Cal State Growth Fund
California Eastern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 11-30626
District Judge Michael S. McManus, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.caeb.11-30626 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Judges don't know as much about themselves as we do.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo August B. Landis, U.S. Trustee
No Logo Office of the US Trustee, U.S. Trustee
No Logo Cal State Growth Fund, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of David C. Johnston

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David C. Johnston +1 209 579 1150
No Logo Russell K. Burbank, Trustee
  Entries (163) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
Need legal research help? Let us know!
PACER 163 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
Certificate of Mailing of Notice of 162 Notice of Entry of Order/Judgment as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 11/19/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 162 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
Notice of Entry of Order/Judgment as Transmitted to BNC for Service Re: 161 Civil Minute Order Denying 139 Motion/Application to Restore Holders of Cal State Growth Investment Certificates to their Rightful Designation of Secured Creditor (fdis) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 161 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
Civil Minute Order Denying 139 Motion/Application to Restore Holders of Cal State Growth Investment Certificates to their Rightful Designation of Secured Creditor (fdis) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 160 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
Civil Minutes -- Hearing Held/Concluded Re: 139 Motion/Application to Restore Holders of Cal State Growth Investment Certificates to their Rightful Designation of Secured Creditor DENIED (shes) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 159 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
Certificate/Proof of Service of 154 Motion/Application to Appoint Trustee [HLC-2], 155 Notice of Hearing, 156 Declaration, 157 Declaration (fdis) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 158 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of 154 Motion/Application to Appoint Trustee [HLC-2] (fdis) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 157 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
Declaration of Dean Brown in support of 154 Motion/Application to Appoint Trustee [HLC-2] (fdis) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 156 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
Declaration of Barbara McCrory in support of 154 Motion/Application to Appoint Trustee [HLC-2] (fdis) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 155 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
Notice of Hearing Re: 154 Motion/Application to Appoint Trustee [HLC-2] to be held on 12/12/2011 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. (fdis) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PDF 154 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
Motion/Application to Appoint Chapter 11 Trustee [HLC-2] Filed by Creditor Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (fdis) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
PACER 153 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
Memorandum/Letter (fdis) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 152 Filed: 11/11/2011, Entered: None
Certificate/Proof of Service of 151 Operating Report (fdis) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PDF 151 Filed: 11/11/2011, Entered: None
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period October 2011 (fdis) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
PACER 150 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
Document Filed by Creditor Chas. W. Reed (fdis) (Entered: 11/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 149 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None
Certificate of Mailing of Notice of 148 Notice of Entry of Order/Judgment as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 148 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None
Notice of Entry of Order/Judgment as Transmitted to BNC for Service Re: 147 Civil Minute Order Denying 133 Motion/Application by Secured Creditor Responds to Issues Raised by Plaintiff's September 2, 2011 Motion Granting Relief from Automatic Stay Based on Not Timely Filed Proof of Claims and Notices [PK-1] (fdis) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 147 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None
Civil Minute Order Denying 133 Motion/Application by Secured Creditor Responds to Issues Raised by Plaintiff's September 2, 2011 Motion Granting Relief from Automatic Stay Based on Not Timely Filed Proof of Claims and Notices [PK-1] (fdis) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 146 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
Civil Minutes -- Hearing Held/Concluded Re: 133 Motion/Application by Secured Creditor Responds to Issues Raised by Plaintiff's September 2, 2011 Motion Granting Relief from Automatic Stay Based on Not Timely Filed Proof of Claims and Notices [PK-1] DENIED (shes) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 145 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
Exhibit(s) Re: 143 Motion/Application to Restore Holders of Cal State Growth Investment Certificates to their Rightful Designation of Secured Creditor (shbs) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 144 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
Notice of Hearing Re: 143 Motion/Application to Restore Holders of Cal State Growth Investment Certificates to their Rightful Designation of Secured Creditor to be held on 11/14/2011 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. (shbs) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 143 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
Motion/Application to Restore Holders of Cal State Growth Investment Certificates to their Rightful Designation of Secured Creditor Filed by Creditor Chas. W. Reed (shbs) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 142 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
Copy of Letter from Richard C. Wyant Re: 1 Voluntary Petition (abas) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 141 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Filing of Transcript and of Deadlines Related to Redaction and Restriction as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 140 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None
Notice of Hearing Re: 139 Motion/Application to Restore Holders of Cal State Growth Investment Certificates to their Rightful Designation of Secured Creditor to be held on 11/14/2011 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. (smis) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 139 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None
Motion/Application to Restore Holders of Cal State Growth Investment Certificates to their Rightful Designation of Secured Creditor Filed by Creditor Chas. W. Reed (smis) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 138 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as transmitted to BNC for Service. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of the hearing on the Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay held on 09/02/2011 has been filed. Pursuant to the new policy adopted by the Judicial Conference, transcripts are available for inspection only at the clerk's office or may be purchased from the court transcriber for a 90 day period Re: 137 Transcript [PK-1] (smis) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 137 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 09/02/2011 [PK-1] Re: 48 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [PK-1] [PK-1] Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 10/31/2011. Redaction Request Due By 11/14/2011. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 11/28/2011. Transcript access will be restricted through 1/23/2012. (smis) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 136 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None
Notice of Hearing Re: 135 Motion/Application by Secured Creditor Responds to Issues Raised by Plaintiff's September 2, 2011 Motion Granting Relief from Automatic Stay Based on Not Timely Filed Proof of Claims and Notices to be held on 10/31/2011 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. (fdis) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 135 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None
Motion/Application by Secured Creditor Responds to Issues Raised by Plaintiff's September 2, 2011 Motion Granting Relief from Automatic Stay Based on Not Timely Filed Proof of Claims and Notices Filed by Creditor Chas. W. Reed (fdis) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 134 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None
Notice of Hearing Re: 133 Motion/Application by Secured Creditor Responds to Issues Raised by Plaintiff's September 2, 2011 Motion Granting Relief from Automatic Stay Based on Not Timely Filed Proof of Claims and Notices [PK-1] to be held on 10/31/2011 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. (fdis) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 133 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None
Motion/Application by Secured Creditor Responds to Issues Raised by Plaintiff's September 2, 2011 Motion Granting Relief from Automatic Stay Based on Not Timely Filed Proof of Claims and Notices [PK-1] Filed by Creditor Chas. W. Reed (fdis) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 132 Filed: 10/15/2011, Entered: None
Certificate/Proof of Service of 131 Operating Report (fdis) (Entered: 10/17/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 131 Filed: 10/15/2011, Entered: None
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period September 2011 (fdis) (Entered: 10/17/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 130 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 10/15/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 129 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None
Copy of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (fdis) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 128 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None
Order Granting 125 Motion/Application to Extend Exclusivity Period for Filing a Chapter 11 Plan and Disclosure Statement Chapter 11 Plan due by 10/15/2011. (fdis) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 127 Filed: 10/8/2011, Entered: None
Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order, 125 Motion/Application to Extend Exclusivity Period for Filing a Chapter 11 Plan and Disclosure Statement [DCJ-4], 126 Declaration (fdis) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 126 Filed: 10/8/2011, Entered: None
Declaration of David C. Johnston in support of 125 Motion/Application to Extend Exclusivity Period for Filing a Chapter 11 Plan and Disclosure Statement [DCJ-4] (fdis) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 125 Filed: 10/8/2011, Entered: None
Ex Parte Motion/Application to Extend Exclusivity Period for Filing a Chapter 11 Plan and Disclosure Statement [DCJ-4] Filed by Debtor Cal State Growth Fund (fdis) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 124 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
Civil Minutes -- Hearing/Motion Resolved without Oral Argument Re: 104 Motion/Application to Extend Time [DCJ-3] GRANTED (shes) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 123 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: None
Civil Minutes -- Hearing Held/Concluded Re: 91 Motion/Application to Employ George C. Hollister as Attorney(s) [HLC-1] GRANTED (shes) (Entered: 09/19/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 122 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: None
Certificate/Proof of Service of 121 Operating Report (fdis) (Entered: 09/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 121 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: None
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period August 2011 (fdis) (Entered: 09/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 120 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
Certificate/Proof of Service of 119 Notice of Entry [PK-1] (mgrs) (Entered: 09/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 119 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
Notice of Entry of 113 Order on Motion/Application for Relief From Stay [PK-1] (mgrs) (Entered: 09/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 118 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
Certificate/Proof of Service of 116 Amended Notice of Hearing, 117 Declaration [HLC-1] (mgrs) (Entered: 09/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 117 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None
Declaration of George C. Hollister in support of 91 Motion/Application to Employ George C. Hollister as Attorney(s) [HLC-1] (mgrs) (Entered: 09/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 116 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None
Amended Notice of Hearing Re: 91 Motion/Application to Employ George C. Hollister as Attorney(s) [HLC-1] to be held on 9/19/2011 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. (mgrs) (Entered: 09/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 115 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: None
Certificate/Proof of Service of 114 Notice (mgrs) (Entered: 09/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 114 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: None
Notice of Law Firm Change of Name (mgrs) (Entered: 09/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 113 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: None
Order Granting 48 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [PK-1] (mgrs) (Entered: 09/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 112 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
Civil Minutes -- Opposed Hearing Held Re: 48 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [PK-1] GRANTED (shes) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 111 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None
Amended Certificate/Proof of Service (fdis) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 110 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None
Response/Reply Filed by Creditor Chas. W. Reed Re: 48 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [PK-1] (fdis) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 109 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
Certificate/Proof of Service (mgrs) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 108 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
Certificate/Proof of Service of 105 Notice of Hearing [DCJ-3] (mgrs) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 107 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
Certificate/Proof of Service of 104 Motion/Application to Extend Time [DCJ-3], 105 Notice of Hearing, 106 Declaration (mgrs) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 106 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
Declaration of David C. Johnston in support of 104 Motion/Application to Extend Time [DCJ-3] (mgrs) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 105 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
Notice of Hearing Re: 104 Motion/Application to Extend Time [DCJ-3] to be held on 10/3/2011 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. (mgrs) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 104 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
Motion/Application to Extend Time [DCJ-3] Filed by Debtor Cal State Growth Fund (mgrs) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 103 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None
Civil Minutes -- Hearing Re: 91 Motion/Application to Employ George C. Hollister as Attorney(s) [HLC-1] continued; Hearing to be held on 9/19/2011 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. (shes) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 102 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None
Memorandum/Letter (fdis) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 101 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None
Certificate/Proof of Service of 100 Operating Report (jlns) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 100 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period July 31, 2011 (jlns) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 99 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
Response/Reply Filed by Creditors Margaret P. Reed, Chas. W. Reed Re: 48 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [PK-1] (cmcs) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 98 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None
Civil Minute Order Dismissing 68 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [PK-3] (shbs) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 97 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None
Civil Minutes -- Hearing Held/Concluded Re: 68 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [PK-3] DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (shes) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 96 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None
Civil Minutes -- Hearing Re: 48 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [PK-1] continued; Hearing to be held on 9/2/2011 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. (shes) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 95 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None
Certificate/Proof of Service of 91 Motion/Application to Employ George C. Hollister as Attorney(s) [HLC-1], 92 Notice of Hearing, 93 Declaration, 94 Exhibit(s) (fdis) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 94 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None
Exhibit(s) to 93 Declaration [HLC-1] (fdis) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 93 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None
Declaration of George C. Hollister in support of 91 Motion/Application to Employ George C. Hollister as Attorney(s) [HLC-1] (fdis) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 92 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None
Notice of Hearing Re: 91 Motion/Application to Employ George C. Hollister as Attorney(s) [HLC-1] to be held on 8/22/2011 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. (fdis) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 91 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None
Motion/Application to Employ George C. Hollister as Attorney(s) [HLC-1] Filed by Creditor Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (fdis) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 90 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None
Civil Minutes -- Hearing Re: 48 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [PK-1] continued; Hearing to be held on 8/8/2011 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. (shes) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 89 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None
Memorandum/Letter Re: 11 BNC Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Meeting of Creditors (smis) (Entered: 07/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 88 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None
Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order, 87 Stipulation [PK-1] (jdas) (Entered: 07/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 87 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None
Stipulation Re: 65 Motion/Application to Continue/Reschedule Hearing [PK-1] (jdas) (Entered: 07/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 86 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None
Certificate/Proof of Service of 85 Operating Report (fdis) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 85 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period June 2011 (fdis) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 84 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None
Certificate/Proof of Service Re: 83 Declaration [PK-2] (fdis) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 83 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None
Declaration of Ian A. Kass in support of 65 Motion/Application to Continue/Reschedule Hearing [PK-1] (fdis) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 82 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
Certificate/Proof of Service of 81 Response/Reply [PK-1] (fdis) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 81 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
Response/Reply [PK-1] Filed by Creditors Marlene Bernstein, Phillip Bernstein, Malinda Bissell, Sheldon Bissell, Marian Bowen, Candace Pratt Hoover, Robert C. Hoover II, The Lerek Family Limited Partnership, Jamison M. Truelock Re: 60 Opposition/Objection, 63 Opposition/Objection (fdis) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 80 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
Certificate/Proof of Service of 79 Notice of Withdrawal [PK-2] (fdis) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 79 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
Notice of Withdrawal Re: 65 Motion/Application to Continue/Reschedule Hearing [PK-1] (fdis) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 78 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
Certificate/Proof of Service of 77 Notice of Withdrawal [PK-1] (fdis) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 77 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
Notice of Withdrawal Re: 48 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [PK-1] (fdis) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 76 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
Certificate/Proof of Service of 68 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [PK-3], 69 Notice of Hearing, 70 Declaration, 71 Exhibit(s), 72 Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362), 73 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, 74 Request for Judicial Notice, 75 Exhibit(s) (fdis) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 75 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
Exhibit(s) to 74 Request for Judicial Notice [PK-3] (fdis) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 74 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
Request for Judicial Notice Re: 68 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [PK-3] Filed by Creditors Marlene Bernstein, Phillip Bernstein, Malinda Bissell, Sheldon Bissell, Marian Bowen, Candace Pratt Hoover, Robert C. Hoover II, The Lerek Family Limited Partnership, Jamison M. Truelock (fdis) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 73 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of 68 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [PK-3] (fdis) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 72 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362) Re: 68 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [PK-3] (fdis) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 71 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
Exhibit(s) to 70 Declaration [PK-3] (fdis) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 70 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
Declaration of Ian A. Kass in support of 68 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [PK-3] (fdis) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 69 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
Notice of Hearing Re: 68 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [PK-3] to be held on 8/8/2011 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. (fdis) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 68 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [PK-3] Filed by Creditors Marlene Bernstein, Phillip Bernstein, Malinda Bissell, Sheldon Bissell, Marian Bowen, Candace Pratt Hoover, Robert C. Hoover II, The Lerek Family Limited Partnership, Jamison M. Truelock (Fee Paid $150) (fdis) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 67 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None
Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order, 65 Motion/Application to Continue/Reschedule Hearing [PK-1] Re:, 66 Exhibit(s) (fdis). (Entered: 07/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 66 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None
Exhibit(s) to 65 Motion/Application to Continue/Reschedule Hearing [PK-1] (fdis). (Entered: 07/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 65 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None
Motion/Application to Continue/Reschedule Hearing [PK-1] Re: 48 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay Filed by Creditors Marlene Bernstein, Phillip Bernstein, Phillip Bernstein, Malinda Bissell, Sheldon Bissell, Marian Bowen, Candace Pratt Hoover, Robert C. Hoover II, The Lerek Family Limited Partnership, Jamison M. Truelock (fdis) (Entered: 07/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 64 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None
Certificate/Proof of Service of 63 Opposition/Objection [PK-1] (fdis) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
Request RequestSpace
Need legal research help? Let us know!
PACER 63 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None
Opposition/Objection Filed by Creditor Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Re: 48 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [PK-1] (fdis) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 62 Filed: 7/4/2011, Entered: None
Certificate/Proof of Service of 60 Opposition/Objection, 61 Declaration [PK-1] (fdis) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 61 Filed: 7/4/2011, Entered: None
Declaration of Alexander Gomez in support of 60 Opposition/Objection [PK-1] (fdis) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 60 Filed: 7/4/2011, Entered: None
Opposition/Objection Filed by Debtor Cal State Growth Fund Re: 48 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [PK-1] (fdis) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 59 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None
Request for Special Notice Filed by Creditors Georgiana Zipse, Doris Privette (fdis) (Entered: 06/29/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 58 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None
Certificate/Proof of Service (fdis) (Entered: 06/29/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 57 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
Certificate/Proof of Service (mgrs) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 56 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
Certificate/Proof of Service of 48 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [PK-1], 49 Notice of Hearing, 50 Declaration, 51 Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362), 52 Exhibit(s), 53 Request for Judicial Notice, 54 Exhibit(s), 55 Memorandum of Points and Authorities (abas) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 55 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of 48 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [PK-1] (abas) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 54 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
Exhibit(s) to 53 Request for Judicial Notice [PK-1] (abas) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 53 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
Request for Judicial Notice Re: 48 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [PK-1] Filed by Creditors Marlene Bernstein, Phillip Bernstein (abas) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 52 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
Exhibit(s) to 50 Declaration [PK-1] (abas) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 51 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362) Re: 48 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [PK-1] (abas) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 50 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
Declaration of Ian A. Kass in support of 48 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [PK-1] (abas) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 49 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
Notice of Hearing Re: 48 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [PK-1] to be held on 7/18/2011 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. (abas) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 48 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [PK-1] Filed by Creditors Marlene Bernstein, Phillip Bernstein (Fee Paid $0.00) (abas) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 47 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
Certificate/Proof of Service of 46 Notice of Appointment of Unsecured Creditors' Committee [UST-1] (mgrs) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 46 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
Notice of Appointment of Unsecured Creditors' Committee (fdis) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 45 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: None
Certificate/Proof of Service of 44 Operating Report (fdis) (Entered: 06/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 44 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: None
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period May 2011 (fdis) (Entered: 06/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 43 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 42 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None
Request for Special Notice Filed by Creditor Ida L. Royal (smis) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 41 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
Copy of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (fdis) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 40 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None
Status Conferece Order RE: 1 Voluntary Petition (fdis) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 39 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference Held/Concluded Re: 1 Voluntary Petition (shes) (Entered: 06/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 38 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None
Trustee's Report of 341 Meeting Concluded (fdis) (Entered: 06/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 37 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
Certificate/Proof of Service of 36 Request for Special Notice (fdis) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 36 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
Request for Special Notice Filed by Creditor Robin Kirk (fdis) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 35 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
Memorandum/Letter (fdis) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 34 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
Order Granting 30 Motion/Application to Employ David C. Johnston[DCJ-2] (fdis) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 33 Filed: 5/29/2011, Entered: None
Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order, 30 Motion/Application to Employ David C. Johnston as Attorney(s) [DCJ-2], 31 Declaration, 32 Disclosure of Attorney Compensation (mbes) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 32 Filed: 5/29/2011, Entered: None
Duplicate Disclosure of Attorney Compensation (mbes) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 31 Filed: 5/29/2011, Entered: None
Declaration of David C. Johnston Re: 30 Motion/Application to Employ David C. Johnston as Attorney(s) [DCJ-2] (mbes) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 30 Filed: 5/29/2011, Entered: None
Motion/Application to Employ David C. Johnston as Attorney(s) [DCJ-2] Filed by Debtor Cal State Growth Fund (mbes) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 29 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None
Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Amendment to 341 Notice as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 28 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: None
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 27 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None
Notice of Amendment to 341 Notice as Transmitted to BNC for Service (cmcs) (Entered: 05/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 26 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None
Certificate/Proof of Service of 10 Notice of Meeting of Creditors (fdis) (Entered: 05/24/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 25 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: None
Copy of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (fdis) (Entered: 05/24/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 24 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None
Order Granting 14 Motion To Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information. (fdis) (Entered: 05/24/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 23 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None
Certificate/Proof of Service of 22 Status Report (fdis) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 22 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None
Chapter 11 Preliminary Status Report Filed by Debtor Cal State Growth Fund (fdis) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 21 Filed: 5/21/2011, Entered: None
Amended Verification and Master Address List (Fee Paid $26) (jlns) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PDF 20 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
Summary of Schedules Statistical Summary Schedule A Schedule B Schedule D Schedule E Schedule F Schedule G Schedule H Statement of Financial Affairs Disclosure of Attorney Compensation (Filing Fee Not Paid or Not Required) (jlns) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
PACER 19 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors (jlns) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 18 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None
Certificate/Proof of Service of 17 Declaration (fdis) (Entered: 05/17/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 17 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None
Declaration of Alexander Gomez (fdis) (Entered: 05/17/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 16 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None
Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order, 14 Motion/Application to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information [DCJ-1], 15 Declaration (jlns) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 15 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None
Declaration of David C. Johnston in support of 14 Motion/Application to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information [DCJ-1] (jlns) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 14 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None
Motion/Application to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information [DCJ-1] Filed by Debtor Cal State Growth Fund (jlns) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 13 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None
List of Equity Security Holders Re: 1 Voluntary Petition (fdis) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 12 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None
Certificate/Proof of Service of 5 Order Scheduling Deadlines (fdis) (Entered: 05/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 11 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Meeting of Creditors as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 05/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 10 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
Notice of Meeting of Creditors as Transmitted to BNC (jdas) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 9 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
Statement Regarding Ownership of Corporate Debtor/Party Re: 1 Voluntary Petition (jdas) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 8 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
Verification and Master Address List Re: 1 Voluntary Petition, 2 Notice of Incomplete Filing (jdas) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 7 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None
Request by U.S. Trustee to Send 341 Notice; Meeting of Creditors to be held on 6/3/2011 at 02:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. Last day to oppose discharge: 8/2/2011. Proofs of Claim due by 9/1/2011. (jdas) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 6 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None
Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case if Documents Are Not Timely Filed as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 5 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None
Order Scheduling Deadlines for Disclosure of Single Asset Real Estate,Filing Preliminary Status Report,Preliminary Status Conference Re: 1 Voluntary Petition; Status Conference to be held on 6/6/2011 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (fdis) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 4 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditors The Lerek Family Limited Partnership, Jamison M. Truelock, Candace Pratt Hoover, Robert C. Hoover II, Marian Bowen, Sheldon Bissell, Malinda Bissell, Marlene Bernstein, Phillip Bernstein (fdis) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 3 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None
Copy of Notice of Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case if Documents Are Not Timely Filed as transmitted to BNC for service. (jdas) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 2 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
Notice of Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case If Documents Are Not Timely Filed. (abas) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 1 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Missing Document(s): Verification and Master Address List due by 05/06/2011; Summary of Schedules; Schedule A - Real Property; Schedule B - Personal Property; Schedule D - Secured Creditors; Schedule E - Unsecured Priority Creditor; Schedule F - Unsecured Nonpriority Creditor; Schedule G - Executory Contracts; Schedule H - Codebtors; Statement of Financial Affairs; Statement Re: Corporate Debtor; List - 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors; List - Equity Security Holders; Attorney's Disclosure Stmt.; Document(s) due by 05/13/2011. (Entered: 04/29/2011)
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 31 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?