FTC v. Trudeau, et al
Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-03904
District Judge Robert W. Gettleman, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.ilnd.1-03-cv-03904 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Judges don't know as much about themselves as we do.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
Federal Trade Commission, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Heather Hippsley +1 301 627 5500
Daniel P. Kaufman +1 202 408 6088 +1 202 408 4400
Elizabeth Tucci +1 703 299 3700

Toggle Switch Represented by Federal Trade Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Sandhya Prabhu Brown +1 202 326 2040 sbrown5@ftc.gov
Karen D. Dodge +1 312 960 5634 kdodge@ftc.gov
Todd Matthew Kossow +1 312 960 5634 tkossow@ftc.gov
Peter B Miller +1 202 326 2675
David A. O'Toole +1 312 960 5634 +1 312 960 5600 dotoole@ftc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Reminger & Reminger - Cleveland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Laura Sullivan +1 216 687 1311

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Laureen Kapin +1 202 307 1011
v.
No Logo Deonna Enterprises, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Collier, Shannon, Rill & Scott, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Lewis Rose +1 202 342 8400

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David L. Schiavone +1 312 876 8000

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Harvey I. Saferstein +1 310 586 3200 +1 310 586 3202 hsaferstein@mintz.com
No Logo Kevin Trudeau, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David J. Bradford +1 312 923 2975

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Daniel Jay Hurtado +1 312 222 9350 dhurtado@jenner.com
David Jimenez-Ekman +1 312 923 2683 +1 312 840 7683 djimenez-ekman@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Katherine R Saunders +1 202 637 2200 katharine.saunders@lw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
John F Kness +1 312 558 8802 john.kness@usdoj.gov

Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

No Logo Robert Barefoot, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Collier, Shannon, Rill & Scott, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Lewis Rose +1 202 342 8400

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David L. Schiavone +1 312 876 8000

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Harvey I. Saferstein +1 310 586 3200 +1 310 586 3202 hsaferstein@mintz.com
No Logo Shop America (USA), LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David J. Bradford +1 312 923 2975

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David Jimenez-Ekman +1 312 923 2683 +1 312 840 7683 djimenez-ekman@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Katherine R Saunders +1 202 637 2200 katharine.saunders@lw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
John F Kness +1 312 558 8802 john.kness@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Kimball Richard Anderson +1 312 558 5600 +1 312 558 5700 kanderson@winston.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 0045
Nature of Suit 890 Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (795) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerPrevious 500DividerNext 500DividerEarliest 500

Need legal research help? Let us know!
PACER 904 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace
PACER 903 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 902 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 900 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Status Hearing Held
Request RequestSpace
PACER 898 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
Request RequestSpace
PACER 894 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
Request RequestSpace
PACER 892 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
Request RequestSpace
PACER 887 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
Request RequestSpace
PACER 886 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
Request RequestSpace
PACER 884 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None order on motion to file instanter
Request RequestSpace
PACER 882 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None File Instanter
Request RequestSpace
PACER 879 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None Compel
Request RequestSpace
PACER 878 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 876 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 874 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace
PACER 873 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace
PACER 872 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 869 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 777 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: 10/22/2013 order on motion for leave to file
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file [774] a statement concerning defendant's letters of direction is granted. Status hearing held on 10/22/2013. Status hearing set for 10/24/2013 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 776 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: 10/21/2013 other
Statement by Kevin Trudeau Regarding Purging Civil Contempt (Attachments: # (1) Index of Exhibits, # (2) Exhibit A-Z)(Anderson, Kimball)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 775 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: 10/21/2013 notice of motion
NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion for leave to file, [774] before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/22/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Cohen, Jonathan)
Request RequestSpace
PDF 774 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: 10/21/2013 motion for leave to file
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for leave to file a Statement Concerning Defendant's Letters of Direction (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Statement Concerning Defendant's Letters of Direction, # (2) Exhibits PXA-PXC to Proposed Statement Concerning Defendant's Letters of Direction)(Cohen, Jonathan)
PDF 773 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: 10/17/2013 order
AMENDED ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/17/2013: Mailed notice (gds)
PACER 772 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: 10/16/2013 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
ORDER signed by the Honorable Judge Robert Gettleman on 10/16/2013. Status hearing held on 10/16/2013. FTC motion for leave to file [767] reply is granted. Receiver's motion for leave to file [769] reply is granted. The U.S. Marshal is directed to take defendant Kevin Trudeau into custody on 10/22/2013 after this court's 9:30 a.m. hearing, and hold him until further order of court. Defendant Trudeau's oral motion for a stay of this order pending appeal is denied. Status hearing set for 10/22/2013 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (gds)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 771 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: 10/15/2013 response in opposition to motion
RESPONSE by Kevin Trudeauin Opposition to MOTION by Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC for leave to file Receiver's Reply in Support of the Imposition of Coercive Sanctions[769], MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for leave to file a Reply in Support of Coercive Incarceration[767] (Anderson, Kimball)
Request RequestSpace
PDF 770 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: 10/15/2013 notice of motion
NOTICE of Motion by Blair Robert Zanzig for presentment of motion for leave to file[769] before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/16/2013 at 01:30 PM. (Zanzig, Blair)
PACER 769 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: 10/15/2013 motion for leave to file
MOTION by Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC for leave to file Receiver's Reply in Support of the Imposition of Coercive Sanctions (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Zanzig, Blair)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 768 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: 10/14/2013 notice of motion
NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion for leave to file[767] before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/16/2013 at 01:30 PM. (Cohen, Jonathan)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 767 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: 10/14/2013 motion for leave to file
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for leave to file a Reply in Support of Coercive Incarceration (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Reply, # (2) Exhibits PXA:1-PXA:27 to Proposed Reply)(Cohen, Jonathan)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 766 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: 10/11/2013 other
Opposition to the FTC's and the Receiver's Statements Regarding the Need for Coercive Sanctions by Kevin Trudeau (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1-11)(Anderson, Kimball)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 765 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: 10/4/2013 text entry
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant is given leave to file response to Receiver's statement [764} on or before 10/11/2013. Mailed notice (gds)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 764 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: 10/4/2013 statement
STATEMENT by Robb Evans & Associates LLC Supporting the Imposition of Coercive Sanctions (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E)(Zanzig, Blair)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 763 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: 10/4/2013 text entry
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant is given leave to file response to FTC's statement regarding the need for coercive sanctions [759] on or before 10/11/2013. Mailed notice (gds)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 762 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: 10/2/2013 order on motion for miscellaneous relief
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion [761] to re-set Friday's proceeding pending new appropriations to the FTC is granted. Status hearing date of 10/4/2013 is re-set to 10/16/2013 at 1:30 p.m. Mailed notice (gds)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 761 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: 10/1/2013 motion for miscellaneous relief
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission To Reset Friday's Proceeding Pending New Appropriations to the FTC (Cohen, Jonathan)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 760 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: 10/1/2013 order on motion to reset
ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/26/2013: Plaintiff's motion to modify the 8/7/2013 order to terminate Trudeau's personal expense allowance is granted. Mailed notice (gds)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 759 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: 9/30/2013 statement
STATEMENT by Federal Trade Commission Regarding the Need for Coercive Sanctions (Attachments: # (1) PXA:1-PXA:13)(Cohen, Jonathan)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 758 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: 9/30/2013 terminate hearings
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing date of 10/1/2013 is re-set to 10/4/2013 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 757 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: 9/27/2013 other
Response to Trudeau's Opposition to the FTC's Proposed Order by Federal Trade Commission (Cohen, Jonathan)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 756 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: 9/27/2013 motion to reset
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to reset October 1, 2013 Status Hearing (Cohen, Jonathan)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 755 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: 9/27/2013 order on motion for miscellaneous relief
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 9/26/2013. Motion [744] to modify Receivership order is granted. A draft order will follow. Status hearing set for 10/1/2013 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (gds)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 754 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: 9/20/2013 order
ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/19/2013: The court releases Kevin Trudeau from custody of the US Marshal. He is to comply with directions of the Receiver and is ordered to appear at the next court hearing Motion [744] to modify the receivership order is set for 9/26/2013, at 2:00 p.m. Mailed notice (gds)
Request RequestSpace
PDF 753 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: 9/19/2013 order
ORDER defendant KEVIN TRUDEAU is to be released from custody forthwith, signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/19/2013: Mailed notice (gds)
PDF 752 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: 9/19/2013 other
NOTICE of Ruling from the Seventh Circuit in their case #13-3055. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Filing Notice of Docketing) The following is before the Seventh Circuit Court : EMERGENCY PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS, or in the Alternative, a Writ Of Habeas Corpus, filed on September 18, 2013, by counsel for the petitioner.IT IS ORDERED that petition for writ of mandamus, or in the alternative, a writ ofhabeas corpus is DENIED. (tlm)
PDF 751 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: 9/18/2013 order
ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/18/2013: Status hearing held on 9/18/2013. The court finds defendant Kevin Trudeau in contempt of court and directs the US Marshal to take him into custody and hold him until further order of the court. Status hearing set for 9/19/2013 at 11:00 a.m. Defendant's request for a stay of this order is denied. Mailed notice (gds)
PDF 750 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: 9/16/2013 status report
STATUS Report Supplemental by Robb Evans & Associates LLC (Attachments: # (1) Receiver's Supplemental Report)(Zanzig, Blair)
PDF 749 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: 9/16/2013 reply
REPLY by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to response in opposition to motion, [748] To Modify the Receivership Order To Prevent Trudeau From Funding Personal Expenses With Assets Needed To Compensate Consumers (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits PXA-PXB)(Cohen, Jonathan)
PDF 748 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: 9/12/2013 response in opposition to motion
RESPONSE by Kevin Trudeauin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade CommissionTo Modify the Receivership Order To Prevent Trudeau From Funding His Personal Living Expenses With Assets Needed To Compensate His Victims [744] (Anderson, Kimball)
PDF 747 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: 9/6/2013 status report
STATUS Report of Receiver for Period August 7, 2013 through September 5, 2013 by Robb Evans & Associates LLC (Attachments: # (1) Receiver's Report of Activities from 8/7/2013 through 9/5/2013, # (2) Exs 1-12 to Receiver's Report)(Zanzig, Blair)
PDF 746 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: 9/4/2013 motion hearing
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 9/4/2013 regarding motion [744] to modify the Receivership order. Response is due by 9/12/2013. Reply is due by 9/16/2013. Mailed notice (gds)
PDF 745 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013 notice of motion
NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, [744] before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/4/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Cohen, Jonathan)
PDF 744 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013 motion for miscellaneous relief
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade CommissionTo Modify the Receivership Order To Prevent Trudeau From Funding His Personal Living Expenses With Assets Needed To Compensate His Victims (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits in Support of FTC's Motion To Modify the Receivership Order To Prevent Trudeau From Funding His Personal Living Expenses With Assets Needed To Compensate His Victims)(Cohen, Jonathan)
PDF 743 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: 8/21/2013 attorney appearance
ATTORNEY Appearance for Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC by Blair Robert Zanzig (Zanzig, Blair)
PDF 742 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: 8/7/2013 order
PACER 741 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: 8/7/2013 order on motion for miscellaneous relief
Request RequestSpace
PACER 740 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: 8/7/2013 Response
Request RequestSpace
PACER 739 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: 8/7/2013 notice of filing
Request RequestSpace
PACER 738 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: 8/5/2013 notice of motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 737 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: 8/5/2013 motion for leave to file
Request RequestSpace
PACER 736 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: 8/2/2013 motion for miscellaneous relief
Request RequestSpace
PACER 735 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: 8/2/2013 Response
Request RequestSpace
PACER 734 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: 8/1/2013 text entry
Request RequestSpace
PACER 733 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: 8/1/2013 status hearing
Request RequestSpace
PACER 732 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: 8/1/2013 status hearing
Request RequestSpace
PACER 731 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: 8/1/2013 other
Request RequestSpace
PDF 730 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
STATEMENT by Federal Trade Commission With Respect to the Appointment of a Receiver (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits PXA:1-PXA:2)(Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
PDF 729 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/26/2013: Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 07/26/2013)
PACER 728 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 7/26/2013. Plaintiff's motion 481 to hold defendant Trudeau in contempt is granted in part. Plaintiff is to submit the name and qualifications of a Receiver. Until further order of court, defendant is enjoined from directing the transfer or use of any money or property of any Trudeau Entity. Status hearing set for 7/30/2013 at 1:00 p.m. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 07/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 727 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: The time of teh 7/26/2013 evidentiary hearing is re-set to 1:30 p.m. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PDF 726 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for leave to file, 725 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/26/2013 at 02:00 PM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
PDF 725 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for leave to file Instanter a Response to the FTC's Post-Hearing Brief (Attachments: # 1 Defendant Kevin Trudeau's Response in Opposition to the FTC's Post-Hearing Brief in Support of Its Contempt Motion)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
PACER 724 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 7/23/2013. Defendant's motion for leave to file excess pages 708 is granted. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file excess pages 714 is granted. Defendant's motion 717 for continuance is denied. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file 719 response is granted. Plaintiff's motion 721 to lift stay of writ is granted. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PDF 723 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
Pursuant to the Court's order (DE707), Plaintiff FTC hereby files its Ex Parte Motion For A Writ Ne Exeat and Related Filings, which were previously filed under seal. by Federal Trade Commission , previously filed Ex Parte Motion For A Writ Ne Exeat, An Order Compelling Trudeau To Surrender His Passports, And An Order To Show Cause Why Defendant Should Not Be Preliminarily Enjoined From Leaving The United States (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Ex Parte Motion For A Writ Ne Exeat, # 2 Cover Letter in Support of Ex Parte Motion For A Writ Ne Exeat, # 3 Rule 65(b)(1) Certification of Jonathan Cohen in Support of Ex Parte Motion For A Writ Ne Exeat, # 4 Proposed Writ Ne Exeat, # 5 Ex Parte Motion For Leave to File Under Seal Temporarily Ex Parte Motion For A Writ Ne Exeat, # 6 Exhibits Part 1 (PXA1 through PXA19), # 7 Exhibits Part 2 (PXA20 through PXA28), # 8 Exhibits Part 3 (PXA29 through PXA42), # 9 Exhibits Part 4 (PXA43 through PXB))(Kostner, Amanda) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
PACER 722 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, 721 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/23/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 721 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission To Lift the Stay of the Writ Ne Exeat (Attachments: # 1 FTC's Opposition to Trudeau's Motion To Waive His Appearance and Cross-Motion To Lift the Stay of the Writ Ne Exeat, # 2 Exhibits PXA:1-PXA:4)(Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 720 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion for leave to file, 719 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/26/2013 at 02:00 PM. (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 719 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for leave to file Response to Assertions of Law in Trudeaus Post-Hearing Brief (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiffs Response to Assertions of Law in Trudeaus Post-Hearing Brief, # 2 Exhibits PXA:1-PXA:2)(Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 718 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 717 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/23/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 717 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for Short Continuance of July 26, 2013 Argument or in the Alternative to Waive Defendant Kevin Trudeau's Appearance (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 716 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Federal Trade Commission in support of motion for miscellaneous relief, 481 Plaintiff's Post-Hearing Brief in Support of Motion To Hold Defendant Trudeau in Contempt for Violating the June 2, 2010 Order, Incarcerate Him, and Order Him To Provide An Accounting of and Turnover Assets (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A:1-A:2)(Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 715 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 714 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/26/2013 at 02:00 PM. (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 714 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for leave to file excess pages (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 713 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
Post-Hearing Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Federal Trade Commission (Kostner, Amanda) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 712 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
Post-Hearing Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Kevin Trudeau (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 711 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Kevin Trudeau regarding memorandum, 710 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 25)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 710 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Kevin Trudeau in Opposition to the FTC's Motion to Hold Him in Contempt(Post-Hearing) (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1- 56 Part 1, # 3 Exhibit 1- 56 Part 2, # 4 Exhibit 1- 56 Part 3, # 5 Exhibit 1- 56 Part 4, # 6 Exhibit 1- 56 Part 5, # 7 Exhibit 1- 56 Part 6, # 8 Exhibit 1- 56 Part 7, # 9 Exhibit 1- 56 Part 8, # 10 Exhibit 1- 56 Part 9, # 11 Exhibit 1- 56 Part 10)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 709 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 708 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/26/2013 at 02:00 PM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 708 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for leave to file excess pages instanter (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 707 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/1/2013: Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 706 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry Hearing held on 7/1/2013.The Writ Ne Exeat is stayed The hearing set for 7/8/2013 is continued to 7/26/2013, at 2:00 p.m. Parties' submissions re: FTC's motion to hold defendant Trudeau in contempt are due by 7/15/2013. Parties are to file all exhibits referred to in the briefs re: the Ne exeat order and the current contempt motion, as well as the exhibits introduced at the recent contempt hearings, unsealed. The parties shall redact personal identifiers from those documents. Further hearing is set for 7/26/2013 at 2:00 p.m. Defendant Trudeau is to be present. Mailed notice (gds ) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 705 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: The Clerk is to correct the docket to reflect attorney Kimball Anderson withdrew as counsel for defendants Marc J. Lane and the Law offices of Marc J. Lane PC only. Mr. Anderson continues to represent defendants Kevin Trudeau, Shop America (USA) LLC and Winston & Strawn LLP. Mailed notices (gcy, ) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 704 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
Opinion of Mary O'Connor, ASA by Kevin Trudeau (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 703 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Evidentiary hearing resumed on 6/27/2013 on plaintiff's motion 481 to hold defendant in contempt and for writ ne exeat order. Evidentiary hearing continued to 7/1/2013 at 10:00 a.m. As stated in open court, defendant is enjoined from transferring any assets outside of ordinary and customary living expenses until further order of court. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 702 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Evidentiary hearing resumed on 6/26/2013 on plaintiff's motion 481 to hold defendant in contempt. Evidentiary hearing continued to 6/27/2013 at 9:45 a.m. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 701 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None
SEALED EXHIBIT filed in support of motion to admit evidence relative to Defendant Kevin Trudeau. (jmp, ) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 700 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant is ordered not to leave the United States until further order of court. Defendant is ordered to surrender immediately all of his passports and any other documents that would permit international travel, to the Clerk of this Court. Defendant is ordered to attend all future hearings. Plaintiff's motion for a writ ne exeat and supporting documents are to be sealed for three business days after service of this order. Defendant is to appear on 7/8/2013, at 11:00 a.m. to show cause why he should not be preliminarily enjoined from leaving the United States. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 699 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None
WRIT NE EXEAT, Order to Surrender Passports, and Order to Show Cause why defendant should not be preliminarily enjoined from leaving the United States Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 6/25/2013. (ph, ) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 698 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to amend/correct MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade CommissionAdmit evidence in evidentiary hearing regarding FTC's pending motion to hold defendant in contempt 694 ; CORRECTED Attachment #1 (Brief in Support of Motion to Admit Evidence) to MOTION (Kostner, Amanda) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 697 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
SEALED EXHIBIT(S) by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission regarding MOTION by to seal temporarily FTC's proposed exhibits in the evidentiary hearing 696 (Exhibits 1 through 6). (jmp, ) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 696 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to seal temporarily FTC's proposed exhibits in the evidentiary hearing (Kostner, Amanda) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
Request RequestSpace
Need legal research help? Let us know!
PACER 695 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held. Respondents' Motion to substitute attorney 685 is granted. Vincent P. Schmeltz is substituted as counsel for respondent Marc J. Lane and the law offices of Marc J. Lane. Kimball Anderson is given leave to withdraw as their counsel. Attorney Kimball Richard Anderson terminated. Mailed notice (jmp, ) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 694 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade CommissionAdmit evidence in evidentiary hearing regarding FTC's pending motion to hold defendant in contempt (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Motion to Admit Evidence, # 2 Exhibits in Support of Motion to Admit Evidence)(Kostner, Amanda) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 693 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
LETTER from the Seventh Circuit regarding no return of the record on appeal in USCA no. 13-1746, 13-1747 (pg, ) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 692 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
CERTIFIED copy of order dated 4/29/13 from the 7th Circuit regarding notice of appeal 613 , notice of appeal 609 ; Appellate case no. : 13-1746, 13-1747 (pg, ) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 691 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
MANDATE of USCA dated 4/29/13 regarding notice of appeal 613 , notice of appeal 609 ; USCA No. 13-1746, 13-1747 (pg, ) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 690 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondents Marc J. Lane, The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC by Austin Jennings Burke CORRECTED (Burke, Austin) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 689 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondents Marc J. Lane, The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC by Vincent P. Schmeltz, III CORRECTED (Schmeltz, Vincent) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 688 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondents Marc J. Lane, The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC by Austin Jennings Burke (Burke, Austin) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 687 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondents Marc J. Lane, The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC by Vincent P. Schmeltz, III (Schmeltz, Vincent) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 686 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to substitute attorney 685 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 6/20/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 685 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Respondents Marc J. Lane, The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC to substitute attorney (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 684 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None
Notice of Name Change by Marc J. Lane, The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC, Kevin Trudeau, Winston & Strawn LLP (Croswell, Katherine) (Entered: 06/12/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 683 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
Defendant Kevin Trudeau's Supplemental Objections to the FTC's Deposition Designations by Kevin Trudeau (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 682 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
LETTER from the Seventh Circuit returning the record on appeal in USCA no. 13-1898 consisting of 16 loose pleadings, 8 volumes of transcripts and 3 sealed items. (jmm-r, ) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 681 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None
LETTER from the Seventh Circuit returning the record on appeal in USCA no. 13-1898 consisting of 16 loose pleadings, 8 transcripts, 3 sealed envelopes (jat, ) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 680 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None
Deposition Designations and Objections by Kevin Trudeau (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Excerpts of Deposition of Michael Dow)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 679 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None
MANDATE of USCA dated 5/24/13 regarding notice of appeal 650 ; USCA No. 13-1898 (pg, ) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 678 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None
LETTER from the Seventh Circuit regarding return of the record on appeal in USCA no. 13-1898 at a later date (pg, ) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 677 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None
USCA RECEIVED on 5/22/13 the long record regarding notice of appeal 650 , notice of appeal 613 , notice of appeal. 609 (dj ) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 676 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of long record on appeal regarding notice of appeal 650 , notice of appeal 613 , notice of appeal 609 ; USCA Case No. 13-1746, 13-1747, 13-1898 (pg, ) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 675 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None
ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 5/22/2013: Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 674 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Evidentiary hearing begins on plaintiff's motion 481 to hold Kevin Trudeau in contempt. Plaintiff's motion to compel 538 is withdrawn without prejudice. Suneil Sant's motion to quash 590 is denied as moot. Plaintiff's motion to compel 593 Sant to comply is denied as moot. Evidentiary hearing continued to 6/26/2013 at 10:00 a.m. Kevin Trudeau and Marc Lane are ordered to appear. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 673 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None
TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit the long record on appeal 650 , 609 (USCA no. 13-1746, 13-1747, 13-1898).(smm) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PDF 672 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 5/20/2013. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
PDF 671 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant's motion to continue 667 hearing is denied. Status hearing held on 5/16/2013. A brief status hearing is set for 5/20/2013 at 1:30 p.m. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
PDF 670 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None
SEVENTH CIRCUIT transcript information sheet by Winston & Strawn LLP (jmm-r, ) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
PDF 669 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to continue 667 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 5/16/2013 at 02:30 PM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
PDF 668 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to continue 667 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 5/16/2013 at 02:30 PM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
PDF 667 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to continue Evidentiary Hearing Until Completion of Third Party Accounting (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
PDF 666 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None
ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 5/14/2013: Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
PDF 665 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Order entered regarding discovery, documents, depositions, etc. Defendant Trudeau is to be present at the 5/21/2013 hearing. A status hearing is set for 5/16/2013 at 2:30 p.m. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
PACER 664 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 5/13/2013. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 663 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
Status Update of Third-Party Corporations and Alternative Request to Participate in Status Conference Telephonically by GIN USA, Inc., KT Radio Network, Inc., WebSite Solutions USA, Inc. (Donnellon, Daniel) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 662 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion of Amanda Brooke Kostner for leave to appear pro hac vice 632 is granted. Attorney Amanda Brooke Kostner for Federal Trade Commission added. Mailed notice (jmp, ) (Entered: 05/03/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PDF 661 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None
Order signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 5/2/2013: Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 05/02/2013)
PDF 660 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert Gettleman: Status hearing held on 5/2/2013. Depositions are expected to proceed. FTC's motion to compel 626 Marc Lane to disclose information is granted on an attorneys'-eyes-only basis. Mr. Lane's deposition will remain under seal until further order of court. Status hearing set for 5/13/2013 at 3:30 p.m. Mailed notice (gds) Modified on 5/3/2013 (gds). (Entered: 05/02/2013)
PACER 659 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondents Marc J. Lane, The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC, Defendant Kevin Trudeau by William P Ferranti (Ferranti, William) (Entered: 05/02/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 658 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
REPLY by Federal Trade Commission to memorandum in opposition to motion 654 , MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to compel Marc Lane To Disclose Information Regarding Trudeau's Asset Protection Plan 626 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit PXB-PXC)(Mora, Michael) (Entered: 05/01/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 657 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: The FTC may file a reply to Marc J. Lane and the Law Offices Marc J. Lane, PC's memorandum in opposition to the FTC's motion to compel 654 by close of business 5/1/2013. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 656 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None
CERTIFIED copy of order dated 4/29/13 from the 7th Circuit regarding notice of appeal 650 ; Appellate case no. : 13-1898 (pg, ) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 655 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal 650 ; USCA Case No. 13-1898. (jmm-r, ) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 654 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Marc J. Lane, The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC in Opposition to motion to compel,,, 626 (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 653 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Request 647 to participate in status conference via telephonic appearance is granted. Telephone notice (gds) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 652 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None
TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal 650 . Notified counsel (smm) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 651 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record. (smm) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 650 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of appeal by Kevin Trudeau regarding orders 649 Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0752-8288181. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 649 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/26/2013: Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 648 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 4/26/2013. Plaintiff's motion 642 for a determination that the contempt proceedings in this court are not subject to the Automatic Stay Provision is granted. Lane's brief and sample documents for an in camera inspection are due by 4/29/2013. Parties are directed to proceed with depositions previously set forthwith. Status hearing is set for 5/2/2013, at 11:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 647 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
Request to Participate in Status Conference Via Telephonic Appearance by GIN USA, Inc., KT Radio Network, Inc., WebSite Solutions USA, Inc. (Donnellon, Daniel) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 646 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Kevin Trudeauin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade CommissionDetermine That Automatic Stay is Inapplicable 642 (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 645 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 4/25/2013. Status hearing set for 4/26/2013 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 644 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
CIRCUIT RULE 3(c) directs the appellant to file and serve a Docketing Statement, which meets the requirements of Circuit Rule 28(a), with the clerk of the District Court at the time of the filing of the notice of appeal or with the clerk of this court within seven (7) days of filing the notice of appeal. Your Rule 3(c) Docketing Statement has not been filed to date. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the appellant file this overdue Docketing Statement with the clerk of this court within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order. Failure to do so will result in a one hundred dollar ($100.00) fine and/or dismissal of this notice of appeal. (jmp, ) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 643 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Michael Mora for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 642 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/30/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Mora, Michael) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 642 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade CommissionDetermine That Automatic Stay is Inapplicable (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Mora, Michael) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 641 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
CERTIFIED copy of order dated 4/23/13 from the 7th Circuit regarding notice of appeal 613 , notice of appeal 609 ; Appellate case no. : 13-1746, 13-1747 (pg, ) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 640 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to strike, 639 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/30/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 639 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Respondent The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC, Defendant Kevin Trudeau to strike deadline to file response brief to Motion to Compel (D.I. 626), deadline to submit documents for in camera review and corresponding hearing date (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 638 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
SUGGESTION of Bankruptcy as to Kevin Trudeau (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 637 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held. FTC's motion 628 to file certain documents under seal temporarily, until 4/25/2013, is granted. Parties' in-camera submissions to the court for review are due by 4/24/2013, noon. Defendant's brief on crime fraud exception is due by 4/24/2013, noon. Hearing on motion to compel is set for 4/25/2013, at 2:00 p.m.Docketing mailed notice (pg, ) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 636 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None
CERTIFIED copy of order dated 4/19/13 from the 7th Circuit regarding notice of appeal 613 , notice of appeal 609 ; Appellate case no. : 13-1746 & 13-1747 (jat, ) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 635 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
Corrected UNREDACTED Motion To Hold the Law Offices of Marc Lane, GIN USA, Website Solutions USA, and KT Radio Network in Contempt by Federal Trade Commission (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jonathan Cohen in Support of Motion To Hold the Law Offices of Marc Lane, GIN USA, Website Solutions USA, and KT Radio Network in Contempt (PXG1-PXG11), # 2 Affidavit Motion To Hold the Law Offices of Marc Lane, GIN USA, Website Solutions USA, and KT Radio Network in Contempt (PXG12-PXG17), # 3 Affidavit Motion To Hold the Law Offices of Marc Lane, GIN USA, Website Solutions USA, and KT Radio Network in Contempt (PXG18-PXH1))(Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 634 Filed: 4/20/2013, Entered: None
UNREDACTED version of Brief in Support of Motion (DE597) To Hold the Law Offices of Marc Lane, GIN USA, Website Solutions USA, and KT Radio Network in Contempt, Filed Pursuant to Court Order (DE608) (Apr. 9, 2013) by Federal Trade Commission (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jonathan Cohen in Support of Motion To Hold the Law Offices of Marc Lane, GIN USA, Website Solutions USA, and KT Radio Network in Contempt (PXG1-PXG11), # 2 Affidavit of Jonathan Cohen in Support of Motion To Hold the Law Offices of Marc Lane, GIN USA, Website Solutions USA, and KT Radio Network in Contempt (PXG12-PXG17), # 3 Affidavit of Jonathan Cohen in Support of Motion To Hold the Law Offices of Marc Lane, GIN USA, Website Solutions USA, and KT Radio Network in Contempt (PXG18-PXH1))(Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/20/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 633 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Amanda Brooke Kostner for presentment of motion to appear pro hac vice 632 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/25/2013 at 02:00 PM. (Kostner, Amanda) (Entered: 04/19/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 632 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Amanda B. Kostner (Kostner, Amanda) (Entered: 04/19/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 631 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None
SEALED BRIEF and EXHIBITS in support of motion to compel Marclane to disclose information regarding Trudeau's Asset Protection Plan by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. (jmp, ) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 630 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 4/16/2013. Status hearing set for 5/2/2013 at 11:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 629 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion to seal 628 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/18/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PDF 628 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to seal documents temporarily (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jonathan Cohen in Support of Motion for Leave To File Documents Under Temporary Seal)(Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
PACER 627 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion to compel,,, 626 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/18/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PDF 626 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to compel Marc Lane To Disclose Information Regarding Trudeau's Asset Protection Plan (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Motion To Compel Marc Lane To Disclose Information Regarding Trudeau's Asset Protection Plan, # 2 Affidavit of Jonathan Cohen in Support of Motion To Compel Marc Lane To Disclose Information Regarding Trudeau's Asset Protection Plan (PXA:1-PXA:2), # 3 Affidavit of Jonathan Cohen in Support of Motion To Compel Marc Lane To Disclose Information Regarding Trudeau's Asset Protection Plan (PXA:3-PXA:10), # 4 Affidavit of Jonathan Cohen in Support of Motion To Compel Marc Lane To Disclose Information Regarding Trudeau's Asset Protection Plan (PXA:11-PXA:14))(Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
PACER 625 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None
COPY of order dated 4/12/13 from the Seventh Circuit regarding notices of appeal 613 , 609 ; Appellate case no. : 13-1746 & 13-1747; these appeals are consolidated for purposes of briefing and disposition. (jmm-r, ) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 624 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
SEVENTH CIRCUIT transcript information sheet by Winston & Strawn LLP (jmm-r, ) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 623 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
copy of order dated 4/10/13 from the 7th Circuit regarding notice of appeal 609 ; Appellate case no. : 13-1746 granting Emergency Motion For 48- Hour Stay. (pg, ) (Entered: 04/11/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 622 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal 613 ; USCA Case No. 13-1747 (pg, ) (Entered: 04/11/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 621 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal 609 ; USCA Case No. 13-1746 (pg, ) (Entered: 04/11/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 620 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal 613 . Notified counsel (dj ) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 619 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record. (dj ) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 618 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal 609 . Notified counsel (dj ) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 617 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record. (dj ) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 616 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE by GIN USA, Inc., KT Radio Network, Inc., WebSite Solutions USA, Inc. re notice of appeal 613 and emergency motion for 48-hour stay (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lecroix, Kenjiro) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 615 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kenjiro D. Lecroix for presentment of motion to stay, motion for relief 614 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/16/2013 at 04:30 PM. (Lecroix, Kenjiro) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 614 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Movants GIN USA, Inc., KT Radio Network, Inc., WebSite Solutions USA, Inc. to stay regarding order 608 pending appeal (Lecroix, Kenjiro) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 613 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of appeal by GIN USA, Inc., KT Radio Network, Inc., WebSite Solutions USA, Inc. regarding orders 608 , 606 Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0752-8228016. (Lecroix, Kenjiro) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 612 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE by The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC, Kevin Trudeau, Winston & Strawn LLP re notice of appeal 609 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 611 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to stay 610 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/16/2013 at 04:30 PM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 610 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Respondents The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC, Winston & Strawn LLP, Defendant Kevin Trudeau to stay oral order of April 9, 2013 (Renewed Emergency) (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 609 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of appeal by The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC, Kevin Trudeau, Winston & Strawn LLP regarding orders 606 Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0752-8227361. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 608 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None
ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/9/2013: Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 607 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 4/9/2013. Motion 604 for leave to file a status report is granted. Plaintiff is directed to file documents with redactions forthwith. Defendant's and respondents' oral request for a stay of this order is denied. Status hearing set for 4/16/2013 at 4:30 p.m. Motions 538 590 593 597 are continued to that date and time. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 606 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held. Plaintiff's motion 599 to file response to motion for continuance is granted. Defendant's motion 586 for continuance is denied. Plaintiff's motion 595 to file certain documents under seal is denied, and said documents will be unsealed on 4/9/2013 after counsel have had the opportunity to redact personal information. Plaintiff's motion 597 to hold parties in contempt, and plaintiff's motion 593 to compel Suneil Sant to comply with subpoena and Sant's motion 590 to quash subpoena are continued to 4/9/2013, at 1:00 p.m.Docketing mailed notice (pg, ) (Entered: 04/08/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 605 Filed: 4/6/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion for leave to file, 604 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/9/2013 at 01:00 PM. (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 604 Filed: 4/6/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for leave to file Status Report Regarding Efforts To Depose Kevin Trudeau in Switzerland as the Corporate Designee of GIN USA, Website Solutions USA, and KT Radio Network (Attachments: # 1 Status Report Regarding Efforts To Depose Kevin Trudeau in Switzerland as the Corporate Designee of GIN USA, Website Solutions USA, and KT Radio Network)(Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 603 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT (Document Not Imaged). (jmp, ) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 602 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
STATUS Report Regarding the FTC's Post-Judgment Discovery by GIN USA, Inc., KT Radio Network, Inc., WebSite Solutions USA, Inc. (Donnellon, Daniel) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 601 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
REPLY by Suneil Sant to MOTION by Respondent Suneil Sant to quash SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM SERVED ON SUNEIL SANT 590 (Haim, Evan) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 600 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion for leave to file, 599 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/4/2013 at 11:00 AM. (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 599 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for leave to file Response To Trudeaus Motion For Continuance, Status Report, And Statement Regarding The Scope Of The Evidentiary Hearing (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment to Motion For Leave To File Response To Trudeaus Motion For Continuance, Status Report, And Statement Regarding The Scope Of The Evidentiary Hearing)(Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 598 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 597 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/4/2013 at 11:00 AM. (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 597 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission To Hold The Law Offices of Marc Lane, GIN USA, Website Solutions USA, and KT Radio Network in Contempt (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 596 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion to seal 595 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/4/2013 at 11:00 AM. (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
Request RequestSpace
Need legal research help? Let us know!
PACER 595 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to seal Certain Documents Related to the Motion To Hold the Law Offices of Marc Lane, GIN USA, Website Solutions USA, and KT Radio Network in Contempt (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 594 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion to compel 593 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/4/2013 at 11:00 AM. (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 593 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to compel Suneil Sant To Comply With a Subpoena (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 592 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Federal Trade Commission in Opposition to motion to quash 590 and Memorandum in Support of Cross-Motion To Compel Suneil Sant To Comply With a Subpoena (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits PXA-PXB)(Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 591 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Suneil Sant in support of motion to quash 590 SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM SERVED ON SUNEIL SANT (Haim, Evan) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PDF 590 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Respondent Suneil Sant to quash SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM SERVED ON SUNEIL SANT (Haim, Evan) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
PACER 589 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 3/21/2013. Motion for leave to file 583 motion to quash under seal is denied. Memorandum in support of motion to quash is due by 3/25/2013. Plaintiff's response is due by 3/28/2013. Reply is due by 4/1/2013. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 588 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to continue 586 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/4/2013 at 11:00 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 03/20/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 587 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to continue 586 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/2/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 586 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to continue May 21, 2013 Evidentiary Hearing (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 585 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Suneil Sant by Patrick Edward Deady (Deady, Patrick) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 584 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Evan J Haim for presentment of motion for leave to file 583 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 3/21/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Haim, Evan) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 583 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Respondent Suneil Sant for leave to file under seal (Haim, Evan) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 582 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Suneil Sant by Evan J Haim of Patrick E. Deady (Haim, Evan) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 581 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Suneil Sant by Evan J Haim (Haim, Evan) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 580 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None
ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 3/7/2013:Mailed notice(tlp, ) (Entered: 03/07/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 579 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Enter order. Motion hearing held on 3/7/2013. Status hearing held. The motion by respondents Marc J. Lane to quash third party subpoenas 568 is denied. Evidentiary Hearing set for 5/21/2013 at 10:00 AM. Status hearing set for 4/4/2013 at 11:00 AM.Mailed notice (tlp, ) (Entered: 03/07/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 578 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 3/6/2013: Mailed notice(tlp, ) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 577 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: ENTER MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. For the reasons set forth above, the motion to compel Winston & Strawn, the Law Offices of Marc Lane, and Website Solutions USA to comply with subpoenas 557 is granted. Mailed notice (tlp, ) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 576 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman:Motion hearing held on 3/5/2013. MOTION by Respondents Marc J. Lane, The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC to quash Third Party Subpoenas 568 is continued to 3/7/2013 at 11:00 AM.Mailed notice (tlp, ) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 575 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None
REPLY by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to motion to compel, 557 GIN USA and KTRN To Comply With Subpoenas, and Supplemental Reply Brief in Support of Motion To Compel Website Solutions To Comply With a Subpoena (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit PXB:1-PXB:3)(Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 574 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by WebSite Solutions USA, Inc. in Opposition to motion to compel, 538 (Donnellon, Daniel) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 573 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by KT Radio Network, Inc. in Opposition to motion to compel, 557 (Donnellon, Daniel) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 572 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by GIN USA, Inc. in Opposition to motion to compel, 557 (Donnellon, Daniel) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 571 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
Joint Discovery Plan by GIN USA, Inc., KT Radio Network, Inc., Marc J. Lane, The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC, Kevin Trudeau, WebSite Solutions USA, Inc., Winston & Strawn LLP (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 570 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to quash 568 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 3/5/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 569 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Marc J. Lane, The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC in support of motion to quash 568 (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 568 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Respondents Marc J. Lane, The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC to quash Third Party Subpoenas (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 567 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Marc J. Lane by Katherine E Croswell (Croswell, Katherine) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 566 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Marc J. Lane by Kimball Richard Anderson (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 565 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Marc J. Lane by Thomas Lee Kirsch, II (Kirsch, Thomas) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 564 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion to stay 545 third party discovery and appoint Special Master was denied. Motion hearing held on 2/21/2013 regarding plaintiff's motion 557 to compel GIN and KT Radio Network to comply with subpoenas. Response is due by 2/28/2013. Reply is due by 3/4/2013. That motion is continued to 3/7/2013, at 11:030 a.m. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 563 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Movants GIN USA, Inc., KT Radio Network, Inc. by Kenjiro D. Lecroix (Lecroix, Kenjiro) (Entered: 02/21/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 562 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Movants GIN USA, Inc., KT Radio Network, Inc. by Daniel J. Donnellon (Donnellon, Daniel) (Entered: 02/21/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 561 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None
REPLY by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to motion to compel, 538 Winston & Strawn, The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane, and Website Solutions USA To Comply With Subpoenas (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F)(Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 560 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Leonard Gail is given leave to withdraw as counsel for Nataliya Babenko, GIN USA, KT Radio Network, and Website Solutions USA. Attorney Leonard A. Gail terminated. Mailed notice (jmp, ) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 558 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion to compel, 557 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 2/21/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 557 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to compel GIN USA and KT Radio Network To Comply With Subpoenas (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion To Compel GIN USA and KT Radio Network To Comply With Subpoenas, # 2 Exhibit PXA:1-PXA:17)(Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 556 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC, Winston & Strawn LLP in Opposition to motion to compel, 538 (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 555 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Winston & Strawn LLP by Katherine E Croswell (Croswell, Katherine) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 554 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Winston & Strawn LLP by Thomas Lee Kirsch, II (Kirsch, Thomas) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 553 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Winston & Strawn LLP by Kimball Richard Anderson (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 552 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC by Katherine E Croswell (Croswell, Katherine) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 551 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC by Thomas Lee Kirsch, II (Kirsch, Thomas) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 550 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent The Law Offices of Marc J. Lane PC by Kimball Richard Anderson (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 549 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None
Proposed Discovery and Contempt Hearing Schedule by Federal Trade Commission (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jonathan Cohen)(Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 548 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 2/8/2013. Plaintiff's plan is due by 2/13/2013. Joint proposal is due by 2/27/2013. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 547 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to stay 545 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 2/8/2013 at 01:30 PM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 546 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Kevin Trudeau in support of motion to stay 545 (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 545 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to stay Third-Party Discovery and Appoint a Special Master for the Purpose of Establishing a Consumer Remediation Plan (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 544 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Movant WebSite Solutions USA, Inc. by Daniel J. Donnellon (Donnellon, Daniel) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 543 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Movant WebSite Solutions USA, Inc. by Daniel J. Donnellon (Donnellon, Daniel) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PDF 542 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Leave is given to defendant to file financial statement under seal. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
PACER 541 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 1/23/2013 regarding plaintiff's motion to compel 538 . Response is due by 2/13/2013. Reply is due by 2/20/2013. Status hearing is set for 3/7/2013 at 11:00 a.m. Status hearing date of 2/1/2013 is re-set to 2/8/2013 at 1:30 p.m. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 540 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Kevin Trudeau Sworn Financial Statement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 539 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Cohen for presentment of motion to compel, 538 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 1/24/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 538 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to compel Winston & Strawn, the Law Offices of Marc Lane, and Website Solutions USA To Comply With Subpoenas, and Certificate of Service (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support, # 2 Exhibit FTC Exhibits PXA-PXE)(Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 537 Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman:Motion hearing held on 12/10/2012 regarding defendant's motion 531 to abstain from filing non-parties' e-mails which is granted. E-mails by non-parties will not be accepted or filed as part of this case. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 536 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None
FTC'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF Regarding the Court's Suggestion to Appoint a Forensic Accountant as a Master and in Support of Contempt Motion by Federal Trade Commission. (mr, ) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PDF 535 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None
ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 12/6/2012: Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 12/06/2012)
PACER 534 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Plaintiff's motion 481 to hold defendant in contempt is continued until further order of court. Defendant's sworn complete statement of his financial condition is due by 1/25/2013. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 12/06/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 533 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 12/6/2012. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file 526 is granted. Defendant's motion 528 for appointment of a Special Master is is denied. Status hearing set for 2/1/2013 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 12/06/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 532 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 531 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 12/10/2012 at 10:30 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 12/06/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 531 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to Abstain from Filing Emails Erroneously Submitted Through Proposed Order Email System or, in the Alternative, to File Under Seal (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 12/06/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 530 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 528 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 12/6/2012 at 10:00 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 12/04/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 529 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Kevin Trudeau in support of motion for miscellaneous relief 528 for the Appointment of a Special Master Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 53 (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 12/04/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 528 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for the Appointment of a Special Master Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. R. 53 (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 12/04/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 527 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Michael Mora for presentment of motion for leave to file, 526 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 12/6/2012 at 10:00 AM. (Mora, Michael) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 526 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for leave to file Instanter a Supplemental Brief Re Court's Suggestion to Appoint Forensic Accountant as Master, and in Support of Contempt Motion (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment A)(Mora, Michael) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 525 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing date of 12/5/2012 is re-set to 12/6/2012 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 11/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 524 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 9/25/2012 before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: LAURA R. RENKE, CSR, RDR, CRR, CLR Contract Court Reporter 219 S. Dearborn Street, Room 2144A Chicago, Illinois 60604 708.447.0905 laurarenke@hotmail.com. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 12/17/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/27/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/25/2013. (rp, ) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 523 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held. Trudeau's Motion to Strike Mora Declaration (Doc. 500) is granted in part. The court strikes and will ignore the portions of the Mora declaration that contain improper argument. Trudeau's Motion to Strike New Matter and Argument in the FTC's Reply Brief (Doc. 519) is granted in part. Trudeau is given leave to file a sur-reply in opposition to the FTC's Motion to Hold Trudeau in Contempt (Doc. 481). Trudeau's sur-reply shall be limited to addressing the new matter raised in the FTC's reply brief. The FTC's motion to Hold Trudeau in Contempt (Doc. 481) is continued to December 5, 2012, at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (mr, ) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 522 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable RObert Gettleman: Status hearing is re-set to 11/20/2012 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (gds) Modified on 11/16/2012 (gds). (Entered: 10/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 521 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to strike 519 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/30/2012 at 09:00 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 520 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Kevin Trudeau in support of motion to strike 519 (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 519 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to strike New Matter and Argument in FTC's Reply Brief (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 518 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion to continue 512 status hearing is granted. Status hearing date of 10/24/2012 is re-set to 10/30/2012 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 517 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
REPLY by Federal Trade Commission to MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to Hold Defendant Trudeau in Contempt for Violating the June 2, 2010 Order, Incarcerate Him, and Order Him to Provide an Accounting of and Turnover Assets 481 , response in opposition to motion, 508 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FTC Reply Exhibit 6, # 2 Exhibit FTC Reply Exhibit 7, # 3 Exhibit FTC Reply Exhibits 8-9)(Mora, Michael) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 516 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None
REPLY by Kevin Trudeau to MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to strike Declaration of Michael Mora in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Hold Defendant Kevin Trudeau in Contempt 481 500 (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 515 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None
REPLY by Kevin Trudeau to MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to continue Status Hearing From October 24, 2012 to October 30, 2012 512 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 514 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Federal Trade Commission in Opposition to motion to continue 512 October 24 Hearing on FTC's Motion to Hold Trudeau In Civil Contempt (Mora, Michael) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 513 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to continue 512 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/18/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 512 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to continue Status Hearing From October 24, 2012 to October 30, 2012 (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 511 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Federal Trade Commissionin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to strike Declaration of Michael Mora in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Hold Defendant Kevin Trudeau in Contempt 481 500 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration FTC Exhibit 5 Supplemental Declaration of Ronald Lewis)(Mora, Michael) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 510 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 9/25/2012. Motion to file tax returns under seal 482 is granted. Motion for recusal 497 is denied. Defendant's motion for extension of time 503 to file response to motion to hold defendant in contempt is granted. Defendant's motion for leave to file excess pages 506 is granted, but is limited to 20 pages. Response to motion 500 to strike Mora declaration is due by 10/5/2012. Reply is due by 10/12/2012. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 509 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: None
SEALED RESPONSE by Kevin Trudeau to MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to Hold Defendant Trudeau in Contempt for Violating the June 2, 2010 Order, Incarcerate Him, and Order Him to Provide an Accounting of and Turnover Assets 481 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D, # 2 Exhibit F, # 3 Exhibit G, # 4 Exhibit H)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 09/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 508 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Kevin Trudeauin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to Hold Defendant Trudeau in Contempt for Violating the June 2, 2010 Order, Incarcerate Him, and Order Him to Provide an Accounting of and Turnover Assets 481 (REDACTED) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C-H)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 09/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 507 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages, 506 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/25/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 506 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for leave to file excess pages For Brief In Opposition To The FTC's Motion To Hold Defendant Trudeau In Contempt For Violating The June 2, 2012 Order, Incarcerate Him, And Order Him To Provide An Accounting Of And Turnover Assets (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 505 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of extension of time, 503 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/25/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 504 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of extension of time, 503 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/27/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 09/20/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 503 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for extension of time to File Response to the FTC's Motion to Hold Defendant Trudeau in Contempt for Violating June 2, 2012 order, Incarcerate Him, and Order Him to Provide an Accounting of and Turnover Assets 481 (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 09/20/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 502 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to strike 500 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/25/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 501 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Kevin Trudeau in support of motion to strike 500 (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 500 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to strike Declaration of Michael Mora in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Hold Defendant Kevin Trudeau in Contempt 481 (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 499 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for recusal 497 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/25/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 498 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Kevin Trudeau in support of motion for recusal 497 (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 497 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for recusal (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 496 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion 468 of Stephen C. Dowdell for leave to appear pro hac vice is granted. Motion 495 of Jonathan Cohen for leave to appear pro hac vice is granted. Mailed notice. (mr, ) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 495 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (mr, ) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
Request RequestSpace
Need legal research help? Let us know!
PDF 494 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: None
Memorandum Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 8/17/2012: Mailed notice (gds)
PACER 493 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant's motion 476 for modification of order is denied. Hearing date of 8/30/2012 is stricken. Defendant's response to plaintiff's motionm 481 to hold defendant in contempt is due by 9/24/2012. Plaintiff's reply is due by 10/15/2012. Status hearing is set for 10/24/2012 at 1:30 p.m. mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 08/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 492 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by David A. O'Toole for presentment of motion for leave to file 491 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 8/30/2012 at 11:00 AM. (O'Toole, David) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 491 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for leave to file Surreply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Modification of Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(O'Toole, David) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 490 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 7/18/12 before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura R. Renke, (708) 447-0905, laurarenke@hotmail.com.. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/30/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/10/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/7/2012. (smm) (Entered: 08/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 489 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None
REPLY by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to motion for miscellaneous relief 476 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 08/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 488 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Plaintiff's motion 483 for leave to file brief in excess of 15 pages is granted. Mailed notice. (mr, ) (Entered: 07/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 487 Filed: 7/26/2012, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Federal Trade Commission in Opposition to motion for miscellaneous relief 476 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FTC Attachment A, # 2 Exhibit FTC Attachment B, # 3 Exhibit FTC Attachment C)(Mora, Michael) (Entered: 07/26/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 486 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 7/18/2012 regarding motion to seal document 482 and motion to hold defendant in contempt 481 which are continued to 8/30/2012, at 11:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 07/26/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 485 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
RESTRICTED Documents Pursuant to LR 26.2 by Federal Trade Commission (mr, ) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 484 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Michael Mora for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 483 , motion for miscellaneous relief, 481 , motion to seal, motion to seal document 482 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/18/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Mora, Michael) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 483 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for leave to file excess pages for Brief in Support of Motion to Hold Defendant Trudeau in Contempt (Mora, Michael) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 482 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to seal Certain Documents Related to Plaintiff's Motion to Hold Trudeau in Contempt, MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to seal document (Mora, Michael) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PDF 481 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to Hold Defendant Trudeau in Contempt for Violating the June 2, 2010 Order, Incarcerate Him, and Order Him to Provide an Accounting of and Turnover Assets (Attachments: # 1 Brief In Support of Motion, # 2 Exhibit FTCX 1, Part I, Lewis Dec & Att A-U, # 3 Exhibit FTCX 1, Part II, Att V-Z, # 4 Exhibit FTCX 2, Luceri Dec & Att A-H, # 5 Exhibit FTCX 3, Van Wazer Dec & Att. A-J, # 6 Exhibit FTCX 4, Mora Dec & Att A-J)(Mora, Michael) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
PACER 480 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 6/19/2012 regarding plaintiff's motion 476 for modification of order. Response is due by 7/26/2012. Reply is due by 8/9/2012. In court hearing is set for 8/30/2012 at 11:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 06/26/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 479 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion 473 of Daniel J. Donnellon for leave to appear pro hac vice is granted. Motion 474 of Kenjiro D. LeCroix for leave to appear pro hac vice is granted. Mailed notice. (mr, ) (Entered: 06/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 478 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 476 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 6/19/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 477 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Kevin Trudeau in support of motion for miscellaneous relief 476 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 476 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for Modification of Order, Approval of Consumer Remediation Plan, and Leave to Administer Consumer Remediation Plan through Rust Consulting, Inc. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 475 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 5/24/2012 regarding motion to quash 470 . The motion to quash or modify the 5/8/2012 subpoena to produce is denied. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 474 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7170908. (Lecroix, Kenjiro) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 473 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7170858. (Donnellon, Daniel) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 472 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Leonard A. Gail for presentment of motion to quash 470 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 5/24/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Gail, Leonard) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 471 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by GIN USA, Inc., KT Radio Network, Inc., WebSite Solutions USA, Inc. in support of motion to quash 470 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Gail, Leonard) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 470 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Movants GIN USA, Inc., KT Radio Network, Inc., WebSite Solutions USA, Inc. to quash Subpoena (Gail, Leonard) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 469 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Movants GIN USA, Inc., KT Radio Network, Inc., WebSite Solutions USA, Inc. by Leonard A. Gail (Gail, Leonard) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 468 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade CommissionMotion and application to appear pro hac vice (Government attorney) (Dowdell, Stephen) (Entered: 05/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 467 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion 454 of Douglas R. Cole for leave to appear pro hac vice is granted. Mailed notice. (psm, ) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 466 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion for order 450 is denied. Motion to quash or for protective order 451 is denied. Motion 457 to adopt is granted;. Status hearing held on 4/19/2012 Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 465 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing date of 4/13/2012 is re-set to 4/19/2012 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 464 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None
Notice of Unavailability of Counsel STATEMENT by Nataliya Babenko (Gail, Leonard) (Entered: 04/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 463 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: None
REPLY by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to motion to quash, motion for protective order 451 (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 04/06/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 462 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant's reply brief is due by 4/6/2012, noon. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 461 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Federal Trade Commission in Opposition to motion to quash, motion for protective order 451 , motion for miscellaneous relief 457 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FTC Attachment A, # 2 Exhibit FTC Attachment B, # 3 Exhibit FTC Attachment C)(Mora, Michael) (Entered: 03/28/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 460 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENT to memorandum in opposition to motion, 459 Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FTC Attachment A)(Mora, Michael) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 459 Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Federal Trade Commission in Opposition to motion for order 450 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FTC Attachment A, # 2 Exhibit FTC Attachment B, # 3 Exhibit FTC Attachment C, # 4 Exhibit FTC Attachment D, # 5 Exhibit FTC Attachment E)(Mora, Michael) (Entered: 03/21/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 458 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 3/14/2012 regarding motion to quash, or for protective order 451 . Plaintiff's response is due by 3/28/2012. Defendant's reply is due by 4/4/2012. Status hearing date of 4/11/2012 is re-set to 4/13/2012 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 03/20/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 457 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Movant Nataliya Babenko Adopting and Joining Defendant Trudeau's Motion to Quash (Gail, Leonard) (Entered: 03/16/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 456 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to quash, motion for protective order 451 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 3/14/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 455 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT by Movant Nataliya Babenko (Gail, Leonard) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 454 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6919313. (Cole, Douglas) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 453 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held. Movant Nataliya Babenko's motion 446 for leave to file a sworn statement under seal is granted. Movant's motion statement is due by 3/9/2012. Plaintiff FTC is given leave to file a response to the motion regarding marital privilege by 3/21/2012. Reply is due by 3/28/2012. Status hearing is set for 4/11/2012, at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (mr, ) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 452 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to quash, motion for protective order 451 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 3/13/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 451 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to quash Third Party Subpoena Directed to Midwest Gaming & Entertainment LLC, d.b.a. Rivers Casino or in the Alternative, MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for protective order (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 450 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Movant Nataliya Babenko for order pursuant to Customer Challenge Provision of Right to Financial Privacy Act of 1978 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Gail, Leonard) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 449 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Leonard A. Gail for presentment of motion to seal 446 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 3/7/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Gail, Leonard) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 448 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Unknown Nataliya Babenko by Leonard A. Gail on behalf of Matthew Reedy (Gail, Leonard) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 447 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Unknown Nataliya Babenko by Leonard A. Gail (Gail, Leonard) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 446 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Unknown Nataliya Babenko to seal sworn statement (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Gail, Leonard) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 445 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: None
LETTER from the Seventh Circuit returning the record on appeal in USCA no. 10-2418 consisting of three pleadings and twelve loose pleadings. (mr, ) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 444 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: None
LETTER from the Seventh Circuit returning the record on appeal in USCA no. 10-2418 consisting of three pleadings. (mr, ) (Entered: 02/23/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 443 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: None
LETTER from the USCA retaining the record on appeal in USCA no. 10-2418 consisting of three pleadings and twelve loose pleadings to be returned later. (mr, ) (Entered: 02/08/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 442 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: None
OPINION from the USCA for the 7th Circuit; Argued 9/24/2010; Decided 11/29/2011 in USCA case no. 10-2418. (mr, ) (Entered: 02/08/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 441 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: None
CERTIFIED copy of order dated 1/30/2012 from the USCA regarding notice of appeal 380 ; Appellate case no. : 10-2418; On consideration of the petition for rehearing and rehearing en banc, filed on January 13, 2012, no judge in active service has requested a vote on the petition for rehearing en banc and all of the judges on the original panel have voted to DENY the petition for rehearing. Accordingly, the petition for rehearing is DENIED. (mr, ) (Entered: 02/08/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 440 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: None
MANDATE of USCA dated 11/29/2011 regarding notice of appeal 380 ; USCA No. 10-2418; The judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED, with costs, in accordance with the decision of this court entered on this date. (mr, ) (Entered: 02/08/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 439 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant's motion for leave to withdraw Aesha R. Pallesen as counsel is granted. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 438 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing date of 10/22/2010 is stricken. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PDF 437 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None
Memorandum Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/19/2010: Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
PACER 436 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: The court overrules Trudeau's objections to the Show Cause order and denies his motion 416 to recuse. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 435 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: The undersigned judge chooses to exercise his prerogative as a senior judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sect. 294(b), to transfer the criminal proceedings arising from its order dated 9/16/2010, [doc. 339] ordering defendant Kevin Trudeau to show cause why he should not be held in criminal contempt for violating the agreed consent order dated 9/2/2004 [doc. 56], to the Executive Committee of this district for reassignment to another judge under a new number and caption: United states v. Kevin Trudeau. This court will continue to preside in the civil proceedings brought by the FTC against Trudeau. See FTC v. Truddeau 606 F.3d 382,391 (7th Cir. 2010). Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 434 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 10/5/2010 regarding motion to correct 429 . That motion is denied. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 433 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Removal of Material from the Custody of the Clerk's Office documents 237 and 313 by Shop America (USA), LLC, Kevin Trudeau (ca, ). (Entered: 10/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 432 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Argument heard on 9/29/2010. Status hearing and ruling set for 10/22/2010 at 10:00 a.m. By agreement of the parties, time is excluded under the Speedy Trial Act 18 U.S.C. Sect. 3161(h)(1) until that date. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 431 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Exhibit Disposal Pursuant to Local Rule 79.1. The following documents are eligible for removal: Defendant's Counsel: David J. Bradford, Document #237, 313. Mailed Notice (jh, ) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 430 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to amend/correct, motion for relief 429 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/5/2010 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 429 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to amend/correct order 426 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 428 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
CERTIFIED copy of order dated 9/24/10 from the Seventh regarding notice of appeal 380 ; Appellate case no. : 10-3230. Upon consideration of the PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS, filed September 24, 2010, by counsel for the petitioner, IT IS ORDERED that the motion is DENIED as premature (ca, ). (Entered: 09/28/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 427 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal 380 ; USCA Case No. 10-3230 (ca, ). (Entered: 09/27/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 426 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/24/2010: Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 425 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 9/24/2010. Defendant's motion to stay 420 further proceedings is denied and this matter is continued to 9/29/2010, at 2:00 p.m. By agreement of the parties, time is excluded under the Speedy Trial Act, 18 U.S.C. Sect. 3161(h)(1) until that date. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 424 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/24/2010: Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 423 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant's motion for declaratory relief 401 and construction of corrected supplemental order is denied. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 422 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: It has been brought to the court's attention in defendant's motion for stay pending a petition for mandamus 420 that the minute order entered by the court on 9/14/2010 419 noted that the defendant's motion for recusal 416 is denied. That portion of the 9/14/2010 minute order is vacated as erroneously entered. As stated on the record and discussed with counsel on that date, defendant's motion for recusal was taken with the hearing regarding the rule to show cause, set to be heard 9/24/2010 at 2:00 p.m. The government was given leave to file a response to the motion to recuse, but government counsel stated in open court that he was unlikely to file an additional brief because the issue had been thoroughly discussed in the government's response to defendant's memorandum in response to the 4/16/2010 order to show cause and motion to dismiss 406 The denial of the motion to recuse is therefore vacated and will be addressed at the hearing on 9/24/2010, at 2:00 p.m.Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 421 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to stay 420 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/29/2010 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 420 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to stay pending Petition for Writ of Mandamus (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 419 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant's motion for recusal 416 is denied. Motion hearing held on 9/14/2010 regarding motion for recusal 416 . The time of the 9/24/2010 hearing regarding rule to show cause is re-set to 2:00 p.m. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 418 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for recusal 416 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/14/2010 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 417 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Kevin Trudeau in support of motion for recusal 416 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 416 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for recusal (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 415 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: None
LETTER from the Seventh Circuit returning the record on appeal in USCA no. 10-1383 consisting of additional record, 1 box of exhibits; (return now complete). (lp, ) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 414 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: None
LETTER from the Seventh Circuit returning the record on appeal in USCA no. 10-1383 consisting of additional record; 8 Transcripts (return now complete). (lp, ) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 413 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: None
REPLY by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to memorandum 357 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 412 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: None
REPLY by Kevin Trudeau to MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for declaratory judgment and Construction of Corrected Supplemental Order 401 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 411 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendants' motion 409 for leave to withdraw Aesha R. Pallesen as counsel is granted. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 410 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Aesha R Pallesen for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 409 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 8/19/2010 at 09:15 AM. (Pallesen, Aesha) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 409 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by counsel for Defendant Kevin Trudeau to withdraw as attorney (Pallesen, Aesha) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 408 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Kevin Trudeau by Katherine E Croswell (Croswell, Katherine) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 407 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Federal Trade Commissionin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for declaratory judgment and Construction of Corrected Supplemental Order 401 (Attachments: # 1 FTC Attachment 1, # 2 FTC Attachment 2, # 3 FTC Attachment 3, # 4 FTC Attachment 4)(Mora, Michael) (Entered: 08/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 406 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Unknown United States of America to motion hearing 404 to Defendant's Memorandum in Response to April 16, 2010, Order to Show Cause and Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Order to Show Cause (Krickbaum, Marc) (Entered: 08/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 405 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
EXHIBIT G (CD) by Defendant Kevin Trudeau regarding memorandum in support of motion 402 (Document not imaged)(ca, ). (Entered: 08/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 404 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 7/28/2010 regarding defendant's motion for declaratory judgment 401 . Response is due by 8/13/2010. Reply is due by 8/27/2010. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 403 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for declaratory judgment 401 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/29/2010 at 10:00 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 402 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Kevin Trudeau in support of motion for declaratory judgment 401 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-G)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 401 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for declaratory judgment and Construction of Corrected Supplemental Order (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 400 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing is still set for 7/29/2010, at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 399 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None
STATUS Report On Monetary Sanction by Federal Trade Commission (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FTC Attachment 1, # 2 Exhibit FTC Attachment 2, # 3 Exhibit FTC Attachment 3)(Mora, Michael) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 398 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
Order signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/13/2010: Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 397 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: This matter is referred to the U.S. Attorney for this District pursuant to 18 U.S.C. Sect. 401 and Fed. R. Crim. P. 42(a) The clerk is directed to create a separate docket entitled United States v. Kevin Trudeau and provide for random assignment to a judge other than Judge Gettleman. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 396 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None
OPINION from the USCA for the Seventh Circuit; Argued April 8, 2010; Decided May 20, 2010 in USCA case no. 10-1383 (ca, ). (Entered: 07/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 395 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None
MANDATE of USCA dated 5/20/10 regarding notice of appeal 301 ; USCA No. 10-1383. We VACATE Trudeau's sentence and the district court's finding of contempt, and REMAND for further proceedings according to 18 U.S.C. § 401, Fed. R. Crim. P. 42(a), and the opinion. The above is in accordance with the decision of this court entered on this date. (ca, ). (Entered: 07/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace
Need legal research help? Let us know!
PACER 394 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None
LETTER from the Seventh Circuit returning the record on appeal in USCA no. 10-1383 consisting of eight volumes of transcripts, one volume of exhibits, and one box of additional exhibits (ca, ). (Entered: 07/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 393 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
USCA RECEIVED on 7/6/2010 the long record regarding notice of appeal 380 . (gej, ) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 392 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit the long record on appeal 380 (USCA no. 10-2418). (gej, ) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 391 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None
SEVENTH CIRCUIT transcript information sheet by Kevin Trudeau (ca, ). (Entered: 06/24/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 390 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: None
AGREED ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 6/16/2010(ca, ). (Entered: 06/18/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 389 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman:Motion 384 for extension of time is granted. Government's response to defendant's motion 363 is due by 8/13/2010. Defendant's reply is due by 8/27/2010. Hearing date of 7/29/10 is reset to 9/24/10 at 9:30 a.m. Time is excluded through 9/24/10 under T.18 U.S.C. Sect. 3161(h)(7)(A). The remedies hearing remains set for 7/29/2010 at 10:00 a.m. [For further detail see separate order(s).] Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 388 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Correction regarding 385 (ca, ). (Entered: 06/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 387 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 6/10/2010 regarding motion to stay pending ppeal, without requirement of a supersedeas bond 377 . That motion is denied. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 386 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Lisa Marie Noller for presentment of extension of time 384 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 6/16/2010 at 09:15 AM. (Noller, Lisa) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 385 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None
Document entered in error (Noller, Lisa) Modified on 6/15/2010 (ca, ). (Entered: 06/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 384 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None
AGREED MOTION by Unknown United States of America for extension of time (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Noller, Lisa) Modified on 6/15/2010 (ca, ). (Entered: 06/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 383 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal 380 ; USCA Case No. 10-2418 (ca, ). (Entered: 06/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 382 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal 380 . Notified counsel (gej, ) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 381 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record. (gej, ) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 380 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of appeal by Kevin Trudeau regarding orders 335 , 371 , 337 , 370 , 372 , 336 , 373 , 334 Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0752-4904032. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 379 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to stay, motion for relief 377 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 6/10/2010 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 378 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Kevin Trudeau in support of motion for stay pending appeal 377 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(Anderson, Kimball) Modified on 6/8/2010 (ca, ). (Entered: 06/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 377 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to stay regarding order 372 PENDING APPEAL (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 376 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Removal of Material from the Custody of the Clerk's Office 293 by Edward Bach (ca, ). (Entered: 06/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 375 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman:Defendant Kevin Trudeau's motion 366 to release bond and passport is granted. The Clerk is directed to release the $50,000 bond, with any accrued interest, and Mr. Trudeau's passport to Edward Bach, head of the docket dept, at defendant's counsel's firm. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 374 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
SUR-REPLY by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Amend the Supplemental Order Dated April 16, 2010 348 (ca, ). (Entered: 06/04/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 373 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: This Court's minute order dated 6/1/2010 is amended in part to VACATE that portion that denied defendant's motion 363 to dismiss the order to show cause, and to INCLUDE the denial of defendant's motion 348 to amend the supplemental order. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 372 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None
Corrected Supplemental Order modifying the stipulated final order for permanent injunction and awarding monetary relief as to defendant Kevin Trudeau signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 6/2/2010: Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 371 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 6/1/2010: Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 370 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 6/1/2010. Both parties have moved 348 361 to amend the supplemental order dated 4/16/2010 and the court amends said order. Defendant's motion to dismiss 363 the order to show cause is denied. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file 368 sur-reply is granted. Defendant's oral motion to extend time to respond is denied. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 369 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Michael Mora for presentment of motion for leave to file 368 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 6/3/2010 at 09:15 AM. (Mora, Michael) (Entered: 05/27/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 368 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission for leave to file Surreply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Amend the Supplemental Order Dated April 16, 2010 (Mora, Michael) (Entered: 05/27/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 367 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Thomas Lee Kirsch, II for presentment of motion to release bond and passport 366 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 6/1/2010 at 10:00 AM. (Kirsch, Thomas) Modified on 5/25/2010 (ca, ). (Entered: 05/24/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 366 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau TO RELEASE BOND AND PASSPORT (Kirsch, Thomas) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 365 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Kevin Trudeau to MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to Amend Supplemental Order 361 335 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Kimball) Modified on 5/24/2010 (ca, ). (Entered: 05/21/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 364 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: None
REPLY Memorandum by Kevin Trudeau in Support of Motion to Amend the Supplemental order entered on April 16, 2010 348 337 (Anderson, Kimball) Modified on 5/24/2010 (ca, ). (Entered: 05/21/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 363 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to dismiss ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Kirsch, Thomas) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 362 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant's response to plaintiff's motion 361 to amend supplemental order is due by 5/21/2010. Plaintiff's reply is due by 5/27/2010. Telephone notice (gds, ) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 361 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to Amend Supplemental Order 335 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment 1, Redlined Excerpted Supplemental Order, # 2 Exhibit Attachment 2, Revised Escrow Agreement ("Attachment A" to Supplemental Order)(Mora, Michael) Modified on 5/10/2010 (ca, ). (Entered: 05/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 360 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None
OPPOSITION by Federal Trade Commission to MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to amend supplemental order and for Stay of enforcement pending resolution of motion 337 348 (Mora, Michael) Modified on 5/10/2010 (ca, ). (Entered: 05/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 359 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None
ORDER dated 5/6/10 from the Seventh Circuit regarding notice of appeal 301 ; Appellate case no. : 10-1383 (ca, ). (Entered: 05/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 358 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
DESIGNATION of Marc Krickbaum as U.S. Attorney for Unknown United States of America (Krickbaum, Marc) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 357 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Response to April 16, 2010 Order to Show Cause 339 by Kevin Trudeau (ca, ). (Entered: 05/03/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 356 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held. Defendant's motion 353 for leave to file excess pages is granted. Defendant's submission is due by 5/13/2010. Government's response is due by 6/14/2010. Defendant's reply is due by 6/28/2010. This Courts 7/29/2010, 10:00 a.m. status hearing will include hearing and argument. The Court waives setting a trial date at this time. The Court deems the period of time through 7/29/2010 excludable under the provisions of T. 18 U.S. Code, Section 3161(h)(7)(A) - interest of justice. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 355 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Kevin Trudeau by Steffen Nathanael Johnson (Johnson, Steffen) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 354 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 353 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/29/2010 at 02:30 PM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 353 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for leave to file excess pages INSTANTER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 352 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendants motion 346 for leave to withdraw the appearance of Lisa J Parker as counsel is granted. Mailed notice (ph, ) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 351 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion to reset 344 rule to show cause hearing is is granted. Rule to show cause hearing date of 4/28/2010 is stricken. Status hearing is set for 4/29/2010, at 2:30 p.m. Motion hearing held on 4/27/2010 regarding defendant's motion 348 to amend the supplemental order. Response is due by 5/7/2010. Reply is due by 5/22/2010. Status hearing set for 6/1/2010 at 10:00 a.m. Motion to stay enforcement of the 4/16/2010 order is granted until 6/1/2010. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 350 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to amend/correct, motion to stay, motion for relief,,, 348 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/27/2010 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 04/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 349 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Kevin Trudeau in support of Motion to amend the supplemental order entered on April 16, 2010 and for Stay of Enforcement pending resolution of the motion 348 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(Anderson, Kimball) Modified on 4/23/2010 (ca, ). (Entered: 04/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 348 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to Amend the Supplemental order entered on April 16, 2010 and for Stay of enforcement pending resolution of the motion 337 (Anderson, Kimball) Modified on 4/23/2010 (ca, ). (Entered: 04/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 347 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 346 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/27/2010 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 04/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 346 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by counsel for Defendant Kevin Trudeau to withdraw as attorney (Lisa J. Parker) (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 04/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 345 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to reschedule 344 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/27/2010 at 09:15 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) Modified on 4/23/2010 (ca, ). (Entered: 04/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 344 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to Reschedule Show Cause Hearing (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Kimball) Modified on 4/23/2010 (ca, ). (Entered: 04/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 343 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Correction regarding 341 (ca, ). (Entered: 04/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 342 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None
DESIGNATION of Lisa Marie Noller as U.S. Attorney for Unknown United States of America (Noller, Lisa) (Entered: 04/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 341 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None
Document entered in error (Noller, Lisa) Modified on 4/22/2010 (ca, ). (Entered: 04/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 340 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion 279 of John Kness for leave to withdraw as counsel for defendant is granted. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 04/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 339 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/16/2010: Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 338 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Order defendant Kevin Trudeau is directed to appear on 4/28/2010 at 11:00 a.m. to show cause why he should not be prosecuted for and held in criminal contempt of this court's 9/2/2004 Consent Order. The court requests the US Attorney prosecute defendant Trudeau for criminal contempt. The US Attorney or an assistant, is directed to appear at the 4/28/2010 hearing. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 337 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
Supplemental Order Modifying the Stipulated Final Order for Permanent Injunction and Awarding Monetary Relief as to defendant Kevin Trudeau signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/16/2010: Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 336 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Supplemental order modifying the stipulated final order for permanent injunction and awarding monetary relief entered. Defendant Trudeau is ordered to obtain and maintain in force a performance bond in the principal amount of $2,000,000.00. In lieu of a performance bond, he may establish an interest-bearing escrow account fund. As a sanction for defendant Trudeau's contempt of the Final Order, and affirmed by the USCA, he is ordered to pay forthwith to plaintiff FTC the sum of $37,616.161.00, representing consumer loss. Plaintiff FTC's report on status of reimbursement efforts is due by 7/23/2010. Status hearing is set for 7/29/2010, at 10:00 a.m. This court shall retain jurisdiction. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 335 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
Memorandum Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/16/2010: Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 334 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Memorandum opinion and order entered. Accordingly, plaintiff's motion 267 for entry of compensatory monetary remedy, and plaintiff's motion 269 to modify the stipulated final order are granted in part. The Court will enter the Supplemental order modifying the stipulated final judgment for permanent injunction and awarding monetary relief. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 333 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None
THIRD PARTY COMMUNICATIONS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit) (Poor quality original - paper document on file) Modified on 3/29/2010 (ca, ). (Entered: 03/29/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 332 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENTAL Post-Hearing Brief by Federal Trade Commission in Support of its Renewed Motion 267 269 for Compensatory Contempt Remedy and Renewed Motion to Modify the Stipulated Final Order for Permanent Injunction As To Defendant Kevin Trudeau (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FTC Attachments 1-3, # 2 Exhibit FTC Attachments 1-9)(Mora, Michael) Modified on 3/22/2010 (ca, ). (Entered: 03/19/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 331 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENTAL Brief by Kevin Trudeau in Opposition to the FTC's Renewed Remedy Motion, and Renewed Motion to modify the 2004 Stipulated Order 267 269 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-H, # 2 Exhibit I-J)(Anderson, Kimball) Modified on 3/22/2010 (ca, ). (Entered: 03/19/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 330 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None
SUR-REPLY by Defendant Kevin Trudeau in Opposition to the FTC's Renewed Motions for Entry of Compensatory Monetary Remedy and to Modify the Stipulated Final Order 267 269 (ca, ). (Entered: 03/17/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 329 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Preliminary hearing held. Defendant's motion 323 for leave to file sur-reply in opposition to plaintiffs motion for compensatory remedy and motion to modify stipulated final order is granted. Defendant's motion 325 to stay is denied. The matter is taken under advisement. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 03/17/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 328 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: None
OPPOSITION by Federal Trade Commission to MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to stay Proceeding 325 (O'Toole, David) Modified on 3/12/2010 (ca, ). (Entered: 03/11/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 327 Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion to stay 325 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 3/12/2010 at 10:30 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 03/09/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 326 Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Kevin Trudeau in support of motion to stay the proceedings in civil action no. 03-C-3904 Pending a Decision by the Appellate Court in expedited appeal no. 10-1381 325 (Anderson, Kimball) Modified on 3/10/2010 (ca, ). (Entered: 03/09/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 325 Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to stay THE PROCEEDINGS IN CIVIL ACTION NO. 03-C-3904 PENDING A DECISION BY THE APPELLATE COURT IN EXPEDITED APPEAL NO. 10-1381 (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 03/09/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 324 Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for leave to file 323 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 3/12/2010 at 10:30 AM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 03/09/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 323 Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for leave to file INSTANTER A SURREPLY IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR COMPENSATORY REMEDY AND MOTION TO MODIFY STIPULATED FINAL ORDER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 03/09/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PDF 437
PDF 322 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None
ORDER dated 2/26/10 from the USCA Seventh Circuit regarding notice of appeal 301 ; Appellate case no. : 10-1383 (ca, ). (Entered: 03/01/2010)
PACER 321 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None
TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit supplemental record on appeal 301 (USCA no. 10-1383) consisting of four volume of transcripts (ca, ). (Entered: 02/25/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 320 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit supplemental record on appeal 301 (USCA no. 10-1383). (gej, ) (Entered: 02/25/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 319 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held. The Court declines to rule on defendant's motion 310 to modify release conditions. This Court stays payment of the fine until the Court of Appeals rules.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 02/25/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 318 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 02/18/10 before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: Jennifer Costales, CRR, RMR jennifer_costales@ilnd.uscourts.gov (312)427-5351.

IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings.

Redaction Request due 3/17/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/29/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/25/2010. (Costales, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/24/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 317 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 02/11/10 before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: Jennifer Costales, CRR, RMR jennifer_costales@ilnd.uscourts.gov (312)427-5351.

IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings.

Redaction Request due 3/17/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/29/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/25/2010. (Costales, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/24/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 316 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12/22/09 before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: Jennifer Costales, CRR, RMR jennifer_costales@ilnd.uscourts.gov (312)427-5351.

IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings.

Redaction Request due 3/17/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/29/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/25/2010. (Costales, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/24/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 315 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12/3/09 before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: Jennifer Costales, CRR, RMR jennifer_costales@ilnd.uscourts.gov (312)427-5351.

IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings.

Redaction Request due 3/17/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/29/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/25/2010. (Costales, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/24/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 314 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit supplemental record on appeal 301 (USCA no. 10-1383). (gej, ) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 313 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None
EXHIBIT (Transcript of Radio Broadcast of February 10, 2010 Taken from the Internet-USTREAM Website). (Document not Imaged) (gej, ) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 312 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None
RECEIVED by USCA Seventh Circuit, long record on appeal, USCA No. 10-1383 (ca, ). (Entered: 02/23/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 311 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 310 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 2/24/2010 at 03:00 PM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 02/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 310 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau to Modify Release Conditions (UNOPPOSED) (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 02/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 309 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 2/18/2010. The Court stays payment of the fine to 2/24/2010. status hearing is set for 2/24/2010, at 3:00 p.m. Preliminary hearing date of 3/9/2010 is re-set to 3/12/2010 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 308 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: None
SEVENTH CIRCUIT transcript information sheet by Kevin Trudeau (Poor quality original - paper document on file). Modified on 2/19/2010 (ca, ). (Entered: 02/19/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 307 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: None
TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit the long record on appeal 301 (USCA no. 10-1383). (gej, ) (Entered: 02/18/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 306 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None
EXHIBIT. Modified on 2/19/2010 (ca, ). (Entered: 02/18/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 305 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: None
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal 301 ; USCA Case No. 10-1383 (ca, ). (Entered: 02/18/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 304 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Case Opening (ca, ). (Entered: 02/18/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 303 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: None
TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal 301 . Notified counsel (gej, ) (Entered: 02/18/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 302 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record. (gej, ) (Entered: 02/18/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 301 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of appeal by Kevin Trudeau regarding orders 299 , 300 Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0752-4537069. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PDF 300 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None
ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 2/17/2010: Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
PACER 299 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 2/17/2010. Defendant's motion for leave to file excess pages 296 is granted. The Court certifies that defendant committed direct criminal contempt of court. Under 18 U.S.C. Sect. 401 he is committed for a term of 30 days custody of the U.S. Marshal and he is fined $5,000.00. Defendant's motion 295 for acquittal and his oral motion for preparation of a pre-sentence report are denied. Imposition of the sanctions imposed herein are stayed until 2/18/2010, at 2:15 p.m. Status hearing set for 2/18/2010 at 2:15 p.m. Terms of defendant's bond are to stand until he surrenders into custody.Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 298 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 296 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 2/17/2010 at 01:30 PM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 02/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 297 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kimball Richard Anderson for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 295 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 2/17/2010 at 01:30 PM. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 02/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 296 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Kevin Trudeau for leave to file excess pages INSTANTER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 02/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 564 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?