Marc S. Kirschner, as Litigation Trustee for the Tribune Litigation Trust v. Dennis J FitzSimons, et al
New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-02652
District Judge William H. Pauley, III, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.nysd.1-12-cv-02652 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Judges don't know as much about themselves as we do.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Marc S. Kirschner, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ROBERT J. LACK +1 973 877 6400 rlack@fklaw.com
Hal Neier +1 212 833 1111 +2127 212 212 7911 hneier@fklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Rusell Englert Orseck Untereiner & Sauber, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Lawrence Saul Robbins +1 202 775 4501 +1 202 775 4510 lrobbins@robbinsrussell.com
Michael Lawrence Waldman +1 202 639 7000 +1 202 639 7004 mwaldman@robbinsrussell.com
No Logo Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Co., et al., Plaintiff
No Logo The Official Committee of Unsecure, Plaintiff
No Logo The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Company (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Company
No Logo The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Company, on behalf of Tribune Company, et al, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Landis Rath & Cobb, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Rebecca Lyn Butcher +1 302 467 4400 +1 302 467 4450 butcher@lrclaw.com
Adam G. Landis +1 302 467 4400 +1 302 467 4450 landis@lrclaw.com
Daniel Bartley Rath +1 302 467 4400 rath@lrclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Harvey Joseph Volzer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
James S. Green +1 302 888 0600 jgreen@svglaw.com
Patricia Pyles McGonigle +1 302 888 0600 pmcgonigle@svglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zuckerman Spaeder LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Graeme Webster Bush +1 202 778 1800 +1 202 822 8106 gbush@zuckerman.com
Andrew Nathan Goldfarb +1 202 778 1822 +1 202 811 8106 agoldfarb@zuckerman.com
James Sottile +1 212 704 9600 +1 212 704 4256 jsottile@zuckerman.com
No Logo #502 TRUST U/W/O MINNETTE R ECKHOUSE DTD 2/1/74, Defendant
No Logo 1173132 ONTARIO INC, Defendant
No Logo 1199SEIU Home Care Employees Pension Fund, Defendant
No Logo 1980 CHARITABLE LEAD TRUST, Defendant
No Logo 1993 GF PARTNERSHIP #4 G-BAR, Defendant
No Logo 1994 ALICIA P. GUGGENHEIM TRUST, Defendant
No Logo 1994 GREGG CHILDRENS TRUST U/A 04/29/94, Defendant
No Logo 1998 CLARKE FAMILY TRUST UA DTD 2/12/98, Defendant
No Logo 1IA SPX1, Defendant
No Logo 1st Source Bank, Defendant
No Logo 2005 Edward K. Newman Revocable Trust U/A 04-14-2005, Defendant
No Logo 21ST CENTURY EQUITY FUND, Defendant
No Logo 3GT Investment Partnership, Defendant
No Logo 3M Employees Welfare Benefits Association Trust I, Defendant
No Logo 4th Power Master Fund Ltd, Defendant
No Logo A & P ASSOCIATES, Defendant
No Logo A E OSBORNE ASSOCIATES, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Walker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jorge Alejandro Padilla +1 512 236 2044 +1 512 391 2131 jpadilla@jw.com
No Logo A ERICKSON SHUSTER & VIRGINIA G SHUSTER, Defendant
No Logo A Good Neighbor Foundation, Defendant
No Logo A R TRUST U/A DTD 09/15/ FBO AGNES STELLA NELTNER, Defendant
No Logo A RICHARD HERSUM 1995 TRUST U/A 10/3/95, Defendant
No Logo A. JOHNSON TRUST FBO C. BOYNTON, Defendant
No Logo A.C.T. Inc LCV, Defendant
No Logo A.G. EDWARDS & SONS, LLC, Defendant
No Logo A.G. Edwards, Inc., Defendant
No Logo A/C CAMDEN, Defendant
No Logo A/C CSFB Prop Trading US, Defendant
No Logo A/C EQUITY DERIV SALES AVG PX, Defendant
No Logo A/C PEOPLE'S BENEFIT LIFE TEAMSTERS, Defendant
No Logo A/C PEOPLES BENEFIT LIFE TEAMSTERS DVP ACCOUNT, Defendant
No Logo AAA Friends in Adoption Foundation Trust, Defendant
No Logo AAFP POOLED INVESTMENT FUND L., Defendant
No Logo AAFP Pooled Investment Fund, L.P., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Stinson Morrison Hecker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Brian R. Markley +1 816 842 8600 +1 816 691 3495 bmarkley@stinson.com
No Logo AAR Corporation Trust F/B/O IRA Eichner, Defendant
Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Abbott Laboratories Consolidated Pension Trust, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Todd J. Rosen +1 213 683 9100 todd.rosen@mto.com
BRADLEY ROBERT SCHNEIDER +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3702 bradley.schneider@mto.com
No Logo ABC ARBITRAGE SA, Defendant
No Logo ABIGAIL WALLACH, Defendant
No Logo ABINGTON ORTHOPAEDIC SPEC PC RET PL DTD 5/1/80 GABELLI PORTFOLIO, Defendant
No Logo ABN AMRO ASIA FINANCIAL SERVICES, LTD., Defendant
No Logo ABN AMRO BANK GV STICHTING PENSIOENFONDS ABN AMRO BANK NV, Defendant
No Logo Abn Amro Bank, N.v., Defendant
No Logo ABN AMRO EQUITIES (UK), LTD., Defendant
No Logo ABN AMRO MULTI MANAGER FUNDS, Defendant
No Logo ABSOLUTE ALPHA FUND, LP, Defendant
No Logo Absolute Value Fund LP, Defendant
No Logo Abu Dhabi Investment Authority, Defendant
No Logo ACCOUNT PNC 4455065 P&PNPF - LSV, JOHN DOE, AS OWNER OF PLUMBERS & PIPEFITTERS NATIONAL PENSION FUND ASSOCIATION, Defendant
No Logo ACCT 38 EQUITY ADVISORY, Defendant
No Logo ACM GROUP TRUST- S&P 500, Defendant
No Logo ACS UNCLAIMED PROPERTY CLEARINGHOUSE, Defendant
No Logo ACT, Inc. Large-Cap Value Fund, Defendant
No Logo ADA H MCIVER, Defendant
No Logo Adage Capital Advisors, L.L.C., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Adage Capital Advisors, L.L.C. (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Adage Capital Advisors, L.L.C.
No Logo Adage Capital Advisors, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Aristeia Capital, L.L.C.
No Logo ADAGE CAPITAL PARTNERS GP, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Adage Capital Partners LP, Defendant
No Logo Adaly Investment Management Co., Defendant
No Logo ADAM W. POTTER, Defendant
No Logo Adams Living Trust, Defendant
No Logo Adelaide Waldenmaier, Defendant
No Logo ADELAIDE WALDENMAIER AND KATHRYN DYBOS, Defendant
No Logo ADIA Invest SRA TRPA 4864, Defendant
No Logo ADIA INVESTMENT SERIES, Defendant
No Logo Administrator Ohio Public Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Defendant
No Logo ADOLPH J & JEANNE M CAPURRO REV TRUST UAD 5/1/00, Defendant
No Logo Adrianne Baker Reilly Estate, Defendant
No Logo Advanced Series Large CAP, T. Rowe Price Retirement Plan Services, Inc., Defendant
No Logo ADVANCED SERIES TRUST (F/K/A AMEERICAN SKANDIA TRUST), Defendant
No Logo Advanced Series Trust - AST QMA US Equity Alpha Portfolio, Defendant
No Logo Advanced Series Trust - AST T. Rowe Price Asset Allocation Portfolio, Defendant
No Logo Advantis Series Fund Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin & Prokopik, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Eric D. Boyle +1 302 594 9780 +1 302 594 9785 eboyle@fandpnet.com
No Logo Advantus Capitol Management Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin & Prokopik, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Eric D. Boyle +1 302 594 9780 +1 302 594 9785 eboyle@fandpnet.com
No Logo Advantus Series Fund, Inc. Index 500 Portfolio, Defendant
No Logo Advisors Asset Management, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Chapman & Cutler LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David Thomas Beech Audley +1 312 845 3000 audley@chapman.com
No Logo ADVISORS INNER CIRCLE FUND-VALUE EQUITY FUND, Defendant
Aetna, Defendant
No Logo Aetna Life Insurance Company, incorrectly named as Aetna Life Insurance Co. - Separate Account No. 364, Defendant
No Logo Aetos Capital, Llc, Defendant
No Logo Aetos Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Aetos Corporation
No Logo AFFILIATED PRIVATE INVESTORS U.S. CORE VALUE FUND LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Eaton & Van Winkle LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Robert K. Gross +1 212 779 9910 +1 212 779 9930 rgross@evw.com
No Logo AGILE NEXUS MULTI STRATEGY FUND SPV 1, LLC, Defendant
No Logo AHL PEGASUS LTD, Defendant
No Logo AIG LIFE INSURANCE Company, Defendant
American International Group, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
American Intl Group Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of American International Group Inc. (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC.
No Logo AIMEE M LANG, Defendant
No Logo ALAN AND ALICE GARNER, Defendant
No Logo ALAN D. EGELSEER, Defendant
No Logo ALAN DEVANEY AND JILL DEVANEY, Defendant
No Logo ALAN E. AND MARIA K. FOWLER, Defendant
No Logo Alan Garner, Defendant
No Logo Alan Gold, Defendant
No Logo ALAN J. TAPPER M.D., Defendant
No Logo ALAN J. TAPPER MD, Defendant
No Logo Alan J. Tapper, MD, Defendant
No Logo ALAN R RHEN, Defendant
No Logo ALAP UK WP NORWICH UNION INVESTMENT TRUST, Defendant
No Logo Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Albert & Julia Smith Charitable Remainder Unitrust II, Defendant
No Logo ALBERT EINSTEIN HEALTHCARE, Defendant
No Logo Albert Einstein Medical Center Employees Retirement Trust, Defendant
No Logo ALBERT J. GAYSON, Defendant
No Logo Albert M. Deyfuss trust U/A DTD 08/14/91, Defendant
No Logo Albert Taffoni, Defendant
No Logo ALBERTA - WCB, Defendant
No Logo Alberta Finance, Defendant
No Logo Alberta W Chandler Marital Trust No. 2 UAD 06/26/35, Defendant
No Logo ALBERTO CRIBIORE (VALUE), Defendant
No Logo Alberto Knie, Defendant
No Logo Alecta Pensionsforsakring, Omsesidigt, Defendant
No Logo ALERION EQUITIES LLC, Defendant
No Logo ALEX D BLUM REVOCABLE TR, Defendant
No Logo ALEX DAMIAN BLUM, UGMA MD, Defendant
No Logo Alexander Dawson Foundation, Defendant
No Logo ALEXANDER J WEISS IRRV TR U/A 10/12/06, Defendant
No Logo ALEXANDER RAPHAEL, Defendant
No Logo Alexander Solon, Defendant
No Logo Alexandr AGobal Master Fund Ltd., Defendant
No Logo ALEXANDRA INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, Defendant
No Logo Alexandra Investment Management, LLC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Allard Investment Company, LLC
No Logo Alfred C. Glassell, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Alfred C. Glassell, Jr.
No Logo Alfred I. Dupont Testamentary Trust, Defendant
No Logo ALFRED V TJARKS, ALFRED V TJARKS RETIREMENT PLAN DTD 02/18/85, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Ofc Jeffrey L Marcus

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jeffrey Lee Marcus +1 805 494 8801 +1 805 494 1881 jeff@marcuslawgroup.com
No Logo ALFRED W. MERKEL, MARLOWE G. MERKEL TR UA 11 SEP 85, Defendant
No Logo Alfred Weinstein, Defendant
No Logo ALI SAR MURIEL SAR JT TEN, Defendant
No Logo Alice B Jones, Beneficiary, M A Barlow Trust FBO Alice B Jones, Defendant
No Logo ALICE C. GARNER, Defendant
No Logo Alice Garner, Defendant
No Logo ALICE GARNER MONEY PPP, Defendant
No Logo ALICE M. GRABAU, Defendant
No Logo ALIZA LEAH ROZMAN, U/A DTD 10/08/82, Defendant
No Logo ALLAN H WILLARD TRUST U/A DTD 9/7/93, Defendant
No Logo Allan R. Koretz Revocable Trust and 05/10/1978, Defendant
No Logo ALLAN R. KORETZ REVOCABLE TRUST UAD 05/10/1978, Defendant
No Logo Allegro Associates, Defendant
No Logo ALLEN C. TANNER JR,, Defendant
No Logo ALLEN PUTTERMAN MD SC MONEY PURCHASE PENSION PLAN, Defendant
No Logo Alliance Capital Group Trust, Defendant
No Logo Alliance Capital Management, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Alliance Capital Management
No Logo AllianceBernstein L.P., Defendant
No Logo ALLIANCEBERNSTEIN TAX-MANAGED, Defendant
No Logo ALLIANCEBERNSTEIN TRUST, ALLIANCEBERNSTEIN VALUE FUND, Defendant
No Logo AllianceBernstein Value Fund, Defendant
Allianz, Defendant
No Logo Allied Workers Local 48, Defendant
No Logo Allstate Insurance Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Allstate Insurance Company
No Logo ALOYSIUS J & EUGENE F FRANZ FOUNDATION FOR THE CONGREGATION OF THE MISSION, Defendant
No Logo ALPHA A. WETENKAMP, Defendant
No Logo Alpha Master LTD RE UBS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Alpha Master LTD RE UBS
No Logo ALPHA WINDWARD LLC, Defendant
No Logo Alphadyne International Master Fund Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Alpheus L Elus 1993 Grandchildren's Trust FBO Christine Gagnon, Defendant
No Logo Alpheus L Elus 1993 Grandchildren's Trust FBO Helen Jo Cahalin, Defendant
No Logo Alpheus L Elus 1993 Grandchildren's Trust FBO Lynn Ann Sharpe, Defendant
No Logo Alpheus L Elus 1993 Great Grandchildren's Trust, Defendant
No Logo Alpheus L Elus 1993 Trust FBO Carol Martin, Defendant
No Logo Alpheus L. Elus 1989 trust, Defendant
No Logo Alpine Associates, Defendant
No Logo Alpine Associates II, L.P., Defendant
No Logo Alpine associates offshore fund ii ltd., Defendant
No Logo Alpine associates offshore fund ltd., Defendant
No Logo Alpine associates, a limited partnership, Defendant
No Logo Alpine Associates, L.P., Defendant
No Logo ALPINE PARTNERS L.P., Defendant
No Logo ALPINE PARTNERS, L.P., Defendant
No Logo ALPINE PLUS L.P., Defendant
No Logo Alson Capital Partners, LLC, Defendant
No Logo ALTERNATIVE FD LLC (CATALYST), Defendant
No Logo ALTMA FUND SICAV PLC IN RESPECT OF THE AMIENS SUB FD US CFD ACCOUNT ONLY, Defendant
No Logo Alvin A. Vinegar Trust SV-15, Defendant
No Logo Alvin Baum Jr. 1966 Trust, Defendant
No Logo Alvin R. Gross, Defendant
No Logo ALYCE TUTTLE FULLER, AS A TRUSTEE OF THE TRUST BY ALYCE TUTTLE FULLER U/A DTD 10/03/2003, Defendant
No Logo ALYCE TUTTLE FULLER, U/A DTD 10/03/2003, Defendant
No Logo Alyce Tuttle Ttee Fuller, Defendant
No Logo ALYN L COOPERMAN REVOCABLE TRUST DATED 8/25/1994, Defendant
No Logo ALZ S&P 500 INDEX FUND, Defendant
No Logo AM International EMAC 63 LTD/VOL ARB, Defendant
No Logo AM Master Fund III, LP, Defendant
No Logo Amalgamated Bank, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Amalgamated Bank
No Logo Amalgamated Bank Of Chicago, Defendant
No Logo AMALGAMATED TRANSIT UNION LOCAL, Defendant
No Logo AMELIA ROSE HOWELLS, Defendant
No Logo AMELITA NEIBURGER, Defendant
No Logo Amelita Neiburger Trust 5c-183, Defendant
No Logo Ameren Management Health Trust, Defendant
No Logo Ameren SVCS Nuclear Decommissioning Trust, Defendant
No Logo AMERICAN BAPTIST HOME MISSION SOCIETY LCV, Defendant
No Logo AMERICAN BEACON FUNDS, Defendant
No Logo American Century Capital Portfolios, Inc., Defendant
No Logo AMERICAN CENTURY INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT INC, Defendant
No Logo American Electric Power Defined Benefit, Defendant
No Logo American General Life Insurance Company Of Delaware, Defendant
No Logo American Home Assurance Company, Defendant
No Logo Ameriprise Trust Company, Defendant
No Logo AMETEK INC EMPLOYEES MASTER RETIREMENT TRUST, Defendant
No Logo Amici Associates LP, Defendant
No Logo Amici Fund International LTD, Defendant
No Logo AMICI FUND INTERNATIONAL, LTD., Defendant
No Logo AMICI QUALIFIED ASSOCIATES LP, Defendant
No Logo Amida Partners Master Fund Ltd, Defendant
No Logo AMM LBI, Defendant
No Logo AMPERE Capital Management LP, Defendant
No Logo AMY BURNS COUNTISS TRUST UA 09/18/99, Defendant
No Logo AMY W FONG TRUST, U/A DTD 06/14/1988, Defendant
No Logo ANA ROTHANA ROTH TRUST, Defendant
No Logo Anadarko Petroleum Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickstein Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Stefanie Jill Greer +1 212 277 6500 +1 212 277 6501 greers@dicksteinshapiro.com
No Logo ANADARKO PETROLEUM CORPORATION MASTER TRUST, Defendant
No Logo Analytic Investors, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Analytic Investors, Inc.
No Logo ANANTH S BHOGARAJU AND PURNIMA U BHOGARAJU, Defendant
No Logo Anchin, Block & Anchin, Defendant
No Logo Ancilla Systems Inc. LCV, Defendant
No Logo ANDE ELLEN WINKLER, Defendant
No Logo ANDERSEN DEFINED BENEFIT, Defendant
No Logo ANDRA AP-FONDEN (AP2), Defendant
No Logo ANDRA-AP-FONDEN, Defendant
No Logo ANDREA REIMANN-CIARDELLI, U/A DTD 04/28/2006, Defendant
No Logo Andrew Absler, Defendant
No Logo ANDREW ALLEN CHARITABLE FOUNDATION SEL ADV/NORTHERN TRUST, Defendant
No Logo ANDREW AND LAUREN F ABSLER, Defendant
No Logo ANDREW BOEHM AND RITA A BOEHM, Defendant
No Logo ANDREW G AND ENID CASSEN, Defendant
No Logo Andrew G. Cassen, Defendant
No Logo ANDREW J IAN GARY WENDY J MACKEN FAMILY TRUST UA 3/16/1999, Defendant
No Logo ANDREW J WALLACE TRUST U/A DTD 07/31/1996, Defendant
No Logo ANDREW J. MCKENNA TRUST, Defendant
No Logo ANDREW T SZMULANSKI, Defendant
No Logo Andrew T. Szymulanski, Defendant
No Logo ANGELO D. GIANCARLO, Defendant
No Logo Anima Societa DI Gestione Del Risparmio Per Azioni, Defendant
No Logo ANIMA SOCIETA' DI GESTIONE DEL RISPARMIO PER AZIONI, Defendant
No Logo ANN B. MURPHY REV TRUST U/A DTD 4/13/04, Defendant
No Logo Ann C. Graff Trust, Defendant
No Logo Ann F. Parks Trust, Defendant
No Logo ANNA B. SILVER, Defendant
No Logo ANNA H DEMING, Defendant
No Logo ANNA L MAST, Defendant
No Logo Anna L. Mast, Defendant
No Logo ANNA W. MURRAY, Defendant
No Logo ANNABELLE M FREDERICKSON, Defendant
No Logo ANNABELLE M FREDERICKSON #10590150010, Defendant
No Logo Anne Aaron Merle Epstein UA 11/09/05, Defendant
No Logo ANNE E MCKENNY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David Amir Kochman +1 212 521 5400 +1 212 521 5450 dkochman@reedsmith.com
No Logo ANNE ELIZABETH MCKENNY 2007, Defendant
No Logo ANNE F NEVILLE FAMILY TRUST U/A DTD 07/14/1999, Defendant
No Logo Anne F. Neville Family Trust U/A DTD 07/14/1999, Defendant
No Logo Anne Irene Anderson, Defendant
No Logo Anne Leslie Fenstermaker, Defendant
No Logo Anne Leslie Scheiermann, Defendant
No Logo ANNE MCCUTCHEON LEWIS TRUST, U/A DTD 10/26/1987, Defendant
No Logo ANNE MCKENNEY TRUST, Defendant
No Logo ANNE PARRY REV LIV TRUST U/A DATED 11/13/97, Defendant
No Logo ANNE RR HUSK & EF PORTER III S HOWELLS TR 12/30/85, Defendant
No Logo ANNE S HOWELLS CHAR TRUST DTD DEC 18 1989, Defendant
No Logo ANNE S SCHEIERMANN, Defendant
No Logo Anne W. Charpie Trust, Defendant
No Logo ANNE=MARIE S GREENBERG, Defendant
No Logo Annette Chan-Norris, Defendant
No Logo ANNETTE O GLOVE HAROLD R GLOVER TRUST UA 02/08/99, Defendant
No Logo ANTHONY AND JACQUELINE MARRO, Defendant
No Logo ANTHONY C AND CELESTE P SCOLARO, Defendant
No Logo ANTHONY C BERARDI, Defendant
No Logo Anthony C. Scolaro, Defendant
No Logo ANTHONY G BRYAN, Defendant
No Logo Anthony G. Bryan, Defendant
No Logo ANTHONY TABASCO III, Defendant
No Logo Anthony Y. Lin, Defendant
No Logo ANTHONY YUKSEEN YAU, Defendant
No Logo Antoinette B Brumbargh Trust, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Antoinette B Brumbargh Trust
No Logo Aon Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Aperio Group LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Aperio Group LLC
No Logo APG (A/K/A ALL PENSIONS GROUP STRUCTURED RESEARCH), Defendant
No Logo APG (DINA) SUCCESOR TR/TIMES, Defendant
No Logo API U.S. CORE VALUE FUND, LLC, Defendant
No Logo APPLEBY INVESTMENTS LP, Defendant
No Logo APPLETON PARTNERS, INC, Defendant
No Logo AQR ABSOLUTE RETURN MASTER ACCOUNT, LP., Defendant
No Logo Aqr Capital Management, Llc, Defendant
No Logo AQR Global Stock Selection HV Master Account Ltd, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ross & Orenstein, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
John B. Orenstein +1 612 436 9800 +1 612 436 9819 jorenstein@rossbizlaw.com
No Logo AQR Global Stock Selection Master Acct LP, Defendant
No Logo AQR R. C. EQUITY AUSTRALIA FUND, Defendant
No Logo AQUA AMERICA-GABELLI ASSET MANAGEMENT, Defendant
No Logo Arbaway Investments LP, Defendant
No Logo ARC REVOCABLE TRUST, Defendant
No Logo Archdiocesan Pension Plan of the Archdiocese of New York, Defendant
No Logo ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES LAY EMPLOYEES PENSION PLAN, Defendant
No Logo Archdiocese Of New York Master Trust, Defendant
No Logo Archdiocese of Philadelphia, Defendant
No Logo ARCHIDIOCESE OF CINCINNATI, Defendant
No Logo ARCHIE/GONSALVES FAMILY TRUST U/A 12/4/01, Defendant
No Logo ARCHITAS MULTI-MANAGER LIMITED, Defendant
No Logo ARI D BLUM REVOCABLE TR, Defendant
No Logo ARIEL CAP MANAGEMENT INC A/C MUNI EMPLOYEES ANNUITYARIEL/MUNEMP AND BENEFIT FUND -CHI, Defendant
No Logo ARIEL CAP MANAGEMENT INC AMIEL PRIM A/C PRIM, Defendant
No Logo ARIEL CAP MGMT INC ARIEL UOFI A/C UNIV OF IL URBANA CHAMPAIG, Defendant
No Logo ARIEL CAPITAL MANAGEMENT ARIEL/SGF ARIEL GROWTH FUND, Defendant
No Logo ARIEL ENTERPRISES INC. PROFIT SHARING PLAN AD TRUST U/A 10/30/1990, Defendant
No Logo ARIEL/APRF/ARIEL APPRECIATION FUND, Defendant
No Logo Ariel/Maxmid/Maxim Midcap Portfolio, Defendant
No Logo Arizona State Retirement System, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Arizona State Retirement System
No Logo ARLENE D SCHULTZ U/A/D 10/18/03, Defendant
No Logo Armen J Adajian Trust U/A 9/15/80, Defendant
No Logo ARMEN MELKUMYAN, Defendant
No Logo ARMENIAN GEN. BENEVOLENT UNION, Defendant
No Logo Armstrong World Industries Inc Retirement Trust, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Stevens & Lee, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Constantine D. Pourakis +1 212 319 8500 +1 212 319 8505 cp@stevenslee.com
No Logo ARNHOLD & S. BLEICHROEDER ADVISERS, LLC, Defendant
No Logo ARNOLD BUCKMAN TRUST U/A DTD 12/24/96, Defendant
No Logo Arnold Manheimer, Defendant
No Logo ARNOLD R WEBER & EDNA F WEBER, Defendant
No Logo Arrow Distressed Fund, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Arrow Distressed Fund
No Logo Arrow Hedge Partners, INC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Arrow Hedge Partners, INC
No Logo ARS & CO, Defendant
No Logo Arthur Blauzda, Defendant
No Logo ARTHUR E GOLDBERG, Defendant
No Logo ARTHUR E MCKENNY, Defendant
No Logo ARTHUR FARBER, Defendant
No Logo ARTHUR G BESS III IRA R/O, Defendant
No Logo ARTHUR HOYER ROLLOVER IRA, Defendant
No Logo ARTHUR JUEDES, Defendant
No Logo ARTHUR R MARTIN, Defendant
No Logo ARTHUR R. HOYER, Defendant
No Logo ARTHUR SHAWN CASEY, Defendant
No Logo ARTHUR Y CHU, Defendant
No Logo ARTICLE VI TRUST 11/W/0 FRANCES BRADLEY LUM MIS, Defendant
No Logo Artis Aggressive Growth Master Fund LP, Defendant
No Logo ARTIS CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LP, Defendant
No Logo Artis Partners (Institutional) LP, Defendant
No Logo Artis Partners 2x (Instututional) LP, Defendant
No Logo Artis Partners 2X LP, Defendant
No Logo Artis Partners 2x Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Artis Partners LP, Defendant
No Logo Artis Partners Ltd., Defendant
No Logo ARTURO QUINONES, Defendant
No Logo Asbestos Workers Local #6, Defendant
No Logo ASBESTOS WORKERS PHILADELPHIA PENSION LCV, Defendant
No Logo ASBURY THEOLOGICAL SEMINARY, Defendant
No Logo Ascension Health, Defendant
No Logo ASIAN PROGRAM AVG PRICE, Defendant
No Logo Assent LLC, Defendant
No Logo ASSET MANAGEMENT INVESTORS LLC, Defendant
No Logo ASSETMARK ENHANCED FUNDAMENTAL INDEX - LARGE COMPANY VALUE FUND, Defendant
No Logo ASSETMARK LARGE CAP VALUE FUND, Defendant
No Logo Assisi Foundation of Memphis, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Glankler Brown, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Lee Chase, III +1 901 576 1729 +1 901 525 2389 lchase@glankler.com
No Logo AST ALLIANCEBERNSTEIN MANAGED, Defendant
No Logo ASTRID K BIRKE REVOCABLE TRUST DATED 04/28/98, Defendant
AT&T, Inc., Defendant
No Logo ATHOLIE K ROSETT, Defendant
No Logo ATLANTIC SALMON FEDERATION CANADA ENDOWMENT FUND INV, Defendant
No Logo ATTN INTL PROGRAM TRADES, Defendant
No Logo AUDREY M SOUTHARD, Defendant
No Logo AUSTIN PRESBYTERIAN THEOLOGICAL, Defendant
No Logo Austin Trust Company, Defendant
No Logo Austin Trust Company, Trustee, Barlow Trust FBO M A Barlow Jr., Defendant
No Logo Austin Trust Company, Trustee, M A Barlow Trust FBO Alice B Jones, Defendant
No Logo Austin Trust Company, Trustee, M A Barlow Trust FBO Gloria Bowman, Defendant
No Logo Austin Trust Company, Trustee, M A Barlow Trust FBO J B Dieman, Defendant
No Logo Austin Trust Company, Trustee, M A Barlow Trust FBO Kathleen Barlow, Defendant
No Logo Austin Trust Company, Trustee, M A Barlow Trust FBO Nancy Barlow, Defendant
No Logo Austin Trust Company, Trustee, M A Barlow Trust UA G J Barlow, Defendant
No Logo Automobile Club Of Southern California, Defendant
No Logo AUTOMOBILE MECHANICS' LOCAL NO. 701 UNION AND INDUSTRY PENSION FUND A/K/A AUTOMOBILE MECHANICS LOCAL 701 LCV, Defendant
No Logo Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Defendant
No Logo AVALON TRUST COMPANY, Defendant
No Logo AVERY DENNISON CORPORATION MASTER RETIREMENT TRUST A/K/A AVERY DENNISON MASTER RETIREMENT TRUST, Defendant
No Logo AVIV NEVO, Defendant
No Logo AVIVA INVESTORS NORTH AMERICA INC., Defendant
No Logo Aviva North America, Defendant
No Logo Aviva Plc, Defendant
No Logo Axa, Defendant
No Logo AXA Assurances I.A.R.D. Mutuelle, Defendant
No Logo AXA Assurances Vie Mutuelle, Defendant
No Logo AXA Courtage Assurance Mutuelle, Defendant
No Logo AXA Equitable Life Insurance Company, Defendant
No Logo Axa Financial, Inc., Defendant
No Logo AXA INSURANCE, Defendant
No Logo AXA Pacific Insurance Company, Defendant
No Logo AXA Premier VIP Trust, Defendant
No Logo AXA Premier VIP Trust , Multimanager Large Cap Core Equity Portfolio, Defendant
No Logo AXA Premier VIP Trust, Multimanager Large Cap Value Portfolio, Defendant
No Logo AYDA R ARSLAN, Defendant
No Logo Ayda R. Arslan, Defendant
No Logo B Trade Services LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
B Trade Services LLC
No Logo Babcock & Wilcox Asbestos Personal Injury Trust, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Campbell & Levine, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Frederick Donald Rapone, Jr. +1 412 261 0310 +1 412 261 5066 fdr@camlev.com
No Logo BACAP Equity Fund XXI, Defendant
No Logo BAE Systems Land & Armaments, Inc. f/k/a United Defense LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Proctor Heyman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Dominick T. Gattuso +1 302 472 7311 +1 302 472 7301 dgattuso@proctorheyman.com
No Logo BAKERY, CONFECTIONERY, TOBACCO WORKERS & GRAIN MILLERS UNION LOCAL 102(INTERNATIONAL PENSION FUND), Defendant
No Logo Balanced Fund, Defendant
No Logo Baldwin Enterprises, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Bst Enterprises, Inc.
No Logo BALL STATE UNIVERSITY LCV, Defendant
No Logo BALLENTINE US MID CAP EQUITY FUND SELECT, Defendant
No Logo BANCO PORTUGUES DE INVESTIMENTO, Defendant
No Logo BANK JULIUS BAER & CO. AG, Defendant
No Logo Bank of America, NA, Defendant
No Logo BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO BOATMENS/100, Defendant
No Logo BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE OF TRUST UNDER AGREEEMENT E L SANFORD FAM FBO MASON, Defendant
No Logo BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE OF TRUST UNDER AGREEMENT E L SANFORD CHILDREN/WILLIAM, Defendant
No Logo BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE OF TRUST UNDER AGREEMENT E L SANFORD FAM FBO WILLIAM, Defendant
No Logo BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE OF TRUST UNDER AGREEMENT J SANFORD CHILDREN/ADA, Defendant
No Logo BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE OF TRUST UNDER AGREEMENT J SANFORD CHILDREN/MASON, Defendant
No Logo BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE OF TRUST UNDER AGREEMENT J SANFORD CHILDREN/WILLIAM, Defendant
No Logo Bank Of Hawaii, Defendant
No Logo Bank Of New York Trust Company, NA, Defendant
No Logo BANK OF NY, Defendant
No Logo Banque D'Orsay, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Banque D'Orsay
No Logo Baptist Foundation of Texas, Defendant
No Logo Barbara Alter, Defendant
No Logo BARBARA ANNE WARD LIVING TR U/A DTD 11/20/2007, Defendant
No Logo Barbara Bell, Defendant
No Logo Barbara Bonoff Gettinger, Defendant
No Logo BARBARA C. SHANE, Defendant
No Logo BARBARA CADY SCHMID, Defendant
No Logo Barbara Clements Heller Revocable Trust DTD 3/22/01, Defendant
No Logo BARBARA D. MCGRAW, Defendant
No Logo BARBARA F SALAS & GEORGE M SALAS, Defendant
No Logo BARBARA H ALTER 2002 DECLARATION OF TRUST DTD 12/12/2002, Defendant
No Logo BARBARA HAMMOND, Defendant
No Logo BARBARA HAMMOND (DECEASED), Defendant
No Logo BARBARA HOROWITZ TRUST U/A/D 04/05/91, Defendant
No Logo BARBARA K. WARNER, Defendant
No Logo BARBARA M OSBORNE TRUST U/I/T DTD 2/7/05, Defendant
No Logo BARBARA M. CALVERT (DCSD), Defendant
No Logo BARBARA M. OSBORNE INTERIN TST DTD 2/7/02, Defendant
No Logo Barbara M.J. Wood Living Trust U/A/D 9/17/81, Defendant
No Logo BARBARA MARTELL, Defendant
No Logo BARBRA ATSAVES PABST, Defendant
Barclays Bank PLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Barclays Bank, PLC
No Logo Barclays Capital Group, Defendant
No Logo Barclays Capital Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Barclays Capital, Inc.
No Logo BARCLAYS CAPITAL PRIME BROKER, Defendant
No Logo BARCLAYS CAPITAL SECURITIES LIMITED AS SUCCESSOR TO BZW SECURITIES LIMITED, Defendant
No Logo BARCLAYS CAPITAL SECURITIES, LTD., Defendant
No Logo BARCLAYS GBL INVESTORS NA REF INDUSTRY ALPHA LTD, Defendant
No Logo Barclays Global Investors, Defendant
No Logo BARCLAYS GLOBAL INVESTORS (US), Defendant
No Logo BARCLAYS GLOBAL INVESTORS FUNDS, Defendant
No Logo BARCLAYS GLOBAL INVESTORS LTD A/C CHS0036408, Defendant
No Logo BARCLAYS GLOBAL INVESTORS LTD A/C CSAM945416, Defendant
No Logo BARCLAYS GLOBAL INVESTORS LTD A/C NT000IPE01, Defendant
No Logo BARCLAYS GLOBAL INVESTORS LTD A/C SEB0567995, Defendant
No Logo BARCLAYS GLOBAL INVESTORS LTD A/C SS0000NE8W, Defendant
No Logo BARCLAYS GLOBAL INVESTORS NA A/C AP1 MSCI WORLD INDEX PLUS, Defendant
No Logo BARKHAUSEN H G TR 12/20/34, Defendant
No Logo Barlow Trust FBO M. A. Barlow Jr., Defendant
No Logo BARNET PARTNERS LTD, Defendant
No Logo BARRETT C MCGREGOR, Defendant
No Logo Barrie A. Kass, Defendant
No Logo BARRINGTON INVESTORS L.P. 0102 GSAM: TAX ADV LH (S&P500), Defendant
No Logo BARRY D MCCORMICK, Defendant
No Logo BARRY DAVID KUPFERBERG & LORI BANNER KUPFERBERG, Defendant
No Logo BARRY L. FELDPAUSCH AND JEANNE R. FELDPAUSCH JT TEN, Defendant
No Logo Barry Shein Revocable Trust, Defendant
No Logo BARRY T WERBLOW AND BARI WERBLOW, Defendant
BASF, Defendant
No Logo BASF CORPORATION PENSION MASTER TRUST, Defendant
No Logo BASHAR A MUBASHIR, Defendant
No Logo BASIM S. AND CATHY MARIE NIMBI, Defendant
No Logo Basim S. Nimri, Defendant
No Logo BATL PN-NTRS S&P, Defendant
No Logo Battelle Memorial Institute (BMI), Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Graydon Head & Ritchey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
John B. Pinney +1 513 621 6464 +1 513 651 3836 jpinney@graydon.com
No Logo Baxter International, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Baycare Health System, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Baylor Health Care System, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Locke Lord Bissell & Liddell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Harriet E. Miers +1 214 740 8450 +1 214 740 8800 hmiers@lockelord.com
Jay Gerald Safer +1 212 812 8305 +1 212 812 2754 jsafer@lordbissell.com
No Logo BB&T FUNDS, Defendant
No Logo Bbt Fund, LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
BBT Fund LP
No Logo BCBSM FOUNDATION BERNSTEIN VALUE, Defendant
No Logo Beacon Trust Company, Defendant
No Logo Bear Stearns & Co., Defendant
No Logo BEAR STEARNS & CO. INC (N/K/A J.P. MORGAN SECURITIES LLC), Defendant
Bear, Stearns & Company, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Bear Stearns Equity Strategies RT LLC
No Logo Bear Stearns Asset Management Inc., Defendant
No Logo BEAR STEARNS SECS CORP (N/K/A J.P. MORGAN CLEARING CORP.), Defendant
No Logo Bear Stearns Securities Corp., Defendant
No Logo BEAUMONT FIREMEN'S RELIEF AND, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Walker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jorge Alejandro Padilla +1 512 236 2044 +1 512 391 2131 jpadilla@jw.com
Bechtel Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Bechtel Corporation
No Logo Bell Atlantic Master Trust, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Bell Atlantic Master Trust
No Logo Bellin Hospital, Defendant
No Logo BELLIN HOSPITAL PENSION TRUST, Defendant
No Logo BellSouth Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Bellsouth Corp.
No Logo BELLSOUTH GROUP LIFE TRUST S&P, Defendant
No Logo BELLSOUTH HEALTHCARE S&P 500, Defendant
No Logo BELLSOUTH/ALLIANCE, Defendant
No Logo BENJAMIN FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, Defendant
No Logo BENJAMIN FRANK OLIVA, Defendant
No Logo BENJAMIN J. VERDUSCO TRUST, U/A DTD 12/13/1989, Defendant
No Logo BENJAMIN JOSEPH DALY GIFT TRUST, Defendant
No Logo BENJAMIN LESAGE, Defendant
No Logo Benjamin Oliva, Defendant
No Logo Berkeley Capital Management, Defendant
No Logo Bernadette Cooley, Defendant
No Logo BERNADETTE FINGLETON, Defendant
No Logo BERNARD AND BARBRO OSHE 2006, Defendant
No Logo BERNARD AND RENA SHAPIRO, INTERVIVOS TRUST A/C #1 DTD 10/15/87, Defendant
No Logo BERNARD CHAPMAN TRUST U/A, Defendant
No Logo Bernard E & Edith B Waterman Charitable Foundation, Defendant
No Logo BERNARD E WATERMAN AND EDITH B WATERMAN, Defendant
No Logo Bernard E. Waterman, Defendant
No Logo BERNARD J AND KAREN A SILGARDO, Defendant
No Logo Bernard J. Silgardo, Defendant
No Logo BERNARD OSHER 2006 CHARITABLE REMAINDER UNTRUST #2, Defendant
No Logo Bernard Osher Trust , Defendant
No Logo Bernard Osher Trust, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Bernard Osher Trust
No Logo BERNARD RABINOWITZ TRUST U/A/D 09-11-2006, Defendant
No Logo BERNARD W LINCICOME, Defendant
No Logo BERNARD W. LINCICOME, Defendant
No Logo BERNER CHARITABLE SCHOLARSHIP FOUNDATION, Defendant
No Logo BERNICE K WATTMAN, U/A DTD 11/01/2002, Defendant
No Logo BERNIE H. SMITH & JOYCE M. SMITH, Defendant
No Logo Bessemer Trust Company, Defendant
No Logo BESSIE E MURRAY, Defendant
No Logo Bessie E. Murray, Defendant
No Logo BETH L ZWEIG C/F LAURA H ZWEIG U/IN/UTMA, Defendant
No Logo BETH L. CHAPIN, Defendant
No Logo Bethesda Hospital master Trust LCV, Defendant
No Logo BETHESDA NON-RETIREMENT ASSETS MASTER TRUST, Defendant
No Logo Betsy D. Holden, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Betsy D. Holden
No Logo BETSY N. ANDERSON, Defendant
No Logo BETTE SUE FLYNN, Defendant
No Logo BETTE WENDT JORE, Defendant
No Logo BETTIE SUE FLYNN, Defendant
No Logo BETTY ANDRES TRUST U/A/D 04-21-1988, Defendant
No Logo BETTY BEAIRD, Defendant
No Logo Betty Beaird, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Betty Beaird
No Logo Betty Beaird Living Trust U/A DTD 4/10/87, Defendant
No Logo Betty Ellen Berlamino, Defendant
No Logo Betty J. Ahlmann Jtwros, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Betty J. Ahlmann Jtwros (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Betty J. Ahlmann Jtwros +1 847 299 8304
No Logo Betty J. Stephens Survivors Trust, Defendant
No Logo BETTY K. ZLATCHIN IRA, Defendant
No Logo Betty Rich, Defendant
No Logo Betty Rich As Trustee under Self Declaration of Trust Dtd 7-1-71, Defendant
No Logo Betty Rich as Trustee under self-declaration of Trust DTD 7-1-71, Defendant
No Logo BETURN, Defendant
No Logo BEVERLY MAACKINTOSH TTEE, Defendant
No Logo Beverly Mackintosh Trustee, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hermes, Netburn, O'Connor & Spearing

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Dana K Etre +1 617 728 0050 detre@hermesnetburn.com
Peter G. Hermes +1 617 728 0050 +1 617 728 0052 phermes@hermesnetburn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Werb & Sullivan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Duane David Werb +1 302 652 1100 +1 302 652 1111 dwerb@werbsullivan.com
No Logo BEVERLY PERRY, Defendant
No Logo Beverly Perry, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Perry, Beverly

Toggle Switch Represented by Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Paige E. Barr +1 312 902 5644 Paige.Barr@kattenlaw.com
David Charles Bohan +1 312 902 5200 +1 312 577 4734 david.bohan@kattenlaw.com
No Logo BGC Insurance Trust PLG, Defendant
No Logo BGI AVG PRICE, Defendant
No Logo Bhf Bank AG, Defendant
No Logo BIG SKY, LLC, Defendant
No Logo BILL C AND JANIE L. OGLE, Defendant
No Logo Bill C. Ogle, Defendant
No Logo BILL HORTON & MARY HORTON TTEE, Defendant
No Logo BILLIE J BOUZEK TRUST U/A 1/28/00, Defendant
No Logo BINHUA MAO, Defendant
No Logo BIRDIE R GRAY FOR JANE J BROWNE; VICTORIA BROWNE ROGERS, Defendant
No Logo BK OF LANCASTER COUNTY NA, Defendant
No Logo Black Diamond Arbitrage Offshore Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Black Diamond Offshore Ltd., Defendant
No Logo BLACK RIVER GLOBAL EQUITY ARBITRAGE FUND LTD., Defendant
No Logo Black River Global Quity Arbitrage Fund Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Blackburn Trust, Defendant
No Logo Blackport Capital Fund Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Blackport Capital Fund Ltd.
No Logo Blackrock Advisors (UK) Ltd, Defendant
No Logo BLACKROCK ADVISORS (UK) LTD., Defendant
No Logo BLACKROCK ADVISORS (UK) LTD. F/K/A BARCLAYS GLOBAL INVESTORS LTD. (A/C CH0036498), Defendant
No Logo Blackrock Advisors (uk ) Ltd, Defendant
No Logo BLACKROCK ADVISORS, LLC, Defendant
No Logo BLACKROCK FUNDS, Defendant
No Logo BLACKROCK INDEX FUNDS, INC., Defendant
No Logo BLACKROCK INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, LLC, Defendant
No Logo BLACKROCK S&P 500 INDEX FUND, Defendant
BlackRock, Defendant
No Logo Blackrock S&P 500 Index V.I. Fund (Ins-Var Ser), Defendant
No Logo BLACKROCK S&P 500 PROTECTED EQUITY FUND, INC C/O BLACKROCK INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, LLC, Defendant
No Logo BLACKROCK VARIABLE SERIES FUNDS INC, Defendant
No Logo BLAINE B ROMINGER, Defendant
No Logo BLANDINA ROJEK, Defendant
No Logo BLANDINA ROJEK CHAR LD. TRUST, Defendant
No Logo BLEND SURVIVOR'S TR DTD 12/2/99, Defendant
No Logo BLOCK COMM RETIREMENT TRUST, Defendant
No Logo Block Communications, Inc., Defendant
No Logo BLUE CHIP FUND, A ERIES OF FIRST INVESTORS EQUITY FUNDS, Defendant
No Logo BLUE CROSS & BLUE SHIELD OF KA, Defendant
No Logo Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Defendant
No Logo BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF GEORGIA, INC. A/K/A WELLPOINT, INC. BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF GEORGIA, Defendant
No Logo Bluecross Blueshield Of Tennessee, Defendant
No Logo Blue Cross Of California, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison Cohen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Gayle Elise Pollack +1 212 735 8793 +1 212 735 8708 gpollack@morrisoncohen.com
Howard S. Wolfson +1 212 735 8872 +1 212 735 8708 hwolfson@morrisoncohen.com
No Logo Blue Hills Bank, Defendant
No Logo BLYTHE T BELENKY, Defendant
No Logo BMO HARRIS BANK N.A. AS TRUSTEE OF TR UA 09/02/1993 DOROTHY QUAAL REV TRUST, Defendant
No Logo BMO Nesbit Burns Trading Corp. SA, Defendant
No Logo BMO Nesbitt Burns Inc./CDS, Defendant
No Logo BMR 2 LLC, Defendant
No Logo BNA EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT TRUST, Defendant
No Logo BNA Employees' Retirement Plan incorrectly named as Bureau of Natl Affairs Ret, Defendant
No Logo BNP PARIBAS ARBITRAGE, SNCR, Defendant
BNP Paribas, Defendant
No Logo BNP PARIBAS PRIME BROKERAGE INC., Defendant
No Logo BNP Paribas Securities Corp, Defendant
No Logo Bnp Paribas Securities Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Alan J. Stone +1 212 530 5285 +1 212 530 5219 astone@milbank.com
No Logo BNPP PRIVATE BK HONG KONG BRAN POOL 3 30% WITHHOLD DIVIDEND, Defendant
No Logo BNY GCM, Defendant
No Logo BNY GCM RE Morgan Stanley & CO INTL, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
BNY GCM RE Morgan Stanley & CO INTL
No Logo BNY Hamilton Funds Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Stephen Leonard Ratner +1 212 969 3000 +1 212 969 2900 sratner@proskauer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Kurt F. Gwynne +1 302 778 7550 +1 302 778 7575 kgwynne@reedsmith.com
Brian M. Rostocki +1 302 778 7561 brostocki@reedsmith.com
No Logo Bny Mellon, Defendant
No Logo Bny Mellon, N.a., Defendant
No Logo BNYTD AC MLC GLOBAL EQUITY DFA BNYTD A/C MLC, Defendant
No Logo BNYTD EQUATOR INV FD ICVC NAMERICA, Defendant
No Logo BO QUAN, Defendant
No Logo BOA PENSION PLAN FOR LEGACY COMPANIES, Defendant
No Logo BOA Pension-CMG Largecap Index, Defendant
No Logo BOA PENSION-T. ROWE PRICE, Defendant
No Logo BOARD OF ADMINISTRATION OF THE WATER AND POWER EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT PLAN A/K/A WATER AND POWER EMPLOYEES' RET DISAB & DEATH BENEFIT INS PLAN, Defendant
No Logo BOARD OF EDUCATION NEW YORK CITY RETIREMENT SYSTEMS, Defendant
Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Junior University, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Bruce A. Ericson +1 415 983 1000 +1 415 983 1200 bruce.ericson@pillsburylaw.com
No Logo Boast Longyear Company Employees' Pension Plan and Trust, Defendant
No Logo BOB FUSHIMI AND CLOVIA L FUSHIMI, Defendant
No Logo Bodmas Capital Partners LP, Defendant
No Logo Boeing Company, Defendant
No Logo Boeing Company Employee Retirement, Defendant
No Logo Boeing Company Employees Retirement Plans Master Trust, Defendant
No Logo Bokf, Na, Defendant
No Logo Bon Secours Health System, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bonita Diaz, Defendant
No Logo BORROWED-NY, STOCK, Defendant
No Logo BOSTON COLLEGE, Defendant
No Logo Boston Partners Asset Management, Defendant
No Logo Boston Private Bank & Trust Company, in its capacity as trustee of Trust U/A A. Johnson FBO C. Boynton, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sally & Fitch LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Stephen C. Reilly +1 617 542 5542 +1 617 542 1542 scr@sally-fitch.com
No Logo Boston Trust & Investment, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Boston Trust & Investment
No Logo Boston Trust & Investment Management Company, Defendant
No Logo BP Pension Services Limited, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
BP Pension Services Limited
No Logo BP PENSION SERVICES LIMITED BP PENSION TRUSTEES LIMITED, Defendant
No Logo BPI-Banco Portugues De Investimento, Defendant
No Logo Bradley A. Long Traditional IRA, Defendant
No Logo BRAGA REVOCABLE TRUST TR UA 31-JUL-95, Defendant
No Logo BRANCH, B PRIVATE BANK SINGAPORE, Defendant
No Logo BRANDES, Defendant
No Logo Brandes Investment Partners, LP, Defendant
No Logo BRANDES U.S. EQUITY FUND, Defendant
No Logo BRANDON DEAN DALY GIFT TRUST, Defendant
No Logo BRAXTON N ROBINSON, Defendant
No Logo BRENT EASTBURG HY/SCT, Defendant
No Logo BRENT V WOODS, Defendant
No Logo Bresler Family Investors LLC, Defendant
No Logo BRIAN F. LITMAN, Defendant
No Logo Brian Gormley, Defendant
No Logo Brian Hull, Defendant
No Logo BRIAN J MCMANUS, SR, Defendant
No Logo Brian Joseph Meek C/F Adam john Meek UGMA/IL, Defendant
No Logo BRIAN MCGOVERN, Defendant
No Logo BRIAN SHERIDAN HALL, Defendant
No Logo BRIAN W SMITH, Defendant
No Logo Brian W. Smith, Defendant
No Logo BRICKLAYERS & ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS LOCAL 5 PENSION FUND, Defendant
No Logo BRICKLAYERS & TROWEL TRADES INTL PENSION FUND MCV, Defendant
No Logo BRIDGER COAL COMPANY RECLAMATION TRUST LCV, Defendant
No Logo Bridgestone Americas, Inc., Defendant
No Logo BRIDGEWAY FUNDS INC., Defendant
No Logo BRISTOL COUNTY RETIREMENT SYSTEM LCV, Defendant
No Logo BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY MASTER RETIREMENT TRUST, Defendant
No Logo BROOKLINE AVENUE PARTNERS, LP, Defendant
No Logo BROPHY PROPERTIES INC, Defendant
No Logo Brown & James PC PFT SHR Plan DTD 91/03, Defendant
No Logo Brown Brothers Harriman & Company, Defendant
No Logo BROWN INVESTMENT ADVISORY & TRUST CO., Defendant
No Logo Browne Value Fund Tweedy, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Tweedy, Browne Value Fund
No Logo BROWNING INVESTMENTS INC EMPL SAVING PLAN FBO D GABVITCH, Defendant
No Logo BRUCE G MURPHY AND LOU ANN MURPHY, Defendant
No Logo BRUCE G. MURPHY & LOU ANN MURPHY, Defendant
No Logo BRUCE KIRKPATRICK, Defendant
No Logo Bruce Reznick, Defendant
No Logo Bruce W. Ahlmann, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Bruce W. Ahlmann (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Bruce W. Ahlmann +1 847 299 8304
No Logo Brumback Family LLC, Defendant
No Logo BRUMBAUGH A B IRRV TRUST, Defendant
No Logo BRUNO HOFMANN, Defendant
No Logo BRYCE PATRICK ANDREWS, Defendant
No Logo BSCL AS AGENT FOR HYMF LTD, Defendant
No Logo BSCS Captial Growth Limited Partnership, Defendant
No Logo BUFFALO FINE ARTS ACADEMY FUND D, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Magavern, Magavern & Grimm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Aven Rennie arennie@magavern.com
No Logo Building Trades United Pension Trust Fund, Defendant
No Logo BULL DANIEL TTEE M K PASCHALL TR-IMA, Defendant
No Logo Bureau of Natl Affairs Ret, Defendant
No Logo BURROUGHS WELLCOME FUND, Defendant
No Logo BURROUGHS WELLCOME FUND LCV, Defendant
No Logo BURT JM TEST, Defendant
No Logo BURTON J RAIN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Susan Patrice Persichilli +1 212 440 4481 +1 212 440 4401 persichillisp@bipc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiff Hardin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jeffrey D Eaton +1 312 258 5573 +1 312 258 5600 jeaton@schiffhardin.com
No Logo Byrd Trading LLC, Defendant
No Logo BYRON PALMER TRUST U/A DTD 02/15/2002, Defendant
No Logo C & F Lane Family LP, Defendant
No Logo C HUGH STEPHENS, U/A DTD 11/08/2002, Defendant
No Logo C. HEALY & C. HEALY LIV. TRUST U/A DTD 08/03/1987, Defendant
No Logo C.O. Baxter, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Baxter
No Logo C/O JACK L RASMUSSEN OR CURRENT TRUSTEE, Defendant
No Logo C/O JOSEPH C. WYLIE II, Defendant
No Logo CA Public EE Retrmnt Sys, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
CA Public EE Retrmnt Sys
No Logo Caceis Bank, Defendant
No Logo CACEIS BANK LUXEMBOURG (CLIENT ACCOUNT), Defendant
No Logo Caisee DE Depot, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Caisee DE Depot
No Logo CAISEE DE DEPOT ET PLACEMENT DU QUEBEC, Defendant
No Logo CAISSE DE DEPOT, Defendant
No Logo CALDWELL FOUNDATION, Defendant
No Logo California Ironworkers Field Pension Trust, Defendant
No Logo California Physicians' Service d/b/a Blue Shield of California, Defendant
No Logo California Public Employees Retirement System, Defendant
No Logo California State Teachers Retirement System, Defendant
No Logo California State Teachers' Retirement System, Defendant
No Logo CALIFORNIACARE BOSTON PART WHNF2001602, Defendant
No Logo Calpers, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Calpers
No Logo CALPERS (CALIFORNIA PUB.EMP.RETIRE.SYS.), Defendant
No Logo CALPERS (DYNAMIC COMPLETION FUND), Defendant
No Logo CALPERS (POOLED S+P 500 INDEX FUND), Defendant
No Logo Calvert Investment Management, Inc., Defendant
No Logo CALVERT LESTER, Defendant
No Logo Calvert Variable Products, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Worcester, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Laura Steinberg +1 617 338 2867 +1 617 338 2880 lsteinberg@sandw.com
No Logo Cambridge Appleton Trust Co., Defendant
No Logo CAMBRIDGE APPLETON TRUST N.A., Defendant
No Logo Camden Asset Management LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Camden Asset Management LP
No Logo CAMDEN ASSET MANAGEMENT, L.P., Defendant
No Logo Camilla Chandler Family Foundation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Camilla Chandler Family Foundation
No Logo CANACCORD WEALTH MANAGEMENT, Defendant
No Logo CANADA PENSION PLAN INVESTMENT BOARD, Defendant
No Logo CANADIAN IMPERIAL $55ARB HOLDINGS INC:INDEX ABRITRAGE, Defendant
No Logo CANADIAN IMPERIAL HOLDINGS INC., Defendant
No Logo CANE GLOBAL MASTER FUND LP, Defendant
No Logo Cantigny Foundation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Cantigny Foundation
No Logo Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Defendant
No Logo Canyon balanced Equity Master Fund Ltd, Defendant
No Logo CANYON BALANCED EQUITY MASTER FUND, LTD F/K/A CANYON BALANCED EQUITY MASTER FUND, LTD, Defendant
No Logo Canyon Capital Advisors LLC, Defendant
No Logo Canyon Value Realization Fund (Cayman) Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Canyon Value Realization Fund LP, Defendant
No Logo Canyon Value Realization MAC 18 Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Capital One N.A. Bank #61, Defendant
No Logo Capitalia AM SGR SPA, Defendant
No Logo CAPURRO INVESTMENTS A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, Defendant
No Logo CAPURRO PROP SERIES LLC - SERIES G, Defendant
No Logo CARA LEIGH GILLESPIE-WILSON, Defendant
No Logo CARE USA NORTHERN TRUST, Defendant
No Logo CARL & ROSELLA THORNE, Defendant
No Logo CARL B. FIELD III AND MARY JEAN CHASE FIELD, Defendant
No Logo Carl B. Field, III, Defendant
No Logo Carl Burr Field, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Shan A. Haider +1 212 262 6900 +1 212 977 1649 shaider@perkinscoie.com
No Logo CARL E HIRSCH, Defendant
No Logo Carl E. Hirsch, Defendant
No Logo CARL H SPAHR, Defendant
No Logo Carl Thorne, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Walker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Charles Lynde Babcock +1 214 953 6030 +1 214 953 5822 cbabcock@jw.com
No Logo Carl Weiner Testamentary Trust U/A/D 3/7/86, Defendant
No Logo Carl Zlatchin Profit, Defendant
No Logo CARLOS MADRIGAL JR AND ELSA MADRIGAL, Defendant
No Logo Carlos Madrigal, Jr., Defendant
No Logo CARLYLE BLUE WAVE, Defendant
No Logo Carlyle Multi-Strategy Master, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Carlyle Multi-Strategy Master
No Logo Carlyle Multi-Strategy Master Fund Ltd., Defendant
No Logo CARLYLE PAFF HEDRICK TR U/A/D 02/06/06, Defendant
No Logo Carmela Shaw, Defendant
No Logo CARMINE MACCHIAROLI LIVING TR U/A 07/01/88, Defendant
No Logo CAROL E JANSSON TRUST U/A DTD 06/17/1998, Defendant
No Logo CAROL E MILAN, Defendant
No Logo CAROL E NEWMAN REVOCABLE TRUST UA 02-10-2006, Defendant
No Logo Carol E. Jansson Trust U/A DTD 06/17/1998, Defendant
No Logo CAROL F DAVIES, Defendant
No Logo Carol F. Davies, Defendant
No Logo CAROL FORACE, Defendant
No Logo CAROL H CASE REV LIV TRUST DTD 06/14/90, Defendant
No Logo CAROL LAU PHD PSP PART QRP, Defendant
No Logo CAROL M ENGLISH REV TRUST UD AGY, Defendant
No Logo Carol M. English Rev Trust UD AGY, Defendant
No Logo CAROL S ROWE, Defendant
No Logo CAROL SKRENTNY, Defendant
No Logo CAROL VIRGINIA JAMES, Defendant
No Logo Carole Levy Rebocable Trust U/A/D 05-05-1986, Defendant
No Logo CAROLE LEVY REVOCABLE TRUST U/A/D 05-05-1986, Defendant
No Logo Carole O'Sullivan, Defendant
No Logo Carolinas Healthcare System, Defendant
No Logo Caroline D Bradley Trust Dated 11/30/51 FBO Sarah Doll Barder, Defendant
No Logo Carolyn I Camassar, Defendant
No Logo CAROLYN S FISHER FAMILY TRUST 11/16/90 U-A, Defendant
No Logo CAROMONT HEALTH INC. LSV MANAGED ACCOUNT-DBAB, Defendant
No Logo CAROMONT/GASTON HEALTHCARE CORPORATE LCV, Defendant
No Logo CAROMONT/GASTON HEALTHCARE PENSION LCV, Defendant
No Logo CARPENTERS ANNUITY TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, Defendant
No Logo Carpenters Pension Trust for Northern California, Defendant
No Logo Carr Total Return Fund Limited Partnership, Defendant
No Logo Carret Asset Management, Defendant
No Logo CARRINGTON M. LLOYD, JR. PLD, Defendant
No Logo CARROLL PITTMAN, LOU E PITTMAN TR UA 04/30/02 PITTMAN TRUST, Defendant
No Logo CARYL PUCCI RETTALIATA, Defendant
No Logo CASEY AND ASSOCIATES, LLP, Defendant
No Logo Cassandra Trading Group LLC, Defendant
No Logo CATALYST INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT CO., LLC, Defendant
No Logo CATERPILLAR INC MASTER TRUST, Defendant
Caterpillar, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Catherine A. Campbell Trust, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ziegler Metzger LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Stephen M Bales +1 216 781 5470 sbales@zieglermetzger.com
No Logo CATHLEEN L ROONEY, Defendant
No Logo Catholic Health West CHW, Defendant
No Logo Catholic Medical Center, Defendant
No Logo CATHOLIC MEDICAL CENTER BOARD DESIGNATED FUNDS MCV, Defendant
No Logo CATHOLIC MEDICAL CENTER ERISA MCV, Defendant
No Logo CATHOLIC UNITED INVESTMENT TRUST, Defendant
No Logo Cathy Marie Nimri, Defendant
No Logo Caxton Associates Lp, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Caxton Associates. LP
No Logo Caxton International, Ltd, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Cerberus International, Ltd.
No Logo CAYUGA MEDICAL CENTER AT ITHACA, Defendant
No Logo CBS Master Trust, Defendant
No Logo CCM PARTNERS, Defendant
No Logo CD Investment Partners Ltd., Defendant
No Logo CDP - NORTHERN TRUST CO, Defendant
No Logo CDS CLEARING AND DEPOSITORY SERVICES, INC, Defendant
No Logo CECIL C SMITH, Defendant
No Logo CECIL C. SMITH IRA FBO CECIL C. SMITH PTC AS CUSTODIAN, Defendant
No Logo CECILE M CROWE 1989 TRUST C U/A DTD 12/27/1989 FBO D CROWE, Defendant
No Logo CEDAR GROVE CEM ASSN PERP CARE RESERVE FUND, Defendant
No Logo CEDE & Co.,, Defendant
No Logo Celeste P. Scholaro, Defendant
No Logo CEMEX INC. MASTER TRUST, Defendant
No Logo Centra-Bernstein, Defendant
No Logo Central Pension Fund, Defendant
No Logo Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Defendant
No Logo CENTRAL STATES TEAMSTERS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David Andrew Rosenzweig +1 212 318 3035 +1 212 318 3400 drosenzweig@fulbright.com
No Logo CENTRAL TRUST & INVESTMENT CO, Defendant
No Logo CENTRASTATE MEDICAL CENTER, Defendant
No Logo CENTURION LONG TERM STRATEGIES OVERSEAS, LTD., Defendant
No Logo CENTURION LONG-TERM STRATEGIES OVERSEAS, LTD., Defendant
No Logo Cervurite Family LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Mary J. Hackett +1 412 288 3250 +1 412 288 3063 mhackett@reedsmith.com
No Logo CEY LIVING TRUST 5/14/87, Defendant
No Logo CFD AVERAGE PRICING STATISTICAL ARBITRAGE, Defendant
No Logo CHALFANT H FOR NANCY-MARITAL TR NO 1, Defendant
No Logo CHANDLER BIELOW AND ELIZABETH BIGELOW JTWROS, Defendant
No Logo Chandler Bigelow, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bouchard, Margules & Friedlander, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Joel E. Friedlander +1 302 573 3500 +1 302 573 3501 jfriedlander@bmf-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sperling & Slater PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Steven Craig Florsheim +1 312 641 3200 +1 312 641 6492 sflorsheim@sperling-law.com
Gregg R. Hague +1 312 641 3200 +1 312 641 6492 grh@sperling-law.com
Scott F. Hessell +1 312 641 3200 +1 312 641 6492 shessell@sperling-law.com
Claire Perona Murphy +1 312 641 3200 +1 312 641 6492 cmurphy@sperling-law.com
Daniel A. Shmikler +1 312 641 3200 +1 312 641 6492 dshmikler@sperling-law.com
Bruce S. Sperling +1 312 641 3200 +1 312 641 6492 bss@sperling-law.com
No Logo Chandler Camilla Frost, Defendant
No Logo CHANDLER TR/CYNTHIA C STRANGE; ANDREW F CHANDLER, Defendant
No Logo Chandler Trust No. 1, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Chandler Trust No. 2
No Logo Chandler Trust No. 2, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Chandler Trust No. 2
No Logo Chandler Trust No. 2 and Chandler Subtrusts, Defendant
No Logo CHANNING CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Polsinelli Shughart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jason A Nagi +1 212 993 6213 jnagi@polsinelli.com
No Logo CHANNING CAPITAL MGT LLC A/C CALSTRS, Defendant
No Logo CHANNING CAPITAL MGT LLC A/C CHURCH PENSION FUND, Defendant
No Logo CHANNING CAPITAL MGT LLC A/C COOK COUNTY RET BOARD, Defendant
No Logo CHANNING CAPITAL MGT LLC A/C FASKEN LTD, Defendant
No Logo CHANNING CAPITAL MGT LLC A/C MID CAP VALUE SUDAN FREE, Defendant
No Logo CHANNING CAPITAL MGT LLC A/C NEW YORK STATE COMMON RET, Defendant
No Logo CHANNING CAPITAL MGT LLC A/C NOR25479, Defendant
No Logo CHANNING CAPITAL MGT LLC A/C POLICEMENS ANNUITY & BNFT, Defendant
No Logo CHANNING CAPITAL MGT LLC A/C PUBLIC SCHOOL TEACH PEN RE, Defendant
No Logo CHARI FAMILY TRUST UAD 1/18/01, Defendant
No Logo CHARLENE FROST TRUST, Defendant
No Logo Charles & Elizabeth Clarke Trust U.A. DTD 01/03/1994, Defendant
No Logo CHARLES & ELIZABETH CLARKE TRUST U/A DTD 01/03/1994, Defendant
No Logo CHARLES & NELL NOBIS TR U/A DTD 04/05/1995, Defendant
No Logo Charles & Nell Nobis Trust U/A DTD 04/05/1995, Defendant
No Logo Charles A. Garcia Trust Under Agreement Dated September 29, 1992, Defendant
No Logo CHARLES C WELLS, Defendant
No Logo CHARLES E EDWARDS FAMILY TRUST, U/A DTD 04/11/1990 (SUB ACCT MLI), Defendant
No Logo CHARLES E WINDSORMSSB, Defendant
No Logo CHARLES E. COLE, Defendant
No Logo CHARLES E. HUGEL, Defendant
No Logo CHARLES FRIEDMAN, Defendant
No Logo CHARLES GOTTFRIED U/A DTD 03/03/1969, Defendant
No Logo CHARLES J SALEMI LIV TRUST U/A DTD 08/02/2002, Defendant
No Logo CHARLES L. EDWARDS IRA R/O, Defendant
No Logo CHARLES M. DAVIS MARITAL TRUST 2 UNDER AGREEMENT DATED 11-27-1984 AS AMENDED, Defendant
No Logo Charles Pratt & Company LLC, Defendant
No Logo CHARLES R DILL AND MARILYN C DILL, Defendant
No Logo Charles R. Baugh, Defendant
No Logo CHARLES R. BAUGH, JR AND BARBARA BAUGH, Defendant
No Logo CHARLES ROTHERS TR UA 5/11/89, Defendant
No Logo CHARLES S. PAIGE AND DIANNA L. PAIGE, Defendant
No Logo CHARLES S. SMITH, Defendant
No Logo CHARLES SCHWAB & CO INC, CUSTODIAN, AND LAWRENCE F KLIMA, BENEFICIARY, LAWRENCE F KLIMA IRA ROLLOVER, Defendant
Charles Schwab & Company, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Charles Schwab INV. MGT. CO
No Logo Charles Schwab Investment Management, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Charles Stoddard IRR Trust UA, Defendant
No Logo CHARLES STOTTLEMYER TRUST UA DTD 04/15/82, Defendant
No Logo CHARLES T BRUMBACK JR AND KIMBERLY C BRUMBACK, Defendant
No Logo CHARLES T MARTIN, Defendant
No Logo Charles T. and Mary Howe Brumback Descendants Trust, Defendant
No Logo Charles T. Martin, Defendant
No Logo Charles T. Ruppman 1994 Trust Dated 3-18-94, Defendant
No Logo CHARLES VANOLE AND BETTY VANOLE, Defendant
No Logo Charles W. Hammond Trust, Defendant
No Logo Charles Weinberg, Defendant
No Logo CHARLEY CHUNYU LU & BIYING ZHANG COMM PROP, Defendant
No Logo CHARLOTTE BRODER REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST, Defendant
No Logo CHARLOTTE CASTLE NEAL U/A DTD 10/31/2000, Defendant
No Logo CHARLOTTE O'BRIEN, Defendant
No Logo CHARLOTTE PIPE & FOUNDRY PENSION LARGE CAP EQUITIES, Defendant
No Logo Chart & Co, Defendant
No Logo Charter Partners LP, Defendant
No Logo CHARTER TRUST, Defendant
No Logo CHARTER TRUST COMPANY, Defendant
No Logo Charter Trust Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Charter Trust Company
No Logo CHASE FAMILY TRUST #2 U/A DTD 02/21/1997, Defendant
No Logo CHAU LAM, Defendant
No Logo Cheatham Martial Trust DTD 1-23-88, Defendant
No Logo CHEETAH + CO, Defendant
No Logo Chemtura Corporation Master Retirement Trust, Defendant
No Logo CHERBONNIER TRUST FOR LESLEY; WILLIAM S KNOWLES, Defendant
No Logo CHERCHEZ LA LOI LLC, Defendant
No Logo CHERRY JACKSON SVEEN, Defendant
No Logo CHERRY SUE JACKSON, Defendant
No Logo CHERYL ANN GOKE TR UA 12-16-1996, Defendant
No Logo Cheryl L. Murray, Defendant
No Logo CHERYL R FOX, Defendant
No Logo Cheryl R. Fox, Defendant
No Logo CHESTER S CAIN, Defendant
No Logo CHEUK W YUNG, Defendant
No Logo Chicago Community Foundation, Defendant
No Logo CHICAGO TEACHERS PENSION FUND, Defendant
No Logo CHICAGO TRIBUNE FOUNDATION, Defendant
No Logo CHINESE NATIONAL COUNCIL FOR SOCIAL SECURITY FUND, Defendant
No Logo CHRIS CARPENTER, Defendant
No Logo CHRISTI DASHER, Defendant
No Logo CHRISTIAN SCHOOL PENSION AND TRUST FUND, Defendant
No Logo CHRISTIANA CARE UNRESTRICTED INVESTED FUND, Defendant
No Logo Christiana Care Health Services Investment Fund, Defendant
No Logo CHRISTIANA CARE HEALTH SERVICES RET. PLAN, Defendant
No Logo Christiana Care Health, Services, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Christiana Care Unrestricted Investment Fund, Defendant
No Logo CHRISTIANA L O'CONNOR TRUST, Defendant
No Logo CHRISTIANA MONSON, Defendant
No Logo CHRISTIE ROBERTS, Defendant
No Logo CHRISTINE E. SMITH, Defendant
No Logo CHRISTINE FITZSIMONS 2004 TST U/A DTD 08/26/2004, Defendant
No Logo CHRISTOPHER E. GATES, Defendant
No Logo CHRISTOPHER F. BADER AND MICHELE M. BADER JTWROS, Defendant
No Logo CHRISTOPHER J APPLEBY TRUST U/A DTD 12/13/1989, Defendant
No Logo Christopher Lindblad, Defendant
No Logo CHRISTOPHER LINDBLAD, CHRIS LINDBLAD REVOCABLE TRUST U/A/D 04/20/2000, Defendant
No Logo CHRISTOPHER POPE, Defendant
No Logo Christopher Reyes, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Christopher Reyes
No Logo Christus Health, Defendant
No Logo CHRISTUS HEALTH OPERATING FUND LCV, Defendant
No Logo CHRYSLER LCC, Defendant
No Logo CHURCH CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC, Defendant
No Logo CHURCH PENSION FUND, Defendant
No Logo CHW FUNDED DEPRECIATION, Defendant
No Logo CHW RETIREMENT TRUST, Defendant
No Logo CHW SELF INSURANCE, Defendant
No Logo CHW WORKERS COMPENSATION, Defendant
No Logo Cibc, Defendant
No Logo CIBC GLOBAL EQUITY FUND, Defendant
No Logo CIBC POOLED U.S EQUITY S&P 500 INDEX FUND, Defendant
No Logo CIBC TRUST CORPORATION, Defendant
No Logo Cibc World Markets Corporation, Defendant
No Logo CIC, Defendant
No Logo CICONIA CO LLC, A PARTNERSHIP, Defendant
Cigna Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jorden Burt LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Raul Antonio Cuervo +1 202 295 6505 +1 202 965 8104 rac@jordenusa.com
Edmund John Zaharewicz +1 305 347 6932 +1 305 372 9928 ejz@jordenusa.com
No Logo CIM XVI LLC, Defendant
No Logo CINDY L SCHREUDER, Defendant
No Logo CIRI GILLESPIE, Defendant
No Logo CITADEL DERIVATIVES GROUP LLC, Defendant
No Logo Citadel Equity Fund Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Citadel Equity Fund Ltd. Secondary Issue Account, Defendant
No Logo Citadel Limited Partnership, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Citadel Limited Partnership
No Logo CITIBANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, in it's individual and custodial capacities, Defendant
Citigroup Management Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Citigroup Global Markets, Inc.
No Logo Citigroup Global Markets Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Citigroup Pension Plan, Defendant
No Logo City Employees' Retirement System of the City of Los Angeles, Defendant
No Logo City National Bank, Defendant
No Logo City of Atlanta General Employees Pension Fund, Defendant
No Logo City of Atlanta Police Officers Pension Fund, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
John W. Weiss +1 212 210 9412 +1 212 210 9444 john.weiss@alston.com
No Logo CITY OF ATLANTA POLICE OFFICERS PENSION FUND LCV, Defendant
No Logo CITY OF ATLANTA POLICE OFFICERS' PENSION FUND, Defendant
No Logo CITY OF ATLANTA, GENERAL EMPLOYEES PENSION FUND, Defendant
No Logo City of Boynton Beach General, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goren Cherof Doody & Ezrol PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Brian Jeffrey Sherman +1 954 771 4500 +1 954 771 4923 bsherman@cityatty.com
No Logo City of Cincinnati, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Assistant City Solicitor - 1

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Robert Louis Weiser +1 513 352 3626 +1 513 352 1515 robert.weiser@cincinnati-oh.gov
No Logo City of Contra Costa Employees Retirement System, Defendant
No Logo CITY OF DAYTONA BEACH POLICE AND FIRE PENSION, Defendant
No Logo City of Daytona Police and Fire Pension, Defendant
No Logo City of Gainesville Police Officers' and Firefighters Retirement Plan, Defendant
No Logo CITY OF JACKSONVILLE POLICE AN, Defendant
No Logo City of Los Angeles Fire and Police Pension Plan, Defendant
No Logo City Of Memphis, Defendant
No Logo City of Philadelphia Public Employees, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Archer & Greiner, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Stephen Michael Packman +1 609 795 2121 +1 609 795 0574 spackman@archerlaw.com
No Logo CITY OF RICHMOND - RSRS, Defendant
No Logo CITY OF RICHMOND LCV, Defendant
No Logo City of Richmond, Virginia, Defendant
No Logo CITY OF SANTA BARBARA EMP RET, Defendant
No Logo City of St. Louis ERS LCV, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Armstrong Teasdale LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Steven N. Cousins +1 314 621 5070 +1 314 621 5065 scousins@armstrongteasdale.com
No Logo CITY OF STAMFORD CLASSIFIED EMP. RET FUND, Defendant
No Logo civilian Employees Retirement System of Kansas City, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cross & Simon, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Michael Joseph Joyce +1 302 777 4200 +1 302 777 4224

Toggle Switch Represented by Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Richard Edward Rosberger +21253 050 00x5729 +1 212 822 5729 rrosberger@milbank.com
No Logo Civilian Employees' Retirement System of the Police Department of Kansas City, Missouri, Defendant
No Logo Civilian ERS of K.C. Missouri LCV, Defendant
No Logo CLARA BUSCH ORTHWEIN IRREVOCABLE TRUST, Defendant
No Logo CLARE ATTWELL GLASSELL, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS THE BENEFICIARY OF THE CLARE ATTWELL GLASSELL CONTINUING MARITAL TRUST, Defendant
No Logo CLARENCE G PETERSEN, Defendant
No Logo Clarence G. Petersen, Defendant
No Logo CLARENCE J SEMLER TR U/A; DORIS SEMLER, Defendant
No Logo CLARETIAN MISSIONARIES WESTERN PROVINCE INC, Defendant
No Logo Claudia Barclay, Defendant
No Logo CLAUDIA BROWN, Defendant
No Logo CLAUDIA F GASPARINI, Defendant
No Logo Claudia F. Gasparini, Defendant
No Logo Clayton County Employees Retirement System, Defendant
No Logo Clayton County Georgia, Defendant
No Logo Clear Cove Capital LP, Defendant
No Logo Clearview Correspondent Services, Defendant
No Logo Clearwater Growth Fund, Defendant
No Logo Clearwater Investment Trust, Defendant
No Logo CLERICAL MEDICAL INVESTMENT GROUP LIMITED, Defendant
No Logo CLERICAL MEDICAL MANAGED FUNDS LIMITED, Defendant
No Logo CLEVELAND BAKERS & TEAMSTERS PENSION FUND LCV, Defendant
No Logo CLINTON CHAN, Defendant
No Logo CLOSE, PROGRAM GUARANTEED, Defendant
No Logo CLOSED FUNDS, Defendant
No Logo CLW TRUST FBO ARTHUR MCKENNY, Defendant
No Logo CMA CAPITAL PARTNERS FUND GU IG MARKETS, Defendant
No Logo CMCJL LLC, Defendant
No Logo Cna Financial Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
CNA Financial Corporation
No Logo CNH MASTER ACCOUNT L.P., Defendant
No Logo CNH Partners, LLC, Defendant
No Logo CNI CHARTER FUNDS, Defendant
No Logo CNTY EMPL ANNTY&BEN FND COOK CNTY, Defendant
No Logo CO TA NELSON BARNES FBO JENNIFER; ROBERT A BERGHOFF, Defendant
No Logo CO TR U/W K/J NEWBOLD - PPA-LCC; MARIAMNE M RUBLEE, Defendant
No Logo CO TUW ISABELLE COCHRAN FBO INA, Defendant
No Logo CO TUW JAMES W MACDONALD JR RES; CONSTANCE K KOENIG, Defendant
No Logo CO VALUE EQUITY, Defendant
No Logo Co-Exec Est of Ronald Williams, Defendant
No Logo CO-TUW S R BLACKWOOD FBO MATTHEW; TERENCE R BLACKWOOD, Defendant
No Logo Coastview Equity Partners LP, Defendant
No Logo Cobalt Trading LLC, Defendant
No Logo COFFEY BERTHA FBO B COFFEY HOYT-TR, Defendant
No Logo COGENT INVESTMENT STRATEGIES , LLC, Defendant
No Logo Cogent Investment Strategies Fund, SPC-Class D, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Robert William Gottlieb +1 212 940 8800 +1 212 935 8405 robert.gottlieb@kattenlaw.com
No Logo COGENT INVESTMENT STRATEGIES MASTER FUND SPC-MADISON STREET, Defendant
No Logo Cogent Management Inc., Defendant
No Logo COHENS FAM REV LIV TRUST, Defendant
No Logo COLBY BARTON COOK UCAUTMA, Defendant
No Logo COLE-CROWN FAMILY FOUNDATION, INC F/K/A JEROME AND ILLENE COLE FOUNDATION, Defendant
No Logo Cole-Crown Family Foundation, Inc. f/k/a Jerome and Ilene Cole Foundation, Defendant
No Logo Coli Pooled S & P 500, Defendant
No Logo COLIN T KERR TRUST U/A DTD 09/02/1977, Defendant
No Logo COLIN THOMAS KERR, Defendant
No Logo COLLECTIVE INVESTMENT TR FOR EE BENEFIT PLANS, Defendant
No Logo Collective Trust Of The Bank Of New York, Defendant
No Logo COLLECTORS FUND LP, Defendant
No Logo COLLEGE OF THE OZARKS LCV, Defendant
No Logo College of the Ozarks, LSV Equity Acct, Defendant
No Logo College Retirement Equities Fund, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COLLEGE RETIREMENT EQUITIES FUND
No Logo COLLEGE RETIREMENT EQUITIES FUND - EQUITY INDEX ACCOUNT, Defendant
No Logo COLLEGE RETIREMENT EQUITIES FUND - GLOBAL EQUITIES ACCOUNT, Defendant
No Logo COLLEGE RETIREMENT EQUITIES FUND - SOCIAL CHOICE ACCOUNT, Defendant
No Logo COLLEGE RETIREMENT EQUITIES FUND - STOCK ACCOUNT, Defendant
No Logo COLLEGE RETIREMENT EQUITIES FUND -STOCK ACCOUNT, Defendant
No Logo COLLEGE RETIREMENT EQUITIES FUND-EQUITY INDEX ACCOUNT, Defendant
No Logo Colleges of Applied Arts and Technology Pension Plan, Defendant
No Logo COLLER HOLDINGS, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Colorado Business Bank, Defendant
No Logo Colorado Public Employees' Retirement Association, Defendant
No Logo COLUMBIA LARGE CORE QUANTITATIVE FUND, Defendant
No Logo COLUMBIA LARGE CORE QUANTITATIVE FUND F/K/A RIVERSOURCE LARGE CAP EQUITY FUND, Defendant
No Logo COLUMBIA LC INDX (MERGED INTO COLUMBIA LARGE CORE QUANTITATIVE FUND), Defendant
No Logo COLUMBIA ORTHOPAEDIC GROUP PSP FBO R D CARTER, Defendant
No Logo COLUMBIA STRATEGIC ALLOCATION FUND, Defendant
No Logo COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY LCV, Defendant
No Logo COMERICA 500 INDEX FUND - EB, Defendant
No Logo Comerica, Defendant
No Logo Comerica Bank, Defendant
No Logo COMERICA LARGECAP INDEX - EB, Defendant
No Logo COMERICA LARGECAP VALUE INDEX - EB, Defendant
No Logo COMERICA TOTAL US EQUITY INDEX FD. 584, Defendant
No Logo COMMERSE BANK, N.A., Defendant
No Logo Commerz Markets LLC, Defendant
No Logo COMMERZBANK CAPITAL MARKETS, Defendant
No Logo Commonwealth of PA Public School Employee' Retirement System, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Commonwealth of PA Public School Employees' Retirement System

Toggle Switch Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Charles Mikell Hart +1 856 874 4275 +1 215 405 2548 chart@duanemorris.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Commonwealth of PA Public School Employee' Retirement System (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Commonwealth of PA Public School Employee' Retirement System
No Logo COMMONWEALTH OF PA TOBACCO SETTLEMENT INVESTMENT BOARD, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Chief Counsel's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Joshua Jordan Vecchio +1 717 720 7317 +1 717 772 3103 jovecchio@pa.gov
No Logo COMMONWEALTH OF PA TREASURY DEPARTMENT FUNDS, Defendant
No Logo COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC SCHOOL EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, Defendant
No Logo Commonwealth of Pennsylvania Public School Employees' Retirement System, Defendant
No Logo COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA TUITION ACCOUNT PROGRAM FUND, Defendant
No Logo COMMUNITY FOUNDATION OF SARASOTA COUNTY CORPORATE ENDOWMENT FDN, Defendant
No Logo COMMUNITY FOUNDATION OF SARASOTA COUNTY TRUST ENDOWMENT FUND, Defendant
No Logo COMMUNITY FOUNDATION OF WESTERN NORTH CAROLINA, Defendant
No Logo Community Insurance Company, Defendant
No Logo Community of Christ Church LCV, Defendant
No Logo Compass Bank, NA, Defendant
No Logo Computershare Trust Co., N.A., Defendant
No Logo COMSUMERS ENERGY COMPANY, Defendant
No Logo Conair Corporation, Defendant
No Logo CONCENTRATED ALPHA PARTNERS LP, Defendant
No Logo Concentrated Alpha PTN LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Concentrated Alpha PTN LP
No Logo CONFIDENTAL CLIENT, Defendant
No Logo CONNABLE OFFICE, INC, Defendant
No Logo Connecticut General Life Insurance Company, Defendant
No Logo Connecticut Health Foundation, Defendant
No Logo Connecticut Health Foundation LCV, Defendant
No Logo Connell Family Partnership Trust, Defendant
No Logo CONRAD C AND SUE C FINK, Defendant
No Logo Conrad C. Fink, Defendant
No Logo CONSEILLER MANAGED FUND LIMITED, Defendant
No Logo CONSERVATIVE BALANCED PORTFOLIO A SERIES OF PRUDENTIAL SERIES FN INC, Defendant
No Logo Conservative Balanced Portfolio, a Series of the Prudential Series Fund, Inc, Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison Of Ny, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Consolidated Edison of NY
No Logo Consolidated Edison Retirement Plan, Defendant
No Logo CONSTANCE TOLBERT YESO, Defendant
No Logo CONSTANCE W SCHNUCK REV TRUST U/A DTD 12-15-93, Defendant
No Logo Consumers Energy Company, Defendant
No Logo CONSUMERS FINANCIAL SVC OF UNION CT, Defendant
No Logo Convertibles Strategic Hold, Defendant
No Logo Con-way, Defendant
No Logo COOK COUNTY OFFICERS AND EMPLOYEES, Defendant
No Logo COOK COUNTY PENSION FUND, Defendant
No Logo Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank BA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller & Wrubel, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Nicholas Cutaia +1 212 336 3500 +1 212 336 3555 ncutaia@mw-law.com
No Logo COPPER NUGGET, INC. (PLEDGED), Defendant
No Logo COPPOLA FAMILY TRUST U/A DTD 11/27/2001, Defendant
No Logo Corbitt R. Fleming, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Blechman Woltz & Kelly PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Robyn Hylton Hansen +1 757 873 8000
No Logo CORINNE CHANDLER WERDEL TST NO. 1 GST NON-EXEMPT QUA, Defendant
No Logo Corporate Service Company, Defendant
No Logo CORRIE NORRIS WHITE, Defendant
No Logo CORTESE/MOGAVEROJV, Defendant
No Logo COSMOPOLITAN INVESTMENT FUND, Defendant
No Logo COUNTRY CLUB BANK, Defendant
No Logo COUNTY EMPLOYEES' AND OFFICERS' ANNUITY AND BENEFIT FUND OF COOK COUNTY, Defendant
No Logo COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES SAVINGS, Defendant
No Logo Coutts EIP US Equity Index BGI, AIB BNY, Defendant
No Logo Coutts US Equity Index Programme, Defendant
No Logo COX FAMILY EDUCATIONAL TRUST U/A DTD 08/02/2004, Defendant
No Logo CPITALIA AZIONARIO USA C/O CAPITALIA AM SGR SPA C/O UNICREDIT S.P.A. (PIONEER INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT SGRPA), Defendant
No Logo CRAIG BRIMICOMBE, Defendant
No Logo Craig Brimicombe, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Blish & Cavanagh, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Mary C. Dunn +8318 831 831 8900 +7517 751 751 7542 mcd@blishcavlaw.com
No Logo CRAIG G FOR K KNIGHT, Defendant
No Logo Craig P Williamson Rev Trust U/A DTD 05/16/2006, Defendant
No Logo CRAIG P. EMMONS, TR U/A FBO CRAIG P EMMONS, Defendant
No Logo CRAIG W DOUGHERTY, Defendant
No Logo Craig W. Dougherty, Defendant
No Logo Crane Asset Management LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Crane Asset Management LLC
No Logo CRANE CO MASTER TRUST, Defendant
No Logo Crane H Kenney, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Crane H. Kenney
No Logo CRANE KENNEY, Defendant
No Logo CRAWFORD COMPANY LLC, Defendant
No Logo Credit Agicole Securities (USA) Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Credit Agricole Securities
No Logo CREDIT AGRICOLE CORP. & INVESTMENT BANK, Defendant
No Logo CREDIT INDUSTRIEL ET COMMERCIAL, Defendant
Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Defendant
No Logo Credit Suisse (Luxembourg) SA, Defendant
No Logo Credit Suisse First Boston, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Credit Suisse First Boston Intl.

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Credit Suisse First Boston (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
CREDIT SUISSE FIRST BOSTON
No Logo CREDIT SUISSE FIRST BOSTON EUROPE LTD, Defendant
No Logo CREDIT SUISSE INTERNATIONAL (DEALER), Defendant
No Logo Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Defendant
No Logo CROW REALTY INVESTORS, LP, Defendant
No Logo CS ZURICH, Defendant
No Logo CSAA IIB AUTOBANK RETIREMENT PLAN, Defendant
No Logo CSS, LLC (AN ILLINOIS LLC), Defendant
CSX Corporation, Defendant
No Logo CTC FUND MANAGEMENT, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo CTC MASTER FUND LTD, Defendant
No Logo CTC MASTER FUND, LTD., Defendant
No Logo CTS Corporation Master Retirement Trust, Defendant
No Logo CTUW E WILLIAMSON - JEAN #2; JOHN D WILLIAMSON JR, Defendant
No Logo CTUW E WILLIAMSON - JOHN #2; JOHN D WILLIAMSON JR, Defendant
No Logo CTUW E WILLIAMSON - MARY #3; JOHN D WILLIAMSON JR, Defendant
No Logo CTUW GEO G WEINMANN NGS DOM EQ; GEORGE G WEINMANN, Defendant
No Logo Curators Of The University Of Missouri, Defendant
No Logo CURATORS OF UNV MO AS TRUSTEE UNV MO RET DSBLTY & DTH BEN PL, Defendant
No Logo Cust E H Oppenheimer TR, Defendant
No Logo Cust E. H. Oppenheimer TR, Defendant
No Logo CUST EDWARD E NEISSER MARITAL TRUST, Defendant
No Logo CUST NEISSER INVESTMENT LP, Defendant
No Logo Custodial Trust Co., Defendant
No Logo CUSTOMER FRIENDLY CREATIONS, Defendant
No Logo Cutler Group LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Cutler Group LP
No Logo Cutler Group, LP, Defendant
No Logo CYMI Equity LP, Defendant
No Logo Cynthia Baker, Defendant
No Logo CYNTHIA BLOOMGARDEN U/A DTD 12/27/2002, Defendant
No Logo Cynthia Harris S G TR 6/13/45, Defendant
No Logo Cynthia M. Brown, Defendant
No Logo D E Shaw Valence Portfolio LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
D E Shaw Valence Portfolio LLC
No Logo D. JEFFREY SWINSON, Defendant
No Logo D.A DAVIDSON & CO, Defendant
No Logo D.C. Retirement Board, Defendant
No Logo D.C. RETIREMENT FD/ALLIANCE, Defendant
No Logo D.e. Shaw & Company, LP, Defendant
No Logo D.e. Shaw & Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo D.E. Shaw Valence Portfolios LLC-Broad Core, Defendant
No Logo Daily News Tribune Inc., Defendant
No Logo DaimlerChrysler Corporation, Defendant
No Logo DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORP. VEBA LCV, Defendant
No Logo DALLAS POLICE AND FIRE PENSION SYSTEM, Defendant
No Logo DALTON TRUST AGREEMENT, U/A DTD 10/03/2007, Defendant
No Logo DAN MURPHY FOUNDATION, Defendant
No Logo DANA CORPORATION PENSION PLANS TRUST, Defendant
No Logo DANIEL A MCCAUGHNA, Defendant
No Logo DANIEL A SMITH, Defendant
No Logo DANIEL AND SUSAN JOSEPH, Defendant
No Logo DANIEL B. OLDMAN, Defendant
No Logo DANIEL COHEN, Defendant
No Logo DANIEL COHEN AND BARRIE A. KASS, Defendant
No Logo Daniel E. Geller Trust U/A/D 07/19/2006, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Koehler Neal LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
James F. Koehler +1 216 539 9370 +1 216 916 4369 jkoehler@koehlerneal.com
Phillip Wesley Lambert +1 216 539 9370 +1 216 916 4369 wlambert@koehlerneal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Collins, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Curtis Victor Trinko +1 212 490 9550 +1 212 986 0158 ctrinko@gmail.com
No Logo Daniel G Kazan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Daniel G. Kazan

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaye Scholer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jason Jerod Ben +1 312 583 2379 +1 312 583 2579 jben@kayescholer.com
Alan Norris Salpeter +1 312 784 8088 +1 312 706 8675 asalpeter@dl.com
Sheldon L. Solow +1 312 583 2320 +1 312 583 2520
No Logo DANIEL G PREZEMBEL, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Williston, McGibbon & Kuehn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Robert Oscar Kuehn +1 847 381 4797 +1 847 381 4789 rok@wmklaw.com
No Logo DANIEL G VOLKMANN III REV TR 3/7/03, Defendant
No Logo Daniel G. Prezembel, Defendant
No Logo DANIEL H RENBERG, Defendant
No Logo Daniel H. Bayly, Defendant
No Logo DANIEL J FABIAN, Defendant
No Logo DANIEL J HILLARY, Defendant
No Logo DANIEL J SHEA, Defendant
No Logo DANIEL J ZWEIG AND BETH L ZWEIG, Defendant
No Logo DANIEL J. COLLINS, Defendant
No Logo Daniel J. Fabian, Defendant
No Logo DANIEL J. GREENBLATT IRR LIV T U/A DTD 12/11/2003, Defendant
No Logo Daniel J. Greenblatt IRR. LIV. Trust, Defendant
No Logo Daniel Joseph, Defendant
No Logo DANIEL K KUDO, Defendant
No Logo DANIEL L O CONNOR TRUST (PLDG); DANIEL L O'CONNOR, Defendant
No Logo DANIEL OPAT ET AL, U/A DTD 08/31/2006, Defendant
No Logo Daniel Osorio, Defendant
No Logo DANIEL R. REESE, Defendant
No Logo DANIEL S JURSA, Defendant
No Logo DANIEL S. GREGORY, Defendant
No Logo DANIEL S. JURSA IRA FBO DANIEL S. JURSA PTC AS CUSTODIAN ROLLOVER ACCOUNT, Defendant
No Logo DANIEL WHITNEY YOUNG GIFT TRUST, Defendant
No Logo Danske Bank, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Danske Bank
No Logo DARBY J DOUGLAS FOR JAMES REM TR, Defendant
No Logo DARELL F KUENZLER, Defendant
No Logo Darell F. Kuenzler IRA, Defendant
No Logo Darrell F. Kuenzel IRA, Defendant
No Logo DARRIN MARITAL TRUST, Defendant
No Logo DARYL V DICHEK, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith & Hennessey PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Geoffrey Paul Knudsen +1 206 292 1770 +1 206 292 1790 gknudsen@smithhennessey.com
No Logo DAVENPORT & CO LLC, Defendant
No Logo DAVID & LOIS LIEBERMAN TR SL-237, CUSTODIAN, Defendant
No Logo DAVID & TEDDI BAGGINS TR 7E-124, CUSTODIAN, Defendant
No Logo DAVID A DICHEK, Defendant
No Logo DAVID B LEICHENGER, Defendant
No Logo DAVID C DE SIEYES, Defendant
No Logo DAVID C. TWICHELL, Defendant
No Logo David D Grumhaus, Defendant
No Logo DAVID D GRUMHAUS 1990 TRUST U/A DTD 03/26/1990, Defendant
No Logo DAVID D GRUMHAUS III TRUST UAD 12/23/95, Defendant
No Logo DAVID D. AND CYNTHIA M. BROWN, Defendant
No Logo David D. Brown, Defendant
No Logo David D. Grumhaus 1990 Trust;, Defendant
No Logo David D. Williams, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David D. Williams
No Logo DAVID D. WILLIAMS AND SANDRA L. WILLIAMS JTWROS, Defendant
No Logo David Dean Hiller, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David Dean Hiller
No Logo David E. Neisser Irrevocable Trust dated 8-14-83, Defendant
No Logo DAVID ERTEL AND BETH ERTEL, Defendant
No Logo DAVID F ANTHONY, Defendant
No Logo DAVID FRANK & MARESSA C FRANK TRUST HC 31 TR UA 12/13/89, Defendant
No Logo David Frank & Wayne C. Frank Trust UA 12/13/89 HC 31, Defendant
No Logo David Greenspahn, Defendant
No Logo DAVID GREENSPAHN TOD HERBERT GREENSPAHN, Defendant
No Logo DAVID H COFRIN TRUST, Defendant
No Logo DAVID H JACOBY, Defendant
No Logo David H. Jacoby, Defendant
No Logo DAVID HOCHBERG, Defendant
No Logo DAVID J EDWARDS, Defendant
No Logo DAVID J TROCCOLI AND JANICE E TROCCOLI, Defendant
No Logo David Jeff, Defendant
No Logo DAVID JEFF AND CARMELA SHAW, Defendant
No Logo DAVID L. NELSON, DAVID L. NELSON REVOCABLE TRUST 02/11/91 U-A, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by George H Bye Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Owen F. Monfils +1 920 435 5264 +1 920 435 0466 owenmonfi@aol.com
No Logo David Leichenger, Defendant
No Logo DAVID LEIGHTON TAYLOR REV. U/A/D 09-09-2004, Defendant
No Logo DAVID M BRUNS, Defendant
No Logo DAVID M JACOBS REVC LVG TST U/A DTD 05/08/90, Defendant
No Logo David M. Jacobs Revc LVG TST U/A DTD 05/08/90, Defendant
No Logo DAVID MAZZULLO, Defendant
No Logo DAVID P. MILLER, Defendant
No Logo DAVID S MORRISON, Defendant
No Logo DAVID S ROSENBERG AND CYNTHIA ROSENBERG, Defendant
No Logo DAVID S ROSENBERG CUST FOR ABBY R ROSENBERG UNDER THE IL UNIF TRSF TO MINORS ACT, Defendant
No Logo DAVID S ROSENBERG CUST FOR CARLY E ROSENBERG UNDER THE IL UNIF TRSF TO MINORS ACT, Defendant
No Logo DAVID SIU, Defendant
No Logo David T.K. Lu, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LU, DAVID T.K.
No Logo Day Family LLLP, Defendant
No Logo DB AG EQUITY SWAPS OFFSHORE CONSOLIDATED ACCOUNT I, Defendant
No Logo DBAG London, Defendant
No Logo DBAG London DB Alternative Trading Inc. A/C US Options, Defendant
No Logo DBAG London Ripley Index, Defendant
No Logo DBAG London Ripley SPX LNG-Auto, Defendant
No Logo DBAG London Ripley SPX SHT-Auto, Defendant
No Logo DBAG London SEF Swap Hedge Account, Defendant
No Logo DBAG Map Trading Account, Defendant
No Logo DBAG Maps Provident Advisors LLC, Defendant
No Logo DBAG Westchester Cap Mgmt Inc., Defendant
No Logo DBI FONDS HPT USV, Defendant
No Logo DBSO Securities Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
DBSO Securities LTD.
No Logo DBX RISK ARBITRAGE 7 FUND, Defendant
No Logo DE GROOT FAMILY TRUST, Defendant
No Logo DE PAUL UNIVERSITY, Defendant
No Logo DE SHAW OCULUS PORT LLC - US, Defendant
No Logo DE WERD TRUST U/A DTD 05/04/1998, Defendant
No Logo DEAN L. DAVENPORT, Defendant
No Logo DEAN P GILLESPIE, Defendant
No Logo DEANN K RILEY AND DAVID L RILEY, Defendant
No Logo DEBORAH FEDYNAK C/F, Defendant
No Logo DEBORAH L BRICE, Defendant
No Logo Deborah M. Nolan, Defendant
No Logo DEBORAH P GREEN, Defendant
No Logo DEBRA A. GASTLER, Defendant
No Logo Debra A. Gentine 2004 Revocable Trust U/A/D 06/16/2004, Defendant
No Logo DEBRA A. MARTHEY, Defendant
No Logo DEBRA ANN AURAND, Defendant
No Logo DEBRA CONTARINO AND THERESA KASLER, Defendant
No Logo DEBRA J HOLMES, Defendant
No Logo Deepak Agarwal, Defendant
No Logo Deephaven Capital Management, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Deephaven Capital Management

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Matthew Osborn Solum +1 212 446 4688 +1 212 446 6460 msolum@kirkland.com
No Logo DEEPHAVEN EVENT TRADING LTD., Defendant
No Logo Deephaven Growth Opportunities Trading Ltd., Defendant
No Logo DEEPHAVEN GROWTH OPPORTUNITIES TRADING, LTD., Defendant
No Logo DEERE & COMPANY LARGE CAP VALUE, Defendant
No Logo DEERE & COMPANY WELFARE BENEFIT TRUST #1, Defendant
No Logo Dekalb County, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dekalb County Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Mark Ashland Thompson +1 404 371 3056 +1 404 371 3024 mathompson@dekalbcountyga.gov
No Logo Del Mar Asset Management, LP, Defendant
No Logo Del Mar Master Fund, Defendant
No Logo DELAPLANTE FAMILY TRUST U/A DTD 07/27/96, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Collins, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Sean MacKenzie +1 310 321 8406 sean.b.mackenzie@gmail.com
No Logo DELAWARE CHARTER GUARANTEE TRUST COMPANY TR FBO THOMAS J BURKE JR IRA, Defendant
No Logo Deld Family Foundation TR UAD 9/30/02, Defendant
No Logo Delos Insurance Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Seward & Kissel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jack Yoskowitz +1 212 574 1200 +1 212 480 8421 yoskowitz@sewkis.com
No Logo DELOS INSURANCE COMPANY N/K/A IMPERIUM INSURANCE COMPANY, Defendant
No Logo DEMETRIOS G GEANON IRA, Defendant
No Logo DENISE MECK, Defendant
No Logo DENISE PALMER REVOCABLE TRUST U/A/D 10-28-1991, Defendant
No Logo Denise Palmer Revocable Trust U/A/D 10-28-1991, Denise E. Palmer, Trustee, Defendant
No Logo DENNIS E AND JOAN E THOMAS, Defendant
No Logo Dennis E. Thomas, Defendant
No Logo Dennis Eugene De Haas, Defendant
No Logo DENNIS FITZSIMONS TRUST U/A DTD 03/29/2001, Defendant
No Logo DENNIS J BRITT, Defendant
No Logo Dennis J Fitzsimmons, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Grippo & Elden LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Donald P. Bunnin +1 312 704 7757 +1 312 558 1195 docket@grippoelden.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Antranig N. Garibian +1 215 564 8000 agaribian@stradley.com
No Logo Dennis J Fitzsimons Trustee, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Dennis J Fitzsimons Trustee
No Logo DENNIS J LAYNE ROLLOVER IRA, Defendant
No Logo Dennis J. Britt, Defendant
No Logo DENNIS J. DREBSKY, Defendant
No Logo DENNIS J. LAYNE ROLLOVER IRA, Defendant
No Logo Dennis S. Bunder, Defendant
No Logo DENNIS W HETLER, Defendant
No Logo DEPAUL UNIV - LSV MGMT, Defendant
No Logo DEPFA BAMK PLC(HYPO REAL ESTATE BANK INT'L.), Defendant
No Logo Depfa Bank Plc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
DEPFA Bank PLC
No Logo DEQUESNE UNIVERSITY OF THE HOLY SPIRIT, Defendant
No Logo DERIVATIVES, EQUITY, Defendant
No Logo Deseret Trust Company, Defendant
No Logo DESJARDINS AMERICAN EQUITY VALUE, Defendant
No Logo Det Ed Qualified Nuclear Decommissioning Trust, Defendant
No Logo DETROIT FREE PRESS NESWPAPER GUILD LCV, Defendant
No Logo Detroit Medical Center Consolidated Pension Plan and Master Retirement Trust, Defendant
No Logo DETROIT MEDICAL CENTER INSURANCE, Defendant
No Logo DETROIT POLICEMAN AND FIREMAN RETIREMENT SYSTEM, Defendant
No Logo DEUTSCHE ASSET MANAGEMENT (SCUDDER), Defendant
No Logo DEUTSCHE BANK AG AMSTERDAM, Defendant
No Logo DEUTSCHE BANK AQRREV FAO AQR CAPITAL AQRREV, Defendant
No Logo Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Defendant
Deutsche Bank AG, Defendant
No Logo Deutsche Lufthansa Ag, Defendant
No Logo DEUTSCHE SHELL PENSIONEN TRUEHAND E.V., Defendant
No Logo Deutshe Bank Securities Inc., Defendant
No Logo DEVIN J MURPHY, Defendant
No Logo Dexia Bank, Defendant
No Logo Dexia Bank (Customer 's Account), Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Dexia Bank
No Logo DF MEDIA, Defendant
No Logo DFA Investment dimensions Group, Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
DFA Investment Dimensions Group, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Richard Beryl Levin +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 rlevin@cravath.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
KEITH R. DUTILL +1 215 564 8000 +1 610 640 1965 kdutill@stradley.com
NEAL ROBERT TROUM +1 215 564 8028 ntroum@stradley.com
No Logo DFA Investment Trust Company, Defendant
No Logo DFA U.S. CORE EQUITY FUND OF DIMENSIONAL FUNDS, Defendant
No Logo DFA U.S. VECTOR EQUITY FUND OF DIMENSIONAL FUNDS, Defendant
No Logo DFA US Vector Equity Fund of Dimensional Funds, Defendant
No Logo DFE Asset Mgmt, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ballard Spahr LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Marjorie Joan Peerce +1 212 223 0200 +1 212 223 1942 peercem@bssfny.com
No Logo DGAM HERITAGE ABSOLUTE RETURN MASTER FUND, Defendant
No Logo DIA MID CAP Value Portfolio, Defendant
No Logo Diamond Consolidated L.P., Defendant
No Logo Diamondback Capital Management, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Diamondback Capital Management
No Logo DIAMONDBACK MASTER FUND LTD., Defendant
No Logo DIAMONS FAMILY FOUNDATION, Defendant
No Logo DIANA L. BONVEGNA, Defendant
No Logo DIANA NEWELL TOD AND STEVEN R NEWELL, Defendant
No Logo DIANE BUCHANAN WILSEY, Defendant
No Logo DIANE D MURPHY, Defendant
No Logo Diane D Jones, Defendant
No Logo Diane Filippi, Defendant
No Logo DIANE SCLAFANI, Defendant
No Logo DICHEK FAMILY TRUST U/A 12/11/74, Defendant
No Logo Dictaphone Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Digel Family Investment Co. LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pullman & Comley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Adam S. Mocciolo +1 203 330 2128 +1 203 576 8888 amocciolo@pullcom.com
No Logo DII INDUSTRIES LLC ASBESTOS PI TRUST, Defendant
No Logo DILLON SMITH, Defendant
No Logo Dimensional Fund Advisors Inc., Defendant
No Logo DINA ALBRIGHT TR-TIMES MIRROR, Defendant
No Logo Diocese of Buffalo Lay Pension LCV, Defendant
No Logo DIOCESE OF TRENTON-PENSION FUND, Defendant
No Logo Direct Edge Ecn LLC, Defendant
No Logo DIRECT EGE ECN A-F FIRM TRADING ACCOUNT, Defendant
No Logo DIRECTOR'S GUILD OF AMERICA PRODUCER PENSION TRUST, Defendant
No Logo Direxion Funds, Defendant
No Logo DIREXION FUNDS TRUST (EVOLUTION ALL CAP EQUITY FUND), Defendant
No Logo DIREXION FUNDS TRUST (EVOLUTION LARGE CAP FUND), Defendant
No Logo Direxion Insurance Trust, Defendant
No Logo DISTRICT #9 IAMAW PENSION TRUST FD, Defendant
No Logo DISTRICT 1199J NEW JERSEY HEALTH CARE EMPLOYERS PENSION PLAN A/K/A DISTRICT 1199J NEW JERSEY HEALTH CARE EMPLOYERS PENSION FUND, Defendant
No Logo D & L Partners, LP, Defendant
No Logo DLD Family LLLP, Defendant
No Logo DLD Partners LP, Defendant
No Logo DMC INSURANCE CO. LTD. MASTER CUSTODY AGREEMENT, Defendant
No Logo DOCTORS PENSION FUND SERVICES STICHTING PENSIOENFUNDS VOOR HUISARTEN, Defendant
No Logo Dodge & Cox, Defendant
No Logo Does 1-25, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Does 1-25
No Logo Doheny Eye Institute, Defendant
No Logo DOLLSEY SEYMOUR RAPPORT UAD 5/6/88 FBO DANI Y ROZMAN, Defendant
No Logo DOLORES C. MIERKIEWICZ, Defendant
No Logo DOLORES H RUSS TRUST, Defendant
No Logo DOMINION NUCLEAR CONNECTICUT, QUAL NDT INVESTMENT POOL, Defendant
No Logo DOMINION RESOURCES RETIREMENT PLAN, Defendant
No Logo Dominion Resources, Inc. Defined Benefit Master Trust, Defendant
No Logo Don & Irene Baron Family Trust, Defendant
No Logo DON E CARTER, Defendant
No Logo Don H. Fellabaum, Jr., Defendant
No Logo DON P HAYN JR, Defendant
No Logo DONALD A AGRELLA AND ELEANOR T AGRELLA TRUST U/A/D 10-15-88, Defendant
No Logo DONALD B. PRELL, Defendant
No Logo DONALD BARON, Defendant
No Logo Donald Baron, As A Trustee of The Don & Irene Baron Family Trust 7B-251, Defendant
No Logo Donald C. Kraska, Defendant
No Logo DONALD CARL AND SHARRON LOUISE CRAMER, Defendant
No Logo Donald Carl Cramer, Defendant
No Logo DONALD CASPER TRUST U/A DTD 01/27/97, Defendant
No Logo DONALD E GOSS, Defendant
No Logo Donald E. Goss, Defendant
No Logo Donald Grenesko, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Donald Grenesko
No Logo Donald Grenesko and Marcia Grenesko, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Donald Grenesko and Marcia Grenesko
No Logo DONALD H NIEDERER, Defendant
No Logo DONALD H RUMSFELD BOARD ACCOUNT, Defendant
No Logo Donald Horwitz, Defendant
No Logo DONALD J. WIIKEN, Defendant
No Logo DONALD L MILLER TR U/A DTD 05/20/1982, Defendant
No Logo Donald L. Ross Trust, Defendant
No Logo Donald M Hinman, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Donald M. Hinman, Jr.
No Logo DONALD N BOYCE, Defendant
No Logo Donald N. Boyce, Defendant
No Logo DONALD R HARRIS LIVING TRUST UA DTD 8/25/2000, Defendant
No Logo Donald Rooney, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Franke Greenhouse, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Bethany Ann Johnson +1 303 623 4500 +1 303 623 0960 bjohnson@frankegreenhouse.com
No Logo Donald Rooney and Sara Rooney, Defendant
No Logo DONALD W WOODALL IRA R/O, Defendant
No Logo DONALD W. READETT, Defendant
No Logo DONN M. DAVIS, Defendant
No Logo DONN R AND PATRICIA ROBERTS, Defendant
No Logo Donn R. Roberts, Defendant
No Logo DONNA BARROWS, Defendant
No Logo DOREEN M KLIME REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST U/A DTD 06/13/2006, Defendant
No Logo Doris Duke Charitable Foundation, Defendant
No Logo DORIS E. LILLY IRA, Defendant
No Logo DORIS KEATS FRANK, TR UA 03/07/00 REVOCABLE TRUST, Defendant
No Logo DORIS SCHAFER, Defendant
No Logo Doroth Cahn, Defendant
No Logo Dorothy B Chandler Marital Trust No 2 UAD 06/26/35, Defendant
No Logo Dorothy B Chandler Residuary Trust No. 2, Defendant
No Logo Dorothy C. Patterson Irrev Trust #2 U/A/D 12-21-93, Defendant
No Logo Dorothy Cahn Trust, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
DOROTHY CAHN TRUST
No Logo DOROTHY CAHN, THE DOROTHY CAHN TRUST UAD 07/03/1981, Defendant
No Logo DOROTHY D SMITH TRUST U/A DTD 10/15/1980, Defendant
No Logo DOROTHY D. PARK, Defendant
No Logo DOROTHY DUNKLIN MARTING, Defendant
No Logo DOROTHY E. HINZE, Defendant
No Logo Dorothy Engberg, Defendant
No Logo DOROTHY L. DRUMMEY 2005 GRANTOR RETAINED ANNUITY TRUST U/A DTD 12/09/2005, Defendant
No Logo DOROTHY LEE INGEBRETSEN, Defendant
No Logo DOROTHY P O'DONNELL REVOCABLE U/A DTD 04/25/1983, Defendant
No Logo Dorothy Patterson Guardianship, Defendant
No Logo Dorothy Quaal Revocable Trust, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
DOROTHY QUAAL REVOCABLE TRUST
No Logo DOROTHY R MOOG FAMILY TRUST, Defendant
No Logo DOROTHY ROCKE TRUST U/A DTD 06/06/88, Defendant
No Logo Dorothy Rouse-Bottom, Defendant
No Logo DOROTHY RUSSELL SHATTUCK, Defendant
No Logo DOROTHY UPJOHN DALTON GRDCHILD, Defendant
No Logo Double Black Diamond, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Double Black Diamond Offshore Ltd.
No Logo DOUBLE BLACK DIAMOND OFFSHORE LDC, Defendant
No Logo Double Black Diamond Offshore Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Double Black Diamond Offshore Ltd.
No Logo DOUGLAS A. WARD, Defendant
No Logo DOUGLAS B STEWART, Defendant
No Logo DOUGLAS C. LANE ASSOCIATES, INC, Defendant
No Logo DOUGLAS E. KNEELAND AND BARBARA J. KNEELAND, Defendant
No Logo DOUGLAS H DITTRICK AND BARBARA S DITTRICK, Defendant
No Logo Douglas H Mccorkindale, Defendant
No Logo DOUGLAS J LUITEN DMD PC PSP U/A DTD 01/01/1996, Defendant
No Logo DOUGLAS L SMATHERS TRUST U/A DTD 04/12/2004, Defendant
No Logo DOUGLAS LEE MEYER AND STACEY MEYER, Defendant
No Logo DOUGLAS M. & JUDITH A LIGHT REV. TRUST, Defendant
No Logo DOUGLAS N DAFT, Defendant
No Logo DOUGLAS PAGE IRA, Defendant
No Logo Douglas R. Murray Advisory Agency, Defendant
No Logo DOUGLAS WILLIAM AND VICTORIA M. KING, Defendant
No Logo Douglas William King, Defendant
No Logo DOYLE D. MCMANUS, Defendant
No Logo DR CLARESA F ARMSTRONG TRUST U/A DTD 4/21/1983, Defendant
No Logo DR CLARESA F. M. ARMSTRONG, Defendant
No Logo DR PAUL I COHEN, Defendant
No Logo DR ROGR H JOHNSON, Defendant
No Logo Dr. Roger H. Johnson, Defendant
No Logo Dr. David L. Hoexter IRA R/O, Defendant
No Logo DR. JAMES E. HANNIGAN AND SUSAN M. HANNIGAN JTWROS, Defendant
No Logo DR. SALEH H. ALHUMAIDAN, Defendant
No Logo Drawbridge Global Macro, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Drawbridge Global Macro
No Logo DRAWBRIDGE GLOBAL MACRO MASTER FUND LTD - K, Defendant
No Logo DREMAN CONTRARIAN VALUE TRUST SERIES 3, Defendant
No Logo DRESDNER BANK AG (N/K/A COMMERZBANK AG), Defendant
No Logo Dresser-rand Company, Defendant
No Logo DREYFUS BSC S&P 500 ST INDX FD, Defendant
No Logo Dreyfus Index Funds, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Stephen Leonard Ratner +1 212 969 3000 +1 212 969 2900 sratner@proskauer.com
No Logo Dreyfus Premier Manager Funds II, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Stephen Leonard Ratner +1 212 969 3000 +1 212 969 2900 sratner@proskauer.com
No Logo Dreyfus Stock Index Funds, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Stephen Leonard Ratner +1 212 969 3000 +1 212 969 2900 sratner@proskauer.com
No Logo Dreyfus Variable Investment Funds, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Stephen Leonard Ratner +1 212 969 3000 +1 212 969 2900 sratner@proskauer.com
No Logo DRIVEN, EVENT, Defendant
No Logo DRS. BRUCE AND LEE FOUNDATION, Defendant
No Logo DSU, Defendant
No Logo DT BROAD MARKET STOCK INDEX FUND, Defendant
No Logo Dudley S. Taft, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Dudley S. Taft
No Logo Duff & Phelps LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Dykman & Wester, Llp +1 415 454 8545

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Duff & Phelps LLC (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Duff & Phelps, LLC
No Logo Duke Energy Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Duke Power Company Non-Qualified Equity Nuclear Decommissioning Trust, Defendant
No Logo DUNN INVESTMENT COMPANY PMP GROWTH, Defendant
No Logo Duquesne University, Defendant
No Logo Durham J Monsma, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Durham J. Monsma
No Logo DWP BANK, Defendant
No Logo DWS Equity 500 Index Portfolio, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
DWS Equity 500 Index Portfolio
No Logo DWS EQUITY 500 INDEX VIP, Defendant
No Logo DYE CHILDREN PARTNERSHIP, Defendant
No Logo Dynamic Domestic Fund LP, Defendant
No Logo E DONALD HEYMAN, Defendant
No Logo E L SANFORD CHILDREN/MASON, Defendant
No Logo E L WIEGAND FOUNDATION, Defendant
No Logo E*Trade Clearing LLC, Defendant
E*TRADE Group, Inc., Defendant
No Logo E*Trade S&P 500 Index Fund, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Douglas Paul Lobel +1 703 456 8000 +1 703 456 8100 dlobel@cooley.com
No Logo E-Connectivity AVG PX, Defendant
No Logo E. DOMINICK AND A. ANDREWS, JR. TRUST AGREEMENT DATED 10/02/90 F/B/O ELIZABETH M. DOMINICK, Defendant
No Logo E. Donald Heyman, Defendant
No Logo E.ON ENERGIE US VALUE (EBWFOND, Defendant
No Logo Eac Management Lp, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
EAC Management LP
No Logo EAC PARTNERS MASTER FUND LTD., Defendant
No Logo EAGLE TRADING COMPANY, Defendant
No Logo Earl E Crowe Trust No 2 UAD 06/26/35, Defendant
No Logo EARL W HUNTLEY FBO MELINDA, Defendant
No Logo EARL W HUNTLEY FBO PAMELA, Defendant
No Logo EAST LIVERPOOL RADIOLOGY ASSOC PROFIT SHARING PLAN & TRUST, Defendant
No Logo EASTERN BAND OF CHEROKEE INDIANS MINORS & INCOMPETENCE FUND, Defendant
No Logo Eastern Bank, Defendant
No Logo EATON VANCE CAPITAL GROWTH PORTFOLIO, Defendant
No Logo EATON VANCE MULTI CAP GROWTH PORTFOLIO, Defendant
No Logo EATON VANCE TAX MANAGED GLOBAL BUY-WRITE OPPORTUNITIES FUND, Defendant
No Logo Eaton Vance Tax Managed Growth Portfolio, Defendant
No Logo EATON VANCE TAX MANAGED MULTI-CAP GRROWTH PORTFOLIO, Defendant
No Logo ECF 1201 INDEX FUND LTD PARTNERSHIP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akerman Senterfitt LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Scott Michael Kessler +1 212 880 3874 +1 212 905 6411 scott.kessler@akerman.com
No Logo Echo Trade Llc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sadis & Goldberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Douglas R Hirsch +1 212 947 3793 +1 212 947 3796 dhirsch@sglawyers.com
No Logo Eclipse Funds, Inc., Defendant
No Logo ED BUCHSBAUM, Defendant
No Logo EDGAR COUNTY BANK AND TRUST COMP, Defendant
No Logo EDGAR D GIFFORD TRUST, Defendant
No Logo Edgar D. Gifford Trust, Defendant
No Logo EDGAR O JANNOTTA JR, REVOCABLE TRUST DATED 7/8/1993, Defendant
No Logo EDGAR O. JANNOTTA, Defendant
No Logo EDGAR O. JANNOTTA JR. REVOCABLE TRUST DATED 07/8/1993, Defendant
No Logo Edith A. Ehrlich, Defendant
No Logo Edith B Waterman, Defendant
No Logo EDITH C BRIZENDINE, Defendant
No Logo Edith C. Brizendine, Defendant
No Logo EDITH D. COFRIN TRUST, Defendant
No Logo EDMUND D. HAIGLER, JR, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Collins, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
WILLIAM G. BLASDEL, JR. +1 610 940 3903 +1 610 940 0843 WGBlasdel@gmail.com
No Logo EDMUND M. GOODHUE, Defendant
No Logo EDUCATIONAL TESTING SERVICE RETIREE MEDICAL BENEFITS PLAN, Defendant
No Logo EDWARD A. COX, JR REVOCABLE TRUST DTD 5/21/2004, Defendant
No Logo EDWARD B BYRD TRUST UAA 08/02/93, Defendant
No Logo Edward D. Jones & Company, LP, Defendant
No Logo Edward Gallagher, Defendant
No Logo Edward H. Matthei Trust U/A DTD 09/18/90, Defendant
No Logo EDWARD HOWELLS, Defendant
No Logo EDWARD J CAMPBELL TRUST U/A DTD 05/17/1994, Defendant
No Logo EDWARD J DELLIN, Defendant
No Logo EDWARD J SIDNEY TR UA 07/22/76, Defendant
No Logo EDWARD K NEWMAN REVOCABLE TRUST U/A/D 04-14-2005, Defendant
No Logo EDWARD S WOOLNER JR, Defendant
No Logo EDWARD STERLING WHITE, Defendant
No Logo EDWARD T MCGOWAN, Defendant
No Logo Edward T. McGowan, Defendant
No Logo EDWARDS WILDMAN PALMER LLP AS SUCCESSOR TO PALMER & DODGE LLP, Defendant
No Logo EDWIN J HAYES JR, U/A DTD 05/26/2006, Defendant
No Logo EDWIN R LABUZ, Defendant
No Logo Edwin R Labuz IRA, Defendant
No Logo EFFIE AND WOFFORD CAIN FOUNDATION, Defendant
No Logo Efg Bank European Financial Group, Defendant
No Logo EFH Retirement Plan Master Trust, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Ari M Berman +1 212 237 0228 +1 917 849 5368 aberman@velaw.com
Hilary L. Preston +1 212 237 0129 +1 212 237 0100 hpreston@velaw.com
Nikolay V Vydashenko +1 212 237 0023 +1 212 237 0100 nvydashenko@velaw.com
No Logo EGI-TRB, L.L.C., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Chris C. Gair +1 312 923 8339 +1 312 923 8439 cgair@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of EGI-TRB, L.L.C. (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
EGI-TRB, L.L.C.
No Logo EGI-TRB, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
EGI-TRB, L.L.C.
No Logo EHAB KHAUL KHALIFA, Defendant
No Logo EHSAN BOKHOUR, Defendant
No Logo Eighth District Electrical Pension Fund, Defendant
No Logo Eileen B Vaughan, Defendant
No Logo EILEEN B VAUGHAN AND ROBERT JOSEPH VAUGHAN, Defendant
No Logo Eileen S. Buckley, Defendant
No Logo ELAINE A MC INTOSH TRUST, Defendant
No Logo ELAINE A MC INTOSH, JAMES DOHERTY, LINDA BILEK & CAROL ELLIOTT TRUSTEES, Defendant
No Logo Elaine A McIntosh Trust, Defendant
No Logo Elaine A. McIntosh Trust, Defendant
No Logo ELAINE B WOOD REV TRUST U/A DTD 10/24/06, Defendant
No Logo Elaine T. Bovaird Trust U/A DTD 02/18/1993, Defendant
No Logo ELAINE W GETZ TRUST UA FEB 5 1986, Defendant
No Logo ELAINE W PETTIJOHN TR U/A 12/20/89, Defendant
No Logo ELDEN GUTWEIN, Defendant
No Logo ELEANOR A. KENYON, Defendant
No Logo Eleanor Jackson Stern Trust Dated 01/06/1971, Defendant
No Logo ELEANOR T AGRELLA TRUST, Defendant
No Logo Eleanor T. Agrella Trust, Defendant
No Logo Electrolux Home Products, Inc. Master Trust, Defendant
No Logo ELINOR P. BAKER TUW FBO CHARITIES, Defendant
No Logo ELIZABETH A NEAL DECLARATION OF TRUST 9/30/1999, Defendant
No Logo Elizabeth A. Neal Declaration of Trust 9/30/1999, Defendant
No Logo Elizabeth Ann Paley, Defendant
No Logo ELIZABETH COLE, Defendant
No Logo ELIZABETH DE CUEVAS, Defendant
No Logo ELIZABETH G CHAMBERLAIN TRUST U/A DTD 04/25/1979, Defendant
No Logo ELIZABETH H VANMERKENSTEIN, Defendant
No Logo Elizabeth J. Hand, Defendant
No Logo Elizabeth L'Engle Trust under the Will of Philip F. L'Engle, Defendant
No Logo ELIZABETH MIZE ELICKER REV TR-PL, Defendant
No Logo Elizabeth O. Kimberly, Defendant
No Logo Elizabeth Schellenger, Defendant
No Logo ELIZABETH SCHELLENGER T/U/D, Defendant
No Logo ELIZABETH SIEGEL, ACTING TRUSTEE OF THE BARBARA M. OSBORNE TRUST U/I/T DTD 2/7/05, Defendant
No Logo ELKHORN LLC, Defendant
No Logo ELL 2006 SZ-2 YEAR GRAT UAD 07-31-06, Defendant
No Logo Ella L. Morris Trust, Defendant
No Logo ELLEN DANAHER TULLY, Defendant
No Logo ELLEN J SUTTON, Defendant
No Logo ELLEN J TWADDELL, Defendant
No Logo ELLEN JACKSON, Defendant
No Logo ELLEN JOHNSON TWADDELL, Defendant
No Logo Ellen P Caputo, Defendant
No Logo Ellen Warren, Defendant
No Logo Elliott & Page Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Elliott Capital Mgmt, Defendant
No Logo ELLIOTT JAY & BARBARA E WAGNER FAMILY TRUST DTD 10/2/91, Defendant
No Logo ELLIOTT JAY WAGNEER, BARBARA E WAGNER FAMILY TRUST DTD 10/02/91, Defendant
No Logo Elmer H. Wavering Family Trust Dated 06/24/1977 as Amended, Defendant
No Logo Elmo C. Brooks, Defendant
No Logo Elsa Madrigal, Defendant
No Logo EMANUEL E. GUDULD 2005 FAMILY TRUST, Defendant
No Logo EMANUEL GRUSS, Defendant
No Logo Embarq Corporation, Defendant
No Logo EMBARQ CORPORATION MCV, Defendant
No Logo Embarq Master Retirement Trust, Defendant
No Logo EMBURY JANET U CHLN TR GRACE FD, Defendant
No Logo EMBURY JANET U CHLN TR J LEY FD, Defendant
No Logo EMBURY JANET U CHLN TR JANET FD, Defendant
No Logo EMIL D KRATOCHVIL, Defendant
No Logo EMIL KRATOCHVIL, Defendant
No Logo Emile Legros Trust B For the Benefit of Deborah Newcomer, Defendant
No Logo Emile Legros Trust B For the Benefit of Emile A. Legros, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Emile Legros Trust B For the Benefit of Judith Murray, Defendant
No Logo EMILY E ORTHWEIN IRREV TRUST DTD 8/19/91, Defendant
No Logo Emily G. Plumb Charitable Trust DTD 1/8/80 as amended, Defendant
No Logo Emily T. Shaw TR U/DECL, Defendant
No Logo EMMA LYN SCHWARTZ TRUST TR UA 07/10/98, Defendant
No Logo EMONMOBIL INVESTMENT FUND, Defendant
No Logo EMPIRE STATE CARPENTERS, Defendant
No Logo EMPIRE STATE CARPENTERS PENSION FUND LCV, Defendant
No Logo EMPIRE STATE CARPENTERS WELFARE LCV, Defendant
No Logo EMPLOYEE RETIREMENT INCOME PLN TR OF MINN MNG & MFG CO, Defendant
No Logo EMPLOYEE RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF GEORGIA, Defendant
No Logo Employee Retirement System of Texas, Defendant
No Logo Employees Retirement System of Texas, Defendant
No Logo EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT FUND OF THE CITY OF DALLAS, Defendant
No Logo Employers Insurance Company Of Nevada, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sills Cummis Epstein & Gross PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
George Robert Hirsch +1 212 643 7000 +1 212 643 6500 ghirsch@sillscummis.com
No Logo Employers Mutual Casualty Company, Defendant
No Logo Employers' Fire Insurance Company, Defendant
No Logo ENDEX Capital Management, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Envision Capital Group, LLC
No Logo ENERGIZER HOLDINGS INC. RETIREMENT PLAN TRUST, Defendant
No Logo ENERGY INDUSTRIES SUPERANNUATION SCHEME, Defendant
No Logo ENHANCED RAFI US LARGE, L.P. A/K/A RESEARCH AFFILIATS FUNDAMENTAL INDEX LP, Defendant
No Logo Enid Cassen, Defendant
No Logo Enrique Jr. Hernandez, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Enrique Jr. Hernandez

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Matthew R. Kipp +1 312 407 0700 +1 312 407 0411 mkipp@skadden.com
Jason T. Manning +1 312 407 0700 jason.manning@skadden.com
Donna Lynn McDevitt +1 312 407 0910 +1 312 407 8581 donna.mcdevitt@skadden.com
Shauna R. Prewitt +1 312 407 0700 +1 312 827 9494 shauna.prewitt@skadden.com
No Logo ENSIGN PEAK ADVISORS, Defendant
No Logo ENSIGN PEAK ADVISORS INC LCV, Defendant
No Logo ENVESTNET ASSET MANAGEMENT LA, Defendant
No Logo Envestnet Asset Management, Inc., Defendant
No Logo ENZO S RICCIARDELLI, Defendant
No Logo EPF-NOMURA-GLOBAL EQUITY FUND, Defendant
No Logo EPHRAIM G HIRSCH, Defendant
No Logo Ephraim G. Hirsch, Defendant
No Logo EPIST INVESTMENT PARTNERSHIP, Defendant
No Logo EPPIST LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jenny Baker Stapleton +1 212 837 6852 +1 212 422 4726 stapleto@hugheshubbard.com
No Logo EPPIST LLC A/K/A EPIST INVESTMENT PARTNERSHIP, Defendant
No Logo EPSILON DISTRESED STRATEGIES MASTER FUND, LP, Defendant
No Logo EPSILON DISTRESSED STRATEGIES MASTER FUND, LP, Defendant
No Logo EQ ADVISORS TRUST, Defendant
No Logo EQ ADVISORS TRUST (EQ/LARGE CAP CORE PLUS), Defendant
No Logo EQ Advisors Trust (EQAT Equity 500 Index), Defendant
No Logo EQUIFAX INC MASTER TRUST, Defendant
No Logo EQUIFAX US RETIREMENT PLAN, Defendant
No Logo EQUISERVE EXCHANGE AGENT OVERAGE ACCT, Defendant
No Logo EQUITABLE SEPARATE ACCOUNT #20, Defendant
No Logo Equitec Specialists LLC, Defendant
No Logo Equitech/Dbag LDN/DB GLB Mstrs, Defendant
No Logo EQUITRUST SERIES FUND, INC., Defendant
No Logo EQUITRUST VARIABLE INSURANCE SERIES FUND, Defendant
No Logo EQUITY DERIVATIVES, Defendant
No Logo Equity Fund B Lendable, Defendant
No Logo Equity Group Investments, L.l.c., Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Equity Group Investments, L.L.C.

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Equity Group Investments, L.L.C.
No Logo EQUITY INDEX FUND, Defendant
No Logo EQUITY INDEX FUND B, Defendant
No Logo EQUITY INDEX FUND B LENDABLE, Defendant
No Logo EQUITY INDEX FUND, A SERIES OF AMERICAN CENTURY CAPITAL PORTFOLIOS, INC., Defendant
No Logo Equity Index Plus Fund A, Defendant
No Logo EQUITY INDEX PLUS FUND B, Defendant
No Logo EQUITY INDEX TRUST, Defendant
No Logo EQUITY INVESTMENT CORPORATION, Defendant
No Logo EQUITY INVSTMENT CORP, Defendant
No Logo Equity League Pension Trust Fund, Defendant
No Logo EQUITY LEAGUE PENSION TRUST LCV, Defendant
No Logo Equity Marketing Services, Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Ex-act Marketing, Inc.
No Logo EQUITY MODELS - EFP, Defendant
No Logo EQUITY OPPORTUNITIES PORTFOLIO, A SERIES OF SUNAMERICA SERIES TRUST, Defendant
No Logo Equity Value Fund, Defendant
No Logo Eric B. Townsend, Defendant
No Logo Eric Coffelt, Defendant
No Logo Eric D. Werthman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Werthman, Eric D.
No Logo ERIC I CHANG, Defendant
No Logo ERIC MORRIS AND SHANNON MORRIS, Defendant
No Logo ERIK LEBSACK, Defendant
No Logo ERIKA MAGGIPINTO, Defendant
No Logo ERMAGARD KUENZLI REV TR, Defendant
No Logo ERMINE P PEAVY FAMILY LP, Defendant
No Logo Ernest Goodman, as Trustee of the Goodman Family Trust, Defendant
No Logo ERNEST W MICHEL, Defendant
No Logo Ernest W. Michel, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldberg, Corwin & Greenberg, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Zachary S. Goldberg +1 212 986 1000 +1 212 986 8039 zgoldberg@gcgllp.com
No Logo ERTURK OZBEK, DTD 06/29/1999 REVOCABLE TRUST, Defendant
No Logo ERVIN L HEYDE JR SEP IRA, Defendant
No Logo ERWIN SHAKIN DELTA TRUST U/A 10/5/00, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Klestadt & Winters, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
John E Jureller, Jr +1 212 972 3000 +1 212 972 2245 jjureller@klestadt.com
No Logo ESTALEEN O ROGERS, Defendant
No Logo ESTATE OF KAREN BABCOCK, Defendant
No Logo Estate of Leavitt J Pope, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Estate of Leavitt J Pope
No Logo ESTATE OF ROBERT C GILKISON, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
John Hamilton Korns +1 202 452 7939 +1 202 452 7989 john.korns@bipc.com
No Logo ESTATE OF ROSE ROCHELL, Defendant
No Logo Esterle Cobourn, Defendant
No Logo ESTHER WONG, Defendant
No Logo Esurance Insurance Company, Defendant
No Logo ETF SPY EQ FINANCE PROD CTRL, Defendant
No Logo ETF TRADING 26, Defendant
No Logo EUGENE AND ROSE MARIE TAYLOR, Defendant
No Logo Eugene Kapaloski, Defendant
No Logo EUGENE P. DECHTER TR UA 12/02/92 JIED TRUST, Defendant
No Logo EUGENE P. HIGGINS AND MARGARET S. HIGGINS JT TEN, Defendant
No Logo EUGENE TOMCZAK TR U-W 06111998 U/A DTD 06/11/1998, Defendant
No Logo EUGENE V THAW REV TR U/A DT 4/25/00, Defendant
No Logo EUR YIELD ENHANCEMENT, Defendant
No Logo Eureka Options LLC, Defendant
No Logo Euroclear Bank, Defendant
No Logo EUROCLEAR BANK SA/NV, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Charles G. Berry +1 212 715 1169 +1 212 715 1399 charles_berry@aporter.com
No Logo Eva B Burris, Defendant
No Logo Eva B. Burris, Defendant
No Logo Evan Norris, Defendant
No Logo EVAN NORRIS AND ANNETTE CHAN-NORRIS, Defendant
No Logo EVANGELICAL BOARD OF PENSIONS, Defendant
No Logo Evangelical Lutheran Church in America Board of Pensions, Defendant
No Logo Evelyn A. Freed Trust U/A/D 03/26/90 Brandes-All Cap Value, Defendant
No Logo EVELYN COOPER AURANDT, TR U-A 10-12-71, Defendant
No Logo Evelyn Kouchoukos, Defendant
No Logo EVELYN KOUCHOUKOS AND DEBORAH M NOLAN, Defendant
No Logo Everence Financial, Defendant
No Logo Everest reinsurance (bermuda) ltd., Defendant
No Logo Everett Smith Jr. U/A DTD 10/15/1998, Defendant
No Logo Evergreen Equity Index Fund, Defendant
No Logo EVERGREEN EQUITY TRUST, Defendant
No Logo EVERGREEN INVESTMENT, Defendant
No Logo EVERGREEN INVESTMENT SERVICES FUND ADMINISTRATION, Defendant
No Logo Evergreen Select Equity Trust, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Evergreen Select Equity Trust
No Logo EVERYTHING MEDICAL, Defendant
No Logo EVERYTHING MEDICAL SERVICES, INC., Defendant
No Logo EVOL CAPITAL MANAGEMENT LLC PORTFOLIO MARGIN ACCOUNT, Defendant
No Logo EVOL Capital Management, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Evolution All-Cap Equity Fund, Defendant
No Logo EVOLUTION LARGE CAPFUND, Defendant
No Logo EVOLUTION VP ALL-CAP EQUITY FUND, Defendant
No Logo EXCAVATORS UNION LOCAL 731 PEN, Defendant
No Logo EXCEL REALTY FUND, LP, Defendant
No Logo Exchange Indemnity Company, Defendant
No Logo Exelon Corporation Nuclear Decommission Trust Tax Qualified, Defendant
No Logo Exelon Corporation Nuclear Decommission Trust-Non Tax Qualified, Defendant
No Logo EXEMPT/BYPASS SUB TRUST OF THE MICHAEL & MARION SHLAUDEMAN TRUST U/A/D 10-01-1995, Defendant
No Logo Exhibit A Shareholder Defendants' Executive Committee, Defendant
No Logo F AUDRYE WOLLER, Defendant
No Logo F GENE GOSELIN, Defendant
No Logo F GENE GOSELIN REVOCABLE LIVING TR U/A DTD 12/31/1992, Defendant
No Logo F HANES BYERLY, Defendant
No Logo F HARLAN BATRUS, Defendant
No Logo F&C MANAGED PENSION FUNDS LIMITED A/K/A MANAGED PENSION FUNDS LIMITED, Defendant
No Logo F. Audrye Woller, Defendant
No Logo F. Gene Goselin, Defendant
No Logo Fairweather Family L.P., Defendant
No Logo FAIRWEATHER LTD PARTNERSHIP R1F3154C, Defendant
No Logo FAIRWEATHER LTD PTRSHP R1F3154C, Defendant
No Logo Faith B. Meem Trust, Defendant
No Logo FAMANDSFORENINGEN TRP US LARGE CAP AKTIER, Defendant
No Logo Famers & Merchants Trust Co, Defendant
No Logo FAO DEEPHAVEN, Defendant
No Logo FARMERS & MERCHANTS TRUST CO, Defendant
No Logo Farmers Group, Inc Employees' Pension Plan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Walker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Bill Cobb +1 512 236 2326 +1 512 691 4446
No Logo Farmers Insurance Group, Defendant
No Logo FASKEN (CHANNING II), Defendant
No Logo FASKEN LTD (CHANNINGI), Defendant
No Logo Fasken, Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lynch Chappell & Alsup

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Randall L Rouse +1 432 683 3351 + 432 683 2587 rrouse@lcalawfirm.com
No Logo FASKEN, LTD. B A/K/A FASKEN(CHANNING II), Defendant
No Logo FAULKNER FAMILY TRUST UA DTD 8/29/1989, Defendant
No Logo FBF PENSION-CMG S&P 500 INDEX, Defendant
No Logo FBO ANNE G TAYLOR U/A DTD 10/16/2000 BY WALTER K GRAHAM, Defendant
No Logo FBO PENSION-CMG S&P 500 INDEX, Defendant
No Logo Federal National Mortgage Association (Fannie Mae), Defendant
No Logo FEDERAL RESERVE EMPLOYEE BENEF, Defendant
No Logo FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM EMPLOEE RETIREMENT FUND, Defendant
Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System, Defendant
No Logo FEDERATED A/C FCIF, Defendant
No Logo Federated a/c feif, Defendant
No Logo FEDERATED CAPITAL APPRECIATION FUND II (F/K/A FEDERATED CLOVER VALUE FUND II), Defendant
No Logo Federated Capital Income Fund, Defendant
No Logo FEDERATED CLOVER VALUE FUND (F/K/A FEDERATED AMERICAN LEADERS FUND), Defendant
No Logo FEDERATED EQUITY INCOME FUND, Defendant
No Logo FEDERATED INV COUNSELING, INC, Defendant
No Logo Federated Investors, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Federated Investors
No Logo Federated Investors Inc., Defendant
No Logo FEDERATED MANAGED VOLATILITY FUND II (F/K/A FEDERATED CAPITAL INCOME FUND II), Defendant
No Logo FEDERATED MANAGED VOLATILITY FUND II(F/KA FEDERATED CAPITAL INCOME FUND II F/K/A FEDERATED EQUITY INCOME FUND II), Defendant
No Logo Federated Max-Cap Index Fund, Defendant
No Logo Federated MDT Stock Trust, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Federated MDT Stock Trust
No Logo Federated mtd stock trust, Defendant
No Logo Federated Muni And Stock Advantage Fund, Defendant
No Logo Federated Securities Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Federated Securities Corp.
No Logo Federated Stock and California Muni Fund, Defendant
No Logo FEHIR LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, Defendant
No Logo FELICITY E APPLEBY TRUST U/A DTD 12/13/1989, Defendant
No Logo FELIX LENG ENG &SERENE WEE WEE LEE, Defendant
No Logo FELIX SHEU, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of FELIX SHEU (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
FELIX SHEU
No Logo FELIX TONG, Defendant
No Logo FELIX WEN GUANG TONG TOD, Defendant
No Logo FEO THOMAS P. O'KEEFE, Defendant
No Logo FERRIS TRADING FUND LLC, Defendant
No Logo Ferris, Baker Watts, Inc., Defendant
No Logo FETHEROLF FAMILY TRUST, Defendant
No Logo FGTFEBP for the Fidelity US Equity Index Commingled Pool, Defendant
No Logo FIDELITY ADVISOR LEVERAGED COMPANY STOCK FUND, A SERIES OF FIDELITY ADVISOR SERIES I, Defendant
No Logo Fidelity Advisor Series I, Defendant
No Logo Fidelity Commonwealth Trust, Defendant
No Logo Fidelity Concord Street Trust, Defendant
No Logo FIDELITY CONCORD STREET TRUST: SPARTAN U.S. EQUITY INDEX FUND, Defendant
No Logo FIDELITY EMM, Defendant
No Logo FIDELITY INSURANCE CO LTD, Defendant
No Logo FIDELITY LEVERAGED COMPANY STOCK FUND, A SERIES OF FIDELITY SECURITIES FUND, Defendant
No Logo FIDELITY MOHAWK INSURANCE CO, Defendant
No Logo Fidelity Puritan Trust, Defendant
No Logo Fidelity Rutland Square Trust II, Defendant
No Logo Fidelity Securities Fund, Defendant
No Logo FIDELITY SELECT MULTIMEDIA, A SERIES OF FIDELITY SELECT PORTFOLIOS, Defendant
No Logo Fidelity Select Portfolios, Defendant
No Logo FIDEURAM BANK LUXEMBOURG, SA, Defendant
No Logo Fiduciary Company Incorporated, Defendant
No Logo Fiduciary Mgt. Assoc. LLC 401K FBO Robert Wesley Thornburgh, Defendant
No Logo FIDUCIARY SMALL AND MID-CAP STOCK FUND LLC, Defendant
No Logo Fiduciary SSB, Defendant
No Logo FIDUCIARY TRUST CO. OF BOSTON, Defendant
No Logo Fiduciary Trust Company, Defendant
No Logo Fiduciary Trust Company International, Defendant
No Logo Fierstein Company, Defendant
Fifth Third Bancorp, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Fifth Third Bancorp.
No Logo Fifth Third Funds, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Fifth Third Funds
No Logo FINANCIAL LP, Defendant
No Logo FINANCIAL MNGT CONCEPTS, Defendant
No Logo Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Mark Gregory Ledwin +1 914 323 7000 +1 914 323 7001 mark.ledwin@wilsonelser.com
No Logo FIREMEN'S RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF ST. LOUIS, Defendant
No Logo First American Equity Index Fund, Defendant
No Logo First American Equity Index, Inc, Defendant
No Logo FIRST AMERICAN INVESTMENT FUNDS INC.-EQUITY INDEX FUND, Defendant
No Logo First Bank & Trust of Evanston, Defendant
No Logo FIRST BANK TRUST, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carroll, Hartigan & Cerney Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Mary Joan O'Donnell +1 312 236 3675 mjo@chc-law.com
No Logo FIRST BUSEY TRUST INVESTMENT CO., Defendant
No Logo First Capital Alliance LP, Defendant
No Logo First Clearing LLC, Defendant
First Data Corporation, Defendant
No Logo FIRST EAGLE CONTRARIAN VALUE MASTER FUND, LTD., Defendant
No Logo first Eagle Contrarian Value Master Fund, LTD., Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
first Eagle Contrarian Value Master Fund, LTD.
No Logo First Financial Bank, Defendant
No Logo First Foundation Advisors FA Master Account, Defendant
No Logo First Interstate bank of Commerce, Defendant
No Logo FIRST INVESTORS EQUITY FUNDS, Defendant
No Logo FIRST INVESTORS INCOME FUNDS, Defendant
No Logo FIRST INVESTORS LIFE SERIES FUND - BLUE CHIPS SERIES, Defendant
No Logo FIRST INVESTORS LIFE SERIES FUND - UTILITIES SERIES, Defendant
No Logo FIRST INVESTORS LIFE SERIES FUNDS, Defendant
No Logo First Investors Management Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo First Investors Utilities Income, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
First Investors Utilities Income
No Logo FIRST INVESTORS UTILITIES INCOME FUND, Defendant
No Logo FIRST MERCHANTS TRUST CO NA, Defendant
No Logo First Midwest Bancorp, Defendant
No Logo First National Bank And Trust Company, Defendant
No Logo First National Bank Lagrange, Defendant
No Logo First New York Securities Llc, Defendant
No Logo First Republic Bank, Defendant
No Logo First Trust Exchange-Traded Fund, Defendant
No Logo First Trust Value Line Equity Allocations Index Fund, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Chapman & Cutler LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Joseph Patrick Lombardo +1 312 845 3000 +1 312 516 1428 lombardo@chapman.com
No Logo FIRST-CITIZENS BANK AND TRUST CO, Defendant
No Logo FIRSTAR EQUITY INDEX FUND (MERGED INTO FIRST AMERICAN EQUITY INDEX FUND), Defendant
No Logo Firstar Equity Index Fund, which is now known as Nuveen Equity Index Fund, a series of Nuveen Investment Funds, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Michael M Krauss +1 612 766 8514 +1 612 766 1600 mkrauss@faegre.com
No Logo Firstar Trust Company, Defendant
No Logo FIRSTENERGY CORP NON-QUALIFYING NUCLEAR DECOMMISSIONING TRUSTS, Defendant
No Logo FIS OPERATIONS, Defendant
No Logo Fisher Family Large Cap Growth LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jaffe Raitt Heuer & Weiss PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Judith Greenstone Miller +1 248 351 3000 +1 248 351 3082 jmiller@jaffelaw.com
No Logo Fistar Trust Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Fistar Trust Company
No Logo Fixed Income Securities, LP, Defendant
No Logo FLEET MARITIME INC., Defendant
No Logo Flexible US Equity Managers, Defendant
No Logo FLEXIBLE US EQUITY MANAGERS PORTFOLIO 1 LLC (FLEXIBLE (US EQUITY) MANAGERS: PORTFOLIO 1 LLC), Defendant
No Logo Flick Family Revocable Trust, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
FLICK FAMILY REVOCABLE TRUST
No Logo FLORENCE S BRADSHAW, Defendant
No Logo FLORIDA POWER CORP NON-QUAL, Defendant
No Logo Florida Prepaid College Plan, Defendant
No Logo Florida Retirement System, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Florida Retirement System
No Logo Florida State Board of Administration, Defendant
No Logo FLOYD C SANGER JR TR U/A 3/11/86, Defendant
No Logo Flushing Financial Corp., Defendant
No Logo FLYNN CORPORATION, Defendant
No Logo FM Global, Defendant
No Logo Fmc Technologies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo FMC Techonologies Inc. Defined Benefit Retirement Trust, Defendant
No Logo Fmr LLC, Defendant
No Logo FNY Managed Accounts LLP, Defendant
No Logo Folio Investing f/k/a Folio Investment, Inc, Defendant
No Logo Folksamerica Reinsurance Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
FOLKSAMERICA REINSURANCE COMPANY
No Logo FOR BEVERLEY TAYLOR; BEVERLEY TAYLOR, Defendant
Ford Motor Company, Defendant
No Logo Forestal Funding Master Trust, Defendant
No Logo Formanek Investment Fund, Defendant
No Logo FORT PITT CAPITAL GROUP, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Metz Lewis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Brian T. Must +1 412 918 1100 bmust@metzlewis.com
No Logo Forum Funds, Defendant
No Logo Foulard and Co., Defendant
No Logo Foundation for Anesthesia Education and Research, Defendant
No Logo FOUNDATION FOR FLORIDAS COMMUNITY COLLEGES INC, Defendant
No Logo FRANCES C JONES REV TRUST U/A/D 08-10-1999, Defendant
No Logo Frances C. Jones Rev Trust U/A/D 08-10-1999, Defendant
No Logo FRANCES L VAN TREESE, Defendant
No Logo Frances P. Gormley, Defendant
No Logo FRANCES R PICONE LIV TRUST UA DTD 01/18/00, Defendant
No Logo FRANCIS L. COOLIDGE, Defendant
No Logo FRANCIS NESSINGER, Defendant
No Logo FRANCISCO PERDOMO & CAROLINE OLIVEIRA, Defendant
No Logo FRANCISCO PERDOMO-FERRER RET PL , Defendant
No Logo FRANCOISE ISABELLE MICHEL TRUST U/A DTD 10/26/1994, Defendant
No Logo FRANCOISE ISABELLE TR U/A DTD 10/26/1994, Defendant
No Logo FRANK A JONES TRUST U/A DTD 05/05/1995 FBO M JONES, Defendant
No Logo Frank Callea, Defendant
No Logo Frank H. Poe Trust U/A/D 11/27/91, Defendant
No Logo FRANK J MANGANO GST NON-TAX EXEMPT TR U/A 6/22/94, Defendant
No Logo FRANK J. BARTUSEK JR., Defendant
No Logo FRANK N MAGID AND MARILYN A MAGID, Defendant
No Logo Frank N. Magid, Defendant
No Logo FRANK P ROCCAFORTE, Defendant
No Logo Frank R. Ball, Jr. Trust dated 4/27/94, Defendant
No Logo FRANK RUSSELL INVESTMENT MANAG, Defendant
No Logo Frank Russell Trust Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Frank Russell Trust Company
No Logo FRANK RUSSELL TRUST COMPANY SO, Defendant
No Logo FRANK RUSSELL TRUST COMPANY-EQ, Defendant
No Logo FRANK S LADNER REV TRUST U/A DTD 03/03/1993, Defendant
No Logo FRANK S TIERNAN, Defendant
No Logo Frank S. Ladner Rev Trust U/A DTD 03/03/1993, Defendant
No Logo Frank W Considine, Defendant
No Logo Frank W. Denius, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Frank W. Denius
No Logo FRED P. PETTIJOHN IRRV TR, Defendant
No Logo FRED T KAJIWARA, Defendant
No Logo Fred T. Kajiwara, Defendant
No Logo FREDERIC LEVENSON AND DOROTHY A LEVENSON, Defendant
No Logo FREDERICK B GETZE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
John Cono Gugliotta +1 718 409 9026 +1 718 319 9877 gugliottalaw@optonline.net
No Logo FREDERICK E NIELSEN AND PETER A NIELSEN, Defendant
No Logo FREDERICK S SHARE TRUST U/A DTD 11/04/88, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of FREDERICK S SHARE TRUST U/A DTD 11/04/88 (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
FREDERICK S SHARE TRUST U/A DTD 11/04/88
No Logo FREDERICKA PAFF & CARLYLE PAFF HEDRICK, Defendant
No Logo FREDRIC LEVENSON AND DOROTHY A LEVENSON, Defendant
No Logo FREDRICK L KATZ, Defendant
No Logo Free Church Minister and Missionaries Retirement Plan A, Defendant
No Logo FREEMAN ASSOCIATES INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT LLC, Defendant
No Logo FRICK C FBO F D FRICK I I-TR NO 3, Defendant
No Logo FRIDSTEIN INVESTMENT PARTNERSHIP, Defendant
No Logo Friedman Billings Ramsey, Defendant
No Logo FRIEDMAN LIVING TRUST U/A 08/04/99, Defendant
No Logo FROEDTERT & COM HEALTH INC LSV ASSET, Defendant
No Logo Froedtert & Community Health, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Frost Bank, Defendant
No Logo Frost Brown Todd LLC, Defendant
No Logo FT1112 Strategis Dividend Portfolio Series 2 First TR Portfolio LP, Defendant
No Logo Full House Ventures, Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Full Value Partners LP, Defendant
No Logo FULTON INVESTMENT TRUST, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Saretsky Katz Dranoff & Glass LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Barry Glenn Saretsky +1 212 973 9797 +1 212 973 0939 bsaretsky@skdglaw.com
No Logo FUND AMERICAN REINSURANCE COMPANY, LTD., Defendant
No Logo FUND SPC OBO MADISON L/S SEG TMS/ITS SETT A/C FOR MADISON (HITE 2) BUTTERFIELD FUND SERVICES, Defendant
No Logo FUTURE FUND BOARD OF GUARDIANS, Defendant
No Logo G M JOHNSON CUST, Defendant
No Logo G VWAP FACILITATION (EQ794) CUSTOMER FACILITATION, Defendant
No Logo G-CLOSE, Defendant
No Logo G. Fontaine Trust U/W/O TC Lupton, Defendant
No Logo GABELLI 787 FUND INC - GABELLI ENTEERPRISE MERGERS AND ACQUISITIONS FUND F/K/A THE 787 FUND INC - AXA ENTERPRISE MERGERS AND ACQUISITIONS FUND, Defendant
No Logo Gabelli ABC Fund, Defendant
No Logo GABELLI ASSET MANAGEMENT, Defendant
No Logo GABELLI ASSET MANAGEMENT CO., Defendant
No Logo GABELLI COMPANY, Defendant
No Logo GABELLI DIVIDENT & INCOME TRUST, Defendant
No Logo GABELLI FOUNDATION INC, Defendant
No Logo Gabelli Funds, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Gabelli Funds, Inc.
No Logo Gabelli Funds, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Gabelli Global Deal Fund, Defendant
No Logo GABELLI MULTIMEDIA PART LP, Defendant
No Logo GABELLI PERFORMANCE PARTNERSHIP, Defendant
No Logo Gabelli Securities, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Gail A. Uebovich Living Trust, Defendant
No Logo GAIL C SCHLANG, Defendant
No Logo GAINSVILLE POLICE & FIREFIGHTERS LCV, Defendant
No Logo GALL DECLARATION OF TRUST U/A DTD 05/05/1981, Defendant
No Logo Galleon Buccaneers Offshore Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Galleon Management LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Galleon Management LP
No Logo Gam Usa Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
GAM USA Inc.
No Logo Gamco Asset Management Inc., Defendant
No Logo Gamco Asset Management, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Gamco Asset Management, Inc.
No Logo GAMCO Investors, Inc., Defendant
No Logo GAMCO INVESTORS WRAP PROCESS, Defendant
No Logo Gamma Phi Beta Foundation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jane Dall Wilson +1 317 237 1398 +1 317 237 1000 jane.wilson@faegrebd.com
No Logo Garland Foundation Trust No 2, Defendant
No Logo Garnett Kilberg, As Trustee of Mary Rosenthal Trust U/A DTD October 19, 1999, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Barbra Rachel Parlin +1 212 513 3200 +1 212 385 9010 barbra.parlin@hklaw.com
No Logo Gartmore Mutual Fund Capital Trust, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Gartmore Mutual Fund Capital Trust
No Logo Gartmore Mutual Funds, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Gartmore Mutual Funds
No Logo GARY A WOLENS, Defendant
No Logo GARY D BLACK, Defendant
No Logo GARY E. PEKALA, Defendant
No Logo GARY N SMITH, Defendant
No Logo GARY R. NORTON, Defendant
No Logo Gary S Briars, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pembroke, Jefson & Associates, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Thomas Albert Jefson +1 847 696 0060 +1 847 696 0950 tjefson@pembrokelaw.com
No Logo GARY S BRIARS AND LAURA A BRIARS, Defendant
No Logo GASPARE LOCASCIO AND DOLORES LOCASCIO, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by 222 N. LaSalle

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Kevin B. O'Rourke +1 312 545 3264 kevin@kevinorourke.com
No Logo Gaston Caperton, Defendant
No Logo GAYLE G MCLEAN REV LIVING TRUST U/A 3/1/94, Defendant
No Logo Gayon Emily Chun, Defendant
No Logo GBGM COLLINS HEALTH BENEFIT TRUST LCV, Defendant
No Logo GBGM Collins Pension Plan LCV, Defendant
No Logo GBGM ENDOWMENT FUND LCV, Defendant
No Logo GBGM GENERAL FUND LCV, Defendant
No Logo GBL Alpha Edge Common Trust FD, Defendant
No Logo GCW Capital LLC, Defendant
No Logo GDK Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
GDK Inc
No Logo GE MUTUAL FUNDS, Defendant
No Logo GEI Stock Index Fund, Defendant
No Logo GELERT R. RAMAGE JR. AND NANCY D. RAMAGE, Defendant
No Logo GENE C MCCAFFERY, Defendant
No Logo GENERAL BUILDING LABORERS LOCAL 66 PROXYVOTEPLUS, Defendant
No Logo General Building Laborers' Local 66 LCV, Defendant
No Logo GENERAL CIGAR RETIREMENT TRUST, Defendant
General Dynamics Corporation, Defendant
General Electric Company, Defendant
No Logo General Electric Pension Trust, Defendant
No Logo General Motors Investment Management Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
General Motors Investment Management Corporation
No Logo GENEVA INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT OF CHICAGO, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Geode Capital Management LLC, Defendant
No Logo GEOFFREY B FITZGERALD SR AND CAROL E FITZGERALD, Defendant
No Logo Geoffrey C Lloyd Rec Tr L-176, Geoffrey C Lloyd, Trustee , Defendant
No Logo GEOFFREY DAWSON, Defendant
No Logo Geoffrey Michael Fitzgerald, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Koerner & Associates, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Gregory Oliver Koerner +1 212 461 4377 +1 212 453 0658 gkoerner@koerner-associates.com
No Logo GEORGE A.P. WALLACE 1999 REV TR, Defendant
No Logo GEORGE B. KAISER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Frederic Dorwart Lawyers

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
John Daniel Clayman +1 918 583 9922 +1 918 583 8251 jclayman@fdlaw.com
No Logo GEORGE BLOSSOM III, TR K3-3219IA2, Defendant
No Logo George Buckman Trust U/A/D 08/26/88, Defendant
No Logo George D Veon Trust U/A DTD 10/03/01, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Nyemaster, Goode, West, Hansell & O'Brien PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Matthew Roger Eslick +1 515 283 3167 +2838 283 283 8045 mreslick@nyemaster.com
Robert A Vanorsdel +1 515 283 3157 +1 515 283 8045 rav@nyemaster.com
No Logo GEORGE DRAPEAU III, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of GEORGE DRAPEAU III (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
GEORGE DRAPEAU III
No Logo GEORGE E ANDERSON REV LIV TR U/A, Defendant
No Logo GEORGE E. KEELER, Defendant
No Logo GEORGE EASTMAN HOUSE INC ENDOWMENT FUND, Defendant
No Logo GEORGE JOHNSON, Defendant
No Logo GEORGE LONGLAND JR, Defendant
No Logo GEORGE M. MOSS, Defendant
No Logo GEORGE MARCIANO, Defendant
No Logo George Michael Eckert, Defendant
No Logo George Monroe Endicott Trust FBO Elizabeth E. Rands, Defendant
No Logo GEORGE R FONTAINE TRUST UNDER WILL OF THOMAS CARRTER LUPTON, Defendant
No Logo GEORGE R ROWLAND JR TR, Defendant
No Logo GEORGE S NOWIK TRUST UA 02/06/01, Defendant
No Logo GEORGE W BLOSSOM III, Defendant
No Logo GEORGE W THOMS TRUST B, Defendant
No Logo George Wallace, Defendant
No Logo GEORGE WILLIAM BUCK, UTA CHARLES SCHWAB & CO INC. SEP-IRA DTD 4/8/93, Defendant
No Logo GEORGEANN S. BLAHA T/U/D, Defendant
No Logo Georgeann Schellenger, Defendant
No Logo Georges Marciano, Defendant
No Logo Georgia Department of Revenue, Defendant
No Logo Georgia M. Johnson, Defendant
No Logo Georgia Municipal Employee Benefit System Pension Plan, Defendant
No Logo Gerald Agema C/F Avery Lauren Agema UTMA/IL Until Age 21, Defendant
No Logo Gerald Agema C/F Justin G. Agema UTMA/IL Until Age 21, Defendant
No Logo Gerald Agema C/F Matthew V. Agema UTMA/IL Until Age 21, Defendant
No Logo Gerald Benjamin, Defendant
No Logo GERALD E GRIEVE, Defendant
No Logo GERALD E. GRIEVE, Defendant
No Logo GERALD J MCCARTHY, Defendant
No Logo GERALD KRZYWDZINSKI AND DORIS A KRZYWDZINSKI, Defendant
No Logo Gerald W Agema Revocable Trust, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Gerald W Agema Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gerald W Agema Revocable Trust (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Gerald W Agema Revocable Trust
No Logo Gerald W Agema Trustee, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Gerald W Agema Trustee
No Logo GERALD W. AGEMA, Defendant
No Logo GERALD W. AGEMA AND MARCIA L. AGEMA JTWROS, Defendant
No Logo Gerald W. Agema C/F Michael W. Agema UTMA/IL Until Age 21, Defendant
No Logo Gerald W. Agema TTEE U/A DTD 03/05/2003 by Gerald W. Agema Rev. Tr., Defendant
No Logo Gerald W. Thiel Trust U/A DTD 10/20/1999, Defendant
No Logo GERALDO RIVERA, Defendant
No Logo GERDA SCHILD, Defendant
No Logo Gidwitz Art Ventures, Defendant
No Logo Gidwitz Family Limited Partnership, Defendant
No Logo Gila River Indian Community, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by OSBORN MALEDON PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Lynne C Adams +1 602 640 9348 +1 602 640 9050 ladams@omlaw.com
No Logo GILBERT LANOFF TRUST UA DTD 9/9/1988, Defendant
No Logo GINA MAZZAFERRI AND THOMAS PERRY, Defendant
No Logo GJD PARTNERS L.P., Defendant
No Logo GLADYS G. COFRIN TRUST, Defendant
No Logo GLADYS SMITH HAYES TESTAMENTARY TR U/A DTD 12-03-1987, Defendant
No Logo GLASS LEWIS CO, Defendant
No Logo GLASS LEWIS CO. (PE ID-EZ2), Defendant
No Logo GLASSELL, ALFRED C III, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS ACTING TRUSTEE AND BENEFICIARY OF ALFRED C. GLASSELL, JR. CHILDREN'S TRUST FOR ALFRED C. GLASSELL, III, Defendant
No Logo Glassman Grandchildren IRR TR UAD 07/21/1999, Defendant
No Logo Glen W. Bell, Martha Bell, Bell Family Trust, Defendant
No Logo Glenmede Trust Company, NA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Seward & Kissel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Mark J. Hyland +1 212 574 1200 +1 212 480 8421 Hyland@sewkis.com
No Logo Glenn A Killoren Trust UAD 12/27/85, Defendant
No Logo Glenn Family Trust U/A DTD 04-03-96, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dilworth Paxson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Robert V Cornish, Jr. +1 202 466 9158 +1 202 452 0930 rcornish@dilworthlaw.com
No Logo GLENVIEW STATE BANK, Defendant
No Logo GLOBAL EQUITY ENHANCED INDEX FUND, Defendant
No Logo Global Sec. CP/CDS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Global Sec. CP/CDS
No Logo Gloria Bowman, Beneficiary, M A Barlow Trust FBO Gloria Bowman, Defendant
No Logo Gloria Trudman Trust, Defendant
No Logo GLOVER TRUST DTD 01-19-90, Defendant
No Logo GM PROMARK LARGE CAP BLEND FUND, Defendant
No Logo GMO Trust, Defendant
No Logo GMP (BROBBZ) RE GREENWICH CAP, Defendant
No Logo Gofen and Glossberg L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Gofen and Glossberg LLC, Defendant
No Logo GOLDENHAWK PARTNERS LP, Defendant
No Logo Goldentree Master Fund Ii, Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Goldentree Master Fund, Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Goldentree Master Fund Ltd.
No Logo Goldentree Multistrategy Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Goldentree Multistrategy Offshore Fund, Defendant
No Logo GOLDMAN SACHS & CO., IN ITS INDIVIDUAL AND CUSTODIAL CAPACITIES, Defendant
Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Goldman Sachs Execution & Clearing, L.P.
GOLDMAN SACHS ASSET MANAGEMENT;
Goldman Sachs Group, Inc.
Goldman Sachs International Holdings LLC
Goldman Sachs Trust
Goldman Sachs Variable Insurance Trust
No Logo GOLDMAN SACHS AND CO FAO PERRY PARTNERS, Defendant
No Logo Goldman Sachs Execution & Clearing, Lp, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Goldman Sachs Execution & Clearing, L.P.
No Logo Goldman Sachs & Co., Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
The Goldman, Sachs & Co. L.L.C.
No Logo GOLDSHER INVESTMENT CO INC., Defendant
No Logo GOLMAN SACH & CO, Defendant
No Logo GOOD STEWARD TRRADING COMPANY SPC, Defendant
No Logo GOODAN, ROGER AND JANE DOE GOODAN, AA WASHINGTON MARITAL COMMUNITY, Defendant
No Logo GOODMAN TRUSTS TIC 8G-380, CUSTODIAN, Defendant
Goodrich Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Gordon T Ford Trust U/A/D 04/24/72, Defendant
No Logo GORDON T FORD U/A/D 04/24/72, Defendant
No Logo Governing Council Of The University Of Toronto, Defendant
No Logo GOVERNMENT OF SINGAPORE INVESTMENT CORPORATION PTE, LTD., Defendant
No Logo Government of Spore Investment, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Government of Spore Investment
No Logo Governor And Company Of The Bank Of Ireland,, Defendant
No Logo GPC LIX LLC, Defendant
No Logo GPC LVIII LLC, Defendant
No Logo GPC LX LLC, Defendant
No Logo GPIF, Defendant
No Logo Gpu, Inc., Defendant
No Logo GRACE I. SPIER, Defendant
No Logo GRACE M. MITCHELL, Defendant
No Logo Grace M. Mitchell, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Mitchell, Grace M
No Logo GRACE TRUST, Defendant
No Logo GRAFF VALVE & FITTINGS CO. EMPL PFT SHG PL2 UAD 6/30/85, Defendant
No Logo Graff Valve & Fittings Co. Employee Profit Sharing Plan UAD 6/30/85, Defendant
No Logo Graham Capital Management, LP, Defendant
No Logo Graham Capital Partnership I, LP, Defendant
No Logo GRAHAM EQUITY BASKETS TRADING LTD. FGC CORPORATE SERVICES, LIMITED, Defendant
No Logo Graham Event Driven Ltd., Defendant
No Logo GRAHAM FAMILY GROWTH PARTNERSHIP LCV, Defendant
No Logo Grammel Joint Living Trust, Defendant
No Logo GRAMMEL JOINT LIVING TRUST U/A DTD 5/24/00, Defendant
No Logo GRANTHAM, MAYO, VAN OTTERLOO & CO. LLC, Defendant
No Logo GRAPHIC ARTS JOINT PENSION TRUST, Defendant
No Logo Greatbanc Trust Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
William John Barrett +1 312 644 3000 +1 312 644 3381
No Logo GREEN FOREST INVESTMENTS LIMITED, Defendant
No Logo GREEN FOREST TRUST, Defendant
No Logo GREGORY J AND ELLEN P CAPUTO, Defendant
No Logo GREGORY J MARCIANO, Defendant
No Logo Gregory J. Caputo, Defendant
No Logo GREGORY L MOLOZNIK, Defendant
No Logo GREGORY L. MOLOZNIK AND JULIE M. MOLOZNIK JTWROS, Defendant
No Logo GREGORY REYETMAN, Defendant
No Logo Gregory Reyftmann, Defendant
No Logo Gregory W. Warmuth, Defendant
No Logo GRIFFITH E. MADIGAN AS CUSTODIAN OF GRIFFITH PATRICK MADIGAN UTMA WI, Defendant
No Logo Gryphon Hidden Values VIII L.P., Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Gryphon Hidden Values VIII Limited
No Logo GS 1999 EXCHANGE PLACE 6823 FUND LP, Defendant
No Logo GS 1999 Exchange Place Fund, LP, Defendant
No Logo GS 2005 Exchange Place Fund, Defendant
No Logo GS 2005 EXCHANGE PLACE FUND 6823 LP (FEEDER 2005) HELD BY GSCO & PLEDGED TO GSI, Defendant
No Logo GS Financial Markets, Defendant
No Logo GS Investment Strat LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
GS Investment Strat LLC
No Logo GSA CAPITAL INTERNATIONAL MASTER FUND LIMITED, Defendant
No Logo GTE Reinsurance Company Limited, Defendant
No Logo GUARDIAN INVESTORS SERVICES LLC (RS S&P 500 INDEX VIP SERIES), Defendant
No Logo GUARDIANS OF NEW ZEALAND SUPERANNUATION AS MANAGER AND ADMINISTRATOR OF THE NEW ZEALAND SUPERANNUATION FUND, Defendant
No Logo GUARDIANS OF NEW ZEALAND SUPERANNUATION GV, Defendant
No Logo Guggenheim, Defendant
No Logo Guggenheim Portfolio Company XXXI LLC, Defendant
No Logo GUGGENHEIN PORTFOLIO LIX, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Guidemark Large Cap Value Fund, Defendant
No Logo Guidestone Equity Index Fund, Defendant
No Logo Guidestone Funds, Defendant
No Logo Guizhi Liang & Yonghui Yang, Defendant
No Logo GULCO CORP., Defendant
No Logo GULCO CORPORATION, Defendant
No Logo GULLEY FAMILY TRUST U/A 7/27/00, Defendant
No Logo GURDON H. METZ, Defendant
No Logo GUS G HARTOON IRA, Defendant
No Logo GUS G HARTOONIAN, Defendant
No Logo GW Capital Management, LLC, Defendant
No Logo GWENDOLYN G. BABCOCK, Defendant
No Logo Gwinnett County Board of Education Retirement System, Defendant
No Logo H W KOCHS GST EXEMPT TR/JUSTIN; DENISE AXTELL, Defendant
No Logo H.M. Payson & Co., Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
H.M. Payson & Co.
No Logo Hach Scientific Foundation Sub Account 1, Defendant
No Logo Haidee W. Flinders, Defendant
No Logo Haig Keropian & Rosanne Keropian Rebocable Trust UA 07/09/97, Defendant
No Logo Halcyon Fund LP, Defendant
No Logo Halcyon Offshore Enhanced Halcyon Master Fund LP, Defendant
No Logo HALCYON OFFSHORE FUND LTD., Defendant
No Logo Halcyon Special Situations LP, Defendant
No Logo HALL-PERRINE FOUNDATION, Defendant
Halliburton Company, Defendant
No Logo HALPS 51/BSH,LLC A/K/A BSH, LLC, Defendant
No Logo HAMMOND FAMILY TRUST U/A/D 02-11-1988, Defendant
No Logo Hampton University Endowment, Defendant
No Logo HANNA JONAS MILLER, Defendant
No Logo Hannah Gollin, Defendant
No Logo HANNAH SMITH TRUST, Defendant
No Logo Hanover Corporation, Defendant
No Logo HARBOR CAPITAL ADVISORS LCV, Defendant
No Logo HARBOR MID CAP VALUE FUND, Defendant
No Logo HARMONY INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT LLC, Defendant
No Logo HAROLD E MICKENS, Defendant
No Logo Harold E. Mickens, Defendant
No Logo Harold K.L. Castle Foundation, Defendant
No Logo Harold R. Ufven Dahl Trust U/A/D 9/7/1988, Defendant
No Logo HARRIET H GLASSPIEGEL DL OF TR U/A DTD 6/21/89, Defendant
No Logo HARRIET ROBINSON 1999 TRUST U/A DTD 06/11/1999, Defendant
No Logo Harriet Robinson Trust, Defendant
No Logo Harrington Bischof Trust DTD 9/15/97, Defendant
No Logo Harris Corp. Retirement Trust, Defendant
No Logo Harris Financial Corporation, Defendant
No Logo HARRIS N.A. (N/K/A BMO HARRIS BANK N.A.), Defendant
No Logo HARRIS S G TR 6/13/45 CYNTHIA, Defendant
No Logo HARRIS S G TR 6/13/45 MARIAN, Defendant
No Logo HARRIS S G TR 6/13/45 RUTH, Defendant
No Logo HARRISON R. AND CLARE HORAN, Defendant
No Logo Harry Amsden, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Harry Amsden
No Logo HARRY GUY SNYDER, Defendant
No Logo HARSCO PENSION & PROFIT SHARING FUND LCV, Defendant
No Logo HART FAMILY TRUST DTD 04/23/92, Defendant
No Logo HARTFORD,, Defendant
No Logo Hartford HLS Series Fund II, Inc, Defendant
No Logo Hartford Index Fund, Defendant
No Logo Hartford Index HLS Fund, Defendant
No Logo Hartford Investment Management Company, Defendant
No Logo Hartford Life Insurance Company, Defendant
No Logo Hartford Separate Account B, Defendant
No Logo Hartford Series Fund, Inc, Defendant
No Logo HARTMARX RETIREMENT INCOME TRUST, Defendant
No Logo Harvard Management Company, Defendant
No Logo HARVARD MGMT CO., Defendant
President and Fellows of Harvard College, Defendant
No Logo Harvest AA Capital LP, Defendant
No Logo Harvey B. Plotnick, Tr. UA Mar 16 88 Harvey B. Plotnick Declaration of Trust, Defendant
No Logo HARVEY B.PLOTNICK DECLARATION OF TRUST 6321 UA MAR 16 88, Defendant
No Logo HARVEY BOOKMAN, Defendant
No Logo HARVEY CANTER, Defendant
No Logo HARVEY R. HELLER, Defendant
No Logo HATABAH LTD., Defendant
No Logo Havens Advisors LLC, Defendant
No Logo Havens Partners Enhanced Fund, L.P., Defendant
No Logo Havens Partners, L.P., Defendant
No Logo HAWAII DENTAL SERVICE, Defendant
No Logo HAWS 51, MP, BSH, LLC ITS GENERAL PARTNER, Defendant
No Logo HAYWOOD SECURITIES, INC., Defendant
No Logo HAZEL C HOUGH, Defendant
No Logo Hazel C. Hough, Defendant
No Logo HC Capital Trust-The Value Equity Portfolio, Defendant
No Logo HC Captial Trust-The Value Equity Portfolio, Defendant
No Logo HCA MASTER RETIREMENT TRUST LCV, Defendant
No Logo HCA, INC. MASTER RETIREMENT TRUST, Defendant
No Logo HCK ENTERPRISES INC PSP UAD 9/15/93, Defendant
No Logo He & Fang 2005 Rev Living Trust, Defendant
No Logo Headwaters Holdings LLC, Defendant
No Logo HEALTH RESOURCE GRP INC 401K PSP, Defendant
No Logo Healthcare Georgia Inc, Defendant
No Logo Hearst Equity Appreciation Plan, Defendant
No Logo Hedgehog Capital LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Hedgehog Capital LLC

Toggle Switch Represented by McGrail & Bensinger LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David Charles McGrail +1 646 290 6496 +1 646 314 0064 dmcgrail@mcgrailbensinger.com
No Logo Hedonic Capital LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Hedonic Capital LLC
No Logo Helen Brown, Defendant
No Logo HELEN BROWN, JEAN SAMOS & GAIL SAMOS JOHNSON, Defendant
No Logo HELEN D HOKE LIVING TRUST UA 06-16-1994, Defendant
No Logo Helen Garland Trust No 2 (For Gwendolyn Garland Babcock) UAD 06/26/35, Defendant
No Logo Helen Garland Trust No 2 (For Hillary Duque Garland), Defendant
No Logo Helen Garland Trust No 2 (For William M Garland III) UAD 06/26/35, Defendant
No Logo HELEN GROSSMAN TRUST U/A/D 09/08/99, Defendant
No Logo HELEN HAY WHITNEY FOUNDATION (WHITNEYEQ), Defendant
No Logo Helen Hough Feinberg, Defendant
No Logo HELEN K DOHM, Defendant
No Logo HELENA RUOTSALAINEN, Defendant
No Logo HENRY & MARY JO RAY, Defendant
No Logo HENRY ALIG SPURGEON, Defendant
No Logo HENRY C AND SHARYN L BORSKI, Defendant
No Logo Henry C. Borski, Defendant
No Logo HENRY CARSON JACKSON IRVOC MGMT TR UA 12-17-96 TR B, Defendant
No Logo HENRY CARSON JACKSON, IRREVOCABLE MANAGEMENT TRUST, UA 12-17-96 TRUST A-2, Defendant
No Logo Henry Francis Dupont Winterthur Museum, Inc., Defendant
No Logo HENRY G BARKHAUSEN, TR 12/14/36 TRUST, Defendant
No Logo HENRY H CAREY IMA, Defendant
No Logo HENRY H KINDLINGER IRR TR, Defendant
No Logo HENRY I PRIEN FAMILY TRUST, Defendant
No Logo HENRY M CHANCE TR DTD 6/26/36 FBO H CHANCE II, Defendant
No Logo HENRY M HARPER JR TRUST, TR UA 12/22/93, Defendant
No Logo HENRY P ALBRECHT REVOCABLE TRUST U/A 1/21/74, Defendant
No Logo Henry R. Dekan, Defendant
No Logo Henry Ray, Defendant
No Logo Henry Spurgeon, Defendant
No Logo HENSHEL FOUNDATION SPECIAL ACCOUNT, Defendant
No Logo HERBERT ANTHONY CLARK, JR, Defendant
No Logo HERBERT G. IAU PROFIT SHARING QRP PARTICIPATION, Defendant
No Logo HERBERT L WASHINGTON, Defendant
No Logo HERBERT VANCE, HERBERT VANCE TR 8/9/71, Defendant
No Logo HERMAN R FRIEDBERG REV TR, Defendant
No Logo HERMAN R. FRIEDBERG REV TR, Defendant
No Logo HERMAN VOLPE TRUST 01/24/92, Defendant
No Logo HF BARBARA J MCKENNY ADVISORY, Defendant
No Logo HFR Asset Mgmt LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
HFR Asset MGMT. LLC
No Logo HFR ED SELECT PERFORMANCE MASTER TRUST ENHANCED, Defendant
No Logo HFR RVA COMBINED MASTER TR (HFR RVA WHITEBOX MASTER TRUST F/K/A HVR RVA COMBINED MASTER TRUST), Defendant
No Logo HHS Partnership, Defendant
No Logo HIDEKAZU KOYANAGI, Defendant
No Logo HIGHBRIDGE EVENT DRIVEN/RELATIVE VALUE FUND, LP, Defendant
No Logo Highbridge International LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Highbridge International LLC
No Logo HIGHBRIDGE INTERNATIONAL LLC (NO 3), Defendant
No Logo Highmark, Inc., Defendant
No Logo HILDA FLYNN, Defendant
No Logo HIMAN BROWN, TR UA 11/20 02 HIMAN BROWN REVOCABLE TRUST, Defendant
No Logo Hirtle Callaghan Trust, Defendant
No Logo Hite Capital Management, LLC, Defendant
No Logo HNB Macro 100, Defendant
No Logo HOC GST Exempt Trust No 2 FBO eliza Haskins UAD 06/26/35, Defendant
No Logo HOC GST Exempt Trust No. 2 FBO John Haskins, Defendant
No Logo HOC GST Exempt Trust No. 2 FBO Scott Haskins, Defendant
No Logo HOC Trust No 2 FBO Eliza Haskins UAD 06/26/35, Defendant
No Logo HOC Trust No 2 FBO John Haskins UAD 6/26/35, Defendant
No Logo HOC Trust No 2 FBO Scott Haskins UAD 06/26/35, Defendant
No Logo HOESLEY FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, Defendant
No Logo HOLMES FAMILY TRUST UA DTD 04/24/87, Defendant
No Logo Homeland Insurance Company of, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Homeland Insurance Company of
No Logo Homeland Insurance Company of New York, Defendant
No Logo HON HARRY F BYRD REV TRUST U/A DTD 01/25/82, Defendant
No Logo HONEYWELL - INCOME AND APPRECIATION HOLDINGS, Defendant
No Logo Honeywell International Inc. Master Retirement Trust, Defendant
No Logo Hong Kong Monetary Authority, Defendant
No Logo Hong Lu, Defendant
No Logo HORACE W. HOWELLS, Defendant
No Logo HORIZON GOLDEN PARTNERS L P, Defendant
No Logo HORIZON PARTNERS, Defendant
No Logo HORIZON TRUST & INVESTMENT MAN, Defendant
No Logo HORIZON TRUST & INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, Defendant
No Logo HORWITZ CHARITABLE FUND, Defendant
No Logo Houston Endowment, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Melissa Jane Armstrong +1 212 408 2568 +1 212 259 2586 melissa.armstrong@bakerbotts.com
Lisa Jane Hart +1 212 408 2519 +1 212 259 2519 lisa.hart@bakerbotts.com
No Logo HOW BARNES HOEFER & ARNETT EMPLOYEE PROFIT SHARING PLAN FBO JOHN LABAK, Defendant
No Logo HOWARD BERKOWITZ, Defendant
No Logo Howard F. Ahmanson Jr. Revocable Trust, Defendant
No Logo HOWARD L. WEINSTEIN, Defendant
No Logo HOWARD RESNICK, Defendant
No Logo HOWARD SHULKES RESIDUARY CREDI U/A DTD 09/20/1991, Defendant
No Logo Howe Barnes Hoefer & Arnett, Inc. Employees' Profit Sharing Plan, Defendant
No Logo Howe Barnes Investment, Inc. Employees' Profit Sharing Plan, Defendant
No Logo HOWELLS FAMILY GST, Defendant
No Logo HSBC Bank PLC, Defendant
HSBC Bank USA, NA, Defendant
No Logo HSUEH-MEI PU, Defendant
No Logo Hudson Bay Fund LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Hudson Bay Fund LP
No Logo Hudson Bay Master Fund Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Hudson Bay Master Fund, LTD
No Logo HUFFMAN FAMILY FOUNDATION, Defendant
No Logo HUGH LAWSON BROWN & ERLINE P. BROWN, Defendant
No Logo HUMPHREY JOHN & JOAN - FAMILY TR, Defendant
No Logo Huntington Asset Services, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Huntington Macro 100 Fund, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Worcester, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Nicholas M. O'Donnell +1 617 338 2814 +1 617 338 2880 nodonnell@sandw.com
No Logo Huntington National Bank, Defendant
No Logo HUNTINGTON R /CHARLES HUNTINGTON, Defendant
No Logo HUNTINGTON R B/ANNA H DEMING, Defendant
No Logo Huntington Trust Company, Defendant
No Logo HURRICANE FUND I - IMA, Defendant
No Logo Hussman Strategic Growth Fund, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Hussman Strategic Growth Fund
No Logo HYMAN F BLUM, Defendant
No Logo Hyman F. Blum, Defendant
No Logo I-SHARES DOW JONES U.S. CONSUMER SERVICES SECTOR INDEX FUND, Defendant
No Logo I-SHARES MORNINGSTAR MID VALUE INDEX FUND, Defendant
No Logo I-SHARES MSCI KLD 400 SOCIAL INDEX FUND, Defendant
No Logo I-SHARES RUSSELL 100 VALUE INDEX FUND, Defendant
No Logo I-Shares Russell 1000 Index Fund, Defendant
No Logo I-SHARES RUSSELL 300 VALUE INDEX FUND, Defendant
No Logo I-SHARES RUSSELL 3000 INDEX FUND, Defendant
No Logo I-SHARES RUSSELL MIDCAP INDEX FUND, Defendant
No Logo I-SHARES RUSSELL MIDCAP VALUE INDEX FUND, Defendant
No Logo I-SHARES S&P 500 INDEX FUND, Defendant
No Logo I-SHARES S&P 500 VALUE INDEX FUND, Defendant
No Logo I.B.E.W. 103, Defendant
No Logo IA UMKC COMMINGLED FD-LARGE CAP, Defendant
No Logo IATSE NATIONAL PENSION FUND, Defendant
No Logo IBEW-NECA EQUITY INDEX FUND, Defendant
No Logo IBEW/NECA LO 124 PENSION - ALLIANCE, Defendant
No Logo IBM 401(K) PLUS PLAN TRUST, Defendant
No Logo IBM Canada Ltd., Defendant
International Business Machines Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
IBM Canada Limited, sued herein as IBM Canada
INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES PERSONAL

Toggle Switch Represented by Satterlee Stephens Burke & Burke LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Christopher Robert Belmonte +1 908 277 2221 +1 212 818 9606 cbelmonte@ssbb.com
No Logo IBM Netherlands MSCI US, Defendant
No Logo IBM Retirement Funds, Defendant
No Logo ICAP COORPORATES LLC, Defendant
No Logo ICAP Corporates LLC, Defendant
No Logo ICCREA BANCA SPA- EUROPE (RB9999), Defendant
No Logo Ice Bear Incorporated, Defendant
No Logo Idaho Trust Bank, Defendant
No Logo IGLESIA METODISTA DEL PERU, Defendant
No Logo IL STUDENT ASSISTANCE COMMISSION LCV, Defendant
No Logo Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund, Defendant
No Logo Illinois State Board of Investment, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Illinois State Board of Investment
No Logo Illinois Student Assistance Commission, Defendant
No Logo IM CERVURITE FAMILY LLC, Defendant
No Logo IM PERSONAL PENSION PLAN TRUST, Defendant
No Logo INACTIVE - GUGGENHEIM, Defendant
No Logo INARCASSA U.S. STRUCTURED EQUITY, Defendant
No Logo Index 500 Fund, Defendant
No Logo INDIAN POINT QUALIFIED NDT INVESTMENT POOL C-O MELLON GSS, Defendant
No Logo Indiana State Teachers' Retirement Fund, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ice Miller LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Matthew Lewis Fornshell +1 614 462 2700 +1 614 222 3692 matthew.fornshell@icemiller.com
No Logo INDUSTRY PAIRS, Defendant
No Logo Ing Belgium Sa, Defendant
No Logo Ing Capital LLC, Defendant
ING Direct, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ING Largecap Value Fund
No Logo ING Index Plus Largecap EQ FD V1 F/K/A ING Principal Protec FD 1V, Defendant
No Logo ING Index Plus Largecap Equity Fund IV, Defendant
No Logo ING Index Plus Largecap Equity N/K/A Indexplus Large Cap Fund, Defendant
No Logo ING INVESTMENT TRUST (ING T. ROWE PRICE EQUITY INCOME PORTFOLIO, ING LARGE CAP VALUE PORT., ING US STOCK INDEX PORT., SERIES OF ING INVESTORS TRUST), Defendant
No Logo ING INVESTMENT TRUST CO. ENHANCED CORE EQUITY COMMON TRUST FUND-CO588, Defendant
No Logo ING INVESTMENT TRUST COMPANY, Defendant
No Logo ING INVESTORS TRUST, Defendant
No Logo ING US STOCK INDEX PORTFOLIO, Defendant
No Logo INJA LEW, Defendant
No Logo INKA MBH, Defendant
No Logo INKA MBH A/K/A INTERNATIONALE KAPITAANAGEGESELLSCHAFT MBH A/K/A HSBC INKA, Defendant
No Logo INNOVEST-SIEMENS EQUITY NORT, Defendant
No Logo Instinet, Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Instinet, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Vandenberg & Feliu, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Raymond Leonard Vandenberg +1 212 763 6800 +1 212 763 6810 rvandenberg@vanfeliu.com
No Logo INSTINET, LLC A/K/A INSTINET CORPORATION, Defendant
No Logo Institutional Benchmarks Series (Master Feeder) Limited, Defendant
No Logo INSTITUTIONAL BENCHMARKS SERIES (MF) LTD - MARKAB SRS CFD ACCOUNT ONLY, Defendant
No Logo INSTITUTIONAL BENCHMARKS SERIES MASTER FEEDER LIMITED MATAR SERIES OLYMPIA CAPITAL INT'L INC, Defendant
No Logo INSTITUTIONAL BENCHMARKS SERIES MASTER FUND, LTD., Defendant
No Logo INSTITUTIONAL MANAGED US EQUIT, Defendant
No Logo INSTITUTIONAL MANAGED US EQUITY ASSANT WEALTH MANAGEMENT, Defendant
No Logo INSTITUTIONAL SHAREHOLDER SERVICES, Defendant
No Logo Institutional Shareholder Services Inc., Defendant
No Logo INSTITUTIONAL SHAREHOLDER SERVICES ISS/210/BERNSTEIN, Defendant
No Logo INSTL BCHMRK SER (MSTR FDR) LTD I/R/O GLAZER MERGER ABRITRAGE SER, Defendant
No Logo INTEGRITY ASSET MANAGEMENT, Defendant
Intel Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Intel Corporation