Judy Congress Smith
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 11-22691
District Judge Robert D. Drain, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.nysb.11-22691 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
The right information can save you thousands of dollars.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Judy Congress Smith, Debtor

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Judy Congress Smith
  Entries (4) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
Need legal research help? Let us know!
PACER 4 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None
Request for Deficiency Notice. (Vargas, Ana) (Entered: 04/12/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 3 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None
Certificate of Credit Counseling, Certificate Number: 12459-NYS-CC-014507548 filed by Judy Congress Smith. (Vargas, Ana) (Entered: 04/12/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 2 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None
Exhibit D Re: Credit Counseling Requirement for Judy Congress Smith, Stating Full Satisfaction of Requirement Credit Counseling Certificate due: 4/12/2011. (Vargas, Ana) (Entered: 04/12/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 1 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11). Order for Relief Entered.Fee Amount $ 1039, Chapter 11 Current Monthly Income Form 22B Due 4/26/2011. Schedule C due 4/26/2011. Schedule E due 4/26/2011. Schedule H due 4/26/2011. Incomplete Filings due by 4/26/2011, Chapter 11 Plan due by 8/10/2011, Disclosure Statement due by 8/10/2011, Initial Case Conference due by 5/12/2011, Filed by Judy Congress Smith . (Vargas, Ana) (Entered: 04/12/2011)
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 28 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?