Ardito, et al v. City of Providence, et al
Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00155-T
District Judge Ernest C. Torres, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.rid.1-03-cv-00155-T (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
The right information can save you thousands of dollars.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Andrew Mignanelli, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Marc B. Gursky +2944 294 294 4700 +2944 294 294 4702 rilaborlaw@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by harschlawoffice.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jennifer Azevedo +4544 454 454 4466 +3513 351 351 3914 azevedolaw@yahoo.com
No Logo Daniel A. Gonzales, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Marc B. Gursky +2944 294 294 4700 +2944 294 294 4702 rilaborlaw@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by harschlawoffice.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jennifer Azevedo +4544 454 454 4466 +3513 351 351 3914 azevedolaw@yahoo.com
No Logo Derek A. Ardito, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Marc B. Gursky +2944 294 294 4700 +2944 294 294 4702 rilaborlaw@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by harschlawoffice.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jennifer Azevedo +4544 454 454 4466 +3513 351 351 3914 azevedolaw@yahoo.com
No Logo Elizabeth A. Pedchenko, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Marc B. Gursky +2944 294 294 4700 +2944 294 294 4702 rilaborlaw@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by harschlawoffice.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jennifer Azevedo +4544 454 454 4466 +3513 351 351 3914 azevedolaw@yahoo.com
No Logo Ernest R. Forlini, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Marc B. Gursky +2944 294 294 4700 +2944 294 294 4702 rilaborlaw@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by harschlawoffice.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jennifer Azevedo +4544 454 454 4466 +3513 351 351 3914 azevedolaw@yahoo.com
No Logo James D. Annis, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Marc B. Gursky +2944 294 294 4700 +2944 294 294 4702 rilaborlaw@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by harschlawoffice.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jennifer Azevedo +4544 454 454 4466 +3513 351 351 3914 azevedolaw@yahoo.com
No Logo Jerome Musco, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Marc B. Gursky +2944 294 294 4700 +2944 294 294 4702 rilaborlaw@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by harschlawoffice.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jennifer Azevedo +4544 454 454 4466 +3513 351 351 3914 azevedolaw@yahoo.com
No Logo Louis J. Gianfrancesco, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Marc B. Gursky +2944 294 294 4700 +2944 294 294 4702 rilaborlaw@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by harschlawoffice.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jennifer Azevedo +4544 454 454 4466 +3513 351 351 3914 azevedolaw@yahoo.com
No Logo Michael . Sullivan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Marc B. Gursky +2944 294 294 4700 +2944 294 294 4702 rilaborlaw@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by harschlawoffice.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jennifer Azevedo +4544 454 454 4466 +3513 351 351 3914 azevedolaw@yahoo.com
No Logo Ralph A. Caraccia, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Marc B. Gursky +2944 294 294 4700 +2944 294 294 4702 rilaborlaw@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by harschlawoffice.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jennifer Azevedo +4544 454 454 4466 +3513 351 351 3914 azevedolaw@yahoo.com
No Logo Robert E. Braddock, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Marc B. Gursky +2944 294 294 4700 +2944 294 294 4702 rilaborlaw@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by harschlawoffice.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jennifer Azevedo +4544 454 454 4466 +3513 351 351 3914 azevedolaw@yahoo.com
No Logo Stephen N. Frechette, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Marc B. Gursky +2944 294 294 4700 +2944 294 294 4702 rilaborlaw@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by harschlawoffice.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jennifer Azevedo +4544 454 454 4466 +3513 351 351 3914 azevedolaw@yahoo.com
No Logo Travis W. McCusker, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Marc B. Gursky +2944 294 294 4700 +2944 294 294 4702 rilaborlaw@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by harschlawoffice.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jennifer Azevedo +4544 454 454 4466 +3513 351 351 3914 azevedolaw@yahoo.com
No Logo Troy D. Lambert, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Marc B. Gursky +2944 294 294 4700 +2944 294 294 4702 rilaborlaw@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by harschlawoffice.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jennifer Azevedo +4544 454 454 4466 +3513 351 351 3914 azevedolaw@yahoo.com
v.
No Logo City of Providence, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Providence

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Joseph M. Fernandez +4 217 740 x333 +3517 351 351 7596 jfernandez@providenceri.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Little, Medeiros, Kinder, Bulman & Whitney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Sara A. Rapport +2728 272 272 8080 +5213 521 521 3555 srapport@lmkbw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tucker and Associates, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Bruce D. Todesco +8438 843 843 8400 +8438 843 843 8401 bdt42@verizon.net
No Logo David N. Cicilline, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Providence

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Joseph M. Fernandez +4 217 740 x333 +3517 351 351 7596 jfernandez@providenceri.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Little, Medeiros, Kinder, Bulman & Whitney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Sara A. Rapport +2728 272 272 8080 +5213 521 521 3555 srapport@lmkbw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tucker and Associates, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Bruce D. Todesco +8438 843 843 8400 +8438 843 843 8401 bdt42@verizon.net
No Logo Dean Esserman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Providence

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Joseph M. Fernandez +4 217 740 x333 +3517 351 351 7596 jfernandez@providenceri.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Little, Medeiros, Kinder, Bulman & Whitney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Sara A. Rapport +2728 272 272 8080 +5213 521 521 3555 srapport@lmkbw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tucker and Associates, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Bruce D. Todesco +8438 843 843 8400 +8438 843 843 8401 bdt42@verizon.net
No Logo Providence Police Department, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Providence

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Joseph M. Fernandez +4 217 740 x333 +3517 351 351 7596 jfernandez@providenceri.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Little, Medeiros, Kinder, Bulman & Whitney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Sara A. Rapport +2728 272 272 8080 +5213 521 521 3555 srapport@lmkbw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tucker and Associates, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Bruce D. Todesco +8438 843 843 8400 +8438 843 843 8401 bdt42@verizon.net
Office Providence
Filed 4/25/2003
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Notice of Removal - Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Providence
Terminated 1/13/2004
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case PC03-2115[RI Superior-Prov.]
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, RWL
  Entries (69) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
Blank 42 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 6/30/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 5, 2003 before Chief Judge Torres. Court Reporter: Angela Reynolds. (Leyva, Lucia)
Blank 41 Filed: 12/27/2004, Entered: 12/28/2004 Exhibit Receipt
Additional Defendant's Exhibit Receipt (Fernandes, D)
Blank 40 Filed: 11/4/2004, Entered: 11/4/2004
DEFENDANT'S Exhibit Receipt (Fernandes, D)
Blank 39 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: 11/1/2004
Jetter faxed to Attorney Sara Rapport requesting the retrieval of exhibits. (Fernandes, D)
Blank 38 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: 11/1/2004
Letter faxed to Attorney Marc Gursky requesting the retrieval of exhibits. (Fernandes, D)
Blank 37 Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: 6/7/2004 Court Filing
ORDER AWARDING ATTONREYS' FEES: Plaintiffs' are hereby awarded attorneys' fees and costs in the amount of $22,500.00 (signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres) [faxed to all counsel of record] (Jackson, R)
Blank 36 Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: 6/7/2004 Court Filing
ORDER: The Court hereby accepts the R and R of Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen dated 5/12/04 pursuant to 28 USC 686(b)(1) in the absence of any objection, (signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres) [faxed to all counsel of record] (Jackson, R)
Blank -- Filed: 6/2/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004
REFERRED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LOVEGREEN DATED 5/12/04 to Chambers (no objections rec'd) (Jackson, R)
Blank 35 Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: 5/12/2004 Court Filing
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen Recommending that the district court award to the plaintiffs, attorneys' fees and costs in the amount of $22,500.00: ; Motion no longer referred Objections to and R due by 6/1/04; mailed to counsel (Theall, J)
Blank -- Filed: 4/20/2004, Entered: 4/20/2004
Motion hearing re: [26-1] motion for Attorney Fees and Costs at 10:00 5/12/04 before MJ Lovegreen (Theall, J)
Blank -- Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004
Settlement conference set on 9:30 4/16/04 Before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen - moved from 4/12/04 per MJ Lovegreen (Theall, J)
Blank -- Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: 3/18/2004
Settlement conference set on 2:00 4/12/04 Before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen - moved from 4/1/04 per Atty Azevedo (Theall, J)
Blank -- Filed: 3/16/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004
Settlement conference on issue of Counsel Fees and Costs set on 2:00 4/1/04 Before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (Theall, J)
Blank 34 Filed: 3/10/2004, Entered: 3/10/2004 Court Filing
ORDER granting in part, denying in part [32-1] motion to Vacate [30-1] order dated 2/17/04: To the extent that the 2/17/04 Order awarded the plaintiffs $43,470 in attorneys fees and $2,347.60 in costs, the order is vacated. The portion of the Order granting the motion for an award of attorneys fees and costs is reaffirmed and this matter is referred to a magistrate judge for a report and recommendation regarding the amount of attorneys fees and costs to be awarded to the plaintiffs (signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres) [faxed to all counsel of record] (Jackson, R)
Blank -- Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/8/2004
Motion(s) referred to Judge Torres: [32-1] motion to Vacate [30-1] order (Jackson, R)
Blank 33 Filed: 3/5/2004, Entered: 3/9/2004 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
OBJECTION and Memorandum by Derek A. Ardito, Robert E. Braddock Jr., Ralph A. Caraccia, Ernest R. Forlini Jr., Stephen N. Frechette, Daniel A. Gonzales, Troy D. Lambert, Travis W. McCusker, Jerome Musco Jr., James D. Annis, Louis J. Gianfrancesco, Andrew Mignanelli, Elizabeth A. Pedchenko, Michael Sullivan to [32-1] motion to Vacate [30-1] order (Fernandes, D)
Blank 32 Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: 2/18/2004, Terminated: 3/10/2004 Motion to Vacate
MOTION and Memorandum by City of Providence, Providence PD, David N. Cicilline, Dean Esserman to Vacate [30-1] order (Fernandes, D)
Blank 31 Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: 2/18/2004
OBJECTION and Memorandum by City of Providence, Providence PD, David N. Cicilline, Dean Esserman to [26-1] motion for Attorney Fees and Costs (Fernandes, D) Modified on 02/18/2004
Blank 30 Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: 2/17/2004 Court Filing
ORDER granting [26-1] motion for Attorney Fees and Costs in the absence of an objection (signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres) [faxed to all counsel of record] (Jackson, R)
Blank -- Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: 2/13/2004
Motion(s) referred: [26-1] motion for Attorney Fees and Costs referred to Judge Ernest C. Torres. (Fernandes, D)
Blank 29 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Affidavit
AFFIDAVIT of Thomas R. Landry Re: [26-1] motion for Attorney Fees and Costs (Fernandes, D)
Blank 28 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Affidavit
AFFIDAVIT of Jennifer Azevedo Re: [26-1] motion for Attorney Fees and Costs (Fernandes, D)
Blank 27 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Affidavit
AFFIDAVIT of Marc B. Gursky Re: [26-1] motion for Attorney Fees and Costs (Fernandes, D)
Blank 26 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004, Terminated: 2/17/2004 Terminated:
POST-JUDGMENT MOTION and Memorandum by Derek A. Ardito, Robert E. Braddock Jr., Ralph A. Caraccia, Ernest R. Forlini Jr., Stephen N. Frechette, Daniel A. Gonzales, Troy D. Lambert, Travis W. McCusker, Jerome Musco Jr., James D. Annis, Louis J. Gianfrancesco, Andrew Mignanelli, Elizabeth A. Pedchenko, Michael . Sullivan for Attorney Fees and Costs (Fernandes, D)
Blank 25 Filed: 1/15/2004, Entered: 1/15/2004
AMENDED JUDGMENT - Judgment is hereby entered enjoining defendants from conducting the 61st Providence Police Academy unless plaintiffs' are allowed to participate. [faxed to counsel of record] (Fernandes, D)
Blank -- Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/13/2004
Case closed (Fernandes, D)
Blank 24 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: 1/12/2004
JUDGMENT FOR Derek A. Ardito, Robert E. Braddock Jr., Ralph A. Caraccia, Ernest R. Forlini Jr., Stephen N. Frechette, Daniel A. Gonzales, Troy D. Lambert, Travis W. McCusker, Jerome Musco Jr., James D. Annis, Louis J. Gianfrancesco, Andrew Mignanelli, Elizabeth A. Pedchenko, Michael Sullivan AGAINST City of Providence, Providence PD, David N. Cicilline, Dean Esserman. Final Judgment is hereby entered in favor of Plaintiffs in accordance to this Court's Memorandum and Order dated May 27, 2003. [faxed to counsel of record] (Fernandes, D) Modified on 01/13/2004
Blank 23 Filed: 12/15/2003, Entered: 12/15/2003 Court Filing
ORDER granting [17-1] motion for Consolidation of Hearing for Preliminary injunction with Trial on the Merits, granting [17-2] motion for Entry of Final Judgment for reasons stated in open court on 12/12/03; Final judgment will be entered in favor of the plaintiff in accordance with this Court's Memorandum & Order granting plaintiffs' motion for a Preliminary Injunction dated 5/27/03 (signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres) faxed to all counsel of record (Jackson, R) Modified on 01/14/2004
Blank 22 Filed: 12/12/2003, Entered: 12/12/2003 Court Filing
Minute entry re: Motions Hearing held 12/12/03 before Judge Torres. (Fernandes, D)
Blank 21 Filed: 12/12/2003, Entered: 12/12/2003, Terminated: 1/13/2004 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
OBJECTION and Memorandum by City of Providence, Providence PD, David N. Cicilline, Dean Esserman to [17-1] motion for of Hearing for Preliminary injunction with Trial on the Merits, [17-2] motion for Entry of Final Judgment. [filed in open court] (Fernandes, D) Modified on 12/12/2003
Blank -- Filed: 12/12/2003, Entered: 12/12/2003
Motion hearing before Judge Ernest C. Torres re: [17-1] motion for Consolidation of Hearing for Preliminary injunction with Trial on the Merits, [17-2] motion for Entry of Final Judgment. (Gursky, Acevedo, Todesco) Court Rptr: A. Gallogly. All counsel of record present. Court lists states motions to be heard. After hearing from counsel - Motion for Consolidation of Hearing for Preliminary Injunction with Trial on the Merits; Motion for Entry of Final Judgment are granted. Judgment to enter in favor of plaintiffs in accordance to this Court's Memorandum and Order dated 5/27/03. Attorneys address regarding attorney fees. Defendant's want fee award to be reflected in the judgment. Court defers entry of judgment for 14 days from today (up to and including 12/26/03). If counsel resolve issue of fee award, they can file a stipulation to amend judgement to include said fee award. (Fernandes, D)
Blank -- Filed: 12/12/2003, Entered: 12/12/2003
Motion hearing re: [17-2] motion for Entry of Final Judgment (Fernandes, D)
Blank -- Filed: 11/13/2003, Entered: 11/13/2003
Motion hearing re: [17-1] motion for Consolidation of Hearing for Preliminary injunction with Trial on the Merits RESET at 10:00 12/12/03, [17-2] motion for Entry of Final Judgment RESET at 10:00 12/12/03 before Judge Torres (Jackson, R)
Blank 20 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: 11/12/2003 Court Filing
ORDER granting [19-1] motion to reschedule show cause hearing (signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres) [faxed to all counsel of record] (Jackson, R)
Blank -- Filed: 11/4/2003, Entered: 11/4/2003
Motion(s) referred to Judge Torres: Plaintiff's Motion to Reschedule Show Cause Hearing (No Objections) (Jackson, R)
Blank 19 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: 11/5/2003, Terminated: 11/12/2003 Terminated:
MOTION by Derek A. Ardito to reschedule show cause hearing. (Baldinelli, D)
Blank 18 Filed: 10/27/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003 Court Filing
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Show Cause Hearing set for 2:00 12/5/03 why the matter should not be dismissed as moot (signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres) [mailed to all counsel of record] (Jackson, R)
Blank -- Filed: 10/22/2003, Entered: 10/22/2003
Motion hearing re: [17-1] motion for Consolidation of Hearing for Preliminary injunction with Trial on the Merits at 2:00 12/5/03, [17-2] motion for Entry of Final Judgment at 2:00 12/5/03 (Jackson, R)
Blank -- Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: 10/14/2003
Motion(s) referred to Judge Torres: [17-1] motion for Consolidation of Hearing for Preliminary injunction with Trial on the Merits, [17-2] motion for Entry of Final Judgment (Jackson, R)
Blank 17 Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: 9/25/2003, Terminated: 12/15/2003 Terminated:
MOTION and Memorandum by Derek A. Ardito, James D. Annis, Robert E. Braddock Jr., Ralph A. Caraccia, Ernest R. Forlini Jr., Stephen N. Frechette, Louis J. Gianfrancesco, Daniel A. Gonzales, Troy D. Lambert, Travis W. McCusker, Andrew Mignanelli, Jerome Musco Jr., Elizabeth A. Pedchenko, Michael Sullivan for Consolidation of Hearing for Preliminary injunction with Trial on the Merits AND for Entry of Final Judgment (Fernandes, D) Modified on 10/03/2003
Blank 15 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 5/27/2003 Court Filing
MEMORANDUM and ORDER granting [6-1] motion for Preliminary Injunction (signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres) (mailed to counsel of record) (Fernandes, D)
Blank 16 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 5/27/2003 State Court Record
State Court Record filed by Derek A. Ardito, Robert E. Braddock Jr., Ralph A. Caraccia, Ernest R. Forlini Jr., Stephen N. Frechette, Daniel A. Gonzales, Troy D. Lambert, Travis W. McCusker, Jerome Musco Jr. RECEIVED FROM: RI Superior Court. (Fernandes, D)
Blank 14 Filed: 5/8/2003, Entered: 5/12/2003 Exhibit List
Exhibit/Witness list (Fernandes, D)
Blank 13 Filed: 5/8/2003, Entered: 5/12/2003 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
Minute entry re: Motion for Preliminary Injunction before Judge Torres. (Fernandes, D)
Blank -- Filed: 5/8/2003, Entered: 5/12/2003 Motion Hearing
Motion hearing held before Judge Torres (DAY 4) re: [6-1] motion for Preliminary Injunction. All parties present. Court reporter: Angela Gallogly. Defense recalls witness (Cohen). 11 exhibits admitted into evidence. Defense rest. Counsel present closing arguments. Matter taken under advisment. (Fernandes, D) Modified on 05/12/2003
Blank -- Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: 5/12/2003 Motion Hearing
Motion hearing held and continued before Judge Torres (DAY 3) re: [6-1] motion for Preliminary Injunction. All counsel present. Court reporter: Angela Gallogy. Counsel address court re: progress of stipulated facts, Gursky addresses issue of Affidavits from plaintiffs. Plaintiffs rest. Defense makes oral 52(c) motion. Parties argue, court defers decision on this matter. Defense presents case. 1 witness sworn and 15 exhibits admitted into evidence. Matter continued to 5/8/03 at 2:00 p.m. (Fernandes, D) Modified on 05/12/2003
Blank -- Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: 5/12/2003 Motion Hearing
Motion hearing held and continued before Judge Torres (DAY 2) re: [6-1] motion for Preliminary Injunction. All Counsel are present. Court Reporter: Angela Gallogy. Todesco Continues cross exam of Witness. 5 witnesses sworn and 2 exhibits addmitted into evidence. matter continued to 5/7/03 at 2:00 p.m. (Fernandes, D) Modified on 05/12/2003
Blank 11 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: 5/5/2003
ORDER passing as mooting [9-1] motion to Quash. (mailed to attorneys of record) (Fernandes, D)
Blank 10 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: 5/5/2003
ENTRY of appearance for City of Providence, Providence PD, David N. Cicilline, Dean Esserman by Sara A. Rapport, Esq; Bruce D. Todesco, Esq. (Fernandes, D)
Blank 9 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: 5/5/2003, Terminated: 5/5/2003 Motion to Quash
MOTION and Memorandum by City of Providence, Providence PD, David N. Cicilline, Dean Esserman to Quash AND/OR for Protective Order (Fernandes, D)
Blank 8 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: 5/5/2003
Hartford Insurance Company Bond in the amount of $5000.00 on behalf of the Plaintiffs (Jackson, R)
Blank -- Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: 5/12/2003 Motion Hearing
Motion hearing held and continued before Judge Torres (DAY 1) re: [6-1] motion for Preliminary Injunction. Marc Gursky for ptfs. and Bruce Todesco, Sara Rapport for defts. Court Reporter: Angela Gallogy. Gursky, Todesco present opening statements. Plaintiffs present their case. 4 witnesses sworn and 8 exhibits are admitted into evidence. Matter continued to 5/6/03 at 10:00 a.m. (Fernandes, D) Modified on 05/12/2003
Blank 12 Filed: 5/2/2003, Entered: 5/6/2003 Amended Complaint
AMENDED COMPLAINT by Derek A. Ardito, Robert E. Braddock Jr., Ralph A. Caraccia, Ernest R. Forlini Jr., Stephen N. Frechette, Daniel A. Gonzales, Troy D. Lambert, Travis W. McCusker, Jerome Musco Jr. , (Answer due 5/19/03 for Dean Esserman, for David N. Cicilline, for Providence PD, for City of Providence ) amending [1-1] complaint (Fernandes, D)
Blank -- Filed: 5/2/2003, Entered: 5/6/2003 Summons Issued
(4) SUMMONS(ES) issued (Fernandes, D)
Blank 7 Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003, Terminated: 1/13/2004 Response in Opposition to Motion
RESPONSE by City of Providence, Providence PD, David N. Cicilline, Dean Esserman in opposition to [6-1] motion for Preliminary Injunction (Jackson, R)
Blank 6 Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003, Terminated: 5/27/2003 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
MOTION AND MEMORANDUM by Derek A. Ardito, Robert E. Braddock Jr., Ralph A. Caraccia, Ernest R. Forlini Jr., Stephen N. Frechette, Daniel A. Gonzales, Troy D. Lambert, Travis W. McCusker, Jerome Musco Jr. for Preliminary Injunction (Jackson, R)
Blank -- Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003
Motion(s) referred to Judge Torres: [6-1] motion for Preliminary Injunction (Jackson, R)
Blank 5 Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003 Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT re: Motion for Temporary Restraining Order before Judge Torres on 4/25/03 (Fernandes, D)
Blank -- Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: 4/28/2003
Motion hearing set for 05/05/03 at 10 AM before Judge Ernest C. Torres re: Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Jackson, R)
Blank 4 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 Court Filing
ORDER granting [3-1] motion for Temporary Restraining Order: Pending Hearing on a Preliminary INjunction, which is hereby scheduled for 5/5/03 at 10 AM, Defendants are hereby restrained from conducting the Police Academy referred to in the Complaint unless Plaintiffs are allowed to participate. Whether the Plaintiffs will be allowed to continue in the Academy and whether the Academy will proceed without their participation will be determined at the Preliminary Injunction hearing. Plaintiffs are directed to post a bond in the amount of $5000.00 by 4/28/03, 12 noon. ( signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres ) [cc'd to all counsel of record] (Jackson, R)
Blank 3 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003, Terminated: 4/25/2003 Motion for TRO
MOTION AND MEMORANDUM by Derek A. Ardito, Robert E. Braddock Jr., Ralph A. Caraccia, Ernest R. Forlini Jr., Stephen N. Frechette, Daniel A. Gonzales, Troy D. Lambert, Travis W. McCusker, Jerome Musco Jr. for Temporary Restraining Order (Jackson, R)
Blank 2 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003
NOTICE OF REMOVAL; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 54019 (Jackson, R)
Blank 1 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003
COMPLAINT (state court complaint titled: "Verified Complaint and Motion for Temporary Restraining Order") filed; (Jackson, R)
Blank -- Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/28/2003 Status Conference
Conference held before Judge Ernest C. Torres on Plaintiffs' motion for Temporary Restraining Order in chambers; Plaintiffs: Marc Gursky, Jennifer Azevedo; Defendants: Joseph Fernandez, Bruce Tedesco; Court Reporter: Karen Bettencourt (Jackson, R)
Blank -- Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/28/2003 Status Conference
Conference held before Judge Ernest C. Torres; Plaintiffs: Marc Gursky, Jennifer Azevedo; Defendants: Joseph Fernandez, Bruce Tedesco; Court Reporter: Karen Bettencourt (held in chambers on Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order) (Jackson, R)
Blank -- Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/28/2003 Status Conference
Conference held before Judge Ernest C. Torres on Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order in chambers; Plaintiff: Marc Gursky, Jennifer Azevedo; Defendant: Bruce Tedesco, Joseph Fernandez; Court Reporter: Karen Bettencourt; Plaintiff argues; Defendant argues; Court grants motion for Temporary Restraining Order and directs the plaintiff to enter bond by 4/28/03 (Jackson, R)
Blank -- Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003
Conference set at 3:00 4/25/03 Before Judge Ernest C. Torres in chambers (Jackson, R)
Blank -- Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003
Motion(s) referred to Judge Torres: [3-1] motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Jackson, R)
Blank -- Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003
CASE assigned to Judge Ernest C. Torres . Assigned to Magistrate Judge Lovegreen (McCabe, F)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 368 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?