Bleu Disque Music Co, et al v. 4040 East Evans Inc, et al
Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00158-PSF-OES
District Judge Phillip S. Figa, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.cod.1-03-cv-00158-PSF (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
The right information can save you thousands of dollars.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Bleu Disque Music Company, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Hart LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Conor Fitzgerald Farley +1 303 295 8432 +1 303 295 8261 cfarley@hollandhart.com
James Edward Hartley +1 303 295 8237 +1 303 975 5486 jhartley@hollandhart.com
No Logo Elliot Wolff Music, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Hart LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Conor Fitzgerald Farley +1 303 295 8432 +1 303 295 8261 cfarley@hollandhart.com
James Edward Hartley +1 303 295 8237 +1 303 975 5486 jhartley@hollandhart.com
No Logo EMI April Music, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Hart LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Conor Fitzgerald Farley +1 303 295 8432 +1 303 295 8261 cfarley@hollandhart.com
James Edward Hartley +1 303 295 8237 +1 303 975 5486 jhartley@hollandhart.com
No Logo EMI Virgin Music, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Hart LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Conor Fitzgerald Farley +1 303 295 8432 +1 303 295 8261 cfarley@hollandhart.com
James Edward Hartley +1 303 295 8237 +1 303 975 5486 jhartley@hollandhart.com
No Logo Music Sales Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Hart LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Conor Fitzgerald Farley +1 303 295 8432 +1 303 295 8261 cfarley@hollandhart.com
James Edward Hartley +1 303 295 8237 +1 303 975 5486 jhartley@hollandhart.com
No Logo Perren Vibes Music Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Hart LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Conor Fitzgerald Farley +1 303 295 8432 +1 303 295 8261 cfarley@hollandhart.com
James Edward Hartley +1 303 295 8237 +1 303 975 5486 jhartley@hollandhart.com
No Logo Sony/ATV Tunes LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Hart LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Conor Fitzgerald Farley +1 303 295 8432 +1 303 295 8261 cfarley@hollandhart.com
James Edward Hartley +1 303 295 8237 +1 303 975 5486 jhartley@hollandhart.com
No Logo Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Hart LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Conor Fitzgerald Farley +1 303 295 8432 +1 303 295 8261 cfarley@hollandhart.com
James Edward Hartley +1 303 295 8237 +1 303 975 5486 jhartley@hollandhart.com
No Logo Wb Music Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Hart LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Conor Fitzgerald Farley +1 303 295 8432 +1 303 295 8261 cfarley@hollandhart.com
James Edward Hartley +1 303 295 8237 +1 303 975 5486 jhartley@hollandhart.com
No Logo Webo Girl Publishing, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Hart LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Conor Fitzgerald Farley +1 303 295 8432 +1 303 295 8261 cfarley@hollandhart.com
James Edward Hartley +1 303 295 8237 +1 303 975 5486 jhartley@hollandhart.com
No Logo 4040 East Evans, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Christakes S. Christou, Defendant
No Logo Bank One, NA, Garnishee
JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Garnishee
Office Denver
Filed 1/24/2003
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 820 - Copyright
Cause Section 17 U.S.C. § 501 Copyright Infringement
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Judgment on Consent
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 5/27/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags NDISPO, SuppressAnsRpt, TERMED
  Entries (84) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PDF 83 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Answer to Writ of Garnishment
ANSWER to [76] and [77] Writ of Garnishment by Garnishee JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A.(sss, )
PDF 82 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Answer to Writ of Garnishment
ANSWER to [76] Writ of Garnishment by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (sss, )
PDF 81 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008 Answer to Writ of Garnishment
ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Bank One.(sss, )
PDF 80 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 Statement
STATEMENT re [52] Judgment, of Partial Satisfaction of Judgment by Plaintiff Bleu Disque Music Company, Inc.. (Farley, Conor)
PDF 79 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 Affidavit
AFFIDAVIT re [77] Writ of Garnishment (judgment debtor Christakes Christou) served to Garnishee 07/25/08 by Plaintiff Bleu Disque Music Company, Inc.. (Farley, Conor)
PDF 78 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 Affidavit
AFFIDAVIT re [76] Writ of Garnishment (judgment debtor 4040 East Evans) served on Garnishee 07/25/08 by Plaintiffs Perren Vibes Music Inc., Bleu Disque Music Company, Inc.. (Farley, Conor)
PDF 77 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Writ of Garnishment
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued upon Bank One N.A. re. Judgment Debtor Christakes S. Christou. (sss, )
PDF 76 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Writ of Garnishment
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued upon Bank One N.A. re. Judgment Debtor 4040 East Evans, Inc. (sss, )
PDF 75 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: 12/7/2007 Order on Motion for Disbursement of FundsCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' [74] Motion for Disbursement of Funds and Orders that the amount of $8,664.25 be paid out of the Court Registry of the Court to Plaintiffs' authorized agent, American Society of Composer, Authors and Publishers, and disbursed to Plaintiffs' counsel, Holland & Hart LLP. Signed by Judge Phillip S. Figa on 12/7/07.(mrs, )
PACER 74 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: 11/21/2007, Terminated: 12/7/2007 Motion for Disbursement of Funds
MOTION for Disbursement of Funds by Plaintiffs Perren Vibes Music Inc., Bleu Disque Music Company, Inc., WB Music Corp., Webo Girl Publishing, Inc., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., EMI April Music, Inc., Music Sales Corporation, EMI Virgin Music, Inc., Elliot Wolff Music, Sony/ATV Tunes LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Farley, Conor)
PDF 73 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: 11/15/2007 Receipt
RECEIPT for Garnishment funds of $8,664.25 from National Account Services re: [72] Order (gms, )
PDF 72 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: 10/17/2007 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
ORDER To Pay Money Into Court Registry. Plaintiffs' Amended [69] Motion for Order to Pay Money Into the Court Registry is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Phillip S. Figa on 10/17/07.(mrs)
Blank 71 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007 Docket Annotation
Docket Annotation re: [69] MOTION for Order to Pay Money Into the Court Registry. [This docket entry modified to indicate attached PDF is an Amended motion.] Text only entry - no document attached. (mrs)
PDF 70 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 Answer to Writ of Garnishment
ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment with Notice of Exemption and Pending Levy [54] by Bank One, N.A. a/k/a Chase Bank. (gms, )
PACER 69 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007, Terminated: 10/17/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Amended MOTION for Order to Pay Money Into the Court Registry by Plaintiffs Perren Vibes Music Inc., Bleu Disque Music Company, Inc., WB Music Corp., Webo Girl Publishing, Inc., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., EMI April Music, Inc., Music Sales Corporation, EMI Virgin Music, Inc., Elliot Wolff Music, Sony/ATV Tunes LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Farley, Conor) Modified on 10/3/2007 to indicate motion amended (mrs, ).
PDF 68 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER GRANTING [67] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Neil L. Arney terminated as counsel for Defendants. Defendants are reminded that should either of them wish to file a response to plaintiffs' Motion to Pay Money into the Court Registry, such response shall be filed no later than 10/1/07, by Judge Phillip S. Figa on 9/21/07.(mrssl)
PACER 67 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/19/2007, Terminated: 9/21/2007 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendants 4040 East Evans, Inc., Christakes S. Christou. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Arney, Neil)
PDF 66 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/19/2007 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER DENYING [65] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, for failure to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 83.3D, by Judge Phillip S. Figa on 9/19/07.(mrs)
PACER 65 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007, Terminated: 9/19/2007 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendants 4040 East Evans, Inc., Christakes S. Christou. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Arney, Neil)
PDF 64 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007 Certificate of Mailing
CERTIFICATE of Mailing to JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. by Clerk of Court re [63] Minute Order. (mrs)
PDF 63 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007 OrderCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER: Defendants shall file a response no later than 10/1/07 re: Plaintiff's [59] MOTION for Order to Pay Money into the Court Registry filed by Music Sales Corporation, Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Elliot Wolff Music, Sony/ATV Tunes LLC, Webo Girl Publishing, Inc., Perren Vibes Music Inc., WB Music Corp., EMI Virgin Music, Inc., Bleu Disque Music Company, Inc., EMI April Music, Inc. Should the garnishee in this matter, JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A., wish to file a response, such response shall be filed no later than 10/1/07, by Judge Phillip S. Figa on 9/17/07. (mrs)
Blank 60 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007 Docket Annotation
Docket Annotation re: [57] Affidavit/Return of Service, this docket entry modified to clarify Writ served on Judgment Debtor. Text only entry - no document attached. (mrs, )
PDF 62 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007 Answer to Writ of Garnishment
ANSWER to [54] Writ of Garnishment by Garnishee JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A. (mrs)
PDF 61 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007 Answer to Writ of Garnishment
ANSWER/Letter to [54] Writ of Garnishment with Notice of Exemption and Pending Levy by Garnishee JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A. (mrs)
PACER 59 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: 9/13/2007, Terminated: 10/2/2007 Motion for Order
MOTION for Order to Pay Money into the Court Registry by Plaintiffs Perren Vibes Music Inc., Bleu Disque Music Company, Inc., WB Music Corp., Webo Girl Publishing, Inc., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., EMI April Music, Inc., Music Sales Corporation, EMI Virgin Music, Inc., Elliot Wolff Music, Sony/ATV Tunes LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Farley, Conor)
PACER 58 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007 Answer to Writ of Garnishment
ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment with Notice of Exemption and Pending Levy re [54] by JP Morgan Chase NA. (Attachments: # (1) Statement re Funds)(mrs, )
PDF 57 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007 Affidavit/Return of Service
AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Writ of Garnishment upon Christakes S. Christou (Judgment Debtor) on 08/25/2007, filed by Plaintiffs Perren Vibes Music Inc., Bleu Disque Music Company, Inc., WB Music Corp., Webo Girl Publishing, Inc., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., EMI April Music, Inc., Music Sales Corporation, EMI Virgin Music, Inc., Elliot Wolff Music, Sony/ATV Tunes LLC (Farley, Conor) Modified on 9/17/2007 to clarify Writ served on Judgment debtor (mrs, ).
PDF 56 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007 Affidavit/Return of Service
AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Writ of Garnishment (replaces docket #55) upon Chase Bank on 08/24/2007, filed by Plaintiffs Perren Vibes Music Inc., Bleu Disque Music Company, Inc., WB Music Corp., Webo Girl Publishing, Inc., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., EMI April Music, Inc., Music Sales Corporation, EMI Virgin Music, Inc., Elliot Wolff Music, Sony/ATV Tunes LLC (Farley, Conor)
PDF 55 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007 Affidavit/Return of Service
AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Writ of Garnishment With Notice of Exemption and Pending Levy upon Chase Bank on 08/24/2007, filed by Plaintiffs Perren Vibes Music Inc., Bleu Disque Music Company, Inc., WB Music Corp., Webo Girl Publishing, Inc., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc., EMI April Music, Inc., Music Sales Corporation, EMI Virgin Music, Inc., Elliot Wolff Music, Sony/ATV Tunes LLC (Farley, Conor)
PDF 54 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: 8/24/2007 Writ of Garnishment
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT with Notice of Exemption and Pending Levy issued to Bank One, NA n/ka Chase Bank by clerk (gms, )
PDF 53 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: 8/3/2007 Certificate of Judgment for Lien Upon Land and Ten
CERTIFICATE of Judgment for Lien Upon Land and Tenements (Transcript of Judgment) issued by Clerk (mrs, )
Blank 52 Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: 5/27/2004 JudgmentCourt Filing
FINAL JUDGMENT ON CONSENT: by United States District Court Judge, Phillip S. Figa granting motion for entry of final judgment on consent [51-1] terminating case (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/27/04 (dlb)
Blank 51 Filed: 5/26/2004, Entered: 5/27/2004 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b)
MOTION by plaintiffs for entry of final judgment on consent (dlb)
Blank 50 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004 OrderCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter granting motion to extend time to file reply in sup of mtn to to 5/21/04 [48-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/17/04 (erv)
Blank 49 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/14/2004 MemorandumCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM by Judge Phillip S. Figa referring to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter the motion to extend time to file reply in sup of mtn to compel to 5/21/04 [48-1] (dlb)
Blank 48 Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: 5/12/2004, Terminated: 5/17/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
Unopposed MOTION by plaintiffs to extend time to file reply in sup of mtn to compel to 5/21/04 (dlb)
Blank 47 Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: 5/6/2004 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Phillip S. Figa granting motion to extend time to file reply in sup of mtn to comp to 5/11/04 [45-1], regarding [35-1] motion to compel production of documents (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/6/04 (dlb)
Blank 46 Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: 5/6/2004 OrderCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter granting motion to extend time to file reply in sup of mtn to comp to 5/11/04 [45-1], regarding [35-1] motion to compel production of documents (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/6/04 (dlb)
Blank 45 Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004, Terminated: 5/5/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
Unopposed MOTION by plaintiffs to extend time to file reply in sup of mtn to comp to 5/11/04 (dlb)
Blank 44 Filed: 4/20/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004 OrderCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter ; pending motions/in court hrg set for 1:00 6/7/04 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 4/21/04 (dlb)
Blank 43 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004 Response to Motion
RESPONSE by defendants to pla's motion to compel production of documents [35-1] (dlb)
Blank 42 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004 OrderCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter granting motion to extend deadline to respond to motion to compel until 04/16/04 [40-1], regarding [35-1] motion to compel production of documents (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 4/8/04 (dlb)
Blank 41 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004 MemorandumCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM by Judge Phillip S. Figa referring to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter the motion to extend deadline to respond to motion to compel until 04/16/04 [40-1] (dlb)
Blank 40 Filed: 4/6/2004, Entered: 4/7/2004, Terminated: 4/7/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
Unopposed MOTION by defendants to extend deadline to respond to motion to compel until 04/16/04 (bpm)
Blank 39 Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: 3/19/2004 Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
Amended PRE-TRIAL ORDER by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter; trial to a jury, estimated 2-3 days (cc: all counsel) (dlb)
Blank 38 Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: 3/19/2004 Pretrial Conference - FinalCourt Filing
COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter , ; pretrial conf held 3/18/04 ; entry date : 3/19/04 Court Reporter: FTR - Ctrm 6 (dlb)
Blank 37 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: 3/18/2004 OrderCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter regarding [35-1] motion to compel production of documents. Pla shall have to and including 04/02/04 in which to respond to pla's motion to compel (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/18/04 (bpm)
Blank 36 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: 3/18/2004 MemorandumCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM by Judge Phillip S. Figa referring to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter the motion to compel production of documents [35-1] (erv)
Blank 35 Filed: 3/16/2004, Entered: 3/17/2004 Motion to Compel
MOTION by plaintiffs' to compel production of documents (erv)
Blank 34 Filed: 3/12/2004, Entered: 3/15/2004 MemorandumCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM by Judge Phillip S. Figa referring to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter the unopposed motion to extend time to file PTO to 3/15/04 [32-1] (bpm)
Blank 33 Filed: 3/12/2004, Entered: 3/15/2004 OrderCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter granting motion to extend time to file PTO to 3/15/04 [32-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/15/04 (dlb)
Blank 32 Filed: 3/11/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004, Terminated: 3/12/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
Unopposed MOTION by plaintiffs to extend time to file PTO to 3/15/04 (dlb)
Blank 31 Filed: 2/20/2004, Entered: 2/23/2004 OrderCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter granting unopposed motion to extend ddl for dis to 3/18/04 and to file dispo mtns to 4/1/04 [28-1] ; discovery ddl reset 3/18/04 ; disp mtn ddl reset 4/1/04 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 2/23/04 (pap)
Blank 30 Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: 2/23/2004 MemorandumCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM by Judge Phillip S. Figa referring to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter the motion to extend ddl for dis to 3/18/04 and to file dispo mtns to 4/1/04 [28-1] (dlb)
Blank 29 Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: 2/20/2004 OrderCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter ; pretrial conf reset for 9:15 3/18/04 upon oral motion of csl (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 2/20/04 (lam)
Blank 28 Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: 2/20/2004, Terminated: 2/20/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
Unopposed MOTION by defendants to extend ddl for dis to 3/18/04 and to file dispo mtns to 4/1/04 (lam)
Blank 27 Filed: 2/10/2004, Entered: 2/11/2004 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Phillip S. Figa ; Trial prep conference re set for 8:00 6/25/04 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 2/11/04 (dlb)
Blank 26 Filed: 1/5/2004, Entered: 1/6/2004 MemorandumCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM by Judge Phillip S. Figa referring to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter the motion response [24-1] (bpm)
Blank 25 Filed: 1/2/2004, Entered: 1/5/2004 OrderCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting unopposed motion to extend ddl to complete disc to 2/18/04 and dispo mtns ddl to 3/3/04 [23-1] ; discovery ddl set 2/18/04 ; disp mtn ddl set 3/3/04 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/5/04 (lam)
Blank 24 Filed: 12/31/2003, Entered: 1/2/2004 Response to Motion
RESPONSE by plaintiffs to motion to extend ddl to complete disc to 2/18/04 and dispo mtns ddl to 3/3/04 [23-1] (lam)
Blank 23 Filed: 12/30/2003, Entered: 12/31/2003, Terminated: 1/2/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
Unopposed MOTION by dfts 4040 East Evans Inc, Christakes S. Christou to extend ddl to complete disc to 2/18/04 and dispo mtns ddl to 3/3/04 (lam)
Blank 22 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: 12/4/2003 OrderCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter by stipulation of the parties ; discovery ddl reset 1/9/04 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 12/4/03 (pap)
Blank 21 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: 12/3/2003 MemorandumCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter ; settlement conf held 12/3/03 (erv)
Blank 20 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: 11/25/2003 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Marcia S. Krieger Case reassigned to Judge Phillip S. Figa (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 11/25/03 (gms)
Blank 19 Filed: 11/19/2003, Entered: 11/20/2003 OrderCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter, due to a conflict arising on the court's calendar, the settlement conf has been reset ; settlement conf reset for 1:30 12/3/03 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 11/20/03 (erv)
Blank 18 Filed: 10/10/2003, Entered: 10/14/2003 OrderCourt Filing
Trial Prep ORDER by Judge Marcia S. Krieger ; four day jury trial set for 1:00 7/12/04 on a trailing docket in second position ; Trial prep conference set for 8:00 6/18/04 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/14/03 (erv)
Blank 17 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 10/1/2003 OrderCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter, On oral motion of Csl, the Settlement Conf has been reset ; settlement conf Reset for 1:30 12/4/03 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/1/03 (erv)
Blank 16 Filed: 9/16/2003, Entered: 9/18/2003 OrderCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter; It appears from a review of the Ct's ifle athat this matter has not yet been scheduled for trial. Csl are therefore directed to contact the chambers of Judge Marcia Krieger and schedule this matter for trial without delay (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 9/18/03 (erv)
Blank 15 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: 7/23/2003 OrderCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter, on oral motion of csl, the settlement conf has been reset ; settlement conf set for 3:00 10/1/03 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/23/03 (erv)
Blank 14 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 OrderCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter ; further settlement conf set for 10:30 7/23/03 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 6/30/03 (pap)
Blank 13 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: 6/11/2003 OrderCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter, On Oral Motion of Csl, the settlement conf has been reset ; settlement conf set for 3:00 6/26/03 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 6/11/03 (erv)
Blank 12 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: 5/20/2003 OrderCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter ; settlement conf set for 3:00 6/16/03 ; pretrial conf set for 9:00 2/20/04 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/20/03 (erv)
Blank 11 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: 5/20/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter (cc: all counsel) (erv)
Blank 10 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: 5/20/2003 Minutes - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter ; rule 16 conf held on 5/19/03 ; discovery ddl set 12/19/03 ; disp mtn ddl set 1/19/04 ; pretrial conf set for 9:00 2/20/04 ; settlement conf set for 3:00 6/16/03 ; entry date : 5/20/03 Court Reporter: Tape No OES 03-8 (pap)
Blank 9 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: 3/18/2003 Answer to Complaint
ANSWER by defendant to complaint [1-1]; jury demand (erv)
Blank 8 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 Stipulation for Extension of Time
STIPULATION for extension of time to answer or respond to Answer Complaint to 3/17/03 by plaintiff Bleu Disque Music Co, plaintiff WB Music Corp., plaintiff Webo Girl Pblsh Inc, plaintiff Universal-Polygram, plaintiff EMI April Music Inc, plaintiff Music Sales Corp, plaintiff EMI Virgin Music Inc, plaintiff Elliot Wolff Music, plaintiff Sony/ATV Tunes LLC, plaintiff Perren Vibes Music, defendant 4040 East Evans Inc, defendant Christakes S. Christou (erv)
Blank 7 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: 2/27/2003 Rule 16 ConferenceCourt Filing
ORDER FOR RULE 16 CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter ; Rule 16 conference set for 9:30 5/19/03 (cc: all counsel) (erv)
Blank 6 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003 CertificateCourt Filing
CERTIFICATE of Service by Plas' Re: Order of reference to the Magistrate Judge and Order of Opportunity for Accelerated service (erv)
Blank 5 Filed: 2/21/2003, Entered: 2/25/2003 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER of Opportunity for Accelerated Service by Judge Marcia S. Krieger (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 2/25/03 (erv)
Blank 4 Filed: 2/21/2003, Entered: 2/25/2003 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
ORDER R16,stat,stlmt,pt,pto referred to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter by Judge Marcia S. Krieger (cc: to counsel) (erv) Modified on 12/16/2003
Blank 3 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: 2/19/2003 Summons Returned Executed
RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint upon defendant 4040 East Evans Inc on 2/13/03 by leaving with: Elani Christou (erv)
Blank 2 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003 Summons Returned Executed
RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint upon defendant Christakes S. Christou on 1/29/03 by leaving with: Christakes S. Christou (erv)
Blank 1 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: 1/27/2003 Complaint
COMPLAINT (Summons(es) issued) (bpm)
Blank -- Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: 1/27/2003 Filing Fee Received
FILING FEE PAID: on 1/24/03 in the amount of $ 150, receipt # 240885. (bpm)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 196 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?