Murdoch v. Rosenberg & Associates, LLC et al
Maryland District Court, Case No. 8:12-cv-02234
District Judge Roger W Titus, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.mdd.8-12-cv-02234 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
This docket can only tell you so much. Get the rest.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Juliette Murdoch, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by JR Howell and Associates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jimmy Ray Howell, Jr. +1 202 552 7386 +1 202 518 2571 jrhowell@jrhlegalstrategies.com
v.
No Logo Diane Rosenberg, Defendant
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1692
Nature of Suit 890 Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (55) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PACER 55 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING 51 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 5/29/2013. (rss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
PACER 54 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Support re 51 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint filed by Rosenberg & Associates, L.L.C.. Replies due by 6/10/2013. (Mills, Laurin) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
PACER 53 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
QC NOTICE: 52 Memorandum filed by Rosenberg & Associates, L.L.C., 51 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Rosenberg & Associates, L.L.C. was filed incorrectly. **A motion and supporting memorandum must be filed separately. The motion should be filed as the main document and the supporting memorandum as a separate attachment to the main document. Your document has been accepted as filed. No corrective action is required in regard to this filing. (rss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
PACER 52 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
Memorandum re 51 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint filed by Rosenberg & Associates, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Mills, Laurin) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
PACER 51 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Rosenberg & Associates, L.L.C. Responses due by 5/13/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mills, Laurin) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
PDF 50 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Rosenberg & Associates, L.L.C..(Mills, Laurin) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
PACER 49 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None
STATUS REPORT (Joint Submission in Response to the Court's March 25, 2013 Scheduling Order) by Rosenberg & Associates, L.L.C.. (Mills, Laurin) (Entered: 04/08/2013)
PACER 48 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM/ORDER regarding issuance of Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 3/25/2013. (ebs2, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
PACER 47 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 8/7/2013. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 3/25/2013. (ebs2, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
PACER 46 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING 9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; GRANTING 14 MOTION to Dismiss; DISMISSING all Claims in Plaintiffs Complaint (Doc. No. 1) except for Plaintiffs claims pursuant to 15 U.S.C. § 1692e of the Fair Debt Collection Practices Act against Defendant Rosenberg & Associates, LLC; DENYING AS MOOT 17 MOTION Stay Class Certification Briefing Pending Discovery; GRANTING 19 MOTION to Strike 1 Complaint 's Class Action Allegations; and DENYING 29 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 3/22/2013. (rss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
PACER 45 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 3/22/2013. (rss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
PACER 44 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
MARGINAL ORDER GRANTING 43 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jimmy Ray Howell, Jr terminated. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 2/27/2013. (rss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
PACER 43 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Juliette Murdoch Responses due by 3/15/2013 (Howell, Jimmy) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
PACER 42 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Motion Hearing held on 12/20/2012 re 29 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Juliette Murdoch before Judge Roger W Titus. (Court Reporter: Lisa Bankins) (hbm, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
PACER 41 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING 40 MOTION to Excuse Attendance at December 20, 2012 Hearing or in the Alternative to Enter Appearance of Counsel. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 12/18/2012. (rss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/18/2012)
PACER 40 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for Other Relief Excusing Counsel from Attendance at December 20, 2012 Hearing or Entering Appearance by Diane Rosenberg, Rosenberg & Associates, L.L.C. Responses due by 1/7/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Denying Motion and Entering Appearance)(Mills, Laurin) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
PACER 39 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 29 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Juliette Murdoch. (Howell, Jimmy) (Entered: 09/24/2012)
PACER 38 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 29 MOTION to Certify Class (Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Certify a Class against Defendants, Appoint Named Plaintiff as Class Representative, and Appoint Class Counsel) filed by Diane Rosenberg, Rosenberg & Associates, L.L.C.. Replies due by 9/27/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Mills, Laurin) (Entered: 09/10/2012)
PACER 37 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING 35 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 29 MOTION to Certify Class . Responses due by 9/10/2012. Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr. on behalf of Judge Roger W. Titus on 8/23/2012. (rss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
PACER 36 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None
QC NOTICE: 35 Motion for Extension of Time, filed by Diane Rosenberg, Rosenberg & Associates, L.L.C. was filed incorrectly. **The incorrect civil event was used. The correct event is "Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply". Then, when given the opportunity during the docketing process, link to the document whose deadline is to be extended. Your document has been accepted as filed. Court staff have made the necessary corrections. No corrective action is required in regard to this filing. (rss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
PACER 35 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: None
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time and Memorandum in Support for Deadline to Oppose Plaintiff's 29 Motion to Certify a Class by Diane Rosenberg, Rosenberg & Associates, L.L.C. Responses due by 9/7/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mills, Laurin) Modified on 8/22/2012 to add link (rss, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 8/22/2012 (rss, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 08/21/2012)
PACER 34 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None
PAPERLESS ORDER granting 32 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Megan S BenAry on behalf of Rosenberg and Associates and Diane Rosenberg. Directing attorney Megan S BenAry to register on-line for CM/ECF at https://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attyregB/inputProHac.asp. Signed by Clerk on 8/16/12. (cmns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/16/2012)
PACER 33 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None
PAPERLESS ORDER granting 31 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney James Douglas Cuthbertson on behalf of Rosenberg and Associates and Diane Rosenberg. Directing attorney James Douglas Cuthbertson to register on-line for CM/ECF at https://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attyregB/inputProHac.asp. Signed by Clerk on 8/16/12. (cmns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/16/2012)
PACER 32 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Megan S. Ben'Ary by Rosenberg & Associates, L.L.C. (Filing fee $50.00; Receipt number 84637019624). (rss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
PACER 31 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James Douglas Cuthbertson by Rosenberg & Associates, L.L.C. (Filing fee $50.00; Receipt number 84637019623) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(rss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
PACER 30 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM scheduling a hearing on all pending motions for December 20, 2012 at 11:30 a.m. (cmc, Chambers) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
PACER 29 Filed: 8/8/2012, Entered: None, Terminated: 8/23/2012
MOTION to Certify a Class Against Defendants, Appoint Named Plaintiff as Class Representative, and Appoint Class Counsel by Juliette Murdoch Responses due by 8/27/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Howell, Jimmy) Modified on 8/9/2012 to enhance title. (rss, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 08/08/2012)
PACER 28 Filed: 8/8/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Counts II and IV by Juliette Murdoch re: 1 Complaint. (Howell, Jimmy) Modified on 8/9/2012 to enhance title & add link. (rss, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 08/08/2012)
PACER 27 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Laurin H Mills on behalf of Diane Rosenberg, Rosenberg & Associates, L.L.C. (Mills, Laurin) (Entered: 08/07/2012)
PACER 26 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Ian Stumpf on behalf of Juliette Murdoch (Stumpf, Ian) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
PACER 25 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Jimmy Ray Howell, Jr on behalf of JULIETTE MURDOCH (Howell, Jimmy) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
PACER 24 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: None
Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:12-cv-00036. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 07/27/2012)
PACER 23 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying in part the defendants' motions ( 9 , 14 ) to dismiss for improper venue and directing the Clerk to TRANSFER this case to the United States District Court for the District of Maryland. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 7/11/2012. (lcrwr1) (Entered: 07/11/2012)
PACER 22 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
REPLY to opposition to motion re 19 MOTION to Strike 1 Complaint 's Class Action Allegations filed by DIANE ROSENBERG, ROSENBERG & ASSOCIATES, LLC. (Ben'Ary, Megan) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
PACER 21 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
Memorandum in opposition to re 19 MOTION to Strike 1 Complaint 's Class Action Allegations filed by JULIETTE MURDOCH. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Howell, Jimmy) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
PACER 20 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by James Douglas Cuthbertson on behalf of All Defendants (Cuthbertson, James) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
PACER 19 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Strike 1 Complaint 's Class Action Allegations by DIANE ROSENBERG, ROSENBERG & ASSOCIATES, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ben'Ary, Megan) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
PACER 18 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None
Memorandum in opposition to re 17 MOTION Stay Class Certification Briefing Pending Discovery and in Support of Motion to Strike Class Action Allegations filed by DIANE ROSENBERG, ROSENBERG & ASSOCIATES, LLC. (Ben'Ary, Megan) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
PACER 17 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None
MOTION Stay Class Certification Briefing Pending Discovery by JULIETTE MURDOCH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Howell, Jimmy) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
PACER 16 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
REPLY to opposition to motion re 14 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by DIANE ROSENBERG. (Ben'Ary, Megan) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
PACER 15 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None
Memorandum in opposition to re 14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by JULIETTE MURDOCH. (Howell, Jimmy) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
PACER 14 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss by DIANE ROSENBERG (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ben'Ary, Megan) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
PACER 13 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
REPLY to opposition to motion re 9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by ROSENBERG & ASSOCIATES, LLC. (Ben'Ary, Megan) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
PACER 12 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None
ERRATA Correcting Defective Header in Dkt. # 10. by JULIETTE MURDOCH Notice of QC,. (Howell, Jimmy) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
PACER 11 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None
Memorandum in opposition to re 9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Rosenberg & Associates LLC [CORRECTED] filed by JULIETTE MURDOCH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Howell, Jimmy) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
PACER 10 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: None
Memorandum in opposition to re 9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by JULIETTE MURDOCH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Howell, Jimmy) (Entered: 03/01/2012)
PACER 9 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by ROSENBERG & ASSOCIATES, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ben'Ary, Megan) (Entered: 02/16/2012)
PACER 8 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ROSENBERG & ASSOCIATES, LLC (jeb, ) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
PACER 7 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by DIANE ROSENBERG, ROSENBERG & ASSOCIATES, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(jeb, ) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
PACER 6 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ROSENBERG & ASSOCIATES, LLC served on 1/12/2012, answer due 2/2/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Howell, Jimmy) (Entered: 01/27/2012)
PACER 5 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
ERRATA by JULIETTE MURDOCH 4 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by JULIETTE MURDOCH. (Howell, Jimmy) (Entered: 01/27/2012)
PACER 4 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
Summons Returned Unexecuted by JULIETTE MURDOCH as to ROSENBERG & ASSOCIATES, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Howell, Jimmy) (Entered: 01/27/2012)
PACER 3 Filed: 1/25/2012, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE by JULIETTE MURDOCH. DIANE ROSENBERG waiver sent on 1/10/2012, answer due 3/10/2012. (Howell, Jimmy) (Entered: 01/25/2012)
PACER 2 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None
ENTERED IN ERROR.....WAIVER OF SERVICE by JULIETTE MURDOCH. DIANE ROSENBERG waiver sent on 1/18/2012, answer due 3/18/2012. (Howell, Jimmy) Modified on 1/25/2012 (jf, ). (Entered: 01/24/2012)
PACER 1 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/29/2013
COMPLAINT against DIANE ROSENBERG, ROSENBERG & ASSOCIATES, LLC ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616045100) filed by JULIETTE MURDOCH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(dr) (Entered: 01/11/2012)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 15 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?