JOHN PATRICK STOKES- Adversary Proceeding
Montana Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 10-00063
District Judge RALPH B. KIRSCHER, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.mtb.10-00063 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
This docket can only tell you so much. Get the rest.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo DAVAR GARDNER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by GOETZ GALLIK & BALDWIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TRENT M. GARDNER +1 406 587 0618 tgardner@goetzlawfirm.com
No Logo TODD GARDNER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by GOETZ GALLIK & BALDWIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TRENT M. GARDNER +1 406 587 0618 tgardner@goetzlawfirm.com
v.
No Logo JOHN PATRICK STOKES, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by MURPHY LAW OFFICES, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
EDWARD A. MURPHY +1 406 728 2671 rusty@murphylawoffices.net
  Entries (38) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
Need legal research help? Let us know!
PACER 38 Filed: 4/16/2011, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation. (related documents(s) 37 Order Approving Stipulation). No. of Notices: 1. Service Date 04/16/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/16/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 37 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None
Order Approving Stipulation By & Between US TRUSTEE, JOHN STOKES, TODD AND DAVAR GARDNER; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED 1. The Gardners shall be substituted into the above-entitled adversary proceeding as the plaintiffs for all purposes.2. The Gardners shall not seek to bring the above-entitled adversary proceeding to trial until after the conclusion of the appeal now pending before the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals in the context of their action against Stokes in Adversary Proceeding No. 10-00064. 3. The trial now scheduled to begin in this adversary proceeding on April 25, 2011, shall be vacated, and shall be rescheduled following the resolution of the appeal referenced in theprevious paragraph. 4. Newly substituted plaintiffs Todd and Davar Gardner shall immediately file a Report with the Court advising when the appeal of this Courts Order entered in the above-captioned Chapter 7 case on July 22, 2010 (Docket No. 316 in Case No. 09-60265-7), which was recently decided by Hon. Donald W. Molloy in the United States District Court for the District of Montana, becomes final after expiration of applicable deadlines for filing further appeals. Signed on 4/14/2011 (related documents(s) 36 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES TRUSTEE). COPY MAILED TO TRENT M GARDNERATTORNEY AT LAW PO BOX 6580 BOZEMAN, MT 59771 (ATTORNEY FOR TODD AND DAVAR GARDNER) (Fortune, Cindy) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 36 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None
Stipulation By UNITED STATES TRUSTEE and JOHN STOKES, AND TODD AND DAVAR GARDNER Filed by UNITED STATES TRUSTEE. (Attachments: # 1 SCANNED SIGNATURE PAGES) (JENSEN, NEAL) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 35 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. (related documents(s) 33 Order on Motion For Summary Judgment). No. of Notices: 1. Service Date 04/13/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/13/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 34 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Memorandum of Decision. (related documents(s) 32 Memorandum of Decision). No. of Notices: 1. Service Date 04/13/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/13/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 33 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
Order Denying Motion For Summary Judgment (Related Doc # 22 ) Signed on 4/11/2011. . (Schelin, Kathy) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PDF 32 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
Memorandum of Decision (related documents(s) 22 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES TRUSTEE). (Schelin, Kathy) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
PACER 31 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
Reply to (related document(s): 22 motion Motion For Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES TRUSTEE) REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO UST'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (related to motions(s) 22 ) Filed by UNITED STATES TRUSTEE (related documents(s) 22 motion Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES TRUSTEE). (JENSEN, NEAL) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 30 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time. (related documents(s) 27 Order on Motion to Extend Time). No. of Notices: 1. Service Date 03/24/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 29 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None
Statement of Facts GENUINE ISSUES OF MATERIAL FACT Filed by JOHN PATRICK STOKES. (Attachments: # 1 DECLARATION# 2 Exhibit A TO DECLARATION) (MURPHY, EDWARD) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 28 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None
Opposition Brief Filed by JOHN PATRICK STOKES (related documents(s) 22 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES TRUSTEE). (MURPHY, EDWARD) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 27 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time TO FILE HIS BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT (Related Doc # 26 ) Signed on 3/22/2011. Document due by 3/23/2011. . (Mahoney, Patti) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 26 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
Motion to Extend Time TO FILE BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Filed by Defendant JOHN PATRICK STOKES. (MURPHY, EDWARD) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 25 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None
Exhibit EXHIBITS AND AFFIDAVITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Filed by UNITED STATES TRUSTEE (related documents(s) 22 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES TRUSTEE). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) TRANSCRIPT OF CHAPTER 11 § 341 MEETING, CONDUCTED APRIL 10, 2009# 2 Exhibit 2) TRANSCRIPT OF COURT'S CONVERSION HEARING, CONDUCTED AUG. 13, 2009# 3 Exhibit 3) TRANSCRIPT OF CONVERSION HEARING, CONTINUED ON AUG. 14, 2009# 4 Exhibit 4) TRANSCRIPT OF CHAPTER 7 § 341 MEETING, CONDUCTED DEC. 2, 2009# 5 Exhibit 5) COURT'S MEMORANDUM OF DECISION, DATED SEPT. 21, 2009# 6 Exhibit 6) TRANSCRIPT OF PICKAVANCE 2004 EXAM, CONDUCTED JAN. 15, 2010# 7 Exhibit 7) TRANSCRIPT OF PAMELA STOKES 2004 EXAM, CONDUCTED JAN. 15, 2010# 8 Exhibit 8) AFFIDAVIT OF JAMES COSSITT# 9 Exhibit 9) STOKES' COMPLAINT AGAINST QUESTA ET AL, FILED JULY 13, 2009# 10 Exhibit 10) STOKES' COMPLAINT AGAINST DAHOOD ET AL, FILED JULY 13, 2009# 11 Exhibit 11) STOKES COMPLAINT AGAINST GARNDERS ET AL, FILED JULY 13, 2009# 12 Exhibit 12) AFFIDAVIT OF RICHARD SAMSON# 13 Exhibit 13) NOTE AND MORTGAGE, DATED JAN. 1, 2001# 14 Exhibit 14) STOKES' INTERROGATORY ANSWERS# 15 Exhibit 15) PCKAVANCE OBJECTION, FILED JULY 24, 2009) (JENSEN, NEAL) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 24 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None
Statement of Facts IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Filed by UNITED STATES TRUSTEE (related documents(s) 22 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES TRUSTEE). (JENSEN, NEAL) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 23 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None
Brief Filed by UNITED STATES TRUSTEE (related documents(s) 22 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES TRUSTEE). (JENSEN, NEAL) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 22 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
Motion For Summary Judgment Filed by UNITED STATES TRUSTEE. Objection Due by 03/18/2011. (JENSEN, NEAL) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 21 Filed: 12/18/2010, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Trial. (related documents(s) 20 Order Setting Trial). No. of Notices: 1. Service Date 12/18/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/18/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 20 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None
Order Setting Trial Signed on 12/16/2010 (related documents(s) 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES TRUSTEE). Pre-Trial Motions due by 3/4/2011. Mediation or Settlement Conference Completed by 4/8/2011. Pre-Trial Order, List of Witnesses & List of Exhibits due by 4/18/2011. Pre-Trial Memorandum due by 4/20/2011. Trial date set for 4/25/2011 and 4/26/2011 at 09:00 AM at MISSOULA HEARINGS 201 E BROADWAY; CRTRM #200A, MISSOULA, MT. (Schelin, Kathy) (Entered: 12/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 19 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing. (related documents(s) 17 Order on Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing). No. of Notices: 1. Service Date 10/21/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 18 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None
Order Setting ADDITIONAL SCHEDULING/STATUS Conference Call Signed on 10/19/2010 (related documents(s) 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES TRUSTEE). Telephone hearing scheduled for 12/15/2010 at 02:15 PM at Telephonic Hearing. ORDER SENT BNC BY DOC 17. (Schelin, Kathy) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 17 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None
Order Granting PLAINTIFF'S Motion To Continue; AND TRIAL SCHEDULED TO COMMENCE ON 12/2/10 AND ALL OTHER REMAINING DEADLINES SET IN THIS COURT'S SCHEDULING ORDER (Doc 9) ARE VACATED (Related Doc # 16 ) Signed on 10/19/2010. . (Schelin, Kathy) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 16 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
Motion to Continue Hearing On DECEMBER 2, 2010 Filed by UNITED STATES TRUSTEE (related documents(s) 9 Order Setting Trial). (JENSEN, NEAL) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 15 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time. (related documents(s) 14 Order on Motion to Extend Time). No. of Notices: 1. Service Date 09/22/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 14 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
Order Granting PLAINTIFF'S Motion to Extend Time (Related Doc # 13 ) Signed on 9/20/2010. AMENDED COMPLAINT due by 10/18/2010. . (Schelin, Kathy) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 13 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None
Motion to Extend Time TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT Filed by UNITED STATES TRUSTEE. (JENSEN, NEAL) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 12 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
Notice of Deposition of Kathy Glover to be held August 26, 2010 10:00 a.m., 21 North Last Chance Gulch, Suite 201, Helena, MT Filed by UNITED STATES TRUSTEE. (JENSEN, NEAL) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 11 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
Notice of Deposition of Gregory Duncan to be held August 26, 2010 10:00 a.m., 21 North Last Chance Gulch, Suite 201 Filed by UNITED STATES TRUSTEE. (JENSEN, NEAL) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 10 Filed: 8/15/2010, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Trial. (related documents(s) 9 Order Setting Trial). No. of Notices: 1. Service Date 08/15/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 9 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None
Order Setting Trial Signed on 8/13/2010 (related documents(s) 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES TRUSTEE). Discovery due by 10/22/2010. Amendments to Pleadings or to Join Additional Parties due by 9/17/2010. Pre-Trial Motions due by 10/29/2010. Mediation or Settlement Conference Completed by 11/12/2010. Pre-Trial Order, List of Witnesses & List of Exhibits due by 11/24/2010. Pre-Trial Memorandum due by 11/29/2010. Trial date set for 12/2/2010 & 12/3/10 at 09:00 AM at MISSOULA HEARINGS 201 E BROADWAY; CRTRM #200A, MISSOULA, MT. (Schelin, Kathy) Modified on 8/13/2010 (Myers, Lynn). (Entered: 08/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 8 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Pre-trial Scheduling Conference Call. (related documents(s) 7 Order Setting Pre-trial Scheduling Conference Call). No. of Notices: 1. Service Date 07/29/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 7 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None
Order Setting Pretrial Scheduling Conference Call Signed on 7/27/2010 (related documents(s) 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES TRUSTEE). Telephone hearing scheduled for 8/11/2010 at 02:45 PM at Telephonic Hearing. (Schelin, Kathy) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 6 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None
Answer to Complaint Filed by JOHN PATRICK STOKES. (MURPHY, EDWARD) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 5 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: None
Summons Service Executed on JOHN PATRICK STOKES 6/30/2010 AMENDED. (JENSEN, NEAL) (Entered: 06/30/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 4 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: None
Summons Service Executed on JOHN PATRICK STOKES 6/28/2010 AND BOB BARR 6/28/2010. (JENSEN, NEAL) Modified on 6/29/2010 (Evankovich, Dianne). (Entered: 06/28/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 3 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint(10-00063-RBK) [cmp,cmp] ( 250.00). Receipt number N/C for USTR,amount $ 250.00. (Markovich) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 2 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None
Summons Issued on JOHN PATRICK STOKES Date Issued 6/25/2010, Answer Due 7/26/2010. (Fortune, Cindy) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 1 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None
Adversary case 10-00063. Complaint by UNITED STATES TRUSTEE against JOHN PATRICK STOKES. Fee Amount $250. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - COMPARISON OF STOKES' STATEMENTS# 2 Exhibit 2 - QUITCLAIM DEED# 3 ADVERSARY COVER SHEET) (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) (JENSEN, NEAL) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 34 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?