WATERS et al v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:05-vv-00872-UNJ
docket://gov.uscourts.cofc.1-05-vv-00872 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
This docket can only tell you so much. Get the rest.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo CANDACE WATERS, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Conway, Homer & Chin-Caplan, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Thao Da Ho +1 617 695 1990 +1 617 695 0880
No Logo ROBERT WATERS, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Conway, Homer & Chin-Caplan, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Thao Da Ho +1 617 695 1990 +1 617 695 0880
No Logo SANDRA WATERS, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Conway, Homer & Chin-Caplan, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Thao Da Ho +1 617 695 1990 +1 617 695 0880
United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Traci R. Patton +1 202 353 1589 +1 202 616 4310 traci.patton@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 8/8/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 492 -
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
  Entries (9) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
Blank 8 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/12/2006 Notice Regarding Statutory Requirement
ORDER re: the statutory 420-day time period for the special master's issuance of a decision in this case has expired. Petitioner may submit a notice continuing or withdrawing the petition and such notice shall be filed within 30 days. Signed by Special Master George L. Hastings. (tjk, )
Blank 7 Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: 4/10/2006 Order Suspending Case 180 Days
ORDER re: the 240-day period for issuance of the special master's decision in this case has expired. Upon petitioner's motion, proceedings in this case are hereby formally suspended pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 300aa-12(d)(3)(C) for up to 180 days, and, thus, the final due date for the special master's decision in this case is formally suspended - for an indefinite period of time, but for no longer then 180 days. Signed by Special Master Denise Kathryn Vowell. (mij, )
Blank 6 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: 11/10/2005 Respondent's Report
Respondent's Report, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 11/09/05. (tjk, )
Blank 5 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/18/2005 Motion to Substitute Attorney (Consented)
Consented MOTION to Substitute Attorney Thao Ho in place of Robert Waters and Sandra Waters, parents of Candace Waters, a minor filed by ROBERT WATERS, SANDRA WATERS, CANDACE WATERS.Service: 10/12/05. (tjk, )
Blank -- Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/18/2005 Add and Terminate Attorneys
***Attorney Thao Da Ho for CANDACE WATERS; ROBERT WATERS and SANDRA WATERS added. (tjk, )
Blank 4 Filed: 8/31/2005, Entered: 9/5/2005 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Traci R. Patton for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 8/31/05.(tjk, )
Blank 3 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005 Notice Regarding Omnibus Autism Proceeding
Notice Regarding Omnibus Autism Proceeding. Signed by Special Master George L. Hastings. (tjk, )
Blank 2 Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: 8/10/2005 Notice of Assignment
NOTICE of Assignment to Special Master George L. Hastings. (tjk, )
Blank 1 Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: 8/10/2005 Petition
PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES [Filed with Notice to Defer Proceedings in Autism Case], ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 063378) , filed by ROBERT WATERS, SANDRA WATERS, CANDACE WATERS.Respondents Report Due by 11/7/2005.(tjk, )

Statistics

This case has been viewed 62 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?