CUOZZO SPEED TECHNOLOGIES LLC v. GARMIN INTERNATIONAL INC. et al
New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-03623
Magistrate Judge Claire C. Cecchi, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.njd.2-12-cv-03623 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Judges don't know as much about themselves as we do.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Cuozzo Speed Technologies LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Scarpone & Vargo LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Bruce D. Vargo +1 973 623 4101 +1 973 623 4181 bvargo@scarponevargo.com
v.
No Logo Chrysler Group LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Connell Foley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
HECTOR DANIEL RUIZ +1 973 535 0500 hruiz@connellfoley.com
LIZA M. WALSH +1 973 535 0500 lwalsh@connellfoley.com
No Logo Garmin International, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by ROBINSON, WETTRE & MILLER LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
MICHAEL JAMES GESUALDO +1 973 690 5400 mgesualdo@rwmlegal.com
No Logo GARMIN USA, INC., Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 Patent
  Entries (58) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PACER 58 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: 11/16/2012 Letter
Letter from Bruce D. Vargo, Esq. to Hon. Joseph A. Dickson, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certification of Cabrach J. Connor, Esq.)(VARGO, BRUCE) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
PACER 57 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: 11/15/2012 Letter
Letter from Bruce D. Vargo, Esq. to Hon. Joseph A. Dickson re 54 Letter, 55 Letter. (VARGO, BRUCE) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
PACER 56 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: 11/9/2012 Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice David A. Skeels, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (VARGO, BRUCE) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
PACER 55 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: 11/7/2012 Letter
Letter from Liza M. Walsh, Esq. to the Honorable Joseph A. Dickson, U.S.M.J.. (WALSH, LIZA) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
PACER 54 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: 11/7/2012 LetterCourt Filing
Letter from Leda Dunn Wettre, Esq. to Judge Dickson. (WETTRE, LEDA) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
PACER 53 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: 10/23/2012 Letter
Letter from Bruce Vargo, Esq. to Hon. Joseph A. Dickson. (VARGO, BRUCE) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
PDF 52 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: 10/23/2012 Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
ORDER granting 50 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David A. Skeels, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/22/12. (dc, ) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
PACER 51 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: 10/19/2012 Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Megan S. Woodworth to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-4637522.) (WALSH, LIZA) (Entered: 10/19/2012)
PACER 50 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: 10/19/2012 Motion for Leave to Appear
Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CUOZZO SPEED TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Bruce D. Vargo, Esq., # 2 Certification of David A. Skeels, Esq., # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(VARGO, BRUCE) (Entered: 10/19/2012)
PACER 49 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: 10/17/2012 Motion for Leave to Appear
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CUOZZO SPEED TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Bruce D. Vargo, Esq., # 2 Certification of David A. Skeels, Esq., # 3 Certification of Dave R. Gunter, Esq., # 4 Certification of Todd I. Blumenfeld, Esq., # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(VARGO, BRUCE) (Entered: 10/17/2012)
PACER 48 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: 10/12/2012 TranscriptCourt Filing
Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/09/2012, before Judge JOSPEH A. DICKSON. Court Reporter/Transcriber KLJ TRANSCRIPTION SERVICES/TERRY L. DEMARCO ((201) 703-1670). Tape Number: RULE 16 CONFERENCE. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 11/2/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/13/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/10/2013. (ma) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
PDF 47 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: 10/9/2012 Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
ORDER granting 44 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Megan S. Woodworth. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/9/12. (dc, ) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
PDF 46 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: 10/9/2012 Joint Discovery Plan
Joint Discovery Plan by CUOZZO SPEED TECHNOLOGIES LLC.(VARGO, BRUCE) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
PACER 45 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: 10/5/2012 Letter
Letter from Bruce Vargo Esq. to Magistrate Dickson. (VARGO, BRUCE) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
PACER 44 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: 10/5/2012 Motion for Leave to Appear
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CHRYSLER GROUP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Statement in Lieu of Brief, # 2 Certification of Megan S. Woodworth, # 3 Supporting Certification of Liza M. Walsh, # 4 Text of Proposed Order, # 5 Certificate of Service, # 6 Cover Letter)(WALSH, LIZA) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
PACER 43 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: 10/5/2012 OrderCourt Filing
TEXT ORDER: Defendant's request to adjourn the in person status conference set for 10/9/12 is DENIED. The conference will go forward on 10/9/12 at 3:00 p.m. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/5/12. (nm, ) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
PACER 42 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: 10/4/2012 LetterCourt Filing
Letter from Bruce D. Vargo to Magistrate Judge Dickson re 41 Letter. (VARGO, BRUCE) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
PACER 41 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: 10/3/2012 LetterCourt Filing
Letter from Leda Dunn Wettre, Esq. to Judge Dickson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Letter to Judge Dickson)(WETTRE, LEDA) (Entered: 10/03/2012)
PACER 40 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: 9/11/2012 OrderCourt Filing
TEXT ORDER: In person Status/Scheduling Conference set for 10/9/2012 03:00 PM in Newark - Courtroom 2D before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson.SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 9/11/12. (nm, ) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
PACER 39 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: 9/6/2012 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHRYSLER GROUP LLC. (WALSH, LIZA) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
PACER 38 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: 9/6/2012 Answer to Amended Complaint
ANSWER to Amended Complaint by CHRYSLER GROUP LLC.(WALSH, LIZA) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
PACER 37 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: 8/31/2012 Answer to Amended Complaint
Garmin's ANSWER to Amended Complaint For Patent Infringement by GARMIN INTERNATIONAL INC., GARMIN USA, INC..(WETTRE, LEDA) (Entered: 08/31/2012)
PACER 36 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: 8/22/2012 LetterCourt Filing
Letter from Leda Dunn Wettre, Esq. to Judge Cecchi. (WETTRE, LEDA) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
PACER 35 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: 8/20/2012 Amended Complaint
AMENDED COMPLAINT against CHRYSLER GROUP LLC, GARMIN INTERNATIONAL INC., GARMIN USA, INC., filed by CUOZZO SPEED TECHNOLOGIES LLC.(VARGO, BRUCE) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
PACER 34 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: 8/20/2012 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEFENDANT'S WITHDRAWAL OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS re 8 Motion to Dismiss; 27 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 8/20/12. (dc, ) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
PACER 33 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: 8/20/2012 Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jason W. Deats, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (VARGO, BRUCE) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
PACER 32 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: 8/20/2012 Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Cabrach J. Connor, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (VARGO, BRUCE) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
PACER 31 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: 8/20/2012 Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Edward W. Goldstein, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (VARGO, BRUCE) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
PACER 30 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: 8/15/2012 Stipulation
STIPULATION and Order on Plaintiff's Leave to File First Amended Complaint and Garmin Defendants' Withdrawal of their Motion to Dismiss by CUOZZO SPEED TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation and proposed order)(VARGO, BRUCE) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
PACER 29 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: 8/9/2012 Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Thomas D. Anderson to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-4513169.) (WALSH, LIZA) (Entered: 08/09/2012)
PACER 28 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: 8/9/2012 Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Frank C. Cimino, Jr. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-4513161.) (WALSH, LIZA) (Entered: 08/09/2012)
PACER 27 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: 8/6/2012 Motion for Leave to File
Cross MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by CUOZZO SPEED TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Opposition to Garmin Motion to Dismiss and In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, # 2 Declaration of Cabrach J. Connor In Opposition to Garmin Motion to Dismiss and In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service)(VARGO, BRUCE) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
PACER 26 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: 8/6/2012 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion
MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by CUOZZO SPEED TECHNOLOGIES LLC re 8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims For Indirect Patent Infringement (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cabrach J. Connor In Opposition to Garmin Motion to Dismiss and In Support of Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, # 2 Certificate of Service)(VARGO, BRUCE) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
PACER 25 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: 8/6/2012 Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
ORDER granting 24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Frank C. Cimino, Jr. and Thomas D. Anderson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 8/6/12. (dc, ) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
PACER 24 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: 8/2/2012 Motion for Leave to Appear
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CHRYSLER GROUP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Statement in Lieu of Brief, # 2 Certification of Frank C. Cimino, Jr., # 3 Certification of Thomas D. Anderson, # 4 Supporting Certification of Liza M. Walsh, # 5 Text of Proposed Order, # 6 Certificate of Service, # 7 Cover Letter)(WALSH, LIZA) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
PACER 23 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: 7/31/2012 Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Ajay A. Sharma, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-4492371.) (WETTRE, LEDA) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
PACER 22 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: 7/31/2012 Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Eric A. Buresh, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-4492309.) (WETTRE, LEDA) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
PACER 21 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: 7/31/2012 Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jason R. Mudd, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-4492255.) (WETTRE, LEDA) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
PACER 20 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: 7/31/2012 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL JAMES GESUALDO on behalf of GARMIN INTERNATIONAL INC., GARMIN USA, INC. (GESUALDO, MICHAEL) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
PACER 19 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: 7/30/2012 Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
ORDER granting 17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Edward W. Goldstein, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 7/30/12. (dc, ) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
PACER 18 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: 7/30/2012 OrderCourt Filing
CONSENT ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ERIC A. BURESH, ESQ., JASON R. MUDD, ESQ., AND AJAY A. SHARMA, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 7/30/12. (dc, ) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
PACER 17 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: 7/25/2012 Motion for Leave to Appear
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CUOZZO SPEED TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Bruce D. Vargo, Esq., # 2 Certification of Edward W. Goldstein, Esq., # 3 Certification of Cabrach J. Connor, Esq., # 4 Certification of Jason W. Deats, Esq., # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(VARGO, BRUCE) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
PACER 16 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: 7/24/2012 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by HECTOR DANIEL RUIZ on behalf of CHRYSLER GROUP LLC (RUIZ, HECTOR) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
PACER 15 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: 7/24/2012 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by LIZA M. WALSH on behalf of CHRYSLER GROUP LLC (WALSH, LIZA) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
PACER 14 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: 7/23/2012 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER extending Deft. Chrysler Group LLC's time to answer until 8/18/12. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 7/23/12. (dc, ) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
PACER 13 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: 7/23/2012 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER resetting deadlines as to 8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims For Indirect Patent Infringement.( Motion set for 8/20/2012 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court.), etc., Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 7/23/12. (dc, ) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
PACER 12 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: 7/20/2012 LetterCourt Filing
Letter from Leda Dunn Wettre, Esq. to Judge Dickson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Leda Dunn Wettre, Esq. In Support of Admissions Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Declaration of Eric A. Buresh In Support of Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 3 Declaration of Jason R. Mudd In Support of Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 4 Declaration of Ajay A. Sharma In Support of Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(WETTRE, LEDA) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
PACER 11 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: 7/19/2012 Letter
Letter from Liza M. Walsh, Esq. to the Honorable Joseph A. Dickson, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation and Proposed Order)(WALSH, LIZA) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
PACER 10 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: 7/16/2012 Answer to Complaint
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by GARMIN INTERNATIONAL INC., GARMIN USA, INC..(WETTRE, LEDA) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
PACER 9 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: 7/13/2012 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Corporate Disclosure Statement by GARMIN INTERNATIONAL INC., GARMIN USA, INC.. (WETTRE, LEDA) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
PACER 8 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: 7/13/2012 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims For Indirect Patent Infringement by GARMIN INTERNATIONAL INC., GARMIN USA, INC.. Responses due by 7/23/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Brief In Support of Garmin's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims For Indirect Patent Infringement, # 2 Declaration of Ajay Sharma In Support of Garmin's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims For Indirect Patent Infringement, # 3 Exhibit A to Sharma Declaration, # 4 Exhibit B to Sharma Declaration, # 5 Exhibit C to Sharma Declaration, # 6 Exhibit D to Sharma Declaration, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(WETTRE, LEDA) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
PACER 7 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: 7/5/2012 Certificate of Service
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CUOZZO SPEED TECHNOLOGIES LLC Summons and Complaint served upon Defendant Garmin International, Inc. via Certified Mail (VARGO, BRUCE) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
PACER 6 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: 7/5/2012 Summons Returned Executed
SUMMONS Returned Executed by CUOZZO SPEED TECHNOLOGIES LLC. CHRYSLER GROUP LLC served on 6/28/2012, answer due 7/19/2012. (VARGO, BRUCE) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
PACER 5 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: 7/5/2012 Summons Returned Executed
SUMMONS Returned Executed by CUOZZO SPEED TECHNOLOGIES LLC. GARMIN USA, INC. served on 6/28/2012, answer due 7/19/2012. (VARGO, BRUCE) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
PACER 4 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: 6/19/2012 Summons Issued
SUMMONS ISSUED as to CHRYSLER GROUP LLC, GARMIN INTERNATIONAL INC., GARMIN USA, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *LEROY DUNBAR* (ld, ) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
PACER 3 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: 6/19/2012 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form
AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (ld, ) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
PACER 2 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: 6/19/2012 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Corporate Disclosure Statement by CUOZZO SPEED TECHNOLOGIES LLC identifying NONE as Corporate Parent.. (ld, ) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
PDF 1 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: 6/19/2012 Complaint
COMPLAINT against CHRYSLER GROUP LLC, GARMIN INTERNATIONAL INC., GARMIN USA, INC. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 4407092) with JURY DEMAND, filed by CUOZZO SPEED TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification -Local Rule 11.2, # 2 Supplement Form AO 120, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ld, ) (Entered: 06/19/2012)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 77 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?