Belsito Communications, Inc. v. Dell, Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court, Case No. 7:12-cv-06255
District Judge Cathy Seibel, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.nysd.7-12-cv-06255 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
This docket can only tell you so much. Get the rest.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Belsito Communications, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Robert Nathan Isseks +1 845 344 4322 isseks@frontiernet.net
No Logo Belsito Communications, Inc. , Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Thomas S Sims

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Kevin Daniel Bloom +1 845 561 6920 +1 845 561 0978 kbloom@hvc.rr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE PORTER LAW OFFICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Robert Nathan Isseks +1 845 344 4322 isseks@frontiernet.net
v.
No Logo A.R.S. National Services, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Dell Direct Sales L.P., Defendant
No Logo Dell Financial Services, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Dell Marketing, L.P., Defendant
No Logo Dell Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 190 Contract: Other
  Entries (3) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PDF 28 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
OPINION AND ORDER: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is hereby GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, and Defendants' Motion to Strike Class Allegations is hereby DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending Motion, (Doc. 16), terminate A.R.S. National Services, Inc. as a defendant, and terminate Dell, Inc., Dell Marketing, L.P., and Dell Direct Sales, L.P. as defendants without prejudice. See Note 2, above. The remaining claims in the case are Plaintiff's breach of c ontract, breach of implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing, and defamation of credit claims against Dell Financial Services, L.L.C. The parties are directed to appear before me for a pre-motion conference on October 4, 2013, at 11:45 a.m. to discuss Plaintiff's request to amend. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 9/12/2013) (lnl)
PACER 2 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. All Defendants. Document filed by Belsito Communications, Inc.. (Isseks, Robert) (Entered: 08/31/2012)
PACER 1 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against A.R.S. National Services, Inc., Dell Direct Sales L.P., Dell Financial Services, L.L.C., Dell Marketing, L.P., Dell, Inc. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465407003932)Document filed by Belsito Communications, Inc. (rj) (Entered: 08/17/2012)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 51 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?