LEONARD v. BRISTOL TOWNSHIP SCHOOL DISTRICT
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:09-cv-04692
District Judge Ronald L. Buckwalter, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.paed.2-09-cv-04692 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
The right information can save you thousands of dollars.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo CHARLENE LEONARD, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Albert Einstein Institution

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
GLORIA M. GILMAN +1 215 568 4990 +1 215 561 1375 gmgilman@igc.org

Toggle Switch Represented by BRODIE & RUBINSKY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
JOSHUA P. RUBINSKY +1 215 925 1470 rubinsky@brodierubinsky.com
v.
No Logo BRISTOL TOWNSHIP SCHOOL DISTRICT, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by LEVIN LEGAL GROUP PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
AMY R. GUERIN +1 215 938 6378 aguerin@levinlegalgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McNicholas & McNicholas LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ANNE E. HENDRICKS +1 215 938 6378 ahendricks@levinlegalgroup.com
MICHAEL I. LEVIN +1 215 938 6378 +1 215 938 6375 mlevin@levinlegalgroup.com
No Logo ELLEN BUDMAN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by LEVIN LEGAL GROUP PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
AMY R. GUERIN +1 215 938 6378 aguerin@levinlegalgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McNicholas & McNicholas LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ANNE E. HENDRICKS +1 215 938 6378 ahendricks@levinlegalgroup.com
MICHAEL I. LEVIN +1 215 938 6378 +1 215 938 6375 mlevin@levinlegalgroup.com
No Logo GERRY BARCIK, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by LEVIN LEGAL GROUP PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
AMY R. GUERIN +1 215 938 6378 aguerin@levinlegalgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McNicholas & McNicholas LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ANNE E. HENDRICKS +1 215 938 6378 ahendricks@levinlegalgroup.com
MICHAEL I. LEVIN +1 215 938 6378 +1 215 938 6375 mlevin@levinlegalgroup.com
No Logo JAMES ANDERS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by LEVIN LEGAL GROUP PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
AMY R. GUERIN +1 215 938 6378 aguerin@levinlegalgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McNicholas & McNicholas LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ANNE E. HENDRICKS +1 215 938 6378 ahendricks@levinlegalgroup.com
MICHAEL I. LEVIN +1 215 938 6378 +1 215 938 6375 mlevin@levinlegalgroup.com
No Logo JAMES WHITE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by LEVIN LEGAL GROUP PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
AMY R. GUERIN +1 215 938 6378 aguerin@levinlegalgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McNicholas & McNicholas LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ANNE E. HENDRICKS +1 215 938 6378 ahendricks@levinlegalgroup.com
MICHAEL I. LEVIN +1 215 938 6378 +1 215 938 6375 mlevin@levinlegalgroup.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e
Nature of Suit 442 Civil Rights: Jobs
  Entries (14) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PACER 14 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: None
Entry of Appearance by JAMES ANDERS, JAMES ANDERS, GERRY BARCIK, GERRY BARCIK, BRISTOL TOWNSHIP SCHOOL DISTRICT, ELLEN BUDMAN, ELLEN BUDMAN, JAMES WHITE, JAMES WHITE. (GUERIN, AMY) (Entered: 04/08/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 13 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None
Memorandum of Law In Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint re 11 First MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief filed by CHARLENE LEONARD. Certificate of Service.(GILMAN, GLORIA) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 12 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None
ORDER THAT SAID MOTION IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF'S SUR-REPLY SHALL BE FILED WITH THE COURT NO LATER THAN 7 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING THIS MOTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 3/17/10.3/18/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dp, ) (dp, ). (Entered: 03/18/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 11 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
First MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief filed by CHARLENE LEONARD.Plaintiff's Motion to Request Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief to Defendants' Reply Brief Pursuant to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint.(RUBINSKY, JOSHUA) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 10 Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: None
Memorandum in Support of 7 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by JAMES ANDERS, JAMES ANDERS, GERRY BARCIK, GERRY BARCIK, BRISTOL TOWNSHIP SCHOOL DISTRICT, ELLEN BUDMAN, ELLEN BUDMAN, JAMES WHITE, JAMES WHITE, Certificate of Service. (HENDRICKS, ANNE) Modified on 3/10/2010 (nd). (Entered: 03/09/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 9 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
Praecipe To Enter Appearance of Counsel by JAMES ANDERS, JAMES ANDERS, GERRY BARCIK, GERRY BARCIK, BRISTOL TOWNSHIP SCHOOL DISTRICT, ELLEN BUDMAN, ELLEN BUDMAN, JAMES WHITE, JAMES WHITE. (HENDRICKS, ANNE) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 8 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None
Answer in Opposition re 7 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by CHARLENE LEONARD, Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (RUBINSKY, JOSHUA) Modified on 2/18/2010 (nd, ). (Entered: 02/17/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 7 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss filed by JAMES ANDERS, GERRY BARCIK, JAMES WHITE, ELLEN BUDMAN, JAMES ANDERS, GERRY BARCIK, JAMES WHITE, ELLEN BUDMAN, BRISTOL TOWNSHIP SCHOOL DISTRICT.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Memorandum of Law)(LEVIN, MICHAEL) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 6 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHARLENE LEONARD. BRISTOL TOWNSHIP SCHOOL DISTRICT waiver sent on 12/23/2009, answer due 2/22/2010. (RUBINSKY, JOSHUA) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 5 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: None
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS DISMISSED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 12/21/2009. 12/23/200 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED.(ap, ) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PDF 4 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: None Amended Complaint
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against JAMES ANDERS, GERRY BARCIK, JAMES WHITE, ELLEN BUDMAN, BRISTOL TOWNSHIP SCHOOL DISTRICT, filed by CHARLENE LEONARD. with JURY DEMAND(ap, ) (Entered: 12/17/2009)
PACER 3 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss filed by BRISTOL TOWNSHIP SCHOOL DISTRICT.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 2 Supplement Memorandum of Law, # 3 Supplement Certificate of Service)(LEVIN, MICHAEL) (Entered: 11/30/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 2 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHARLENE LEONARD. BRISTOL TOWNSHIP SCHOOL DISTRICT waiver sent on 10/14/2009, answer due 12/14/2009. (RUBINSKY, JOSHUA) (Entered: 11/05/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 1 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against BRISTOL TOWNSHIP SCHOOL DISTRICT ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number PPE010770.), filed by CHARLENE LEONARD.(jeb, ) (Entered: 10/14/2009)
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 71 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?