Systems Integration, et al v. US Gen Srvs Admin, et al
Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:05-mc-00022-TSE-TCB
docket://gov.uscourts.vaed.1-05-mc-00022-TSE (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
The right information can save you thousands of dollars.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo M.L. Denese Slaey, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David Thomas Williams +1 703 836 7997 wbcpclaw@aol.com
No Logo Shelley Slaey-Mountjoy, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David Thomas Williams +1 703 836 7997 wbcpclaw@aol.com
No Logo Systems Integration and Management, Inc., Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David Thomas Williams +1 703 836 7997 wbcpclaw@aol.com
Office Alexandria
Filed 4/22/2005
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 690 - Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause Motion for Return of Property
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County Fairfax
Terminated 10/26/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (18) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
Blank 14 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: 10/28/2005 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
ORDER that this matter is TERMINATED. Signed by Judge T. S. Ellis III on 10/26/05. c/s(agil)
Blank 13 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: 10/26/2005 Reply
Dft's Report to the Court re [12] Order, filed by United States General Services Administration Office of the Inspector General, United States of America. (agil)
Blank 12 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER that, as there appears to be nothing more to accomplish in this matter, parties are DIRECTED to advise the Court on or before 5:00 p.m., 10/16/05, whether a dismissal Order terminating this matter is now appropriate, and if not what further remains to be accomplished in this matter. Signed by Judge T. S. Ellis III on 10/19/05. c/s: 10/20/05(agil)
Blank 11 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: 10/13/2005 NOTICE
Second Joint Report to the Court by parties. (agil)
Blank 10 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: 9/28/2005 Response
Joint Report to Court pursuant to [9] Order of 9/16/05 by parties. (agil)
Blank 9 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/28/2005 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER DENYING Pltffs' motion to unseal the search warrant, and GRANTING in part (all seized material is to be made available for inspection and copying by 5:00 9/27/05) and DENYING in part (in all other respects) the [1] Motion for Return of Property filed by Systems Integration and Management, Inc., M.L. Denese Slaey, Shelley Slaey-Mountjoy, all for reasons stated from the Bench. Further ORDERED that Defts are DIRECTED to file a pleading by 5:00 9/28/05 confirming the production of seized material (see Order for details). Further ORDERED that the issue of which party should bear the costs of copies is DEFERRED, and if not resolved, parties are DIRECTED to file memoranda by 5:00 9/30/05. Signed by Judge T. S. Ellis III on 9/16/05. Mailed: epn(tbul, )
Blank -- Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/27/2005 Motion Hearing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. S. Ellis III: Motion Hearing held on 9/16/2005 re [1] Motion for Return of Property filed by Systems Integration and Management, Inc., M.L. Denese Slaey, Shelley Slaey-Mountjoy. Appearances: Joseph Sher/Kenya Mann for USA; William Cummings/Jack Gruenstein/Kathy Nagel for Defts. Heard, findings stated, and granted in part (Ms. Mann to make avail. all of the matters seized, and file w/ the Court a pldg. signed by an attorney stating these are all the seized docs. and make avail. copies, including hard drive), and the motion to unseal warrant - denied. Prod. by 9/28; submit simultaneous briefs re who should pay - 9/30/05. (Court Reporter Rodriquez.) (tbul, )
Blank 8 Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY to Response to Motion re [1] Motion for Return of Property, and by Shelley Slaey-Mountjoy, M.L. Denese Slaey, Systems Integration to Unseal the Search Warrant Affidavit of Probable Cause filed by Systems Integration and Management, Inc., M.L. Denese Slaey, Shelley Slaey-Mountjoy. (clar, )
Blank 7 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: 9/14/2005 Brief in Support
Memorandum in support of motion to transfer proceedings filed by United States General Services Administration Office of the Inspector General, United States of America. (clar, )
Blank 6 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: 9/14/2005 Memorandum in Opposition
Opposition to [1] Motion for Return of Property, and by Shelley Slaey-Mountjoy, M.L. Denese Slaey, Systems Integration to Unseal the Search Warrant Affidavit of Probable Cause filed by United States General Services Administration Office of the Inspector General, United States of America. (clar, )
Blank 5 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: 9/13/2005 Affidavit
Declaration of Special Agent James E. Adams (clar, )
Blank 4 Filed: 8/2/2005, Entered: 8/3/2005 Notice of Hearing on Motion
NOTICE of Hearing on [1] Motion for Return of Property: Motion Hearing set for 9/16/2005 10:00 AM before Honorable District T. S. Ellis III. (agil)
Blank -- Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: 5/4/2005 So Ordered
So Ordered re [3] Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order filed by United States of America, Systems Integration and Management, Inc., M.L. Denese Slaey, Shelley Slaey-Mountjoy, United States General Services Administration Office of the Inspector General . Signed by Judge T. S. Ellis III on 5/4/05. (agil)
Blank 3 Filed: 5/3/2005, Entered: 5/4/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Joint MOTION for a Scheduling Order by Systems Integration and Management, Inc., M.L. Denese Slaey, Shelley Slaey-Mountjoy, United States General Services Administration Office of the Inspector General, United States of America. (agil)
Blank 2 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/25/2005 Memorandum in Support
MEMORANDUM of Law by Systems Integration, M.L. Denese Slaey, Shelley Slaey-Mountjoy in support of [1-1] motion by Shelley Slaey-Mountjoy, M.L. Denese Slaey, Systems Integration for Return of Property, [1-2] motion by Shelley Slaey-Mountjoy, M.L. Denese Slaey, Systems Integration to Unseal the Search Warrant Affidavit of Probable Cause (ctat)
PDF 1 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/25/2005, Terminated: 9/16/2005 Motion for Return of Property
MOTION by Shelley Slaey-Mountjoy, M.L. Denese Slaey, Systems Integration for Return of Property , and by Shelley Slaey-Mountjoy, M.L. Denese Slaey, Systems Integration to Unseal the Search Warrant Affidavit of Probable Cause (ctat)
Blank -- Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/25/2005 Filing Fee Received
Filing Fee Paid; FILING FEE $ 39.00 RECEIPT # 100 180030 (ctat)
Blank -- Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/25/2005 Miscellaneous Document
CASE REFERRED to Mag Judge Theresa C. Buchanan (ctat)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 251 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?