Allegretto, et al v. D.R. Johnson
Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:99-cv-00093-ML
District Judge Mary M Lisi, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.rid.1-99-cv-00093-ML (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Judges don't know as much about themselves as we do.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Credit General Insurance Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Higgins Cavanagh & Cooney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Gerald C. DeMaria +1 401 272 3500 +1 401 273 8780 gdemaria@hcc-law.com
No Logo Michael Allegretto, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jeffrey S. Michaelson +2954 295 295 4330 +2955 295 295 5220 jeffmichaelson@cox.net

Toggle Switch Represented by djolaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David Jesse Oliveira +2749 274 274 9191 +2749 274 274 9190 doliveira@djolaw.com
No Logo Ohio Insurance Liquidator, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Higgins Cavanagh & Cooney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Gerald C. DeMaria +1 401 272 3500 +1 401 273 8780 gdemaria@hcc-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by straussfactor.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Lisa A. Pinsonneault +4560 456 456 0700 lpinsonneault@straussfactor.com
v.
No Logo D.R. Johnson Landscape Construction, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by alparks.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Albert Lauriston Parks, III +1 401 423 8900 +1 401 560 0186 alp@alparks.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Hanson Curran LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
James Truden Murphy +1 401 421 2154 +1 401 521 7040 jtm@hansoncurran.com
Office Providence
Filed 2/23/1999
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Providence
Terminated 11/30/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ADR, CLOSED, DLM
  Entries (168) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
Blank 116 Filed: 12/5/2001, Entered: 12/5/2001 Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT OF hearing on Objections to Report & Recommendation for date of 11/30/01, held before Judge Mary M. Lisi. (Duhamel, J)
Blank 115 Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001
Minute entry: Objections to the Report and Recommendation (Barletta, B)
Blank 114 Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001 Court Filing
STIPULATION of dismissal with prejudice signed by Judge Mary M. Lisi (Barletta, B)
Blank -- Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001
Case closed (Barletta, B)
Blank -- Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001
Civil Hearing re: [113-1] objection before Judge Mary M. Lisi; Crtrpt: K. Zinni; Jeffrey Michaelson for Allegretto; Gerald DeMaria for Ohio Ins.; James T. Murphy for deft. Mr. Murphy presents a dismissal stipulation. Court to file Report and Recommendation under miscellaneous number to be assigned to Chief Judge Torres and orders Mr. DeMaria to present a letter to Chief Judge Torres from Gallagher & Bassett within ten days detailing when it sold the lien to Credit General and when Mr. DeMaria was informed of this fact. Letter to be filed by 12/12/01. (Barletta, B)
Blank -- Filed: 11/21/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001
Civil Hearing re: [111-1] report and recommendations 11:00 11/30/01 before Judge Mary M. Lisi (Barletta, B)
Blank 113 Filed: 11/20/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001 Objection to Report and Recommendations
OBJECTION by Credit General, Ohio Insurance to [111-1] report and recommendations (Duhamel, J)
Blank 112 Filed: 11/13/2001, Entered: 11/15/2001 Notice of Appearance
ENTRY of appearance for Ohio Insurance by Lisa A. Kelly (Theall, J)
Blank 111 Filed: 11/13/2001, Entered: 11/15/2001 Response/Reply - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen Re: sent to district court for its review as to whether a hearing should be held on the issue of sanctions ; Motion no longer referred Objections to and R due by 11/30/01 (Theall, J)
Blank 110 Filed: 11/7/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001
TRANSCRIPT OF Show Cause hearing held before USMJ Robert W. Lovegreen for date of 10/29/01 (William Rogers, Court Rptr) (Duhamel, J)
Blank 109 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: 10/29/2001
Minute entry: Sanctions Hearing (Theall, J)
Blank -- Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: 10/29/2001
Civil Hearing re: Sanctions before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (Murphy, DeMaria, Kelly, Oliveira) court addresses counsel; Court takes under advisement; R&R to follow (Theall, J)
Blank -- Filed: 10/26/2001, Entered: 10/29/2001 Settlement Conference
Settlement conference held before MJ Lovegreen (Theall, J)
Blank -- Filed: 10/15/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001
Settlement conference set on 2:00 10/26/01 Before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (Theall, J)
Blank 108 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: 10/12/2001 Court Filing
ORDER granting [107-1] joint motion to add the Office of the Ohio Insurance Liquidator together with Credit General Ins. Co. for the Hartford Ins. Co. as co-party plaintiffs ( signed by Judge Mary M. Lisi ) (Barletta, B)
Blank 107 Filed: 10/10/2001, Entered: 10/10/2001, Terminated: 10/12/2001 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
SUPPLEMENTAL JOINT MOTION by Michael Allegretto, D.R. Johnson to add the Office of the Ohio Insurance Liquidator together with Credit General Ins. Co. for the Hartford Ins. Co. as co-party plaintiffs (Duhamel, J)
Blank 106 Filed: 10/9/2001, Entered: 10/9/2001 Court Filing
ORDER granting [105-1] joint motion to Substitute "Credit General Insurance Company" for "Hartford Insurance Company" as a co-party plaintiff ( signed by Judge Mary M. Lisi ) (Barletta, B)
Blank 105 Filed: 10/4/2001, Entered: 10/5/2001, Terminated: 10/9/2001 Terminated:
JOINT MOTION by Michael Allegretto, Hartford Accident to Substitute "Credit General Insurance Company" for "Hartford Insurance Company" as a co-party plaintiff (Duhamel, J)
Blank 104 Filed: 10/4/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001 Court Filing
ORDER denying [73-1] motion "to Strike Expert Interrogatory Answer" ( signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin ) (Zinni, C)
Blank -- Filed: 10/1/2001, Entered: 10/1/2001
Additional Final Pre-Trial Conference held: Attys Jeffrey Michaelson & David Jesse Oliveira for pltf Allegretto; Atty James T. Murphy for deft; Atty Gerald C. DeMaria (for pltf Hartford Accident Co.) not present -- Court is informed that "Hartford Accident" is not true party in interest, but that "Credit General" in Ohio (who bought out Hartford's interest) is. Counsel to file joint motion to get "Credit General" in as a party, & to remove "Hartford" as a party. Short continuance re this trial: rescheduled for tentative date of 10/22/01. (Duhamel, J)
Blank 103 Filed: 9/18/2001, Entered: 9/19/2001 Notice to Take Deposition
NOTICE by D.R. Johnson to take deposition of Angelo Allegretto (Duhamel, J)
Blank 102 Filed: 9/12/2001, Entered: 9/12/2001 Court Filing
ORDER, referring matter to mediator, William Poore, Esq. for mediation session to be held on 9/18/01 at 10:00 am in mediator's office ( signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (Theall, J)
Blank 101 Filed: 9/12/2001, Entered: 9/12/2001 Court Filing
Consent to jury selection by a Magistrate Judge signed by counsel. (Barletta, B)
Blank -- Filed: 9/11/2001, Entered: 9/12/2001 Jury Impaneled
Jury impaneled by MJ Lovegreen; voir dire; 8 jurors impaneled (Theall, J)
Blank -- Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: 9/5/2001
Additional Final Pre-Trial Conference set at 2:00 10/1/01 before Judge Mary M. Lisi (Notices sent. Note: Atty DeMaria's presence not necessary.) (Duhamel, J)
Blank -- Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: 9/5/2001
Final Pre-Trial Conference held: Jeffrey Michaelson, Esq. & David Jesse Oliveira, Esq. (for Pltf Allegretto); Gerald C. DeMaria, Esq. (for Pltf Hartford Co.); James T. Murphy, Esq. (for deft) -- Settlement talks unsuccessful; jury empanelment scheduled for 9/11/01. Additional final pre-trial conference set for Monday, October 1, 2001, @ 2:00 p.m., at which time counsel are to present list of witnesses & exhibits. (Duhamel, J)
Blank -- Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: 9/5/2001
Motion(s) referred to Judge: [95-1] motion in Limine, to preclude pltf from presenting evidence on certain issues, including fibromyalgia causation, pain management, psychological damages, and medical expenses for failure to comply with discovery obligations, [94-1] motion in Limine, to preclude pltf from offering a photograph at the trial of this action, [93-1] motion in Limine, to exclude Dr. Peck's anticipated opinion testimony on "fibromyalgia causation" at the trial of this action (Barletta, B)
Blank 100 Filed: 9/4/2001, Entered: 9/5/2001 Terminated:
OBJECTION by D.R. Johnson to [92-1] motion in Limine, "to preclude defendant from introducing evidence or making reference to" various matters during trial (Duhamel, J)
Blank 99 Filed: 9/4/2001, Entered: 9/5/2001 Terminated:
OBJECTION by Michael Allegretto to [93-1] motion in Limine, to exclude Dr. Peck's anticipated opinion testimony on "fibromyalgia causation" at the trial of this action (Duhamel, J)
Blank 98 Filed: 9/4/2001, Entered: 9/5/2001 Terminated:
OBJECTION by Michael Allegretto to [94-1] motion in Limine, to preclude pltf from offering a photograph at the trial of this action (Duhamel, J) Modified on 09/05/2001
Blank 97 Filed: 9/4/2001, Entered: 9/5/2001 Terminated:
OBJECTION by Michael Allegretto to [95-1] motion in Limine, to preclude pltf from presenting evidence on certain issues, including fibromyalgia causation, pain management, psychological damages, and medical expenses for failure to comply with discovery obligations (Duhamel, J)
Blank -- Filed: 9/4/2001, Entered: 9/5/2001 Pretrial Memorandum
PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM filed by defendant and forwarded to chambers (Barletta, B)
Blank 96 Filed: 8/30/2001, Entered: 8/30/2001
NOTICE by Michael Allegretto to take deposition of Dr. James Hudson on 9/7/01 at 11:00 AM (Barletta, B)
Blank 95 Filed: 8/28/2001, Entered: 8/28/2001, Terminated: 11/30/2001 Motion in Limine
MOTION by D.R. Johnson in Limine, to preclude pltf from presenting evidence on certain issues, including fibromyalgia causation, pain management, psychological damages, and medical expenses for failure to comply with discovery obligations (Duhamel, J)
Blank 94 Filed: 8/28/2001, Entered: 8/28/2001, Terminated: 11/30/2001 Motion in Limine
MOTION by D.R. Johnson in Limine, to preclude pltf from offering a photograph at the trial of this action (Duhamel, J)
Blank 93 Filed: 8/28/2001, Entered: 8/28/2001, Terminated: 11/30/2001 Motion in Limine
MOTION by D.R. Johnson in Limine, to exclude Dr. Peck's anticipated opinion testimony on "fibromyalgia causation" at the trial of this action (Hearing requested pursuant to Rule 104, Fed Rules of Evidence) (Duhamel, J)
Blank 92 Filed: 8/28/2001, Entered: 8/28/2001, Terminated: 11/30/2001 Motion in Limine
MOTION by Michael Allegretto in Limine, "to preclude defendant from introducing evidence or making reference to" various matters during trial (Duhamel, J)
Blank -- Filed: 8/28/2001, Entered: 8/28/2001
Pltf's and deft's designation of deposition testimony filed and forwarded to chambers (Barletta, B)
Blank 91 Filed: 8/21/2001, Entered: 8/21/2001
AMENDED NOTICE by D.R. Johnson to take deposition of Brian Peck, M.D. (Duhamel, J)
Blank 90 Filed: 8/20/2001, Entered: 8/20/2001
2 NOTICES by D.R. Johnson to take depositions of Shwu Ling Shiau & Angelo Allegretto (Duhamel, J)
Blank -- Filed: 8/20/2001, Entered: 8/20/2001
Deadline updated; reset Discovery deadline to 8/27/01 (Barletta, B)
Blank -- Filed: 8/20/2001, Entered: 8/20/2001
Final Pre-Trial Conference set at 9:00 9/5/01 Before Judge Mary M. Lisi (Barletta, B)
Blank 89 Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/20/2001 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER extending discovery closure to 8/27/01; pltf's m/protective order with respect to Dr. Peck is denied; deft's M/SJ is denied; pltf may depose Dr. Hudson at deft's expense on or before 8/27/01 ( signed by Judge Mary M. Lisi ) (Barletta, B)
Blank 88 Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001 Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT OF Deft's Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines, for date of 7/27/01, before Judge Mary M. Lisi (Joseph Fontes, Court Rptr) (Duhamel, J)
Blank 87 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: 8/9/2001
NOTICE by D.R. Johnson to take deposition of Brian Peck, M.D. (Duhamel, J)
Blank 86 Filed: 8/2/2001, Entered: 8/3/2001 Set Scheduling Order DeadlinesCourt Filing
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER setting 8/28/01 for filing of all motions and 9/4/01 for objections mailed to all counsel ( signed by Judge Mary M. Lisi ) (Barletta, B)
Blank 85 Filed: 8/1/2001, Entered: 8/1/2001 Court Filing
TRIAL NOTICE setting impanelment for 9/11/01 mailed to all parties ( signed by Judge Mary M. Lisi ) (Barletta, B)
Blank 84 Filed: 7/30/2001, Entered: 7/30/2001 Court Filing
Minute entry: Motion hearing held before Mag. Judge Martin on 7/30/01. (Zinni, C)
Blank -- Filed: 7/30/2001, Entered: 7/30/2001
Motion hearing re: [73-1] motion "to Strike Expert Interrogatory Answer" Motion hearing held before Mag. Judge Martin. Jeffrey Michaelson for plaintiff. James Murphy for deft. Motion is denied conditioned upon defendant making available to plaintiff Drs. Morgan and Baird for plaintiff to take their depositions at defendant's expense. Mr. Murphy to submit order. (Zinni, C)
Blank 83 Filed: 7/27/2001, Entered: 7/27/2001 Court Filing
Minute entry: Clerk's Minutes filed as to Motion Hearing held before Judge Mary M. Lisi on 7/27/01. (Duhamel, J)
Blank 82 Filed: 7/27/2001, Entered: 7/27/2001
ENTRY of appearance for Michael Allegretto by David Jesse Oliveira (Barletta, B)
Blank -- Filed: 7/27/2001, Entered: 8/1/2001 Oral Order
ORAL ORDER as to D.R. Johnson denying [75-1] motion for Summary Judgment, denying [74-1] motion for Protective Order regarding deposition of Brian Peck, M.D., granting [70-1] motion to Enlarge Time to up to & including 7/31/01 re discovery closure, and to extend all other dates under the current pre-trial order, as amended, by 30 days ( Entered by Judge Mary M. Lisi ) (Barletta, B)
Blank -- Filed: 7/27/2001, Entered: 7/27/2001
Motion hearing re: [70-1] motion to Enlarge Time to up to & including 7/31/01 re discovery closure, and to extend all other dates under the current pre-trial order, as amended, by 30 days Motion hearing held: Atty Jeffrey S. Michaelson for Pltf; Atty David Jesse Oliveira enters his appearance for Pltf at this hearing; Atty James T. Murphy for Deft; Joseph Fontes (Court Rptr): Counsel argue deft's motion to extend the pre-trial order deadlines. An extension of 30 days is GRANTED. (Note: the Court also addressed the Pltf's Motion for a Protective Order regarding the proposed depo of Dr. Peck. Court DENIES the motion. The Court also addressed the deft's second motion for Summary Judgment. The Court DENIES the motion, and counsel are advised that this case is on the September, 2001, trial list.) (Duhamel, J)
Blank -- Filed: 7/26/2001, Entered: 7/26/2001
Deadline updated; Motion Hearing set for 10:00 7/30/01 for [74-1] motion for Protective Order regarding deposition of Brian Peck, M.D., set for 10:00 7/30/01 for [73-1] motion "to Strike Expert Interrogatory Answer" before Mag. Judge Martin. (Zinni, C)
Blank 81 Filed: 7/25/2001, Entered: 7/26/2001 Remark
"Conditional Rule 56(f) Request" filed by Pltf Michael Allegretto (Duhamel, J)
Blank 80 Filed: 7/25/2001, Entered: 7/26/2001 Statement of Undisputed Facts
Statement Of Material Fact by Michael Allegretto RE: [79-1] motion response (Duhamel, J)
Blank 79 Filed: 7/25/2001, Entered: 7/26/2001 Terminated:
OBJECTION by Michael Allegretto to [75-1](second) motion for Summary Judgment (Duhamel, J)
Blank -- Filed: 7/25/2001, Entered: 7/25/2001
Motion hearing re: [74-1] motion for Protective Order regarding deposition of Brian Peck, M.D. at 11:00 8/2/01, [73-1] motion "to Strike Expert Interrogatory Answer" at 11:00 8/2/01 before Mag. Judge Martin. (Zinni, C)
Blank -- Filed: 7/25/2001, Entered: 7/25/2001
Motion(s) referred to Judge: [75-1] motion for Summary Judgment (Barletta, B)
Blank 78 Filed: 7/19/2001, Entered: 7/19/2001, Terminated: 11/30/2001 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
OBJECTION by D.R. Johnson to [74-1] motion for Protective Order regarding deposition of Brian Peck, M.D. (Duhamel, J)
Blank 77 Filed: 7/19/2001, Entered: 7/19/2001, Terminated: 11/30/2001 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
OBJECTION by D.R. Johnson to [73-1] motion "to Strike Expert Interrogatory Answer" (Duhamel, J)
Blank -- Filed: 7/19/2001, Entered: 7/19/2001
Motion(s) referred: [74-1] motion for Protective Order regarding deposition of Brian Peck, M.D. referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin, [73-1] motion "to Strike Expert Interrogatory Answer" referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin (Barletta, B)
Blank -- Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/19/2001 Motion Hearing
Motion hearing re: [70-1] motion to Enlarge Time to up to & including 7/31/01 re discovery closure, and to extend all other dates under the current pre-trial order, as amended, by 30 days at 10:00 7/27/01 (Barletta, B)
Blank -- Filed: 7/16/2001, Entered: 7/16/2001
PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff and forwarded to chambers (Barletta, B)
Blank -- Filed: 7/16/2001, Entered: 7/16/2001
Motion(s) referred to Judge: [75-1] motion for Summary Judgment (without objection) (Barletta, B)
Blank 76 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: 7/13/2001
Statement Of Undisputed Fact by D.R. Johnson RE: [75-1] motion for Summary Judgment (Duhamel, J)
Blank 75 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: 7/13/2001, Terminated: 7/27/2001 Motion for Summary Judgment
MOTION by D.R. Johnson for Summary Judgment (Duhamel, J)
Blank -- Filed: 7/10/2001, Entered: 7/10/2001
Motion(s) referred to Judge: [70-1] motion to Enlarge Time to up to & including 7/31/01 re discovery closure, and to extend all other dates under the current pre-trial order, as amended, by 30 days (Barletta, B)
Blank 74 Filed: 7/9/2001, Entered: 7/10/2001 Terminated:
MOTION by Michael Allegretto for Protective Order regarding deposition of Brian Peck, M.D. (Duhamel, J)
Blank 73 Filed: 7/9/2001, Entered: 7/10/2001, Terminated: 10/4/2001 Terminated:
MOTION by Michael Allegretto "to Strike Expert Interrogatory Answer" (Duhamel, J)
Blank 72 Filed: 7/9/2001, Entered: 7/9/2001, Terminated: 11/30/2001 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
OBJECTION by Michael Allegretto to [70-1] motion to Enlarge Time to up to & including 7/31/01 re discovery closure, and to extend all other dates under the current pre-trial order, as amended, by 30 days (Mercurio, A)
Blank 71 Filed: 6/28/2001, Entered: 6/29/2001 Notice to Take Deposition
NOTICE by D.R. Johnson to take deposition of Brian Peck, M.D. (Duhamel, J)
Blank 70 Filed: 6/28/2001, Entered: 6/28/2001, Terminated: 7/27/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION by D.R. Johnson to Enlarge Time to up to & including 7/31/01 re discovery closure, and to extend all other dates under the current pre-trial order, as amended, by 30 days (Duhamel, J)
Blank -- Filed: 6/28/2001, Entered: 6/28/2001
Defendant's disclosure of expert witnesses forwarded to chambers (Barletta, B)
Blank 69 Filed: 5/23/2001, Entered: 5/25/2001 Notice to Take Deposition
NOTICE by Michael Allegretto to take deposition of Christopher Ferraro (Duhamel, J)
Blank 68 Filed: 5/23/2001, Entered: 5/23/2001
NOTICE by D.R. Johnson to take deposition of Kenneth Fitzgibbon on 4/23/01 (Gilfillan, B)
Blank 67 Filed: 3/29/2001, Entered: 3/29/2001 Court Filing
ORDER denying [60-1] motion for Summary Judgment ( signed by Judge Mary M. Lisi ) (Brunelle, E)
Blank 66 Filed: 3/26/2001, Entered: 3/26/2001 Court Filing
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 6/29/01; Deadline for filing of dispositive motions 7/13/01; Plaintiff shall disclose any trial experts not later than 4/16/01; Defendant shall disclose any trial experts not later than 5/15/01; Pretrial Memorandum Deadline 7/13/01; ( signed by Judge Mary M. Lisi ) (Brunelle, E)
Blank 65 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: 3/20/2001 Court Filing
Minute entry: Clerks minutes filed regarding motion hearing held on 3/20/01 before Judge Mary M. Lisi. (Delano, D)
Blank -- Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: 3/20/2001
Motion hearing re: [60-1] motion for Summary Judgment Motion hearing held. Jeffrey Michaelson and Gerald DeMaria for the plaintiffs; James Murphy for the defendant. Counsel argue motion. The motion for summary judgment is denied. Michaelson will prepare an order. (Delano, D)
Blank 64 Filed: 2/26/2001, Entered: 2/26/2001 Court Filing
Stipulation between the parties regarding plaintiff's tax returns, photographs of defendant's tractor and seat belts and reports of plaintiff's psychiatrist signed by Judge Mary M. Lisi (Brunelle, E)
Blank 63 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: 2/22/2001 Notice to Take Deposition
3 NOTICES by D.R. Johnson to take deposition of Peter DiMartino, M.D.; Kenneth D. Fitzgibbon; Paul Shiebler, Psy.D. (Delano, D)
Blank -- Filed: 1/30/2001, Entered: 1/30/2001
Motion hearing re: [60-1] motion for Summary Judgment at 9:30 2/22/01. Notices mailed to all parties (Brunelle, E)
Blank -- Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/22/2001
Motion(s) referred to Judge Lisi: [60-1] motion for Summary Judgment (Brunelle, E)
Blank 62 Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 Terminated:
OBJECTION by Michael Allegretto, Hartford Accident to [60-1] motion for Summary Judgment (Delano, D)
Blank 61 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/9/2001 Statement of Undisputed Facts
Statement Of Undisputed Fact by D.R. Johnson RE: [60-1] motion for Summary Judgment (Delano, D)
Blank 60 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/9/2001, Terminated: 3/29/2001 Terminated:
MOTION by D.R. Johnson for Summary Judgment (Delano, D)
Blank -- Filed: 12/26/2000, Entered: 12/26/2000
Motion hearing re: [58-1] motion to Compel production of documents at 10:00 1/29/01, [58-2] motion Preclude the plaintiff from introducing medial evidence at the time of trial regarding psychiatric treatment at 10:00 1/29/01 before Magistrate Judge Martin. (Barletta, B)
Blank -- Filed: 12/14/2000, Entered: 12/14/2000
Motion(s) referred: [58-1] motion to Compel production of documents referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin (Brunelle, E)
Blank 59 Filed: 12/13/2000, Entered: 12/18/2000 Terminated:
OBJECTION by Michael Allegretto to [58-1] motion to Compel production of documents, [58-2] motion Preclude the plaintiff from introducing medial evidence at the time of trial regarding psychiatric treatment (Delano, D)
Blank 58 Filed: 12/1/2000, Entered: 12/6/2000 Terminated:
MOTION by D.R. Johnson to Compel production of documents , and to Preclude the plaintiff from introducing medial evidence at the time of trial regarding psychiatric treatment (Delano, D)
Blank 57 Filed: 10/25/2000, Entered: 10/30/2000 Utility - Miscellaneous
Designation of ADR Neutral William A. Poore, Esq. (Delano, D)
Blank 56 Filed: 10/18/2000, Entered: 10/18/2000 Court Filing
ORDER granting in part, denying in part [45-1] motion for Discovery Sanctions ( signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin ) (Zinni, C)
Blank 55 Filed: 10/4/2000, Entered: 10/4/2000 Court Filing
ORDER referring this matter ADR. The ADR Administrator shall hold a conference within 30 days from the date of this Order and a report shall be filed with the Court within 45 days from the date of that conference. ( signed by Judge Mary M. Lisi ) (Brunelle, E)
Blank 54 Filed: 10/4/2000, Entered: 10/4/2000 Court Filing
ORDER granting [52-1] motion to Enlarge Time of the pretrial order ( signed by Judge Mary M. Lisi ) (Brunelle, E)
Blank -- Filed: 10/4/2000, Entered: 11/24/2000 Set/Clear Flags
**Set Alternative Dispute Resolution Flag (Brunelle, E)
Blank 53 Filed: 9/27/2000, Entered: 9/27/2000 Court Filing
Minute entry: Motion hearing held before Mag. Judge Martin on 9/27/00. (Zinni, C)
Blank -- Filed: 9/27/2000, Entered: 9/27/2000
Motion hearing re: [45-1] motion for Discovery Sanctions Motion hearing held before Mag. Judge Martin. Jeffrey Michaelson for plaintiff. James Murphy for deft. Motion is granted in part and denied in part. Order to be submitted. (Zinni, C)
Blank 52 Filed: 9/20/2000, Entered: 9/22/2000, Terminated: 10/4/2000 Terminated:
MOTION by Hartford Accident to Enlarge Time of the pretrial order (Delano, D)
Blank 51 Filed: 9/20/2000, Entered: 9/22/2000 Notice of Appearance
ENTRY of appearance for Hartford Accident by Gerald C. DeMaria (Delano, D)
Blank 50 Filed: 9/18/2000, Entered: 9/19/2000 Notice to Take Deposition
NOTICE by D.R. Johnson to take deposition of Dr. Charles DiCecca (Delano, D)
Blank -- Filed: 9/15/2000, Entered: 9/15/2000
Motion hearing re: [45-1] motion for Discovery Sanctions at 10:30 9/27/00 before Mag. Judge Martin. (Zinni, C)
Blank 49 Filed: 9/1/2000, Entered: 9/1/2000
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER (Brunelle, E)
Blank 48 Filed: 9/1/2000, Entered: 9/1/2000
TRIAL NOTICE of empanelment scheduled for September 26, 2000 at 9:15 a.m. Notice mailed to all parties (Brunelle, E)
Blank -- Filed: 8/30/2000, Entered: 8/30/2000
Motion(s) referred: [45-1] motion for Discovery Sanctions referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin (Brunelle, E)
Blank 47 Filed: 8/25/2000, Entered: 8/28/2000 Notice to Take Deposition
AMENDED NOTICE by D.R. Johnson to take deposition of Richard Hawkins, M.D. (Delano, D)
Blank -- Filed: 8/21/2000, Entered: 8/21/2000
Motion(s) referred to Judge Lisi : [45-1] motion for Discovery Sanctions (Brunelle, E)
Blank 46 Filed: 8/17/2000, Entered: 8/18/2000 Terminated:
OBJECTION by D.R. Johnson to [45-1] motion for Discovery Sanctions (Delano, D)
Blank 45 Filed: 8/9/2000, Entered: 8/11/2000, Terminated: 10/18/2000 Terminated:
MOTION by Michael Allegretto for Discovery Sanctions (Delano, D)
Blank 44 Filed: 8/3/2000, Entered: 8/4/2000 Notice to Take Deposition
NOTICE by D.R. Johnson to take deposition of Ron vonBlomberg (Delano, D)
Blank 43 Filed: 6/14/2000, Entered: 6/14/2000 Court Filing
ORDER granting [40-1] motion to Enlarge Time of discovery deadlines to and including August 28, 2000 and the time for filing pre-trial papers to and including September 25, 2000. There will be no further extensions granted in this case. ( signed by Judge Mary M. Lisi ) (Brunelle, E)
Blank 42 Filed: 6/8/2000, Entered: 6/8/2000 Court Filing
ORDER granting [37-1] motion for Joinder with real party in interest. The Hartford Accident and Indemnity Co. shall forthwith appear as a party pltf. in this action. ( signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin ) (Administrator, )
Blank 41 Filed: 5/31/2000, Entered: 5/31/2000 Court Filing
Minute entry: Motion hearing held before Mag. Judge Martin on 5/31/00. (Zinni, C)
Blank -- Filed: 5/31/2000, Entered: 5/31/2000
Motion hearing re: [37-1] motion for Joinder with real party in interest held before Mag. Judge Martin. Jeffrey Michaelson for plaintiff. A. Lauriston Parks for deft. Motion is granted. Mr. Parks to submit order. (Zinni, C)
Blank 40 Filed: 5/23/2000, Entered: 5/23/2000, Terminated: 6/14/2000 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION by D.R. Johnson to Enlarge Time of discovery deadlines to and including August 28, 2000 and the time for filing pre-trial papers to and including September 25, 2000 (Delano, D)
Blank 39 Filed: 5/18/2000, Entered: 5/19/2000 Remark
Withdrawal of appearance of attorney A. Lauriston Parks on behalf of the defendant D.R. Johnson. (Delano, D)
Blank 39 Filed: 5/18/2000, Entered: 5/19/2000 Notice of Appearance
ENTRY of appearance for D.R. Johnson by James T. Murphy (Delano, D)
Blank -- Filed: 5/10/2000, Entered: 5/10/2000
Motion(s) referred: [37-1] motion for Joinder with real party in interest referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin (Brunelle, E)
Blank -- Filed: 5/10/2000, Entered: 5/10/2000
Motion(s) no longer referred: [37-1] motion for Joinder with real party in interest (Brunelle, E)
Blank -- Filed: 5/4/2000, Entered: 5/4/2000
Motion(s) referred to Judge Lisi: [37-1] motion for Joinder with real party in interest (Brunelle, E)
Blank 38 Filed: 5/3/2000, Entered: 5/5/2000 Terminated:
OBJECTION by Michael Allegretto to [37-1] motion for Joinder with real party in interest (Delano, D)
Blank 37 Filed: 4/21/2000, Entered: 4/21/2000, Terminated: 6/8/2000 Motion for Joinder
MOTION by D.R. Johnson for Joinder with real party in interest (Delano, D)
Blank 36 Filed: 4/19/2000, Entered: 4/21/2000 Notice to Take Deposition
NOTICE by D.R. Johnson to take deposition of Ronald Von Blomberg (Delano, D)
Blank 35 Filed: 4/10/2000, Entered: 4/12/2000 Subpoena Returned Executed or Unexecuted
SUBPOENA Returned Subpoena served on Keeper of Records, Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company. (Delano, D)
Blank 34 Filed: 4/6/2000, Entered: 4/6/2000
NOTICE by D.R. Johnson to take deposition of Keeper of Record of Harford Accident and Indemnity Co.. (Delano, D)
Blank 33 Filed: 4/5/2000, Entered: 4/5/2000 Court Filing
ORDER passed for compliance [31-1] motion to Compel response to discovery ( signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin ) (Zinni, C)
Blank -- Filed: 3/27/2000, Entered: 3/27/2000
Motion hearing re: [31-1] motion to Compel response to discovery at 11:00 4/3/00 before Mag. Judge Martin. (Zinni, C)
Blank -- Filed: 3/9/2000, Entered: 3/9/2000
Motion(s) referred: [31-1] motion to Compel response to discovery referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin (Brunelle, E)
Blank 32 Filed: 3/7/2000, Entered: 3/7/2000, Terminated: 11/30/2001 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
OBJECTION by D.R. Johnson to [31-1] motion to Compel response to discovery (Delano, D)
Blank 31 Filed: 2/28/2000, Entered: 2/29/2000 Terminated:
MOTION by Michael Allegretto to Compel response to discovery (Delano, D)
Blank 30 Filed: 1/10/2000, Entered: 1/10/2000
SUBPOENA Returned Subpoena served on Keeper of Records, Dept. of Radiology Kent County Memorial Hospital (Delano, D)
Blank 29 Filed: 1/5/2000, Entered: 1/6/2000 Notice to Take Deposition
NOTICE by D.R. Johnson to take deposition of Keeper of records of Dept. of Radiology, Kent County Memorial Hospital (Delano, D)
Blank 28 Filed: 12/13/1999, Entered: 12/30/1999 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting [20-1] motion for Reconsideration of [17-1] order ( signed by Judge Mary M. Lisi ) (Brunelle, E)
Blank 27 Filed: 12/13/1999, Entered: 12/14/1999 Terminated:
AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by D.R. Johnson : amends [3-1] answer (Delano, D)
Blank 26 Filed: 12/9/1999, Entered: 12/9/1999 Court Filing
Minute entry: Regarding motion hearing on December 9, 1999 before Judge Lisi. (Delano, D)
Blank -- Filed: 12/9/1999, Entered: 12/9/1999
Motion hearing re: [20-1] motion for Reconsideration of [17-1] order Motion hearing held. Jeffrey Michaelson for the plaintiff; Albert Lauriston Parks, III for the defendant. Counsel argue motion. Court grants motion to reconsider. Parks to prepare an order. (Delano, D)
Blank 25 Filed: 11/29/1999, Entered: 11/30/1999 Notice to Take Deposition
NOTICE by Michael Allegretto to take deposition of Leonard Picot, David Godfrey, John Harajovic and Kim Quam. (Delano, D)
Blank -- Filed: 11/29/1999, Entered: 11/29/1999
Motion hearing re: [20-1] motion for Reconsideration of [17-1] order at 9:30 12/9/99 (Brunelle, E)
Blank 24 Filed: 11/23/1999, Entered: 11/23/1999 Court Filing
ORDER granting [18-1] motion to Compel plaintiff to furnish more responsive interrogatory answers. Plaintiff shall provide responses within 10 days of this order. ( signed by Judge Mary M. Lisi ) (Brunelle, E)
Blank 23 Filed: 11/23/1999, Entered: 11/23/1999 Court Filing
ORDER granting [19-1] motion to Enlarge Time of discovery and associated deadlines ( signed by Judge Mary M. Lisi ) (Brunelle, E)
Blank -- Filed: 11/15/1999, Entered: 11/15/1999
Motion(s) referred to Judge Lisi: [20-1] motion for Reconsideration of [17-1] order and [19-1] motion to Enlarge Time of discovery and associated deadlines (Brunelle, E)
Blank -- Filed: 11/15/1999, Entered: 11/15/1999
Motion(s) referred to Judge Lisi: [19-1] motion to Enlarge Time of discovery and associated deadlines (Brunelle, E)
Blank 22 Filed: 11/9/1999, Entered: 11/10/1999 Terminated:
OBJECTION by Michael Allegretto to [18-1] motion to Compel plaintiff to furnish more responsive interrogatory answers (Delano, D)
Blank 21 Filed: 11/9/1999, Entered: 11/10/1999 Terminated:
OBJECTION by Michael Allegretto to [20-1] motion for Reconsideration of [17-1] order (Delano, D)
Blank 20 Filed: 11/1/1999, Entered: 11/3/1999, Terminated: 12/13/1999 Terminated:
MOTION by D.R. Johnson for Reconsideration of [17-1] order (Delano, D)
Blank 19 Filed: 10/28/1999, Entered: 10/28/1999, Terminated: 11/23/1999 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION by Michael Allegretto to Enlarge Time of discovery and associated deadlines (Delano, D)
Blank 18 Filed: 10/28/1999, Entered: 10/28/1999, Terminated: 11/23/1999 Motion to Compel
MOTION by D.R. Johnson to Compel plaintiff to furnish more responsive interrogatory answers (Delano, D)
Blank 17 Filed: 10/26/1999, Entered: 10/26/1999 Court Filing
ORDER denying [15-1] motion for Leave to File Amended Answer ( signed by Judge Mary M. Lisi ) (Brunelle, E)
Blank -- Filed: 10/26/1999, Entered: 10/26/1999
Motion(s) referred: [15-1] motion for Leave to File Amended Answer referred to Judge Mary M. Lisi (Brunelle, E)
Blank 16 Filed: 10/19/1999, Entered: 10/25/1999 Terminated:
OBJECTION by Michael Allegretto to [15-1] motion for Leave to File Amended Answer (Delano, D)
Blank 15 Filed: 10/12/1999, Entered: 10/12/1999, Terminated: 10/26/1999 Motion for Leave to File
MOTION by D.R. Johnson for Leave to File Amended Answer (Delano, D)
Blank 14 Filed: 10/6/1999, Entered: 10/7/1999 Notice to Take Deposition
NOTICE by D.R. Johnson to take deposition of Keeper of records of Leominster Hospital, Keeper of records of Deaconess-Nashoba Hospital, Keeper of records of Anne S. Rosenthal, M.D., Keeper of records of Debra Twehous, Keeper of records of Robert A. Yood, M.D., Keeper of records of Roland R. Caron, M.D. and Keeper of records of Burbank Hospital. (Delano, D)
Blank 13 Filed: 9/23/1999, Entered: 9/27/1999 Notice to Take Deposition
REVISED NOTICE by Michael Allegretto to take deposition of Darrell Johnson (Delano, D)
Blank 12 Filed: 9/13/1999, Entered: 9/14/1999 Notice to Take Deposition
REVISED NOTICE by Michael Allegretto to take deposition of Darrell Johnson (Delano, D)
Blank 11 Filed: 8/18/1999, Entered: 8/19/1999 Notice to Take Deposition
NOTICE by D.R. Johnson to take the deposition of Michael Allegretto (Brunelle, E)
Blank 10 Filed: 8/3/1999, Entered: 8/3/1999 Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 1/28/00 ; Deadline for filing of all dispositive motions 2/28/00 ; Pretrial Memorandum Deadline 2/28/00 ; ( signed by Judge Mary M. Lisi ) (Burgess, J)
Blank -- Filed: 7/28/1999, Entered: 7/28/1999
Rule 16 Conference held. Attorney Jeffrey Michaelson for the plaintiff. Attorney Larry Parks for the defendant. Pretrial order to enter. (Burgess, J)
Blank -- Filed: 7/20/1999, Entered: 7/20/1999
Rule 16 Conference set 2:00 7/28/99 Before Judge Mary M. Lisi (Burgess, J)
Blank 9 Filed: 7/19/1999, Entered: 7/19/1999
ORDER granting [7-1] motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatory ( no objection having been timely filed) (McCabe, F)
Blank 8 Filed: 7/19/1999, Entered: 7/19/1999
ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Compel answers to interrogatories ( no objection having been timely filed) (McCabe, F)
Blank 7 Filed: 6/25/1999, Entered: 7/7/1999, Terminated: 7/19/1999 Terminated:
MOTION by Michael Allegretto to Compel Answers to Interrogatory (Brunelle, E)
Blank 6 Filed: 6/14/1999, Entered: 6/14/1999, Terminated: 7/19/1999 Motion to Compel
MOTION by D.R. Johnson to Compel answers to interrogatories (Brunelle, E)
Blank 5 Filed: 6/7/1999, Entered: 6/7/1999
NOTICE by Michael Allegretto to take the deposition of Darrell Johnson (Brunelle, E)
Blank 4 Filed: 6/2/1999, Entered: 6/2/1999
NOTICE by Michael Allegretto to take the deposition of Darrell Johnson (Brunelle, E)
Blank 3 Filed: 4/7/1999, Entered: 4/12/1999 Terminated:
ANSWER to Complaint by D.R. Johnson (Attorney Albert Lauriston Parks III), (Brunelle, E)
Blank 2 Filed: 3/24/1999, Entered: 3/24/1999
RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to D.R. Johnson on 3/18/99; Answer due on 4/7/99 for D.R. Johnson (Brunelle, E)
Blank 1 Filed: 2/23/1999, Entered: 2/23/1999
COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 41231 (McCabe, F)
Blank -- Filed: 2/23/1999, Entered: 2/23/1999
CASE assigned to Judge Mary M. Lisi . Assigned to Magistrate Judge Martin (McCabe, F)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 93 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?