Hopkins v. Oakland Police Dept et al
California Northern District Court, Case No. 4:07-cv-06096-CW
District Judge Claudia Wilken, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.cand.4-07-cv-06096-CW (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Judges don't know as much about themselves as we do.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Kevin Lamar Hopkins, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Berg, Eron, Defendant
No Logo Oakland Police Dept, Defendant
No Logo Wayne Tucker, Defendant
Office Oakland
Filed 12/3/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Alameda
Terminated 5/16/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ProSe
  Entries (18) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PACER 18 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Statement of Prisoner Account
Certificate of Funds in Prisoner's Account as to Kevin L. Hopkins. (Attachments: # (1) envelope)(kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2008)
PDF 17 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 Letter
Letter dated 8/10/2008 from Kevin Lamar Hopkins re: Document request. (Attachments: # (1) Envelope)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2008) Modified on 8/19/2008 (kc, COURT STAFF).
PDF 16 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 8/1/2008 Letter
Letter dated 7/26/2008 from Kevin Lamar Hopkins requesting copy of court order entered March 17, 2008. (Attachments: # (1) envelope)(kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2008)
PDF 15 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008 Letter
Letter from Kevin Hopkins. (Attachments: # (1) envelope)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2008)
PDF 14 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008 Letter
Letter from Kevin Hopkins re: amendment to complaint. (Attachments: # (1) Amended Complaint, # (2) In Forma Pauperis Application, # (3) envelope)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2008)
PDF 13 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008 Letter
Letter from Kevin Hopkins re: request for order to vacate dismissal. (Attachments: # (1) envelope)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2008)
PDF 12 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008 Letter
Letter from Kevin L. Hopkins re change of address, and requesting status of case. (Attachments: # (1) envelope)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2008)
PDF 11 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Letter
Letter from Kevin Hopkins re status of case, and change of address. (Attachments: # (1) envelope)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2008)
PDF 10 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: 5/16/2008 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/16/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2008)
PDF 9 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008 Letter
Letter from Kevin L. Hopkins requesting status, and that inquiries and correspondence be sent to an Oakland address. (Attachments: # (1) envelope)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2008)
PDF 8 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Letter
Letter dated 3/30/08 from Kevin Hopkins requesting case status. (Attachments: # (1) envelope)(kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2008)
PDF 7 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER REGARDING IN FORMA PAUPERIS MOTION. Signed by Judge Clauida Wilken on 3/17/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2008)
PDF 6 Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: 1/7/2008 Notice of Change of Address
NOTICE of Change of Address by Kevin Lamar Hopkins (Attachments: # (1) envelope)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2008)
PDF 5 Filed: 12/26/2007, Entered: 1/2/2008 Letter
Letter from Kevin Hopkins requesting case number and case status. (Attachments: # (1) envelope)(kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2007)
PACER 4 Filed: 12/26/2007, Entered: 12/28/2007 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Certificate of Funds in Prisoner's Account by Kevin Lamar Hopkins. (Attachments: # (1) envelope)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2007)
PDF 3 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007 Clerk's Notice re: IFP
CLERK'S NOTICE re insufficient In Forma Pauperis Application (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2007)
PDF 2 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kevin Lamar Hopkins. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2007)
PDF 1 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007 Complaint
COMPLAINT (no process) against Oakland Police Dept, Wayne Tucker, Bergeron. Filed byKevin Lamar Hopkins. (Attachments: # (1) envelope)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2007)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 28 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?