Ribeiro v. Usher et al
Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 3:04-cv-30201-MAP
docket://gov.uscourts.mad.3-04-cv-30201 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
This docket can only tell you so much. Get the rest.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo David Ribeiro, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo City of Holyoke, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Charles P. Lavelle +1 413 322 5580

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Holyoke, Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Karen T. Betournay +1 413 322 5582 +1 413 322 5581 betournayk@ci.holyoke.ma.us
No Logo David S. Usher, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Charles P. Lavelle +1 413 322 5580

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Holyoke, Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Karen T. Betournay +1 413 322 5582 +1 413 322 5581 betournayk@ci.holyoke.ma.us
No Logo Emil Morales, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Charles P. Lavelle +1 413 322 5580
No Logo Hampden County District Attorney's Office, Defendant
No Logo Holyoke Police Department, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Charles P. Lavelle +1 413 322 5580
No Logo James D. Briant, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Charles P. Lavelle +1 413 322 5580

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Holyoke, Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Karen T. Betournay +1 413 322 5582 +1 413 322 5581 betournayk@ci.holyoke.ma.us
No Logo Martin W. Narey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Charles P. Lavelle +1 413 322 5580

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Holyoke, Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Karen T. Betournay +1 413 322 5582 +1 413 322 5581 betournayk@ci.holyoke.ma.us
No Logo Officer Donze, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Charles P. Lavelle +1 413 322 5580
Office Springfield
Filed 10/8/2004
Jury Demand Both
Demand $50000
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Federal Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Barnstable
Terminated 1/4/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (77) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PDF 56 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: 1/4/2007 JudgmentCourt Filing
Judge Michael A Ponsor : ORDER entered. JUDGMENT in favor of defendants Holyoke Police Department, et al. against plaintiff David Ribeiro. cc/cl(Lindsay, Maurice)
PDF 55 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: 1/4/2007 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
Judge Michael A Ponsor : MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting [52] Motion for Summary Judgment. The clerk will enter judgment for all defendants in this case. See the attached memo & order for complete details. cc/cl (Lindsay, Maurice)
PDF 54 Filed: 12/26/2006, Entered: 12/26/2006 Opposition to Motion
Opposition to Dft's [52] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by David Ribeiro. (Lindsay, Maurice)
PDF 53 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/17/2006 Memorandum in Support of Motion
Dft's MEMORANDUM of law in Support of [52] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Officer Donze, Emil Morales, City of Holyoke, David S. Usher, Martin W. Narey, James D. Briant, Holyoke Police Department. (Lindsay, Maurice)
PDF 52 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/17/2006, Terminated: 1/4/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
Dft's MOTION for Summary Judgment by Officer Donze, Emil Morales, City of Holyoke, David S. Usher, Martin W. Narey, James D. Briant, Holyoke Police Department. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D)(Lindsay, Maurice)
PDF 51 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
Judge Michael A Ponsor : FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER entered. As follows; A Motion for summary judgment from remaining Dft's due by 11/17/2006, Ptf's Opposition by 1/19/07, if sum. jgm. motion is denied Trial will commence on 4/2/2007 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael A Ponsor. Proposed Jury Instructions, voir dire questions and motions in limine due 3/26/07. See the attached order for complete details. cc/cl(Lindsay, Maurice)
Blank -- Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 Set Deadlines/Hearings
ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Michael A Ponsor : Final Pretrial Conference held on 10/16/2006. Defendants' Motion for S/J due by 11/17/2006. Plaintiff's response to motion fue by 1/19/07. Court will rule on papers or schedule hearing after reviewing pleadings. Jury Trial set for 4/2/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael A Ponsor. Order to issue. (Court Reporter Laurie(Philbin's).) (Stuckenbruck, John)
PDF 50 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: 10/12/2006 Pretrial Memorandum
PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by City of Holyoke, David S. Usher, Martin W. Narey, James D. Briant filed. (Finn, Mary)
PDF 49 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: 10/12/2006 Remark
Habe issued for plaintiff to attend Pretrial Conference on 10/16/06 at 3:30 p.m. (French, Elizabeth)
Blank -- Filed: 10/3/2006, Entered: 10/4/2006 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Judge Michael A Ponsor : ENDORSED ORDER entered granting [48] Motion to be habed to court for pretrial conference and trial. cc/cl (Lindsay, Maurice)
Blank -- Filed: 10/3/2006, Entered: 10/4/2006 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Judge Michael A Ponsor : ENDORSED ORDER entered denying [47] Motion to Appoint Counsel. DENIED, without prejudice. cc/cl (Lindsay, Maurice)
PDF 48 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/20/2006, Terminated: 10/3/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Ptf's MOTION to be habed to the court for pre-trial conference and trial by David Ribeiro.(Lindsay, Maurice)
PDF 47 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/20/2006, Terminated: 10/3/2006 Motion to Appoint Counsel
Ptf's MOTION to Appoint Counsel by David Ribeiro. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit in Support)(Lindsay, Maurice)
PDF 46 Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: 9/13/2006 Procedural Order re pretrial/trialCourt Filing
Judge Michael A Ponsor : ORDER entered. PROCEDURAL ORDER re pretrial/trial Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/16/2006 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael A Ponsor; cc/cl. and Pltf. (Finn, Mary)
Blank -- Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: 9/13/2006 Notice regarding mandatory registration for ECF (W
NOTICE issued to Attorney Karen Betourney and Charles P. Lavelle regarding mandatory registration with ECF in compliance with the Standing Order entered by Judge Ponsor and Magistrate Judge Neiman. (Finn, Mary)
PDF 45 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: 5/31/2006 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
Judge Michael A Ponsor : ORDER entered. PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Any further Discovery will be completed by 7/31/2006, Dispositive motions due by 8/31/2006 and opposed by 9/30/06, if no dispositive motions are filed by 8/31/06, this case will be set for a final pretrial conference. See Scheduling Order for complete details. cc/cl(Lindsay, Maurice)
PDF 44 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/3/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Ptf's MOTION to Respond to defendants [38] Application for summary judgment on Michael Higgins and Paul Kelly. by David Ribeiro. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3)(Lindsay, Maurice)
Blank -- Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/3/2005 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Judge Michael A Ponsor : ENDORSED ORDER entered granting [44] Motion to respond to dft's application for summary judgment on Michael Higgins and Paul Kelly. ALLOWED. However, the court's ruling allowing the motion for summary judgment of defendants Higgins and Kelly (Dkt.41) stands. Plaintiff has artculated no voilation of a constitutional right by these defendants. So ordered. cc/cl (Lindsay, Maurice)
Blank -- Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/3/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
Judge Michael A Ponsor : ENDORSED ORDER entered granting [42] Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Dft's Motion for summary judgment, due to unavoidable cirumstances. ALLOWED. However, the court's ruling allowing the motion for summary judgment of defendants Higgins and Kelly stands. cc/cl (Lindsay, Maurice)
PDF 43 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 10/31/2005 Affidavit in Support of Motion
AFFIDAVIT in Support of [42] MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond, oppose and extension of time to file enclosed motions. filed by David Ribeiro. (Lindsay, Maurice)
PDF 42 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 10/31/2005, Terminated: 11/2/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
Ptf's MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Dft's [38] Motion for summary judgment, due to unavoidable circumstances. by David Ribeiro. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Motion to Respond (1of4 parts)# (2) Exhibit -1# (3) Exhibit - 2# (4) Exhibit - 3)(Lindsay, Maurice)
PDF 41 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: 10/26/2005 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
Judge Michael A Ponsor : ElectronicMEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting unopposed[38] Motion for Summary Judgment as to defendants Higgins and Kelly (Stuckenbruck, John)
PDF 40 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: 9/30/2005 Statement of facts
STATEMENT of facts re [38] MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Joyce, Austin)
PDF 39 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: 9/30/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
MEMORANDUM in Support re [38] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Michael Higgins, Paul M. Kelly. (Joyce, Austin)
PDF 38 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: 9/30/2005, Terminated: 10/26/2005 Motion for Summary Judgment
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Michael Higgins, Paul M. Kelly. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) Exhibit A part 2# (3) Exhibit B# (4) Errata C# (5) Exhibit D# (6) Exhibit E)(Joyce, Austin)
Blank -- Filed: 8/9/2005, Entered: 8/9/2005 Jury Demand
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by David Ribeiro. (Finn, Mary)
Blank -- Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: 8/9/2005 Order on Motion to Amend
Judge Michael A Ponsor : ENDORSED ORDER entered granting the Pltf's [34] Motion to Amend monetary relief amount, and to amend trial by Judge to Jury; cc/cl. and Pltf. (Finn, Mary)
Blank -- Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: 8/9/2005 Order on Motion for Reconsideration
Judge Michael A Ponsor : ENDORSEDORDER entered denying the Pltf's [35] Motion for Reconsideration to include Deft. Lt. Michael Higgins in this civil action; cc/cl. and Pltf. (Finn, Mary)
Blank -- Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: 8/9/2005 Order on Motion to Amend
Judge Michael A Ponsor : ENDORSED ORDER entered granting the Pltf's [37] Motion to Amend punitive damages amount to $50,000.00; cc/cl. and Pltf. (Finn, Mary)
PDF 37 Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: 7/26/2005, Terminated: 8/8/2005 Motion to Amend
Ptf's MOTION to Amend Punitive Amount of Damage by David Ribeiro.(Lindsay, Maurice)
PDF 36 Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: 7/22/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
Ptf's REPLY to Dft's Opposition to his [12] MOTION to Amend [3] Complaint filed by David Ribeiro. (Lindsay, Maurice)
PDF 35 Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: 7/22/2005, Terminated: 8/8/2005 Motion for Reconsideration
Ptf's MOTION for Reconsideration to include defendant LT. Micheal Higgins in this action by David Ribeiro.(Lindsay, Maurice)
PDF 34 Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: 7/22/2005, Terminated: 8/8/2005 Motion to Amend
Ptf's MOTION to Amend monetary relief amount and to Amend trial by judge to a jury by David Ribeiro.(Lindsay, Maurice)
PDF 33 Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: 7/5/2005 Summons Returned Executed
Marshals return of service re: SUMMONS Returned Executed Emil Morales and Holyoke Police Department. Both served on 6/24/2005. Answer due 7/14/2005. (Finn, Mary)
Blank -- Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005 Order on Motion to Dismiss
Judge Michael A Ponsor : ENDORSED ORDER entered granting [30] Motion to Dismiss. ALLOWED. Defendant Higgins is immune from suit. Plaintiff has also violated the local rules by failing to file an opposition. So ordered. cc/cl (Lindsay, Maurice)
Blank -- Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005 Order on Motion to Amend
Judge Michael A Ponsor : ENDORSED ORDER entered granting [27] Motion to Amend Damages. cc/cl (Lindsay, Maurice)
PDF 32 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005 Notice of Change of Address or Firm Name
NOTICE of Change of Address by David Ribeiro (Lindsay, Maurice)
PDF 31 Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: 5/5/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
MEMORANDUM of law in Support of her [30] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Catherine Higgins. (Lindsay, Maurice)
PDF 30 Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: 5/5/2005, Terminated: 6/23/2005 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss by Catherine Higgins.(Lindsay, Maurice)
PDF 29 Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: 5/4/2005 Summons Returned Executed
Marshals return of service Returned Executed as to Catherine Higgins. Served on 4/22/2005. Answer due 5/12/2005. (Finn, Mary)
PDF 28 Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: 5/2/2005 Answer to Amended Complaint
ANSWER to Amended Complaint by City of Holyoke, David S. Usher, Martin W. Narey, James D. Briant.(Lindsay, Maurice)
PDF 27 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: 4/14/2005, Terminated: 6/23/2005 Motion to Amend
Ptf's MOTION to Amend Damages [25] Amended Complaint, by David Ribeiro.(Lindsay, Maurice)
PDF 26 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: 4/13/2005 Answer to Amended Complaint
ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Michael Higgins, Paul M. Kelly.(Vigliotti, John)
Blank -- Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005 Summons Issued
Summons Issued as to Officer Donze, Catherine Higgins, Emil Morales and forwarded to the Marshals for service. (Finn, Mary)
PDF 25 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005 Amended Complaint
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Officer Donze, Hampden County District Attorney's Office, Catherine Higgins, Emil Morales, City of Holyoke, David S. Usher, Martin W. Narey, Paul M. Kelly, James D. Briant, Lt. Higgins, Holyoke Police Department by David Ribeiro filed.(Finn, Mary)
PDF 24 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005 Motion to Appoint Counsel
Pltf's MOTION to Appoint Counsel by David Ribeiro filed.(Finn, Mary)
Blank -- Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005 Order on Motion to Amend
Judge Michael A Ponsor : ENDORSED ORDER entered granting the Pltf's [20] Motion to Amend the complaint; cc/cl. and Pltf. (Finn, Mary)
Blank -- Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005 Order on Motion for Discovery
Judge Michael A Ponsor : ENDORSED ORDER entered granting Defts. Michael Higgins and Paul Kelly's [18] Motion for Discovery (to depose the Pltf); cc/cl. and Pltf. (Finn, Mary)
Blank -- Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005 Order on Motion to Amend
Judge Michael A Ponsor : ENDORSED ORDER entered granting the Pltf's [12] Motion to Amend findings; cc/cl. and Pltf. (Finn, Mary)
Blank -- Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005 Order on Motion to Dismiss
Judge Michael A Ponsor : ENDORSED ORDER entered granting Defts. William Bennett and the Commonwealth of Massachusett's [9] Motion to Dismiss. This ruling applies to the amended complaint as well as the original complaint. This case is dismissed at to these two Defts; cc/Pltf. and Cl. (Finn, Mary)
Blank -- Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Judge Michael A Ponsor : ENDORSED ORDER entered denying [24] Motion to Appoint Counsel - in view of the pending criminal charge this is an not appropriate civil case for appointment of counsel; cc/Pltf. (Finn, Mary) Modified on 4/1/2005 (Finn, Mary).
Blank -- Filed: 3/15/2005, Entered: 3/15/2005 Case Assigned/Reassigned
Case Reassigned to District Judge Michael A Ponsor. Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are directed to the Court's Standing Orders re: Electronic Case Filing. (Healy, Bethaney)
PDF 23 Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: 3/11/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
Ptf's RESPONSE to Dft's [20] and [21] Opposition to his [20] MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by David Ribeiro. (Lindsay, Maurice)
PDF 22 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: 2/22/2005 Opposition to Motion
Dft's Opposition to Ptf's [20] MOTION to Amend his complaint filed by City of Holyoke, David S. Usher, Martin W. Narey, James D. Briant. (Lindsay, Maurice)
PDF 21 Filed: 2/16/2005, Entered: 2/16/2005 Opposition to Motion
Dft's Opposition to Ptf's [20] MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Commonwealth of Massachusetts, William Bennett. (Lindsay, Maurice)
PDF 20 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005, Terminated: 3/31/2005 Motion to Amend
MOTION to Amend his Complaint by David Ribeiro.(Lindsay, Maurice)
PDF 19 Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: 1/19/2005 Letter/request (non-motion)
Letter/request (non-motion) from David Ribeiro. (Lindsay, Maurice)
PDF 18 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: 1/12/2005, Terminated: 3/31/2005 Motion for Discovery
MOTION for Discovery by Paul M. Kelly, Lt. Higgins.(Vigliotti, John)
PDF 17 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/5/2005 Certificate of Consultation
CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION by Michael J. Akerson on behalf of Paul M. Kelly. (Akerson, Michael)
PDF 16 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/5/2005 Certificate of Consultation
CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION by Michael J. Akerson on behalf of Lt. Higgins. (Akerson, Michael)
PDF 15 Filed: 12/27/2004, Entered: 12/27/2004 Answer to Complaint
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by James D. Briant, City of Holyoke, Martin W. Narey, David S. Usher.(Lindsay, Maurice)
PDF 14 Filed: 12/27/2004, Entered: 12/27/2004 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Karen Betourney, Charles P. Lavelle on behalf of James D. Briant, City of Holyoke, Martin W. Narey, David S. Usher (Lindsay, Maurice)
PDF 13 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: 12/22/2004 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by John K. Vigliotti, Michael J. Akerson, Andrew J. Gambaccini, Austin M. Joyce on behalf of Paul M. Kelly, Lt. Higgins (Lindsay, Maurice)
PDF 12 Filed: 12/21/2004, Entered: 12/21/2004, Terminated: 3/31/2005 Motion to Amend
MOTION to Amend [3] Complaint by David Ribeiro. Caption on document is Motion to Amend Findings.(Stuckenbruck, John) Modified on 12/21/2004 to add text that no certificate of service is attached to document.(Stuckenbruck, John).
PDF 11 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: 12/17/2004 Answer to Complaint
ANSWER to Complaint with The Defendants Demand a Trial by Jury on All Issues by Paul M. Kelly, Lt. Higgins.(Joyce, Austin)
PDF 10 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: 12/15/2004 Memorandum in Support of Motion
Deft. William Bennett's MEMORANDUM in Support of his [9] MOTION to Dismiss filed. (Finn, Mary)
PDF 9 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: 12/15/2004, Terminated: 3/31/2005 Motion to Dismiss
Deft. William Bennett's MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by William Bennett filed.(Finn, Mary)
PDF 8 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: 12/15/2004 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by William P. O'Neil on behalf of William Bennett as District Attorney for the Commonwealth of Mass. filed. (Finn, Mary)
PDF 7 Filed: 12/9/2004, Entered: 12/9/2004 Summons Returned Executed
Marhals return of service executed as to Defts. James D. Briant served on 12/9/2004, answer due 12/29/2004; City of Holyoke served on 12/9/2004, answer due 12/29/2004; Commonwealth of Massachusetts served on 12/9/2004, answer due 12/29/2004; Holyoke Police Department served on 12/9/2004, answer due 12/29/2004; Paul M. Kelly served on 12/9/2004, answer due 12/29/2004; Lt. Higgins served on 12/9/2004, answer due 12/29/2004; Martin W. Narey served on 12/9/2004, answer due 12/29/2004; David S. Usher served on 12/9/2004, answer due 12/29/2004. (Finn, Mary)
PDF 6 Filed: 12/9/2004, Entered: 12/9/2004 Summons Returned Executed
Marshals return of service executed as to District Attorney William Bennett - served on 12/8/2004, answer due 12/28/2004. (Finn, Mary)
Blank 5 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: 11/1/2004 Consent by all parties to Jurisdiction by US MagisCourt Filing
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (This document was not scanned and is kept in a separate file in a secure room). (Lindsay, Maurice)
Blank -- Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: 11/1/2004 Summons Issued
Summons Issued as to William Bennett, James D. Briant, Paul M. Kelly, Lt. Higgins, Martin W. Narey, David S. Usher and forwarded to the Marshals for service. (Finn, Mary)
Blank -- Filed: 10/13/2004, Entered: 10/13/2004 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Judge Kenneth P. Neiman : ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying [4] Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel without prejudice to its reconsideration once a response to the complaint has been filed. (Neiman, Kenneth)
PDF 4 Filed: 10/8/2004, Entered: 10/12/2004 Motion to Appoint Counsel
Pltf's MOTION to Appoint Counsel by David Ribeiro filed.(Finn, Mary)
PDF 3 Filed: 10/8/2004, Entered: 10/12/2004 ComplaintCourt Filing
COMPLAINT by David Ribeiro filed. Filing fee of $150.00 waived (IFP). Magistrate Judge Consent Form and Blank Marshals Forms forwarded to the Pltf.(Finn, Mary)
PDF 2 Filed: 10/8/2004, Entered: 10/12/2004 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma paupCourt Filing
Judge Kenneth P. Neiman : ORDER entered granting the Pltf's [1] Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; cc/Pltf. (Finn, Mary)
PDF 1 Filed: 9/16/2004, Entered: 10/12/2004 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis
Pltf's MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Ribeiro filed.(Finn, Mary)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 166 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?