USA v. ABUASSAB
New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:02-cr-00560-JAP
docket://gov.uscourts.njd.2-02-cr-00560 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
The right information can save you thousands of dollars.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
JILL S. ANDERSEN +1 973 645 2700 jill.andersen@usdoj.gov
JAMES F. MCMAHON +1 973 645 2700 james.mcmahon@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo KHADER ABUASSAB, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LORRAINE S. GAULI-RUFO +1 973 645 6347 lorraine_gauli-rufo@fd.org
Office Newark
Filed 7/22/2002
County Passaic
Terminated 2/4/2004
Reopened
Magistrate Case
201-mj-03209
Citation
Offense Level
COMPLAINT MAIL FRAUD. 18:1341 [ 2:01-m -3209 ]
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1341.F
Offense Level 4
181341 and 2 FRAUDS AND SWINDLES(DOF 2/00-5/01)
Def Custody Status Released
Flags CLOSED, PRIOR
  Entries (26) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
Blank 23 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: 3/25/2004 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to KHADER ABUASSAB for a two week stayn in defendant's surrender date. Ordered that surrender date scheduled for 3/17/04 is extended to 3/31/04. . Signed by Judge Joseph A. Greenaway, Jr. on 3/17/04. (jn, )
PACER 22 Filed: 3/10/2004, Entered: 3/10/2004 Amended JudgmentCourt Filing
AMENDED JUDGMENT as to KHADER ABUASSAB (1), Count(s) 1 of Information, Impr. 13mos. Supervised Release 2yrs. Restitution $619,851.90 Spec. Assessment $100 . Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 3/8/04. (it, )
PACER 21 Filed: 2/5/2004, Entered: 2/10/2004 JudgmentCourt Filing
JUDGMENT as to KHADER ABUASSAB (1), Count(s) 1 of Information, Impr. 13mos. Supervised Release 2yrs. Deft. excused from mandatory drug testing, etc. Spec. conditions: 1. deft. provide the Prob. Office w/full disclosure of his financial records, etc. 2. deft. refrain from all gambling activities, etc. 3. deft. prohibited from incurring any new credit charges, etc. Total Restitution $619,851.90, etc. Spec. Assessment $100 due immediately. Court recommends deft. be designated to a facility nearest to his family & a facility that provides for full medical treatment for his needs and conditions. Voluntary surrender on 3/17/04. . Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 2/4/04. (it, )
PACER 20 Filed: 2/4/2004, Entered: 2/10/2004 SentencingCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joel A. Pisano :Hrg. on deft's application for downward departure, Ordered application granted. Court indicated that a review of custody time shall be investigated and reported accurately for the correct time of custody credit as to the deft. Sentencing held on 2/4/2004 for KHADER ABUASSAB (1), Count(s) 1 of Information, Impr. 13mos. Supervised Release 2yrs. Restitution $619,851.90 Spec. Assessment $100. (Court Reporter JC.) (it, )
PACER 19 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: 1/14/2004 Motion HearingCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joel A. Pisano :Motion Hearing as to KHADER ABUASSAB held on 1/14/2004 re [18] First MOTION In Opposition to Defendant's Supplemental Brief In Support of Motion for Downward Departure and Bail Modification to Permit Travel to Mecca filed by USA -Ordered application denied in part as to defendant's request to travel to Mecca. Ordered sentence date set for 3-10-04 at 11:00 a.m.(Court Reporter Caruso.)(tt, )
PACER 18 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/13/2004, Terminated: 1/26/2004 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
First MOTION In Opposition to Defendant's Supplemental Brief In Support of Motion for Downward Departure and Bail Modification to Permit Travel to Mecca by USA as to KHADER ABUASSAB. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit # (2))(MAHONCHAK, JILL)
Blank 17 Filed: 10/3/2003, Entered: 10/8/2003 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minutes of 10/3/03 before Judge Joel A. Pisano as to KHADER ABUASSAB, Status conference held as to the deft's health condition for sentencing. Ordered sentence adjourned until full medical testimony is given by a doctor. ) (it)
Blank 16 Filed: 4/3/2003, Entered: 4/10/2003 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minutes of 4/3/03 before Judge Joel A. Pisano as to KHADER ABUASSAB, Status conference off the record held. Sentence adjourned until an update report regarding the medical condition of the deft. has been provided by counsel. ) (it)
Blank 15 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: 1/28/2003 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minutes of 1/22/03 before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk as to KHADER ABUASSAB, Hearing on deft's application to modify bail , Ordered application granted. Ordered Modifying Conditions of Bail allowing deft to travel, travel to be completed within 7 days, travel plans, flight information and lodging to be filed with PTS and the surrender of passport upon return OTBS. (Court Reporter/ESR: Tape F3-03) (it)
Blank 14 Filed: 7/22/2002, Entered: 7/25/2002 Plea Agreement
Plea Agreement as to KHADER ABUASSAB (tl)
Blank 13 Filed: 7/22/2002, Entered: 7/25/2002 Plea Application of Guilty
Application for permission to enter Plea of guilty by KHADER ABUASSAB (tl)
Blank 12 Filed: 7/22/2002, Entered: 7/25/2002 Waiver of Indictment
WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by KHADER ABUASSAB (tl)
Blank 11 Filed: 7/22/2002, Entered: 7/25/2002 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minutes of 7/22/02 before Judge Joel A. Pisano as to KHADER ABUASSAB, Initial Appearance held. (Defendant informed of rights.) ,Dft plead guitly to a 1 cnt info setting Sentencing for 9:30 11/7/02 for KHADER ABUASSAB Ordered bail con't.(Court reporter J.Caruso ) (tl) Modified on 07/26/2002
Blank 10 Filed: 7/22/2002, Entered: 7/25/2002 Information - Felony
INFORMATION as to KHADER ABUASSAB (1) count(s) 1 (tl)
Blank -- Filed: 7/22/2002, Entered: 7/25/2002 Plea Entered
PLEA of Guilty: KHADER ABUASSAB (1) count(s) 1 ; Court accepts plea. (tl)
Blank 9 Filed: 3/8/2002, Entered: 3/11/2002 Description not availableCourt Filing
ORDER as to KHADER ABUASSAB, to Continue in Interests of Justice Time Excluded from 2/27/02 to 3/29/02 ( Signed by Mag. Judge Stanley R. Chesler ) [ 2:01-m -3209 ] (me)
Blank 8 Filed: 2/4/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 Description not availableCourt Filing
BAIL MODIFICATION CONSENT ORDER as to KHADER ABUASSAB ( Signed by Mag. Judge Stanley R. Chesler ) [ 2:01-m -3209 ] (me)
Blank -- Filed: 2/4/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 Bond
BAIL/BOND executed by KHADER ABUASSAB in Amount $ 250,000 posting property Receipt # none [ 2:01-m -3209 ] (me)
Blank 7 Filed: 1/28/2002, Entered: 1/29/2002 Description not availableCourt Filing
ORDER as to KHADER ABUASSAB, to Continue in Interests of Justice Time Excluded from 1/28/02 to 2/27/02 ( Signed by Mag. Judge Stanley R. Chesler ) [ 2:01-m -3209 ] (me)
Blank 6 Filed: 12/18/2001, Entered: 12/20/2001 Description not availableCourt Filing
ORDER as to KHADER ABUASSAB, to Continue in Interests of Justice Time Excluded from 12/28/01 to 1/28/02 ( Signed by Mag. Judge Stanley R. Chesler ) [ 2:01-m -3209 ] (me)
Blank 5 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 12/10/2001 Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing
Waiver of Preliminary Hearing by KHADER ABUASSAB [ 2:01-m -3209 ] (me)
Blank 4 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 12/10/2001 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to KHADER ABUASSAB Bond reset to bail not meet, deft. remanded. for KHADER ABUASSAB. ( Signed by Mag. Judge Stanley R. Chesler ) [ 2:01-m -3209 ] (me)
Blank 3 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 12/10/2001 Financial Affidavit - CJA23
CJA 23 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by KHADER ABUASSAB [ 2:01-m -3209 ] (me)
Blank 2 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 12/10/2001 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minutes of 11/28/01 before Mag. Judge Stanley R. Chesler as to KHADER ABUASSAB, Initial Appearance held. (Defendant informed of rights.) , Bond set to $250,000. posting property. for KHADER ABUASSAB. , Appointing Federal Public Defender (Court Reporter/ESR: court tape) [ 2:01-m -3209 ] (me)
Blank 1 Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: 12/10/2001 Complaint
COMPLAINT as to KHADER ABUASSAB [ 2:01-m -3209 ] (me)
Blank -- Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: 12/10/2001 Warrant Issued
ARREST WARRANT issued as to KHADER ABUASSAB [ 2:01-m -3209 ] (me)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 329 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?