Birnbaum, et al v. G.D. Searle Company., et al
Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:90-cv-01715-WEB
docket://gov.uscourts.mdd.1-90-cv-01715 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Judges don't know as much about themselves as we do.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Harriet Birnbaum Helberg, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by J M Computer Services, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
H Robert Erwin, Jr. +1 410 385 6000 +1 410 385 2310 theelf@mindspring.com
No Logo Sandy Morris Helberg, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo G.d. Searle & Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Paul Farrell Strain +1 410 244 7400 +1 410 244 7742 pfstrain@venable.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WHITNEY & BOGRIS, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Janet K. Coleman +1 410 583 8000 +1 202 583 8031 jcoleman@whitneybogris.com
No Logo Searle Pharmaceuticals Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Paul Farrell Strain +1 410 244 7400 +1 410 244 7742 pfstrain@venable.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WHITNEY & BOGRIS, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Janet K. Coleman +1 410 583 8000 +1 202 583 8031 jcoleman@whitneybogris.com
Office Baltimore
Filed 6/26/1990
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 365 - Personal Injury: Prod. Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County 88888
Terminated 1/22/1992
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (25) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
Blank 19 Filed: 5/17/1993, Entered: 5/21/1993 USCA Mandate
JUDGMENT OF USCA (certified copy) Re: [17-1] appeal by Harriet Birnbaum Helberg, Sandy Morris Helberg "AFFIRMING" the Judgment of the District Court, copy of Opinion and Bill of Cost attached hereto, taxing cost in the amount of $232.00. (for Opinion see Civil Action #B-87-985) (c/s) (has, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 05/24/1993
Blank 18 Filed: 7/14/1992, Entered: 7/14/1992 Certificate of Clerk
Certificate of Clerk certifying record as complete for appeal purposes for [17-1] appeal (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 17 Filed: 4/23/1992, Entered: 4/27/1992 Notice of Appeal
Copy of NOTICE OF APPEAL by Sandy Morris Helberg, Harriet Birnbaum Helberg . Fee Status: (Filing fee paid) Appeal record due on 5/23/92 (Original filed in civil case B-87-985) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 16 Filed: 3/27/1992, Entered: 4/14/1992 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER dated March 26, 1992 denying [13-1] motion to Alter or Amend the Judgment. ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m 3/26/92 am) (For Original See Case No. B-87-985) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 15 Filed: 3/13/1992, Entered: 4/6/1992 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY by Harriet Birnbaum Helberg, Sandy Morris Helberg to Opposition of Defendants to [13-1] motion to Alter or Amend the Judgment and Attachments I, II and III. (c/s) (For Attachments I, II and III See Case No. B-87-985) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 14 Filed: 2/24/1992, Entered: 3/5/1992 Response in Opposition to Motion
MEMORANDUM by G.D. Searle Company, Searle Pharm. in opposition to [13-1] motion to Alter or Amend the Judgment with Appendix. (For Original See Case No. B-87-985) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 13 Filed: 2/5/1992, Entered: 2/14/1992, Terminated: 3/27/1992 Motion to Alter/Amend Judgment
MOTION with memorandum in support by Harriet Birnbaum Helberg, Sandy Morris Helberg to Alter or Amend the Judgment and Attachments. (For Copy of Memorandum See Lead Case No. B-87-3172) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 12 Filed: 1/22/1992, Entered: 1/25/1992 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) "DISMISSING" the Complaint of plaintiff(s) against defendants; and "DIRECTING" that the Clerk shall close this case. (c/d 1/22/92 mt) (microfilmed 1/24/92) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
Blank -- Filed: 1/22/1992, Entered: 1/31/1992 Terminated Case
Case closed (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
Blank -- Filed: 1/22/1992, Entered: 1/25/1992 Remark
Opinion (Black, C.J.) (c/d 1/22/92 mt) (For Original - See Lead Case No. B-87-3172) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
Blank -- Filed: 1/22/1992, Entered: 1/25/1992 Telephone Conference
Telephone conference held before Black, C.J. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
Blank -- Filed: 1/14/1992, Entered: 1/25/1992 Telephone Conference
Telephone conference held before Black, C.J. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 11 Filed: 1/13/1992, Entered: 1/22/1992 Motion to Compel
Local Rule 104.7 Certificate of Defendants of Attempted Resolution of Discovery Dispute, MOTION with memorandum in support by G.D. Searle Company, Searle Pharm. to Compel Disclosure of Inquiry Notice Facts , RESPONSE of Plaintiffs in Opposition to Motion of Defendants to Compel Production of Questionnaires and Exhibits, and REPLY of Defendants to Opposition of Plaintiffs to Motion of Defendants to Compel Production of Questionnaires. (c/s) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 10 Filed: 12/18/1991, Entered: 1/7/1992 Response in Opposition to Motion
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by Harriet Birnbaum Helberg in opposition to [4-1] motion for Rule 12(d) Preliminary Hearing on Searle's Defense of Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 9 Filed: 11/19/1991, Entered: 12/16/1991 Response in Support of Motion
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by G.D. Searle Company, Searle Pharm. [4-1] on Personal Jurisdiction (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 8 Filed: 9/17/1991, Entered: 9/26/1991 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY by G.D. Searle Company, Searle Pharm. to opposition to [4-1] motion for Rule 12(d) Preliminary Hearing on Searle's Defense of Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Exhibit A. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 7 Filed: 8/16/1991, Entered: 8/22/1991 Motion to Stay
CROSS MOTION with memorandum in support to Stay Discovery by Sandy Morris Helberg, Harriet Birnbaum Helberg (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 7 Filed: 8/16/1991, Entered: 8/22/1991 Response in Opposition
RESPONSE by Sandy Morris Helberg, Harriet Birnbaum Helberg in opposition to [5-1] motion to Compel Discovery, and Memorandum. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 6 Filed: 7/26/1991, Entered: 8/6/1991 Response in Opposition to Motion
MEMORANDUM by Sandy Morris Helberg, Harriet Birnbaum Helberg in opposition to [4-1] motion for Rule 12(d) Preliminary Hearing on Searle's Defense of Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 5 Filed: 7/17/1991, Entered: 7/25/1991 Motion to Compel
MOTION with memorandum in support by G.D. Searle Company to Compel Discovery, and Local Rule 104.7 Certificate (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 4 Filed: 4/12/1991, Entered: 4/16/1991 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION with memorandum in support by G.D. Searle Company, Searle Pharm. for Rule 12(d) Preliminary Hearing on Searle's Defense of Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Appendix of Exhibits 1 through 5 (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 3 Filed: 9/13/1990, Entered: 2/2/1991 Answer to Complaint
ANSWER to Complaint by G.D. Searle Company, Searle Pharm. (Attorney Paul F. Strain, Susan K. Gauvey, Janet K. Coleman), (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 2 Filed: 6/28/1990, Entered: 1/31/1991 Summons Issued
SUMMONS(ES) issued (60 days) for G.D. Searle Company., Searle Pharm. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 1 Filed: 6/26/1990, Entered: 1/31/1991 Jury Demand
DEMAND for jury trial by Harriet Birnbaum, Sandy Morris Helberg. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
Blank 1 Filed: 6/26/1990, Entered: 1/31/1991 Complaint
COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 120 RECEIPT # 74527 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 297 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?