BOT, Sht Mtl Wkr Nat, et al v. Sussex, Morris, et al
Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00075-TSE
docket://gov.uscourts.vaed.1-03-cv-00075 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Judges don't know as much about themselves as we do.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo International Training Institute For The Sheet Metal And Air Conditioning Industry, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jennings Sigmond, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David Stephen Bahuriak, Jr. +1 215 351 0658 +1 215 922 3524 usdc-edva-erisa@jslex.com
No Logo National Energy Management Institute Committee, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jennings Sigmond, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David Stephen Bahuriak, Jr. +1 215 351 0658 +1 215 922 3524 usdc-edva-erisa@jslex.com
No Logo National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jennings Sigmond, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David Stephen Bahuriak, Jr. +1 215 351 0658 +1 215 922 3524 usdc-edva-erisa@jslex.com
No Logo Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jennings Sigmond, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David Stephen Bahuriak, Jr. +1 215 351 0658 +1 215 922 3524 usdc-edva-erisa@jslex.com
No Logo Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jennings Sigmond, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David Stephen Bahuriak, Jr. +1 215 351 0658 +1 215 922 3524 usdc-edva-erisa@jslex.com
v.
No Logo Carole Materna, Defendant
No Logo Joseph Materna, Defendant
No Logo Linda Hennighan, Defendant
No Logo Mary Hennighan, Defendant
No Logo Sussex, Morris, Warren Sheet Metal Works, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
William M. Cusmano +1 703 527 1775
Office Alexandria
Filed 1/21/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Judgment on Default
County Alexandria City
Terminated 3/1/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (49) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
Blank -- Filed: 6/10/2005, Entered: 6/10/2005 Docket Call
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. S. Ellis III: Docket Call held on 6/10/2005; no parties present for a hrg. (Court Reporter Rodriquez.) (tbul, )
Blank 39 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Satisfaction of Judgment
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT by Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund, International Training Institute for the Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Industry, National Energy Management Institute Committee, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust Fund, National Stabilization Agreement of the Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund. (agil)
Blank 38 Filed: 5/25/2005, Entered: 5/26/2005 Notice of Hearing on Motion
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [28] Motion for Relief from Judgment (Rule 60) Motion Hearing set for 6/10/2005 10:00 AM before Honorable District T. S. Ellis III. (clar, )
Blank 37 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: 4/26/2005 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER that the hearing on dft's Rule 60 motion for relief be continued to 6/3/05 @ 10:00 a.m. ( signed by Judge T. S. Ellis III ) Copies Mailed: 4.26.05 [EOD Date: 4/26/05] (agil)
Blank -- Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: 4/26/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines
Deadline updated; Motion Hearing Deadline before Judge T. S. Ellis III set for 10:00 6/3/05 for [28-1] motion by Sussex, Morris for Relief from Judgment (Rule 60) (agil)
Blank 36 Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: 4/5/2005 Notice of HearingCourt Filing
NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing Deadline before Judge T. S. Ellis III set for 10:00 4/29/05 for [28-1] motion by Sussex, Morris for Relief from Judgment (Rule 60) (agil)
Blank 35 Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: 4/5/2005 Miscellaneous Document
Reply by Sussex, Morris, Carole Materna, Joseph Materna, Mary Hennighan, Linda Hennighan to [31-1] opposition to Dft's Rule 60 Motion for Relief from Judgment (agil)
Blank 34 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: 3/31/2005 Affidavit
Declaration of Karleen O'Neill (agil)
Blank 33 Filed: 3/25/2005, Entered: 3/28/2005 Affidavit
Declaration of Diane Ferguson (agil)
Blank 32 Filed: 3/25/2005, Entered: 3/28/2005 Affidavit
Declaration of Alex Dyer (agil)
Blank 31 Filed: 3/25/2005, Entered: 3/25/2005 Memorandum in Opposition
MEMORANDUM by Nat'l Stabilization, Sheet Metal Workers', Intl Trng Institute, Natl Energy Mgmt, Sheet Mtl Occ Health in response to [28-1] motion by Sussex, Morris for Relief from Judgment (Rule 60) (LARGE PLEADING) (karn) Modified on 03/25/2005
Blank 30 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: 3/11/2005 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER Granting [29-1] motion by Sheet Mtl Occ Health, Natl Energy Mgmt, Intl Trng Institute, Sheet Metal Workers', Nat'l Stabilization to Extend Time to Respond to Dft's Rule 60 motion until 3/25/05 ( signed by Judge T. S. Ellis III ) Copies Mailed: 3.11.05 [EOD Date: 3/11/05] (agil)
Blank 29 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: 3/10/2005, Terminated: 3/10/2005 Motion for Extension
MOTION by Sheet Mtl Occ Health, Natl Energy Mgmt, Intl Trng Institute, Sheet Metal Workers', Nat'l Stabilization to Extend Time to Respond to Dft's Rule 60 motion (agil)
Blank 28 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005, Terminated: 6/27/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION by Sussex, Morris for Relief from Judgment (Rule 60) (agil)
Blank 27 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005 Financial Disclosure Statement
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Sussex, Morris (agil)
Blank 26 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Judgment
JUDGMENT for Nat'l Stabilization, Sheet Metal Workers', Intl Trng Institute, Natl Energy Mgmt, Sheet Mtl Occ Health against Sussex, Morris, Carole Materna, Joseph Materna, Mary Hennighan, Linda Hennighan in the amount of $40,343.29 entered by the clerk [EOD DATE: 3/4/04] (clerk) Modified on 03/08/2004
Blank 25 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Set DeadlinesCourt Filing
DEFAULT JUDGMENT, that the court adopts as its own the findings of fact and recommendation of the US Mag. Judge, against Sussex, Morris, Carole Materna, Joseph Materna, Mary Hennighan, Linda Hennighan jointly & severally in the amount of $40,343.29 ( signed Judge T. S. Ellis III ) Copies Mailed: y (clerk) Modified on 03/08/2004
Blank -- Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/3/2004 Terminated Case
Case closed (clerk)
Blank 24 Filed: 2/11/2004, Entered: 2/12/2004 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge Barry R. Poretz Re: [22-1] motion by Sheet Mtl Occ Health, Natl Energy Mgmt, Intl Trng Institute, Sheet Metal Workers', Nat'l Stabilization for Default Judgment against Sussex, Morris, Carole Materna, Joseph Materna, Mary Hennighan, Linda Hennighan ; Motion no longer referred Objections to R and R due by 2/27/04 Copies Mailed: yes (Sent to TSE) (clerk)
Blank -- Filed: 2/6/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004 Minutes - Miscellaneous
Minute entry: Magistrate Judge Poretz (FTR) Reporter: Casamo & Assoc. Appearances: Counsel for Pltf. This matter came on to Pltf's. Motion for default judgment against Sussex, Morris, Casrole Materna, Joseph Materna, Mary Hennighan and Linda Hennighan - Matter uncontested and taken under advisement. Report & Recommendation to follow. (jsch)
Blank -- Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Set/Reset Deadlines
Deadline updated; Motion Hearing Deadline before Magistrate Judge Barry R. Poretz set for 10:00 2/6/04 for [22-1] motion by Sheet Mtl Occ Health, Natl Energy Mgmt, Intl Trng Institute, Sheet Metal Workers', Nat'l Stabilization for Default Judgment against Sussex, Morris, Carole Materna, Joseph Materna, Mary Hennighan, Linda Hennighan (clar)
Blank 23 Filed: 1/15/2004, Entered: 1/15/2004 Notice of HearingCourt Filing
NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing Deadline before Judge T. S. Ellis III set for 10:00 2/6/04 for [22-1] motion by Sheet Mtl Occ Health, Natl Energy Mgmt, Intl Trng Institute, Sheet Metal Workers', Nat'l Stabilization for Default Judgment against Sussex, Morris, Carole Materna, Joseph Materna, Mary Hennighan, Linda Hennighan (clerk)
Blank 22 Filed: 1/15/2004, Entered: 1/15/2004, Terminated: 3/1/2004 Motion for Default Judgment
MOTION by Sheet Mtl Occ Health, Natl Energy Mgmt, Intl Trng Institute, Sheet Metal Workers', Nat'l Stabilization for Default Judgment against Sussex, Morris, Carole Materna, Joseph Materna, Mary Hennighan, Linda Hennighan (clerk)
Blank -- Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: 11/26/2003 Docket Annotation
Called atty. told to re-notice default hearing for another friday, due to no motions being heard on 11/28/03 (jcup)
Blank 21 Filed: 11/2/2003, Entered: 11/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER, that this cse is scheduled for an ex parte proof of damages hearing on 11/28/03 at 10:00 am (see order for details) ( signed by Judge T. S. Ellis III ) Copies Mailed: Yes [EOD Date: 11/3/03] (kjon)
Blank 20 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: 10/31/2003 Clerk's Entry of Default
CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Sussex, Morris, Carole Materna, Joseph Materna, Mary Hennighan, Linda Hennighan granting [18-1] motion by Sheet Mtl Occ Health, Natl Energy Mgmt, Intl Trng Institute, Sheet Metal Workers', Nat'l Stabilization for Entry of Default as to Sussex, Morris, Carole Materna, Joseph Materna, Mary Hennighan, Linda Hennighan (kjon)
Blank 19 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: 10/31/2003 Affidavit
AFFIDAVIT of David S. Bahuriak, Jr. Re: [18-1] motion by Sheet Mtl Occ Health, Natl Energy Mgmt, Intl Trng Institute, Sheet Metal Workers', Nat'l Stabilization for Entry of Default as to Sussex, Morris, Carole Materna, Joseph Materna, Mary Hennighan, Linda Hennighan (kjon)
Blank 18 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: 10/31/2003 Request for Entry of Default
REQUEST/MOTION by Sheet Mtl Occ Health, Natl Energy Mgmt, Intl Trng Institute, Sheet Metal Workers', Nat'l Stabilization for Entry of Default as to Sussex, Morris, Carole Materna, Joseph Materna, Mary Hennighan, Linda Hennighan (kjon) Modified on 10/31/2003
Blank 17 Filed: 9/22/2003, Entered: 9/29/2003 Summons Returned Executed
AMENDED COMPLAINT/SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Linda Hennighan 9/3/03 Answer due on 9/23/03 for Linda Hennighan (clerk)
Blank 16 Filed: 9/22/2003, Entered: 9/29/2003 Summons Returned Executed
AMENDED COMPLAINT/SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Mary Hennighan 9/3/03 Answer due on 9/23/03 for Mary Hennighan (clerk) Modified on 03/08/2004
Blank 15 Filed: 9/22/2003, Entered: 9/29/2003 Summons Returned Executed
AMENDED COMPLAINT/SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Joseph Materna 8/21/03 Answer due on 9/10/03 for Joseph Materna (clerk)
Blank 14 Filed: 9/22/2003, Entered: 9/29/2003 Summons Returned Executed
AMENDED COMPLAINT/SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Carole Materna 8/21/03 Answer due on 9/10/03 for Carole Materna (clerk)
Blank 13 Filed: 9/22/2003, Entered: 9/29/2003 Summons Returned Executed
AMENDED COMPLAINT/SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Sussex, Morris 8/21/03 Answer due on 9/10/03 for Sussex, Morris (clerk)
Blank -- Filed: 6/26/2003, Entered: 6/26/2003 Summons Issued
AMENDED COMPLAINT SUMMONS(ES) (orig & 5) issued & mailed to atty for service by SPS for Sussex, Morris, Carole Materna, Joseph Materna, Mary Hennighan, Linda Hennighan (kjon)
Blank 12 Filed: 6/6/2003, Entered: 6/25/2003 Amended Complaint
AMENDED COMPLAINT by Nat'l Stabilization, Sheet Metal Workers', Intl Trng Institute, Natl Energy Mgmt, Sheet Mtl Occ Healthagainst Carole Materna, Joseph Materna, Mary Hennighan, Linda Hennighan; amending [1-1] complaint (kjon)
Blank 11 Filed: 6/6/2003, Entered: 6/6/2003 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER for reasons stated from the bench and in accord with specific rulings and instructions thereto granting [6-1] motion by BOT, Sht Mtl Occ, BOT, Nat Ene Man, Board Trust. Inter., BOT, Sht Mtl Wkr Nat to Amend [1-1] Complaint, granting [6-2] motion by BOT, Sht Mtl Occ, BOT, Nat Ene Man, Board Trust. Inter., BOT, Sht Mtl Wkr Nat to Continue Ex Parte Hearing ( signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa C. Buchanan ) Copies Mailed: yes [EOD Date: 6/6/03] (ctat)
Blank -- Filed: 6/6/2003, Entered: 6/6/2003 Minutes - Miscellaneous
Minute entry: Judge Buchanan (FTR) Reporter: Casamo. Appearance of Counsel for Pltf. Matter came on as a motion hearing. Matter is uncontested. Motion to Amend Complaint - granted. Order to follow. (ctat)
Blank 10 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING [9-1] Motion by BOT, Sht Mtl Occ, BOT, Nat Ene Man, Board Trust. Inter., BOT, Sht Mtl Wkr Nat to Continue ex parte proof of damages default hearing for 05/23/03 at 10:00 pending an outcome of the hearing on a Motion to File An Amended Complaint scheduled for 06/06/03 at 10:00 a.m.; Pltfs are directed to re-notice the ex parte proof of damages hearing following the Court's ruling on Pltfs' motion for leave to amend (see Order for details) ( signed by Magistrate Judge Liam O'Grady ) Copies Mailed: yes [EOD Date: 6/3/03] (clerk)
Blank -- Filed: 5/21/2003, Entered: 5/21/2003 Docket Annotation
Per LO chambers motions set for 5/23/03 are to be cont. (clar)
Blank 9 Filed: 5/14/2003, Entered: 5/15/2003, Terminated: 5/23/2003 Motion to Continue
MOTION by BOT, Sht Mtl Occ, BOT, Nat Ene Man, Board Trust. Inter., BOT, Sht Mtl Wkr Nat to Continue ex parte proof of damages default hearing for 05/23/03 at 10:00 (stas)
Blank 8 Filed: 5/8/2003, Entered: 5/9/2003 Notice of Hearing
NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing Deadline set for 10:00 6/6/03 for [6-1] Motion by BOT, Sht Mtl Occ, BOT, Nat Ene Man, Board Trust. Inter., BOT, Sht Mtl Wkr Nat to Amend [1-1] Complaint (clerk)
Blank 7 Filed: 5/8/2003, Entered: 5/9/2003 Memorandum in Support
MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES by BOT, Sht Mtl Wkr Nat, Board Trust. Inter., BOT, Nat Ene Man, BOT, Sht Mtl Occ in FAVOR of [6-1] Motion by BOT, Sht Mtl Occ, BOT, Nat Ene Man, Board Trust. Inter., BOT, Sht Mtl Wkr Nat to Amend [1-1] Complaint (clerk)
Blank 6 Filed: 5/8/2003, Entered: 5/9/2003, Terminated: 6/6/2003 Motion to Amend/Correct
MOTION by BOT, Sht Mtl Occ, BOT, Nat Ene Man, Board Trust. Inter., BOT, Sht Mtl Wkr Nat to Amend [1-1] Complaint , And by BOT, Sht Mtl Occ, BOT, Nat Ene Man, Board Trust. Inter., BOT, Sht Mtl Wkr Nat to Continue Ex Parte Hearing (clerk)
Blank 5 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/21/2003 OrderCourt Filing
ORDERED that this case is scheduled for an ex parte proof of damages Default Hearing for 10:00 5/23/03 ( signed by Judge T. S. Ellis III ) Copies Mailed: yes [EOD Date: 4/21/03] (clerk)
Blank 4 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/9/2003 Summons Returned Executed
AFFIDAVIT/SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Sussex, Morris 1/28/03 Answer due on 2/17/03 for Sussex, Morris (clerk) Modified on 04/09/2003
Blank 3 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 2/28/2003 OrderCourt Filing
Stipulated Order, that Soo Kang Scardina shall be permitted to and is withdrawn as counsel of record for pltfs. in the above-captioned matter; and it is further ordered that David S. Bahuriak, Jr. shall be sutstituted as counsel for pltfs.; and it is further ordered that this substitution of counsel shall not prevent pltfs from meeting established trial dates or other regularly scheduled proceedings as the Court may direct (see order for details) ( signed by Judge T. S. Ellis III ) Copies Mailed: yes [EOD Date: 2/28/03] (ltun)
Blank 2 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/28/2003 Financial Disclosure Statement
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by BOT, Sht Mtl Wkr Nat, Board Trust. Inter., BOT, Nat Ene Man, BOT, Sht Mtl Occ (clerk)
Blank 1 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/28/2003 Complaint
COMPLAINT Filing Fee $ 150.00 Receipt # 100160926 (clerk)
Blank -- Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/28/2003 Summons Issued
SUMMONS(ES) (Orig. & 1) issued and given to atty for service by SPS for Sussex, Morris (clerk)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 81 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?