Soares v. INS Commissioner
Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10540-RGS
docket://gov.uscourts.mad.1-05-cv-10540 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
The right information can save you thousands of dollars.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Adailton Gomes Soares, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Care Circle, LLC.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Thomas P. Collins +1 978 475 8846 +1 978 475 7947 tcll@prodigy.net
v.
No Logo Department Of Homeland Security, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Mark T. Quinlivan +1 617 748 3606 +1 617 748 3969 mark.quinlivan@usdoj.gov
Office Boston
Filed 3/22/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Suffolk
Terminated 11/18/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (20) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
Blank -- Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: 11/18/2005 Terminated Case
Civil Case Terminated. (Johnson, Mary)
PDF 14 Filed: 11/17/2005, Entered: 11/17/2005 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Adailton Gomes Soares, Department of Homeland Security, INS Commissioner. (Quinlivan, Mark)
PDF 13 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: 11/3/2005 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 12/19/2005 03:00 PM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. (Johnson, Mary)
Blank -- Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: 5/20/2005 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part [4] Motion for Preliminary Injunction "Allowed as to requests (1) and (2). Otherwise Denied." (Flaherty, Elaine)
PDF 12 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005 Answer to Complaint
ANSWER to Complaint by Department of Homeland Security.(Quinlivan, Mark)
PDF 11 Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: 5/6/2005 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [4] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Department of Homeland Security. (Quinlivan, Mark)
Blank -- Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: 5/3/2005 Order on Motion to Dismiss
Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part [8] Motion to Dismiss "the motion to substitute the Department of Homeland Security as the proper defendant is Allowed." (Flaherty, Elaine)
PDF 9 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
MEMORANDUM in Support re [8] MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Substitute Proper Party Defendant filed by INS Commissioner. (Quinlivan, Mark)
PDF 8 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005, Terminated: 5/2/2005 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Substitute Proper Party Defendant by INS Commissioner.(Quinlivan, Mark)
PDF 7 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark T. Quinlivan on behalf of INS Commissioner (Quinlivan, Mark)
PDF 10 Filed: 4/20/2005, Entered: 4/26/2005 Notice (Other)
NOTICE of request for hearing on motion for preliminary injunction by Adailton Gomes Soares re [4] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Flaherty, Elaine)
PDF 6 Filed: 4/20/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005 Affidavit in Support
AFFIDAVIT in Support re [5] Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Flaherty, Elaine)
PDF 5 Filed: 4/20/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
MEMORANDUM in Support re [4] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Adailton Gomes Soares. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5))(Flaherty, Elaine)
PDF 4 Filed: 4/20/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Adailton Gomes Soares.(Flaherty, Elaine)
Blank -- Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005 Filing Fee/Payment Received
Filing fee: $ 250., receipt number 63020 regarding new case (Flaherty, Elaine)
Blank -- Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: 3/25/2005 Order on Motion for TRO
Judge William G. Young (as Emergency Judge)Electronic ORDER entered denying [2] Motion for TRO, Flaherty, Elaine) "Treated as a motion for preliminary injunction and DENIED without prejudice, as more fully stated on the record in open Court."
PDF 3 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: 3/25/2005 Motion for Order
MOTION for Order to short order of notice and hearing on preliminary injunction by Adailton Gomes Soares.(Flaherty, Elaine)
PDF 2 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: 3/25/2005 Motion for TRO
Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Adailton Gomes Soares.(Flaherty, Elaine)
PDF 1 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: 3/25/2005 Complaint
COMPLAINT against INS Commissioner Filing fee: none listed yet $ 250, filed by Adailton Gomes Soares.(Flaherty, Elaine)
Blank -- Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: 3/25/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Collings. (Flaherty, Elaine)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 62 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?