Reed v. 1-800 Contacts, Inc. et al
California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:12-cv-02359
District Judge Jeffrey T. Miller, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.casd.3-12-cv-02359 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
The right information can save you thousands of dollars.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Robert Reed, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dostart Clapp & Coveney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Zachariah Paul Dostart , +1 858 623 4200 +1 858 623 4299 zdostart@sdlaw.com
v.
No Logo 1-800 Contacts, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Andrew B Serwin +1 619 234 6655 +1 619 234 3510 aserwin@foley.com
No Logo Does 1-50, Inclusive, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1442
Nature of Suit 890 Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (47) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PACER 47 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: 9/9/2013 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1)
PACER 46 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: 9/4/2013 Miscellaneous (Other 1)
PACER 45 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: 8/29/2013 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1)
PACER 44 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: 8/28/2013 Response - Other
PACER 43 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: 8/27/2013 Response - Other
PACER 42 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: 8/16/2013 Order
PACER 41 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: 8/9/2013 Non Opposition to Motion
PACER 40 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: 7/26/2013 Miscellaneous (Other 1)
PACER 39 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: 6/11/2013 Notice (Other)
PACER 38 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: 6/10/2013 Order
PACER 37 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: 5/15/2013 Notice (Other)
PACER 36 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: 5/15/2013 Order on Motion to Continue
PACER 35 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: 5/10/2013 Motion to Continue
PACER 34 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: 5/10/2013 Response in Opposition to Motion
PACER 33 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: 5/8/2013 Order on Motion for Protective Order
PACER 32 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: 5/3/2013 Motion to Compel
PACER 31 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: 4/30/2013 Reply - Other
PACER 30 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: 4/29/2013 Pro Hac Vice Appointed
PACER 29 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: 4/29/2013 Pro Hac Vice Appointed
PACER 28 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: 4/29/2013 Pro Hac Vice Appointed
PACER 27 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: 4/26/2013 Response in Opposition to Motion
PACER 26 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: 4/24/2013 Order
PACER 25 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: 4/22/2013 Motion for Protective Order
PACER 24 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: 4/17/2013 Order
PACER 23 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: 4/17/2013 Notice of Appearance
PACER 22 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: 3/29/2013 Order on Motion to Stay
PACER 21 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: 3/21/2013 Reply - Other
PACER 20 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: 3/19/2013 Response in Opposition to Motion
PACER 19 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: 3/13/2013 Notice of Appearance
PACER 18 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: 3/13/2013 Order Setting Briefing Schedule
PACER 17 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: 3/12/2013 Motion to Stay
PACER 16 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: 3/8/2013 Order on Motion for Discovery
PACER 15 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: 3/1/2013 Motion for Discovery
PACER 14 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
PROTECTIVE ORDER: Granting 13 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 12/19/2012. (jao)(jrd) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
PACER 13 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: None
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Robert Reed. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Dostart, Zachariah) (jao). (Entered: 12/19/2012)
PACER 12 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: Rejecting Document, from Plaintiff Robert Reed, re 10 Joint MOTION for Protective Order . Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Attaching an exhibit in this manner is not appropriate means of moving for a protective order. The language contained in the exhibit should be part of the actual motion. In addition, the submitted proposed protective order is not properly formatted. There should NEVER be law firm or attorney information on the order. Please remove and resend when the Joint Motion is refiled. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 12/17/2012.(jao) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
PDF 11 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Following Case Management Conference. Telephonic, attorneys-only Status Conference set for 8/19/2013 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 12/17/2012.(jao)(jrd) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
PACER 10 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None
**Document Stricken** Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Robert Reed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- Protective Order, # 2 Proof of Service)(Dostart, Zachariah) (Main Document 10 replaced on 12/17/2012) (jao). (Entered: 12/17/2012)
PACER 9 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: Case Management Conference held on 12/17/2012. Scheduling order to follow.(Plaintiff Attorney Zach Dostart). (Defendant Attorney Nancy Stagg). (no document attached) (asz) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
PACER 8 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Order Following Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, Setting Rule 26 Compliance and Notice of Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 10/30/2012. The Rule 26(f) conference shall be completed on or before November 26, 2012. A Joint Discovery Plan shall be lodged with Magistrate Judge Skomal before 12/10/2012. Telephonic attorneys-only Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2012 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 10/31/2012.(jao)(jrd) (Entered: 10/31/2012)
PACER 7 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 10/30/2012. The case did not settle. Order setting Rule 26 dates to follow(Plaintiff Attorney Zach Dostart, Jim Clapp). (Defendant Attorney Nancy Stagg, Andy Serwin, Tammy Boggs, Dave Zeidner, Pam Williams). (no document attached) (asz) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
PACER 6 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE of Hearing: Early Neutral Evaluation set for 10/30/2012 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal is converted to ATTORNEYS ONLY.(no document attached) (asz) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
PACER 5 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None Jury Demand
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Robert Reed. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Dostart, Zachariah) (srm). (Entered: 09/28/2012)
PACER 4 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation is set for 10/30/2012 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal, located at 101 W. Broadway, Suite 1100, San Diego, California. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 9/28/2012. (srm)(jrd) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
PACER 3 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Non-Compliance with Local Rule 5.4(a) Mandatory Electronic Filing. (dls) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
PACER 2 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by 1-800 Contacts, Inc. (dls)(av1). (Entered: 09/27/2012)
PACER 1 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from S.D.C.S.C. - Central Division, case number 37-2012-00102442-CU-MC-CTL (filing fee $350 receipt number 42991), filed by 1-800 Contacts, Inc. (t/w Complaint and Answer in Removal). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B - Answer in State Court, # 3 Proof of Service, # 4 Civil Case Cover Sheet).The new case number is 3:12-cv-2359-JM-BGS. Judge Jeffrey T. Miller and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Serwin, Andrew)(dls) [ATTNY MAINT] (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/27/2012: # 5 Declaration of Jason Campbell ISO Removal) (dls). (av1). (Entered: 09/27/2012)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 806 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?