USA v. Smith et al
Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:12-cr-00479
District Judge William D Quarles, Jr, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.mdd.1-12-cr-00479 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
This docket can only tell you so much. Get the rest.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Garnett Gilbert Smith, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Daniel McCormack

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Michael Edward Lawlor +1 301 474 3404 +1 301 474 3406 mlawlor@verizon.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Roland Walker and Marc L Zayon PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Marc L Zayon +1 410 727 3710 +1 410 727 4955 mzayon@walkerzayon.com
  Entries (109) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PDF 122 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE filed by USA. ( Replies due by 3/31/2014.), RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Garnett Gilbert Smith re 108 MOTION to Stay Forfeiture (Warwick, James) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
PACER 120 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT as to Marc Tyrone Collins (3), Count(s) 1, IMPRISONMENT for a total term of ninety-seven (97) months, with credit for time served since March 28, 2013; SUPERVISED RELEASE for a term of five (5) years; ASSESSMENT in the amount of $100.00. Signed by Judge William D Quarles, Jr on 3/11/2014. (c/s 3/11/2014 aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
PACER 118 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
PRELIMINARY FORFEITURE ORDER as to Marc Tyrone Collins.. Signed by Judge William D Quarles, Jr on 3/6/2014. (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
PACER 117 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
Sentencing as to Marc Tyrone Collins held on 3/6/2014 before Judge William D Quarles, Jr. (Court Reporter: Martin Giordano) (kmts, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
PACER 116 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT as to Garnett Gilbert Smith for proceedings held on 1/30/13 before Judge Quarles, re 107 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment Transcript due by 4/10/2014. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
PACER 115 Filed: 3/1/2014, Entered: None
SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Marc Tyrone Collins (Trainor, Harry) (Entered: 03/01/2014)
PACER 114 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None
ORDER of USCA relieving counsel from further representation on appeal and appointing Barbara Ellen Kittay to represent Appelland on appeal as to Garnett Gilbert Smith re 107 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
PACER 113 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Garnett Gilbert Smith for proceedings held on 10/10/13 before Judge Quarles, re 107 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment Transcript due by 3/27/2014. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
PACER 112 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Garnett Gilbert Smith for proceedings held on 1/30/14 before Judge Quarles, re 107 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment Transcript due by 3/27/2014. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
PACER 111 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
ORDER of USCA appointing Teresa Whalen, Esq. to represent Garnett Gilbert Smith re 107 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
PACER 110 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
USCA Case Number 14-4118 as to Garnett Gilbert Smith for 107 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment filed by Garnett Gilbert Smith. Case Manager - Sharon Wiley. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
PACER 109 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet as to Garnett Gilbert Smith to US Court of Appeals re 107 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
PACER 108 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None
MOTION to Stay forfeiture pending appeal by Garnett Gilbert Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Mailing Envelope)(aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
PACER 107 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Garnett Gilbert Smith Fee Status: CJA. (Whalen, Teresa) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
PACER 105 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT as to Garnett Gilbert Smith (1), Count(s) 1, 2s, DISMISSED; Count(s) 1s, IMPRISONMENT for a total term of (300) three-hundred months;SUPERVISED RELEASE for a term of (5) five years;ASSESSMENT in the amount of $100.00. Signed by Judge William D Quarles, Jr on 1/31/2014. (c/s 1/31/2014 aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
PACER 104 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE as to Garnett Gilbert Smith. Signed by Judge William D Quarles, Jr on 1/30/2014. (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
PACER 103 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
Sentencing as to Garnett Gilbert Smith held on 1/30/2014 before Judge William D Quarles, Jr. (Court Reporter: Giordano) (rks, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
PACER 102 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
MOTION for Judgment of Forfeiture by USA as to Garnett Gilbert Smith, Antonio Lamont Johnson, Marc Tyrone Collins, Michael Lee White. Responses due by 2/18/2014 (Warwick, James) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
PACER 101 Filed: 1/18/2014, Entered: None
SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Garnett Gilbert Smith (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10a, # 11 Exhibit 10b, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12a, # 14 Exhibit 12b, # 15 Exhibit 12c, # 16 Exhibit 12d, # 17 Exhibit 13, # 18 Exhibit 14a, # 19 Exhibit 14b, # 20 Exhibit 15a, # 21 Exhibit 15b, # 22 Exhibit 16, # 23 Exhibit 17)(Whalen, Teresa) (Entered: 01/18/2014)
PACER 100 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to Garnett Gilbert Smith (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Warwick, James) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
PACER 99 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
Correspondence re: Acceptance of Plea Agreement by Garnett Smith (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter, # 2 Mailing Envelope)(aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/18/2013)
  • Attachment 1: Cover Letter
  • Attachment 2: Mailing Envelope
PACER 98 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
PRELIMINARY FORFEITURE ORDER as to Garnett Gilbert Smith.. Signed by Judge William D Quarles, Jr on 11/26/13. (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
PACER 95 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Expedited Sentencing Order as to Garnett Gilbert Smith. Signed by Judge William D Quarles, Jr on 10/10/2013. (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
PACER 94 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
-SEALED- PLEA SUPPLEMENT as to Garnett Gilbert Smith (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
PACER 93 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
PLEA AGREEMENT as to Garnett Gilbert Smith (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
PACER 92 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Rearraignment as to Garnett Gilbert Smith (1) Count 1s,2s held on 10/10/2013. Plea entered by Garnett Gilbert Smith (1)of Guilty as to Count 1s and Not Guilty on count 2s of the Superseding Indictment before Judge William D Quarles, Jr. (FTR: Nadine Mitter) (nrm, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
PACER 90 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Arraignment as to Garnett Gilbert Smith (1) Counts 1s,2s held on 9/13/2013, Plea entered by Garnett Gilbert Smith of Not Guilty as to counts 1s, 2s before Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey. (FTR: Klein-7B) (jk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
PACER 89 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Sentencing Order as to Michael Lee White. Signed by Judge William D Quarles, Jr on 9/4/13 (cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
PACER 88 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
-SEALED- PLEA SUPPLEMENT as to Michael Lee White (cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
PACER 87 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
PLEA AGREEMENT as to Michael Lee White (cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
PACER 86 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Rearraignment as to Michael Lee White (4) Count 1 held on 9/4/2013. Plea entered by Michael Lee White (4) of Guilty as to Count 1 of the Superseding Indictment before Judge William D Quarles, Jr. (Court Reporter: Martin Giordano) (kmts, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
PACER 85 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Regular Sentencing Order as to Marc Tyrone Collins. Signed by Judge William D Quarles, Jr on 8/14/2013. (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
PACER 84 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
-SEALED- PLEA SUPPLEMENT as to Marc Tyrone Collins (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
PACER 83 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
PLEA AGREEMENT as to Marc Tyrone Collins (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
PACER 82 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Rearraignment as to Marc Tyrone Collins (3) Count 1 held on 8/14/2013. Plea entered by Marc Tyrone Collins (3) of Guilty as to Count 1 of the Indictment before Judge William D Quarles, Jr. (Court Reporter: Martin Giordano) (kmt, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
PACER 81 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
Emergency MOTION for Medical Exam and Treatment of Defendant Detained Pre-Trial by Michael Lee White. Responses due by 7/22/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Woods, Richard) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
PACER 80 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
MOTION for Hearing Request for Detention Hearing by Marc Tyrone Collins. Responses due by 7/15/2013 (Trainor, Harry) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
PACER 78 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT as to Antonio Lamont Johnson (2), Count(s) 1, IMPRISONMENT for a total term of one hundred and fifty-six (156) months with credit for time served since September 7, 2012; SUPERVISED RELEASE for a total term of four (4) years; ASSESSMENT in the amount of $100.00; Count(s) 1s, 2s, DISMISSED. Signed by Judge William D Quarles, Jr on 6/26/13. (c/s 6/26/2013 aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
PACER 77 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Sentencing as to Antonio Lamont Johnson held on 6/25/2013 before Judge William D Quarles, Jr. (Court Reporter: Martin Giordano) (kmts, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
PACER 76 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None
CJA 20 as to Michael Lee White: Appointment of Attorney Gary Edward Proctor for Michael Lee White. Signed by Maureen F. Essex on 6/3/13. (Attachments: # 1 CJA 21) (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/10/2013)
PACER 74 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF DETENTION by Agreement as to Michael Lee White. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 6/6/13. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
PACER 73 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
Bench Warrant Returned Executed on 6/6/13 in case as to Michael Lee White (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
PACER 72 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Arraignment as to Michael Lee White (4) Count 1 held on 6/6/2013, Plea entered by Michael Lee White Not Guilty on count 1 before Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher. (FTR Gold: Goldsmith) (hsg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
PACER 71 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Initial Appearance as to Michael Lee White (Defendant informed of Rights.) held on 6/6/2013 before Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher. (FTR Gold: Goldsmith) (hsg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
PACER 70 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 68 Motion for Speedy Trial as to Garnett Gilbert Smith (1), Marc Tyrone Collins (3), Michael Lee White (4). Signed by Judge William D Quarles, Jr on 6/5/2013. (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
PACER 69 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Richard C B Woods as Retained Counsel appearing for Michael Lee White (Woods, Richard) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
PACER 68 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None
Joint MOTION for Speedy Trial Exclusion by USA as to Garnett Gilbert Smith, Marc Tyrone Collins, Michael Lee White. Responses due by 6/24/2013 (Sharfstein, David) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
PACER 67 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER setting date for trial and pretrial submissions as to Garnett Gilbert Smith, Antonio Lamont Johnson, Marc Tyrone Collins, Michael Lee White. Signed by Judge William D Quarles, Jr on 5/29/2013. (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
PACER 66 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
CJA 20 as to Garnett Gilbert Smith: Appointment of Attorney Teresa Whalen for Garnett Gilbert Smith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 5/16/2013. (Attachments: # 1 CJA 21) (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
PACER 65 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Order Sealing Portion of Court Proceeding as to Garnett Gilbert Smith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 5/15/2013. (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
PACER 64 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Attorney Inquiry Hearing as to Garnett Gilbert Smith held on 5/15/2013 before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. (FTR Waryu-7B) (jw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
PACER 63 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None
Correspondence from Antonio Johnson re: Concerns about Plea Agreement (Attachments: # 1 Mailing Envelope)(aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
PACER 61 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
Correspondence re: Request for Pre-Plea Criminal History Report (Trainor, Harry) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
PACER 60 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
MOTION to Suppress Tangible Evidence and Custodial Statements by Marc Tyrone Collins. Responses due by 5/9/2013 (Trainor, Harry) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
PACER 59 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF DETENTION BY AGREEMENT as to Marc Tyrone Collins. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 4/19/2013. (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
PACER 58 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
CONTRIBUTION ORDER as to Marc Tyrone Collins. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 4/19/2013. (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
PACER 57 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Arraignment as to Marc Tyrone Collins (3) Count 1 held on 4/19/2013, Plea entered by Marc Tyrone Collins Not Guilty on count 1 before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. (FTR Gold: Goldsmith) (hsg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
PACER 56 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Detention Hearing as to Marc Tyrone Collins held on 4/19/2013 before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. (FTR Gold: Goldsmith) (hsg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
PACER 55 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None
Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 3/28/2013(CA) and 4/9/2013 (MD) in case as to Marc Tyrone Collins (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
PACER 54 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Harry J Trainor, Jr as CJA Appointment appearing for Marc Tyrone Collins (Trainor, Harry) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
PACER 53 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: None
CJA 20 as to Marc Tyrone Collins: Appointment of Attorney Harry J Trainor, Jr for Marc Tyrone Collins. Signed by Donna P. Shearer on 4/9/2013. (Attachments: # 1 CJA 21) (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/11/2013)
PACER 52 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Marc Tyrone Collins (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
PACER 51 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF DETENTION BY AGREEMENT as to Marc Tyrone Collins. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 4/9/2013. (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
PACER 50 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Marc Tyrone Collins (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
PACER 49 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Initial Appearance as to Marc Tyrone Collins (Defendant informed of Rights.) held on 4/9/2013 before Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher. (FTR Gold) (stds, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
PACER 48 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Marc Tyrone Collins (RULE 5 DOCUMENT) (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
PDF 47 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None
STATUS REPORT by USA as to Garnett Gilbert Smith, Antonio Lamont Johnson, Marc Tyrone Collins, Michael Lee White (Warwick, James) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
PACER 46 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Order to Unseal Indictment as to Garnett Gilbert Smith, Antonio Lamont Johnson, Marc Tyrone Collins, Michael Lee White. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 4/3/2013. (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
PACER 45 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 43 Motion for Protective Order as to Garnett Gilbert Smith (1), Marc Tyrone Collins (3), Michael Lee White (4). Signed by Judge William D Quarles, Jr on 4/1/2013. (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
PACER 44 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None
MOTION and ORDER to Seal Protective Order by USA as to Garnett Gilbert Smith, Marc Tyrone Collins, Michael Lee White. (aos, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 4/2/2013 (aos, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 04/02/2013)
PACER 43 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None
APPLICATION for a Protective Order by USA as to Garnett Gilbert Smith, Marc Tyrone Collins, Michael Lee White. (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
PACER 42 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Regular Sentencing Order as to Antonio Lamont Johnson. Signed by Judge William D Quarles, Jr on 3/8/13. (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/11/2013)
PACER 41 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None
-SEALED- PLEA SUPPLEMENT as to Antonio Lamont Johnson (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
PDF 40 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None
PLEA AGREEMENT as to Antonio Lamont Johnson (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
PACER 39 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
RE-Arraignment as to Antonio Lamont Johnson (2) Count 1 held on 3/8/2013, Plea entered Guilty Count 1 before Judge William D Quarles, Jr. (CR: M. Giordano) (CRD: bmas) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
PACER 36 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Motion and Order to Seal Case as to Garnett Gilbert Smith, Antonio Lamont Johnson, Marc Tyrone Collins, Michael Lee White. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 2/26/13. (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
PACER 35 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
Redlined Superseding Indictment filed by USA on 2/27/2013as to Garnett Gilbert Smith, Antonio Lamont Johnson, Marc Tyrone Collins, Michael Lee White. (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
PDF 33 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
SEALED Superseding INDICTMENT as to Garnett Gilbert Smith (1) count(s) 1s, 2s, Antonio Lamont Johnson (2) count(s) 1s, 2s, Marc Tyrone Collins (3) count(s) 1, Michael Lee White (4) count(s) 1. (aos, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 2/27/2013 (aos, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 02/27/2013)
PACER 32 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Re-arraignment as to Antonio Lamont Johnson (2) Count 1 postponed by request of defendant on 1/11/2013 before Judge William D Quarles, Jr. (Court Reporter: C. Asif) (pat, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
PACER 31 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE David Sharfstein appearing for USA. (Sharfstein, David) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
PACER 30 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF DETENTION as to Garnett Gilbert Smith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 12/20/2012. (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
PACER 29 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Detention Hearing as to Garnett Gilbert Smith held on 12/20/2012 before Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey. (FTR Waryu-7B) (jws, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
PACER 28 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for Hearing on Detention by Garnett Gilbert Smith. Responses due by 1/2/2013 (Lawlor, Michael) (Entered: 12/14/2012)
PACER 27 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER ORDER re Trial and Pretrial submissions as to Garnett Gilbert Smith, Antonio Lamont Johnson. Signed by Judge William D Quarles, Jr on 11/6/2012. (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/06/2012)
PACER 26 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MARGINAL ORDER granting 24 MOTION to Continue Motions Deadline as to Garnett Gilbert Smith (1). Signed by Judge William D Quarles, Jr on 10/15/2012. (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
PACER 25 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael Edward Lawlor as CJA Appointment appearing for Garnett Gilbert Smith (Lawlor, Michael) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
PACER 24 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Continue Motions Deadline by Garnett Gilbert Smith. Responses due by 11/1/2012 (Lawlor, Michael) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
PACER 23 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Prohibiting Liquidation of Assets as to Garnett Gilbert Smith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 9/28/2012. (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
PACER 22 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
CONTRIBUTION ORDER as to Garnett Gilbert Smith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 9/28/2012. (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
PACER 21 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Arraignment as to Antonio Lamont Johnson (2) Count 1 held on 9/28/2012. Plea entered by Antonio Lamont Johnson Not Guilty on Count 1 before Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey. (FTR Wohlfort-7B) (jws, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
PACER 20 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Arraignment as to Garnett Gilbert Smith (1) Count 1 held on 9/28/2012. Plea entered by Garnett Gilbert Smith Not Guilty on Count 1 before Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey. (FTR Waryu-7B) (jws, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
PACER 19 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None
CJA 20 as to Garnett Gilbert Smith: Appointment of Attorney Michael Edward Lawlor for Garnett Gilbert Smith. Signed by Donna P. Shearer on 9/28/2012. (Attachments: # 1 CJA 21) (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
PACER 18 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Suppress Custodial Statements & Tangible Evidence by Antonio Lamont Johnson. Responses due by 10/9/2012 (Purpura, William) (Entered: 09/20/2012)
PACER 17 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None
CJA 20 as to Antonio Lamont Johnson: Appointment of Attorney William B Purpura, Jr for Antonio Lamont Johnson. Signed by Donna P. Shearer on 9/7/2012. (Attachments: # 1 CJA 21) (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
PACER 15 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None
INDICTMENT as to Garnett Gilbert Smith (1) count(s) 1, Antonio Lamont Johnson (2) count(s) 1. (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/12/2012)
PACER 14 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF DETENTION BY AGREEMENT as to Garnett Smith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/11/12. (hsg, Deputy Clerk)[1:12-mj-04111-PWG] Modified on 9/12/2012 (aos, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 09/11/2012)
PACER 13 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Detention Hearing as to Garnett Smith held on 9/11/2012 before Magistrate Judge Paul W. Grimm; Preliminary Hearing scheduled for 9/21/12 @ 12:00. (FTR Gold: Wohlfort) (hsg, Deputy Clerk)[1:12-mj-04111-PWG] Modified on 9/12/2012 (aos, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 09/11/2012)
PACER 12 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF DETENTION BY AGREEMENT as to Antonio Johnson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/11/12. (hsg, Deputy Clerk)[1:12-mj-04112-PWG] Modified on 9/12/2012 (aos, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 09/11/2012)
PACER 11 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Detention Hearing as to Antonio Johnson held on 9/11/2012 before Magistrate Judge Paul W. Grimm; Preliminary Hearing scheduled for 9/21/12 @ 12:00. (FTR Gold: Wohlfort) (hsg, Deputy Clerk)[1:12-mj-04112-PWG] Modified on 9/12/2012 (aos, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 09/11/2012)
PACER 10 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Marc L Zayon as Retained Counsel appearing for Garnett Smith (Zayon, Marc)[1:12-mj-04111-PWG] Modified on 9/12/2012 (aos, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 09/10/2012)
PACER 9 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Garnett Smith Detention Hearing set for 9/11/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 7C, 101 West Lombard Street, Baltimore, Maryland 21201, before Magistrate Judge Paul W. Grimm.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul W. Grimm on 09/07/12. (crc, Deputy Clerk)[1:12-mj-04111-PWG] Modified on 9/12/2012 (aos, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 09/10/2012)
PACER 8 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Garnett Smith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul W. Grimm on 09/07/12. (crc, Deputy Clerk)[1:12-mj-04111-PWG] Modified on 9/12/2012 (aos, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 09/10/2012)
PACER 7 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None
CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Garnett Smith (crc, Deputy Clerk)[1:12-mj-04111-PWG] Modified on 9/12/2012 (aos, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 9/12/2012 (aos, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 09/10/2012)
PACER 6 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Initial Appearance as to Garnett Smith (Defendant informed of Rights) held on 9/7/2012 before Magistrate Judge Paul W. Grimm. (FTR Wohlfort 7C) (crc, Deputy Clerk)[1:12-mj-04111-PWG] Modified on 9/12/2012 (aos, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 9/12/2012 (aos, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 09/10/2012)
PDF 5 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None
COMPLAINT as to Garnett Smith (1). (crc, Deputy Clerk)[1:12-mj-04111-PWG] Modified on 9/12/2012 (aos, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 9/12/2012 (aos, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 09/10/2012)
PACER 4 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Antonio Johnson Detention Hearing set for 9/11/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7C, 101 West Lombard Street, Baltimore, Maryland 21201, before Magistrate Judge Paul W. Grimm.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul W. Grimm on 09/07/12. (crc, Deputy Clerk) [1:12-mj-04112-PWG] (Entered: 09/10/2012)
PACER 3 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None
CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Antonio Johnson (crc, Deputy Clerk) [1:12-mj-04112-PWG] (Entered: 09/10/2012)
PACER 2 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Initial Appearance as to Antonio Johnson (Defendant informed of Rights) held on 9/7/2012 before Magistrate Judge Paul W. Grimm. (FTR Wohlfort 7C) (crc, Deputy Clerk) [1:12-mj-04112-PWG] (Entered: 09/10/2012)
PDF 1 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None
COMPLAINT as to Antonio Johnson (1). (crc, Deputy Clerk) [1:12-mj-04112-PWG] (Entered: 09/10/2012)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 862 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?