JASON L FRIZZELL
Nevada Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 09-23375
District Judge LINDA B. RIEGLE, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.nvb.09-23375 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
This docket can only tell you so much. Get the rest.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo COLLEEN L KEATING - FRIZZELL, Joint Debtor

Represented by HAINES & KRIEGER, LLC

No Logo JASON L FRIZZELL, Debtor

Represented by HAINES & KRIEGER, LLC

  Entries (21) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
Need legal research help? Let us know!
PDF 24
PACER 23 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: None
Receipt of Filing Fee for Schedules(09-23375-lbr) [misc,amdschsa] ( 26.00). Receipt number 7310201, fee amount $ 26.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 09/22/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 19 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: None
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution: I, TIMOTHY S CORY, having been appointed trustee of the estate of the above-named debtor(s), report that I have neither received any property nor paid any money on account of this estate; that I have made a diligent inquiry into the financial affairs of the debtor(s) and the location of the property belonging to the estate; and that there is no property available for distribution from the estate over and above that exempted by law. Pursuant to Fed R Bank P 5009, I hereby certify that the estate of the above-named debtor(s) has been fully administered. I request that I be discharged from any further duties as trustee. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 1 months. Assets Abandoned: $ 296257.00, Assets Exempt: $ 10997.00, Claims Scheduled: $ 439383.00, Claims Asserted: Not Applicable, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment: $ 439383.00. (CORY, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 09/03/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 18 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: None
Creditor Request for Notices Filed by BASS AND ASSOCIATES, P.C. (all) on behalf of HSBC Bank Nevada, N.A. (BASS AND ASSOCIATES, P.C. (all)) (Entered: 08/17/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 17 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
Certificate of Service Filed by KEVIN S. SODERSTROM on behalf of HSBC BANK (USA) (Related document(s) 13 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor HSBC BANK (USA), 14 Notice of Hearing filed by Creditor HSBC BANK (USA)) (SODERSTROM, KEVIN) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 16 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
Receipt of Filing Fee for Motion for Relief from Stay(09-23375-lbr) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 150.00). Receipt number 7062497, fee amount $ 150.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 15 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
Hearing Scheduled/Rescheduled.Hearing scheduled 9/2/2009 at 10:30 AM at LBR-Courtroom 1, Foley Federal Bldg.. (Related document(s) 13 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor HSBC BANK (USA)) (wml) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 14 Filed: 8/7/2009, Entered: None
Notice of Hearing Hearing Date: 9/2/2009 Hearing Time: 10:30 AM Filed by GREGORY L. WILDE on behalf of HSBC BANK (USA) (Related document(s) 13 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor HSBC BANK (USA)) (WILDE, GREGORY) (Entered: 08/07/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 13 Filed: 8/7/2009, Entered: None
Motion for Relief from Stay Property: 3413 ASHBY FIELD AVENUE, NORTH LAS VEGAS, NV 89031 . Fee Amount $150. Filed by GREGORY L. WILDE on behalf of HSBC BANK (USA) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DEED OF TRUST# 2 Exhibit NOTE# 3 Exhibit EXHIBITS)(WILDE, GREGORY) (Entered: 08/07/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 12 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s) 8 Order Determining Debtor's Compliance with Filing Requirements of 11 U.S.C. Section 521(a)(1) (BNC)) No. of Notices: 35. Service Date 07/29/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/30/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 11 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s) 9 Notice of Requirement to File Certification of Completion of Instructional Course Concerning Financial Management (BNC)) No. of Notices: 1. Service Date 07/29/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/30/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 10 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing (Related document(s) 6 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (BNC)) No. of Notices: 27. Service Date 07/29/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/30/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 9 Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: None
Notice of Requirement to File Certification of Completion of Instructional Course Concerning Financial Management. (mrb) (Entered: 07/27/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 8 Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: None
Order Determining Debtor's Compliance with Filing Requirements of 11 U.S.C. Section 521(a)(1) (mrb) (Entered: 07/27/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 7 Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: None
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(09-23375) [misc,volp7a] ( 299.00). Receipt number 6975749, fee amount $ 299.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 07/27/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 6 Filed: 7/25/2009, Entered: None
Meeting of Creditors and Notice of Appointment of Trustee TIMOTHY S CORY. 341 meeting to be held on 09/02/2009 at 02:00 PM at 341s - Foley Bldg,Rm 1500. Objections to Discharge due by 11/02/2009. (Entered: 07/25/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 5 Filed: 7/25/2009, Entered: None
Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by GEORGE HAINES on behalf of JASON L FRIZZELL, COLLEEN L KEATING - FRIZZELL (HAINES, GEORGE) (Entered: 07/25/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 4 Filed: 7/25/2009, Entered: None
Chapter 7 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Means Test Calculation - Form 22A . Filed by GEORGE HAINES on behalf of JASON L FRIZZELL, COLLEEN L KEATING - FRIZZELL (HAINES, GEORGE) (Entered: 07/25/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 3 Filed: 7/25/2009, Entered: None
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Filed by GEORGE HAINES on behalf of JASON L FRIZZELL, COLLEEN L KEATING - FRIZZELL (HAINES, GEORGE) (Entered: 07/25/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 2 Filed: 7/25/2009, Entered: None
Statement of Social Security Number(s). This document contains sensitive information and cannot be viewed by the public. Filed by GEORGE HAINES on behalf of JASON L FRIZZELL, COLLEEN L KEATING - FRIZZELL (HAINES, GEORGE) (Entered: 07/25/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PDF 1 Filed: 7/25/2009, Entered: None
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $299. Filed by GEORGE HAINES on behalf of JASON L FRIZZELL, COLLEEN L KEATING - FRIZZELL (HAINES, GEORGE) (Entered: 07/25/2009)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 20 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?