Swift et al v. Direct Buy, Inc. et al
Indiana Northern District Court, Case No. 2:11-cv-00401
District Judge Theresa L Springmann, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.innd.2-11-cv-00401 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
This docket can only tell you so much. Get the rest.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 190 Contract: Other
  Entries (147) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PDF 189 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
OPINION AND ORDER granting plaintiff's 171 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement Agreement, Approval of Distribution of Net Cash Settlement Fund, Award of Attorney's Fees, and Award of Class Representatives' Incenter Fee. A final judgment will be issued consistent with this Opinion and Order and with the Settlement Agreement. Signed by Chief Judge Philip P Simon on 10/24/2013. (rmn)
PACER 187 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
FAIRNESS HEARING held on 9/10/2013 before Chief Judge Philip P Simon. Pla appeared by atty Richard Shevitz and Lawerence Eagle. Dft appeared by atty Russell Perdew and Joseph Yast. Parties present oral arguments. Parties to file under seal joint submission of Dft financial updates by 9/30/2013. Court takes under advisement 171 MOTION Final Approval of Class Action Settlement. (Court Reporter Tina Gallucci.) (jjj) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
PACER 186 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Philip P Simon for all further proceedings. Judge Theresa L Springmann no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Philip P Simon on 9/5/2013. (rmn) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
PACER 185 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENT to 183 Brief (Other) In Response to Objections and in Support of Final Approval of Class Settlement filed by DirectBuy Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5)(Sargent, Douglas) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
PACER 184 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ORDER granting 182 Motion for Leave to File A 28-page Final Approval Brief. Text entry/no pdf order to be issued. APPROVED by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 8/28/2013. (smb) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
PDF 183 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
BRIEF In Response to Objections and in Support of Final Approval of Class Settlement. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Perdew, P) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
  • Attachment 1: Exhibit 1
  • Attachment 2: Exhibit 2
  • Attachment 3: Exhibit 3
  • Attachment 4: Exhibit 4
PACER 182 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Unopposed) by Defendant DirectBuy Inc. (Perdew, P) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
PACER 181 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
BRIEF re 160 Objection, 164 Objection, 167 Letter, 154 Objection, 155 Objection, 165 Objection, 156 Objection, 176 Objection, 175 Objection, 161 Objection, 162 Objection, 152 Objection, 158 Objection, 174 Objection, 163 Objection, 157 Objection, 178 Objection, 151 Objection, 153 Objection, 166 Letter . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Richard Shevitz)(Shevitz, Richard) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
PACER 180 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE by DirectBuy Inc re 175 Objection Joint Notice of Withdrawal of Objection (Dkt. No. 175) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Sargent, Douglas) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
PACER 179 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
COPY of Settlement Current Member Claim Form from Carol A Bierenfeld. (rmn) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
PACER 178 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
OBJECTION to Proposed Settlement by Brenda Weeks. (rmn) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
PACER 177 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas R Sargent on behalf of DirectBuy Holdings Inc, DirectBuy Inc, United Consumers Club Inc, DirectBuy Inc, Beta Finance Company Inc, National Management Corporation, Trivest Partners IV Inc, UCC Distribution Inc Associated Cases: 2:11-cv-00401-TLS-PRC, 2:11-cv-00415-TLS-PRC, 2:11-cv-00417-TLS-PRC, 2:12-cv-00045-TLS-PRC(Sargent, Douglas) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
PACER 176 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None
OBJECTION to Proposed Settlement by Cathy Lochridge. (rmn) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
PACER 175 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
OBJECTION to Proposed Settlement by Carol A Bierenfeld, Robert W Bierenfeld. (tc) (Entered: 08/13/2013)
PACER 174 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
OBJECTION to the Proposed Settlement and Attorneys' Fee by Deborah Lemon. (tc) (Entered: 08/13/2013)
PACER 173 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change of Address by David L Marcus PHV (Marcus PHV, David) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
PACER 172 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
BRIEF in Support of 171 MOTION Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Shirley Whisman, Ron Whisman, Mary Mellino, Joel Machado, Angelique Alabsi, Loretta Fogg, Michael Nope, Danneil Zaychuk, Joel Calvillo, Lacey Harris, Tyrone Gillispie, Sean Mellino, William Fisher, Jeffrey Lane, Michael Habbinga, Dominic Gomes, Thomas Boettcher, Marie Denise Green, Vance Zachary, Thomas A Palmer, Terry Hutchens, Marco Cajas, Jamila Swift, Criscynthia Ellis, Shirley Habbinga, Meredith Fogg, Jeffrey Green, Phil Ganezer, Lynette Sohl, Susan Tafuri, Brian Vance, Arun Kaliappa, Hal Harnden, Christina Harnden, Donna Belles, Gina Brigida, Janice Harris, Richard E Cohoon, Sr, Kristin D Allfrey, Merrill Treadwell, Raymond Bailey, Shery Bailey. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Settlement Administrator Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A-1 Email Notice, # 3 Exhibit A-2 Class Notice, # 4 Exhibit A-3 Claim Package, # 5 Exhibit A-4 List of Federal and State Officials, # 6 Exhibit A-5 Notice to AGs, # 7 Exhibit A-6 Supp. Notice to AGs)(Shevitz, Richard) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
PACER 171 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
MOTION Final Approval of Class Action Settlement by Plaintiffs Angelique Alabsi, Kristin D Allfrey, Donna Belles, Thomas Boettcher, Gina Brigida, Marco Cajas, Joel Calvillo, Richard E Cohoon, Sr, Criscynthia Ellis, William Fisher, Loretta Fogg, Meredith Fogg, Phil Ganezer, Tyrone Gillispie, Dominic Gomes, Jeffrey Green, Marie Denise Green, Michael Habbinga, Shirley Habbinga, Christina Harnden, Hal Harnden, Janice Harris, Lacey Harris, Terry Hutchens, Arun Kaliappa, Jeffrey Lane, Joel Machado, Mary Mellino, Sean Mellino, Michael Nope, Thomas A Palmer, Lynette Sohl, Jamila Swift, Susan Tafuri, Merrill Treadwell, Brian Vance, Monique Venier, Ron Whisman, Shirley Whisman, Vance Zachary, Danneil Zaychuk. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Final Judgment)(Shevitz, Richard) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
PACER 170 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ORDER granting 168 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Pla(s) to file their Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement Agreement is extended to 8/2/103. Text entry/no pdf order to be issued. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 7/31/2013. (smb) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
PACER 169 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE by DirectBuy Inc of Proof of Notice Under Preliminary Approval Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Attachment A-1, # 3 Attachment A-2, # 4 Attachment A-3, # 5 Attachment A-4, # 6 Attachment A-5, # 7 Attachment A-6, # 8 Attachment A-7)(Cunningham, Thomas) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
PACER 168 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Final Approval by Plaintiffs Angelique Alabsi, Kristin D Allfrey, Donna Belles, Thomas Boettcher, Gina Brigida, Marco Cajas, Joel Calvillo, Richard E Cohoon, Sr, Criscynthia Ellis, William Fisher, Loretta Fogg, Meredith Fogg, Phil Ganezer, Tyrone Gillispie, Dominic Gomes, Jeffrey Green, Marie Denise Green, Michael Habbinga, Shirley Habbinga, Christina Harnden, Hal Harnden, Janice Harris, Lacey Harris, Terry Hutchens, Arun Kaliappa, Jeffrey Lane, Joel Machado, Mary Mellino, Sean Mellino, Michael Nope, Thomas A Palmer, Lynette Sohl, Jamila Swift, Susan Tafuri, Merrill Treadwell, Brian Vance, Ron Whisman, Shirley Whisman, Vance Zachary, Danneil Zaychuk. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Shevitz, Richard) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
PACER 167 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None
Letter from Eugene C Smalls re settlement (rmn) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
PACER 166 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
Letter from Kenanne Nagel requesting to be excluded from the proposed settlement agreement (rmn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2013: # 1 Envelope attached) (rmn). (Entered: 06/17/2013)
PACER 165 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None
OBJECTION to Action and Proposed Settlement by Bennett J Schliesman. (rmn) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
PACER 164 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None
OBJECTION to Action and Proposed Settlement by Richard Soto. (rmn) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
PACER 163 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None
OBJECTION to Action and Proposed Settlement by Jason Umphrey. (rmn) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
PACER 162 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None
OBJECTION to Action and Proposed Settlement by Cindy Chapman. (rmn) (Entered: 05/03/2013)
PACER 161 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None
OBJECTION to Action and Proposed Settlement by Ralf & Guissoo Schnurbusch. (rmn) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
PACER 160 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None
OBJECTION to Action and Proposed Settlement by Stuart and Jane Armstrong. (rmn) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
PACER 159 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
Former Member Claim Form by Angela Darrington. (rmn) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
PACER 158 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
OBJECTION to Action and Proposed Settlement by Walter and Linda Gresham. (rmn) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
PACER 157 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
OBJECTION to Action and Proposed Settlement by Hugh D. Camitta and Louise A. Snyder. (lhc) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
PACER 156 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
OBJECTION to Action and Proposed Settlement by Leticia Arce. (rmn) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
PACER 155 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
OBJECTION to Action and Proposed Settlement by Kenneth N Shortlidge. (rmn) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
PACER 154 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None
OBJECTION to Action and Proposed Settlement filed by Dawn and John Egan. (rmn) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
PACER 153 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None
OBJECTION to proposed settlement by John R. Leftault. (rmn) (Entered: 04/19/2013)
PACER 152 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None
OBJECTION to Action and Proposed Settlement filed by Peter and Pamela Spekman. (rmn) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
PACER 151 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
OBJECTION to Action and Proposed Settlement filed by Richard C. Greiner. (rmn) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
PACER 150 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER. The Court hereby VACATES the January 5, 2012 Order of consolidation as to cause number 2:11cv416 ONLY and ORDERS that cause number 2:11cv416 shall proceed separately. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to UNCONSOLIDATE cause number 2:11cv416 from 2:11cv401. The Court will set cause number 2:11cv416 for a telephonic status/scheduling conference by separate order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 4/9/2013. Associated Cases: 2:11-cv-00401-TLS-PRC, 2:11-cv-00416-TLS-PRC(rmn) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
PACER 149 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
AMENDED ORDER granting 148 Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Theresa L Springmann on 4/1/2013. (rmn) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
PACER 112 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held 8/23/2012 before Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry. Pla(s) appeared by attys Lawrence Eagel, Richard Shevitz, Seth Klein, John Davis. Dfts appeared by attys Joseph Yast, John Doroghazi, Russell Perdew. There are 4 sets of plaintiffs and 4 sets of attorneys. All Pla(s) except those non-terminated plaintiffs in 2:11-CV-416 Wilson et al/Atty Seth Klein have agreed to a class action settlement, and these plaintiffs defer a scheduling order until such time they have decided to opt in/out of the settlement. Pla(s) request an expedited deadline within which to submit preliminary approval papers to the Court for filing - California case filed over 5 years ago. Defense requests 90 days within which to prepare and file preliminary approval paperwork. The Court ORDERED as follows: Any motion for preliminary approval and related documents to be filed by 10/26/2012. Parties and counsel request that the Judge Theresa L. Springmann schedule a preliminary approval hearing as soon after 10/26/2012 as possible to prevent further delay. The Court ORDERS that counsel for the Wilson et al case (2:11cv416) file a written status report w/in 15 days after the preliminary approval hearing is held to advise on Plaintiffs' position of settlement or whether a scheduling order is necessary in their case. (Tape #FTR.) (smb) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
PACER 111 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: None
APPLICATION for Attorney Lawrence P Eagel to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jamila Switt, et al ; Receipt #2003957. (rmn) (Entered: 08/21/2012)
PACER 110 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned from Steven Franklyn Helfand - attempted not known - 109 Order. (rmn) Modified on 7/19/2012 TO ATTACH NEW COPY OF RETURNED MAIL (rmn). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/19/2012: # 1 Returned mail rescanned envelope) (rmn). (Entered: 07/17/2012)
PACER 109 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 107 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney James Berman and Jeffrey R Hellman terminated; granting 108 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney James Berman and Jeffrey R Hellman terminated in case 2:11-cv-00401-TLS-PRC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 6/28/2012. Associated Cases: 2:11-cv-00401-TLS-PRC, 2:11-cv-00415-TLS-PRC, 2:11-cv-00416-TLS-PRC, 2:11-cv-00417-TLS-PRC, 2:12-cv-00045-TLS-PRC(rmn) (Entered: 06/28/2012)
PACER 108 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Withdraw James Berman as Attorney by Plaintiffs Angelique Alabsi, Kristin D Allfrey, Gina Brigida, Marco Cajas, Joel Calvillo, Richard E Cohoon, Sr, Criscynthia Ellis, Loretta Fogg, Meredith Fogg, Dominic Gomes, Jeffrey Green, Marie Denise Green, Michael Habbinga, Shirley Habbinga, Christina Harnden, Hal Harnden, Terry Hutchens, Arun Kaliappa, Jeffrey Lane, Mary Mellino, Sean Mellino, Thomas A Palmer, Jamila Swift, Susan Tafuri, Monique Venier, Ron Whisman, Shirley Whisman, Vance Zachary, Danneil Zaychuk. (rmn) (Entered: 06/26/2012)
PACER 107 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Withdraw Jeffrey R Hellman as Attorney by Plaintiffs Angelique Alabsi, Donna Belles, Gina Brigida, Marco Cajas, Joel Calvillo, Richard E Cohoon, Sr, Criscynthia Ellis, Loretta Fogg, Meredith Fogg, Dominic Gomes, Jeffrey Green, Marie Denise Green, Michael Habbinga, Shirley Habbinga, Christina Harnden, Hal Harnden, Terry Hutchens, Arun Kaliappa, Jeffrey Lane, Mary Mellino, Sean Mellino, Thomas A Palmer, Jamila Swift, Susan Tafuri, Monique Venier, Ron Whisman, Shirley Whisman, Vance Zachary, Danneil Zaychuk. (rmn) (Entered: 06/26/2012)
PACER 106 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 6/21/2012 before Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry. Parties appeared by attys Craig Matthews, David Deutsch, Jeffrey Nobel, Richard Shevitz, Russell Purdue, Joseph Yast, John Davis, Purdue Russell. Mediation took place in Chicago ILL on June 11 & 12th. Proposed settlement on the table awaiting approval as to some Pla(s). 7 Pla(s) represented by Jeffrey S. Nobel firm forego settlement and wish to pursue their individual claims. It is determined that all parties will allow settlement approval to take its course before entering a scheduling order in the case. Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/23/2012 10:30 AM Central time before Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry w/the Court initiating the conference. Counsel are directed to provide their contact information to the case manager sue_brown@innd.uscourts.gov within 48 hrs in advance of the conference. (Tape #FTR.) (smb) (Entered: 06/21/2012)
PACER 105 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned from Steven Franklin Helfand as Undeliverable - Insufficient address 103 CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND ORDER. (mc) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
PACER 104 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned from Jennifer Yu Sacro as Undeliverable 103 CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND ORDER (mc) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
PACER 103 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND ORDER re 102 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 5/16/2012. (rmn) (Entered: 05/17/2012)
PACER 102 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiffs Angelique Alabsi, Kristin D Allfrey, Raymond Bailey, Shery Bailey, Donna Belles, Thomas Boettcher, Gina Brigida, Marco Cajas, Joel Calvillo, Richard E Cohoon, Sr, Criscynthia Ellis, William Fisher, Loretta Fogg, Meredith Fogg, Phil Ganezer, Tyrone Gillispie, Dominic Gomes, Jeffrey Green, Marie Denise Green, Michael Habbinga, Shirley Habbinga, Christina Harnden, Hal Harnden, Janice Harris, Lacey Harris, Terry Hutchens, Gary Ingram, Regina Ingram, Arun Kaliappa, Christian Kalled, Jeffrey Lane, Joel Machado, Mary Mellino, Sean Mellino, Daniel Morgan, Mabyn Morgan, Michael Nope, Thomas A Palmer, Lynette Sohl, Jamila Swift, Susan Tafuri, Merrill Treadwell, Brian Vance, Robin Varghese, Monique Venier, Keith M Walker, Ron Whisman, Shirley Whisman, Christopher J Wilson, Vance Zachary, Danneil Zaychuk, Defendants Beta Finance Company Inc, DirectBuy Holdings Inc, DirectBuy Inc, National Management Corporation, Trivest Partners IV Inc, UCC Distribution Inc, United Consumers Club Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Confidentiality Agreement and Order)(Dunham, Edward) (Entered: 05/16/2012)
PACER 101 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 99 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Charles B Nutley PHV for Phil Ganezer (under case number 2:12cv45). Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 4/30/12. (mc) (Entered: 05/02/2012)
PACER 100 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 98 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney James G Kendrick PHV for Phil Ganezer (under case number 2:12cv45) . Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 4/30/12. (mc) (Entered: 05/02/2012)
PACER 99 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None
APPLICATION for Attorney Charles B Nutley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Phil Ganezer ; Receipt #2003247. (rmn) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
PACER 98 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None
APPLICATION for Attorney James G Kendrick to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Phil Ganezer ; Receipt #2003247. (rmn) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
PACER 97 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 4/11/2012 before Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry at request of defense counsel. Pla(s) appeared by attys Richard Shevitz, Lawrence P Eagel. Dfts appeared by attys C. Joseph Yast, Thomas Cunningham. These particular attorneys represent they are globally representing most Pla(s) for purpose of this conference only. Parties would like to concentrate on mediation/settlement in an effort to minimize litigation fees. Parties' joint oral request to VACATE the Telephonic Rule16b Preliminary Pretrial Conference on 4/19/2012 9:15 AM CST and related ddl to submit a joint discovery plan is GRANTED. Telephonic Rule16b Preliminary Pretrial Conference reset to 6/21/2012 @ 9:30 AM CST before Magistrate Judge Paul R. Cherry. All parties will be required to notify the case manager sue_brown@innd.uscourts.gov within 48 hrs in advance of their contact number for the conference otherwise their appearance will be assumed waived. Proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due 6/15/2012. (Tape #FTR.) (smb) Modified on 4/13/2012 to correct text(smb). (Entered: 04/12/2012)
PACER 96 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 93 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Seth R Klein PHV on behalf of Christopher Wilson, Regina and Gray Ingram, Christian Kalled, Keith Walker, Mabyn and Daniel Morgan, Raymond and Shery Bailey and Robin Varghese. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 3/29/12. (mc) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
PACER 95 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 92 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jeffrey S Nobel PHV on behalf of Christopher Wilson, Regina and Gray Ingram, Christian Kalled, Keith Walker, Mabyn and Daniel Morgan, Raymond and Shery Bailey and Robin Varghese. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 3/29/12. (mc) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
PACER 94 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None
STATUS REPORT re Service of Process by Phil Ganezer, Lynette Sohl, Merrill Treadwell, April Treadwell. Associated Cases: 2:11-cv-00401-TLS-PRC, 2:11-cv-00415-TLS-PRC, 2:11-cv-00416-TLS-PRC, 2:11-cv-00417-TLS-PRC, 2:12-cv-00045-TLS-PRC(Davis PHV, John) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
PACER 93 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
APPLICATION for Attorney Seth R Klein to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Christopher Wilson, Regina and Gray Ingram, Christian Kalled, Keith Walker, Mabyn and Daniel Morgan, Raymond and Shery Bailey and Robin Varghese ; Receipt #2003064. (rmn) (Entered: 03/27/2012)
PACER 92 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
APPLICATION for Attorney Jeffrey S Nobel to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Christopher Wilson, Regina and Gray Ingram, Christian Kalled, Keith Walker, Mabyn and Daniel Morgan, Raymond and Shery Bailey and Robin Varghese ; Receipt #2003064. (rmn) (Entered: 03/27/2012)
PACER 91 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 90 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Conrad V Sison PHV for Capire LLC,Conrad V Sison PHV for DBHB LLC,Conrad V Sison PHV for DirectBuy Inc,Conrad V Sison PHV for Tayden Enterprises LP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 3/19/2012. (rmn) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
PACER 90 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
APPLICATION for Attorney Conrad V Sison to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of DirectBuy, Inc, DBHB LLC, Tayden Enterprises LP and Capire LLC ; Receipt #2003005. (rmn) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
PACER 89 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 88 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney John W Davis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 3/1/2012. (rmn) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
PACER 88 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: None
APPLICATION for Attorney John W Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Phil Ganezer, Lynette Sohl, April Treadwell and Merill Treadwell; Receipt #2002881. (rmn) (Entered: 02/28/2012)
PACER 87 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: (TELEPHONIC Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/19/2012 09:15 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry. Joint Proposed Discovery due by 4/12/2012. The Court ORDERS that all attorneys (1) not currently admitted to practice in the United States District Court for the Northern District of Indiana pursuant to Northern District of Indiana Local Rule 83-5 and/or (2) not yet registered for mandatory electronic filing pursuant to the Northern District of Indiana Local Rules and the courts CM/ECF User Manual must do so by March 29, 2012. The Court ORDERS pla Ganezer, Sohl and Treadwell to FILE with the court a Status Report regarding service on the dfts The Sequoia Group Burbank LLC, Hunter Direct Inc, and Seavers Group LLC due by 3/29/2012.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 2/23/2012. (rmn) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
PACER 86 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 85 Motion to Consolidate Cases and ORDERS consolidation of cause numbers 2:11-cv-401 and 2:12-cv-45. ALL FUTURE FILINGS SHALL BE MADE IN 2:11-CV-401 ONLY. The Court will set this matter for an initial status conference by separate order, at which time the Court will set the deadline for Defendants to file a responsive pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 2/22/2012. (rmn) (Entered: 02/23/2012)
PACER 85 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Consolidate Cases , filed by Defendants Beta Finance Company Inc, DirectBuy Holdings Inc, DirectBuy Inc, National Management Corporation, Trivest Partners IV Inc, UCC Distribution Inc, United Consumers Club Inc. (Yast, C) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
PACER 84 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE by Beta Finance Company Inc, DirectBuy Holdings Inc, DirectBuy Inc, National Management Corporation, Trivest Partners IV Inc, UCC Distribution Inc, United Consumers Club Inc of Related Action (Yast, C) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
PACER 83 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
STATUS REPORT as to Grant of California Transfer Motion, filed by Beta Finance Company Inc, DirectBuy Holdings Inc, DirectBuy Inc, National Management Corporation, Trivest Partners IV Inc, UCC Distribution Inc, United Consumers Club Inc. (Yast, C) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
PACER 82 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 81 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David L Marcus PHV for Janice Harris and Lacey Harris. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 1/13/2012. (rmn) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
PACER 81 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None
APPLICATION for Attorney David L Marcus to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Janice Harris, Lacey Harris; Receipt #2002602. (tc) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
PACER 80 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: GRANTING plaintiff's 72 Motion to Consolidate and to Set Initial Status Conference and ORDERS consolidation of cause numbers 2:11cv401, 2:11cv415, 2:11cv416 and 2:11cv417. ALL FUTURE FILING SHALL BE MADE IN 2:11cv401 ONLY. The Court ORDERS defendants to FILE a status report with the Court in this case regarding the ruling on the motion to transfer filed in the Central District of California case as soon as practible after that court's ruling. The Court will set these consolidated cases for an initial status conference after such time as set forth in this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 1/5/2012. (rmn) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
PACER 79 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting Defendants' 77 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Defendants to file a responsive pleading will be set at the status conference, to be held by the Court sometime after 1/23/2012, which is yet to be set. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 1/3/2012. (rmn) (Entered: 01/04/2012)
PACER 78 Filed: 12/28/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 77 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 16 Amended Complaint, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 16 Amended Complaint, filed by Angelique Alabsi, Kristin D Allfrey, Donna Belles, Gina Brigida, Marco Cajas, Joel Calvillo, Richard E Cohoon, Sr, Crissynthia Ellis, Loretta Fogg, Meredith Fogg, Dominic Gomes, Jeffrey Green, Marie Denise Green, Michael Habbinga, Shirley Habbinga, Christina Harnden, Hal Harnden, Terry Hutchens, Arun Kaliappa, Jeffrey Lane, Mary Mellino, Sean Mellino, Thomas A Palmer, Jamila Swift, Susan Tafuri, Ron Whisman, Shirley Whisman, Vance Zachary, Danneil Zaychuk. (Matthews PHV, Craig) (Entered: 12/28/2011)
PACER 77 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 16 Amended Complaint, by Defendants Beta Finance Company Inc, DirectBuy Holdings Inc, DirectBuy Inc, National Management Corporation, Trivest Partners IV Inc, UCC Distribution Inc, United Consumers Club Inc. (Doroghazi, John) (Entered: 12/27/2011)
PACER 76 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 72 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Set Initial Status, filed by Beta Finance Company Inc, DirectBuy Holdings Inc, DirectBuy Inc, National Management Corporation, Trivest Partners IV Inc, UCC Distribution Inc, United Consumers Club Inc. (Yast, C) (Entered: 12/19/2011)
PACER 75 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: 72 Motion to Consolidate Cases REMAINS UNDER ADVISEMENT. The Court ORDERS plaintiff's counsel to FILE a notice of consolidated motion in each of the three identified related cases upon receipt of this order. The Court further ORDERS that the deadline for any response by defendants to plaintiff's motion to consolidate and to set initial status conference 72 is governed by Local Rule 7.1(a). Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 12/14/2011. (rmn) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
PACER 74 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE by Jamila Swift Notice of Related Action (Matthews PHV, Craig) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
PACER 73 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: TAKING UNDER ADVISEMENT 72 Motion to Consolidate Cases and to Set Initial Status Conference and ORDERS Plaintiff's counsel to FILE a Notice of Related Action in this case and in each of the three identified related cases upon receipt of this Order. If these three cases constitute related actions, then the Court further ORDERS that the Notice of Related Action include these three additional cases and shall be filed in these cases as well. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 12/6/2011. (rmn) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
PACER 72 Filed: 12/3/2011, Entered: None
MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Plaintiffs Angelique Alabsi, Kristin D Allfrey, Donna Belles, Gina Brigida, Marco Cajas, Joel Calvillo, Richard E Cohoon, Sr, Crissynthia Ellis, Loretta Fogg, Meredith Fogg, Dominic Gomes, Jeffrey Green, Marie Denise Green, Michael Habbinga, Shirley Habbinga, Christina Harnden, Hal Harnden, Terry Hutchens, Arun Kaliappa, Jeffrey Lane, Mary Mellino, Sean Mellino, Thomas A Palmer, Jamila Swift, Susan Tafuri, Ron Whisman, Shirley Whisman, Vance Zachary, Danneil Zaychuk. (Matthews PHV, Craig) (Entered: 12/03/2011)
PACER 71 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 70 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Craig T Matthews on behalf of Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 11/29/2011. (rmn) Modified on 11/30/2011 TO REFLECT NAME OF ATTORNEY (rmn). (Entered: 11/30/2011)
PACER 70 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None
APPLICATION for Attorney Craig T Matthews to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs ; Receipt #2002325. (rmn) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
PACER 69 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by C Joseph Yast on behalf of All Defendants (Yast, C) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
PACER 68 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None
Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 1:09-cv-04067. Original electronic file with documents numbered 1-67, copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (mc) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
PACER 67 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None
Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 1:09-cv-04067. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 11/03/2011)
PACER 66 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Consent MOTION to Change Venue pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) by Beta Finance Company, Inc., Direct Buy, Inc., DirectBuy Holdings, Inc., National Management Corporation, Trivest Partners IV, Inc., UCC Distribution, Inc., United Consumers Club, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1. Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 2. Pre-Motion Conference Letter, # 3 Exhibit 3. Judge Hall's Ruling on Transfer) (Doroghazi, John) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 11/01/2011)
PACER 65 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ORDER for telephone status conference held on 10/27/11 before Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky: denying 62 Motion for Protective Order. No further conferences are scheduled. See annexed conference minutes for details. (Newton, Joan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 10/28/2011)
PACER 64 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
Letter Requesting Conference with Court by Angelique Alabsi, Kristin D. Allfrey, Donna Belles, Gina Brigida, Marco Cajas, Joel Calvillo, Richard E. Cohoon, Sr, Crissynthia Ellis, Loretta Fogg, Meredith Fogg, Dominic Gomes, Jeffrey Green, Marie Denise Green, Michael Habbinga, Shirley Habbinga, Christina Harnden, Hal Harnden, Terry Hutchens, Arun Kaliappa, Jeffrey Lane, Mary Mellino, Sean Mellino, Thomas A. Palmer, Jamila Swift, Susan Tafuri, Ron Whisman, Shirley Whisman, Vance Zachary, Danneil Zaychuk (Eagel, Lawrence) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 10/27/2011)
PACER 63 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None
Letter in response to Def's Letter for Protective Order by Angelique Alabsi, Kristin D. Allfrey, Donna Belles, Gina Brigida, Marco Cajas, Joel Calvillo, Richard E. Cohoon, Sr, Crissynthia Ellis, Loretta Fogg, Meredith Fogg, Dominic Gomes, Jeffrey Green, Marie Denise Green, Michael Habbinga, Shirley Habbinga, Christina Harnden, Hal Harnden, Terry Hutchens, Arun Kaliappa, Jeffrey Lane, Mary Mellino, Sean Mellino, Thomas A. Palmer, Jamila Swift, Susan Tafuri, Ron Whisman, Shirley Whisman, Vance Zachary, Danneil Zaychuk (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Eagel, Lawrence) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 10/19/2011)
PACER 62 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None
Letter MOTION for Protective Order pursuant to Rule 26(c) by Beta Finance Company, Inc., Direct Buy, Inc., DirectBuy Holdings, Inc., National Management Corporation, Trivest Partners IV, Inc., UCC Distribution, Inc., United Consumers Club, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1. Proposed Protective Order) (Dunham, Edward) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 10/12/2011)
PACER 61 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY. See document for dates. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky on 9/23/2011. (Chee, Alvin) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 09/28/2011)
PACER 59 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ENTRY for Telephone Status Conference held on 9/7/11 before Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky: Discussion held concerning proposed scheduling orders submitted by each of the parties. The court opts for a scheduling order with fixed dates for deadlines rather than deadlines tied to decisions on motions. The parties are to confer on and submit a scheduling order with fixed dates upon which they have agreed (if possible) within seven days. The next conference will be held by telephone on November 16, 2011 at 2:00 p.m., to be initiated by counsel for the plaintiffs (Chambers: 718-613-2400). (Newton, Joan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 09/07/2011)
PACER 56 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky:Status Conference held by telephone on 8/4/2011. See annexed conference minutes for scheduling and rulings. (Pohorelsky, Viktor) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 08/04/2011)
PACER 55 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None
Consent MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for July 28, 2011 at 3pm to anytime on August 4, 2011 by Beta Finance Company, Inc., Direct Buy, Inc., DirectBuy Holdings, Inc., National Management Corporation, Trivest Partners IV, Inc., UCC Distribution, Inc., United Consumers Club, Inc.. (Doroghazi, John) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 07/26/2011)
PACER 54 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ENTRY for Status Conference held on 7/20/11 before Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky: Judge Block will withhold ruling on the defendants transfer motion pending rulings in other courts on similar motions. The plaintiffs wish to commence discovery, coordinating with plaintiffs counsel in two other cases where scheduling orders have been entered in the S.D. Indiana and D. Connecticut. The parties will confer concerning that proposal and advise the court of their positions on the matter at a telephone conference which will be held on July 28, 2011 at 3:00 p.m. (Newton, Joan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 07/21/2011)
PACER 53 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None
Consent MOTION to Adjourn Conference currently scheduled for July 19, 2011 at 11:00am, to July 20, 2011 at 4:00pm and supplemental submission regarding pre-motion conference letters for dismissal and transfer by Beta Finance Company, Inc., Direct Buy, Inc., DirectBuy Holdings, Inc., National Management Corporation, Trivest Partners IV, Inc., UCC Distribution, Inc., United Consumers Club, Inc.. (Doroghazi, John) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 07/13/2011)
PACER 52 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Defendant's letter applications dated June 8 & 9, 2011 are GRANTED. A pre motion conference is schedule for July 19, 2011 @ 11AM. There will be no formal order mailed to counsel. Upon receipt of this email counsel shall confirm with each other the date and time of this conference. If this date presents a conflict counsel shall first obtain the consent from all the parties to adjourn this conference, and then notify the Court by ECF letter. Ordered by Senior Judge Frederic Block on 7/7/2011. (Innelli, Michael) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 07/07/2011)
PACER 51 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None
Letter in Response to Defendants' Pre-Motion Letter dated June 9, 2011 by Angelique Alabsi, Kristin D. Allfrey, Donna Belles, Gina Brigida, Marco Cajas, Joel Calvillo, Richard E. Cohoon, Sr, Crissynthia Ellis, Loretta Fogg, Meredith Fogg, Dominic Gomes, Jeffrey Green, Marie Denise Green, Michael Habbinga, Shirley Habbinga, Christina Harnden, Hal Harnden, Terry Hutchens, Arun Kaliappa, Jeffrey Lane, Mary Mellino, Sean Mellino, Thomas A. Palmer, Jamila Swift, Susan Tafuri, Ron Whisman, Shirley Whisman, Vance Zachary, Danneil Zaychuk (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Eagel, Lawrence) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 06/16/2011)
PACER 50 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
Letter in Response to Defendants' Pre-Motion Letter dated June 8, 2011 by Angelique Alabsi, Kristin D. Allfrey, Donna Belles, Gina Brigida, Marco Cajas, Joel Calvillo, Richard E. Cohoon, Sr, Crissynthia Ellis, Loretta Fogg, Meredith Fogg, Dominic Gomes, Jeffrey Green, Marie Denise Green, Michael Habbinga, Shirley Habbinga, Christina Harnden, Hal Harnden, Terry Hutchens, Arun Kaliappa, Jeffrey Lane, Mary Mellino, Sean Mellino, Thomas A. Palmer, Jamila Swift, Susan Tafuri, Ron Whisman, Shirley Whisman, Vance Zachary, Danneil Zaychuk (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Eagel, Lawrence) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 06/15/2011)
PACER 49 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Beta Finance Company, Inc., Direct Buy, Inc., DirectBuy Holdings, Inc., National Management Corporation, Trivest Partners IV, Inc., UCC Distribution, Inc., United Consumers Club, Inc.. (Dunham, Edward) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 06/09/2011)
PACER 48 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Beta Finance Company, Inc., Direct Buy, Inc., DirectBuy Holdings, Inc., National Management Corporation, Trivest Partners IV, Inc., UCC Distribution, Inc., United Consumers Club, Inc.. (Dunham, Edward) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 06/08/2011)
PACER 47 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ENTRY for Telephone Status Conference held on 6/2/11 before Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky: A conference will be held in person on June 27, 2011 at 3:00 p.m. See annexed conference minutes for detailed scheduling and rulings (Newton, Joan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 06/03/2011)
PACER 46 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ENTRY for Telephone Status Conference held on 3/11/11 before Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky: The fairness hearing concerning the settlement in the related Connecticut action has been scheduled for May 11, 2011. Some but perhaps not all of the plaintiffs will opt out of the class there. The plaintiffs will be in a better position to determine how they will proceed after the fairness hearing. The next conference will be held by telephone on June 2, 2011 at 2:30 p.m. (Newton, Joan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 03/14/2011)
PACER 45 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky:Telephone Status Conference held on 1/12/2011. *See annexed scheduling & rulings for details. (Newton, Joan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 01/13/2011)
PACER 44 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky: Telephone Status Conference held on 12/3/2010. See annexed conference calendar minutes for details. (Newton, Joan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 12/06/2010)
PACER 43 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky: Telephone Status Conference held on 10/29/2010. The next conference is scheduled for December 3, 2010 at 2:45 p.m., to be initiated by counsel for the defendants (Chambers: 718-613-2400). See Amended Conference Calendar Minutes for details. (Newton, Joan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 11/01/2010)
PACER 42 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky:Telephone Status Conference held on 8/18/2010. See annexed conference calendar minutes for details. (Newton, Joan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 08/19/2010)
PACER 41 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky: Telephone Status Conference held on 6/18/2010. See annexed conference calendar minutes for details. (Newton, Joan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 06/18/2010)
PACER 40 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 19, 2010, before Judge Pohorelsky. Court Transcriber Typewrite Word Processing Service, Telephone number 718-966-1401. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/31/2010. (Rocco, Christine) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 06/02/2010)
PACER 39 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky: Hearing re Motions to Stay and for Pre-Answer Discovery held on 4/19/10; GRANTING 32 Motion to Stay; DENYING 33 Motion to Compel. (Newton, Joan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 04/20/2010)
PACER 38 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 32 MOTION to Stay Case, MEMORANDUM in Support re 33 MOTION to Compel Pre-Answer Discovery filed by Angelique Alabsi, Kristin D. Allfrey, Donna Belles, Gina Brigida, Marco Cajas, Joel Calvillo, Richard E. Cohoon, Sr, Crissynthia Ellis, Loretta Fogg, Meredith Fogg, Dominic Gomes, Jeffrey Green, Marie Denise Green, Michael Habbinga, Shirley Habbinga, Christina Harnden, Hal Harnden, Terry Hutchens, Arun Kaliappa, Jeffrey Lane, Mary Mellino, Sean Mellino, Thomas A. Palmer, Jamila Swift, Susan Tafuri, Ron Whisman, Shirley Whisman, Vance Zachary, Danneil Zaychuk. (Eagel, Lawrence) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 04/12/2010)
PACER 37 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 33 MOTION to Compel Pre-Answer Discovery filed by Beta Finance Company, Inc., Direct Buy, Inc., DirectBuy Holdings, Inc., National Management Corporation, Trivest Partners IV, Inc., UCC Distribution, Inc., United Consumers Club, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2) (Doroghazi, John) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 04/12/2010)
PACER 36 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None
Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 33 MOTION to Compel Pre-Answer Discovery, 32 MOTION to Stay Case and to Request Oral Argument on April 19, 2010 as Originally Scheduled by Beta Finance Company, Inc., Direct Buy, Inc., DirectBuy Holdings, Inc., National Management Corporation, Trivest Partners IV, Inc., UCC Distribution, Inc., United Consumers Club, Inc.. (Dunham, Edward) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 04/07/2010)
PACER 35 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: None
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 33 MOTION to Compel Pre-Answer Discovery, 32 MOTION to Stay Case by Beta Finance Company, Inc., Direct Buy, Inc., DirectBuy Holdings, Inc., National Management Corporation, Trivest Partners IV, Inc., UCC Distribution, Inc., United Consumers Club, Inc.. (Doroghazi, John) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 04/06/2010)
PACER 34 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support re 33 MOTION to Compel Pre-Answer Discovery filed by Angelique Alabsi, Kristin D. Allfrey, Donna Belles, Gina Brigida, Marco Cajas, Joel Calvillo, Richard E. Cohoon, Sr, Crissynthia Ellis, Loretta Fogg, Meredith Fogg, Dominic Gomes, Jeffrey Green, Marie Denise Green, Michael Habbinga, Shirley Habbinga, Christina Harnden, Hal Harnden, Terry Hutchens, Arun Kaliappa, Jeffrey Lane, Mary Mellino, Sean Mellino, Thomas A. Palmer, Jamila Swift, Susan Tafuri, Ron Whisman, Shirley Whisman, Vance Zachary, Danneil Zaychuk. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents, # 2 Exhibit B - Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition) (Eagel, Lawrence) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 03/29/2010)
PACER 33 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None Motion to Compel
MOTION to Compel Pre-Answer Discovery by Angelique Alabsi, Kristin D. Allfrey, Donna Belles, Gina Brigida, Marco Cajas, Joel Calvillo, Richard E. Cohoon, Sr, Crissynthia Ellis, Loretta Fogg, Meredith Fogg, Dominic Gomes, Jeffrey Green, Marie Denise Green, Michael Habbinga, Shirley Habbinga, Christina Harnden, Hal Harnden, Terry Hutchens, Arun Kaliappa, Jeffrey Lane, Mary Mellino, Sean Mellino, Thomas A. Palmer, Jamila Swift, Susan Tafuri, Ron Whisman, Shirley Whisman, Vance Zachary, Danneil Zaychuk. (Eagel, Lawrence) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 03/29/2010)
PACER 32 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
MOTION to Stay Case by Beta Finance Company, Inc., Direct Buy, Inc., DirectBuy Holdings, Inc., National Management Corporation, Trivest Partners IV, Inc., UCC Distribution, Inc., United Consumers Club, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Memorandum in Support, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Memorandum in Support, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Memorandum in Support) (Dunham, Edward) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 03/29/2010)
PACER 31 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER setting briefing schedule. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky on 3/17/2010. See attached order. (Newton, Joan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 03/17/2010)
PACER 29 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None
Letter to the Honorable Viktor V. Pohorelsky by Angelique Alabsi, Kristin D. Allfrey, Donna Belles, Gina Brigida, Marco Cajas, Joel Calvillo, Richard E. Cohoon, Sr, Crissynthia Ellis, Loretta Fogg, Meredith Fogg, Dominic Gomes, Jeffrey Green, Marie Denise Green, Michael Habbinga, Shirley Habbinga, Christina Harnden, Hal Harnden, Terry Hutchens, Arun Kaliappa, Jeffrey Lane, Mary Mellino, Sean Mellino, Thomas A. Palmer, Jamila Swift, Susan Tafuri, Ron Whisman, Shirley Whisman, Vance Zachary, Danneil Zaychuk (Eagel, Lawrence) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 03/15/2010)
PACER 27 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky:Status and Scheduling Conference held on 3/10/2010. See annexed conference minutes for details. (Newton, Joan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 03/10/2010)
PACER 26 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Letter dated March 8, 2010 to Judge Pohorelsky in response to Defendants' letter dated March 8, 2010 by Angelique Alabsi, Kristin D. Allfrey, Donna Belles, Gina Brigida, Marco Cajas, Joel Calvillo, Richard E. Cohoon, Sr, Crissynthia Ellis, Loretta Fogg, Meredith Fogg, Dominic Gomes, Jeffrey Green, Marie Denise Green, Michael Habbinga, Shirley Habbinga, Christina Harnden, Hal Harnden, Terry Hutchens, Arun Kaliappa, Jeffrey Lane, Mary Mellino, Sean Mellino, Thomas A. Palmer, Jamila Swift, Susan Tafuri, Ron Whisman, Shirley Whisman, Vance Zachary, Danneil Zaychuk (Eagel, Lawrence) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 03/08/2010)
PACER 25 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled for March 11, 2010 by Beta Finance Company, Inc., Direct Buy, Inc., DirectBuy Holdings, Inc., National Management Corporation, Trivest Partners IV, Inc., UCC Distribution, Inc., United Consumers Club, Inc.. (Dunham, Edward) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 03/08/2010)
PACER 24 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: None
United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ORDER DENYING TRANSFER: Plaintiff in an action in the Southern District of Indiana has moved, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1407, to centralize this litigation in the Southern District of Indiana. This litigation currently consists of four actions pending as follows: an action each in the Central District of California, the District of Connecticut, the Southern District of Indiana, and the Eastern District of New York, as listed on Schedule A. IT IS ORDERED that the motion, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1407, for centralization of the actions listed on Schedule A is denied. Ordered by John G. Heyburn II, Chairman, on 2/5/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Schedule A) (Barrett, C) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 02/05/2010)
PACER 23 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None
Letter to The Hon. Viktor Pohorelsky by Angelique Alabsi, Kristin D. Allfrey, Donna Belles, Gina Brigida, Marco Cajas, Joel Calvillo, Richard E. Cohoon, Sr, Crissynthia Ellis, Loretta Fogg, Meredith Fogg, Dominic Gomes, Jeffrey Green, Marie Denise Green, Michael Habbinga, Shirley Habbinga, Christina Harnden, Hal Harnden, Terry Hutchens, Arun Kaliappa, Jeffrey Lane, Mary Mellino, Sean Mellino, Thomas A. Palmer, Jamila Swift, Susan Tafuri, Ron Whisman, Shirley Whisman, Vance Zachary, Danneil Zaychuk (Eagel, Lawrence) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 02/01/2010)
PACER 22 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky: Scheduling Conference held on 1/28/2010. See annexed conference minutes for details. (Newton, Joan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 01/28/2010)
PACER 21 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None
Letter by Angelique Alabsi, Kristin D. Allfrey, Donna Belles, Gina Brigida, Marco Cajas, Joel Calvillo, Richard E. Cohoon, Sr, Crissynthia Ellis, Loretta Fogg, Meredith Fogg, Dominic Gomes, Jeffrey Green, Marie Denise Green, Michael Habbinga, Shirley Habbinga, Christina Harnden, Hal Harnden, Terry Hutchens, Arun Kaliappa, Jeffrey Lane, Mary Mellino, Sean Mellino, Thomas A. Palmer, Jamila Swift, Susan Tafuri, Ron Whisman, Shirley Whisman, Vance Zachary, Danneil Zaychuk (Eagel, Lawrence) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 01/25/2010)
PACER 20 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Merschman on behalf of Beta Finance Company, Inc., Direct Buy, Inc., DirectBuy Holdings, Inc., National Management Corporation, Trivest Partners IV, Inc., UCC Distribution, Inc., United Consumers Club, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Merschman, Joseph) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 01/25/2010)
PACER 19 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: None
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Beta Finance Company, Inc., Direct Buy, Inc., DirectBuy Holdings, Inc., National Management Corporation, Trivest Partners IV, Inc., UCC Distribution, Inc., United Consumers Club, Inc. (Doroghazi, John) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 01/22/2010)
PACER 18 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by John Doroghazi on behalf of Beta Finance Company, Inc., Direct Buy, Inc., DirectBuy Holdings, Inc., National Management Corporation, Trivest Partners IV, Inc., UCC Distribution, Inc., United Consumers Club, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Doroghazi, John) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 01/22/2010)
PACER 17 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Wood Dunham on behalf of Beta Finance Company, Inc., Direct Buy, Inc., DirectBuy Holdings, Inc., National Management Corporation, Trivest Partners IV, Inc., UCC Distribution, Inc., United Consumers Club, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Dunham, Edward) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 01/22/2010)
PACER 16 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Beta Finance Company, Inc., Direct Buy, Inc., DirectBuy Holdings, Inc., National Management Corporation, Trivest Partners IV, Inc., UCC Distribution, Inc., United Consumers Club, Inc., filed by Jamila Swift. (Eagel, Lawrence) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 01/19/2010)
PACER 15 Filed: 1/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Letter in Response to Defendants' January 4 Letter by Angelique Alabsi, Kristin D. Allfrey, Donna Belles, Gina Brigida, Marco Cajas, Joel Calvillo, Richard E. Cohoon, Sr, Crissynthia Ellis, Loretta Fogg, Meredith Fogg, Dominic Gomes, Jeffrey Green, Marie Denise Green, Michael Habbinga, Shirley Habbinga, Christina Harnden, Hal Harnden, Terry Hutchens, Arun Kaliappa, Jeffrey Lane, Mary Mellino, Sean Mellino, Thomas A. Palmer, Jamila Swift, Susan Tafuri, Ron Whisman, Shirley Whisman, Vance Zachary, Danneil Zaychuk (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Defendants' December 30 Letter to Judge Pohorelsky) (Eagel, Lawrence) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 01/07/2010)
PACER 14 Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: None
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Beta Finance Company, Inc., Direct Buy, Inc., DirectBuy Holdings, Inc., National Management Corporation, Trivest Partners IV, Inc., UCC Distribution, Inc., United Consumers Club, Inc.. (Corrigan, Scott) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 01/04/2010)
PACER 13 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ORDER for Motion Hearing proceedings held on 12/30/09 before Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky: granting in part and denying in part 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. See annexed conference minutes for details. (Newton, Joan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 12/30/2009)
PACER 12 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None
Letter by Beta Finance Company, Inc., Direct Buy, Inc., DirectBuy Holdings, Inc., National Management Corporation, Trivest Partners IV, Inc., UCC Distribution, Inc., United Consumers Club, Inc. (Corrigan, Scott) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 12/30/2009)
PACER 11 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: None
Letter in reply to Defendant's December 29, 2009 letter by Angelique Alabsi, Kristin D. Allfrey, Donna Belles, Gina Brigida, Marco Cajas, Joel Calvillo, Richard E. Cohoon, Sr, Crissynthia Ellis, Loretta Fogg, Meredith Fogg, Dominic Gomes, Jeffrey Green, Marie Denise Green, Michael Habbinga, Shirley Habbinga, Christina Harnden, Hal Harnden, Terry Hutchens, Arun Kaliappa, Jeffrey Lane, Mary Mellino, Sean Mellino, Thomas A. Palmer, Jamila Swift, Susan Tafuri, Ron Whisman, Shirley Whisman, Vance Zachary, Danneil Zaychuk (Eagel, Lawrence) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 12/29/2009)
PACER 10 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: None
Letter by Beta Finance Company, Inc., Direct Buy, Inc., DirectBuy Holdings, Inc., National Management Corporation, Trivest Partners IV, Inc., UCC Distribution, Inc., United Consumers Club, Inc. (Corrigan, Scott) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 12/29/2009)
PACER 9 Filed: 12/24/2009, Entered: None
Letter in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time by Angelique Alabsi, Kristin D. Allfrey, Donna Belles, Gina Brigida, Marco Cajas, Joel Calvillo, Richard E. Cohoon, Sr, Crissynthia Ellis, Loretta Fogg, Meredith Fogg, Dominic Gomes, Jeffrey Green, Marie Denise Green, Michael Habbinga, Shirley Habbinga, Christina Harnden, Hal Harnden, Terry Hutchens, Arun Kaliappa, Jeffrey Lane, Mary Mellino, Sean Mellino, Thomas A. Palmer, Jamila Swift, Susan Tafuri, Ron Whisman, Shirley Whisman, Vance Zachary, Danneil Zaychuk (Wexler, Paul) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 12/24/2009)
PACER 8 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: None
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time by Beta Finance Company, Inc., Direct Buy, Inc., DirectBuy Holdings, Inc., National Management Corporation, Trivest Partners IV, Inc., UCC Distribution, Inc., United Consumers Club, Inc. (Corrigan, Scott) Modified on 12/30/2009 (Toritto, Jim). [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 12/23/2009)
PACER 7 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None
Letter Motion for Time by Beta Finance Company, Inc., Direct Buy, Inc., DirectBuy Holdings, Inc., National Management Corporation, Trivest Partners IV, Inc., UCC Distribution, Inc., United Consumers Club, Inc. (Corrigan, Scott) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 12/10/2009)
PACER 6 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
Letter dated 11/17/2009 from John G. Heyburn II to the Judges regarding the motions involved in the MDL Litigation (Lagana, Michael) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 11/30/2009)
PACER 5 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: None
Letter dated 11/12/2009 from Andrei V. Rado (1) letter regarding contents of submission. (2) proof of service. (3) motion of Plaintiff Brian Vance Pursuant to 28 USC 1407 for coordination and Transfer of Action to The Southern District of Indiana. Please note that the motion is bound and to large to scan placed in hard copy. (Lagana, Michael) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 11/19/2009)
PACER 4 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: None
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Beta Finance Company, Inc., Direct Buy, Inc., DirectBuy Holdings, Inc., National Management Corporation, Trivest Partners IV, Inc., UCC Distribution, Inc., United Consumers Club, Inc.. (Corrigan, Scott) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 11/06/2009)
PACER 3 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Scott D. Corrigan on behalf of Beta Finance Company, Inc., Direct Buy, Inc., DirectBuy Holdings, Inc., National Management Corporation, Trivest Partners IV, Inc., UCC Distribution, Inc., United Consumers Club, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Corrigan, Scott) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 11/06/2009)
PACER 2 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None
First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Craig T. Matthews. (Lagana, Michael) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 10/20/2009)
PACER 1 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: None
COMPLAINT (Filing fee $350 receipt #4653005550) against Beta Finance Company, Inc., Direct Buy, Inc., DirectBuy Holdings, Inc., National Management Corporation, Trivest Partners IV, Inc., UCC Distribution, Inc., United Consumers Club, Inc. Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Shirley Whisman, Ron Whisman, Mary Mellino, Angelique Alabsi, Loretta Fogg, Marco Cajas, Jamila Swift, Danneil Zaychuk, Shirley Habbinga, Joel Calvillo, Crissynthia Ellis, Meredith Fogg, Jeffrey Green, Susan Tafuri, Sean Mellino, Arun Kaliappa, Jeffrey Lane, Michael Habbinga, Dominic Gomes, Hal Harnden, Donna Belles, Christina Harnden, Marie Denise Green, Gina Brigida, Richard E. Cohoon, Sr, Vance Zachary, Thomas A. Palmer, Kristin D. Allfrey, Terry Hutchens. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 11/3/2011.] (Entered: 09/22/2009)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 1,057 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?