Ross v. Kia Motors Corp et al
Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 4:05-cv-00381
District Judge Richard A. Schell, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.txed.4-05-cv-00381 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
This docket can only tell you so much. Get the rest.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Mildred Ross, Plaintiff
No Logo Kia Motors America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hartline Dacus Barger Dreyer & Kern, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Kyle Harold Dreyer +1 214 369 2100 +1 214 369 2118 kdreyer@hdbdk.com
Sean Roger Fitzgibbons +1 214 346 3740 +1 214 369 2118 sfitzgibbons@hdbdk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Office of Brian K. Gary, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Brian Keith Gary +1 903 892 0404 +1 903 892 8688 bgary@garylawoffice.com
No Logo Kia Motors Corp, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Robert T Jarvis +1 903 892 8500 +1 903 892 8550 bobjarvislawfirm@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hartline Dacus Barger Dreyer & Kern, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Kyle Harold Dreyer +1 214 369 2100 +1 214 369 2118 kdreyer@hdbdk.com
Sean Roger Fitzgibbons +1 214 346 3740 +1 214 369 2118 sfitzgibbons@hdbdk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Office of Brian K. Gary, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Brian Keith Gary +1 903 892 0404 +1 903 892 8688 bgary@garylawoffice.com
No Logo Garland Cardwell, Guardian ad Litem
No Logo Joe Dodson Clayton, Mediator

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert L. Royer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Joe Dodson Clayton +1 903 533 9288 +1 903 533 9687 jdcmediations@suddenlinkmail.com
No Logo Juvenile Alternatives, Inc., Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Robert T Jarvis +1 903 892 8500 +1 903 892 8550 bobjarvislawfirm@aol.com
No Logo Kia Motors America, Inc., Third Party Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hartline Dacus Barger Dreyer & Kern, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Sean Roger Fitzgibbons +1 214 346 3740 +1 214 369 2118 sfitzgibbons@hdbdk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Office of Brian K. Gary, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Brian Keith Gary +1 903 892 0404 +1 903 892 8688 bgary@garylawoffice.com
No Logo Tanya Kennimer, Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Ross S Crossland +1 512 329 5110 +1 512 329 5056 crosslandlaw@att.net
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 365 Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
  Entries (69) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PACER 69 Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Don D. Bush : Minor Prove-Up hearing held on 8/4/2006. (Court Reporter MaryAnn Taylor.) (baf, ) Modified on 8/30/2006 (tls, ). (Entered: 08/28/2006)
PACER 68 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING 65 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Claim filed by Kia Motors Corp,, Kia Motors America Inc. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 8/11/2006. (baf, ) (Entered: 08/14/2006)
PACER 67 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
AGREED JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 8/9/2006. (baf, ) (Entered: 08/09/2006)
PACER 66 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER that the Court approves the final settlement reached by the parties and finds it is in the best interest of the minor plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Don D. Bush on 8/8/2006. (baf, ) (Entered: 08/08/2006)
PACER 65 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Claim by Kia Motors Corp, Kia Motors America Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gary, Brian) (Entered: 08/07/2006)
PACER 64 Filed: 7/13/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE of Hearing:Minor Prove-Up Hearing set for Friday 8/4/2006 at 11:30 AM in Ctrm Bnkrptcy (Plano) before Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush. (tls, ) (Entered: 07/13/2006)
PACER 63 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER RESETTING Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Scheduling for 8/7/2006 at 1:30 PM in Ctrm A01 (Sherman) before Judge Richard A. Schell. Signed by Judge Don D. Bush on 6/16/2006. (baf, ) (Entered: 06/19/2006)
PACER 62 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 61 Motion to Appoint Guardian ad Litem. Appointed Garland Don Cardwell for Cayla Kennimer; Brian Kennimer and Le'Shea Kennimer. Signed by Judge Don D. Bush on 5/24/2006. (baf, ) (Entered: 05/24/2006)
PACER 61 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: None
Joint MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem by Kia Motors Corp, Kia Motors America Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gary, Brian) (Entered: 05/18/2006)
PACER 60 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 59 Motion to Continue mediation deadline, mediation to be completed by Wednesday, 5/3/06 . Signed by Judge Don D. Bush on 4/6/06. (ttm, ) (Entered: 04/10/2006)
PACER 59 Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: None
MOTION to Continue Agreed Motion To Continue Mediation Deadline by Mildred Ross. (Attachments: # 1 Order Re: Agreed Motion To Continue Mediation Deadline)(Tracy, E) (Entered: 04/04/2006)
PACER 58 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE by Kia Motors Corp, Kia Motors America Inc of Service of Kia Defendants' Designation of Experts (Gary, Brian) (Entered: 03/31/2006)
PACER 57 Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE by Mildred Ross Plfts Notice of Service of Desg Exp Witnesses (Tracy, E) (Entered: 03/07/2006)
PACER 56 Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 49 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, it is Ordered that Dfts' motion is granted as to the wrongful death claims brought by Pltf . Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 2/1/06. (ttm, ) (Entered: 02/03/2006)
PACER 55 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 54 Motion to Withdraw 52 MOTION to Quash Notice of Intent to Take Deposition by Written Questions, or in the Alternative for In Camera Inspection and Protective Order . Signed by Judge Don D. Bush on 1/25/2006. (pad, ) (Entered: 01/25/2006)
PACER 54 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: None
MOTION to Withdraw Motion to Quash (de#52) by Juvenile Alternatives, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1)(Jarvis, Robert) Modified on 1/24/2006 (ttm, ). ***Replaces Motion #53*** (Entered: 01/24/2006)
PACER 53 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: None
FILED IN ERROR. WILL BE REFILED AS A MOTION TO WITHDRAW. PLEASE IGNORE. MOTION to Quash by Juvenile Alternatives, Inc.. (Jarvis, Robert) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/23/2006 (pad, ). Modified on 1/24/2006 (pad, ). (Entered: 01/23/2006)
PACER 52 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: None
MOTION to Quash Notice of Intent to Take Deposition by Written Questions, or in the Alternative for In Camera Inspection and Protective Order by Kia Motors Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order# 2 Exhibit Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit Exhibit A# 4 Exhibit Exhibit A# 5 Exhibit Exhibit A# 6 Exhibit Exhibit A# 7 Exhibit Exhibit A# 8 Exhibit Exhibit A# 9 Exhibit Exhibit A# 10 Exhibit Exhibit B# 11 Exhibit Exhibit B# 12 Exhibit Exhibit B# 13 Exhibit Exhibit C# 14 Exhibit Exhibit C# 15 Exhibit Exhibit C# 16 Errata Exhibit C)(Jarvis, Robert) (Entered: 01/13/2006)
PDF 51 Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for 42 Motion to Dismiss filed by Tanya Kennimer. It is ORDERED that Third Party Dft Tanya Kennimer's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Third Party Complaint is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 12/29/2005. (baf, ) (Entered: 01/04/2006)
PACER 50 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2006 before Judge Richard A. Schell. Amended Pleadings due by 11/28/2005. Discovery due by 6/16/2006. Jury instructions due by 7/7/2006 Mediation Completion due by 4/15/2006. The parties have agreed to use Judge Joe Clayton as a mediator. Motions due by 6/2/2006. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/7/2006. Disclosure of expert testimonydue by 3/7/2006 for plaintiff, and 3/31/2006 by defendants, and by 4/14/2006 by 3rd party defendant. Each party shall have until 6/2/2006 to object. Pretrial disclosure by plaintiff due by 6/16/2006 and by defendant 6/30/2006. Signed by Judge Don D. Bush on 12/21/2005. (pad, ) (Entered: 12/23/2005)
PACER 49 Filed: 12/13/2005, Entered: None
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Brief in Support by Kia Motors Corp, Kia Motors America Inc. Responses due by 12/28/2005 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gary, Brian) (Entered: 12/13/2005)
PACER 48 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 42 MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Complaint and Brief in Support filed by Tanya Kennimer. Objections to R&R due by 12/23/2005. Signed by Judge Don D. Bush on 12/7/2005. (baf, ) (Entered: 12/09/2005)
PACER 47 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: None
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Gary, Brian) (Entered: 12/07/2005)
PACER 46 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING 45 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Designate Tanya Kennimer as Responsible Third Party, filed by Kia Motors Corp,, Kia Motors America Inc. Signed by Judge Don D. Bush on 12/2/2005. (baf, ) (Entered: 12/05/2005)
PACER 45 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 42 MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Complaint and Brief in Support and Unopposed Motion for Leave to Designate Kennimer as Responsible Third Party filed by Kia Motors Corp, Kia Motors America Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Gary, Brian) (Entered: 10/27/2005)
PACER 44 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER TO CONDUCT RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/7/2005. Scheduling Conference set for 12/16/2005 at 9:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush at the US Bankruptcy Court, 660 North Central Expressway, Plano, Texas (Suite 300B). Signed by Judge Don D. Bush on 10/25/2005. (baf, ) (Entered: 10/26/2005)
PACER 43 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: None
Tanya Kennimer's ANSWER to Third Party Complaint Subject to Tanya Kennimer's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss by Tanya Kennimer.(Crossland, Ross) (Entered: 10/13/2005)
PACER 42 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Complaint and Brief in Support by Tanya Kennimer. (Crossland, Ross) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/14/2005 (ttm, ). (Entered: 10/13/2005)
PACER 41 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 40 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Don D. Bush on 10/12/2005. (baf, ) (Entered: 10/13/2005)
PACER 40 Filed: 10/10/2005, Entered: None
MOTION for Protective Order (Agreed) by Kia Motors Corp, Kia Motors America Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gary, Brian) (Entered: 10/10/2005)
PACER 39 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: None
Magistrate Consent Form emailed to attorneys for Mildred Ross, Tanya Kennimer, Kia Motors Corp and Kia Motors America Inc with (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Case Assignment form) (ttm, ) (Entered: 10/03/2005)
PACER 38 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush to handle pretrial proceedings. cc:attys on 10/3/05(ttm, ) (Entered: 10/03/2005)
PACER 37 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 11 Motion to Change Venue; The above-styled and captioned matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the Sherman Division of the Eastern District of Texas . Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/30/05. (mrm, ) (Entered: 09/30/2005)
PACER 36 Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: None
CANCELLATION NOTICE OF HEARING re 11 MOTION to Change Venue (mrm, ) (Entered: 09/21/2005)
PACER 35 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 34 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kyle Harold Dreyer terminated . Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/9/05. (mrm, ) (Entered: 09/09/2005)
PACER 34 Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: None
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Kia Motors Corp, Kia Motors America Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Dreyer, Kyle) (Entered: 09/08/2005)
PACER 33 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE by Kia Motors Corp, Kia Motors America Inc of Service of Interrogatories and Request for Production to Plaintiffs (Gary, Brian) (Entered: 09/07/2005)
PACER 32 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 11 MOTION to Change Venue: Motion Hearing reset for 9/23/2005 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom. (mrm, ) (Entered: 09/07/2005)
PACER 31 Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 11 MOTION to Change Venue: Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2005 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom. (each side shall have 20 mins to present). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/31/05. (mrm, ) (Entered: 09/01/2005)
PACER 30 Filed: 8/10/2005, Entered: None
***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, to be refiled with certificate of conference attached*** MOTION for Protective Order by Kia Motors America Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fitzgibbons, Sean) Modified on 10/4/2005 (ttm, ). (Entered: 08/10/2005)
PACER 29 Filed: 5/25/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Keith Gary on behalf of Kia Motors Corp, Kia Motors America Inc (Gary, Brian) (Entered: 05/25/2005)
PACER 28 Filed: 3/18/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE by Kia Motors Corp of Service of Response to Request for Production (Fitzgibbons, Sean) (Entered: 03/18/2005)
PACER 27 Filed: 3/18/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE by Kia Motors America Inc of Service of Responses to Request for Production (Fitzgibbons, Sean) (Entered: 03/18/2005)
PACER 26 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE of Disclosure by Kia Motors Corp, Kia Motors America Inc Defendants' Notice of Initial Disclosure (Gary, Brian) (Entered: 01/27/2005)
PACER 25 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE of Disclosure by Mildred Ross, Brian Kennimer, Le'Shea Kennimer, Cayla Kennimer Plaintiffs' Notice of Initial Disclosure (Tracy, E) (Entered: 01/26/2005)
PACER 24 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/6/2006 in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge David Folsom. Amended Pleadings due by 12/5/2005. Discovery due by 12/6/2005. Joinder of Parties due by 11/4/2005. Jury instructions due by 2/4/2006 Jury Selection set for 3/7/2006 10:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge David Folsom. Mediation Completion due by 12/8/2005.Proposed Findings of Fact due by 2/4/2006 Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/4/2006.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/3/05. (mrm, ) (Entered: 01/04/2005)
PACER 23 Filed: 12/27/2004, Entered: None
Proposed Pretrial Order and Joint Conference Report by Mildred Ross, Kia Motors America Inc, Tanya Kennimer, Brian Kennimer, Le'Shea Kennimer, Cayla Kennimer, Kia Motors Corp, Kia Motors America Inc. (Gary, Brian) (Entered: 12/27/2004)
PACER 22 Filed: 11/10/2004, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 11 MOTION to Change Venue in Support of filed by Kia Motors America Inc. (Huntsman, Fred) (Entered: 11/10/2004)
PACER 21 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 11 MOTION to Change Venue Plaintiffs' Response to Kia Motors America, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer filed by Brian Kennimer, Cayla Kennimer, Le'Shea Kennimer, Mildred Ross. (Tracy, E) (Entered: 11/01/2004)
PACER 20 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: None
***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE. SEE DOC #21.***RESPONSE to Motion re 11 MOTION to Change Venue Plaintiffs' Response to Kia Motors America, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer filed by Brian Kennimer, Cayla Kennimer, Le'Shea Kennimer, Mildred Ross. (Tracy, E) Modified on 11/2/2004 (fal, ). (Entered: 11/01/2004)
PACER 19 Filed: 10/25/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 11 MOTION to Change Venue Responses due by 10/31/2004 Replies due by 11/8/2004.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/22/04. (mpv, ) (Entered: 10/26/2004)
PACER 18 Filed: 10/22/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER To Conduct Rule 26f Conference directing parties to confer no later than 11/22/2004 and parties are to file with court a joint written report outlining their proposals no later than 12/27/2004.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/21/2004. (sm, ) (Entered: 10/22/2004)
PACER 17 Filed: 10/21/2004, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 11 MOTION to Change Venue Unopposed Motion For Extension of Time For Plaintiffs To File A Response To Defendants' Motion For Change of Venue by Brian Kennimer, Cayla Kennimer, Le'Shea Kennimer. (Attachments: # 1 Order - Unopposed Motion For Extension of Time For Plaintiffs to Respond to Defendant's Mtn For Change of Venue)(Tracy, E) (Entered: 10/21/2004)
PACER 16 Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: None
Kia Motors America, Inc.'s First Amended ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Kia Motors America Inc.(Gary, Brian) (Entered: 10/19/2004)
PACER 15 Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: None
Kia Motors Corp.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Kia Motors Corp.(Gary, Brian) (Entered: 10/19/2004)
PACER 14 Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: None
Kia Motors Corp.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , Subject to Kia Motor Corp's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss by Kia Motors Corp.(Gary, Brian) (Entered: 10/19/2004)
PACER 13 Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss by Kia Motors Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on KMC's Motion to Dismiss)(Gary, Brian) (Entered: 10/19/2004)
PACER 12 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: None
KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC.'S ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Kia Motors America Inc.(Gary, Brian) (Entered: 10/14/2004)
PACER 11 Filed: 10/6/2004, Entered: None, Terminated: 10/25/2004
MOTION to Change Venue by Kia Motors America Inc. (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(Gary, Brian) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/6/2004 (fal, ). (Entered: 10/06/2004)
PACER 10 Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: None
AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiffs' First against Kia Motors America Inc, Kia Motors Corp, filed by Brian Kennimer, Cayla Kennimer, Le'Shea Kennimer, Mildred Ross.(Tracy, E) (Entered: 10/01/2004)
PACER 9 Filed: 9/8/2004, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Keith Gary on behalf of Kia Motors America Inc (Gary, Brian) (Entered: 09/08/2004)
PACER 8 Filed: 8/25/2004, Entered: None
THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT Subject to Kia Motors America, Inc.'s Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss against Tanya Kennimer, filed by Kia Motors America Inc. (Attachments: # 1)(Fitzgibbons, Sean) (Entered: 08/25/2004)
PACER 7 Filed: 8/24/2004, Entered: None
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand SUBJECT TO KIA MOTOR AMERICA, INC.'S 6 RULE 12(b)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS by Kia Motors America Inc.(Fitzgibbons, Sean) Modified on 8/24/2004 (ktd, ). (Entered: 08/24/2004)
PACER 6 Filed: 8/24/2004, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss by Kia Motors America Inc. Responses due by 9/13/2004 (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(Fitzgibbons, Sean) (Entered: 08/24/2004)
PACER 5 Filed: 8/24/2004, Entered: None
***PLEASE IGNORE. FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCUMENTS # 6 & 7 ***ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Subject to Kia Motor America, Inc.'s Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss by Mildred Ross.(Fitzgibbons, Sean) Modified on 8/24/2004 (ktd, ). (Entered: 08/24/2004)
PACER 4 Filed: 8/13/2004, Entered: None
Return of personal Service Executed as to Kia Motors America Inc on 8/5/2004, answer due: 8/25/2004. (ktd, ) (Entered: 08/16/2004)
PACER 3 Filed: 8/11/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 2 Motion for substituted service. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that APS International, Ltd, is authorized to effect service of process on the Dft Kia Motors Corp in the Republic of Korea in accordance with the Hague Convention and international law. The Court further grants Pla an extension of a minimum of 180 days to serve Dft Kia Motors Corp . Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/11/04. (mpv, ) (Entered: 08/11/2004)
PACER 2 Filed: 8/5/2004, Entered: None
MOTION for Substituted Service by Mildred Ross. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(mpv, ) (Entered: 08/06/2004)
PACER 1 Filed: 7/28/2004, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against Kia Motors America Inc, Kia Motors Corp (Filing fee $ 150.) Receipt 103173, filed by Mildred Ross. (Attachments: # 1)(rvw, ) (Entered: 07/29/2004)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 76 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?