USA, et al v. Compean-Yanez
Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:02-cr-00499-PGR
docket://gov.uscourts.azd.2-02-cr-00499 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
The right information can save you thousands of dollars.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
John Robert Lopez, IV +1 602 514 7500 +1 602 514 7537 John.Lopez3@usdoj.gov
Office Phoenix Division
Filed 5/15/2002
County Yuma
Terminated 8/21/2003
Reopened
Magistrate Case
202-mj-01737
Count 1
Citation Section 8 U.S.C. § 1326A.F
Offense Level 4
81326(a), (b)(2) Reentry After Deportation
Count 1
Citation Section 8 U.S.C. § 1326A.F
Offense Level 4
81326(a), (b)(2) Reentry After Deportation
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (34) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
Blank 33 Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: 8/27/2003 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt granting motion to Dismiss all counts charged (dft) Without Prejudice [32-1] by USA as to dft Sonia Enriqueta Compean-Yanez.. Sonia Compean-Yanez (1) count(s) 1. Dismissed by gov motion Case closed (KMG)
Blank 32 Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: 8/27/2003, Terminated: 8/21/2003 Motion to Dismiss All Charges
MOTION to Dismiss all counts charged (dft) Without Prejudice [32-1] by USA as to dft Sonia Enriqueta Compean-Yanez (KMG) Modified on 08/27/2003
Blank 31 Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: 8/27/2003 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
( FILED: 8/21/03) MINUTES: before Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt. Ct Rptr: L. Lemke Interpreter: Cristina Sporrer/Spanish. Status hearing held re: Competency held. Parties submit to the report. Dft found incompetent to proceed to trial. Gov will move to dismiss without prejudice. ; status hrg held [31-2] (KMG)
Blank 30 Filed: 7/28/2003, Entered: 7/28/2003 Order
MINUTE ORDER Status hearing re: competency set for 9:30 8/21/03 for Sonia Enriqueta Compean-Yanez [30-2] (KMG)
Blank 28 Filed: 11/29/2002, Entered: 11/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt that dft Sonia Enriqueta Compean-Yanez shall submit to Psychiatric examination and testing ordered for Sonia Enriqueta Compean-Yanez pursuant to 18 United States Code, Section 4241(d). FURTHER ORDERED pursuant to 18 U.S.C., Section 4247(d) that dft is committed to the custody of the Attorney General, not to exceed four months, for placement in a suitable facility to determine if dft is competent to stand trial. FURTHER ORDERED that a psychiatric or psychological report shall be prepared by the examiner, shall be filed with the Court. (KMG)
Blank 27 Filed: 11/26/2002, Entered: 11/27/2002 Other Notice
NOTICE of Proposed Order re 18 U.S.C. 4241(d) Commitment by pla USA as to dft Sonia Enriqueta Compean-Yanez (KMG)
Blank 26 Filed: 11/20/2002, Entered: 11/22/2002 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
( FILED: 11/20/02) MINUTES: before Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt . Ct Rptr: Bill McNut Interpreter: Lita VanDuzer/Spanish. hrg held; granting motion to determine mental competency to stand trial for Sonia Enriqueta Compean-Yanez [15-1] by dft Sonia Enriqueta Compean-Yanez; crt finds dft not competent to stand trial; ord to follow [26-1] (former emp)
Blank 25 Filed: 11/19/2002, Entered: 11/21/2002 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
NOTICE of substitution of attorney for USA : John Robert Lopez IV appears and terminating attorney Mumtaza Malaika Rahi-Loo for USA (former emp)
Blank 24 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt granting motion for Order Authorizing the Payment to Dr. Kathryn A. Menendez' the amount of five hundred dollars [21-1] by dft Sonia Enriqueta Compean-Yanez (KMG)
Blank 23 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 Order
MINUTE ORDER granting motion for hearing to determine mental competency to stand trial for Sonia Enriqueta Compean-Yanez [22-1] by dft Sonia Enriqueta Compean-Yanez Competency examination ordered for Sonia Enriqueta Compean-Yanez FURTHER ORDERED setting a hearing re dft's motion to determine mental competency to stand trial for Sonia Enriqueta Compean-Yanez [15-1] by dft Sonia Enriqueta Compean-Yanez ; hearing set for 11:00 11/20/02 for Sonia Enriqueta Compean-Yanez [23-2] (KMG)
Blank 22 Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: 10/7/2002, Terminated: 10/11/2002 Motion to Determine Competency
MOTION for hearing to determine mental competency to stand trial for Sonia Enriqueta Compean-Yanez [22-1] by dft Sonia Enriqueta Compean-Yanez (KMG)
Blank 22 Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: 10/7/2002, Terminated: 10/11/2002 Psychiatric Report
PSYCHIATRIC (Mental Competency) evaluation report received as to Sonia Enriqueta Compean-Yanez from Dr. Kathryn A. Menendez (KMG)
Blank 21 Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: 10/7/2002, Terminated: 10/11/2002 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION for Order Authorizing the Payment to Dr. Kathryn A. Menendez' in the amount of five hundred dollars [21-1] by dft Sonia Enriqueta Compean-Yanez (KMG)
Blank 20 Filed: 8/26/2002, Entered: 8/27/2002 Order Returned Executed
ORDER executed on 7/31/02 as to defendant Sonia Compean-Yanez re order [17-2] . (KMG)
Blank 19 Filed: 8/14/2002, Entered: 8/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt granting motion to Continue Trial [18-1] by dft Sonia Compean-Yanez, granting motion to Extend Time for Doctor to Submit Report [18-2] by dft Sonia Enriqueta Compean-Yanez Trial reset for 9:00 10/29/02 for Sonia Enriqueta Compean-Yanez , excludable delay in the interest of justice started FURTHER ORDERED that within fourteen days of Dr. Menendez receiving the dft's medical reports, that the Doctor file her report with the Court, with copies to counsel. (cc: pts, cnsl) (KMG)
Blank 18 Filed: 8/9/2002, Entered: 8/12/2002, Terminated: 8/14/2002 Motion to Continue
MOTION to Continue Trial [18-1] by dft Sonia Compean-Yanez , and to Extend Time for Doctor to Submit Report [18-2] by dft Sonia Enriqueta Compean-Yanez (KMG)
Blank 17 Filed: 7/12/2002, Entered: 7/12/2002 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt granting motion to (have dft examined) determine mental competency to stand trial for Sonia Enriqueta Compean-Yanez and Motion to Have dft Transported to Dr. Kathryn Menendez' Office [16-1] by dft Sonia Enriqueta Compean-Yanez purs to 18:4241 examination ordered for Sonia Enriqueta Compean-Yanez Dr Kathryn Menendez, Phoenix AZ shall be appointed to perform the exam and file rpt to crt w/copies provided to both cnsl; USM shall transport dft to Dr's office and arrange w/Dr for date and time; ORD Dr Menendez file rpt w/crt within one week of exam (former emp)
Blank 16 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002, Terminated: 7/12/2002 Motion to Determine Competency
MOTION to (have dft examined) determine mental competency to stand trial for Sonia Enriqueta Compean-Yanez and Motion to Have dft Transported to Dr. Kathryn Menendez' Office [16-1] by dft Sonia Enriqueta Compean-Yanez (KMG)
Blank 15 Filed: 6/27/2002, Entered: 6/28/2002 Motion to Determine Competency
MOTION to determine mental competency to stand trial for Sonia Enriqueta Compean-Yanez [15-1] by dft Sonia Enriqueta Compean-Yanez (KMG)
Blank 14 Filed: 6/12/2002, Entered: 6/12/2002 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt granting motion to continue trial [13-1] by dft Sonia Compean-Yanaz ; Trial reset for 9:00 9/10/02 for Sonia Enriqueta Compean-Yanez , excludable delay in the interest of justice started (KMG)
Blank 13 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: 6/12/2002, Terminated: 6/12/2002 Motion to Continue
MOTION to continue trial [13-1] by dft Sonia Compean-Yanaz (KMG)
Blank 12 Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: 5/30/2002 OrderCourt Filing
PAYMENT voucher by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt as to Sonia Enriqueta Compean-Yanez for CJA atty Bruce Yancey (KMG)
Blank 11 Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: 5/30/2002 OrderCourt Filing
PAYMENT voucher by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt as to Sonia Enriqueta Compean-Yanez for CJA atty Bruce Yancey (KMG)
Blank 10 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: 5/23/2002 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
( FILED: 5/23/02) MINUTES: before Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan. Interpreter: Louis Velasco/Spanish. dft Sonia Enriqueta Compean-Yanez arraigned; not guilty plea entered. Attorney present; , ; pretrial motions due 6/6/02 for Sonia Enriqueta Compean-Yanez ; trial set for 9:00 7/2/02 for Sonia Enriqueta Compean-Yanez [cc: pts,cnsl,dkd,cd] [10-3] (KMG)
Blank 9 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: 5/17/2002 Notice IssuedCourt Filing
NOTICE issued ; arraignment set for 10:00 5/22/02 for Sonia Enriqueta Compean-Yanez before Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan (KMG)
Blank 8 Filed: 5/15/2002, Entered: 5/17/2002 Indictment
INDICTMENT by USA attorney Mumtaza Malaika Rahi-Loo. Counts filed against Sonia Enriqueta Compean-Yanez (1) count(s) 1 (KMG)
Blank 7 Filed: 5/8/2002, Entered: 5/9/2002 CJA 20 - Appointment
CJA Form 20 copy 4 as to Sonia Enriqueta Compean-Yanez appointing David M Ochoa on 5/3/02 [ 2:02-m -1737 ] (PHR)
Blank 5 Filed: 5/8/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
ORDER of detention pending trial signed 4/18/02 by Mag Judge Jay Irwin as to Sonia Enriqueta Compean-Yanez re: detention [5-1] [ 2:02-m -1737 ] (PHR)
Blank 6 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
( FILED: 5/8/02) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Virginia a Mathis; Interpreter: Lita Van Duzer-SPANISH. appointing counsel for Sonia Enriqueta Compean-Yanez, Attorney David M Ochoa and terminating attorney Bruce Yancey [6-2] [ 2:02-m -1737 ] (PHR)
Blank 4 Filed: 5/1/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
( FILED: 5/8/02) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay Irwin . Interpreter: Marcia Resler - SPANISH; defendant Compean-Yanez is present with counsel; prelim hrg held and defendant held to answer before the District Court; status hearing re appointment of counsel is set for 5/3/02 at 11:00 a.m. before Mag Judge Mathis in Phoenix; case is transferred to District Court in Phoenix, AZ. [4-1] re: [4-1] [ 2:02-m -1737 ] (PHR)
Blank 3 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
( FILED: 5/8/02) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay Irwin . Interpreter: Marcia Resler - SPANISH; defendant Compean-Yanez is present with counsel; Mag Judge Irwin did not proceed with plea as the defendant seemed somewhat disturbed; Case will proceed to prelim hearing; status hearing re plea held; prelim hrg is reset from 5/1/02 at 10:30 p.m. before this Court. [3-1] re: [3-1] [ 2:02-m -1737 ] (PHR)
Blank 2 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
( FILED: 5/8/02) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay Irwin . Interpreter: Marcia Resler - SPANISH. first appearance of Sonia Enriqueta Compean-Yanez ; informed of rights, charges, etc.; , dft Sonia Enriqueta Compean-Yanez appears with counsel Bruce Yancey , Defendant ordered detained as a flight risk; prelim hrg is set for 5/1/02 at 10:30 a.m. before this Court; counsel is appointed; SPANISH for Sonia Enriqueta Compean-Yanez. [2-4] [ 2:02-m -1737 ] (PHR)
Blank 1 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 Complaint
COMPLAINT filed as to Sonia Enriqueta Compean-Yanez [ 2:02-m -1737 ] (PHR)
Blank -- Filed: 4/17/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 Arrest
DEFENDANT Sonia Enriqueta Compean-Yanez arrested. Sonia Enriqueta Compean-Yanez (1) count(s) cmp [ 2:02-m -1737 ] (PHR)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 81 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?