Wolfe v. Routzahn et al
Maryland District Court, Case No. 8:08-cv-03479
District Judge Peter J. Messitte, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.mdd.8-08-cv-03479 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
This docket can only tell you so much. Get the rest.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Rodney William Wolfe, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by 4833 Rugby Ave.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
John E Mallonee +1 301 979 9448 +1 240 597 0749 John@malloneelawfirm.com
v.
No Logo Joel Footen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by The Travelers Indemnity Company

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Rodger O Robertson +1 443 353 2301 +1 410 637 4703 Rodger.O.Robertson@Travelers.com
No Logo Thomas Routzahn, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by The Travelers Indemnity Company

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Rodger O Robertson +1 443 353 2301 +1 410 637 4703 Rodger.O.Robertson@Travelers.com
No Logo Washington County, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by The Travelers Indemnity Company

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Rodger O Robertson +1 443 353 2301 +1 410 637 4703 Rodger.O.Robertson@Travelers.com
No Logo Washington County Sheriff Dept., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by The Travelers Indemnity Company

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Rodger O Robertson +1 443 353 2301 +1 410 637 4703 Rodger.O.Robertson@Travelers.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 Prisoner: Civil Rights
  Entries (47) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
Need legal research help? Let us know!
PACER 48 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 46 Notice of Appeal. IMPORTANT NOTICE: To access forms which you are required to file with the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit please go to http://www.ca4.uscourts.gov and click on Forms & Notices. (krc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 47 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2-17-10, before Judge Messitte. Court Reporter/Transcriber L Marshall, Telephone number 301-344-3229. Total number of pages filed: 73. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER... Redaction Request due 4/5/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/14/2010. (lcm, Court Reporter) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 46 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Rodney William Wolfe. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0416-2451594. Appeal Record due by 4/19/2010. (Mallonee, John) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 45 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL ORDER OF JUDGMENT GRANTING WITH PREJUDICE 35 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment as to Counts I and II; GRANTING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 35 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment as to all remaining Counts; Final Judgment is ENTERED in favor of Defendants Thomas Routzahn, et al. and against Plaintiff Rodney Wolfe. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 2/17/2010. (kn, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/18/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 44 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Motion Hearing held on 2/17/2010 re 35 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Washington County, Joel Footen, Thomas Routzahn held before Judge Peter J. Messitte. (Court Reporter Marshall (4C) (esp, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 43 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 35 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Joel Footen, Thomas Routzahn, Washington County. (Robertson, Rodger) (Entered: 11/30/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 42 Filed: 11/27/2009, Entered: None
Supplemental to 38 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Rodney William Wolfe. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Mallonee, John) (Entered: 11/27/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 41 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 40 Consent Motion For Extension Of Time. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 11/23/2009. (jchss, Chambers) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 40 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 38 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Thomas Routzahn, Joel Footen, Washington County Responses due by 12/7/2009 (Robertson, Rodger) (Entered: 11/19/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 39 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: None
PAPERLESS CORRESPONDENCE to counsel/parties of record advising that, due to a conflict in the Court calendar, the MOTIONS HEARING scheduled for Tuesday, February 9, 2010 at 11:30 a.m. has been RESCHEDULED to Wednesday, February 17, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. (Courtroom 4C). (rass, Chambers) (Entered: 11/12/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PDF 38 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 35 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Rodney William Wolfe. Replies due by 11/19/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Lengthy Filing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mallonee, John) Courtesy and Hard Copies received 11/10/09. Modified on 11/10/2009 (cm, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 11/05/2009)
PACER 37 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: None
PAPERLESS CORRESPONDENCE to counsel/parties of record advising that, due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the MOTIONS HEARING scheduled for Monday, December 21, 2009 at 10:00 a.m. has been RESCHEDULED to Tuesday, February 9, 2010 at 11:30 a.m. (Courtroom 4C). (rass, Chambers) (Entered: 11/04/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 36 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None
PAPERLESS CORRESPONDENCE setting date for MOTIONS HEARING on 35 Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment for December 21, 2009 at 10:00 a.m. (Courtroom 4C) (jchss, Chambers) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 35 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Thomas Routzahn, Joel Footen, Washington County Responses due by 11/5/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order granting Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Exhibit Notice of Filing Lengthy Exhibits)(Robertson, Rodger) Modified on 10/28/2009 (kn, Deputy Clerk)(Hard Copy and One Set of Lengthy Exhibits rec'd 10/21/09 kn). (Entered: 10/19/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 33 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: None Amended Complaint
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Rodney William Wolfe. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Changes to Amended Complaint Identified)(Mallonee, John) Modified on 9/28/2009 (elts, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 9/29/2009 inadvertently marked filed in error (ranks, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 09/25/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 32 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING 31 Plaintiff's Line Withdrawing Motion For Fees Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 9/18/2009. (jchss, Chambers) (Entered: 09/18/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 31 Filed: 9/17/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE by Rodney William Wolfe re 26 MOTION for Attorney Fees for obtaining order compelling discovery responses Line Withdrawing Motion for Fees without prejudice (Mallonee, John) (Entered: 09/17/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 30 Filed: 9/17/2009, Entered: None
Status Report Submitted by Rodney William Wolfe (Mallonee, John) (Entered: 09/17/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 29 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 26 MOTION for Attorney Fees for obtaining order compelling discovery responses Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Expenses and Attorney's Fees filed by Thomas Routzahn, Joel Footen. Replies due by 9/10/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Written Discovery Requests, # 2 Exhibit Written Discovery Responses)(Robertson, Rodger) (Entered: 08/27/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 28 Filed: 8/4/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE to Rodney William Wolfe (Plaintiff) in Compliance with 4-306 of the Health General Article, Annotated Code of Maryland by Thomas Routzahn, Joel Footen (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Service)(jc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/05/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 27 Filed: 8/4/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE to Rodney William Wolfe (Plaintiff) In Compliance with 4-306 of The Health General Article Annotated Code of Maryland by Thomas Routzahn, Joel Footen (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Service)(jc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/05/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 26 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: None
MOTION for Attorney Fees for obtaining order compelling discovery responses by Rodney William Wolfe Responses due by 8/24/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of counsel re fees, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mallonee, John) (Entered: 08/05/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 25 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: None
Correspondence re: Defendant's Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Signature Page- Wolfe Report, # 2 Exhibit Wolfe Report, # 3 Exhibit Affidavit of Charles J. Keys, # 4 Exhibit Major Sam Billotti, WCSO)(Robertson, Rodger) (Entered: 08/03/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 24 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 21 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 7/29/09. (Messitte, Peter) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 23 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 21 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories filed by Rodney William Wolfe. (Mallonee, John) (Entered: 07/14/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 22 Filed: 7/9/2009, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 21 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories filed by Thomas Routzahn, Joel Footen. Replies due by 7/23/2009. (Robertson, Rodger) (Entered: 07/09/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 21 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: None Motion to Compel
MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories by Rodney William Wolfe Responses due by 7/9/2009 (Mallonee, John) (Entered: 06/22/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 20 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: None
Status Report Submitted by Rodney William Wolfe (Mallonee, John) (Entered: 06/19/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 19 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: None
Correspondence re: No Consent for Magistrate or Early ADR (Mallonee, John) (Entered: 05/19/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 18 Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 05/5/2009. (jc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/05/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PDF 17 Filed: 5/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 8 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; granting 15 Plaintiff's Consent Motion to Dismiss; denying 16 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File An Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 05/04/2009. (jc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/05/2009)
PACER 16 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Rodney William Wolfe Responses due by 5/14/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Mallonee, John) (Entered: 04/27/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 15 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
Consent MOTION to Dismiss Washington County Sheriff's Department by Rodney William Wolfe Responses due by 5/4/2009 (Mallonee, John) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 14 Filed: 4/16/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by John E Mallonee on behalf of Rodney William Wolfe (Mallonee, John) (Entered: 04/16/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 13 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 12 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to 4/20/09. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 3/16/09. (bmh, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 3/17/09) (Entered: 03/17/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 12 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: None
MOTION for Additional Time to Respond by Rodney William Wolfe (cem, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 11 Filed: 3/4/2009, Entered: None
Rule 12/56 letter sent to the parties. (c/m 3/4/09 cem, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/04/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 10 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None
ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Thomas Routzahn.(Robertson, Rodger) (Entered: 03/02/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 9 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None
ANSWER to 1 Complaint by J. R. Footen.(Robertson, Rodger) (Entered: 03/02/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 8 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Washington County Sheriff Dept. Responses due by 3/19/2009 (Robertson, Rodger) (Entered: 03/02/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 7 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change of Address by Rodney William Wolfe (cem, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 6 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: None
Correspondence from Fiscal Administrator re: inmate account analysis. (cem, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 5 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing Clerk to mail copies and withhold service; and directing Defendants to answer the complaint. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 2/6/09. (Attachments: # 1 service letter) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 2/9/09) (Entered: 02/09/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 4 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: None
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Rodney William Wolfe. (bmh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 3 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER directing the Fiscal Administrator for MCIH to file an inmate account certificate within 20 days. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 1/8/09. (c/m 1/12/09)(bmh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/12/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 2 Filed: 12/24/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rodney William Wolfe (bmh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/31/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 1 Filed: 12/24/2008, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against Thomas Routzahn, J. R. Footen, Washington County Sheriff Dept., filed by Rodney William Wolfe. (Attachments: # 1 envelope)(bmh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/31/2008)
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 133 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?