Johnson-Llanos v. P.R. Telephone Co., et al
Puerto Rico District Court, Case No. 3:96-cv-02057-PG
docket://gov.uscourts.prd.3-96-cv-02057-PG (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Judges don't know as much about themselves as we do.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Daniel Johnson-Llanos, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Abbid Quinones, Defendant
No Logo Angel Rijos, Defendant
No Logo Carmen Santiago, Defendant
No Logo Enizet Gonzalez, Defendant
No Logo Fulano 96CV2057, Defendant
No Logo Jose Rijos, Defendant
No Logo Mengano de Tal 96CV2057, Defendant
No Logo Mercedes Gomez, Defendant
No Logo Norma Burgos, Defendant
No Logo Reynaldo Rodriguez, Defendant
No Logo Rodney Rodriguez, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Garcia & Fernandez

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
John M. Garcia-Nokonechna +1 787 764 1932 +1 787 766 2132 gflaw@gflawpr.com
No Logo Rogelio Capestrany, Defendant
No Logo Sutano 96CV2057, Defendant
No Logo Victor Pacheco, Defendant
Office San Juan
Filed 8/28/1996
Jury Demand None
Demand $7700000
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County San Juan
Terminated 7/2/1997
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, FRC
  Entries (32) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
Blank -- Filed: 9/26/2000, Entered: 9/26/2000 Set FRC Flag
CASE REFERRED TO FEDERAL RECORDS CENTER. ACC.021 - 021-00-0178 Box 17 (yr)
Blank 18 Filed: 7/2/1997, Entered: 7/3/1997 JudgmentCourt Filing
PARTIAL JUDGMENT dismissing the complaint as to defts Angel Rijos, Abbid Quinones, Mercedes Gomez, Carmen Santiago, Norma Burgos, Reynaldo Rodriguez, Jose Rijos, Rodney Rodriguez, Rogelio Capetany, Victor Pacheco and Enizet Gonzalez ( signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez ) (mr)
Blank -- Filed: 7/2/1997, Entered: 7/3/1997 Terminated Case
Case closed (mr)
Blank -- Filed: 7/2/1997, Entered: 7/3/1997 Order
ENDORSED ORDER granting [16-1] motion to Dismiss for insuffiency of service of process ( signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez ) (mr)
Blank -- Filed: 5/13/1997, Entered: 5/13/1997 Order
ENDORSED ORDER [17-1] informative motion, Noted. ( signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez ) (mr)
Blank -- Filed: 5/13/1997, Entered: 5/13/1997 Order
ENDORSED ORDER mooting [13-1] response in opposition ( signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez ) (mr)
Blank 17 Filed: 4/30/1997, Entered: 5/1/1997 none
Informative Motion by Angel Rijos, Abbid Quinones, Mercedes Gomez, Carmen Santiago, Norma Burgos, Reynaldo Rodriguez, Jose Rijos, Rodney Rodriguez, Rogelio Capestrany, Victor Pacheco, Enizet Gonzalez re: atty's change of address. (mr)
Blank 16 Filed: 4/30/1997, Entered: 5/1/1997 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION by Angel Rijos, Abbid Quinones, Mercedes Gomez, Carmen Santiago, Norma Burgos, Reynaldo Rodriguez, Jose Rijos, Rodney Rodriguez, Rogelio Capestrany, Victor Pacheco, Enizet Gonzalez to Dismiss for insuffiency of service of process (mr)
Blank 15 Filed: 2/25/1997, Entered: 2/26/1997 JudgmentCourt Filing
PARTIAL JUDGMENT dismissing the complaint as to codefts Agustin Garcia, Jose Arroyo, Ruben Hernandez, Ricardo Rubio, Charles Blanco, Rodaldenis Rivera, Christopher Jackson, Samuel Acosta, Jose Kurtwright, Alfredo Mendez, Georgeanne Green, Margie Stefanic, Lilian Torres, Maria Pena, Maria Santos, Milagros Rodriguez, Hector Rosas, Ivan Miranda, Angel Melendez, Ramon Ruiz, Viviannette Menendez and Nilda Ojeda ( signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez ) (mr)
Blank 14 Filed: 2/25/1997, Entered: 2/26/1997 JudgmentCourt Filing
PARTIAL JUDGMENT dismissing the complaint as to codeft PR Telephone Co. ( signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez ) (mr)
Blank -- Filed: 2/25/1997, Entered: 2/26/1997 Order
ENDORSED ORDER granting [10-1] motion to Dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. After having read the complaint and the position of appearing codefts, the complaint is dismissed as to all of them ( signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez ) (mr)
Blank -- Filed: 2/25/1997, Entered: 2/26/1997 Order
ENDORSED ORDER granting [12-1] motion to Dismiss for lack of timely service ( signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez ) (mr)
Blank 13 Filed: 2/19/1997, Entered: 2/21/1997 none
RESPONSE by Daniel Johnson-Llanos in opposition to [9-1] motion to Dismiss for insufficiency of service of process P.R. Telephone Co. (motion unsigned by pltf) (mr)
Blank 12 Filed: 2/13/1997, Entered: 2/14/1997 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION by P.R. Telephone Co. to Dismiss for lack of timely service (mr)
Blank -- Filed: 2/2/1997, Entered: 2/26/1997 Order
ENDORSED ORDER granting [9-1] motion to Dismiss for insufficiency of service of process ( signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez ) (mr)
Blank 11 Filed: 1/24/1997, Entered: 1/27/1997 Summons Returned Executed
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to P.R. Telephone Co. (thru Iraida Latoni, Legal Div. Manager) on 1/22/97 Answer due on 2/11/97 for P.R. Telephone Co. (mr)
Blank -- Filed: 1/14/1997, Entered: 1/15/1997 Summons Issued
SUMMONS issued for P.R. Telephone Co. (mr)
Blank 10 Filed: 1/9/1997, Entered: 1/10/1997 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION by Agustin Garcia, Jose Arroyo-Davila, Hector Rosas, Angel Melendez, Ronald R. Rivera, Ivan Miranda, Ruben Hernandez, Maria Santos, Ricardo Rubio, Charles Blanco, Christopher Jackson, Margie Steffanic, Jose Kurtwright, Maria Pena, Lilliam Torres, Samuel Acosta, Alfredo Mendez, Georgeanne Green, Nilda Ojeda, Milagros Rodriguez, Viviannete Doe, Ramon Ruiz-Roque to Dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted Response due 1/22/97 . (mr)
Blank 9 Filed: 1/9/1997, Entered: 1/10/1997 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION by P.R. Telephone Co. to Dismiss for insufficiency of service of process Response due 1/22/97 . (mr)
Blank -- Filed: 12/20/1996, Entered: 12/23/1996 Order
ENDORSED ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Extend Time for a period of 30 days to answer the complaint ( signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez ) (mr)
Blank 8 Filed: 12/11/1996, Entered: 12/12/1996 Motion for extension of time
MOTION by Agustin Garcia, Jose Arroyo-Davila, Hector Rosas, Angel Melendez, Ivan Miranda, Ruben Hernandez, Maria Santos, Ricardo Rubio, Charles Blanco, Christopher Jackson, Margie Steffanic, Jose Kurtwright, Maria Pena, Lilliam Torres, Samuel Acosta, Alfredo Mendez, Georgeanne Green, Nilda Ojeda, Rodney Rodriguez, Milagros Rodriguez, Viviannete Doe, Ramon Ruiz-Roque to Extend Time for a period of 30 days to answer the complaint (mr)
Blank -- Filed: 12/6/1996, Entered: 12/10/1996 Summons Issued
SUMMONS issued for Victor Pacheco (mr)
Blank 7 Filed: 12/4/1996, Entered: 12/5/1996 Summons Returned Executed
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Nilda Ojeda on 11/29/96 Answer due on 12/19/96 for Nilda Ojeda (mr)
Blank 6 Filed: 12/4/1996, Entered: 12/5/1996 Summons Returned Executed
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Jose Arroyo-Davila, Hector Rosas, Angel Melendez, Ivan Miranda, Maria Pena, Viviannete Doe, Ramon Ruiz-Roque on 11/27/96 Answer due on 12/17/96 for Jose Arroyo-Davila, for Hector Rosas, for Angel Melendez, for Ivan Miranda, for Maria Pena, for Viviannete Doe, for Ramon Ruiz-Roque (mr)
Blank 5 Filed: 12/4/1996, Entered: 12/5/1996 Summons Returned Executed
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Milagros Rodriguez on 11/26/96 Answer due on 12/16/96 for Milagros Rodriguez (mr)
Blank 4 Filed: 12/4/1996, Entered: 12/5/1996 Summons Returned Executed
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Margie Steffanic, Jose Kurtwright, Samuel Acosta, Alfredo Mendez, Georgeanne Green on 11/22/96 Answer due on 12/12/96 for Margie Steffanic, for Jose Kurtwright, for Samuel Acosta, for Alfredo Mendez, for Georgeanne Green (mr)
Blank 3 Filed: 12/4/1996, Entered: 12/5/1996 Summons Returned Executed
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Agustin Garcia, Ronald R. Rivera, Ruben Hernandez, Maria Santos, Ricardo Rubio, Charles Blanco, Christopher Jackson, Lilliam Torres on 11/21/96 Answer due on 12/11/96 for Agustin Garcia, for Ronald R. Rivera, for Ruben Hernandez, for Maria Santos, for Ricardo Rubio, for Charles Blanco, for Christopher Jackson, for Lilliam Torres (mr)
Blank -- Filed: 10/16/1996, Entered: 10/21/1996 Summons Issued
SUMMONS issued for Agustin Garcia, Jose Arroyo-Davila, Angel Rijos, Hector Rosas, Angel Melendez, Ronald R. Rivera, Ivan Miranda, Abbid Quinones, Ruben Hernandez, Maria Santos, Ricardo Rubio, Charles Blanco, Christopher Jackson, Carmen Santiago, Margie Steffanic, Jose Kurtwright, Maria Pena, Lilliam Torres, Norma Burgos, Reynaldo Rodriguez, Samuel Acosta, Alfredo Mendez, Jose Rijos, Georgeanne Green, Nilda Ojeda, Rodney Rodriguez, Milagros Rodriguez, Viviannete Doe, Ramon Ruiz-Roque, Rogelio Capestrany, Enizet Gonzalez (mr)
Blank -- Filed: 10/1/1996, Entered: 10/1/1996 Remark
Case referred to Counter for filing fees (mr)
Blank -- Filed: 9/27/1996, Entered: 10/1/1996 Order
ENDORSED ORDER denying [1-1] motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis ( signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez ) (mr)
Blank 2 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 8/29/1996 Complaint
COMPLAINT with attachments (in Spanish) (mr)
Blank 1 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 8/29/1996 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis
MOTION by Daniel Johnson-Llanos to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (with affidavit in support thereof attached) (mr)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 38 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?