Robert Briseno v. Conagra Foods, Inc.
California Central District Court, Case No. 2:11-cv-05379
District Judge Margaret M. Morrow, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.cacd.2-11-cv-05379 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Judges don't know as much about themselves as we do.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Alexis Justak, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bramson, Plutzik, Mahler & Birkhaeuser LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Lawrence Timothy Fisher +1 925 945 0200 +1 925 945 8792 ltfisher@bramsonplutzik.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bursor & Fisher PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Sarah Nicole Westcot +1 925 482 1515 +1 925 407 2700 swestcot@bursor.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Scott A Bursor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Scott A Bursor +1 212 989 9113 +1 212 989 9163

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Adam J. Levitt +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 levitt@whafh.com
No Logo Anita Willman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Adam J. Levitt +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 levitt@whafh.com
No Logo Anne Cowan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Adam J. Levitt +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 levitt@whafh.com
No Logo Bonnie McDonald, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Adam J. Levitt +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 levitt@whafh.com
No Logo Brenda Krein, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Freed and Weiss

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Eric David Freed +1 312 220 0000 +1 312 220 7777 eric@freedweiss.com
Julie Diane Miller +1 312 220 0000 juliem@freedweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheller, Ludwig & Badey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Scott Alan George +1 215 790 7300 +1 215 546 0942

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Adam J. Levitt +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 levitt@whafh.com
No Logo Cheri Shafstall, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Adam J. Levitt +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 levitt@whafh.com
No Logo Christi Toomer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Francis M. Gregorek +1 619 231 1058

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Edmund S Aronowitz +1 312 984 0000 aronowitz@whafh.com
Adam J. Levitt +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 levitt@whafh.com
No Logo Dee Hopper-Kercheval, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Adam J. Levitt +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 levitt@whafh.com
No Logo Erika Heins, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Adam J. Levitt +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 levitt@whafh.com
No Logo Janeth Ruiz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Leopold-Kuvin, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
William Charles Wright +1 561 514 0904 +5140 514 514 0905 wwright@leopoldkuvin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Adam J. Levitt +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 levitt@whafh.com
No Logo Jill Crouch, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Adam J. Levitt +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 levitt@whafh.com
No Logo Julie Palmer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Adam J. Levitt +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 levitt@whafh.com
No Logo Kelly McFadden, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Reese Richman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Michael Robert Reese +1 212 579 4625 +1 212 253 4272 michael@reeserichman.com
Kim Eleazer Richman +1 212 687 8291 +1 212 687 8292 krichman@reeserichman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Adam J. Levitt +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 levitt@whafh.com
No Logo Leonora Ulitsky, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bramson, Plutzik, Mahler & Birkhaeuser LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Lawrence Timothy Fisher +1 925 945 0200 +1 925 945 8792 ltfisher@bramsonplutzik.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bursor & Fisher PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Sarah Nicole Westcot +1 925 482 1515 +1 925 407 2700 swestcot@bursor.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Scott A Bursor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Scott A Bursor +1 212 989 9113 +1 212 989 9163

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Adam J. Levitt +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 levitt@whafh.com
No Logo Lil Marie-Birr, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Adam J. Levitt +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 levitt@whafh.com
No Logo Maureen Towey, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Adam J. Levitt +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 levitt@whafh.com
No Logo Michele Andrade, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Adam J. Levitt +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 levitt@whafh.com
No Logo Necla Musat, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Adam J. Levitt +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 levitt@whafh.com
No Logo Patty Boyer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Adam J. Levitt +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 levitt@whafh.com
No Logo Pauline Michael, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Adam J. Levitt +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 levitt@whafh.com
No Logo Phyllis Scarpelli, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bramson, Plutzik, Mahler & Birkhaeuser LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Lawrence Timothy Fisher +1 925 945 0200 +1 925 945 8792 ltfisher@bramsonplutzik.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bursor & Fisher PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Sarah Nicole Westcot +1 925 482 1515 +1 925 407 2700 swestcot@bursor.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Scott A Bursor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Scott A Bursor +1 212 989 9113 +1 212 989 9163

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Adam J. Levitt +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 levitt@whafh.com
No Logo Robert Briseno, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Andrei V Rado +1 212 907 0821 +1 212 883 7521 arado@labaton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Adam J. Levitt +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 levitt@whafh.com
No Logo Rona Johnston, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Adam J. Levitt +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 levitt@whafh.com
v.
Conagra Foods, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Douglas M Schwab +1 415 374 2301 +1 415 374 2499 douglas.schwab@hoganlovells.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 150 Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
  Entries (160) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PACER 182
PACER 181
PACER 180
PACER 179
PACER 178
PACER 177
PACER 176 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE TEXT ENTRY CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION TO MODIFY ORDER APPOINTING INTERIM LEAD COUNSEL by Judge Margaret M. Morrow re: MOTION for Order for Modify Order Appointing Interim Lead Counsel 174 previously scheduled for 12/23/2013 AT 10:00 am has been rescheduled. Motion set for hearing on 1/6/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 09/26/2013)
PACER 175 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion to Modify Order Appointing Interim Lead Counsel 174 . The following error(s) was found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): Motion is noticed for a date that is closed on the court's calendar. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
PACER 174 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Modify Order Appointing Interim Lead Counsel filed by plaintiff Robert Briseno. Motion set for hearing on 12/23/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Azar, David) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
PACER 173 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: denying 171 Defendant's Ex Parte Application for an Order Staying Action Pending Outcome of Referral to Food and Drug Administration. (rne) (Entered: 08/13/2013)
PDF 172 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending OUTCOME OF REFERRAL TO FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION 171 (Plaintiffs' Opposition to Ex Parte Application for Order Staying Proceedings Pending Outcome of Referral to FDA) filed by Plaintiffs Michele Andrade, Patty Boyer, Robert Briseno, Anne Cowan, Jill Crouch, Erika Heins, Dee Hopper-Kercheval, Rona Johnston, Alexis Justak, Brenda Krein, Lil Marie-Birr, Bonnie McDonald, Kelly McFadden, Pauline Michael, Necla Musat, Julie Palmer, Janeth Ruiz, Phyllis Scarpelli, Cheri Shafstall, Christi Toomer, Maureen Towey, Leonora Ulitsky, Anita Willman. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Henry J, Kelston)(Azar, David) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
  • Attachment 1
PACER 171 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending OUTCOME OF REFERRAL TO FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
PACER 170 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Julie Diane Miller counsel for Plaintiff Brenda Krein. Julie D. Miller is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Brenda Krein. (Miller, Julie) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
PACER 169 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ONLY ENTRY STRIKING MOTION TO WITHDRAW 168 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow. Counsel is direced to file Form G-123 ("Notice of Appearance or WITHDRAWAL of Counsel"). THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(ah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/17/2013)
PACER 168 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
APPLICATION of Julie D. Miller to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Plaintiff Brenda Krein. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Julie) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
PACER 167 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ONLY ENTRY STRIKING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTYORNEY 166 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow. Incorrect event used. Correct event is -Motions and Related Filings- Applications- Substitution of Attorney. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(ah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/10/2013)
PACER 166 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None
[STRICKEN] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Julie D. Miller to Withdraw as Attorney filed by plaintiff Brenda Krein. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Julie) Modified on 7/10/2013 (ah). (Entered: 07/09/2013)
PACER 165 Filed: 7/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ENTRY ONLY: Judge Margaret M. Morrow is participating in a pilot project regarding the submission of SEALED DOCUMENTS. Effective July 8, 2013, all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judge's Chambers email at MMM_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. Please refer to the judge's procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(ah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/05/2013)
PACER 164 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR Re: Protective Order 163 . Due to clerical error incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. The incorrect document is replaced with the correct document entitled Stipulated Protective Order. (mp) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
PDF 163 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg re Order on Motion for Order re Discovery Matter 162 . IT IS STIPULATED, AGREED, AND JOINTLY REQUESTED by Plaintiffs ("Plaintiffs") and Defendant ConAgra Foods, Inc. ("Defenda nt")(Collectively, the "Parties"), by and through their respective counsel, that a protective order should be entered according to the following terms and provisions ("Protective Order") pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(c): (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS.) ***** NOTE CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT ***** (mp) (Main Document 163 replaced on 6/25/2013) (mp).
PDF 163 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg re Order on Motion for Order re Discovery Matter 162 . IT IS STIPULATED, AGREED, AND JOINTLY REQUESTED by Plaintiffs ("Plaintiffs") and Defendant ConAgra Foods, Inc. ("Defendant")(Collectively, the "Parties"), by and through their respective counsel, that a protective order should be entered according to the following terms and provisions ("Protective Order") pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(c): (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS.) ***** NOTE CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT ***** (mp) (Main Document 163 replaced on 6/25/2013) (mp). (Entered: 06/25/2013)
PACER 162 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg: granting in part and denying in part 159 Motion for Order. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RESOLUTION OF OPEN ISSUES ON PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. For the reasons stated on the record, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for entry of a protective order is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The court has revised the proposed protective order submitted by the parties and ORDERS the entry of that protective order. (mp) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
PACER 161 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg re: MOTION for Order for Resolution of Limited Open Issues on [Proposed] Confidentiality Protective Order 159 . The motion previously scheduled for July 16, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. is advanced to Tuesday, June 25, 2013 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Counsel are ordered to appear telephonically on this date and time. The call-in information is as follows: Call-in Number: (213) 894-0800; Meeting ID: 1112#; User Password: 6206#. If counsel have any problems connecting to this call, please contact the Space and Facilities Help Desk at (213) 894-1400.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(mp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 06/20/2013)
PACER 160 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno, re MOTION for Order for Resolution of Limited Open Issues on [Proposed] Confidentiality Protective Order 159 served on 06/14/2013. (Westerman, Jeff) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
PACER 159 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Resolution of Limited Open Issues on [Proposed] Confidentiality Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. Motion set for hearing on 7/16/2013 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Statement of Plaintiffs' Motion)(Westerman, Jeff) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
PACER 158 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robert B Hawk on behalf of Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc. (Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
PACER 157 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Jeff S. Westerman on behalf of Plaintiff Robert Briseno. Filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno (Azar, David) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
PACER 156 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Jeff S Westerman counsel for Plaintiff Robert Briseno. Changing firm name and address to Westerman Law Corp., 1925 Century Park East, Suite 2100, Los Angeles, CA 90067. Changing e-mail and fax number to jwesterman@jswlegal.com and (310) 201-9160. Adding Jeff S. Westerman as attorney as counsel of record for plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Robert Briseno (Westerman, Jeff) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
PACER 155 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Nicole M Duckett counsel for Plaintiff Robert Briseno. Adding Nicole M. Duckett as attorney as counsel of record for plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Robert Briseno (Duckett, Nicole) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
PACER 154 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF CERTAIN COUNSEL - CHRISTIAN KEENEY filed by plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Azar, David) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
PACER 153 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: granting 151 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Henry J. Kelston on behalf of Plaintiff Robert Briseno, designating David E. Azar as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 02/19/2013)
PACER 152 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: granting 150 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ariana J. Tadler on behalf of Plaintiff Robert Briseno, designating David E. Azar as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 02/19/2013)
PACER 151 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
APPLICATION for attorney Henry J. Kelston to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-11674143 paid.) filed by plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order)(Azar, David) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
PACER 150 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
APPLICATION for attorney Ariana J. Tadler to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-11674062 paid.) filed by plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order)(Azar, David) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
PACER 149 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial TBD, filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno.. (Azar, David) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
PACER 148 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change of address by Adam J Levitt attorney for Plaintiffs Patty Boyer, Christi Toomer, Anita Willman. Changing attorneys address to 30 North LaSalle Street, Suite 1200 Chicago Illinois, 60602. Filed by Plaintiffs Patty Boyer, Christi Toomer, Anita Willman. (Levitt, Adam) (Entered: 02/07/2013)
PACER 147 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Adam J Levitt counsel for Plaintiffs Patty Boyer, Christi Toomer, Anita Willman. Changing Firm and Address to Grant & Eisenhofer P.A. 826 West Oakdale Avenue Chicago Illinois 60657. Changing email to alevitt@gelaw.com. Adding Adam J. Levitt as attorney as counsel of record for Christi Toomer, Anita Willman and Patty Boyer for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Christi Toomer, Anita Willman and Patty Boyer (Levitt, Adam) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
PACER 146 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
IN CHAMBERS ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE UPDATED JOINT 26(f) REPORT by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in a timely fashion and to file an updated Joint Rule 26(f) Report on or before 02/11/2013. (ah) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
PACER 145 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None
ANSWER to Amended Complaint 143 JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc..(Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 01/16/2013)
PACER 144 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney David E Azar counsel for Plaintiff Robert Briseno.Christian Keeney is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Robert Briseno (Azar, David) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
PACER 143 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: None
SECOND CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against defendants Conagra Foods, Inc. amending CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT, 80 . (bm) (bm). (Entered: 12/20/2012)
PACER 142 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to Michael Robert Reese, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward, re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive 137 . (bm) (Entered: 12/06/2012)
PACER 141 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION 140 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow. Plaintiff's have until 12/19/2012 to file a Second Amended Consolidated Complaint. Defendant shall answer or respond by 1/16/2013. (vdr) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
PACER 140 Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 11/29/2012)
PACER 139 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to Michael Robert Reese, Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, re Order on Motion to Dismiss Case 138 . (bm) (Entered: 11/29/2012)
PACER 138 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION 84 TO DISMISS by Judge Margaret M. Morrow. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint within twenty (20) days of the entry of this order. (vdr) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
PACER 137 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
IN CHAMBERS COURT ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: The court orders CV 11-08421 consolidated with the above cases under the following caption: In re ConAgra Foods, Inc. CASE No. CV 11-05379-MMM(AGRx). See order. (ah) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
PACER 136 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to Michael Robert Reese - RETURNED TO SENDER re Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112), 134 (lw) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
PACER 135 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION 131 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow. See deficiency notice issued on 10/09/2012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(ah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/10/2012)
PACER 134 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06) 131 . The following error(s) was found: Form G-06 is filled-out per attorney, please do not combine another attorney's information. A separate Form G-06 should be filled-out for attorney Eric Freed. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lom) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
PACER 133 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to Michael Robert Reese re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held 109 . (csi) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
PACER 132 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to Michael Robert Reese re Order 108 . (csi) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
PACER 131 Filed: 10/8/2012, Entered: None
[STRICKEN] NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Julie Diane Miller counsel for Plaintiff Brenda Krein. Changing address and firm name to Complex Litigation Group LLC 513 Central Avenue, Suite 300, Highland Park IL 60035. Changing fax number to 847-433-2500. Adding Julie Diane Miller as attorney as counsel of record for Plaintiff Brenda Krein for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Brenda Krein (Miller, Julie) Modified on 10/10/2012 (ah). (Entered: 10/08/2012)
PACER 130 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to Michael Robert Reese re Order on Motion for Protective Order, Motion Hearing,,,,,,,, 110 (bp) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
PACER 129 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to Erid D. Freed re Order on Motion for Protective Order, Motion Hearing,,,,,,,, 110 (bp) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
PACER 128 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to Julie Diane Miller re Order on Motion for Protective Order, Motion Hearing,,,,,,,, 110 (bp) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
PACER 127 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to Eric D. Freed re Order on Motion for Protective Order, Motion Hearing,,,,,,,, 110 (bp) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
PACER 126 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to Julie Diane Miller re Order on Motion for Protective Order, Motion Hearing,,,,,,,, 110 (bp) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
PACER 125 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to MICHAEL ROBERT REESE re Order on Motion for Protective Order Motion Hearing 110 . (rne) (Entered: 08/09/2012)
PACER 124 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to JULIE DIANE MILLER re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held 109 . (rne) (Entered: 08/08/2012)
PACER 123 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to Julie Diane Miller re Order,, 108 (bp) (Entered: 08/08/2012)
PACER 122 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to Eric D. Freed re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, 109 (bp) (Entered: 08/08/2012)
PACER 121 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to Eric D. Freed re Order,, 108 (bp) (Entered: 08/08/2012)
PACER 120 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 7/24/12 9:48 a.m. re Transcript 119 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(mo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/31/2012)
PACER 119 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 7/24/12 9:48 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Babykin Courthouse Services, phone number (626) 963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/21/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/31/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/29/2012. (mo) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
PACER 118 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to Michael Robert Reese re Order on Motion to Dismiss Case 99 . (csi) (Entered: 07/26/2012)
PACER 117 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to Julie Diane Miller re Order Taking Motion Under Submission 99 . (csi) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
PACER 116 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to Eric D Freed re Order Taking Motion Under Submission 99 . (csi) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
PACER 115 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to Julie Diane Miller re Notice of Filing Transcript (G-46) 103 . (csi) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
PACER 114 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to Eric D Freed re Notice of Filing Transcript (G-46) 103 . (csi) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
PACER 113 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to Michael Robert Reese re Notice of Filing Transcript (G-46) 103 . (csi) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
PACER 112 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for date of proceedings 7/24/2012 to 7/24/2012 re: Order on Motion for Protective Order, Motion Hearing,,,,,,,, 110 , as to plaintiff Robert Briseno Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Cecille Chaffins at cchaffins@milberg.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: 7/24/2012. Category: Expedited. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Westerman, Jeff) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
PACER 111 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for date of proceedings 7/24/2012 to 7/24/2012 re: Order on Motion for Protective Order, Motion Hearing,,,,,,,, 110 , as to Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc. Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Kris May at kris.may@hoganlovells.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Testimony of: Entire Telephonic Hearing of 7/24/2012. Other: 7/24/2012. Category: Expedited. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
PACER 110 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES OF granting 104 Motion for Protective Order re MOTION for Protective Order for Plaintiffs' Preservation Obligations 104 ; Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. On July 2, 2012, Plaintiffs filed a motion for protective order. On July 10, 2012, Plaintiffs filed a supplemental memorandum. The court heard oral argument on July 24, 2012. At oral argument, the court made clear that it was ruling only on Plaintiffs' motion for protective order as to the two categories in dispute as currently written. The court expresses no opinion as to the viability of discovery requests that cover the same subject matter. Moreover, the court cannot give an advisory opinion as to the scope of appropriate preservation of evidence. The parties are free to meet and confer in an effort to narrow the scope of ConAgra's request. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion for protective order is GRANTED.(See Order for details.)Court Recorder: CS 7/24/2012. (mp) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
PACER 109 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg re: MOTION for Protective Order for Plaintiffs' Preservation Obligations 104 . The Court on its own motion advances the time of the hearing from 10:00 a.m. to 9:45 a.m. on July 24, 2012. The telephone number to call is (213) 894-0800, Meeting ID Number is 7002#, and User Password is 0042#. If counsel have any problems connecting to this call, please contact the Space and Facilities Help Desk at (213) 894-1400. Counsel are ordered to appear telephonically on this date and time. (mp) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
PACER 108 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO APPEAR AT HEARING ON MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TELEPHONICALLY by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg, re Stipulation for Leave 107 . Pursuant to the parties Joint Motion to Appear at Hearing on Motion for Protective Order Telephonically, and for good cause, the Court HEREBY ORDERS that counsel for all parties are authorized to appear telephonically at the hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order scheduled for July 24, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. (mp) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
PACER 107 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
Joint STIPULATION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Hearing on Motion for Protective Order filed by plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Keeney, Christian) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
PACER 106 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Protective Order for Plaintiffs' Preservation Obligations 104 Supplemental Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Keeney, Christian) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
PACER 105 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None
JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION for Protective Order for Plaintiffs' Preservation Obligations 104 filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Christian Keeney, # 2 Declaration Plaintiff Briseno, # 3 Declaration Plaintiff Toomer, # 4 Declaration Plaintiff Wilman, # 5 Declaration Robert Hawk)(Keeney, Christian) (Entered: 07/02/2012)
PACER 104 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Protective Order for Plaintiffs' Preservation Obligations filed by plaintiff Robert Briseno. Motion set for hearing on 7/24/2012 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (Keeney, Christian) (Entered: 07/02/2012)
PACER 103 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 05-21-2012 11:55 a.m. re Transcript 102 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(Duvall, Richard) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 06/27/2012)
PACER 102 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 05-21-2012 11:55 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: MARK SCHWEITZER, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number (213) 663-3494. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/18/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/28/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/25/2012. (Duvall, Richard) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
PACER 101 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for date of proceedings 5/21/2012 to 5/21/2012 as to Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc. Court Reporter Mark Schweitzer. Court will contact Michael Ewers at michael.ewers@hoganlovells.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Motion to Dismiss 5/21/12. Category: Expedited. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
PACER 100 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for date of proceedings 5/21/2012 to 5/21/2012 re: Order on Motion to Dismiss Case, Motion Hearing,, 99 , as to plaintiff Robert Briseno Court Reporter Mark Schweitzer. Court will contact Cecille Chaffins at cchaffins@milberg.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Motion to Dismiss 5/21/2012. Category: Expedited. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Westerman, Jeff) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
PACER 99 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES OF Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action 84 held before Judge Margaret M. Morrow: The court having carefully considered the papers and the evidence submitted by the parties, and having heard the oral argument of counsel, the court takes the motion to dismiss consolidated class action under submission.Court Reporter: Mark Schweitzer. (bp) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
PACER 98 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to Michael Robert Reese re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held 94 . (csi) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
PACER 97 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to Michael Robert Reese re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held 93 . (csi) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
PACER 96 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None
REPLY in Support MOTION to Dismiss Case Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof 84 filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 05/07/2012)
PACER 95 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Case Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof 84 filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Keeney, Christian) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
PACER 94 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
IN CHAMBERS Order Continuing Hearing Date On Defendants Motion to Dismiss 84 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is continued to 5/21/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. Opposition due 4/30/2012; Reply due 05/07/2012. (ah) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
PACER 93 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
IN CHAMBERS ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS 84 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: The court continues the motion to dismiss to 5/21/2012 at 10:00 AM pursuant to the stipulation 92 . Opposition due 4/30/2012. Reply due 05/07/2012. (ah) (Entered: 04/19/2012)
PACER 92 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response and Reply as to MOTION to Dismiss Case Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof 84 filed by Plaintiffs Michele Andrade, Patty Boyer, Robert Briseno, Anne Cowan, Jill Crouch, Erika Heins, Dee Hopper-Kercheval, Rona Johnston, Brenda Krein, Lil Marie-Birr, Bonnie McDonald, Kelly McFadden, Pauline Michael, Necla Musat, Julie Palmer, Janeth Ruiz, Phyllis Scarpelli, Cheri Shafstall, Christi Toomer, Maureen Towey, Anita Willman. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Levitt, Adam) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
PACER 91 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jill M Manning on behalf of Plaintiff Michele Andrade (Manning, Jill) (Entered: 03/01/2012)
PACER 85 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Case Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof 84 filed by defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
PACER 84 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/14/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
PACER 83 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION RE RESPONSE TO CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by Judge Margaret M. Morrow (bp) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
PACER 82 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Conagra Foods, Inc. answer now due 2/24/2012, re Consolidated Complaint, 80 filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
PACER 81 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Julio J Ramos on behalf of Plaintiff Lil Marie-Birr (Ramos, Julio) (Entered: 01/19/2012)
PDF 80 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None
CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT related to: Complaint - (Discovery), 1 ,filed by plaintiffs Christi Toomer, Robert Briseno, Brenda Krein, Phyllis Scarpelli, Kelly McFadden, Janeth Ruiz, Anne Cowan, Julie Palmer, Patty Boyer, Necla Musat, Pauline Michael, Rona Johnston, Cheri Shafstall, Jill Crouch, Erika Heins, Maureen Towey, Michele Andrade, Anita Willman, Dee Hopper-Kercheval, Lil Marie-Birr, Bonnie McDonald (bp) (Entered: 01/18/2012)
PACER 61 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
AMENDED ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION RE AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT, AND CONSOLIDATION OF ADDITIONAL ACTION by Judge Margaret M. Morrow, re Order 60 (bp) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
PACER 60 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION RE AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT, RESPONSE TO AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT, AND CONSOLIDATION OF ADDITIONAL ACTION by Judge Margaret M. Morrow, (bp) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
PACER 59 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER RE STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED ACTIONS by Judge Margaret M. Morrow, (bp) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
PACER 58 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
STIPULATION to Consolidate Cases as to 11-08513 filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Keeney, Christian) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
PACER 57 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Amended Consolidated Complaint, Response to Consolidated Complaint, and Consolidation of Additional Action filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
PACER 56 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: Order Consolidating Cases. The court orders CV11-9308 consolidated with the above cases under the following caption: In re ConAgra Foods, Inc. (bp) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
PACER 55 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: granting 53 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robin Wechkin on behalf of Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc., designating Robert B. Hawk as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
PDF 54 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS 24 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: Plaintiffs prayer for an order requiring ConAgra to adopt and enforce a policy that requires appropriate disclosure of genetically modified ingredients is preempted. Accordingly, that prayer may not be included in any amended complaint. With that exception, Briseno may file an amended complaint within twenty (20) days of the date of this order. (ah) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
PACER 53 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
APPLICATION for attorney Robin Wechkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-9533237 paid.) filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
PACER 52 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings MONDAY, NOVEMBER 7, 2011 (dc) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
PACER 51 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on MONDAY, NOVEMBER 7, 2011. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: MARK SCHWEITZER,, phone number (213) 663-3494. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 12/7/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/14/2012. (dc) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
PACER 50 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference; Defendan ConAgra's Motion to Dismiss 24 held before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. The court having carefully considered the papers and the evidence submitted by the parties, and having heard the oral argument of counsel, the court takes the motion to dismiss under submission. The Scheduling Conference is not held. The clerk will notify the parties when a new date has been scheduled.Court Reporter: Mark Schweitzer. (bp) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
PACER 49 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Rachele R Rickert counsel for Plaintiff Christi Toomer. Adding Rachele R. Rickert as attorney as counsel of record for Christi Toomer for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Christi Toomer (Rickert, Rachele) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
PACER 48 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): Order Appointing Interim Lead Counsel 35 43 44 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: The court enters this order on plaintiffs' stipulation, appointing Milberg and Wolf Halderstein as interim class counsel. In light of this ruling, the pending motions for appointment of interim class counsel (Docket Nos.43 and 44) are denied as moot. (bp) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
PACER 47 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Vacating Order re Consolidation by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: On October 15, 2011, the court issued an order consolidating this case with CV11-5379-MMM in error. The court vacates its October 14, 2011 order consolidating cases. (bp) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
PACER 46 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial TBD, filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno.. (Westerman, Jeff) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
PACER 45 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION re MOTION for Appointment of Counsel - Interim Class Counsel 44 filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. Motion set for hearing on 1/30/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. (Westerman, Jeff) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
PACER 44 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel - Interim Class Counsel filed by plaintiff Robert Briseno. Motion set for hearing on 1/30/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Proposed Order)(Westerman, Jeff) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
PACER 43 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Appoint Co-Lead Interim Class Counsel Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g)(3) filed by Plaintiffs ALEXIS JUSTAK, PHYLLIS SCARPELLI, LEONORA ULITSKY. Motion set for hearing on 1/30/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Appoint Co-Lead Interim Class Counsel Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g)(3), # 2 Declaration Declaration of Scott A. Bursor in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Co-Lead Interim Class Counsel, # 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Co-Lead Interim Class Counsel Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g)(3))(Fisher, Lawrence) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
PACER 42 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Lawrence Timothy Fisher on behalf of Plaintiffs ALEXIS JUSTAK, PHYLLIS SCARPELLI, LEONORA ULITSKY (Fisher, Lawrence) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
PACER 41 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None
STIPULATION for Hearing re Appoint Interim Class Counsel and Set Briefing Schedule filed by plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Westerman, Jeff) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
PACER 40 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
PACER 39 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
REPLY in Support MOTION to Dismiss Case MOTION TO DISMISS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF 24 filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
PACER 38 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: The court orders CV11-8513 consolidated with the above cases under the caption: In re Conagra Foods, Inc., CASE NO.CV11-5379-MMM(AGRx) (bp) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
PACER 37 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance on Behalf of Plaintiff Kelly McFadden filed by Plaintiff Kelly McFadden Robert Briseno. (Reese, Michael) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
PACER 36 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None
Copy of Certified Order from MDL Panel creating MDL 2:11-ml-02291 MMM (AGRx) See MDL docket for any documents common to two or more actions. (ghap) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
PACER 35 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
STIPULATION for Order Granting Stipulated Case Management Order filed by plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Westerman, Jeff) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
PACER 34 Filed: 10/10/2011, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Case MOTION TO DISMISS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF 24 filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Westerman, Jeff) (Entered: 10/10/2011)
PACER 33 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): Order Taking Off Calendar and Denying as Moot Motion of Plaintiffs Briseno and Toomer to Consolidate Related Actions and Designate Interim Class Counsel 8 . The court orders these matter consolidated under the caption: In re Conagra Food, Inc., Case No.CV11-5379-MMM(AGRx). Because the cases have now been consolidated, the parties are directed to file a stipulation and proposed order designating interim class counsel. (bp) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
PACER 32 Filed: 10/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES OF Telephone Status Conference held before Judge Margaret M. Morrow:Court Reporter: Mark Schweitzer. (bp) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
PACER 31 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
OPPOSITION to MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:11-CV-06127 DMG (AGR), MOTION for Appointment of Counsel Designating Milberg LLP and Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLC as Co-Interim Class Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:11-CV-06127 DMG (AGR), 8 DEFENDANT CONAGRA FOODS, INC.S RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATING RELATED ACTIONS filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
PACER 30 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND CLASS CERTIFICATION DEADLINE by Judge Margaret M. Morrow, (bp) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
PACER 29 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Class Certification filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Keeney, Christian) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
PACER 28 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Margaret M. Morrow The Court hereby ORDERS the documents listed below be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules. RE: Miscellaneous Document 27 (bp) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
PACER 27 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
[STRICKEN] Letter to Judge Margaret M. Morrow re Ex Parte Applications filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc. (Hawk, Robert) Modified on 8/26/2011 (ah). (Entered: 08/25/2011)
PACER 26 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Court Order Setting Scheduling Conference by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for 11/7/2011 10:00 AM. (bp) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
PACER 25 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Case MOTION TO DISMISS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF 24 filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
PACER 24 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case MOTION TO DISMISS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 11/7/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
PACER 23 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: granting 20 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Andrei V. Rado on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Jeff S. Westerman as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
PACER 22 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: granting 19 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jessica J. Sleater on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Jeff S. Westerman as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
PACER 21 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff Robert Briseno. Related Case(s): CV 11-6127 DMG (AGRx); CV 11-6402 DMG (PLAx); CV 11-6480 GW (MANx) (Westerman, Jeff) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
PACER 20 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None
APPLICATION for attorney Andrei V. Rado to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $275 receipt number 0973-9099523 paid.) filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order)(Westerman, Jeff) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
PACER 19 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None
APPLICATION for attorney Jessica J. Sleater to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $275 receipt number 0973-9099423 paid.) filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Westerman, Jeff) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
PACER 18 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
DENIED BY ORDER OF Judge Margaret M. Morrow, re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) 16 (bp) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
PACER 17 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. correcting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) 15 (Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
PACER 16 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
PACER 15 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
PACER 14 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ERRATA RE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
PACER 13 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc., (Hawk, Robert) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
PACER 12 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robert B Hawk on behalf of Defendant ConAgra Foods, Inc. (Hawk, Robert) Modified on 8/22/2011 (bp). (Entered: 08/10/2011)
PACER 11 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Jeff S. Westerman in support of MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:11-CV-06127 DMG (AGR), MOTION for Appointment of Counsel Designating Milberg LLP and Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLC as Co-Interim Class Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:11-CV-06127 DMG (AGR), 8 [CORRECTED - Exhibits G, K, P] filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q)(Westerman, Jeff) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
PACER 10 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Jeff S. Westerman in support of MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:11-CV-06127 DMG (AGR), MOTION for Appointment of Counsel Designating Milberg LLP and Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLC as Co-Interim Class Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:11-CV-06127 DMG (AGR), 8 filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q)(Westerman, Jeff) (Entered: 08/04/2011)
PACER 9 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION re MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:11-CV-06127 DMG (AGR), MOTION for Appointment of Counsel Designating Milberg LLP and Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLC as Co-Interim Class Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:11-CV-06127 DMG (AGR), 8 filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno. Motion set for hearing on 10/24/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. (Westerman, Jeff) (Entered: 08/04/2011)
PACER 8 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:11-CV-06127 DMG (AGR),, MOTION for Appointment of Counsel Designating Milberg LLP and Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLC as Co-Interim Class Counsel filed by plaintiff Robert Briseno. Motion set for hearing on 10/24/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Westerman, Jeff) (Entered: 08/04/2011)
PACER 7 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno, upon Defendant Conagra Foods, Inc. served on 6/29/2011, answer due 8/24/2011. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge, CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Westerman, Jeff) (Entered: 08/04/2011)
PACER 6 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None
STIPULATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ORDER. Defendant requested, and Plaintiff agrees to, an extension of time for Defendant to file a response to Plaintiff's complaint. Defendant shall have until August 24, 2011 to file a response to Plaintiff's complaint. (bp) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
PACER 5 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None
STIPULATION for Order to Enter Case Management Order filed by plaintiff Robert Briseno. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Westerman, Jeff) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
PACER 4 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application to Andrei V Rado for Plaintiff Robert Briseno. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-ResidentAttorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $275.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U. S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (car) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
PACER 3 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application to Jessica Sleater for Plaintiff Robert Briseno. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-ResidentAttorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $275.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U. S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (car) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
PACER 2 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno (car) (mg). (Entered: 06/30/2011)
PDF 1 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
COMPLAINT against Defendants Conagra Foods, Inc. Case assigned to Judge Margaret M. Morrow for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G Rosenberg.(Filing fee $ 350 PAID) Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Robert Briseno.(car) (mg). (Entered: 06/30/2011)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 111 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?