USA v. Roble
Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:12-cr-00348
District Judge James C. Cacheris, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.vaed.1-12-cr-00348 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
The right information can save you thousands of dollars.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Mohammed Suleiman Roble, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Patrick N Anderson Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Lavonda Nicole Graham-Williams +1 703 519 7100 lgraham@pnalaw.com
  Entries (16) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PACER 17 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to Indict; ORDERED that the time period for indicting the defendant be and is hereby extended up to and including August 17, 2012 as to Mohammed Suleiman Roble (1). Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 07/17/2012. (jlan) [1:12-mj-00405-TCB] (Entered: 07/18/2012)
PACER 16 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None
CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by USA as to Mohammed Suleiman Roble. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(jlan) [1:12-mj-00405-TCB] (Entered: 07/17/2012)
PACER 15 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None
WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Mohammed Suleiman Roble (Effendi, Alexander) [1:12-mj-00405-TCB] (Entered: 06/28/2012)
PACER 14 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None
Bond Entered as to Mohammed Suleiman Roble (ktot, ) [1:12-mj-00405-TCB] (Entered: 06/25/2012)
PACER 13 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Mohammed Suleiman Roble.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 6/22/2012. (ktot, ) [1:12-mj-00405-TCB] (Entered: 06/25/2012)
PACER 12 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Substitution of Counsel Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 6/22/2012. (ktot, ) [1:12-mj-00405-TCB] (Entered: 06/25/2012)
PACER 11 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis:Preliminary Hearing and Detention Hearing as to Mohammed Suleiman Roble held on 6/22/2012. USA appeared through Alexander Effendi. Defendant appeared w/ counsel: Lavonda Graham-Williams. Defendant has retained counsel, therefore the FPD is not longer assigned to this case. Substitution order filed and signed in open court. Defense requests the preliminary hearing be continued - GRANTED. Preliminary Hearing is continued to Friday, June 29, 2012. USA does not seek detention. Defendant is released on bond w/ conditions. (Tape #ftr.)(ktot, ) [1:12-mj-00405-TCB] (Entered: 06/25/2012)
PACER 10 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Temporary Detention Order as to Mohammed Suleiman Roble. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 6/20/2012. (ktot, ) [1:12-mj-00405-TCB] (Entered: 06/21/2012)
PACER 9 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis:Initial Appearance as to Mohammed Suleiman Roble held on 6/20/2012. USA appeared through Alex Effendi. Defendant appeared w/o counsel. Defendant informed of rights, charges and penalties. Court to appoint FPD to represent defendant. USA seeks detention. Matter continued for a Preliminary and Detention Hearing set for 6/22/2012 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. Defendant is REMANDED to the custody of the USMS. (Tape #ftr.)(ktot, ) [1:12-mj-00405-TCB] (Entered: 06/21/2012)
PACER 8 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None
Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 6/20/2012 in case as to Mohammed Suleiman Roble. (ktot, ) [1:12-mj-00405-TCB] (Entered: 06/21/2012)
PACER 7 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 6 Motion to Seal; ORDERED that the complaint and affidavit in support of the complaint, Motion to Seal, and this Order be Sealed until the defendant is arrested as to Mohammed Suleiman Roble (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 06/18/2012. (jlan) [1:12-mj-00405-TCB] (Entered: 06/18/2012)
PACER 6 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Seal by USA as to Mohammed Suleiman Roble. (jlan) [1:12-mj-00405-TCB] (Entered: 06/18/2012)
PACER 5 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis in case as to Mohammed Suleiman Roble. (jlan) [1:12-mj-00405-TCB] (Entered: 06/18/2012)
PACER 4 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: None
Redacted Criminal Case Cover Sheet (jlan) [1:12-mj-00405-TCB] (Entered: 06/18/2012)
PACER 2 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT by USA as to Mohammed Suleiman Roble 1 Complaint (jlan) [1:12-mj-00405-TCB] (Entered: 06/18/2012)
PACER 1 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: None
COMPLAINT as to Mohammed Suleiman Roble (1). (jlan) [1:12-mj-00405-TCB] (Entered: 06/18/2012)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 443 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?