Gaydos v. 3M Company F/K/A Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing Company et al.
Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:09-cv-00610
District Judge Vanessa D. Gilmore, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.txsd.4-09-cv-00610 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
This docket can only tell you so much. Get the rest.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1446
Nature of Suit 368 P.I. : Asbestos
  Entries (25) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PACER 25 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: None
Certified Mail Receipt Returned from Harris County Civil Courthouse (333rd Civil Court) executed on April 6 2009, filed. (sguevara, ) (Entered: 04/07/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 24 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 6 Motion to Remand.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(sbyrum, ) (Entered: 04/01/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 23 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: None
STATEMENT of No Opposition re: 6 MOTION to Remand by Paul Gaydos, filed.(Smith, James) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 22 Filed: 3/26/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Crystal G. Roach on behalf of Elliott Turbomachinery Company a/k/a Elliott Company, filed. (Roach, Crystal) (Entered: 03/26/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 21 Filed: 3/26/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Regarding Discovery Motions, Motions for Summary Judgment and Analogous Motions to Dismiss.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(emares, ) (Entered: 03/26/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 20 Filed: 3/26/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Concerning Removal.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(emares, ) (Entered: 03/26/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 19 Filed: 3/26/2009, Entered: None
ANSWER to 14 Answer to Complaint,,,, Crossclaim,,, 12 Answer to State Court Petition/Notice of Removal,,,, Crossclaim,,,, ANSWER to 14 Answer to Complaint,,,, Crossclaim,,, 12 Answer to State Court Petition/Notice of Removal,,,, Crossclaim,,,, CROSSCLAIM against all parties by Guard-Line, Inc., filed.(Bosio, Nathaniel) (Entered: 03/26/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 18 Filed: 3/26/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/5/2009 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. Parties notified.(emares, ) (Entered: 03/26/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 17 Filed: 3/23/2009, Entered: None
ANSWER to Complaint by Elliott Turbomachinery Company a/k/a Elliott Company, filed.(Smith, Court) (Entered: 03/23/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 16 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Rowan Companies, Inc, filed.(Barker, Lauren) (Entered: 03/18/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 15 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: None
CLERKS NOTICE on Mandatory Electronic Filing re: 14 Answer to Complaint,,,,,,, Crossclaim,,,,,,. Party notified, filed. (kstrouse, ) (Entered: 03/17/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 14 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: None
Defendant Riley Power, Inc.'s ANSWER to Plaintiff's Original Complaint 1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal, CROSSCLAIM against General Electric Company, General Motors Corporation, Guard-Line, Inc., Honeywell International (individually and as successor-in-interest ot Bendix Corporation), Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Riley Power Inc. f/k/a Riley Stoker Corporation and D.B. Riley, Inc.), Rowan Companies, Inc, 3M Company F/K/A Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing Company, Alcoa, Inc., CBS Corporation, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. f/k/a Aqua-Chem, Inc., d/b/a Cleaver-Brooks Division, Drilling Specialities Company, a Division of Chevron Phillips Chemical Company, Elliott Turbomachinery Company a/k/a Elliott Company, Ford Motor Company, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation by National Oil Well Varco, filed.(kstrouse, ) (Entered: 03/17/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 13 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: None
CLERKS NOTICE on Mandatory Electronic Filing re: 12 Answer to State Court Petition/Notice of Removal,,,, Crossclaim,,,. Party notified, filed. (kstrouse, ) (Entered: 03/17/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 12 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: None
Defendant National Oilwell Varco, LP's (Improperly Named as National Oilwell Varco) ANSWER to Plaintiff's Original Complaint 1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal, CROSSCLAIM against General Electric Company, General Motors Corporation, Guard-Line, Inc., Honeywell International (individually and as successor-in-interest ot Bendix Corporation), Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Riley Power Inc. f/k/a Riley Stoker Corporation and D.B. Riley, Inc.), Rowan Companies, Inc, 3M Company F/K/A Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing Company, Alcoa, Inc., CBS Corporation, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. f/k/a Aqua-Chem, Inc., d/b/a Cleaver-Brooks Division, Drilling Specialities Company, a Division of Chevron Phillips Chemical Company, Elliott Turbomachinery Company a/k/a Elliott Company, Ford Motor Company, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation by National Oil Well Varco, filed.(kstrouse, ) (Entered: 03/17/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 11 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. Judge Keith P Ellison no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (dhansen, ) (Entered: 03/17/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 10 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Winn Carter on behalf of Rowan Companies, Inc, filed. (Carter, Winstol) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 9 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss by Rowan Companies, Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/6/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Barker, Lauren) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 8 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
RECUSAL ORDER. Judge Keith P Ellison recused. Deadlines in scheduling orders subsist. Court settings are vacated.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(csonnier, ) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 7 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: None
ANSWER to 1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Alcoa, Inc., filed.(Matney, William) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 6 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: None
MOTION to Remand by Alcoa, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/26/2009. (Matney, William) (Entered: 03/06/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 5 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None
CLERKS NOTICE REGARDING INITIAL CONFERENCE. Parties notified., filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(csonnier, ) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 4 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/1/2009 at 10:15 AM in Room 3716 before Judge Keith P Ellison.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(bthomas, ) (Entered: 03/02/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 3 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None
MOTION to Stay Initial Case Management and Initial Disclosure Deadlines by Alcoa, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/19/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Matney, William) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 2 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Tag-Along Action by Alcoa, Inc., filed. (Matney, William) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 1 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 333rd Judicial District of Harris County, Texas, case number 2009-06951 (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 05410000000004758989) filed by Alcoa, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A - G)(Matney, William) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 6 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?