Rivera v. Smith et al
New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-03246-BSJ
docket://gov.uscourts.nysd.1-07-cv-03246 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
The right information can save you thousands of dollars.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Roberto Rivera, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Jess A. Bunshaft, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Stacy Blair Fischgrund +1 212 490 3000 +1 212 490 3038 s_fischgrund@hotmail.com
Rick Roer +1 212 490 3000

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Nancy V. Wright +1 212 490 3000 +1 212 490 3038 wrightn@wemed.com
No Logo Ruth E. Smith, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Stacy Blair Fischgrund +1 212 490 3000 +1 212 490 3038 s_fischgrund@hotmail.com
Rick Roer +1 212 490 3000

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Nancy V. Wright +1 212 490 3000 +1 212 490 3038 wrightn@wemed.com
No Logo Saint Vincent's Hospital, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Stacy Blair Fischgrund +1 212 490 3000 +1 212 490 3038 s_fischgrund@hotmail.com
Rick Roer +1 212 490 3000

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Nancy V. Wright +1 212 490 3000 +1 212 490 3038 wrightn@wemed.com
Office Foley Square
Filed 4/23/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 445 - American with Disabilities - Employment
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Federal Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Westchester
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag PRO-SE
  Entries (74) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PDF 60 Filed: 9/17/2008, Entered: 9/18/2008 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendants' letter dated September 17, 2008 requesting an adjournment of the hearing date for Plaintiff's preliminary injunction from September 19, 2008 to October 6, 2008. Defendants' request is hereby granted. The hearing is now set for October 6, 2008 at 2 o'clock p.m. (Signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones on 9/17/2008) (jpo)
Blank -- Filed: 9/17/2008, Entered: 9/18/2008 Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2008 at 02:00 PM before Judge Barbara S. Jones. (jpo)
PDF 58 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: 9/12/2008 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendants' letter dated September 10, 2008 requesting an adjournment of the deadline for submission of Defendants' reply brief from September 12, 2008 to October 6, 2008. Defendant's request is hereby GRANTED; Defendants' reply will now be due on or before October 6, 2008. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones on 9/11/08) (js)
PDF 57 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: 9/10/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Barbara S. Jones from Nancy Wright dated 9/8/08 re: Request that the return date be adjourned to 9/19/08 at 10:00 am. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to [55] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. ( Motion Hearing set for 9/19/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Barbara S. Jones.) (Signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones on 9/9/08) (cd)
Blank 59 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: 9/18/2008 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [53] MOTION for Summary Judgment, MOTION for Sanctions. Document filed by Roberto Rivera. (jmi)
PDF 56 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Barbara S. Jones from Roberto Rivera dated 8/27/08 re: Counsel requests that the court accept the proposed deadlines as follows: New deadline for submission of opposition to summary judgment motion papers: Friday, September 5, 2008; New deadline for submissions of reply to opposition to summary judgment motion papers: Friday, September 19, 2008. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted., Set Deadlines/Hearing as to [53] MOTION for Summary Judgment. MOTION for Sanctions. :( Responses due by 9/5/2008, Replies due by 9/19/2008.) (Signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones on 9/2/08) (mme)
Blank 55 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
MOTION for issuance of a preliminary injunction against the medical staff and medical board of St. Vincent's Catholic Medical Centers. Document filed by Roberto Rivera.(dle)
Blank 54 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [53] MOTION for Summary Judgment. MOTION for Sanctions. Document filed by Ruth E. Smith, Jess A. Bunshaft, Saint Vincent's Hospital. (djc)
Blank 53 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
MOTION for Summary Judgment., MOTION for Sanctions. Attacherd is Local Rule 56.1 Statement Document filed by Ruth E. Smith, Jess A. Bunshaft, Saint Vincent's Hospital.(djc)
Blank 52 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 Notice (Other)
NOTICE of Local Civil Rule 56.2 Notice to Pro Se Litigant who Opposes a Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Ruth E. Smith, Jess A. Bunshaft, Saint Vincent's Hospital. (djc)
PDF 50 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck from Nancy V. Wright dated 7/15/2008 re: Requesting that plaintiffs motion for reconsideration be denied in its entirety. ENDORSEMENT: Dr. Rivera's motion for reconsideration is DENIED. The Court adheres to its original ruling and citation for contempt. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck on 7/16/2008) Copies Mailed By Chambers.(jpo)
Blank -- Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge
CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to I have closed the above reference for magistrate judge statistical purposes. Reason: Discovery Closed (SJ Motion due 8/8/08) (ae)
Blank 51 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008 LetterCourt Filing
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck from Nancy V.Wright dated 7/9/08 re: counsel renews defendants' oral request made during one of their status conferences, for an extension of time to move for summary judgment. Document filed by Ruth E. Smith, Jess A. Bunshaft, Saint Vincent's Hospital.(djc)
PDF 49 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck from Nancy V. Wright dated 7/9/2008 re: We therefore propose the following briefing schedule: Defendants' summary judgment motion is to be served and filed by August 8, 2008. Plaintiffs opposition papers are to be served and filed by August 29, 2008. Defendants' reply papers are to be served and filed by September 12, 2008. ENDORSEMENT: Approved. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck on 7/14/2008) Copies Mailed By Chambers.(jpo)
Blank 48 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
MOTION for reconsideration of Magistrate Judge's rulings on certain discovery issues and reconsideration of citation for contempt against plaintiff. Document filed by Roberto Rivera.(dle)
Blank 47 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 6/26/08 before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck. (ama)
PDF 46 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck from Nancy V. Wright dated 6/27/08 Counsel requests that plaintiff be directed to turn over the relevant communication forthwith. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff was already so ordered and cited for contempt. Make your motion along with Sj motion unless he first complies. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck on 6/30/08) Copies Mailed By Chambers.(mme)
PDF 45 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER: For the reasons set forth within it is clear from the record that Judge peck thoroughly and thoughtfully analyzed Plaintiff's discovery request and articulated his reasons for denying those request. Plaintiff has raised essentially the same arguments before this Court as he did before Judge Peck and has not proffered any additional evidence or grounds which demonstrate that Judge Peck's decision was erroneous or contrary to Law. Accordingly, the Magistrate Judge Peck's May 2, 2008 Order is affirmed. (Signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones on 6/27/2008) (jfe)
Blank -- Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008 Telephone Conference
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck: Telephone discovery Conference held on 6/26/2008. (cd)
Blank 44 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 6/03/08 before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck. (ama)
Blank 43 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 6/03/08 before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck. (ama)
Blank -- Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008 Status Conference
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck: Status Conference held on 6/3/2008. Parties to contact if disputes or re settlement. (jpo)
Blank 42 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: 5/27/2008 Affirmation in Support of Motion
REPLY AFFIRMATION of Roberto Rivera in further Support re: [39] MOTION for Reconsideration. Document filed by Roberto Rivera. (dle)
Blank 41 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 5/02/2008 before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck. (ama)
Blank 40 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 5/02/2008 before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck. (ama)
Blank 39 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008 Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
MOTION for Reconsideration of Magistrate Judge's Ruling on Certain discovery Requests Made by plaintiff. Attached is Affirmation in Support. Document filed by Roberto Rivera.(djc)
Blank -- Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008 Status Conference
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck: Status Conference held on 5/2/2008 ( Status Conference set for 6/3/2008 at 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck.)AJP denies pltf's request for access to patient medical files because of HIPAA privacy issues and for the other reasons stated on the record. Status conference 6/3 at 3:30pm. (jw)
Blank 38 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 4/8/08 before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck. (jw)
PDF 37 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck from Nancy V. Wright dated 4/21/2008 re: Requesting that plaintiffs request for patient chats be denied in its entirety. ENDORSEMENT: The Court is inclined to deny Dr. Rivera's request, but to give him the benefit of the doubt, he is to identify to defense counsel the 2 patient names, and defense counsel is to bring those charts to the next court conf. for the Court's in camera review. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck on 4/14/2008) Copies Mailed By Chambers.(jpo)
Blank 36 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 3/27/2008 before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck. (ama)
PDF 34 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: 4/10/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck from Roberto Rivera dated 4/9/08 re: Plaintiff wishes to make an expedited discovery request for three documents that are needed and that are in the custody, control, and possession of the defendants, in particular, St. Vincent's Catholic Medical Centers. ENDORSEMENT: Defendant is to produce the 2 patient charts on receipt of their identification by Dr. Rivera (and the third chart if defendant is able to identify the patient), and produce the charts in redacted form as follows: only produce any statements from Dr. Rivera about Ms. Dirks contained in the charts, redacting all other information including the patient's name, any medical information about the patient (except as contained in Dr. Rivera's complaints about Ms. Dirks). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck on 4/10/08) (djc) Modified on 4/10/2008 (djc).
Blank 35 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008 LetterCourt Filing
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck from Roberto Rivera dated 4/6/08 re: discovery status conference. Document filed by Roberto Rivera.(dle)
Blank -- Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008 Memorandum to the Docket Clerk
MEMORANDUM TO THE DOCKET CLERK: discovery conf. held via telephone on 4/8/08. discovery dispute resolved. (djc)
Blank 33 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 3/05/2008 before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck. (ama)
Blank -- Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: 4/2/2008 Status Conference
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck: Status Conference held on 3/27/2008. Pltf. expert report due 4/15, def. 5/15. Next Status Conf. before Judge Peck scheduled for 5/2 at 9:30 a.m. (pl)
Blank 32 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 3/5/2008 before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck. (jp)
PDF 31 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: 3/10/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck from Nancy V. Wright dated 3/6/2008 re: Writing about an issue that arose with plaintiff immediately after our Rule 16 Pre-Trial conference. ENDORSEMENT: Dr. Rivera and defense counsel are to try to agree on the dates for depositions, or present any disputes as to deposition scheduling to the Court. No party shall schedule a deposition without first conferring with the opposing party as to the date. If the parties do not cooperate the Court will issue monetary and/or other sanction on any party and/or counsel. Try to get along- things go more smoothly that way. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck on 3/7/2008) Copies Mailed By Chambers.(jpo)
PDF 30 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008 OrderCourt Filing
RULE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures due by 3/12/2008. A Status Conference is set for 3/27/2008 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck. All Fact and Expert Discovery due by 7/3/2008. Summary Judgment Motions due by 7/25/2008. A Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/25/2008. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck on 3/5/08) Copies Faxed by Chambers.(db)
Blank -- Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Pretrial Conference - Initial
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/5/2008, Status Conference held on 3/5/2008. ( Discovery cutoff due by 7/3/2008 (mandatory discovery due 3/12/08), SJ notice 7/8/08, SJ Motions or PTO due by 7/25/2008, Status Conference set for 3/27/2008 at 09:30 AM before Judge Andrew J. Peck.). (ja)
PDF 29 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008 Order for Initial Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
ORDER SCHEDULING AND INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby ordered that a conference is scheduled for Wednesday, March 5, 2008 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck. Counsel are advised that my Chambers (Room 1370, 500 Pearl Street) are to be provided with courtesy copy of all papers hereafter filed with the Court. The parties are to follow the "Individual Practices of Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck", a copy of which is attached. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck on 2/26/2008) Copies Faxed By Chambers.(jpo)
Blank -- Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008 Memorandum to the Docket Clerk
MEMORANDUM TO THE DOCKET CLERK: Please reopen the GPT referral to me on this case. The referral was closed on 8/21/07 when returned to Judge Jones because of a pending motion to dismiss. Judge Jones decided that motion by Order of 1/24/08 (Dkt. No. 25) and in that Order re-referred the parties to me for general pretrial purposes. (ae)
PDF 28 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008 Answer to Amended Complaint
ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by Ruth E. Smith, Jess A. Bunshaft, Saint Vincent's Hospital. Related document: [17] Amended Complaint, filed by Roberto Rivera.(Wright, Nancy)
Blank 27 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: 1/28/2008 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER: that the time for the defendant to answer plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint is extended to 2/18/08. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. (Signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones on 1/24/08) Copies faxed by chambers. (dle) Modified on 1/28/2008 (dle).
PDF 26 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/25/2008 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nancy V. Wright on behalf of Ruth E. Smith, Jess A. Bunshaft, Saint Vincent's Hospital (Wright, Nancy)
PDF 25 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: 1/24/2008 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
ORDER granting in part and denying in part [15] Motion to Dismiss. The motion by Defendants for dismissal for failure to state a claim is GRANTED for Counts II, III, IV, and V. The motion by Defendants for failure to state a claim is DENIED for Counts I, II, VI, and VII. The parties are remainded that this case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Peck for general pre-trial purposes. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones on 1/17/08) (jco)
Blank 24 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007 Reply Affirmation in Support
REPLY AFFIRMATION in Further Support re: [15] MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Ruth E. Smith, Jess A. Bunshaft, Saint Vincent's Hospital. (pl)
Blank 23 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007 Motion for Reconsideration
MOTION for Reconsideration of Moton to compel Disclosure (Expedited Disclosure). Attached is Affirmation in support. Document filed by Roberto Rivera.(djc)
Blank 22 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007 Affirmation in Opposition to Motion
AFFIRMATION of Roberto Rivera in Opposition re: [15] MOTION to Dismiss. (djc)
Blank 21 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
ORDER denying [19] Motion to Compel; denying [20] Motion to Compel. However, as this Court has stayed discovery, pending resolution of the Defendants' motion to dismiss, Plaintiff's motion is denied and Defendants need not respond. (Signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones on 9/4/07) (tro) Copies Mailed By Chambers.
Blank 20 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 Motion to Compel
MOTION to Compel Disclosure of documents Antecedent to FRCP 16(b) Conference. Document filed by Roberto Rivera. Attached is Affidavit in Support.(djc)
Blank 19 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007, Terminated: 9/10/2007 Motion to Compel
MOTION to Compel disclosure of Documents Antecedent to FRCP Rule 16(b) Conference. Document filed by Roberto Rivera.(djc)
PDF 18 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Roberto Rivera dated 8/22/07 re: plaintiff requests an extension of time to respond to defendants motion to dismiss until 9/14/07; and defendants reply extended to 9/28/07. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to [15] MOTION to Dismiss: Responses due by 9/14/2007; Replies due by 9/28/2007. (Signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones on 8/27/07) (db)
Blank 17 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: 8/27/2007 Amended Complaint
Second AMENDED COMPLAINT amending [2] Amended Complaint against Ruth E. Smith, Jess A. Bunshaft, Saint Vincent's Hospital.Document filed by Roberto Rivera. Related document: [2] Amended Complaint filed by Roberto Rivera.(dle) Modified on 8/27/2007 (Lewis, Diahan).
PDF 16 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/22/2007 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER: the Court grants defendants' request to stay discovery pending the resolution of their motion to dismiss. Additionally, the Clerk of the Court is directed to close the referral to Magistrate Judge Peck. (Signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones on 8/21/07) (kco)
Blank -- Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/22/2007 Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge
CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck. (kco)
Blank 15 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: 8/20/2007, Terminated: 1/24/2008 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION for an order pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the F.R.C.P. to Dismiss the second amended complaint. Document filed by Ruth E. Smith, Jess A. Bunshaft, Saint Vincent's Hospital.(pl)
Blank 14 Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: 8/17/2007 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on a letter sent by Stacy B. Fishgrund On consent, plaintiff's on re: [13] MOTION to Amend/Correct [2] Amended Complaint; is GRANTED. Plaintiff is to serve and file the second Amended Complaint.filed by Roberto Rivera. (Signed by Judge Andrew J. Peck on 8/15/2007) Copies By Fax.(jmi)
Blank 13 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: 8/14/2007 Motion to Amend/Correct
MOTION to Amend the [2] Amended Complaint. Document filed by Roberto Rivera.Return Date set for 9/4/2007 at 10:00 AM.(jar)
Blank 12 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: 8/13/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 7/25/07 before Judge Andrew J. Peck. (jbe)
Blank 11 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: 7/30/2007 OrderCourt Filing
RULE 16 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: All Fact and Expert Discovery due by 12/31/2007. Summary Judgment Motions due by 1/22/2008. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/22/2008 (if no motion for summary judgment is filed/if motion IS filed, then deadline is set for 30 days after the motion is decided). The case will be considered trial ready on 24-hours notice after the pretrial order has been submitted. Initial Disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) of the FRCP due by 8/17/2007. A Status Conference is set for 9/5/2007 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck. All other details are as further set forth in said Order. (Signed by Judge Andrew J. Peck on 7/25/07) Copies Faxed by Chambers.(db) Modified on 8/9/2007 (Boneta, Dennis).
Blank -- Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: 7/31/2007 Pretrial Conference - Initial
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew J. Peck : Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/25/2007. Discovery due by 12/31/2007 (plaintiff expert reports by 11/1/07; defendants by 11/30/07)(mandatory discovery due 8/17/07). SJ notice by 1/3/08, SJ Motions due by 1/22/2008 or Pretrial Order due by 1/22/2008. Status Conference set for 9/5/2007 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck. (db)
Blank 10 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007 Order for Initial Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that an Initial Conference is scheduled for 7/25/2007 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck. (Signed by Judge Andrew J. Peck on 7/17/07) Copies Mailed By Chambers.(tro) Modified on 7/24/2007
PDF 9 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: 7/16/2007 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (including scheduling, discovery, non-dispostive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck. (Signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones on 7/2/2007) (jmi)
Blank -- Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: 7/10/2007 Note to Attorney to Re-File Document - Non-ECF Cas
***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF CASE ERROR. Note to Attorney Stacy Blair Fischgrund to MANUALLY RE-FILE Document NOTICE OF APPEARANCE and RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, Document No. 3 and 4. This case is not ECF. (lb)
Blank 8 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: 6/18/2007 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Barbara S. Jones from Stacy B. Fischgrund dated 6/8/07 re: Defendants counsel respectfully requests an extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's complaint from June 11, 2007 until August 17, 2007. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones on 6/11/07) Copies Mailed By Chambers.(tro)
Blank 7 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007 Summons Returned Executed
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Saint Vincent's Hospital served on 5/22/2007, answer due 6/11/2007. Service was accepted by Ms.Christine; also mailed copy of same to defendant on 5/23/07. Document filed by Roberto Rivera. (djc)
Blank 6 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007 Summons Returned Executed
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Jess A. Bunshaft served on 5/29/2007, answer due 6/18/2007. Service was accepted by affixing to door on 5/19/07 at 2:20 p.m.; 5/22/07 at 7:41 p.m. and on 5/29/07 at 9:55 a.m. Document filed by Roberto Rivera. (djc)
Blank 5 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007 Summons Returned Executed
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Ruth E. Smith served on 5/22/2007, answer due 6/11/2007. Service was accepted by Ms. Christine, Co-worker. Document filed by Roberto Rivera. (djc)
PDF 4 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING IN NON-ECF CASE - FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ruth E. Smith, Jess A. Bunshaft, Saint Vincent's Hospital.(Fischgrund, Stacy) Modified on 7/10/2007 (lb).
PDF 3 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007 Notice of Appearance
FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING IN NON-ECF CASE - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stacy Blair Fischgrund on behalf of Ruth E. Smith, Jess A. Bunshaft, Saint Vincent's Hospital (Fischgrund, Stacy) Modified on 7/10/2007 (lb).
Blank 2 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/18/2007 Amended Complaint
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending [1] Complaint against Ruth E. Smith, Jess A. Bunshaft, Saint Vincent's Hospital.Document filed by Roberto Rivera. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by Roberto Rivera.(jco)
Blank 1 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/24/2007 Complaint
COMPLAINT against Ruth E. Smith, Jess A. Bunshaft, Saint Vincent's Hospital. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 613030)Document filed by Roberto Rivera.(tro)
Blank -- Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/24/2007 Case Designation
Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck is so designated. (tro)
Blank -- Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/24/2007 Summons Issued
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ruth E. Smith, Jess A. Bunshaft, Saint Vincent's Hospital. (tro)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 172 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?