Gosnell v. Sciarini
Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:99-cv-00634-CMH
docket://gov.uscourts.vaed.1-99-cv-00634 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Judges don't know as much about themselves as we do.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Douglas L. Gosnell, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Robert Stanley Powell +1 703 527 6664
v.
No Logo Charles Sciarini, Defendant
Office Alexandria
Filed 5/5/1999
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Want of Prosecution
County Fairfax
Terminated 10/6/1999
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, JURY
  Entries (7) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
Blank 3 Filed: 10/6/1999, Entered: 10/12/1999 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER, Dismissing this case w/out Prejudice pursuant to FRCP 4(m) (ent. & filed) (see Order for details) ( signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton ) Copies Mailed: yes [EOD Date: 10/12/99] (pmil)
Blank -- Filed: 10/6/1999, Entered: 10/12/1999 Terminated Case
Case closed (pmil)
Blank -- Filed: 10/6/1999, Entered: 10/12/1999 Case Assigned/Reassigned
CASE assigned to Judge Claude M. Hilton (pmil)
Blank 2 Filed: 9/14/1999, Entered: 9/16/1999 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER, that the pltfs within 20 days Show Cause, if any they can, why this case should not be dismissed to FRCP 4(m) - ent & filed ( signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton ) Copies Mailed: yes [EOD Date: 9/16/99] (mcke)
Blank -- Filed: 9/2/1999, Entered: 9/2/1999 Docket Annotation
Will get service next week per counsel. (klau)
Blank 1 Filed: 5/5/1999, Entered: 5/6/1999 Complaint
COMPLAINT Filing Fee $ 150.00 Receipt # 100 128605; jury demand (clerk)
Blank -- Filed: 5/5/1999, Entered: 5/6/1999 Set/Clear Flags
Jury Trial Flag (clerk)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 202 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?