USA v. Paccone
Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:11-cr-00091
District Judge Anna J. Brown, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.ord.3-11-cr-00091 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
The right information can save you thousands of dollars.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Gregory Edward Paccone, Jr., Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Lisa J. Ludwig, Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Lisa J. Ludwig +1 503 223 5570 +1 503 721 9050 lisa@ludwiglegaldefense.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Christopher J. Schatz +1 503 326 2123 +1 503 326 5524 chris_schatz@fd.org
  Entries (41) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PDF 41 Filed: 8/8/2012, Entered: None
Plea Agreement as to Gregory Edward Paccone, Jr. (bb) (Entered: 08/08/2012)
PACER 40 Filed: 8/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Plea Petition and Order Entering Plea as to Defendant Gregory Edward Paccone, Jr signed by Judge Anna J. Brown. (bb) (Entered: 08/08/2012)
PACER 39 Filed: 8/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minutes of Proceedings: Entry of Plea Hearing before Judge Anna J. Brown for Defendant Gregory Edward Paccone, Jr. Guilty plea entered as to counts 1,2. Sentencing is SET for 11/5/2012 at 02:00 PM before Judge Anna J. Brown. The Court will assume 30 minutes is sufficient for sentencing unless the parties notify the Court 2 weeks in advance that more time will be needed. Simultaneously filed Sentencing Memos are due no later than 10/31/2012 by NOON. If the Sentencing Memos are not received on time or the Court is not advised that none will be filed, sentencing may be rescheduled. Counsel Present for Plaintiff: Scott Kerin.Counsel Present for Defendant: Lisa Ludwig.(Court Reporter Amanda LeGore) (bb) (Entered: 08/08/2012)
PACER 38 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. Granting Defendant's eighth Motion to Continue Trial 36 as to Gregory Paccone, Jr. The 3-day Jury Trial set for 7/24/2012 is STRICKEN and a Change of Plea Hearing is SET for 08/08/2012 at 1:30 PM in Portland, Courtroom 14A. Pursuant to 18 U.S.C. §3161(h)(7)(A), the Court specifically finds, in granting the motion, that the ends of justice outweigh the best interests of the public and the defendant in a speedy trial because the failure to grant the requested continuance is likely to result in a miscarriage of justice (§3161(h)(7)(B)(i)) and likely would deny Defendant's counsel the reasonable time necessary for effective preparation taking into account the exercise of due diligence (§3161(h)(7)(B)(iv). In support of this finding, the Court further finds the requested delay for the purpose of allowing defendant to arrange a reasonably priced airline ticket from California to Portland in order to appear for a change of plea hearing and therefore, the time from 07/24/2012 to 08/08/2012 is properly excludable according to law. (bb) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
PACER 37 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
Declaration by Lisa J. Ludwig regarding Unopposed Motion to Continue / Reset July 24, 2012 Trial Date 36 filed by Defendant Gregory Edward Paccone, Jr. (Ludwig, Lisa) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
PACER 36 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
Unopposed Motion to Continue / Reset July 24, 2012 Trial Date by Defendant Gregory Edward Paccone, Jr. (Ludwig, Lisa) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
PACER 35 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. Granting Defendant's seventh Motion to Continue Trial 33 as to Gregory Edward Paccone, Jr. The 3-day Jury Trial set for 6/26/2012 is STRICKEN and RESET for 07/24/2012 at 9:00 AM. Pursuant to 18 U.S.C. §3161(h)(7)(A), the Court specifically finds, in granting the motion, that the ends of justice outweigh the best interests of the public and the defendant in a speedy trial because the failure to grant the requested continuance is likely to result in a miscarriage of justice (§3161(h)(7)(B)(i)) and likely would deny Defendant's counsel the reasonable time necessary for effective preparation taking into account the exercise of due diligence (§3161(h)(7)(B)(iv). In support of this finding, the Court further finds the requested delay for the purpose of allowing defendant to make reasonable airline reservations to appear in Portland, Oregon for a change of plea hearing, and consultation with defendant is reasonable and necessary and therefore, the time from 06/26/2012 to 07/24/2012 is properly excludable according to law. No more continuances will be granted absent a showing of extraordinary circumstances. (bb) (Entered: 06/25/2012)
PACER 34 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None
Declaration by Lisa J. Ludwig regarding Motion to Continue / Reset July 26, 2012 Trial Date 33 filed by Defendant Gregory Edward Paccone, Jr. (Ludwig, Lisa) (Entered: 06/22/2012)
PACER 33 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None
Motion to Continue / Reset July 26, 2012 Trial Date by Defendant Gregory Edward Paccone, Jr. (Ludwig, Lisa) (Entered: 06/22/2012)
PACER 32 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Anna J. Brown. Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Continue Trial Date 30 as to Gregory Edward Paccone Jr. (1). Jury Trial ( 3 days) is RESET for 6/26/2012 at 09:00 AM before Judge Anna J. Brown. See attached Order. (bb) (Entered: 05/17/2012)
PACER 31 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None
Declaration by Lisa J. Ludwig regarding Unopposed Motion to Continue / Reset May 22, 2012 Trial Date 30 filed by Defendant Gregory Edward Paccone, Jr. (Ludwig, Lisa) (Entered: 05/16/2012)
PACER 30 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None
Unopposed Motion to Continue / Reset May 22, 2012 Trial Date by Defendant Gregory Edward Paccone, Jr. (Ludwig, Lisa) (Entered: 05/16/2012)
PACER 29 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Continue Trial Date 27 as to Gregory Edward Paccone Jr. (1). Jury Trial (3 days) is RESET for 5/22/2012 at 09:00 AM before Judge Anna J. Brown. Signed on 04/16/2012 by Judge Anna J. Brown.See attached Order for full text. (bb) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
PACER 28 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
Declaration by Lisa J. Ludwig regarding Unopposed Motion to Continue / Reset April 17, 2012 Trial Date 27 filed by Defendant Gregory Edward Paccone, Jr. (Ludwig, Lisa) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
PACER 27 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
Unopposed Motion to Continue / Reset April 17, 2012 Trial Date by Defendant Gregory Edward Paccone, Jr. (Ludwig, Lisa) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
PACER 26 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Continue Trial Date as to Gregory Edward Paccone Jr. (1). Jury Trial(3 days) is RESET for 4/17/2012 at 09:00 AM before Judge Anna J. Brown. signed on 02/22/2012 by Judge Anna J. Brown. See attached Order for full text. (bb) (Entered: 02/22/2012)
PACER 25 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
Declaration by Lisa J. Ludwig regarding Unopposed Motion to Continue / Reset February 28, 2012 Trial Date 24 filed by Defendant Gregory Edward Paccone, Jr. (Ludwig, Lisa) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
PACER 24 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
Unopposed Motion to Continue / Reset February 28, 2012 Trial Date by Defendant Gregory Edward Paccone, Jr. (Ludwig, Lisa) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
PACER 23 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Continue Trial Date 21 as to Gregory Edward Paccone Jr. (1). Jury Trial (3 days) is RESET for 2/28/2012 at 09:00 AM before Judge Anna J. Brown. signed on 12/20/2011 by Judge Anna J. Brown. See attached Order. (bb) (Entered: 12/20/2011)
PACER 22 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None
Declaration by Lisa J. Ludwig : Exhibit by Gregory Edward Paccone, Jr regarding Unopposed Motion to Continue / Reset December 27, 2011 Trial Date 21 filed by Defendant Gregory Edward Paccone, Jr. (Ludwig, Lisa) Modified on 12/20/2011 to correct title of filing (tll). (Entered: 12/19/2011)
PACER 21 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None
Unopposed Motion to Continue / Reset December 27, 2011 Trial Date by Defendant Gregory Edward Paccone, Jr. (Ludwig, Lisa) (Entered: 12/19/2011)
PACER 20 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDERby Judge Anna J. Brown. Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Continu Trial Date 18 as to Gregory Edward Paccone Jr. (1). Jury Trial (3 days) is RESET for 12/27/2011 at 09:00 AM before Judge Anna J. Brown. See attached Order. (bb) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
PACER 19 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None
Declaration by Lisa J. Ludwig regarding Unopposed Motion to Continue / Reset October 25, 2011 Trial Date 18 filed by Defendant Gregory Edward Paccone, Jr. (Ludwig, Lisa) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
PACER 18 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None
Unopposed Motion to Continue / Reset October 25, 2011 Trial Date by Defendant Gregory Edward Paccone, Jr. (Ludwig, Lisa) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
PACER 17 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Granting Defendant's Motion to Continue Trial Date 15 as to Gregory Edward Paccone Jr. (1). Jury Trial (3 days) is SET for 10/25/2011 at 09:00 AM before Judge Anna J. Brown. Signed on 08/12/2011 by Judge Anna J. Brown. See attached Order. (bb) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
PDF 16 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None
Declaration by Lisa J. Ludwig regarding Unopposed Motion to Continue / Reset August 23, 2011 Trial Date 15 filed by Defendant Gregory Edward Paccone, Jr. (Ludwig, Lisa) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
PACER 15 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None
Unopposed Motion to Continue / Reset August 23, 2011 Trial Date by Defendant Gregory Edward Paccone, Jr. (Ludwig, Lisa) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
PACER 14 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Order Setting Conditions of Release as to Defendant Gregory Edward Paccone, Jr. Signed 6/29/11 by Magistrate Judge Donald C. Ashmanskas. (mkk) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
PACER 13 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
CJA 20 - Appointment of and Authority to Pay Court Appointed Counsel as to Defendant Gregory Edward Paccone, Jr.; Attorney Lisa Ludwig, replacing Assistant Federal Public Defender Christopher Schatz as counsel for Defendant, effective 6/17/11; by Judge Marco A. Hernandez; signed on 6/17/11. (kw) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
PACER 12 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Minutes of Proceedings:First Appearance, Arraignment, and Detention Hearing before Magistrate Judge Donald C. Ashmanskas as to Defendant Gregory Edward Paccone, Jr held on 6/29/2011. Order appointing counsel. Arraignment held for Defendant Gregory Edward Paccone Jr. (1) Counts 1-6. Defendant waived reading of the Indictment. Defendant proceeds as named. Defendant advised of rights. Not guilty plea(s) entered; denial of forfeiture. Order that Discovery is due in 14 days. 3-day Jury Trial is set for 8/23/2011 at 09:00AM in Judge Brown's Courtroom before Judge Anna J. Brown. Detention Hearing held for Gregory Edward Paccone Jr. (1): Defendant's Location-Custody status is: released on conditions; see formal order. Counsel Present for Plaintiff: AUSA Scott M. Kerin. Counsel Present for Defendant: Lisa Ludwig. (Court Reporter FTR/Rawson) (mr) (Entered: 06/29/2011)
PACER 11 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
Documents Received From Other Court as to Gregory Edward Paccone, Jr from USDC Eastern District of California Case No: 2:11-mj-90-DAD (mkk) (Entered: 04/21/2011)
PACER 10 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Order Appointing Federal Public Defender as to Gregory Edward Paccone, Jr. Signed 3/30/11 by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. (mkk) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
PACER 9 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
CORRECTED Order by Judge Anna J. Brown to docket #8 as to Gregory Edward Paccone, Jr. Defendant to appear for arraignment on 6/29/2011 at 01:30 PM before the Magistrate Duty Judge at the U.S. District Court, 1000 SW Third Avenue, Portland, Oregon. See attached CORRECTED ORDER. (bb) (bb) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
PACER 8 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Anna J. Brown. Granting Defendant's Motion to Continue Arraignment Date 7 as to Gregory Edward Paccone Jr. (1). Arraignment is RESET for 6/29/2011 at 01:30 PM before the Magistrate Duty Judge. (bb) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
PACER 7 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None
Unopposed Motion to Continue / Reset Arraignment by Defendant Gregory Edward Paccone, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Declaration) (Schatz, Christopher) (Entered: 03/25/2011)
PACER 6 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None
Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 3/14/11 as to Gregory Edward Paccone, Jr. (cib) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
PACER 5 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Granting 4 Government's Motion to Unseal Case as to Gregory Edward Paccone Jr. (1). Signed 3/2/11 by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. (mkk) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
PACER 4 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
Motion to Unseal filed by USA as to Defendant Gregory Edward Paccone, Jr. (mkk) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
PACER 3 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown. (mkk) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
PACER 2 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
Indictment Unredacted Version Filed Under Seal as to Defendant Gregory Edward Paccone, Jr (mkk) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
PDF 1 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
SEALED INDICTMENT as to Gregory Edward Paccone, Jr (1) count 1-2 - 18 USC 922(g)(1) and 924(a)(2) FELON IN POSSESSION OF A FIREARM; count 3 - 21 USC 841(a)(1) and 841(b)(1)(B) DISTRIBUTION OF METHAMPHETAMINE; counts 4 and 6 - 21 USC 841(a)(1) and 841(b)(1)(C) DISTRIBUTION OF COCAINE; count 5 - 21 USC 841(a)(1) and 841(b)(1)(C) MANUFACTURE OF COCAINE BASE IN THE FORM OF CRACK COCAINE; CRIMINAL FORFEITURE ALLEGATION (NARCOTICS OFFENSE). (mkk) (Entered: 02/28/2011)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 234 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?