USA v. Pacache et al
Alabama Middle District Court, Case No. 2:06-cr-00169-WKW-SRW
District Judge William Keith Watkins, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.almd.2-06-cr-00169-WKW (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
The right information can save you thousands of dollars.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Tommie Brown Hardwick +1 334 223 7280 +1 334 223 7135 tommie.hardwick@usdoj.gov
A. Clark Morris +1 334 223 7280 +2237 223 223 7560 clark.morris@usdoj.gov
Office Montgomery
Filed 7/11/2006
County Chilton
Terminated 1/30/2008
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 846=CD.F
Offense Level 4
21846; CONSPIRACY TO DISTRIBUTE CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE; NLT 10Y or NMT life; NMT $4,000,000 or B; NLT 5 SUP REL; $100 SA; G-LNS; VWPA; FORFEITURE ALLEGATION
Def Custody Status Released
Flags 27BE, AR
  Entries (49) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PDF 543 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: 1/30/2008 Court Filing
ORDER as to Rodrigez Childres granting [537] MOTION to Dismiss Indictment filed by USA; cancelling the 1/31/08 sentencing hearing. Signed by Judge William Keith Watkins on 1/30/08. (ajr, )
PDF 537 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: 1/30/2008, Terminated: 1/30/2008 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss Indictment by USA as to Rodrigez Childres. (Morris, A.)
PDF 486 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/9/2008 Court Filing
ORDER as to Rodrigez Childres; Sentencing set for 1/25/08 is RESET for 1/31/2008 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2E before Honorable William Keith Watkins. Signed by Judge William Keith Watkins on 1/9/08. (ajr, )
PDF 450 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: 10/30/2007 Court Filing
ORDER as to Rodrigez Childres setting Sentencing for 1/25/2008 09:15 AM in Courtroom 2E before Honorable William Keith Watkins; directing that any motion for downward departure be filed on or before the conference with the probation officer. Signed by Judge William Keith Watkins on 10/30/07. (ajr, )
PACER 393 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: 10/16/2007 Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Russ Walker :Change of Plea Hearing as to Rodrigez Childres held on 10/16/2007. Plea entered by Rodrigez Childres (11) Guilty Count 1. (PDF available for court use only) (Court Reporter Mitchell Reisner.) (jct, )
PDF 392 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: 10/16/2007
PLEA AGREEMENT as to Rodrigez Childres (jct, )
PDF 391 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: 10/16/2007 Court Filing
Consent to Enter Guilty Plea before U. S. Magistrate Judge as to Rodrigez Childres (jct, )
Blank -- Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: 10/16/2007
ORAL ORDER that defendant be released and continued under the same conditions previously imposed by the U. S. Magistrate Judge as to Rodrigez Childres. Signed by Judge Susan Russ Walker on 10/16/07. (jct, )
Blank -- Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: 10/16/2007
ORAL ORDER accepting guilty plea and adjudicating defendant guilty as to Count 1 of the Indictment as to Rodrigez Childres. Signed by Judge Susan Russ Walker on 10/16/07. (jct, )
PDF 375 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: 10/12/2007 Court Filing
ORDER as to Rodrigez Childres setting Change of Plea Hearing for 10/16/2007 03:00 PM in Courtroom 5B before Honorable Susan Russ Walker; directing the Clerk to provide a court reporter for this proceeding. Signed by Judge Susan Russ Walker on 10/12/07. (ajr, )
PDF 370 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007
NOTICE OF INTENT TO CHANGE PLEA by Rodrigez Childres (McCord, Tiffany)
PDF 351 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007 Court Filing
ORDER setting out the guilty plea schedule as follows: October 16, 2007, 3:00 p.m. - Cliff Johnson, Rodrigez Childres, William Earl Ulmer and Terrence Antwan Jerome Newkirk; October 17, 2007, 3:00 p.m. - Christopher Iman Ulmer, Demetria Mills, Darnell Montreze Brown, Roger Walton, James Talley and James Earl Hubbard; October 22, 2007, 3:00 p.m. - Cecillo Pacache, Demetrius Terrell Pegues, Charles Daniel Craig, Kowosoky Tywan Christian, Darryl Lamont Brown and Wilmont Timothy Barnett; DIRECTING that notices of intent to change plea shall be filed on or before 7 days prior to the scheduled plea date; that if defendants are ready to enter guilty pleas prior to their scheduled dates, the defendants' attorneys shall notify the court's chambers. Signed by Judge Susan Russ Walker on 10/1/07. (ajr, )
PACER 342 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007 Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Russ Walker :Pretrial Conference as to Cecillo Pacache, Demetrious Terrell Pegues, Cliff Johnson, Terrence Antwan Jerome Newkirk, Charles Daniel Craig, Kowosky Tywan Christian, Christopher Iman Ulmer, Demetria Mills, Darryl Lamont Brown, Darnell Montreze Brown, Rodrigez Childres, Roger Walton, James Earl Hubbard, James Calvin Talley, Wilmont Timothy Barnett, William Earl Ulmer held on 9/28/2007 (PDF available for court use only) (Recording Time 3:07 - 3:24.) (jct, )
PDF 314 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007 Court Filing
ORDER as to Cecillo Pacache, Demetrious Terrell Pegues, Cliff Johnson, Terrence Antwan Jerome Newkirk, Charles Daniel Craig, Kowosky Tywan Christian, Christopher Iman Ulmer, Demetria Mills, Darryl Lamont Brown, Darnell Montreze Brown, Rodrigez Childres, Roger Walton, James Earl Hubbard, James Calvin Talley, Wilmont Timothy Barnett, William Earl Ulmer; Pretrial Conference set for 9/28/2007 8:30 a.m. is RESCHEDULED for 9/28/07 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 5B before Honorable Susan Russ Walker. Signed by Judge Susan Russ Walker on 9/24/07. (ajr, )
PDF 288 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: 6/26/2007 Court Filing
ORDER as to Demetrious Terrell Pegues, Cliff Johnson, Terrence Antwan Jerome Newkirk, Charles Daniel Craig, Kowosky Tywan Christian, Christopher Iman Ulmer, Demetria Mills, Darryl Lamont Brown, Darnell Montreze Brown, Rodrigez Childres, Roger Walton, James Earl Hubbard, James Calvin Talley, Wilmont Timothy Barnett, William Earl Ulmer setting Pretrial Conference for 9/28/2007 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5B before Honorable Susan Russ Walker. Signed by Judge Susan Russ Walker on 6/26/07. (ajr, )
PDF 287 Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: 6/20/2007, Terminated: 6/20/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION STRUCK/TERMINATED: MOTION Reimbursement of Copy Expenses by Rodrigez Childres. (McCord, Tiffany) Modified on 6/25/2007 to strike motion/terminate; voucher inadvertently filed as a motion (snc).
PDF 276 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: 6/7/2007 Court Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Demetrious Terrell Pegues, Cliff Johnson, Terrence Antwan Jerome Newkirk, Charles Daniel Craig, Kowosky Tywan Christian, Christopher Iman Ulmer, Demetria Mills, Darryl Lamont Brown, Darnell Montreze Brown, Rodrigez Childres, Roger Walton, James Earl Hubbard, James Calvin Talley, Wilmont Timothy Barnett, William Earl Ulmer; GRANTING [275] MOTION to Continue trial filed by USA,. Jury Trial set for 8/6/07 is CONTINUED to 11/5/2007 before Honorable William Keith Watkins. Signed by Judge William Keith Watkins on 6/7/07. (ajr, )
PDF 275 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: 6/7/2007, Terminated: 6/7/2007 Motion to Continue Trial
MOTION to Continue trial by USA as to Demetrious Terrell Pegues, Cliff Johnson, Terrence Antwan Jerome Newkirk, Charles Daniel Craig, Kowosky Tywan Christian, Christopher Iman Ulmer, Demetria Mills, Darryl Lamont Brown, Darnell Montreze Brown, Rodrigez Childres, Roger Walton, James Earl Hubbard, James Calvin Talley, Wilmont Timothy Barnett, William Earl Ulmer. (Morris, A.)
PACER 248 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: 5/9/2007 Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Russ Walker :Pretrial Conference as to Demetrious Terrell Pegues, Cliff Johnson, Terrence Antwan Jerome Newkirk, Charles Daniel Craig, Kowosky Tywan Christian, Christopher Iman Ulmer, Darnell Montreze Brown, Rodrigez Childres, James Earl Hubbard, James Calvin Talley, Wilmont Timothy Barnett, William Earl Ulmer held on 5/9/2007 (PDF available for court use only) (Recording Time 8:39 - 8:52.) (jct, )
PDF 227 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: 5/1/2007 Court Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Demetrious Terrell Pegues, Cliff Johnson, Terrence Antwan Jerome Newkirk, Charles Daniel Craig, Kowosky Tywan Christian, Christopher Iman Ulmer, Demetria Mills, Darryl Lamont Brown, Darnell Montreze Brown, Rodrigez Childres, Roger Walton, James Earl Hubbard, James Calvin Talley, Wilmont Timothy Barnett, William Earl Ulmer; granting [219] MOTION to Continue trial filed by Demetrious Terrell Pegues; Jury Trial set for 6/4/07 is RESET for 8/6/2007 before Honorable William Keith Watkins. Signed by Judge William Keith Watkins on 5/1/07. (ajr, )
PDF 226 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: 5/1/2007 Court Filing
ORDER as to Demetrious Terrell Pegues, Cliff Johnson, Terrence Antwan Jerome Newkirk, Charles Daniel Craig, Kowosky Tywan Christian, Christopher Iman Ulmer, Demetria Mills, Darryl Lamont Brown, Darnell Montreze Brown, Rodrigez Childres, Roger Walton, James Earl Hubbard, James Calvin Talley, Wilmont Timothy Barnett, William Earl Ulmer VACATING [223] Order to Continue - Ends of Justice. Signed by Judge William Keith Watkins on 5/1/07. (ajr, )
PDF 188 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: 4/4/2007 Court Filing
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER as to Demetrious Terrell Pegues, Cliff Johnson, Terrence Antwan Jerome Newkirk, Charles Daniel Craig, Kowosky Tywan Christian, Darryl Lamont Brown, Darnell Montreze Brown, Rodrigez Childres, Roger Walton, James Earl Hubbard, James Calvin Talley, Wilmont Timothy Barnett, William Earl Ulmer setting Jury Selection for 6/4/2007 before Honorable William Keith Watkins. Jury Trial (ETT 1 month) set for 6/4/2007 before Honorable William Keith Watkins. Pretrial Conference set for 5/9/2007 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5B before Honorable Susan Russ Walker. Voir Dire due by 5/29/2007; Proposed Jury Instructions due by 5/29/2007; Motions in Limine due by 5/29/2007; Notice of Intent to Change Plea due by noon on 5/23/2007. Signed by Judge Susan Russ Walker on 4/4/07. (ajr, )
PACER 178 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: 4/3/2007 Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Russ Walker :Pretrial Conference as to Demetrious Terrell Pegues, Cliff Johnson, Terrence Antwan Jerome Newkirk, Charles Daniel Craig, Kowosky Tywan Christian, Darryl Lamont Brown, Darnell Montreze Brown, Rodrigez Childres, Roger Walton, James Earl Hubbard, James Calvin Talley, Wilmont Timothy Barnett, William Earl Ulmer held on 4/2/2007 (PDF available for court use only) (Recording Time 3:35 - 3:54.) (jct, )
PDF 156 Filed: 3/28/2007, Entered: 3/29/2007 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Demetrious Terrell Pegues, Cliff Johnson, Charles Daniel Craig, Kowosky Tywan Christian, Christopher Iman Ulmer, Darryl Lamont Brown, Darnell Montreze Brown, Rodrigez Childres, James Earl Hubbard, James Calvin Talley, Wilmont Timothy Barnett, William Earl Ulmer GRANTING [146] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions filed by Demetrious Terrell Pegues, [135] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions filed by Rodrigez Childres, [148] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions filed by Wilmont Timothy Barnett, [132] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions filed by James Calvin Talley, [138] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions filed by Christopher Iman Ulmer,, [130] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions filed by William Earl Ulmer, [136] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions filed by James Earl Hubbard, [140] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions filed by Darryl Lamont Brown, [139] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pre-trial Motions filed by Charles Daniel Craig, [144] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pre-Trial Motions filed by Kowosky Tywan Christian, [141] MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by Cliff Johnson, [151] MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by Darnell Montreze Brown to the extent that defendants' pretrial motions shall be filed on or before 5/2/07. Signed by Judge Susan Russ Walker on 3/28/07. (ajr,
PDF 135 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: 3/19/2007, Terminated: 3/28/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions by Rodrigez Childres. (McCord, Tiffany)
PDF 121 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: 3/12/2007 Court Filing
ORDER as to Kowosky Tywan Christian, Christopher Iman Ulmer, Darryl Lamont Brown, Darnell Montreze Brown, Rodrigez Childres, Roger Walton, James Earl Hubbard, James Calvin Talley, Wilmont Timothy Barnett Pretrial Conference set for 4/4/07 is RESET for 4/2/2007 03:00 PM in Courtroom 5B before Honorable Susan Russ Walker. Signed by Judge Susan Russ Walker on 3/12/07. (ajr, )
PDF 102 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: 3/6/2007 Court Filing
ORDER granting [93] Motion to Withdraw Document as to Rodrigez Childres (11)withdrawing [22] Motion for Detention Hearing as to Rodrigez Childres (11); . Signed by Judge Susan Russ Walker on 3/6/07. (ajr, )
PDF 99 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 3/2/2007 Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Russ Walker :Bond Hearing as to Rodrigez Childres held on 3/2/2007 (Recording Time 10:50 - 10:54.) (jct, )
PACER 98 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 3/2/2007 Court Filing
ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Rodrigez Childres (11) $25,000.00 non-surety . Signed by Judge Susan Russ Walker on 3/2/07. (jct, )
PACER 97 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 3/2/2007
Non-Surety Bond Entered as to Rodrigez Childres in amount of $ 25,000.00, (jct, )
PDF 93 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: 3/1/2007, Terminated: 3/6/2007 Motion to Withdraw Document
MOTION to Withdraw Document [22] MOTION for Detention Hearing by USA as to Rodrigez Childres. (Morris, A.)
PDF 82 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: 2/28/2007 Court Filing
CJA 20 as to Rodrigez Childres: Appointment of Attorney Tiffany Bullard McCord for Rodrigez Childres. Signed by Judge Susan Russ Walker on 2/28/07. (ajr, )
Blank -- Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: 3/7/2007 Set/Reset Hearings
TRIAL DEADLINES UPDATED as to Rodrigez Childres: Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 6/4/07 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2E before Honorable W. Keith Watkins.(ajr)
Blank -- Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: 2/27/2007
Case as to Cecillo Pacache, Demetrious Terrell Pegues, Cliff Johnson, Terrence Antwan Jerome Newkirk, Charles Daniel Craig, Kowosky Tywan Christian, Christopher Iman Ulmer, Demetria Mills, Darryl Lamont Brown, Darnell Montreze Brown, Rodrigez Childres, Roger Walton, James Earl Hubbard, James Calvin Talley, Wilmont Timothy Barnett, William Earl Ulmer Reassigned to Judge William Keith Watkins. Judge W. Harold Albritton, III no longer assigned to the case. (snc)
PDF 71 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007 Court Filing
Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing as to Christopher Iman Ulmer, Darryl Lamont Brown, Rodrigez Childres, James Calvin Talley, Wilmont Timothy Barnett Detention Hearing set for 3/1/2007 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5B before Honorable Susan Russ Walker.. Signed by Judge Susan Russ Walker on 2/23/2007. (sql, )
PDF 70 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007 Court Filing
ORDER ON ARRAIGNMENT (incorporating Order to Continue - Ends of Justice) as to Christopher Iman Ulmer, Darryl Lamont Brown, Darnell Montreze Brown, Rodrigez Childres, Roger Walton, James Earl Hubbard, James Calvin Talley, Wilmont Timothy Barnett Pretrial Conference set for 4/4/2007 03:00 PM in Courtroom 5B before Honorable Susan Russ Walker. Jury Selection set for 6/4/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2C before Honorable W. Harold Albritton III. Jury Trial set for 6/4/2007 before Honorable W. Harold Albritton III. Pretrial Motions due by 4/2/2007. Response to Motion due by 4/16/2007. Discovery due by 3/2/2007.. Signed by Judge Susan Russ Walker on 2/23/2007. (sql, ) Modified on 5/3/2007 to reflect Continuance - Ends of Justice( snc).
PDF 48 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007 Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Russ Walker :Arraignment as to Rodrigez Childres (11) Count 1 held on 2/21/2007, Initial Appearance as to Rodrigez Childres held on 2/21/2007, Plea entered by Rodrigez Childres (11) Not Guilty on counts 1. (Recording Time 2:10 - 2:36.) (jct, )
PACER 47 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007
CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Rodrigez Childres (jct, )
PDF 22 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007, Terminated: 3/6/2007 Motion for Detention
MOTION for Detention Hearing by USA as to Rodrigez Childres. (Morris, A.)
Blank -- Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007
ORDER (ORAL) granting Oral Motion to Appoint Counsel: Appointed Tiffany Bullard McCord as to Rodrigez Childres (11). Signed by Judge Susan Russ Walker on 2/21/07. (jct, )
Blank -- Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007, Terminated: 2/21/2007 Oral Motion to Appoint Counsel
ORAL MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Rodrigez Childres. (jct, )
Blank -- Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007
Case unsealed as to Christopher Iman Ulmer, Darryl Lamont Brown, Darnell Montreze Brown, Rodrigez Childres, James Earl Hubbard, James Calvin Talley pursuant to USM's Notice of Arrest of said defendants. (war, )
Blank -- Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007 Arrest
Arrest of Christopher Iman Ulmer, Darryl Lamont Brown, Darnell Montreze Brown, Rodrigez Childres, James Earl Hubbard, James Calvin Talley, Wilmont Timothy Barnett (jct, )
Blank -- Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007 Indictment Unsealed
INDICTMENT UNSEALED as to Cecillo Pacache, Demetrious Terrell Pegues, Cliff Johnson, Terrence Antwan Jerome Newkirk, Charles Daniel Craig, Kowosky Tywan Christian, Christopher Iman Ulmer, Demetria Mills, Darryl Lamont Brown, Darnell Montreze Brown, Rodrigez Childres, Roger Walton, James Earl Hubbard, James Calvin Talley, Wilmont Timothy Barnett, William Earl Ulmer (pursuant to 2/16/07 order in Cr Misc No. 1053) (snc)
Blank -- Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: 12/4/2006
Case as to Cecillo Pacache, Demetrious Terrell Pegues, Cliff Johnson, Terrence Antwan Jerome Newkirk, Charles Daniel Craig, Kowosky Tywan Christian, Christopher Iman Ulmer, Demetria Mills, Darryl Lamont Brown, Darnell Montreze Brown, Rodrigez Childres, Roger Walton, James Earl Hubbard, James Calvin Talley, Wilmont Timothy Barnett, William Earl Ulmer Reassigned to Judge Susan Russ Walker. Judge Delores R. Boyd no longer assigned to the case. (jct, )
Blank -- Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: 7/14/2006
***Set Magistrate and CRD Flags as to Cecillo Pacache, Demetrious Terrell Pegues, Cliff Johnson, Terrence Antwan Jerome Newkirk, Charles Daniel Craig, Kowosky Tywan Christian, Christopher Iman Ulmer, Demetria Mills, Darryl Lamont Brown, Darnell Montreze Brown, Rodrigez Childres, Roger Walton, James Earl Hubbard, James Calvin Talley, Wilmont Timothy Barnett, William Earl Ulmer (ajr, ) Modified on 7/17/2008 (jct, ).
PDF 1 Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: 7/14/2006 Indictment (Sealed)
INDICTMENT as to Cecillo Pacache (1) count(s) 1, Demetrious Terrell Pegues (2) count(s) 1, 26, Cliff Johnson (3) count(s) 1, 12, 13, 15, 16-32, Terrence Antwan Jerome Newkirk (4) count(s) 1, 15, 16-17, 20, Charles Daniel Craig (5) count(s) 1, 19, 24-25, 27, 32, Kowosky Tywan Christian (6) count(s) 1, 11, Christopher Iman Ulmer (7) count(s) 1, 10-11, 14, 29-30, Demetria Mills (8) count(s) 1, 23, 28, 31, Darryl Lamont Brown (9) count(s) 1, 3, 4, Darnell Montreze Brown (10) count(s) 1, 6, Rodrigez Childres (11) count(s) 1, Roger Walton (12) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 5, James Earl Hubbard (13) count(s) 1, 9, James Calvin Talley (14) count(s) 1, Wilmont Timothy Barnett (15) count(s) 1, 8, William Earl Ulmer (16) count(s) 1, 7. (ajr, ) Modified on 7/24/2006 (snc). Modified on 2/16/2007 (war, ). Modified on 2/16/2007 (war, ). Modified on 1/30/2008 (ajr, ). Modified on 6/12/2008 (snc,).
Blank -- Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: 7/14/2006 Order on Motion to Seal
ORDER (entered in Cr Misc No. 1053) granting [1] Motion to Seal Indictment as to Cecillo Pacache (1), Demetrious Terrell Pegues (2), Cliff Johnson (3), Terrence Antwan Jerome Newkirk (4), Charles Daniel Craig (5), Kowosky Tywan Christian (6), Christopher Iman Ulmer (7), Demetria Mills (8), Darryl Lamont Brown (9), Darnell Montreze Brown (10), Rodrigez Childres (11), Roger Walton (12), James Earl Hubbard (13), James Calvin Talley (14), Wilmont Timothy Barnett (15), William Earl Ulmer (16). Signed by Judge Vanzetta P. McPherson on 7/11/06. (ajr, ) Modified on 7/14/2006 (ajr, ). Modified on 7/24/2006 (snc) to correct docket entry.
Blank -- Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: 7/14/2006 Terminated:
MOTION to Seal Indictment (filed in Cr Misc No. 1053) by USA as to Cecillo Pacache, Demetrious Terrell Pegues, Cliff Johnson, Terrence Antwan Jerome Newkirk, Charles Daniel Craig, Kowosky Tywan Christian, Christopher Iman Ulmer, Demetria Mills, Darryl Lamont Brown, Darnell Montreze Brown, Rodrigez Childres, Roger Walton, James Earl Hubbard, James Calvin Talley, Wilmont Timothy Barnett, William Earl Ulmer. (ajr, ) Modified on 7/14/2006 (ajr, ). Modified on 7/14/2006 (ajr, ).

Statistics

This case has been viewed 121 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?