Trusz v. UBS Rlty Investors LLC et al
Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:09-cv-00268
District Judge Dominic J. Squatrito, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.ctd.3-09-cv-00268 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
The right information can save you thousands of dollars.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Richard Trusz, Plaintiff

Represented by Madsen, Prestley & Parenteau, LLC

v.
No Logo Ubs AG, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Day Pitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Victoria Woodin Chavey +1 860 275 0467 +1 860 275 0343 vwchavey@daypitney.com
Jeffrey Allan Fritz +1 860 275 0116 +1 860 275 0343 jafritz@daypitney.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Alison Jacobs Wice +1 203 961 0404 +1 203 324 4704 wicea@jacksonlewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Neal Gerber & Eisenberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Nineveh Alkhas +1 312 269 5321 +1 312 980 0760 nalkhas@ngelaw.com
No Logo UBS Rlty Investor LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Day Pitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Victoria Woodin Chavey +1 860 275 0467 +1 860 275 0343 vwchavey@daypitney.com
Jeffrey Allan Fritz +1 860 275 0116 +1 860 275 0343 jafritz@daypitney.com
Stacy Smith Walsh +1 860 275 0565 +1 860 275 0343 sswalsh@daypitney.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Alison Jacobs Wice +1 203 961 0404 +1 203 324 4704 wicea@jacksonlewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Neal Gerber & Eisenberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Nineveh Alkhas +1 312 269 5321 +1 312 980 0760 nalkhas@ngelaw.com
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1514
Nature of Suit 442 Civil Rights: Jobs
  Entries (412) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
Need legal research help? Let us know!
PACER 414 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 413 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None Conference
Request RequestSpace
PACER 411 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace
PACER 409 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace
PACER 408 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Motion Hearing re: 287 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 284 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 316 MOTION for Summary Judgment Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Defendants' Sixth Affirmative Defense.( Motion Hearing set for 6/1/2015 03:00 PM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer) (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 04/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 407 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None Notice of Additional Authority
Request RequestSpace
PACER 406 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 405 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 404 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Telephone Status Conference held on 12/1/2014. Total Time: 11 minutes(Court Reporter Diana Huntington.) (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 12/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 403 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/1/2014 at 4:30 PM before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call. Once all parties are on the line, please call chambers at (203)579-5554. (Norman, D.) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 402 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting Plaintiff's 401 Motion for Status Conference. A telephonic status conference will be held on 12/1/2014 at 4:30 PM. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 11/19/2014. (Norman, D.) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 401 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None Conference
Request RequestSpace
PACER 400 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None Notice of Additional Authority
Request RequestSpace
PACER 399 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
Letter from Caroyn C. Ziogas, Assistant Clerk-Appellate, Dated 5/15/2014 Re: Acceptance of Certified Question (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 398 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
Notice of Additional Authority re 284 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Trusz. (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 397 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None
Eight copies of relevant pleadings and briefs received from and sent to the Supreme Court on 3/27/14. (Glynn, T.) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 396 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer. Judge Dominic J. Squatrito no longer assigned. Signed by Clerk on 03/14/2014.(Lynch, K.) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 395 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE TO COUNSEL requesting eight copies of relevant pleadings and briefs re certified question of law. (Glynn, T.) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 394 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF CERTIFICATION TO THE CONNECTICUT SUPREME COURT. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 3/13/14.(Glynn, T.) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 393 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
RESPONSE re 375 Response Per Order No. 392 Granting No. 377 filed by Richard Trusz. (Steigman, Todd) Modified on 10/2/2013 to link documents. (Blue, A.). (Entered: 09/30/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 392 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 377 Motion for Leave to File Response to Defendants' New Authority Regarding Scope of Protected Activity. The plaintiff shall efile his response dated January 25, 2013 (attached as Exhibit A to document 377) on or before October 4, 2013. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 9/30/13. (Pike, C.) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 391 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 370 Amended Motion to Seal, limited to the documents listed in this motion; granting 371 Amended Motion to Seal, limited to the documents listed in this motion. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 9/30/13. (Pike, C.) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 390 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
PROPOSED ORDER re 382 Order by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 389 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
PROPOSED ORDER re 382 Order by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Boskiewicz, Brett) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 388 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 387 Motion for Extension of Time until June 14, 2013 to file the proposed certification order. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 6/11/13. (Pike, C.) (Entered: 06/11/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 387 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time until June 14, 2013 to File Proposed Certification Order 382 Order by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Boskiewicz, Brett) (Entered: 06/10/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 386 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
Notice of Additional Authority re 284 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 287 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Trusz. (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 385 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
Notice of Additional Authority re 284 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 287 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Trusz. (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 384 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 383 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Chad W Moeller terminated. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 5/6/13. (Pike, C.) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 383 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None
MOTION for Chad W. Moeller to Withdraw as Attorney by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Moeller, Chad) (Entered: 05/02/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 382 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER - OPEN FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 4/24/13. (Glynn, T.) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 381 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
Notice of Additional Authority re 284 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 287 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Trusz. (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 380 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 359 Motion for Conference. The Court will set down a conference in due course. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 3/15/13. (Pike, C.) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 379 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 378 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Justin E Theriault terminated. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 3/5/13. (Pike, C.) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 378 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None
MOTION for Justin Theriault to Withdraw as Attorney by Richard Trusz. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Theriault, Justin) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 377 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendants' New Authority Regarding Scope of Protected Activity by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A. Proposed Response)Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 376 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None
RESPONSE re 374 Order,,, filed by Richard Trusz. (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 375 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None
RESPONSE re 374 Order,,, filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Boskiewicz, Brett) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 374 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER. As discussed with counsel, the Court is providing each party with an opportunity to submit a brief addressing the isue of whether this Court should certify the following question of law to the Connecticut Supreme Court pursuant to Conn. Gen. Stat. Sec. 51-199b(d): Whether the rule set forth in Garcetti v. Ceballos, 547 U.S. 410 (2006) applies to a claim that an employer violated Conn. Gen. Stat. Sec. 31-51q by subjecting an employee "to discipline or discharge on account of the exercise by such employee of rights guaranteed by... section 3, 4 or 14 of article first of the Constitution of the state...." Each party may file a brief addressing this issue on or before January 11, 2013. Such brief shall not exceed 15 pages. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 12/06/2012. (Ring, T.) (Entered: 12/06/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 373 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 372 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Nineveh Alkhas terminated. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 11/28/12. (Pike, C.) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 372 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for Nineveh Alkhas to Withdraw as Attorney by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Alkhas, Nineveh) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 371 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None
Amended MOTION to Seal filed pursuant to the Court's Memorandum of Decision dated 09/18/2012 confidential reports and other documents regarding Plaintiff's psychological evaluations by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 10/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 370 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None
Amended MOTION to Seal filed pursuant to the Court's Memorandum of Decision and Order of September 18, 2012 Documents reflecting settlement efforts and confidential third party information by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Ritter, David) (Entered: 10/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 369 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 365 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Victoria Woodin Chavey and Alison Jacobs Wice terminated; granting 366 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Victoria Woodin Chavey and Alison Jacobs Wice terminated. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 9/25/12. (Pike, C.) (Entered: 09/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 368 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Wade on behalf of UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC (Wade, James) (Entered: 09/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 367 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Brett J. Boskiewicz on behalf of UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC (Boskiewicz, Brett) (Entered: 09/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 366 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for Alison Jacobs Wice to Withdraw as Attorney by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Wice, Alison) (Entered: 09/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 365 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for Victoria Woodin Chavey to Withdraw as Attorney by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Chavey, Victoria) (Entered: 09/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 364 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Brett J. Boskiewicz on behalf of UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC (Boskiewicz, Brett) (Entered: 09/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 363 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Wade on behalf of UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC (Wade, James) (Entered: 09/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 362 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 321 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Legal Authority in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 09/19/2012. (Ring, T.) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 361 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 314 Motion to Amend/Correct Plaintiff's Rule 56(a)(2) Statement in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 09/19/2012. (Ring, T.) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 360 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM OF DECISION denying without prejudice 331 Motion to Seal; denying without prejudice 334 Motion to Seal; denying without prejudice 286 Motion to Seal; denying without prejudice 305 Motion to Seal; denying without prejudice 309 Motion to Seal; denying without prejudice 312 Motion to Seal; denying without prejudice 317 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 9/18/12. (Glynn, T.) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 359 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for Conference to Discuss New Authority by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 08/21/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 358 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None
Notice of Additional Authority re 284 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Trusz. (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 07/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 357 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
Notice of Additional Authority re 284 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 356 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE re 354 Order on Motion for Conference,, filed by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 355 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE re Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings, 354 Order on Motion for Conference,, Defendants' Memorandum of Law Addressing the Pickering/Connick Test Per the Court's Order of May 11, 2012 filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Affidavit of Thomas O'Shea)(Ritter, David) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 354 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying without prejudice 353 Motion for Conference. Before the Court determines what, if any, action should be taken in light of the decision of the Connecticut Supreme Court in Schumann v. Dianon Systems, Inc., 304 Conn. 585 (2012), the Court wishes to provide each party with an additional opportunity to address the following issue discussed in Schumann: whether "the plaintiff's speech and actions in this case were... constitutionally protected under [the Pickering/Connick balancing test]." 304 Conn. at 621. Each party may file a supplemental brief addressing this issue on or before June 11, 2012. Such brief shall not exceed 10 pages. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 05/11/2012. (Ring, T.) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 353 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for Conference to Discuss New Authority by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 352 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE by Richard Trusz Notice of Additional Authority (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 351 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE re 326 Order, 350 Response Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Brief in Support of Sealing Certain Documents filed by Richard Trusz. (Steigman, Todd) Modified on 3/22/2012 to edit text to link document. (Blue, A.). (Entered: 03/14/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 350 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE re Defendants' Brief In Support Of Sealing Certain Documents re [326 Order filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Alkhas, Nineveh) Modified on 3/22/2012 to edit text and link document. (Blue, A.). (Entered: 03/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 349 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None
Memorandum in Support re 286 Motion, 309 Motion, 326 Order re Sealing Documents Concerning Plaintiff's Psychological Treatment and Examination filed by Richard Trusz. (Steigman, Todd) Modified on 3/22/2012 to edit text and link documents. (Blue, A.). (Entered: 03/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 348 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
ENTERED IN ERROR: Docket Entry Correction re 347 Settlement Conference held (entered on wrong case) (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 347 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joan G. Margolis: Settlement Conference held on 3/9/2012. Total Time: 3 hours and 30 minutes (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PDF 346 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
RULING: denying 327 Motion to Compel, denying 341 Motion for Attorney's Fees. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 3/9/2012. (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
PACER 345 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE re 327 MOTION to Compel Payment of Expert Witness Fees, 341 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Ritter, David) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 344 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 342 Motion for Extension of Time ; granting 342 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by 3/13/2012 regarding 286 , 305 , 309 , 312 and 317 . Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 3/2/12. (Pike, C.) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 343 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to 327 MOTION to Compel Payment of Expert Witness Fees filed by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through E)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 03/01/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 342 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time until March 13, 2012 to Supplement the Parties' Pending Motions to Seal, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply until March 13, 2012 documents 286 , 305 , 309 , 312 , 317 by Richard Trusz, UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Alkhas, Nineveh) Modified on 3/2/2012 to edit text to add in document numbers. (Blue, A.). (Entered: 02/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 341 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: None
Memorandum in Opposition re 327 MOTION to Compel Payment of Expert Witness Fees filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Ritter, David) (Entered: 02/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 340 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 339 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply until 2/17/12, absent objection. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 2/13/12.(Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 339 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 327 MOTION to Compel Payment of Expert Witness Fees until February 17, 2012 by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Alkhas, Nineveh) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 338 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to 316 MOTION for Summary Judgment Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Defendants' Sixth Affirmative Defense filed by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 02/10/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 337 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
EXHIBIT Redacted Exhibit Q, Affidavit of Thomas O'Shea re 316 MOTION for Summary Judgment by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC re 336 Statement of Material Facts,. (Ritter, David) Modified on 2/3/2012 to edit text to link document. (Blue, A.). (Entered: 01/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 336 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
Statement of Material Facts re 316 MOTION for Summary Judgment Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Defendants' Sixth Affirmative Defense Defendants' Local rule 56(a)(2) Statement filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Ritter, David) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 335 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
EXHIBIT Notice of Manual Filing by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC re 334 MOTION to Seal Docket #330 and #330-28. (Ritter, David) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 334 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Seal Docket 330 and [330-28] by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Ritter, David) Modified on 2/1/2012 to link documents. (Blue, A.). (Entered: 01/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 333 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
Sealed Document: Schedule A by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC re 329 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 316 MOTION for Summary Judgment Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Defendants' Sixth Affirmative Defense, 330 Statement of Material Facts, 331 MOTION to Seal Confidential Documents. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(Blue, A.) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 332 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
EXHIBIT Notice of Manual Filing 331 Motion to Seal by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Schdule A for manually filed documents)(Ritter, David) Modified on 2/1/2012 to link document. (Blue, A.). (Entered: 01/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 331 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Seal Confidential Documents by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Schedule A for Motion to File Under Seal)Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Ritter, David) (Entered: 01/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 330 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
Statement of Material Facts re 316 MOTION for Summary Judgment Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Defendants' Sixth Affirmative Defense Local Rule 56(A)(2) Statement filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Cover Sheet for Appendix of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, Excerpts from Deposition of Plaintiff, # 3 Exhibit B, Exhibits from the Deposition of Plaintiff, # 4 Exhibit C, Excerpts from the Deposition of Matthew Lynch, # 5 Exhibit D, Exhibit 3 from the Deposition of Matthew Lynch, # 6 Exhibit E, Excerpts from the Deposition of thomas O'Shea, # 7 Exhibit F, Excerpts from Goldstein Dep., Ex.1,, # 8 Exhibit G, Job Search Documents, # 9 Exhibit H, Job Search Documents, # 10 Exhibit I, Job Search Documents, # 11 Exhibit J, Job Search Documents, # 12 Exhibit J-1, Job Search Documents, # 13 Exhibit K, Job Search Documents, # 14 Exhibit L, Job Search Documents, # 15 Exhibit M, Job Search Documents, # 16 Exhibit M-1, Job Search Documents, # 17 Exhibit M2, Job Search Documents, # 18 Exhibit N, Job Search Documents, # 19 Exhibit O, Job Search Documents, # 20 Affidavit P, Affidavit of David Ritter, # 21 Exhibit p-1, Deposition Notice, # 22 Exhibit p-2, Response to Discovery Request, # 23 Exhibit p-3,Correspondence, # 24 Exhibit p-4, Amended Response to Discovery request, # 25 Exhibit p-5, Email, # 26 Exhibit p-6, Email, # 27 Exhibit P-7, Second Amended Response to Discovery Request, # 28 Affidavit Q, Affidavit of Tom O'Shea)(Ritter, David) (Entered: 01/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 329 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
Memorandum in Opposition re 316 MOTION for Summary Judgment Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Defendants' Sixth Affirmative Defense filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Ritter, David) (Entered: 01/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 327 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Compel Payment of Expert Witness Fees by Richard Trusz.Responses due by 2/13/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit 1-10)Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 01/23/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 326 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 1/9/12. (Glynn, T.) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 325 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying as moot 290 Motion to Seal. See Dkt. # 305, Amended Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 01/09/2012. (Ring, T.) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 324 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 323 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to opposition re 316 MOTION for Summary Judgment Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Defendants' Sixth Affirmative Defense. Responses due by 1/27/2012. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 12/21/11. (Pike, C.) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 323 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply UNOPPOSED as to 316 MOTION for Summary Judgment Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Defendants' Sixth Affirmative Defense until January 27, 2012 by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Alkhas, Nineveh) (Entered: 12/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 322 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
Memorandum in Opposition re 321 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Legal Authority in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Richard Trusz. (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 321 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Legal Authority in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Unpublished Case)Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Ritter, David) (Entered: 12/13/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 320 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
Sealed Document: Documents/Exhibits by Richard Trusz re 316 MOTION for Summary Judgment Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Defendants' Sixth Affirmative Defense, 317 MOTION to Seal 56(a)(1) Statement and Exhibits 7 and 9. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Notice of manual filing)(Blue, A.) (Entered: 12/13/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 319 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to 287 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Ritter, David) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 318 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to 284 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 317 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
MOTION to Seal 56(a)(1) Statement and Exhibits 7 and 9 by Richard Trusz. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Theriault, Justin) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 316 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Summary Judgment Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Defendants' Sixth Affirmative Defense by Richard Trusz.Responses due by 12/30/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Material Facts REDACTED, # 3 Exhibit 1-9 REDACTED)(Theriault, Justin) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 315 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Justin E Theriault on behalf of Richard Trusz (Theriault, Justin) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 314 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
MOTION To Amend/Correct Plaintiff's Rule 56(a)(2) Statement in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment re 306 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, by Richard Trusz. Responses due by 12/20/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Steigman, Todd) Modified on 12/7/2011 to edit text with correct motion relief. (Blue, A.). (Entered: 11/29/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 313 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None
Sealed Document: Exhibits by Richard Trusz. (Blue, A.) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 312 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
Amended MOTION to Seal Exhibits by Richard Trusz. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
Request RequestSpace
Need legal research help? Let us know!
PACER 311 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
EXHIBIT [Exhibit 101, inadvertently missed in original filing] by Richard Trusz re 307 Statement of Material Facts, 306 Memorandum in Opposition to 287 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Steigman, Todd) Modified on 12/1/2011to link document. (Blue, A.). (Entered: 11/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 310 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
EXHIBIT [filed under seal] 44 Protective Order by Richard Trusz. (Steigman, Todd) Modified on 12/1/2011 to link document. (Blue, A.). (Entered: 11/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 309 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
MOTION to Seal (Re Docs. 306 & 307 Exhibits by Richard Trusz. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 308 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
Sealed Document: Exhibit by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC re 305 Amended MOTION to Seal Documents. (Blue, A.) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 307 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
Statement of Material Facts re 287 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 11, # 2 Exhibit 12, # 3 Exhibit 13, # 4 Exhibit 14, # 5 Exhibit 15, # 6 Exhibit 16, # 7 Exhibit 18, # 8 Exhibit 19, # 9 Exhibit 20 - Under Seal, # 10 Exhibit 17, # 11 Exhibit 21 - Under Seal, # 12 Exhibit 22 - Under Seal, # 13 Exhibit 23, # 14 Exhibit 24 - Under Seal, # 15 Exhibit 25, # 16 Exhibit 26 - Under Seal, # 17 Exhibit 27, # 18 Exhibit 28, # 19 Exhibit 29 - Under Seal, # 20 Exhibit 30 - Under Seal, # 21 Exhibit 33 - Under Seal, # 22 Exhibit 34 - Under Seal, # 23 Exhibit 31, # 24 Exhibit 32, # 25 Exhibit 35, # 26 Exhibit 36, # 27 Exhibit 37, # 28 Exhibit 39, # 29 Exhibit 42, # 30 Exhibit 44, # 31 Exhibit 45, # 32 Exhibit 47, # 33 Exhibit 48, # 34 Exhibit 49, # 35 Exhibit 52, # 36 Exhibit 53, # 37 Exhibit 54, # 38 Exhibit 58, # 39 Exhibit 59, # 40 Exhibit 60, # 41 Exhibit 64, # 42 Exhibit 65, # 43 Exhibit 67, # 44 Exhibit 68, # 45 Exhibit 70, # 46 Exhibit 72, # 47 Exhibit 73, # 48 Exhibit 74, # 49 Exhibit 75, # 50 Exhibit 76, # 51 Exhibit 78, # 52 Exhibit 81, # 53 Exhibit 82, # 54 Exhibit 83, # 55 Exhibit 84, # 56 Exhibit 91, # 57 Exhibit 93, # 58 Exhibit 96, # 59 Exhibit 102, # 60 Exhibit 38, 40-41, 43, 46, 50-51, 55-57, 61-63, 66, 69, 71, 77, 79, 80, 85, 86-90, 92, 94-95, 97, 98-101, 103)(Steigman, Todd) (Main Document 307 replaced on 11/29/2011) (Blue, A.). (Entered: 11/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 306 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
Memorandum in Opposition Exhibits 1 through 10 re 287 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 5 - Under Seal, # 8 Exhibit 7 - Under Seal, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 305 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
Amended MOTION to Seal Documents by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Notice of Manual Filing, # 2 Exhibit Schedule A)Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Ritter, David) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 304 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
"ENTERED IN ERROR" Amended MOTION to Seal Documents by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Schedule A)Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Ritter, David) Modified on 11/21/2011 (Blue, A.). (Entered: 11/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 303 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
Statement of Material Facts re 284 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Local Rule 56(A)(2) Statement in Response to Plaintiff's Local Rule 56(a)(1) filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Plaintiff's Deposition Transcripts Excerpts, # 2 Exhibit B, Additional Exhibits from Plaintiff's Deposition, # 3 Exhibit C, Excerpts from the Deposition of Mario Cueni, # 4 Exhibit D, Additional Deposition Excerpts from the Deposition of Thomas Gould, # 5 Exhibit E, Additional Excerpts from the Deposition of Jeffrey Maguire, # 6 Exhibit F, Additional Excerpts from Deposition of Christine Menard, # 7 Exhibit G, Additional Excerpts from the Deposition of Ana Ibis Seebrath, # 8 Exhibit H, Additional Excerpts from the Deposition of Stephen Sikes, # 9 Exhibit I, Additional Excerpts from the Deposition of Christopher Taylor, # 10 Exhibit J, Excerpts from the Deposition of Peter Korpacz, # 11 Exhibit K, Excerpts from the Deposition of William Pastuszek, # 12 Exhibit L, Excerpts from the Deposition of Steven Scott Thel, # 13 Exhibit M, Korpacz Expert Real Property Consulting Report, # 14 Exhibit N, Expert Report of Kevin J. O'Connor, # 15 Exhibit O, Supplemental Affidavit of Thomas O'Shea, # 16 Exhibit P, UBS 10569 redacted)(Ritter, David) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 302 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
Memorandum in Opposition re 284 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Journal Article)(Ritter, David) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 301 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 300 Motion for Extension of Time until December 9, 2011 for the plaintiff to file a summary judgment. No further extensions shall be granted. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 11/14/11. (Pike, C.) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 300 Filed: 11/11/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time until December 9, 2011 To File Motion for Summary Judgment on Affirmative Defense of Failure to Mitigate Damages 295 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 11/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 299 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 298 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by November 18, 2011. Replies to the responses shall be filed by December 12, 2011. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 11/10/2011. (Ring, T.) (Entered: 11/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 298 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 284 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 287 MOTION for Summary Judgment until November 18, 2011 by Richard Trusz. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 297 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 296 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 287 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 284 MOTION for Summary Judgment Responses due by 11/15/2011. Replies to the responses shall be filed by December 9, 2011. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 10/17/11. (Pike, C.) (Entered: 10/17/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 296 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 284 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 287 MOTION for Summary Judgment until November 15, 2011 by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC., Richard Trusz. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Alkhas, Nineveh) Modified on 10/17/2011 to edit text and add filer. (Blue, A.). (Entered: 10/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 295 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 294 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff may file a motion for summary judgment regarding defendants' sixth affirmative defense (mitigation of damages) on or before November 14, 2011. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 10/12/2011. (Ring, T.) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 294 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time until November 14, 2011 To File Summary Judgment Motion Relating to Affirmative Defense Claiming Failure to Mitigate Damages by Richard Trusz. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 293 Filed: 10/5/2011, Entered: None
Sealed Document: Memorandum in Support (Unredacted) by Richard Trusz re 287 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts, Unredacted)(Blue, A.) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 292 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None
EXHIBIT Notice of Manual Filing by Richard Trusz re 286 MOTION to Seal Unredacted Memo of Law; Unredacted 56(a)(1) Statement and Exhibits to 56(a)(1) Statement re 284 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List of Exhibits for Filing Under Seal)(Steigman, Todd) Modified on 10/5/2011 to edit text and link document. (Blue, A.). (Entered: 09/27/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 291 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
EXHIBIT Notice of Manual Filing by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC re 290 MOTION to Seal Documents designated Confidential pursuant to Protective Order of October 7, 2009, 289 Statement of Material Facts,,,,,,,,,, 287 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Schedule A of Documents for Notice of Manual Filing)(Ritter, David) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 290 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
MOTION to Seal Documents designated Confidential pursuant to Protective Order of October 7, 2009 by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Schedule A of Documents)Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Ritter, David) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 289 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
Statement of Material Facts re 287 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Cover Sheet to Appendix of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, Deposition Transcripts Excerpts of Plaintiff Richard Trusz, # 3 Exhibit A1 Deposition Transcript Excerpts of Plaintiff Richard Trusz, # 4 Exhibit A2, Deposition Excerpts of Plaintiff Richard Trusz, # 5 Exhibit B, Exhibits from Deposition of Plaintiff Richard Trusz, # 6 Exhibit B1, Exhibits from the Deposition of Plaintiff Richard Trusz, # 7 Exhibit B2, Exhibits from the Deposition of Plaintiff Richard Trusz, # 8 Exhibit B3, Exhibits from the Deposition of Plaintiff Richard Trusz, # 9 Exhibit B4, exhibits from the Deposition of Plaintiff Richard Trusz, # 10 Exhibit B5, Exhibits from the Deposition of Plaintiff Richard Trusz, # 11 Exhibit B6, Exhibits from the Deposition of Richard Trusz, # 12 Exhibit B7, exhibits from Deposition of Plaintiff Richard Trusz, # 13 Exhibit C, Excerpts and Exhibits from the Deposition of Hope Cahoon, # 14 Exhibit D, Exhibits from the Deposition of Mario Cueni, # 15 Exhibit E, Excerpts and Exhibits from the Deposition of Michelle Cullen, # 16 Exhibit F, Excerpts from the Deposition of Dr. Laurence Goldstein, # 17 Exhibit G, Excerpts and Exhibits from the deposition of Thomas Gould, # 18 Exhibit H, Excerpts from the Deposition of Dr. Jeffrey Kluger, # 19 Exhibit I, Excerpts and Exhibits from the Deposition of Carol Kuta, # 20 Exhibit J, Excerpts and Exhibits from the Deposition of Matthew Lynch, # 21 Exhibit Excerpts from the Deposition of Jeffrey Maguire, # 22 Exhibit L, Excerpts from the Deposition of Vincent Maniscalco, # 23 Exhibit Excerpts and Exhibits from the Deposition of Christine Menard, # 24 Exhibit N, Excerpts and Exhibits from the Deposition of Thomas O'Shea, # 25 Exhibit O, Excerpts from the Deposition of Patrick Reinhardt, # 26 Exhibit P, Excerpts and Exhibits from the Deposition of Ana Ibis Seebrath, # 27 Exhibit Q, Excerpts and Exhibits from the Deposition of Stephen Sikes, # 28 Exhibit R, Excerpts and Exhibits from the Deposition of Christopher Taylor, # 29 Exhibit S, Excerpts from the Deposition of Jeffrey Walden, # 30 Affidavit of Hope Cahoon, # 31 Affidavit of Michelle Cullen, # 32 Affidavit of Thomas Gould, # 33 Affidavit of Carol Kuta, # 34 Affidavit of Matthew Lynch, # 35 Affidavit of Jeffrey Maguire, # 36 Affidavit of Christine Menard, # 37 Affidavit of Thomas O'Shea, # 38 Exhibit 1-27 of Affidavit of Thomas O'Shea, # 39 Affidavit of Ronald Osborne, # 40 Affidavit of Ana Ibis Seebrath, # 41 Affidavit of Christopher Taylor)(Ritter, David) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 288 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
Memorandum in Support re 287 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Ritter, David) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 287 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Summary Judgment by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC.Responses due by 10/17/2011 (Ritter, David) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 286 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
MOTION to Seal Unredacted Memo of Law; Unredacted 56(a)(1) Statement and Exhibits to 56(a)(1) Statement by Richard Trusz. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 285 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
Statement of Material Facts re 284 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1., # 2 Exhibit 2., # 3 Exhibit 3., # 4 Exhibit 4., # 5 Exhibit 5., # 6 Exhibit 6-9. Filed Under Seal, # 7 Exhibit 10., # 8 Exhibit 11., # 9 Exhibit 12., # 10 Exhibit 13-17. Filed Under Seal, # 11 Affidavit 18., # 12 Exhibit 19-31. Filed Under Seal, # 13 Exhibit 32., # 14 Exhibit 33., # 15 Exhibit 34-37. Filed Under Seal, # 16 Exhibit 38., # 17 Exhibit 39., # 18 Exhibit 40. Filed Under Seal, # 19 Exhibit 41., # 20 Exhibit 42. Filed Under Seal, # 21 Exhibit 43., # 22 Exhibit 44., # 23 Exhibit 45., # 24 Exhibit 46. Filed Under Seal, # 25 Exhibit 47., # 26 Exhibit 48., # 27 Exhibit 49., # 28 Exhibit 50., # 29 Exhibit 51. Filed Under Seal, # 30 Exhibit 52., # 31 Exhibit 53. Filed Under Seal, # 32 Exhibit 54., # 33 Exhibit 55., # 34 Exhibit 56., # 35 Exhibit 57., # 36 Exhibit 58., # 37 Exhibit 59. Redacted, # 38 Exhibit 60. Filed Under Seal, # 39 Exhibit 61., # 40 Exhibit 62., # 41 Exhibit 63., # 42 Exhibit 64., # 43 Exhibit 65-71. Filed Under Seal, # 44 Exhibit 72., # 45 Exhibit 73., # 46 Exhibit 74-77. Filed Under Seal, # 47 Exhibit 78., # 48 Exhibit 79., # 49 Exhibit 80., # 50 Exhibit 81., # 51 Exhibit 82., # 52 Exhibit 83., # 53 Exhibit 84. Filed Under Seal, # 54 Exhibit 85., # 55 Exhibit 86-87. Filed Under Seal, # 56 Exhibit 88., # 57 Exhibit 89., # 58 Exhibit 90., # 59 Exhibit 91. Filed Under Seal, # 60 Exhibit 92., # 61 Exhibit 93-104. Filed Under Seal, # 62 Exhibit 105., # 63 Exhibit 106., # 64 Exhibit 107-108. Filed Under Seal)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 284 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Richard Trusz.Responses due by 10/17/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support (redacted), # 2 Exhibit A., # 3 Exhibit B., # 4 Exhibit C., # 5 Exhibit D., # 6 Exhibit E., # 7 Exhibit F., # 8 Exhibit G., # 9 Exhibit H., # 10 Exhibit I., # 11 Exhibit J., # 12 Exhibit K.)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 283 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: granting 282 Motion for Extension of Time until 9/26/11, absent objection. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 9/22/2011. (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 09/22/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 282 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until September 26, 2011 To File Dispositive Motions 281 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,,, by Richard Trusz. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 09/22/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 281 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 278 Motion for Extension of Time, with great reluctance, as follows: (1) the deadline for the completion of expert discovery is extended until 9/9/11 solely for the purpose of taking the deposition of Steven Scott Thel on 8/24/11, the deposition of Kevin O'Connor on 9/8/11, and the deposition of Lisa D. Piechowski on or before 9/9/11; (2) the deadline for the filing of all dispositive motions is extended until 9/23/11; and (3) the depositions of all economic damages expert witnesses, namely Arther W. Wright and Dwight Steward, will be completed within 30 days of a ruling on the dispositive motions by Senior U.S. District Judge Dominic J. Squatrito. The Magistrate Judge trusts that there will not be a flurry of motions filed with respect to the Thel, O'Connor, and Piechowski depositions. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 8/16/11. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 280 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 279 Motion for Extension of Time until 8/22/11, absent objection. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 8/16/11. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 279 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time until 08/22/2011 to comply with Court Order 270 Order on Motion to Compel, 272 Docket Annotation by Richard Trusz. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 278 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time To Extend Three Deadlines by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC., Richard Trusz. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Alkhas, Nineveh) Modified on 8/15/2011 to add filer. (Blue, A.). (Entered: 08/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 277 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
RULING: denying 265 Motion for Leave to Serve Subpoena on Foot Locker. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 8/10/2011. (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 276 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
SUR-REPLY to Response to 265 MOTION for Leave to File Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum on Foot Locker Retail, Inc filed by Richard Trusz. (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 275 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 274 Motion for Leave to File Sur-reply Brief. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 8/10/11. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 274 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Sur-Reply)Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 273 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to 265 MOTION for Leave to File Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum on Foot Locker Retail, Inc filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Menard Deposition Transcript Pages, # 2 Exhibit B, Seebrath Deposition Transcript Pages)(Ritter, David) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 272 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None
Docket Entry Correction re 270 Order on Motion to Compel. Added correct PDF to docket entry (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 271 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE re 262 Objection re 254 Order To Ruling Following In Camera Review filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Alkhas, Nineveh) Modified on 8/18/2011 to edit text to include order. (Blue, A.). (Entered: 08/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 270 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
RULING: granting in part and denying in part to the extent set forth in ruling. Plaintiff shall produce these reports on or before August 19, 2011 263 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 8/9/2011. (Rodko, B.) (Rodko, B.). (Entered: 08/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 269 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None
Memorandum in Opposition re 265 MOTION for Leave to File Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum on Foot Locker Retail, Inc filed by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Cueni Email, # 2 Exhibit Excerpts from Cueni Deposition, # 3 Exhibit Excerpts from Lynch Deposition, # 4 Exhibit Excerpts from Seebrath Deposition, # 5 Exhibit Excerpts from McRae Deposition)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 268 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to 263 MOTION to Compel Responses to Subpoena Directed to Plaintiff's Expert, William J. Pastuszek filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Ritter, David) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 267 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: None
Memorandum in Opposition re 263 MOTION to Compel Responses to Subpoena Directed to Plaintiff's Expert, William J. Pastuszek filed by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 08/04/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 266 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER: SEE ATTACHED ORDER for expedited briefing schedule re: Defendants' Motion for Leave to Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum on Foot Locker Retail,Inc., filed today (Dkt. #265). THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE THE COURT WILL ISSUE. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 8/4/2011. (Watson, M.) (Entered: 08/04/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 265 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum on Foot Locker Retail, Inc by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, McRae Expert Report for Trusz v. UBS, # 2 Exhibit B, McRae Expert Report for James v. Footlocker Retail, # 3 Exhibit C, McRae Deposition Transcript Pages, # 4 Exhibit D, Objections and Responses to Subpoena, # 5 Exhibit E, Subponea to Produce Documents Issued to Footlocker Retail, Inc.)Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Ritter, David) (Entered: 08/04/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 264 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER: SEE ATTACHED ORDER for expedited briefing schedule regarding Defendants' pending Motion to Compel Responses to Subpoena to Plaintiff's Expert. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE THE COURT WILL ISSUE. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 8/2/2011. (Watson, M.) (Main Document 264 replaced on 8/5/2011) (Gutierrez, Y.). (Entered: 08/02/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 263 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
MOTION to Compel Responses to Subpoena Directed to Plaintiff's Expert, William J. Pastuszek by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC.Responses due by 8/22/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Ritter, David) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 262 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None
OBJECTION re 254 Order filed by Richard Trusz. (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 261 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 260 Motion for Extension of Time, until 7/26/11, absent objection. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 7/21/11. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 260 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time until July 26, 2011 To File Objection In Response To 254 Order by Richard Trusz. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PDF 346 Filed: 3/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
RULING: denying 327 Motion to Compel, denying 341 Motion for Attorney's Fees. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 3/9/2012. (Rodko, B.)
PACER 259 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE re 253 Objection to Ruling on Defendants' Motion for Protective Order filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Alkhas, Nineveh) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 258 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: 7/8/2011 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Request RequestSpace
PACER 257 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: 7/8/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 256 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: 7/8/2011 Response
Request RequestSpace
PACER 255 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: 7/8/2011 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Request RequestSpace
PACER 254 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: 7/8/2011 Order
Request RequestSpace
PACER 253 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: 7/7/2011 Objection
Request RequestSpace
PACER 252 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: 7/1/2011 Response
Request RequestSpace
PACER 251 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: 7/1/2011 Response
Request RequestSpace
PACER 250 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: 6/30/2011 Memorandum of Conference
Request RequestSpace
PACER 249 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: 6/30/2011 Order on Motion for Conference
Request RequestSpace
PACER 248 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: 6/30/2011 Status Conference
Request RequestSpace
PACER 247 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: 6/29/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 246 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: 6/29/2011 Order on Motion to Take Deposition
Request RequestSpace
PACER 245 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: 6/29/2011 Order on Motion to Withdraw
Request RequestSpace
PACER 244 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: 6/29/2011 Motion to Withdraw
Request RequestSpace
PACER 243 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: 6/28/2011 Calendar Entry
Request RequestSpace
PACER 242 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: 6/27/2011 Motion to Take Deposition
Request RequestSpace
PACER 241 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: 6/27/2011 Order on Motion to Quash
Request RequestSpace
PDF 240 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: 6/27/2011 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
PACER 239 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: 6/27/2011 Response
Request RequestSpace
PACER 238 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: 6/27/2011 Order on Motion for Leave to File
Request RequestSpace
PACER 237 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: 6/24/2011 Motion for Conference
Request RequestSpace
PACER 236 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: 6/24/2011 Motion for Leave to File
Request RequestSpace
PACER 235 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: 6/24/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PACER 234 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: 6/23/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace
PDF 233 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: 6/23/2011 Order on Motion for Protective Order
PACER 232 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: 6/21/2011 Order on Motion to QuashCourt Filing
RULING: denying without prejudice as moot regarding the subpoenas served on SURS, Ruggles and FSBA; granting in part and denying in part regarding subpoenas served on Townsend Group, Hewitt EnnisKnupp, and Dohrmann 204 Motion to Quash Six Third-Party Subpoenas; granting 227 Motion to Seal Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 6/21/2011. (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 231 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: 6/21/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY to Response to 210 MOTION for Protective Order filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Transcript References from the Deposition of Mario Cueni, # 2 Exhibit B, Deposition Exhibit 14 from Deposition of Mario Cueni)(Ritter, David) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 230 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: 6/17/2011 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Memorandum in Opposition re 220 Emergency MOTION for In Camera review filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Ritter, David) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 229 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: 6/14/2011 Sealed Document
Sealed Document: Unredacted Version of Exhibit A by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC re 226 Exhibit, 227 MOTION to Seal Exhibit A, November 18, 2008 Letter. (Kelsey, N.) (Entered: 06/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 228 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: 6/13/2011 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Memorandum in Opposition re 224 MOTION to Quash Deposition Subpoena Directed to Karl Koch of IPERS filed by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1. O'Shea Deposition Excerpt)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 06/13/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 227 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: 6/13/2011 Motion to Seal
MOTION to Seal Exhibit A, November 18, 2008 Letter by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Alkhas, Nineveh) (Entered: 06/13/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 226 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: 6/13/2011 Exhibit
EXHIBIT A, Notice of Manual Filing of Exhibit Under Seal by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC re 225 Reply to Response to Motion. (Alkhas, Nineveh) (Entered: 06/13/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 225 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: 6/13/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY to Response to 204 MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Six Third-Party Subpoenas filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, November 18, 2008 Letter)(Alkhas, Nineveh) (Entered: 06/13/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 224 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: 6/10/2011 Motion to Quash
MOTION to Quash Deposition Subpoena Directed to Karl Koch of IPERS by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC.Responses due by 7/1/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Reinhardt Deposition Excerpts and Exhibits)Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Ritter, David) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 223 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: 6/7/2011 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Memorandum in Opposition re 210 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A., # 2 Exhibit B., # 3 Exhibit C., # 4 Exhibit D.)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 222 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: 6/6/2011 Sealed Document
Sealed Document: Exhibits B, C, D, G by Richard Trusz re 212 Memorandum in Opposition to 204 MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Six Third-Party Subpoenas, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C, # 2 Exhibit D, # 3 Errata G)(Malone, P.) (Entered: 06/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 221 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: 6/3/2011 OrderCourt Filing
EXPEDITED SCHEDULING ORDER RE: Dkt. #220. Defendants' brief in opposition shall be filed on or before June 13, 2011, and plaintiff's reply brief, if any, shall be filed on or before June 17, 2011. SEE ATTACHED ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 6/3/11. (Watson, M.) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 220 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: 6/2/2011 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Emergency MOTION for In Camera review by Richard Trusz.Responses due by 6/23/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N)Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 219 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: 6/2/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
ORDER: granting in large part 215 Motion for Extension of Time. SEE attached. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 6/2/2011. (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 218 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: 6/1/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY to Response to 215 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 31, 2011 regarding Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline and Dispositive Motion Deadline filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Alkhas, Nineveh) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 217 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: 6/1/2011 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Memorandum in Opposition re 215 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 31, 2011 regarding Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline filed by Richard Trusz. (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 216 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: 6/1/2011 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 213 Motion to Seal. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 6/1/11. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 215 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: 5/31/2011 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION for Extension of Time until May 31, 2011 regarding Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Alkhas, Nineveh) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 214 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: 5/31/2011 ResponseCourt Filing
RESPONSE re 209 Objection -- Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Partial Objection to Ruling by Magistrate Judge on Plaintiff's Third Motion to Compel -- filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Ritter, David) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 213 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: 5/31/2011 Motion to Seal
MOTION to Seal Exhibits B, C, D & G to Doc. 212 (Opposition to Motion to Quash) by Richard Trusz. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
Request RequestSpace
Need legal research help? Let us know!
PACER 212 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: 5/31/2011 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Memorandum in Opposition re 204 MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Six Third-Party Subpoenas filed by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, E and F)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 211 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: 5/17/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
Memorandum in Support re 210 MOTION for Protective Order filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Deposition Transcript References, # 2 Exhibit B, Declaration of M. Cueni)(Ritter, David) (Entered: 05/17/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 210 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: 5/17/2011 Motion for Protective Order
MOTION for Protective Order by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC.Responses due by 6/7/2011 Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Ritter, David) (Entered: 05/17/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 209 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: 5/16/2011 Objection
OBJECTION re 203 Order on Motion to Compel filed by Richard Trusz. (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 208 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: 5/13/2011 Notice (Other)
NOTICE by Richard Trusz re 184 Objection (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 207 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: 5/13/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 206 Motion for Extension of Time until 5/16/11, absent objection. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 5/13/11. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 206 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: 5/12/2011 Motion for Extension of Time
First MOTION for Extension of Time until May 16, 2011 ON CONSENT To Object to Ruling on Plaintiff's 193 Third Motion to Compel by Richard Trusz. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis (Steigman, Todd) Modified on 5/16/2011 (Blue, A.). (Entered: 05/12/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 205 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: 5/10/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
Memorandum in Support re 204 MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Six Third-Party Subpoenas filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Ritter, David) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 204 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: 5/10/2011 Motion to Quash
MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Six Third-Party Subpoenas by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC.Responses due by 5/31/2011 Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Ritter, David) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PDF 203 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: 4/28/2011 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S THIRD MOTION TO COMPEL: granting in part and denying in part 193 Motion to Compel. See attached ruling for details. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 4/27/2011. (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
PACER 202 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: 4/25/2011 Response
RESPONSE re 199 Reply to Response to Motion -- Defendants' Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion to Compel -- filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Ritter, David) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 201 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: 4/25/2011 Order on Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 200 Motion for Leave to File Sur-reply Brief. See Von Spee v. Von Spee, 514 F. Supp. 2d 302, 306 n.9 (D. Conn. 2007)(citations omitted); Burford v. McDonald's Corp., 321 F. Supp. 2d 358, 360 n.1 (D. Conn. 2004). The sur-reply brief may now be docketed. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 4/25/11. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 200 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: 4/20/2011 Motion for Leave to File
MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Alkhas, Nineveh) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 199 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: 4/13/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY to Response to 193 Third MOTION to Compel filed by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 04/13/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 198 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: 4/7/2011 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Memorandum in Opposition re 193 Third MOTION to Compel filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-J)(Ritter, David) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 197 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: 3/30/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to MotionCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 196 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply until 4/7/11, absent objection. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 3/30/11.(Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 196 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: 3/30/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply -- Unopposed -- as to 193 Third MOTION to Compel until Thursday, April 7, 2011 by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Alkhas, Nineveh) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 195 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: 3/21/2011 Sealed Document
Sealed Document: Exhibits 26-30, 38-53, 55, 56 by Richard Trusz re 193 Third MOTION to Compel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 27, # 2 Exhibit 28, # 3 Exhibit 29, # 4 Exhibit 30, # 5 Exhibit 38, # 6 Exhibit 39, # 7 Exhibit 40, # 8 Exhibit 41, # 9 Exhibit 42, # 10 Exhibit 43, # 11 Exhibit 44, # 12 Exhibit 45, # 13 Exhibit 46, # 14 Exhibit 47, # 15 Exhibit 48, # 16 Exhibit 49, # 17 Exhibit 50, # 18 Exhibit 51, # 19 Exhibit 52, # 20 Exhibit 53, # 21 Exhibit 55, # 22 Exhibit 56)(Garguilo, B) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 194 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: 3/11/2011 Exhibit
EXHIBIT Notice of Manual Filing of Certain Exhibits by Richard Trusz re 193 Third MOTION to Compel. (Steigman, Todd) . (Entered: 03/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 193 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: 3/11/2011 Motion to Compel
Third MOTION to Compel by Richard Trusz.Responses due by 4/1/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Appendix Indexd of Exhibits, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit 18, # 21 Exhibit 19, # 22 Exhibit 20, # 23 Exhibit 21, # 24 Exhibit 22, # 25 Exhibit 23, # 26 Exhibit 24, # 27 Exhibit 25, # 28 Exhibit 26-30 Cover Pages Only, # 29 Exhibit 31, # 30 Exhibit 32, # 31 Exhibit 33, # 32 Exhibit 34, # 33 Exhibit 35, # 34 Exhibit 36, # 35 Exhibit 37, # 36 Exhibit 38-53 Cover Pages Only, # 37 Exhibit 54, # 38 Exhibit 55-56 Cover Pages Only, # 39 Exhibit 57, # 40 Exhibit 58, # 41 Exhibit 59, # 42 Exhibit 60, # 43 Exhibit 61, # 44 Exhibit 62, # 45 Exhibit 63, # 46 Exhibit 64, # 47 Exhibit 65, # 48 Exhibit 66, # 49 Exhibit 67, # 50 Exhibit 68, # 51 Exhibit 69)Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 192 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: 3/8/2011 ResponseCourt Filing
RESPONSE re 184 Objection of Plaintiff to Ruling by Magistrate Judge Granting Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Ritter, David) . (Entered: 03/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 191 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: 3/8/2011 ResponseCourt Filing
RESPONSE re 185 Objection of Plaintiff to Ruling by Magistrate Judge Regarding Depositions of Employees Who Reside and Are Employed in Europe filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Ritter, David) . (Entered: 03/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 190 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: 3/7/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 188 Motion for Extension of Time until 3/31/11. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 3/7/11. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 189 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: 3/3/2011 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Chad W Moeller on behalf of UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC (Moeller, Chad) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 188 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: 2/28/2011 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION for Extension of Time until March 31, 2011 To Object And/Or Respond to Requests for Production Relating to Expert Witnesses by Richard Trusz. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 187 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: 2/25/2011 Order on Motion to AppearCourt Filing
ORDER granting 177 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Chad Moeller. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 2/25/11. (Pike, C.) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 186 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: 2/25/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 183 Motion for Extension of Time as follows:(1) plaintiff shall disclose his expert witnesses, and defendants shall disclose their expert witnesses on any affirmative defenses or issues on which defendants have the burden of proof on or before 3/31/11;(2) defendants shall disclose any expert witnesses in response to plaintiff's expert witnesses, or on any issue for which defendants do not have the burden of proof, and plaintiff shall dlsclose rebuttal expert witnesses on or before 5/31/11; (3) All discovery shall be completed on or before 6/30/11; and (4) all dispositive motions shall be filed on or before 7/29/11. THERE SHALL BE NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS REGARDING THE COMPLETION OF DISCOVERY, ABSENT UNEXPECTED AND EXTRAORDINARY CIRCUMSTANCES. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 2/25/11. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 185 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: 2/22/2011 ObjectionCourt Filing
OBJECTION re 179 Order by Magistrate Judge Regarding Depositions of Employees of UBS Who Reside and are Employed in Europe filed by Richard Trusz. (Steigman, Todd) . (Entered: 02/22/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 184 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: 2/22/2011 Objection
OBJECTION re 167 Order on Motion for Reconsideration filed by Richard Trusz. (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 183 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: 2/22/2011 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION for Extension of Time Relating to Scheduling Order Deadlines by Richard Trusz. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 182 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: 2/22/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 181 Motion for Extension of Time until 2/22/11, absent objection. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 2/22/11. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 181 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: 2/18/2011 Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
MOTION for Extension of Time until February 22, 2011 to File Objection to Ruling by Magistrate Judge by Richard Trusz. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 180 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: 2/14/2011 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
RULING: granting 163 Motion for Independent Mental Examination. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 2/14/2011. (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 179 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: 2/8/2011 OrderCourt Filing
RULING Regarding Plaintiff's Desire to Depose Several Employees who Reside and are Employed in Europe. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 2/8/2011. (Rodko, B.) (Main Document 179 replaced on 2/15/2011) (Gutierrez, Y.). (Entered: 02/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 178 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: 2/7/2011 Response
RESPONSE re 163 MOTION for Independent Mental Examination, 164 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A and B)(Ritter, David) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 177 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: 2/3/2011 Motion to Appear
MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice Attorney Chad W. Moeller. Filing Fee $25.00 Receipt Number CTXH00000437., by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit) Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Blue, A.) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 176 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: 1/31/2011 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
***AMENDED*** NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. February 4, 2011 Telephonic Discovery Conference at 3:30pm before Judge Joan G. Margolis is CANCELED. (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 01/31/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 175 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: 1/28/2011 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Memorandum in Opposition re 163 MOTION for Independent Mental Examination filed by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 174 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: 1/28/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 173 Motion for Extension of Time, until 2/18/11, over objection. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 1/28/11. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 173 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: 1/27/2011 Motion for Extension of Time
First MOTION for Extension of Time until 02/27/2011 to file objection to ruling dated 01/13/2011 168 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, 167 Order on Motion for Reconsideration by Richard Trusz. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 172 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: 1/26/2011 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A Telephonic Discovery Conference is set for 2/4/2011 at 3:30 PM before Judge Joan G. Margolis. Attorney Steigman will initiate the conference call. Chambers: 203-773-2350. (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 171 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: 1/20/2011 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Alison Jacobs Wice on behalf of UBS Rlty Investor LLC (Wice, Alison) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 170 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: 1/14/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 169 Motion for Extension of Time, until 2/28/11, absent objection. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 1/14/11. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 169 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: 1/14/2011 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION for Extension of Time until February 28, 2011 To Object and/or Respond to Defendants' Second Set of Requests for Production by Richard Trusz. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 168 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: 1/13/2011 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION: granting in part 127 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 1/13/2011. (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 167 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: 1/13/2011 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
RULING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION: granting 128 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 1/13/2011. (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 166 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: 1/13/2011 Order on Motion for ConferenceCourt Filing
RULING granting 150 Motion for Telephonic Discovery Conference. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 1/13/2011. (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 165 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: 1/11/2011 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joan G. Margolis: Telephonic Discovery Conference held on 1/11/2011. Time: 10 minutes (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 164 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
Memorandum in Support re 163 MOTION for Independent Mental Examination filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Ritter, David) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 163 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION for Independent Mental Examination by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC.Responses due by 1/28/2011 Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Ritter, David) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 162 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A Telephonic Discovery Conference is set for 1/11/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Joan G. Margolis. Attorney Steigman shall initiate the conference call. Chambers: 203-773-2350. (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 161 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: 1/3/2011 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 159 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Stacy Smith Walsh terminated. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 1/3/11. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 160 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: 1/3/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 156 Motion for Extension of Time, by consent, as follows:(1) plaintiff shall disclose his expert witnesses, and defendants shall disclose their expert witnesses on any affirmative defenses or issues on which defendants have the burden of proof on or before 2/28/11;(2) defendants shall disclose any expert witnesses in response to plaintiff's expert witnesses, or on any issue for which defendants do not have the burden of proof, and plaintiff shall dlsclose rebuttal expert witnesses on or before 4/29/11; (3) All discovery shall be completed on or before 5/31/11; and(4) All dispositive motions shall be filed on or before 6/30/11.THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 1/3/11. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 159 Filed: 12/30/2010, Entered: 12/30/2010 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
MOTION for Stacy Smith Walsh to Withdraw as Attorney by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Walsh, Stacy) (Entered: 12/30/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 158 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: 12/23/2010 Response
RESPONSE to Plaintiff's 150 Motion for Telephonic Discovery Conference filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Alkhas, Nineveh) Modified on 12/28/2010 to create link (Pesta, J.). (Entered: 12/23/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 157 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: 12/23/2010 Sealed Document
Sealed Document: Exhibits by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC re 153 Reply to Response to Motion, re 84 MEMORANDUM re Argument Against Depositions of Europe-based Employees. (Blue, A.) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 156 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: 12/22/2010 Motion for Extension of Time
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Extension of Discovery Deadlines by Richard Trusz. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 155 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: 12/21/2010 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 152 Motion to Seal, to the extent permitted by Local Rule 5(e). THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 12/21/10. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 154 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: 12/21/2010 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 151 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 12/21/10. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 153 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: 12/20/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY 84 MEMORANDUM re Argument Against Depositions of Europe-based Employees, Exhibit 2 to Exhibit C; and Exhibits G, H and I --/I Exhibits filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C with Placeholder, # 4 Exhibit Notice of Manual Filing of Exhibit 2 to Exhibit C Filed Under Seal, # 5 Exhibit Exhibits D-F, # 6 Exhibit Placeholders for Exhibits G-I, # 7 Exhibit Notice of Manual Filing for Exhibit G Filed Under Seal, # 8 Exhibit Notice of Manual Filing of Exhibit H Filed Under Seal, # 9 Exhibit Notice of Manual Filing of Exhibit I Filed Under Seal, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit J Part 1, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit J Part 2, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit J Part 3, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit J Part 4, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit J Part 5, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit J Part 6, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit J Part 7, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit J Part 8, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit J Part 9)(Ritter, David). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/21/2010: # 19 Exhibit G, # 20 Exhibit H, # 21 Exhibit I, # 22 Exhibit 2 to Exhibit C) (Grady, B.). (Entered: 12/20/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 152 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: 12/20/2010 Motion to Seal
MOTION to Seal Exhibit 2 to Exhibit C; and Exhibits G, H and I -- Exhibits by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Ritter, David) . (Entered: 12/20/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 151 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: 12/20/2010 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Ritter, David) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 150 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: 12/16/2010 Motion for Conference
MOTION for Telephonic Discovery Conference by Richard Trusz. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 12/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 149 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: 12/6/2010 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 148 Motion to Seal. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 12/6/10.(Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 148 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: 12/3/2010 Motion to Seal
MOTION to Seal Tab B of Document No. 53 of Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion to Quash Seven of Plaintiff's Subpoenas Duces Tecum by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Alkhas, Nineveh) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 147 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: 11/24/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
ORDER: granting 146 Motion for Extension of Time until 12/20/2010 to File Their Reply Brief Concerning Plaintiff's Desire to Depose Several Employees Who Reside and Are Employed in Europe. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 11/24/2010. (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 146 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: 11/23/2010 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/20/2010 to File Their Reply Brief Concerning Plaintiff's Desire to Depose Several Employees Who Reside and Are Employed in Europe -- Unopposed -- 84 Trial Memo, by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Ritter, David) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 145 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: 11/17/2010 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
ORDER denying 140 Motion to Seal,without prejudice as moot. (See Dkts. ##142, 144). THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 11/17/10. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 144 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: 11/17/2010 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 142 Motion to Seal, subject to all the requirements set forth in Local Rule 5(e). THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 11/17/10. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 143 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: 11/16/2010 Sealed Document
Sealed Document: Sealed portions of Memorandum of Law by Richard Trusz re 142 MOTION to Seal Redacted Portions of Reply Brief. (Attachments: # 1 Exh. AA, # 2 Exh. BB, # 3 Exh. EE, # 4 Exh. G, # 5 Exh. OO, # 6 Exh. U, # 7 Exh. V, # 8 Exh. W, # 9 Notice of Manual Filing)(Blue, A.) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 142 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: 11/16/2010 Motion to Seal
MOTION to Seal Redacted Portions of Reply Brief and Exhibits G, U, V, W, AA, BB, EE and OO by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Redacted Brief, # 2 Exhibit G, # 3 Exhibit U, # 4 Exhibit V, # 5 Exhibit W, # 6 Exhibit AA, # 7 Exhibit BB, # 8 Exhibit EE, # 9 Exhibit OO) Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis (Steigman, Todd). (Entered: 11/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 141 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: 11/16/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 138 Motion for Extension of Time until 1/14/11, absent objection. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 11/16/10. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 140 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: 11/15/2010 Motion to Seal
"DOCKETED IN ERROR" MOTION to Seal Portions of Brief and Exhibits G, U, V, W, AA, BB, EE, OO by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G, # 2 Exhibit U, # 3 Exhibit V, # 4 Exhibit W, # 5 Exhibit AA, # 6 Exhibit BB, # 7 Exhibit EE, # 8 Exhibit OO)Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis (Steigman, Todd) Modified on 11/16/2010 (Blue, A.). (Entered: 11/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 139 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: 11/15/2010 Response
RESPONSE re 84 Trial Memo, REDACTED filed by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit CC, # 30 Exhibit DD, # 31 Exhibit EE, # 32 Exhibit FF, # 33 Exhibit GG, # 34 Exhibit HH, # 35 Exhibit II, # 36 Exhibit JJ, # 37 Exhibit KK, # 38 Exhibit LL, # 39 Exhibit MM, # 40 Exhibit NN, # 41 Exhibit OO, # 42 Exhibit PP, # 43 Exhibit QQ)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 138 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: 11/15/2010 Motion for Extension of Time
Third MOTION for Extension of Time until January 14, 2011 To Respond to Defendants' Second Set of Discovery Requests by Richard Trusz. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 137 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: 11/5/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY to Response to 128 MOTION for Reconsideration re 124 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Sanctions MOTION for Reconsideration re 124 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Sanctions filed by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 136 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/1/2010 Order on Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 135 Motion for Leave to File. Plaintiff shall file his sur-reply brief by 11/5/10. These filings unfortunately reflect the inexplicable difficulty counsel have in their communications with one another. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 11/1/10. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 135 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: 10/29/2010 Motion for Leave to File
MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendants' Objection to Discovery Ruling by Richard Trusz. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis (Steigman, Todd) . (Entered: 10/29/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 134 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: 10/28/2010 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 133 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 10/28/10. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 133 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: 10/26/2010 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Ritter, David) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 132 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: 10/26/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY to Response to 128 MOTION for Reconsideration re 124 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Sanctions MOTION for Reconsideration re 124 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Sanctions filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A, B and C)(Ritter, David) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 131 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Memorandum of ConferenceCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM of Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 10/15/2010. (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 130 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Settlement ConferenceCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joan G. Margolis: Settlement Conference held on 10/15/2010. Total Time: 2 hours and 30 minutes (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 129 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: 10/12/2010 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Memorandum in Opposition re 128 MOTION for Reconsideration re 124 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Sanctions MOTION for Reconsideration re 124 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Sanctions filed by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 128 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: 9/21/2010 Motion for Reconsideration
MOTION for Reconsideration re 124 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Sanctions by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC.Responses due by 10/12/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Ritter, David) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 127 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: 9/21/2010 Motion for Reconsideration
First MOTION for Reconsideration re 124 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Sanctions (portions of the Order) by Richard Trusz.Responses due by 10/12/2010 Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 126 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: 9/17/2010 Order of TransferCourt Filing
ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Dominic J. Squatrito for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 9/17/10. (Johnson, D.) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 125 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: 9/10/2010 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A Settlement Conference is set for 10/15/2010 at 9:30 AM in Chambers Room 303, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Joan G. Margolis. ALL PARTIES MUST ATTEND THE CONFERENCE. (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 124 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: 9/7/2010 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
RULING: granting in part to the extent set forth in ruling 104 Motion to Compel; denying 104 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 9/7/2010. (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 123 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: 9/7/2010 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 105 Motion to Seal and granting 115 Motion to Seal. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 9/7/10. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 122 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: 8/24/2010 Order on Motion for ConferenceCourt Filing
ORDER granting in part 117 Motion for Conference. SEE ATTACHED ELECTRONIC ORDER FOR DETAILS. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE THE COURT WILL ISSUE. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 8/24/2010.(Watson, M.) (Entered: 08/24/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 121 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: 8/24/2010 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joan G. Margolis: Telephonic Discovery Conference held on 8/23/2010. Time: 15 minutes (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 08/24/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 120 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: 8/20/2010 Response
RESPONSE re 117 MOTION for Telephonic Discovery Conference filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Ritter, David) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 119 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: 8/19/2010 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A Telephonic Discovery Conference is set for 8/23/2010 at 2:15 PM before Judge Joan G. Margolis. Attorney Steigman will initiate the conference call. (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 118 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: 8/18/2010 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Stacy Smith Walsh on behalf of UBS Rlty Investor LLC (Walsh, Stacy) (Entered: 08/18/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 117 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: 8/17/2010 Motion for Conference
MOTION for Telephonic Discovery Conference by Richard Trusz. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 116 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: 7/27/2010 Sealed Document
Sealed Document: Unredacted Portions of Reply Brief and Unredacted Exhibit 2 and Exhibit 5 by Richard Trusz re 115 MOTION to Seal portions of Reply Brief and Exhibits 2 & 5 to Reply Brief, 104 Second MOTION to Compel MOTION for Sanctions. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit 5)(Kelsey, N.) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PDF 115 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: 7/22/2010 Motion to Seal
MOTION to Seal portions of Reply Brief and Exhibits 2 & 5 to Reply Brief by Richard Trusz. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 07/22/2010)
PACER 114 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: 7/22/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY to Response to 104 Second MOTION to Compel MOTION for Sanctions filed by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1., # 2 Exhibit 2. filed under seal, # 3 Exhibit 3. USPAP, # 4 Exhibit 4., # 5 Exhibit 5. filed under seal, # 6 Exhibit 6. Bloomberg Article)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 07/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 113 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: 7/14/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to MotionCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 112 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply until 7/22/10, absent objection. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 7/14/10.(Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace
Need legal research help? Let us know!
PACER 112 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: 7/13/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 104 Second MOTION to Compel MOTION for Sanctions until July 22, 2010 by Richard Trusz. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 111 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: 7/1/2010 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Memorandum in Opposition re 104 Second MOTION to Compel MOTION for Sanctions filed by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Ritter, David) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 110 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: 6/18/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to MotionCourt Filing
ORDER granting 109 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Second Motion to Compel and Motion for Sanctions. Defendants' response is due July 1, 2010. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE THE COURT WILL ISSUE. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 6/18/2010 (Watson, M.) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 109 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: 6/17/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 104 Second MOTION to Compel MOTION for Sanctions until July 1, 2010 by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Alkhas, Nineveh) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 108 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: 6/15/2010 Answer to Amended Complaint
Defendants' ANSWER to 33 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses. -- Answer to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by UBS AG, UBS Rlty Investor LLC.(Ritter, David) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 107 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: 6/10/2010 Sealed Document
Sealed Document: CDs numbered 7, 8 and 21 through 32 re 105 First MOTION to Seal Disks of Defendants' Production marked Confidential by Richard Trusz. (Kelsey, N.) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 106 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: 6/8/2010 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joan G. Margolis for pending discovery motions. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 6/7/2010. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Kelsey, N.) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PDF 105 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: 6/4/2010 Motion to Seal
First MOTION to Seal Disks of Defendants' Production marked Confidential by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 7. Filed Under Seal, # 2 Exhibit 8. Filed Under Seal, # 3 Exhibit 21-32. Filed Under Seal)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
PACER 104 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: 6/3/2010 Motion to Compel
Second MOTION to Compel, MOTION for Sanctions by Richard Trusz.Responses due by 6/24/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Affidavit of Good Faith, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 103 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: 6/3/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 102 Motion for Extension of Time until 11/22/10, nunc pro tunc, absent objection. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 6/3/10. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 102 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: 6/2/2010 Motion for Extension of Time
Second MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/22/2010 to respond and/or object to 2nd set of Requests for Production by Richard Trusz. (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 101 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: 5/12/2010 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joan G. Margolis: A Telephonic Conference Re: Disclosure held on 5/12/2010. Time: 2 minutes (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 100 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: 5/10/2010 OrderCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER -- The case is trial ready as of 10/1/2011. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 5/10/10. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 99 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A Telephonic Conference Re: Disclosure is set for 5/12/2010 at 2:00 PM before Judge Joan G. Margolis (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 98 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: 5/5/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 93 Motion for Extension of Time, absent objection, so that all fact discovery will be completed by 11/15/10, plaintiff will disclose his expert witnesses by 11/22/10 and such experts will be deposed by 12/30/10, defendants will disclose their expert witnesses by 2/1/11 and such experts will be deposed by 3/1/11, and dispositive motions, if any, will be filed by 4/1/11, after a pre-filing conference has been held with Judge Arterton. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 5/5/10. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 97 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 3/30/2010 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
ORDER: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint 23 is granted as to Count Five and denied as to Counts One, Two, Three, and Four. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 03/30/2010. (Kretman, J.) (Entered: 03/30/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 96 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: 2/12/2010 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
ORDER granting 95 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jeffrey Allan Fritz terminated. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 2/12/10. (Tooker, A.) (Entered: 02/12/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 95 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: 2/11/2010 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
MOTION for Jeffrey A. Fritz to Withdraw as Attorney by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG. (Fritz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 94 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: 2/11/2010 Motions ReferredCourt Filing
93 MOTION for Extension of Time To Complete Discovery is referred to Magistrate Judge Margolis. (Tooker, A.) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 93 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: 2/10/2010 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION for Extension of Time To Complete Discovery Set Deadlines/Hearings by Richard Trusz. (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 02/10/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 92 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: 2/5/2010 Order on Motion for ConferenceCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 59 Motion for Conference, to the extent that these issues were addressed in a telephonic discovery conference held with this Court. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 2/5/10. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 02/05/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 91 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: 2/5/2010 Order on Motion for Protective OrderCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 60 Motion for Protective Order, to the extent previously agreed to by counsel. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 2/5/10. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 02/05/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 90 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: 2/5/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 89 Motion for Extension of Time, by agreement, so that plaintiff's brief regarding the three European deponents will be filed within fifteen days of receipt of the transcripts of the depositions of Matt Lynch and Thomas O'Shea. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 2/5/10. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 02/05/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 89 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: 2/4/2010 Motion for Extension of Time
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Brief Regarding Depositions of Individuals Who Reside and Work in Europe 84 Trial Memo, by Richard Trusz. (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 02/04/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 88 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: 1/25/2010 Exhibit
Amended EXHIBIT E, to Trial Memo by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG re 84 Trial Memo,. (Ritter, David) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 87 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: 1/22/2010 Exhibit
Amended EXHIBIT D by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG re 84 Trial Memo,. (Ritter, David) (Entered: 01/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 86 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: 1/22/2010 Exhibit
Amended EXHIBIT C by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG re 84 Trial Memo,. (Ritter, David) (Entered: 01/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 85 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: 1/22/2010 OrderCourt Filing
RULING Regarding Potential In Camera Review of European Personnel Records: defendants need not produce the personnel files of John Fraser, Mario Cueni, and Paul Marcuse at this time, without prejudice to the plaintiff. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 1/22/10. (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 01/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 84 Filed: 1/20/2010, Entered: 1/20/2010 Trial Memo
MEMORANDUM re Argument Against Depositions of Europe-based Employees by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, 01/15/10 email, # 2 Exhibit B, Organizational Chart, # 3 Exhibit C, Cueni declaration, # 4 Exhibit D, Fraser Declaration, # 5 Exhibit E, Marcuse Declaration, # 6 Exhibit F, Notice of 30B6 deposition)(Ritter, David) . (Entered: 01/20/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 83 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: 1/19/2010 Trial Memo
Supplemental TRIAL Brief in Further Support of Argument Against Production of Swiss and English Personnel Files by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 82 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: 1/15/2010 Response
ENTERED IN ERROR: RESPONSE -- Defendants' Reply Brief in Further Support of Their Argument Against the Production of Swiss and English Personnel Files filed by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG. (Ritter, David) Modified on 1/19/2010 (Brown, S.). (Entered: 01/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 81 Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: 1/14/2010 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joan G. Margolis: Telephonic Discovery Conference held on 1/11/2010. Time: 30 minutes (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 01/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 80 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: 1/13/2010 Response
RESPONSE re Docket Annotation, 78 MOTION -- Defendants' Memorandum of Law Addressing Swiss and English Legal Issues as They Relate to Production of Personnel Files filed by Richard Trusz. (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 79 Filed: 1/12/2010, Entered: 1/12/2010 Memorandum of ConferenceCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM of Discovery Conference. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 1/12/10. (Torday, B.) (Entered: 01/12/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 78 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: 1/8/2010 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Defendants' Memorandum of Law Addressing Swiss and English Legal Issues as They Relate to Production of Personnel Files by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG. (Ritter, David) Modified on 1/11/2010 (Bauer, J.). (Entered: 01/08/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 77 Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: 1/5/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 74 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 1/4/10. (Torday, B.) (Entered: 01/05/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 76 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: 1/5/2010 Notice of Additional Authority
NOTICE OF ADDITIONAL AUTHORITY by Richard Trusz re 23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Richard Trusz; correcting event in doc. #73. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Inferrera, L.) (Entered: 01/05/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 75 Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: 1/4/2010 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A Telephonic Discovery Conference is set for 1/11/2010 at 03:00 PM before Judge Joan G. Margolis. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the conference call (203)773-2350. (Watson, M.) (Entered: 01/04/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 74 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: 12/30/2009 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION for Extension of Time To File Brief Addressing European Law 71 Order,, by Richard Trusz. (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 12/30/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 73 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: 12/28/2009 Notice (Other)
ENTERED IN ERROR: NOTICE by Richard Trusz re 23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Notice Re: Legal Issues Raised by Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A., # 2 Exhibit B.)(Steigman, Todd) Modified on 1/5/2010 (Inferrera, L.). (Entered: 12/28/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 72 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: 12/22/2009 OrderCourt Filing
Ruling Following partial In Camera Review: The only relevant document in Mr. Taylor's personnel file is the five-page Feedback Report 2008. The only relevant documents in Mr. Gould's file are an email, dated April 30, 2002 and the five page Feedback Report 2008. Defendants shall produce copies of these three documents to plaintiff's counsel on or before January 5, 2010 subject to the same safeguards agreed upon by counsel.... Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 12/21/09. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 12/22/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 71 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: 12/21/2009 OrderCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER -- In accordance with the request of defense counsel in his letter, dated 12/18/09, with respect to the personnel files of John Fraser, Mario Cueni, and Paul Marcuse, counsel have until 1/8/10 to attempt to resolve the issue regarding production thereof, or, in the absence of any agreement, to file simultaneous briefs (not to exceed ten pages) on whether production would violate English or Swiss privacy law. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 12/21/09. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 12/21/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 70 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Response
RESPONSE re 59 MOTION for Discovery Telephone Conference filed by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG. (Ritter, David) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 69 Filed: 12/17/2009, Entered: 12/17/2009 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to MotionCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 68 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply until 1/15/10, absent objection. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 12/17/09.(Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 12/17/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 68 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: 12/16/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 60 MOTION for Protective Order until 01/15/2010 by Richard Trusz. (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 12/16/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 67 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: 12/16/2009 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 66 Motion for Extension of Time until 2/15/10. Counsel are to confer with each other and submit a proposed Amended Scheduling Order. (See Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, filed 12/1/09 (Dkt. #61), at 25). THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 12/16/09. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 12/16/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 66 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: 12/15/2009 Motion for Extension of Time
First MOTION for Extension of Time until 02/15/2010 to respond and/or object to 2nd Set of Reqs for Production by Richard Trusz. (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 12/15/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 65 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: 12/10/2009 Order on Motion to QuashCourt Filing
ORDER granting 52 Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 12/10/09. (Brown, S.) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 64 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: 12/9/2009 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY to Response to 52 MOTION to Quash Seven of Plaintiff's Subpoenas Duces Tecum filed by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fritz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/09/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 63 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: 12/4/2009 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joan G. Margolis for Rulings on including 60 MOTION for Protective Order, 59 MOTION for Discovery Telephone Conference and the 52 MOTION to Quash Seven of Plaintiff's Subpoenas Duces Tecum was previously referred. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 12/4/09. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Pesta, J.) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 62 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: 12/2/2009 Docket Annotation
Docket Entry Correction re 61 Ruling on Motion to Compel. Added corrected PDF document. (Rodko, B.) (Entered: 12/02/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 61 Filed: 12/1/2009, Entered: 12/1/2009 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
RULING: granted by agreement with respect to Request for Production 40 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 12/1/09. (Rodko, B.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/2/2009: # 1 Main Document) (Rodko, B.). (Entered: 12/01/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 60 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: 11/25/2009 Motion for Protective Order
MOTION for Protective Order by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG.Responses due by 12/16/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A thru D)(Ritter, David) (Entered: 11/25/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 59 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: 11/25/2009 Motion for Conference
MOTION for Discovery Telephone Conference by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 11/25/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 58 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: 11/24/2009 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Memorandum in Opposition re 52 MOTION to Quash Seven of Plaintiff's Subpoenas Duces Tecum filed by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3, # 2 Exhibit 4, # 3 Exhibit 5)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 11/24/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 57 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: 11/20/2009 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to MotionCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 56 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply until 11/24/09, absent objection. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 11/20/09.(Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 56 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: 11/20/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 52 MOTION to Quash Seven of Plaintiff's Subpoenas Duces Tecum until November 24, 2009 by Richard Trusz. (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 55 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: 11/4/2009 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joan G. Margolis for ruling on 40 First MOTION to Compel, 52 MOTION to Quash Seven of Plaintiff's Subpoenas Duces Tecum. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 11/3/09. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Spielberg, N.) (Entered: 11/04/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 54 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: 11/2/2009 Order on Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
ORDER: For the reasons set forth on the record on November 2, 2009, Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Sur-reply 34 is denied. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 11/2/2009. (Kretman, J.) (Entered: 11/02/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 53 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: 10/30/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
Memorandum in Support re 52 MOTION to Quash Seven of Plaintiff's Subpoenas Duces Tecum filed by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Part I, # 2 Exhibit Part II, # 3 Exhibit Part III, # 4 Exhibit Part IV)(Ritter, David) (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/3/2011) (Gutierrez, Y.). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/3/2011: # 5 Exhibit 2 - Sealed Tab B) (Gutierrez, Y.). (Entered: 10/30/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 52 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: 10/30/2009 Motion to Quash
MOTION to Quash Seven of Plaintiff's Subpoenas Duces Tecum by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG.Responses due by 11/20/2009 (Ritter, David) (Entered: 10/30/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 51 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: 10/29/2009 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY to Response to 40 First MOTION to Compel filed by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3, # 2 Exhibit 4)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 50 Filed: 10/27/2009, Entered: 10/27/2009 Status Report
STATUS REPORT Plaintiff's Status Report by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 10/27/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 49 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: 10/26/2009 Status Report
STATUS REPORT -- Defendants' Status Update by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG. (Ritter, David) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 48 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: 10/20/2009 Response
RESPONSE re 40 First MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG. (Ritter, David) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 47 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: 10/19/2009 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 45 Motion for Extension of Time to Disclose Expert Witnesses, with consent, to and including 30 days following ruling on motion to compel; granting 46 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Compel, with consent, to and including 10/20/09. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 10/16/09. (Tooker, A.) (Entered: 10/19/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 46 Filed: 10/16/2009, Entered: 10/16/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 40 First MOTION to Compel until October 20, 2009 by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG. (Ritter, David) (Entered: 10/16/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 45 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: 10/15/2009 Motion for Extension of Time
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time To Disclose Expert Witnesses by Richard Trusz. (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 10/15/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 44 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: 10/9/2009 Protective OrderCourt Filing
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 10/7/09. (Spielberg, N.) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 43 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: 10/8/2009 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to MotionCourt Filing
ORDER granting 41 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Compel, with consent to and including 10/16/09; granting 42 Motion for Extension of Time, with consent, to and including 10/12/09. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 10/8/09. (Tooker, A.) (Entered: 10/08/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 42 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: 10/5/2009 Motion for Extension of Time
Second MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/12/2009 (consented to) to respond to discovery 39 Order on Motion for Extension of Time by Richard Trusz. (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 41 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: 10/5/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 40 First MOTION to Compel until October 16, 2009 by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG. (Ritter, David) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 40 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: 9/15/2009 Motion to Compel
First MOTION to Compel by Richard Trusz.Responses due by 10/6/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Memo in Support of Motion to Compel, # 2 Exhibit A., # 3 Exhibit B., # 4 Exhibit C., # 5 Exhibit D., # 6 Exhibit E., # 7 Exhibit F., # 8 Exhibit G., # 9 Exhibit H., # 10 Exhibit I., # 11 Exhibit J., # 12 Exhibit K., # 13 Exhibit L., # 14 Exhibit M., # 15 Exhibit N.)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 39 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: 9/1/2009 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
ORDER granting 38 Motion for Extension of Time 10/05/2009 to respond to discovery. Signed by Clerk on 9/1/09. (Bauer, J.) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 38 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: 8/31/2009 Motion for Extension of Time
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/05/2009 to respond and/or object to discovery by Richard Trusz. (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 37 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: 8/28/2009 Proposed Order
PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Stipulated Protective Order by Richard Trusz, UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG. (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 36 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: 5/29/2009 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY to Response to 34 MOTION for Leave to File Attached Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Richard Trusz. (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 05/29/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 35 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: 5/29/2009 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Memorandum in Opposition re 34 MOTION for Leave to File Attached Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply and Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Sur-Reply)(Ritter, David) (Entered: 05/29/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 34 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: 5/27/2009 Motion for Leave to File
MOTION for Leave to File Attached Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 33 Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: 5/22/2009 Amended Complaint
AMENDED COMPLAINT Request for Leave to Amend with Amended Complaint attached against UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG, filed by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Third Amended Complaint)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 05/22/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 32 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: 5/21/2009 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
ORDER granting in part 30 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, not to exceed 20 pages total. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 5/21/09. (Tooker, A.) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 31 Filed: 5/18/2009, Entered: 5/18/2009 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY to Response to 23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Unreported Cases)(Alkhas, Nineveh) (Entered: 05/18/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 30 Filed: 5/18/2009, Entered: 5/18/2009 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG. (Alkhas, Nineveh) (Entered: 05/18/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 29 Filed: 5/8/2009, Entered: 5/8/2009 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Memorandum in Opposition re 23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A. Unreported Cases, # 2 Exhibit B. OSHA-SOX Complaint, # 3 Exhibit C. State Court Complaint, # 4 Exhibit D. Bloomberg Article)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 05/08/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 28 Filed: 4/30/2009, Entered: 4/30/2009 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER:Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/2/2009 03:30 PM before Judge Janet Bond Arterton. Amended Pleadings due by 6/30/2009. Discovery due by 2/15/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 3/15/2010. Trial Ready Date 9/1/2010. Trial Brief due by 4/1/2010. Parties status reports shall be filed five days prior to the status conference. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 4/29/2009. (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 04/30/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 27 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: 4/29/2009 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 04/29/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 26 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: 4/21/2009 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Corporate Disclosure Statement by UBS AG. (Ritter, David) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 25 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: 4/21/2009 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Corporate Disclosure Statement by UBS Rlty Investor LLC. (Ritter, David) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 24 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: 4/17/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
Memorandum in Support re 23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-C, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit D-E)(Ritter, David) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 23 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: 4/17/2009 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG.Responses due by 5/8/2009 (Ritter, David) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 22 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: 4/3/2009 Amended Complaint
AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against all defendants, filed by Richard Trusz.(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 04/03/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 21 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: 4/2/2009 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
Scheduling/Endorsement ORDER denying 18 Motion to Stay without prejudice to renew by 4/17/2009. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 3/30/2009. (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 04/02/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 20 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: 3/24/2009 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by David B. Ritter on behalf of UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG (Ritter, David) (Entered: 03/24/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 19 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: 3/24/2009 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Nineveh Alkhas on behalf of UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG (Alkhas, Nineveh) (Entered: 03/24/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 18 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: 3/17/2009 Motion to Stay
MOTION to Stay by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG.Responses due by 4/2/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit)(Falcone, K.) (Entered: 03/17/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 17 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: 3/16/2009 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
ORDER denying 10 Motion to Dismiss, without prejudice to renew, for failure to comply with pre-filing conference requirement. Granting 15 Motion for Pre-Filing Conference. A telephonic pre-filing conference will be held March 30, 2009 at 1:00 p.m. Defense counsel shall initiate the conference call. Chambers: 203-773-2456. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 3/16/2009. (Tooker, A.) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 16 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: 3/16/2009 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Memorandum in Opposition re 15 MOTION to Waive Pre-Filing Conference or, in the Alternative, for Pre-Filing Conference filed by Richard Trusz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 15 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: 3/13/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION to Waive Pre-Filing Conference or, in the Alternative, for Pre-Filing Conference by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG.Responses due by 4/3/2009 (Fritz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 14 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: 3/13/2009 Order on Motion to Appear
ORDER granting 12 Motion for David Ritter and Nineveh to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 3/13/2009. (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 13 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: 3/13/2009 Docket Annotation
Docket Entry Correction to add the Motions to the Affidavits previously docketed re 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney David Ritter. Filing Fee $25.00. Receipt Number NO26991. (Attachments: # 1 Motion) (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
Request RequestSpace
Need legal research help? Let us know!
PACER 12 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: 3/13/2009 Motion to Appear
MOTION for Leave for David Ritter and Nineveh Alkhas to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee $50.00 by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG.. Receipt Numbers NO26991 and NO26990. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit David Ritter)(Falcone, K.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2009: # 2 Motion, # 3 Motion) (Falcone, K.). (Entered: 03/13/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 11 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: 3/12/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
Memorandum in Support re 10 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Stay Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R)(Fritz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/12/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 10 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: 3/12/2009 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss and/or Stay Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG.Responses due by 4/2/2009 (Fritz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/12/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 9 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: 3/9/2009 Summons Returned Executed
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Trusz. UBS Rlty Investor LLC served on 2/18/2009, answer due 3/10/2009. (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 03/09/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 8 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: 3/9/2009 Summons Returned Executed
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Trusz. UBS AG served on 2/18/2009, answer due 3/10/2009. (Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 03/09/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 7 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: 3/5/2009 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Allan Fritz on behalf of UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG (Fritz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/05/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 6 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: 3/5/2009 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria Woodin Chavey on behalf of UBS Rlty Investor LLC, UBS AG (Chavey, Victoria) (Entered: 03/05/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 5 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: 2/27/2009 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by William G. Madsen on behalf of Richard Trusz (Madsen, William) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 4 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: 2/27/2009 Amended Complaint
AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Richard Trusz.(Steigman, Todd) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 3 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: 2/17/2009 Electronic Filing OrderCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER: Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 02/13/09. (Grady, B.) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 2 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: 2/17/2009 Order on Pretrial Deadlines
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 05/13/09. Amended Pleadings due by 4/14/2009; Discovery due by 8/15/2009; Dispositive Motions due by 9/14/2009. Signed by Clerk on 02/13/09. (Grady, B.) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 1 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: 2/17/2009 Complaint
COMPLAINT against UBS Rlty Investors LLC, UBS AG ( Filing fee $350 receipt number H027578) filed by Richard Trusz.(Grady, B.) Modified on 2/18/2009 to correct the parties name (Grady, B.). (Entered: 02/17/2009)
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 330 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?