Think Computer Corp v. Venchiarutti et al
California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:11-cv-05496-HRL
Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.cand.5-11-cv-05496 (What is this?)

Tags
The right information can save you thousands of dollars.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.

Case Summary (Last Edited by Aaron Greenspan)

Think Computer Corporation is suing the State of California Department of Financial Institutions, alleging that the 2010 California Money Transmission Act (MTA) is unconstitutional.

There are three main claims: that the MTA violates the Due Process Clause by requiring companies to apply for licenses before learning their prerequisites for applying; that the MTA violates the Dormant Commerce Clause by regulating commerce outside of California; and that the MTA violates the Dormant Commerce Clause by causing uneven requirements for licensure across various states, and by imposing more of a burden on society than it creates benefits.
Think Computer Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Marvin Cable

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Marvin Nathan Cable +1 413 268 6500 +1 888 691 9850 marvin@marvincable.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Michael Brooks Carroll

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Michael Brooks Carroll +1 415 788 7600 +1 415 421 7379 carroll_law@sbcglobal.net
v.
No Logo Edmund Brown, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Peter Keller Southworth +1 213 897 2638 +1 213 897 2802 Peter.southworth@doj.ca.gov
No Logo Jacob A Appelsmith, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Peter Keller Southworth +1 213 897 2638 +1 213 897 2802 Peter.southworth@doj.ca.gov
No Logo Kamala Harris, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Peter Keller Southworth +1 213 897 2638 +1 213 897 2802 Peter.southworth@doj.ca.gov
No Logo Robert Venchiarutti, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Ryan Marcroft +1 916 323 5313 +1 916 324 8835 Ryan.Marcroft@doj.ca.gov
Peter Keller Southworth +1 213 897 2638 +1 213 897 2802 Peter.southworth@doj.ca.gov
No Logo Traci Stevens, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Peter Keller Southworth +1 213 897 2638 +1 213 897 2802 Peter.southworth@doj.ca.gov
No Logo William Haraf, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Peter Keller Southworth +1 213 897 2638 +1 213 897 2802 Peter.southworth@doj.ca.gov
Office San Jose
Filed 11/14/2011
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $999000
Nature of Suit 950 - Constitutional - State Statute
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Santa Clara
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags ADRMOP,E-Filing
  Entries (83) Calendar Events Related (2) Tools Right End
PDF 52 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: 3/24/2014 Notice (Other)
NOTICE by Think Computer Corporation re [24] MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by State Defendants; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support, [30] Opposition/Response to Motion, [31] Reply to Opposition/Response, [40] Motion Hearing under L.R. 7-13 that motion has been under submission for more than 120 days (Aschenbrener, Michael) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
PDF 51 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: 3/20/2014 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting [49] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Marvin Nathan Cable terminated. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2014)
PDF 50 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: 10/15/2013 Request for Judicial Notice
Request for Judicial Notice filed byThink Computer Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F)(Aschenbrener, Michael) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
PDF 49 Filed: 8/10/2013, Entered: 8/10/2013, Terminated: 3/20/2014 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (pro hac vice) filed by Think Computer Corporation. Responses due by 8/26/2013. Replies due by 9/3/2013. (Cable, Marvin) (Filed on 8/10/2013)
PDF 48 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: 7/16/2013 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael James Aschenbrener for Plaintiff Think Computer Corp. (Aschenbrener, Michael) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
PDF 47 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: 3/14/2013 Request for Judicial Notice
Request for Judicial Notice filed by Think Computer Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Aaron Greenspan in Support of Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice) (Cable, Marvin) (Filed on 3/14/2013) Modified on 3/15/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
PDF 46 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: 2/27/2013 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER Denying Without Prejudice [45] Plaintiff's Counsel's Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/27/2013. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
PDF 45 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: 2/19/2013 Notice of Change In Counsel
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF CO-COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF THINK COMPUTER CORPORATION Before the Honorable Howard R. Lloydby Michael Brooks Carroll (Carroll, Michael) (Filed on 2/19/2013) Modified on 2/20/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
Blank  ADR Remark
ADR Remark: The further ADR Phone Conference scheduled for 9/18/12 did not take place. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
Blank  ADR Remark
ADR Remark: The further ADR Phone Conference scheduled for 9/18/12 did not take place. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
Blank  ADR Remark
ADR Remark: The further ADR Phone Conference scheduled for 9/18/12 did not take place. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
PDF 44 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: 7/17/2012 TranscriptCourt Filing
Transcript of Proceedings held on April 17, 2012, before Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Court Reporter/Transcriber Stacy Wegner, Telephone number 859-539-2802. Tape Number: FTR. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 8/7/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/17/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2012. (jy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
Blank  ADR Phone Conference held
ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by RWS on 7/16/12. A further ADR Phone Conference has been scheduled for 9/18/12 at 2:30 p.m. Pacific. The call-in information remains the same. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2012)
Blank  ADR Phone Conference held
ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by RWS on 7/16/12. A further ADR Phone Conference has been scheduled for 9/18/12 at 2:30 p.m. Pacific. The call-in information remains the same. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2012)
PDF 43 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: 5/18/2012 Request for Judicial Notice
Motion for Leave to File Request for Judicial Notice filed by Think Computer Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Supplement, # (2) Declaration)(Cable, Marvin) (Filed on 5/18/2012) Text modified on 5/18/2012 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
Blank  ADR Phone Conference held
ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by RWS on 5/15/12. A further ADR Phone Conference has been scheduled for 7/16/12 at 2:30 p.m. Pacific. Please note that the call-in information remains the same. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2012)
Blank  ADR Phone Conference held
ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by RWS on 5/15/12. A further ADR Phone Conference has been scheduled for 7/16/12 at 2:30 p.m. Pacific. Please note that the call-in information remains the same. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2012)
Blank  ADR Phone Conference held
ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by RWS on 5/15/12. A further ADR Phone Conference has been scheduled for 7/16/12 at 2:30 p.m. Pacific. Please note that the call-in information remains the same. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2012)
PDF 42 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: 5/10/2012 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re [41] Continuing Initial Case Management Conference. Case management conference set for 5/29/2012 is continued to a date to be set by the court contemporaneous with its written ruling on defendants' motion to dismiss.(hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
PDF 41 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: 5/8/2012, Terminated: 5/10/2012 Stipulation
STIPULATION TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; DECLARATION OF RYAN MARCROFT IN SUPPORT and (Proposed) Order filed by Jacob A Appelsmith, Edmund Brown, Jr, William Haraf, Kamala Harris, Traci Stevens, Robert Venchiarutti. (Marcroft, Ryan) (Filed on 5/8/2012) Modified on 5/8/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
PDF 40 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: 4/18/2012 Motion HearingCourt Filing
Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/17/2012 before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd (Date Filed: 4/17/2012) re [24]. (Court Reporter ftr.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/17/2012)
PACER 39 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: 4/17/2012 Motion HearingCourt Filing
*** FILED IN ERROR*** Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/17/2012 before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd (Date Filed: 4/17/2012) re [24] (Court Reporter ftr.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/17/2012) Modified on 4/18/2012 (pmc, COURT STAFF).
PDF 38 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: 4/16/2012 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting [36] Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Marvin Cable.(hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2012)
Blank  ADR Remark
ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference scheduled for 4/12/12 has been rescheduled to 5/15/12 at 1:30 p.m. Pacific. Please note that the call-in information remains the same. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2012)
Blank  ADR Remark
ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference scheduled for 4/12/12 has been rescheduled to 5/15/12 at 1:30 p.m. Pacific. Please note that the call-in information remains the same. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2012)
Blank  ADR Remark
ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference scheduled for 4/12/12 has been rescheduled to 5/15/12 at 1:30 p.m. Pacific. Please note that the call-in information remains the same. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2012)
Audio  Audio Recording Available Set Deadlines/Hearings
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 4/17/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
Blank  Set Deadlines/Hearings
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 4/17/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
Blank  Set Deadlines/Hearings
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 4/17/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
PDF 37 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: 4/11/2012 Proposed Order
(Proposed) Order Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Marvin Cable for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re [36] by Think Computer Corporation. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2012) Modified on 4/13/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
PDF 36 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: 4/11/2012 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Application for Admission of Attorney Marvin Cable for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305.00, receipt number 34611072669.) Filing fee previously paid on 4/6/2012 filed by Think Computer Corporation. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2012) Modified on 4/13/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
PDF 35 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: 3/16/2012 Order on Motion to Shorten TimeCourt Filing
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying [33] Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Shortening Time.(hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2012)
PDF 34 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: 3/14/2012 Opposition/Response to Motion
Response and Partial Oppositon to Plainitff's Motion to Change Time re [33]; Declaration of Ryan Marcroft in Support filed by Jacob A Appelsmith, Edmund Brown, Jr, William Haraf, Kamala Harris, Traci Stevens, Robert Venchiarutti. (Marcroft, Ryan) (Filed on 3/14/2012) Text modified, linkage added on 3/15/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
PDF 33 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: 3/13/2012, Terminated: 3/16/2012 Motion to Shorten Time
Motion to Change Time of Oral Argument Concerning Defendants' Motion To Dismiss And Scheduling Conference Pursuant to Local Rule 6-3 filed by Think Computer Corporation. (Carroll, Michael) (Filed on 3/13/2012) Text modified on 3/14/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
PDF 32 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: 3/12/2012 Clerks Notice
CLERKS NOTICE re Motion Hearing and Initial Case Management Conference. Hearing re [24] continued to 4/17/2012, 10:00 AM, Courtroom 2, San Jose. Case Management Statement due by 5/22/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/29/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2012)
PDF 31 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: 3/6/2012 Reply to Opposition/Response
Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of State Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint re [24] filed by Jacob A Appelsmith, Edmund Brown, Jr, William Haraf, Kamala Harris, Traci Stevens, Robert Venchiarutti. (Marcroft, Ryan) (Filed on 3/6/2012) Modified on 3/8/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
PDF 30 Filed: 3/3/2012, Entered: 3/3/2012 Opposition/Response to Motion
Response and Opposition to State Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (re [24] filed by Think Computer Corporation. (Carroll, Michael) (Filed on 3/3/2012) Modified on 3/5/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
PDF 29 Filed: 3/3/2012, Entered: 3/3/2012 Notice (Other)
Notice of Court of Filing of [Errata] Plaintiffs Response and Opposition To State Defendants Motion to Dismiss by Think Computer Corporation (Carroll, Michael) (Filed on 3/3/2012) Modified on 3/5/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
PDF 28 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: 2/29/2012 Request for Judicial Notice
Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Response to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss and Exhibits A-B re [25] filed by Think Computer Corporation. (Carroll, Michael) (Filed on 2/29/2012) Modified on 3/1/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
PDF 27 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: 2/29/2012 Request for Judicial Notice
Exhibits C to Response and Opposition to State Defendants' Motion to Dismiss re [25] filed by Think Computer Corporation. (Carroll, Michael) (Filed on 2/29/2012) Text modified on 3/1/2012 conforming to posted document caption; incorrect event type used when posting Exhibit (bw, COURT STAFF).
PDF 26 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: 2/28/2012 Request for Judicial Notice
Exhibits D-F to Response and Opposition to State Defendants' Motion to Dismiss re [25] filed by Think Computer Corporation. (Carroll, Michael) (Filed on 2/28/2012) Text modified on 3/1/2012 conforming to posted document incorrect event type used when posting Exhibits (bw, COURT STAFF).
PDF 25 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: 2/28/2012 Opposition/Response to Motion
Response and Opposition to State Defendants' Motion to Dismiss re [24] filed by Think Computer Corporation. (Carroll, Michael) (Filed on 2/28/2012) Modified on 3/1/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
Blank  ADR Remark
ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference scheduled for 2/22/12 has been rescheduled to 4/12/12 at 10:30 a.m. Pacific. Please note that the call-in information remains the same. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2012)
Blank  ADR Remark
ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference scheduled for 2/22/12 has been rescheduled to 4/12/12 at 10:30 a.m. Pacific. Please note that the call-in information remains the same. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2012)
Blank  ADR Remark
ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference scheduled for 2/22/12 has been rescheduled to 4/12/12 at 10:30 a.m. Pacific. Please note that the call-in information remains the same. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2012)
PDF 24 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: 2/14/2012 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint re [23] by State Defendants; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Jacob A Appelsmith, Edmund Brown, Jr, William Haraf, Kamala Harris, Traci Stevens, Robert Venchiarutti. Motion Hearing set for 3/27/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Responses due by 2/28/2012. Replies due by 3/6/2012. (Attachments: # (1) (Proposed) Order Granting State Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Marcroft, Ryan) (Filed on 2/14/2012) Modified on 2/14/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
PDF 23 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: 1/31/2012 Amended Complaint
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and jury demand against All Defendants. Filed byThink Computer Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Schedule B To First Amended Complaint) (Carroll, Michael) (Filed on 1/31/2012) Modified on 1/31/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
  • Attachment 1: Exhibit Schedule B To First Amended Complaint
PDF 22 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: 1/27/2012 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER re [20] by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd for Filing of Amended Complaint. Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint due by 1/31/2012. Defendants' answer or response due as per Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a). Initial case management conference continued to 4/17/2012, 1:30 PM.(hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2012)
Blank  Set Deadlines/Hearings
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 4/10/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/17/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2012)
Blank  Set Deadlines/Hearings
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 4/10/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/17/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2012)
Blank  Set Deadlines/Hearings
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 4/10/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/17/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2012)
PDF 21 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: 1/24/2012 Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Think Computer Corporation (Carroll, Michael) (Filed on 1/24/2012) Modified on 1/24/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
PDF 20 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: 1/23/2012, Terminated: 1/27/2012 Stipulation
STIPULATION for Filing of Amended Complaint and (Proposed) Order filed by Jacob A Appelsmith, Edmund Brown, Jr, William Haraf, Kamala Harris, Traci Stevens, Robert Venchiarutti. (Southworth, Peter) (Filed on 1/23/2012) Modified on 1/24/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
Blank  ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference
ADR Clerk Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 2/22/12 at 9:30 a.m. Pacific. The court will provide instructions for connecting to the call in a separate notice to the parties. (TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY) (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2012)
Blank  ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference
ADR Clerk Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 2/22/12 at 9:30 a.m. Pacific. The court will provide instructions for connecting to the call in a separate notice to the parties. (TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY) (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2012)
Blank  ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference
ADR Clerk Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 2/22/12 at 9:30 a.m. Pacific. The court will provide instructions for connecting to the call in a separate notice to the parties. (TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY) (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2012)
PDF 19 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jacob A Appelsmith, Edmund Brown, Jr, William Haraf, Kamala Harris, Traci Stevens, Robert Venchiarutti .. (Southworth, Peter) (Filed on 1/18/2012)
PDF 18 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: 1/13/2012 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER re [15] Extending Defendants' Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendants' answer or response to complaint due by 1/23/2012. Initial case management conference continued to 2/28/2012, 1:30 PM. No later than 1/24/2012, each party to file either consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/13/2012. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2012)
Blank  Set Deadlines/Hearings
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 2/21/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/28/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2012)
Blank  Set Deadlines/Hearings
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 2/21/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/28/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2012)
Blank  Set Deadlines/Hearings
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 2/21/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/28/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2012)
PDF 17 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: 1/12/2012 Notice of need of ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d)
NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference by All Parties (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Southworth, Peter) (Filed on 1/12/2012) Modified on 1/13/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
PDF 16 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: 1/12/2012 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of ADR options
ADR Certification by Defendants and Counsel (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Southworth, Peter) (Filed on 1/12/2012) Modified on 1/13/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
PDF 15 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: 1/12/2012 Stipulation
STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint re [1] by Jacob A Appelsmith, Edmund Brown, Jr, William Haraf, Kamala Harris, Traci Stevens, Robert Venchiarutti. (Southworth, Peter) (Filed on 1/12/2012) Modified on 1/13/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
PDF 14 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: 1/5/2012 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying as moot [2] Motion for Electronic Case Filing; denying as moot [5] Motion for Exemption from Local Rule 3-9(b); granting [13] defendants' Motion to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Initial case management conference set for 1/31/2012, 1:30 PM. Related deadlines adjusted. Each party to file consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 1/24/2012. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
Blank  Set Deadlines/Hearings
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 1/24/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/31/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
Blank  Set Deadlines/Hearings
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 1/24/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/31/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
Blank  Set Deadlines/Hearings
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 1/24/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/31/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
PDF 13 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: 1/3/2012, Terminated: 1/5/2012 Motion to Continue
Unopposed Motion for Administrative Relief (to Continue Case Management Conference) filed by Jacob A Appelsmith, Edmund Brown, Jr, William Haraf, Kamala Harris, Traci Stevens, Robert Venchiarutti. (Attachments: # (1) (Proposed) Order)(Southworth, Peter) (Filed on 1/3/2012) Text modified on 1/5/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
  • Attachment 1: Proposed Order
PDF 12 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: 1/3/2012 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEl by THINK COMPUTER CORPORATION (Carroll, Michael) (Filed on 1/3/2012) Modified on 1/5/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF).
PDF 11 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: 11/29/2011 Summons Issued
Summons Issued as to Traci Stevens. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011) Modified on 12/12/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
PDF 10 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: 11/29/2011 Summons Issued
Summons Issued as to Edmund Brown, Jr. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
PDF 9 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: 11/29/2011 Summons Issued
Summons Issued as to Jacob A Appelsmith. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
PDF 8 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: 11/29/2011 Summons Issued
Summons Issued as to William Haraf. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
PDF 7 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: 11/29/2011 Summons Issued
Summons Issued as to Kamala Harris. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
PDF 6 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: 11/29/2011 Summons Issued
Summons Issued as to Robert Venchiarutti. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
PDF 5 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: 11/17/2011, Terminated: 1/5/2012 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION for Exemption from Local rule 3-9(b) filed by Think Computer Corp;. Responses due by 12/1/2011. Replies due by 12/8/2011. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2011) Modified on 11/28/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
PDF 4 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: 11/15/2011 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 1/3/2011. Case Management Conference set for 1/10/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011)
PDF 3 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: 11/15/2011 Received Document
(Proposed) Order Granting MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing re [2] by Think Computer Corp. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011) Modified on 11/28/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
PDF 2 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: 11/15/2011 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Think Computer Corp. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011) Modified on 11/28/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
PDF 1 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: 11/15/2011 Complaint
COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief (NO PROCESS: jury demand; against Jacob A Appelsmith, William Haraf, Kamala Harris, Traci Stevens, Robert Venchiarutti ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611010747). Filed by Think Computer Corp. (Attachments: # (1) Schedule A to Complaint, # (2) Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011) Modified on 11/28/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
  • Attachment 1: Schedule A to Complaint
  • Attachment 2: Civil Cover Sheet
Blank  Case Referred to ECF
CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011)
Blank  Case Referred to ECF
CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 4,877 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?