Durso et al v. Laub et al
New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-05781-PKC
docket://gov.uscourts.nysd.1-07-cv-05781 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
The right information can save you thousands of dollars.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Fred Wren, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman & Wolf

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
William Keith Wolf +1 212 354 4500 +1 212 719 9072 wwolf@friedmanwolf.com
No Logo Jeffrey Laub, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman & Wolf

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
William Keith Wolf +1 212 354 4500 +1 212 719 9072 wwolf@friedmanwolf.com
No Logo John Catsimatides, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman & Wolf

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
William Keith Wolf +1 212 354 4500 +1 212 719 9072 wwolf@friedmanwolf.com
No Logo John DeMartino, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman & Wolf

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
William Keith Wolf +1 212 354 4500 +1 212 719 9072 wwolf@friedmanwolf.com
No Logo John Greenfield, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman & Wolf

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
William Keith Wolf +1 212 354 4500 +1 212 719 9072 wwolf@friedmanwolf.com
No Logo John R. Durso, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman & Wolf

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
William Keith Wolf +1 212 354 4500 +1 212 719 9072 wwolf@friedmanwolf.com
No Logo Michael Most, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman & Wolf

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
William Keith Wolf +1 212 354 4500 +1 212 719 9072 wwolf@friedmanwolf.com
No Logo Murray J. Morrissey, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman & Wolf

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
William Keith Wolf +1 212 354 4500 +1 212 719 9072 wwolf@friedmanwolf.com
No Logo Samuel Peltz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman & Wolf

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
William Keith Wolf +1 212 354 4500 +1 212 719 9072 wwolf@friedmanwolf.com
No Logo Sydney Katz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman & Wolf

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
William Keith Wolf +1 212 354 4500 +1 212 719 9072 wwolf@friedmanwolf.com
No Logo Wanda Caraway, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman & Wolf

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
William Keith Wolf +1 212 354 4500 +1 212 719 9072 wwolf@friedmanwolf.com
Office Foley Square
Filed 6/18/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 1145 E.R.I.S.A.
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Queens
Terminated 7/9/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (10) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PDF 7 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: 7/10/2007 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - SignedCourt Filing
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the F.R.C.P. Plts hereby dismiss this action against dft B.M.J. Food Corp. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 7/9/2007) (jar)
PDF 6 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/6/2007 Affidavit of Service Other
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Dismissal served on Harold S. Berzow, Esq., Ruskin, Moscou & Faltischek, P.C. on July 6, 2007. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Fred Wren, John R. Durso(as Trustee and Fiduciary of the Local 338 Retirement Fund), John DeMartino(as Trustee and Fiduciary of the Local 338 Retirement Fund), Wanda Caraway, Jeffrey Laub(as Trustee and Fiduciary of the Local 338 Retirement Fund), Michael Most, John Greenfield, John Catsimatides, Samuel Peltz, Sydney Katz, John R. Durso(as Trustee and Fiduciary of the Local 338 Health and Welfare Fund), John DeMartino(as Trustee and Fiduciary of the Local 338 Health and Welfare Fund), Murray J. Morrissey, Jeffrey Laub(as Trustee and Fiduciary of the Local 338 Health and Welfare Fund). (Wolf, William)
PDF 5 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/6/2007 Notice (Other)
NOTICE of Dismissal. Document filed by Fred Wren, John R. Durso(as Trustee and Fiduciary of the Local 338 Retirement Fund), John DeMartino(as Trustee and Fiduciary of the Local 338 Retirement Fund), Wanda Caraway, Jeffrey Laub(as Trustee and Fiduciary of the Local 338 Retirement Fund), Michael Most, John Greenfield, John Catsimatides, Samuel Peltz, Sydney Katz, John R. Durso(as Trustee and Fiduciary of the Local 338 Health and Welfare Fund), John DeMartino(as Trustee and Fiduciary of the Local 338 Health and Welfare Fund), Murray J. Morrissey, Jeffrey Laub(as Trustee and Fiduciary of the Local 338 Health and Welfare Fund). (Wolf, William)
PDF 4 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: 6/25/2007 Order for Initial Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
ORDER RE SCHEDULING AND INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE:Initial Conference set for 9/7/2007 at 11:45 AM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 6/22/07) (db)
PDF 3 Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: 6/22/2007 Amended Complaint
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending [1] Complaint, against BMJ Food Corp.Document filed by Fred Wren, John R. Durso(as Trustee and Fiduciary of the Local 338 Retirement Fund), John DeMartino(as Trustee and Fiduciary of the Local 338 Retirement Fund), Wanda Caraway, Jeffrey Laub(as Trustee and Fiduciary of the Local 338 Retirement Fund), Michael Most, John Greenfield, John Catsimatides, Samuel Peltz, Sydney Katz, John R. Durso(as Trustee and Fiduciary of the Local 338 Health and Welfare Fund), John DeMartino(as Trustee and Fiduciary of the Local 338 Health and Welfare Fund), Murray J. Morrissey, Jeffrey Laub(as Trustee and Fiduciary of the Local 338 Health and Welfare Fund). Related document: [1] Complaint, filed by Sydney Katz, John Catsimatides, John R. Durso, Michael Most, John DeMartino, Jeffrey Laub, John Greenfield, Murray J. Morrissey, Samuel Peltz, Fred Wren, Wanda Caraway.(jco)
PDF 2 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Fred Wren, John R. Durso(as Trustee and Fiduciary of the Local 338 Retirement Fund), John DeMartino(as Trustee and Fiduciary of the Local 338 Retirement Fund), Wanda Caraway, Jeffrey Laub(as Trustee and Fiduciary of the Local 338 Retirement Fund), Michael Most, John Greenfield, John Catsimatides, Samuel Peltz, Sydney Katz, John R. Durso(as Trustee and Fiduciary of the Local 338 Health and Welfare Fund), John DeMartino(as Trustee and Fiduciary of the Local 338 Health and Welfare Fund), Murray J. Morrissey, Jeffrey Laub(as Trustee and Fiduciary of the Local 338 Health and Welfare Fund).(tro)
PDF 1 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007 Complaint
COMPLAINT against BMJ Food Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 618701)Document filed by Fred Wren, John R. Durso(as Trustee and Fiduciary of the Local 338 Retirement Fund), John DeMartino(as Trustee and Fiduciary of the Local 338 Retirement Fund), Wanda Caraway, Jeffrey Laub(as Trustee and Fiduciary of the Local 338 Retirement Fund), Michael Most, John Greenfield, John Catsimatides, Samuel Peltz, Sydney Katz, John R. Durso(as Trustee and Fiduciary of the Local 338 Health and Welfare Fund), John DeMartino(as Trustee and Fiduciary of the Local 338 Health and Welfare Fund), Murray J. Morrissey, Jeffrey Laub(as Trustee and Fiduciary of the Local 338 Health and Welfare Fund).(tro)
Blank -- Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007 Case Designated ECF.
Case Designated ECF. (tro)
Blank -- Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007 Case Designation
Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis is so designated. (tro)
Blank -- Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007 Summons Issued
SUMMONS ISSUED as to BMJ Food Corp.. (tro)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 76 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?