Johnson v. Alabama State University et al
Alabama Middle District Court, Case No. 2:07-cv-00101-MEF-SRW
District Judge Mark E. Fuller, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.almd.2-07-cv-00101-MEF (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
The right information can save you thousands of dollars.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Jalonda Johnson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ARENDALL & ARNOLD

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David R Arendall +1 205 252 1550 +1 205 252 1556 dra@arendalllaw.com
Allen Durham Arnold +1 205 252 1550 +1 205 252 1556 ada@arendalllaw.com
No Logo Anwar Diop, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Donald Gordon Madison +1 334 263 4800 +1 334 265 8511 dgmadison@bellsouth.net
No Logo Alabama State University, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by THOMAS MEANS GILLIS & SEAY, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Latasha Antoinette Meadows +1 334 270 1033 +1 334 260 9396 lameadows@tmgslaw.com
Kenneth L Thomas +1 334 270 1033 +1 334 260 9396 klthomas@tmgslaw.com
No Logo Anwar Diop, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Donald Gordon Madison +1 334 263 4800 +1 334 265 8511 dgmadison@bellsouth.net
No Logo Jalonda Johnson, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by ARENDALL & ARNOLD

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David R Arendall +1 205 252 1550 +1 205 252 1556 dra@arendalllaw.com
Allen Durham Arnold +1 205 252 1550 +1 205 252 1556 ada@arendalllaw.com
No Logo Alabama State University, Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by THOMAS MEANS GILLIS & SEAY, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Latasha Antoinette Meadows +1 334 270 1033 +1 334 260 9396 lameadows@tmgslaw.com
No Logo Anwar Diop, Cross Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Donald Gordon Madison +1 334 263 4800 +1 334 265 8511 dgmadison@bellsouth.net
Office Montgomery
Filed 2/6/2007
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Montgomery
Terminated 7/15/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (54) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PDF 46 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Court Filing
FINAL JUDGMENT that this case is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice, each party to bear his, her or its own costs and expenses. The Clerk of court is directed to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the FRCP and close this file. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 7/15/08. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Appeals Checklist) (Term: PT-8/28/08; JT-9/29/08)(sl, )
PDF 45 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Alabama State University, Anwar Diop. (Meadows, Latasha)
PDF 44 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008
STIPULATION of Dismissal - Joint by Jalonda Johnson. (Arnold, Allen)
PDF 43 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Alabama State University. (Meadows, Latasha)
PDF 42 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Jalonda Johnson. (Arnold, Allen)
PDF 41 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: 6/5/2008 Court Filing
ORDERED that: (1) plaintiff's claims against defendant Anwar Diop, Counts Two and Three of plaintiff's Amended and Restated Complaint are dismissed with prejudice; (2) defendant Anwar Diop's counterclaims against plaintiff, Counts One, Two, and Three, are dismissed with prejudice; (3) Anwar Diop remains a party to this action by virtue of his cross claims against Alabama State University. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 6/5/08. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Appeals Checklist)(sl, )
PDF 40 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008 Court Filing
ORDERED that the [35] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Cross Claim Complaint be submitted without oral argument on 6/24/08 as further set out in order. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 6/3/08. (sl, )
PDF 39 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008 Court Filing
ORDERED that the [33] MOTION for Summary Judgment be submitted without oral argument on 6/24/2008 as further set out in order. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 6/3/08. (sl, )
PDF 38 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008
STIPULATION of Dismissal - PARTIAL - JOINT by Jalonda Johnson. (Arnold, Allen)
PDF 37 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support of [33] Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Alabama State University. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3-15)(Meadows, Latasha) Modified on 6/2/2008 to create a line to [33] Motion for Summary Judgment (sl, ).
PDF 36 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008, Terminated: 7/15/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
[STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD. THIS IS A DUPLICATE OF [33] MOTION] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Complaint by Alabama State University. (Meadows, Latasha) Modified on 6/2/2008 (sl, ).
PDF 35 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008, Terminated: 7/15/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
MOTION for Summary Judgment on Cross Claim Complaint by Alabama State University. (Meadows, Latasha)
PDF 34 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Alabama State University. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2-3, # (3) Exhibit 4, # (4) Exhibit 5-11)(Meadows, Latasha)
PDF 33 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008, Terminated: 7/15/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Alabama State University. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Meadows, Latasha)
PDF 32 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: 5/28/2008
STIPULATION of Dismissal JOINT PARTIAL STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Jalonda Johnson, Anwar Diop. (Arnold, Allen)
PDF 31 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: 5/20/2008 Court Filing
ORDERED that: (1) plaintiff's [28] partial motion to dismiss is denied, with leave to refile. On or before 5/26/08, the plaintiff shall file a joint stipulation of dismissal that complies with Rule 41(a)(1) and CM/ECF Civil Administrative Procedure II.C.3.; (2) the parties' [29] Amended partial motion to dismiss is denied, with leave to refile. On or before 5/26/08, the plaintiff shall file a joint stipulation of dismissal that complies with Rule 41(a)(1) and CM/ECF Civil Administrative Procedure II.C.3. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 5/20/08. (sl, )
Blank -- Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008
NOTICE of Docket Text Correction re: [28] Motion to Remove "joint" from the Motion to Dismiss; terminated "Motion to Consolidate Cases", "Motion for Contempt", "Motion to Continue" and "Motion for Default Judgment" incorrectly e-filed with the [29] Joint MOTION to Dismiss; [30] Amended Document is a duplicate of [29] Motion. (sl, )
PDF 30 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008
[THIS IS A DUPLICATE OF [29]] AMENDED DOCUMENT by Jalonda Johnson, Anwar Diop. - PARTIAL - AMENDED. (Arnold, Allen) Modified on 5/13/2008 (sl, ).
PDF 29 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008, Terminated: 5/20/2008 Motion to Dismiss
Joint MOTION to Dismiss - PARTIAL by Jalonda Johnson, Anwar Diop. (Arnold, Allen) Modified on 5/13/2008 to terminate additional motions incorrectly e-filed. (sl, ).
PDF 28 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008, Terminated: 5/20/2008 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss Partial by Jalonda Johnson. (Arnold, Allen) Modified on 5/13/2008 to remove "Joint"(sl, ).
PDF 27 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008
ANSWER to [14] Crossclaim by Alabama State University.(Meadows, Latasha)
PDF 26 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008 Court Filing
ORDERED as follows: (1) plaintiff's [25] partial motion to dismiss is granted in part and denied in part; (2) Count One of the Amended Complaint is dismissed without prejudice as further set out in order. Signed by Judge Mark E. Fuller on 2/14/08. (sl, )
PDF 25 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: 2/11/2008, Terminated: 2/14/2008 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss PARTIAL by Jalonda Johnson. (Arnold, Allen)
PDF 24 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jalonda Johnson re [19] Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Arendall, David)
PDF 23 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/13/2007
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Anwar Diop. (Madison, Donald)
PDF 22 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/10/2007
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Alabama State University. (Meadows, Latasha)
PDF 21 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007
Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Anwar Diop. Corporate Disclosures due by 12/20/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Standing Order and Sample Format)(sl, )
PDF 20 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007
Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Alabama State University Corporate Disclosures due by 12/20/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Standing Order and Sample Format)(sl, )
PDF 19 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007
Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Jalonda Johnson. Corporate Disclosures due by 12/20/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Standing Order and Sample Format)(sl, )
PDF 18 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: 6/25/2007 Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 8/28/2008 in Chambers of United States District Judge Marke E. Fuller, Montgomery, AL; Jury Trial set for term of court commencing on 9/29/2008; Amended Pleadings due by 9/5/2007; Discovery due by 8/14/2008; Dispositive Motions due by 5/30/2008; Mediation Notice due by 6/25/2008. Signed by Judge Mark E. Fuller on 6/25/07. (sl, )
PDF 17 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Arendall, David)
PDF 16 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007
Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant ANSWER to Counterclaim by Jalonda Johnson.(Arnold, Allen)
Blank -- Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007 Add and Terminate Attorneys
***Attorney David Randall Arendall and Allen Durham Arnold added for Jalonda Johnson. (dmn) (see Doc. [16] for pdf)
PDF 15 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: 5/15/2007 Court Filing
ORDER directing parties to file the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan as soon as practicable but not later than 6/15/2007. Signed by Judge Mark E. Fuller on 5/15/07. (sl, )
PDF 14 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007
Anwar Diop ANSWER to [8] Amended Complaint, Anwar Diop ANSWER to Complaint, First CROSSCLAIM against Alabama State University, Preliminary COUNTERCLAIM against Alabama State University by Anwar Diop.(Madison, Donald)
Blank -- Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/15/2007 Add and Terminate Attorneys
***Attorney Donald Gordon Madison for Anwar Diop added pursuant to [14] Answer filed on 5/14/07. (sl, )
PDF 13 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/23/2007 Court Filing
ORDER granting [12] Motion for Carter H. Dukes and Kimberly W. Geisler to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Mark E. Fuller on 4/23/07. (sl, )
Blank -- Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/23/2007
*** Attorney Carter H. Dukes terminated pursuant to [13] Order entered on 4/23/07. (sl, )
PDF 12 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007, Terminated: 4/23/2007 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Alabama State University. (Dukes, Carter)
PDF 11 Filed: 4/6/2007, Entered: 4/6/2007 Court Filing
ORDER granting [10] Motion to Amend/Correct Agent for Service of Process for Defendant Anwar Diop . Signed by Judge Mark E. Fuller on 4/6/07. (vma, )
PDF 10 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: 4/2/2007, Terminated: 4/6/2007 Motion to Amend/Correct
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Agent for Service of Process for Defendant Anwar Diop by Jalonda Johnson, Alabama State University. (Dukes, Carter)
PDF 9 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: 3/29/2007
ANSWER to Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Alabama State University.(Dukes, Carter)
Blank -- Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: 3/30/2007 Add and Terminate Attorneys
***Attorney Kenneth Lamar Thomas and Latasha A Meadows added for Alabama State University. (dmn) (see Doc. [9] for pdf)
PDF 8 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007
NOTICE by Jalonda Johnson of filing of Amended and Restated Complaint (Attachments: # (1))(Arendall, David)
Blank -- Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/16/2007 Amended Complaint
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Alabama State University, Anwar Diop, filed by Jalonda Johnson. (This document has no pdf attached. See [8] for pdf.)(sl, )
PDF 7 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: 3/8/2007 Court Filing
ORDER granting [6] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to and including 3/29/07. Signed by Judge Mark E. Fuller on 3/8/07. (sl, )
PDF 6 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007, Terminated: 3/8/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint by Alabama State University. (Dukes, Carter)
Blank -- Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/26/2007 Add and Terminate Attorneys
***Attorney Carter H. Dukes added for Alabama State University. (dmn) (see Doc. [6] for pdf)
PDF 5 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007
Alias Summons issued as to Anwar Diop; summons and complaint returned/mailed to counsel for service. (dmn)
PDF 4 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: 2/8/2007
Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by D. McDonell for Anwar Diop served on 2/7/2007, answer due 2/27/2007. (dmn)
PDF 3 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: 2/8/2007
Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by D. McDonell for Alabama State University served on 2/7/2007, answer due 2/27/2007. (dmn)
PDF 2 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: 2/6/2007
Summons Issued; summons and complaint mailed by CMRRR to Alabama State University, and Anwar Diop. (dmn)
PDF 1 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: 2/6/2007
COMPLAINT against Alabama State University, and Anwar Diop (Filing fee $350.00 receipt number 113017), filed by Jalonda Johnson. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A; #(2) Exhibit B) (dmn)
Blank -- Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: 2/6/2007 Jury Demand
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jalonda Johnson. (dmn) (This document has no pdf attached, see Doc. [1] for pdf.)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 115 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?