Palmer v. Persolve, LLC et al
California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:07-cv-06104-MMC
District Judge Maxine M. Chesney, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.cand.3-07-cv-06104 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
The right information can save you thousands of dollars.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Marshall Lee Palmer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Consumer Law Center, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Fred W. Schwinn +1 408 294 6100 +1 408 294 6190 fred.schwinn@sjconsumerlaw.com
v.
No Logo Alaine Patti-jelsvik, Defendant
No Logo Persolve, LLC, Defendant
Office San Francisco
Filed 12/3/2007
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 480 - Consumer Credit
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Santa Clara
Terminated 2/14/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ADRMOP, CLOSED, E-Filing
  Entries (7) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PDF 4 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Marshall Lee Palmer (Schwinn, Fred) (Filed on 2/14/2008)
PDF 3 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 Clerk's Notice re: Failure to E-File and Register
CLERK'S NOTICE to Plaintiff(s) Attorney(s) by e-mail or U.S. mail re: Failure to E-File/E-Mail re [1] Complaint and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 12/14/2007)
PDF 2 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007 ADR Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 3/7/2008. Case Management Conference set for 3/14/2008 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/3/07. (Attachments: # (1) MMC Standing Order, # (2) Standing Order)(aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 12/3/2007)
PDF 1 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007 Complaint
COMPLAINT: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL: 15 United States Code 1692 et seq., California Civil Code 1788 et seq., California Civil Code 1812.700 against Persolve, LLC, Alaine Patti-Jelsvik ( Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 54611002176.). Filed byMarshall Lee Palmer. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 12/3/2007) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/17/2007: # (1) Exhibit 1) (aaa, Court Staff).
Blank -- Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007 Case Referred to ECF
CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 12/3/2007)
Blank -- Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007 Summons Issued
Summons Issued as to Persolve, LLC. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 12/3/2007)
Blank -- Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007 Summons Issued
Summons Issued as to Alaine Patti-Jelsvik. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 12/3/2007)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 224 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?