Acay Lampkins v. U.S.A.
Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:96-cv-00266-LON
District Judge Joseph J. Longobardi, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.ded.1-96-cv-00266 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
This docket can only tell you so much. Get the rest.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
United States of America, Respondent
No Logo Acay NMN Lampkins, Movant
Office Wilmington
Filed 5/22/1996
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 510 - Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2255 Motion to Vacate Sentence
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 5/19/1997
Origin 4
Reopened 4/11/1997
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case CR92-68[USDC/DE]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (7) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
Blank -- Filed: 5/19/1997, Entered: 5/27/1997 Terminated Case
Case closed----See Court's order dated 5/19/97 in CR 92-68. (bkb)
Blank -- Filed: 4/11/1997, Entered: 5/9/1997 Case Reopened
Case reopened (bkb)
Blank -- Filed: 4/10/1997, Entered: 5/1/1997 Terminated Case
Case closed (bkb)
Blank -- Filed: 4/7/1997, Entered: 4/11/1997 Case Reopened
Case reopened (bkb)
Blank -- Filed: 3/31/1997, Entered: 4/8/1997 Terminated Case
Case closed (bkb)
Blank -- Filed: 5/29/1996, Entered: 6/7/1996 Case Assigned/Reassigned
CASE assigned to Judge Joseph J. Longobardi. see CR 92-68 for all entries. (ds)
Blank -- Filed: 5/22/1996, Entered: 5/23/1996 Remark
Case opened for statistical purposes; see CR 92-68 for all entries. (dab)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 14 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?