DIRECTV, INC. v. BRISBON, et al
New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:03-cv-02214-DMC-MF
docket://gov.uscourts.njd.2-03-cv-02214-DMC-MF (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
This docket can only tell you so much. Get the rest.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
DirecTV Group, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Saiber Schlesinger Satz & Goldstein, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
MARC E. WOLIN +1 973 622 3333 mew@saiber.com
v.
No Logo GEORGE HERMANN, JR., Defendant
Office Newark
Filed 5/13/2003
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 18 U.S.C. § 2511 Wiretapping
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Judgment on Default
County Union
Terminated 10/25/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BN, CLOSED, SCHEDO
  Entries (49) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
Blank -- Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: 10/25/2005 Terminated Case
***Civil Case Terminated. (DD, )
PDF 41 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: 10/25/2005 Default JudgmentCourt Filing
DEFAULT JUDGMENT in the sum of $11,803.43 in favor of pltf., DIRECTTV, INC. against deft., GEORGE HERMANN, JR.. Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 10/24/05. (DD, )
PDF 40 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: 10/25/2005 OpinionCourt Filing
OPINION . Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 10/24/05. (DD, )
PACER 39 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005, Terminated: 10/25/2005 Motion for Default Judgment
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant George Hermann, Jr. Only by DIRECTV, INC.. Responses due by 10/31/2005 (Attachments: # (1) Brief DIRECTV, Inc.'s Memorandum of Law in Support of Its Motion for Entry of Default Judgment Against Defendant George Hermann, Jr. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(b)(2)# (2) Exhibit A to Brief# (3) Certification of Marc E. Wolin, Esq. In Support of DIRECTV, Inc.'s Motion for Default Judgment Against George Hermann, Jr. w/ Exh. A & B# (4) Text of Proposed Order Final Judgment by Default Against Defendant George Hermann, Jr. Only# (5) Certificate of Service by Paris Daskalakis, Esq.)(WOLIN, MARC)
Blank -- Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/14/2005 Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Setting motion hearing as to [39] MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant George Hermann, Jr. Only. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2005 10:00 AM before Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh. Please be advised that this motion will be decided on the papers unless otherwise notified by the Court.(cs, )
Blank -- Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: 5/20/2005 Telephone Conference
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark Falk: Telephone Conference held on 5/16/2005. (mm, )
PDF 38 Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: 2/24/2005 Notice (Other)
NOTICE by DIRECTV, INC. Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendants Calvin Brisbon, and Jose Reynoso Only (WOLIN, MARC)
PDF 37 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/14/2005 OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION & ORDER of dismissal w/prejudice as to deft Joe Vallillo ONLY. Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 1/14/05. (sr, )
PDF 36 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/14/2005 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER for PERMANENT INJUNCTION as to deft Joe Vallillo ONLY. Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 1/14/05. (sr, )
PDF 35 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: 11/10/2004 Order on Motion to QuashCourt Filing
ORDER denying [29] Motion to Quash . Signed by Judge Mark Falk on 11/8/04. (dc, )
PDF 34 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: 11/4/2004 Motion HearingCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark Falk: Motion Hearing held on 11/1/2004 re [29] MOTION to Quash Nonparty Lenore Vallillo's Subpoena Duces Tecum and Ad Testificandum filed by JOE VALLILLO. (Tape #F04#61,62,63.) (mm-sl, )
PACER 33 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: 10/12/2004 Brief in Opposition to Motion
BRIEF in Opposition re [29] MOTION to Quash Nonparty Lenore Vallillo's Subpoena Duces Tecum and Ad Testificandum filed by DIRECTV, INC.. (Attachments: # (1) Certification of Marc E. Wolin)(WOLIN, MARC)
PDF 32 Filed: 10/7/2004, Entered: 10/7/2004 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER that there shall be oral argument on 10/25/04 at 11:00 a.m. before Mag. Falk. . Signed by Judge Mark Falk on 10/6/04. (jd, )
Blank -- Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: 9/28/2004 Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Set Deadline as to [29] MOTION to Quash Nonparty Lenore Vallillo's Subpoena Duces Tecum and Ad Testificandum. Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2004 before Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh. (PLEASE BE ADVISED THAT THIS MOTION WILL BE DECIDED ON THE PAPERS UNLESS OTHERWISE NOTIFIED BY THE COURT) (sr, )
PDF 31 Filed: 8/10/2004, Entered: 8/11/2004 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL w/prejudice as to deft., ROBERT AGOSTA, only.. Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 8/10/04. (DD, )
PDF 30 Filed: 8/10/2004, Entered: 8/11/2004 Permanent InjunctionCourt Filing
PERMANENT INJUNCTION as to deft., ROBERT AGOSTA.. Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 8/10/04. (DD, )
PDF 29 Filed: 7/2/2004, Entered: 7/2/2004, Terminated: 11/8/2004 Motion to Quash
MOTION to Quash Nonparty Lenore Vallillo's Subpoena Duces Tecum and Ad Testificandum by JOE VALLILLO. (SIMONE, MICHAEL)
PDF 28 Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER that this action be and is hereby dismissed as to Defendant Robert Agosta Only. the parties have resolved their differences and reached a settlement.. Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 05/21/04. (JB, )
Blank -- Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: 5/11/2004 Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Set/Reset Deadlines as to [27] MOTION to Dismiss Partial Dismissal of Claims. Motion Hearing set for 6/14/2004 10:00 AM before Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh. PLEASE BE ADVISED THAT THIS MOTION WILL BE DECIDED ON THE PAPERS UNLESS OTHERWISE NOTIFIED BY THE COURT (mn, )
PDF 27 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004, Terminated: 8/10/2004 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss Partial Dismissal of Claims by ROBERT AGOSTA. Responses due by 6/1/2004 (LEVINE, RONALD)
PDF 26 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004 Certification
Certification on behalf of JOE VALLILLO Re [18] Order,,,. (SIMONE, MICHAEL)
PDF 25 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION & ORDER dismissing action as to deft Donato Metta only; w/prejudice. Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 1/19/04. (sr, )
PDF 24 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/21/2004 Permanent InjunctionCourt Filing
PERMANENT INJUNCTION as to deft. Donato Metta. Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 1/15/04. (bl, )
Blank 23 Filed: 12/12/2003, Entered: 12/19/2003 Answer to Complaint
ANSWER to Complaint by ROBERT AGOSTA; w/cert of service (sr)
Blank 22 Filed: 12/2/2003, Entered: 12/9/2003 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER, dismissing action as to dft, DONATO METTA w/out prejudice & w/out costs. ( signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh ) (NM) (DS)
Blank -- Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 11/18/2003 Clerk's Entry of Default
DEFAULT ENTERED as to GEORGE HERMANN JR. granting [20-1] default requested for failure to plead. (DS)
Blank 21 Filed: 11/13/2003, Entered: 11/18/2003 Certification
CERTIFICATION of HOPE M. LLOYD on behalf of DIRECTV, INC. in support of [20-1] default requested (DS)
Blank 20 Filed: 11/13/2003, Entered: 11/18/2003 Request for Default
REQUEST BY DIRECTV, INC. FOR Entry of DEFAULT AGAINST GEORGE HERMANN JR. (DS)
Blank 19 Filed: 10/3/2003, Entered: 10/8/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 3/19/04; Settlement conference 10:30 12/10/03; and setting deadlines for certain documents. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk )(NM) (DS)
Blank -- Filed: 10/3/2003, Entered: 10/8/2003 Scheduling Conference
Scheduling conference held before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 9/17/03. (DS)
Blank 17 Filed: 10/1/2003, Entered: 10/2/2003 Certificate of Service
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of dft's RULE 26 (a) disclosure. (DS)
Blank 18 Filed: 9/30/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER setting settlement conference for 9:30 11/20/03; consolidating the following cases for purposes of settlement only: 03-1513 (FSH), 03-1948(JAG), 03-1949(WGB), 03-2175(JLL), 03-2214(DMC), 03-2215(DMC), 03-2381(JCL), 03-2382(WHW), 03-2383(JAP), 03-2385(HAA), 03-2412(WGB), 03-2414(KSH), 03-2413(WJM), 03-2416(KSH), 03-2417(KSH), 03-2418(WHW), 03-2419(WGB), 03-2420(DMC), 03-2421(JWB), 03-2422(JWB), 03-2423(FSH), 03-2424(WGB), & 03-2492(WJM). (signed by Mag. Judge Ronald J. Hedges )(NM) (DS)
Blank 15 Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: 9/26/2003 Certificate of Service
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: Rule 26(a) disclosure. (DS)
Blank 16 Filed: 9/19/2003, Entered: 9/30/2003 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER, dismissing action w/out costs & w/prejudice as to dft, JACK FUCILI only. ( signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh ) (NM) (DS)
Blank 14 Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: 8/18/2003 Answer to Complaint
ANSWER to Complaint by JOE VALLILLO; jury demand (ar)
Blank 13 Filed: 8/6/2003, Entered: 8/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER for permanent injunction against deft JACK FUCILI, who is permanently enjoined from received or assisting others in receiving DIRECTV's satellite transmissions etc. ( signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh ) (NM) (ar)
Blank 12 Filed: 7/18/2003, Entered: 7/23/2003 Substitution of Attorney
Substitute attorney for JACK FUCILI ; Terminated attorney SCOTT M. WILHELM for JACK FUCILI ; Added, ERNEST F. DUH (sr)
Blank 11 Filed: 7/17/2003, Entered: 7/22/2003 Summons Returned Executed
RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to dft., ROBERT AGOSTA 7/1/03 Answer due on 7/21/03 for ROBERT AGOSTA (cs)
Blank 10 Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: 7/16/2003 OrderCourt Filing
LETTER ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 16, setting scheduling conference for 8/18/03 at 11:00 A.M. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk ) (NM) (dc)
Blank 9 Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: 7/14/2003 Answer to Complaint
ANSWER to Complaint by dft DONATO METTA w/certsvc. (ak)
Blank 7 Filed: 7/1/2003, Entered: 7/2/2003 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
STIPULATION and CONSENT ORDER, extending time , reset answer due for 7/18/03 for JOE VALLILLO ( signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh ) (NM) (ar)
Blank 8 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: 7/7/2003 Summons Returned Executed
RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to GEORGE HERMANN JR. 6/17/03 Answer due on 7/7/03 for GEORGE HERMANN JR. (DD)
Blank 6 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER, extending time , reset answer due for 7/18/03 for JACK FUCILI ( signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh ) (NM) (ar)
Blank 5 Filed: 6/16/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003 Summons Returned Executed
RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to JOE VALLILLO 6/2/03 Answer due on 6/23/03 for JOE VALLILLO (ar)
Blank 4 Filed: 6/11/2003, Entered: 6/12/2003 Summons Returned Executed
RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to DONATO METTA 6/5/03 Answer due on 6/25/03 for DONATO METTA (ar)
Blank 3 Filed: 6/6/2003, Entered: 6/11/2003 Summons Returned Executed
RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to JACK FUCILI 5/29/03 Answer due on 6/18/03 for JACK FUCILI (ar)
Blank 2 Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: 5/15/2003 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. ( NEWARK - Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh - Magistrate Judge Mark Falk) (NM) (dc)
Blank -- Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: 5/15/2003 Summons Issued
SUMMONS(ES) issued for CALVIN BRISBON, ROBERT AGOSTA, JACK FUCILI, GEORGE HERMANN JR., DONATO METTA, JOSE REYNOSO, JOE VALLILLO ( 20 Days) (Mailed to Counsel) (dc)
Blank 1 Filed: 5/13/2003, Entered: 5/15/2003 Complaint
COMPLAINT filed FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 315641 (dc)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 179 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?