USA v. McCullough et al
Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 1:11-cr-00136
District Judge Julie E. Carnes, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.gand.1-11-cr-00136 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Judges don't know as much about themselves as we do.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Sandra Whorton, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Finestone & Morris

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Bruce Howard Morris +1 404 262 2500 BMorris@FMattorneys.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LaScala & LaScala

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Michael S. LaScala +1 404 881 8866

Toggle Switch Represented by Whorton, Sandra

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Sandra Whorton +1 770 507 4410
  Entries (53) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
Need legal research help? Let us know!
PACER 287 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition as to Joshua McCullough, Jimmy Ray Whorton, Sandra Whorton, James McKenzie, Karry Autry, Holly Autry, Joseph Tillman, Brian Prewitt, Paul Bunch, Ira Butler filed by USA re 183 MOTION to Suppress Search and Seizure of 1396 Commerce Drive, Suites A and B, 132 First MOTION to Adopt Co-Defendant, Sandra Whorton's Motions (Documents 125, 126,127, 128 and 129)First MOTION to Adopt Co-Defendant, Sandra Whorton's Motions (Documents 125, 126,127, 128 and 129), 196 MOTION to Suppress Evidence Seized in Search of 436 Hood Road, 153 MOTION to Suppress 436 Hood Road, 154 MOTION to Suppress 436 Hood Road with Exhibit A, 230 Supplemental MOTION to Suppress Evidence, 233 Second MOTION to Adopt Holly Autry's Supplemental Motion to Suppress (Document 230), 113 MOTION to Suppress Re: Traffic Stop, 143 MOTION to Suppress Evidence, 125 MOTION to Suppress Evidence, 200 MOTION to Suppress Evidence, 112 MOTION to Suppress Re: Search Warrant Executed at 925 Hemphill Road, 156 MOTION to Suppress 2220 Jodeco Road with Exhibit, 155 MOTION to Suppress 445 Hood Road with Exhibit, 146 MOTION to Suppress the Search of 436 Hood Road, Stockbridge, Georgia, 30281 and the Fruits Thereof (Preliminary), 205 Supplemental MOTION to Suppress Evidence, Statements and the Fruits Thereof, 147 MOTION to Suppress the Search of 1850 Flat Rock Road and the Fruits Thereof (Preliminary), 197 MOTION to Suppress Evidence, 130 MOTION to Suppress Evidence, 213 MOTION to Suppress Evidence, 145 MOTION to Adopt, 163 MOTION to Suppress Evidence Supplement to Government's Consolidated Response in Opposition - Additional Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 277 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING 271 Motion to Travel outside Jurisdiction as to Sandra Whorton (3). Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 7/1/11. (lme) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 272 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None
PROPOSED ORDER Order Permitting Travel as to Sandra Whorton re: 271 MOTION to Travel outside Jurisdiction 6/30/11-7/8/11 Panama City Beach, FL (Morris, Bruce) (Entered: 06/29/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 271 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None
MOTION to Travel outside Jurisdiction 6/30/11-7/8/11 Panama City Beach, FL by Sandra Whorton. (Morris, Bruce) (Entered: 06/29/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 263 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Approving 251 Leave of Absence for AUSA Michael Brown for the periods of July 8-27, 2011 as to Joshua McCullough, Jimmy Ray Whorton, Sandra Whorton, James McKenzie, Karry Autry, Holly Autry, Joseph Tillman, Brian Prewitt, Paul Bunch, Ira Butler. Time excluded from 07/08/11 until 07/27/11. Counsel must seek approval form Magistrate Judge Baverman, as this Court does not know his schedule or deadlines. Signed by Judge Julie E. Carnes on 06/14/11. (fap) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 255 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion as to Sandra Whorton filed by Sandra Whorton re: 183 MOTION to Suppress Search and Seizure of 1396 Commerce Drive, Suites A and B, 125 MOTION to Suppress Evidence (Morris, Bruce) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 251 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): July 8, 2011-July 27, 2011, by Michael John Brown. (Brown, Michael) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 245 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING Government Exhibits as to Joshua McCullough, Jimmy Ray Whorton, Sandra Whorton, James McKenzie, Karry Autry, Holly Autry, Joseph Tillman, Brian Prewitt, Paul Bunch, Ira Butler re 236 Response in Opposition,,,,,, filed by USA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit N, O, & P)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 244 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING Government Exhibits as to Joshua McCullough, Jimmy Ray Whorton, Sandra Whorton, James McKenzie, Karry Autry, Holly Autry, Joseph Tillman, Brian Prewitt, Paul Bunch, Ira Butler re 236 Response in Opposition,,,,,, filed by USA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit L & M)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 243 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING Government Exhibits as to Joshua McCullough, Jimmy Ray Whorton, Sandra Whorton, James McKenzie, Karry Autry, Holly Autry, Joseph Tillman, Brian Prewitt, Paul Bunch, Ira Butler re 236 Response in Opposition,,,,,, filed by USA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit J & K)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 242 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING Government Exhibits as to Joshua McCullough, Jimmy Ray Whorton, Sandra Whorton, James McKenzie, Karry Autry, Holly Autry, Joseph Tillman, Brian Prewitt, Paul Bunch, Ira Butler re 236 Response in Opposition,,,,,, filed by USA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 241 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING Government Exhibits as to Joshua McCullough, Jimmy Ray Whorton, Sandra Whorton, James McKenzie, Karry Autry, Holly Autry, Joseph Tillman, Brian Prewitt, Paul Bunch, Ira Butler re 236 Response in Opposition,,,,,, filed by USA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G & H)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 240 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING Government Exhibits as to Joshua McCullough, Jimmy Ray Whorton, Sandra Whorton, James McKenzie, Karry Autry, Holly Autry, Joseph Tillman, Brian Prewitt, Paul Bunch, Ira Butler re 236 Response in Opposition,,,,,, filed by USA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E & F)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 239 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING Government Exhibits as to Joshua McCullough, Jimmy Ray Whorton, Sandra Whorton, James McKenzie, Karry Autry, Holly Autry, Joseph Tillman, Brian Prewitt, Paul Bunch, Ira Butler re 238 Notice of Filing, filed by USA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C & D)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 238 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING Government Exhibits as to Joshua McCullough, Jimmy Ray Whorton, Sandra Whorton, James McKenzie, Karry Autry, Holly Autry, Joseph Tillman, Brian Prewitt, Paul Bunch, Ira Butler re 236 Response in Opposition,,,,,, filed by USA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A & B)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 236 Filed: 5/28/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition as to Joshua McCullough, Jimmy Ray Whorton, Sandra Whorton, James McKenzie, Karry Autry, Holly Autry, Joseph Tillman, Brian Prewitt, Paul Bunch, Ira Butler filed by USA re 183 MOTION to Suppress Search and Seizure of 1396 Commerce Drive, Suites A and B, 132 First MOTION to Adopt Co-Defendant, Sandra Whorton's Motions (Documents 125, 126,127, 128 and 129)First MOTION to Adopt Co-Defendant, Sandra Whorton's Motions (Documents 125, 126,127, 128 and 129), 196 MOTION to Suppress Evidence Seized in Search of 436 Hood Road, 153 MOTION to Suppress 436 Hood Road, 154 MOTION to Suppress 436 Hood Road with Exhibit A, 230 Supplemental MOTION to Suppress Evidence, 233 Second MOTION to Adopt Holly Autry's Supplemental Motion to Suppress (Document 230), 113 MOTION to Suppress Re: Traffic Stop, 143 MOTION to Suppress Evidence, 125 MOTION to Suppress Evidence, 200 MOTION to Suppress Evidence, 112 MOTION to Suppress Re: Search Warrant Executed at 925 Hemphill Road, 156 MOTION to Suppress 2220 Jodeco Road with Exhibit, 155 MOTION to Suppress 445 Hood Road with Exhibit, 146 MOTION to Suppress the Search of 436 Hood Road, Stockbridge, Georgia, 30281 and the Fruits Thereof (Preliminary), 205 Supplemental MOTION to Suppress Evidence, Statements and the Fruits Thereof, 147 MOTION to Suppress the Search of 1850 Flat Rock Road and the Fruits Thereof (Preliminary), 197 MOTION to Suppress Evidence, 130 MOTION to Suppress Evidence, 213 MOTION to Suppress Evidence, 145 MOTION to Adopt, 163 MOTION to Suppress Evidence (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 05/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 232 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 229 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motions to Suppress Evidence. The Government is DIRECTED to File its reply brief by FRIDAY, MAY 27, 2011. The defendants' reply thereto will be due JUNE 10, 2011. The Clerk is DIRECTED to exclude any additional time in the setting of the trial date and to exclude the time frame from May 27, 2011, through June 10, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 05/25/11. (fap) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 229 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 183 MOTION to Suppress Search and Seizure of 1396 Commerce Drive, Suites A and B, 196 MOTION to Suppress Evidence Seized in Search of 436 Hood Road, 153 MOTION to Suppress 436 Hood Road, 154 MOTION to Suppress 436 Hood Road with Exhibit A, 113 MOTION to Suppress Re: Traffic Stop, 143 MOTION to Suppress Evidence, 125 MOTION to Suppress Evidence, 155 MOTION to Suppress 445 Hood Road with Exhibit, 146 MOTION to Suppress the Search of 436 Hood Road, Stockbridge, Georgia, 30281 and the Fruits Thereof (Preliminary), 197 MOTION to Suppress Evidence, 112 MOTION to Suppress Re: Search Warrant Executed at 925 Hemphill Road, 200 MOTION to Suppress Evidence, 156 MOTION to Suppress 2220 Jodeco Road with Exhibit, 205 Supplemental MOTION to Suppress Evidence, Statements and the Fruits Thereof, 147 MOTION to Suppress the Search of 1850 Flat Rock Road and the Fruits Thereof (Preliminary), 218 First MOTION to Adopt CoDefendant Holly Autry's Motion, Document 200, 213 MOTION to Suppress Evidence by USA as to Joshua McCullough, Jimmy Ray Whorton, Sandra Whorton, James McKenzie, Karry Autry, Holly Autry, Joseph Tillman, Brian Prewitt, Paul Bunch, Ira Butler. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 219 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Approving 210 Leave of Absence for AUSA Michael F. Smith for the periods of May 31-June 3, 2011 and June 10, 2011 as to Joshua McCullough, Jimmy Ray Whorton, Sandra Whorton, James McKenzie, Karry Autry, Holly Autry, Joseph Tillman, Brian Prewitt, Paul Bunch, Ira Butler. Counsel must seek approval from Magistrate Judge Baverman, as this Court does not know his schedule or deadlines. Time excluded from 05/31/11 until 06/03/11. Signed by Judge Julie E. Carnes on 05/14/11. (fap) (Entered: 05/17/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 210 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: None
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 5/31,6/1,6/2,6/3,6/10/2011, by Michael F. Smith. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 05/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 192 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Approving 176 Leave of Absence for Bruce H. Morris for the period of June 10-20, 2011 as to Sandra Whorton. Time excluded from 06/10/11 until 06/20/11. Signed by Judge Julie E. Carnes on 05/01/11. (fap) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 190 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER regarding contact with co-defendants as to Jimmy Ray Whorton, Sandra Whorton. It is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT: Sandra Whorton will be allowed to visit her husband, Jimmy Ray Whorton, at the Robert E. Deyton detention facility, or any other detention facility where he may be housed, in accordance with all of the rules, regulations and security procedures of said Facility. The Clerk is DIRECTED to serve a copy of this Order upon the United States Marshal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 05/02/11. (fap) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 184 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None
Mail Returned as to Attorney Michael S. LaScala re 93 Notice to Counsel as to Joshua McCullough, Jimmy Ray Whorton, Sandra Whorton, James McKenzie, Karry Autry, Holly Autry, Joseph Tillman, Brian Prewitt, Paul Bunch, Ira Butler. Mail Marked (Return to Sender - Unable to Forward) by USPS (fap) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 183 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None
MOTION to Suppress Search and Seizure of 1396 Commerce Drive, Suites A and B by Sandra Whorton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E) (Morris, Bruce) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 176 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): June10-20, 2011, by Bruce Howard Morris. (Morris, Bruce) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 168 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman: Pretrial Conference as to Sandra Whorton. The 124 Motion to Suppress Statements, TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. An Evidentiary hearing will be scheduled after consideration of need for hearing on moitons to suppress physical evidence.The 125 Motion to Suppress Evidence,TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. The Government's Response shall be due on May 23, 2011 and the Defendant's reply brief shall be due on June 6, 2011. The 126 Motion to Produce DEFERRED. The 127 Motion for In Camera Review DEFERRED. The 128 Motion for Bill of Particulars TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT, Order to follow.The 129 Motion for Disclosure of Confidential Informants, DENIED. (No Roviaro informants) Defendant's Oral motion for extension of time to file pretrial motions. GRANTED. The Defendant has until May 5, 2011, to supplement motions, the Government's Response shall be due on May 23, 2011 and the Defendant's reply brief shall be due on June 6, 2011. Jencks Act Statements. (Tape #FTR Gold) (ank) Modified on 4/25/2011 in order to add docket text (ank). (Entered: 04/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 129 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Disclosure of Confidential Informants with Brief In Support by Sandra Whorton. (Morris, Bruce) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 128 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Bill of Particulars with Brief In Support by Sandra Whorton. (Morris, Bruce) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 127 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for In Camera Review Contents of Presentence Reports by Sandra Whorton. (Morris, Bruce) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 126 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Production of Presentence Reports of Government Witnesses by Sandra Whorton. (Morris, Bruce) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 125 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
MOTION to Suppress Evidence by Sandra Whorton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits "A" and "B") (Morris, Bruce) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 124 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
MOTION to Suppress Statements with Brief In Support by Sandra Whorton. (Morris, Bruce) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 109 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER as to Joshua McCullough, Jimmy Ray Whorton, Sandra Whorton, James McKenzie, Karry Autry, Holly Autry, Joseph Tillman, Brian Prewitt, Paul Bunch, Ira Butler. Pretrial Conference set for 4/21/2011 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1875 before Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 04/14/11. (fap) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 100 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None
Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 4/5/2011 as to Sandra Whorton. (adg) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 98 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Bruce Howard Morris appearing on behalf of Sandra Whorton (Morris, Bruce) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 96 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Sandra Whorton. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 4/7/2011. (adg) (Entered: 04/13/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 95 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None
Surety Bond Entered as to Sandra Whorton in amount of $ 50,000.00, Surety: Janet Webb Race and Richard E. Race, 438 Lakeshore Drive, Stockbridge, GA 30281 (Attachments: # 1 Agreement to Forfeit Property)(adg) (Entered: 04/13/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 94 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman: Bond Release Hearing as to Sandra Whorton. Bond filed, defendant released. (Tape #FTR) (adg) (Entered: 04/13/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 93 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE of District Judge Reassignment as to Joshua McCullough, Jimmy Ray Whorton, Sandra Whorton, James McKenzie, Karry Autry, Holly Autry, Joseph Tillman, Brian Prewitt, Paul Bunch, Ira Butler (adg) (Entered: 04/12/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 86 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 4/5/2011 as to Sandra Whorton. (adg) (Entered: 04/12/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 83 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jimmy Ray Whorton, Sandra Whorton held on April 7, 2011, before Judge Alan J. Baverman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Martha J. Frutchey, Telephone number (404) 215-1573. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/3/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/13/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/11/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing Transcript) (fem) (Entered: 04/12/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 81 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Michael John Brown appearing for USA. for asset forfeiture issues (Brown, Michael) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 74 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman: Detention Hearing as to Sandra Whorton; DENYING 35 Governments Motion for Detention; Bond set as to Sandra Whorton (3) 50,000.00. Bond NOT EXECUTED, Defendant to remain in USM custody. (Tape #FTR) (adg) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 36 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing pursuant to Bail Reform Act by Judge Alan J. Baverman` as to Sandra Whorton. Detention Hearing set for 4/7/2011 at 11:30 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1875 before Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (adg) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 35 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Detention by USA as to Sandra Whorton. (adg) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 34 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman: INITIAL APPEARANCE and ARRAIGNMENT as to Sandra Whorton. PLEA of NOT GUILTY by Sandra Whorton (3) Count 1,2,3, Estimated Trial Time-Long, Added attorney Michael S. LaScala for Sandra Whorton. Govt Motion for Detention filed, hearing set for 4/7/2011 at 11:30 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Plea (with counsel)) (Tape #FTR) (adg) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 25 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING 24 Motion to Unseal 1 Indictment as to Joshua McCullough (1), Jimmy Ray Whorton (2), Sandra Whorton (3), James McKenzie (4), Karry Autry (5), Holly Autry (6), Joseph Tillman (7), Brian Prewitt (8), Paul Bunch (9), Ira Butler (10). Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 4/5/11. (ryc) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 24 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: None
MOTION to Unseal 1 Indictment by USA as to Joshua McCullough, Jimmy Ray Whorton, Sandra Whorton, James McKenzie, Karry Autry, Holly Autry, Joseph Tillman, Brian Prewitt, Paul Bunch, Ira Butler. (ryc) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 16 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
Praecipe filed. Arrest Warrant Issued as to Sandra Whorton and delivered to USM on 3/23/11. (ryc) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 6 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
Defendant Information Sheet as to Sandra Whorton. (ryc) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace
Need legal research help? Let us know!
PACER 3 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion to Seal 1 Indictment as to Joshua McCullough (1), Jimmy Ray Whorton (2), Sandra Whorton (3), James McKenzie (4), Karry Autry (5), Holly Autry (6), Joseph Tillman (7), Brian Prewitt (8), Paul Bunch (9), Ira Butler (10). Signed by Magistrate Judge Janet F. King on 3/22/11. (ryc) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 2 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
MOTION to Seal 1 Indictment by USA as to Joshua McCullough, Jimmy Ray Whorton, Sandra Whorton, James McKenzie, Karry Autry, Holly Autry, Joseph Tillman, Brian Prewitt, Paul Bunch, Ira Butler. (ryc) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 1 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
INDICTMENT as to Joshua McCullough (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, Jimmy Ray Whorton (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3, Sandra Whorton (3) count(s) 1, 2, 3, James McKenzie (4) count(s) 1, 2, 3, Karry Autry (5) count(s) 1, 2, 3, Holly Autry (6) count(s) 1, 2, 3, Joseph Tillman (7) count(s) 1, 2, Brian Prewitt (8) count(s) 1, 2, Paul Bunch (9) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, Ira Butler (10) count(s) 1, 2 with FORFEITURE PROVISION (UNSEALED PURSUANT TO ORDER FILED 4/5/11) (ryc) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 277 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?