Stonecrafters Inc v. Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc
Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 3:08-cv-06992
District Judge P. Michael Mahoney, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.ilnd.3-08-cv-06992 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
The right information can save you thousands of dollars.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Americana Art China Co., Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Anderson & Wanca

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David Max Oppenheim +1 847 368 1500 +1 847 368 1501 doppenheim@andersonwanca.com
No Logo Stone Crafters, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Anderson & Wanca

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jonathan Earl Irwin +1 847 368 1500 jirwin@andersonwanca.com
Brian John Wanca +1 847 368 1500 +1 847 368 1501 bwanca@andersonwanca.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bock and Hatch LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Tod Allen Lewis +1 312 658 5500 +1 312 658 5555 tod@bockhatchllc.com
Louis Carey Ludwig +1 312 609 0908 louis@bockhatchllc.com
James Michael Smith +1 312 658 5500 +1 312 658 5555 jim@bockhatchllc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cicero & France

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Andrew T Smith +1 815 226 7700 ats@cicerofrance.com
No Logo Foxfire Printing And Packaging, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Coleman Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Jerry Scott Menge +1 312 444 1000 jmenge@colemanlawfirm.com
Eugene J. Schiltz +1 312 444 1000 +4441 444 444 1028 eschiltz@colemanlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Litchfield Cavo

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ALAN I. BECKER +1 312 781 6622 becker@litchfieldcavo.com
Laura Milnichuk +1 312 781 6672 milnichuk@litchfieldcavo.com
Lauren Marie Penn +1 312 781 6609 penn@litchfieldcavo.com
Erin Anne Potempa +1 312 781 6570 potempa@litchfieldcavo.com
Stephanie Wing Tipton +1 312 781 6636 +1 312 781 6630 tipton@litchfieldcavo.com
No Logo Continental Casualty Company, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Katherine Streicher Arnold +1 312 627 4000 karnold@tsmp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carroll McNulty & Kull LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Heather Elizabeth Simpson +1 908 848 6300 hsimpson@cmk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by CNA Insurance

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Barrett Arnold Breitung +1 312 822 5047 barrett.breitung@cna.com
David Eugene Trainor +1 312 822 6045 +1 312 817 2486 David.Trainor@cna.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 890 Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (248) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
Need legal research help? Let us know!
PACER 250 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
OPINION from the USCA for the 7th Circuit; Argued 11/13/13; Decided 2/18/14 in USCA case no. 13-2569. (jp, ) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 249 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
MANDATE of USCA dated 2/18/2014 regarding notice of appeal 241 ; USCA No. 13-2569: The judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED, with costs, in accordance with the decision of this court entered on this date. (jp, ) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 248 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
CERTIFIED copy of order dated 3/25/14 from the Seventh Circuit regarding notice of appeal 241 ; Appellate case no. : 13-2569 : It is, therefore, ORDERED that rehearing and rehearing en banc are DENIED. (jp, ) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 247 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
LETTER from the USCA regarding the record on appeal in USCA no. 13-2569 ; no record to be returned. (jp, ) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 246 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None
TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit the long record on appeal 241 (USCA no. 13-2569) consisting of 13 Volumes of Electronic Pleadings ("Binder 2") and 1 Volume of Electronic Transcripts ("Binder 3"). Sent on CD via UPS, tracking number 1Z6E25200393587134 due to case size. (jp, ) (Entered: 10/17/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 245 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 5-9-13 before the Honorable Frederick J. Kapala. Court Reporter Contact Information: mary_lindbloom@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 10/11/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/21/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/19/2013. (Lindbloom, Mary) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 244 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 1-4-13 before the Honorable Frederick J. Kapala. Court Reporter Contact Information: mary_lindbloom@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 10/11/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/21/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/19/2013. (Lindbloom, Mary) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 243 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
CIRCUIT Rule 3(c) Notice (pg, ) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 242 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal 241 . Electronic Notices (jat, ) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 241 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of appeal by Americana Art China Co., Inc. regarding orders 239 Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0752-8548602. (Oppenheim, David) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PDF 240 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
Final Approval ORDER And Judgment regarding, 239 , Case Terminated Signed by the Honorable Frederick J. Kapala on 6/19/2013:(pg, ) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
PACER 239 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Frederick J. Kapala: Defendant's motion for severance of fee determination and for final approval of class settlement 232 is granted. Plaintiff's motion for attorney fees and expenses 236 is granted in part. Presentment of these motions is canceled. The clerk is directed to enter the Final Approval Order and Judgment. [ For further details see text below.]Docketing mailed notice (pg, ) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 238 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Americana Art China Co., Inc. to MOTION by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc to sever Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging, Inc.'s Motion for Severance of Fee Determination and for Final Approval on Class Settlement 232 (Oppenheim, David) (Entered: 06/10/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 237 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by David Max Oppenheim for presentment of motion for attorney fees 236 before Honorable Frederick J. Kapala on 6/21/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Oppenheim, David) (Entered: 06/10/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 236 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Americana Art China Co., Inc. for attorney fees and expenses (Amended) (Oppenheim, David) (Entered: 06/10/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 235 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Intervenor Defendant Continental Casualty Company to motion to sever 232 (Simpson, Heather) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 234 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Eugene J. Schiltz for presentment of motion to sever 232 before Honorable Frederick J. Kapala on 6/21/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Schiltz, Eugene) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 233 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc in support of motion to sever 232 Brief in Support of Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging, Inc.'s Motion for Severance of Fee Determination and for Final Approval on Class Settlement (Schiltz, Eugene) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 232 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc to sever Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging, Inc.'s Motion for Severance of Fee Determination and for Final Approval on Class Settlement (Schiltz, Eugene) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 231 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Frederick J. Kapala: Plaintiff's motion for attorney's fees and expenses 229 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended motion for attorney's fees and expenses within 30 days of this order. The court reserves ruling on the fairness of the class settlement.[ For further details see text below.] Docketing mailed notice (pg, ) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 230 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Frederick J. Kapala: Final approval hearing held. Matter taken under advisement.Electronic notice(sb, ) (jmm-r, ). (Entered: 05/21/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 229 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM (Supplemental) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Bock & Hatch, LLC Attorney Biographies, # 2 Exhibit B - Anderson + Wanca Attorney Biographies)(Bock, Phillip) Modified on 5/10/2013 (jat, ). [IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND EXPENSES] (Entered: 05/09/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 228 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None
Brief in support of final approval of class action settlement by Americana Art China Co., Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order A - proposed Final Approval Order, # 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Nancy Johnson)(Bock, Phillip) (Entered: 05/02/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 227 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
AMENDED Exhibit A (Settlement Agreement) to Doc 220 (Pltf's 2nd Amended Mtn for Preliminary Approval) (Oppenheim, David) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 226 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None
ORDER regarding, 225 Signed by the Honorable Frederick J. Kapala on 1/10/2013:(pg, ) (Entered: 01/10/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 225 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Frederick J. Kapala: Enter ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING THE CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND APPROVING THE CLASS NOTICE. Opt out notices, objections, and motions to intervene due March 1, 2013. Memoranda by any class member in connection with objections, motions to intervene, or the Final Approval Hearing, due April 15, 2013. Final Approval Hearing set for 9:30 a.m. on May 9, 2013.Docketing mailed notice (pg, ) (Entered: 01/10/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 224 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Frederick J. Kapala: Status hearing held. Plaintiff's second amended motion for preliminary approval of proposed class action settlement 220 is granted as stated in open court. Plaintiff to submit a revised proposed order for preliminary approval of class action with changes as stated in open court, along with a copy of a revised notice to the class members. Final approval hearing set for 9:30 a.m. on May 9, 2013.Docketing mailed notice (pg, ) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 223 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Frederick J. Kapala: The parties' agreed motions to withdraw 204 206 218 222 are granted. As a result, plaintiff's previous motion for preliminary approval 150 is withdrawn; defendant's motion for reconsideration 187 is denied as moot and the stay previously entered by this court is lifted; and Hartford's motions to intervene 210 212 are withdrawn. In light of plaintiff's second amended motion for preliminary approval of proposed class action settlement 220 , plaintiffs previous motion for preliminary approval 208 is denied as moot. Hearing on plaintiff's motion 220 remains set for 1/4/2013 at 9:00 a.m.Docketing mailed notice (pg, ) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 222 Filed: 12/31/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Intervenor Defendant Hartford Casualty Insurance Company to withdraw motion to intervene, 210 (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Motion to Withdraw 11/29/12 Motion to Intervene, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Parker, Paul) (Entered: 12/31/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 221 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Phillip A. Bock for presentment of motion for settlement, motion to certify class, motion to approve consent judgment,,,,,, 220 before Honorable Frederick J. Kapala on 1/4/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Bock, Phillip) (Entered: 12/28/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 220 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Americana Art China Co., Inc. for settlement (class action), MOTION by Plaintiff Americana Art China Co., Inc. to certify class (for settlement purposes), MOTION by Plaintiff Americana Art China Co., Inc. to approve consent judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement with exhibits 1 and 2, # 2 Text of Proposed Order B - Proposed preliminary approval order, # 3 Text of Proposed Order C - Proposed final approval order)(Bock, Phillip) (Entered: 12/28/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 219 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION regarding motion to withdraw, motion for relief 218 (Ruggeri, James) (Entered: 12/28/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 218 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Intervenor Defendant Hartford Casualty Insurance Company to withdraw motion to intervene, 210 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ruggeri, James) (Entered: 12/28/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 217 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Frederick J. Kapala: The clerk is directed to issue a $50 refund to James P. Ruggeri, Shipman & Goodwin LLP 1133 Connecticut Avenue, NW Suite 300 Washington, DC 20036, for overpayment of his fee to appear pro hoc vice. Docketing mailed notice (jat, ) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 216 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Frederick J. Kapala: Plaintiff's agreed motion for extension of time 215 is granted. Response to Hartford's pending motion to intervene due 12/28/2012. Status hearing on pending motions reset from 12/28/2012 to 1/4/2013 at 9:00 a.m.Docketing mailed notice (pg, ) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 215 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Americana Art China Co., Inc. for extension of time Agreed (Wanca, Brian) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 214 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: None
REQUEST for Clerk of Court to refund filing fee in the amount of 50.00, receipt no. 7800554, (Ruggeri, James) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 213 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Frederick J. Kapala: James Ruggeri's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice 211 is granted. John Williams' motion for leave to appear pro hac vice 200 is granted. Motion to intervene 212 filed. Response due December 21, 2012. Status hearing on pending motions set for 9:00 a.m. on December 28, 2012.Docketing mailed notice (pg, ) (Entered: 12/04/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 212 Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Intervenor Defendant Hartford Casualty Insurance Company to intervene Corporate Disclosure attachment to Motion to Intervene Docket No. 210 (Parker, Paul) (Entered: 11/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 211 Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0752-7800554. (Ruggeri, James) (Entered: 11/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 210 Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Intervenor Defendant Hartford Casualty Insurance Company to intervene Memorandum in Support of Motion (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Hartford Casualty Insurance Company's Motion to Intervene, # 2 Hartford Casualty Insurance Company's Motion to Intervene, # 3 Proposed Order on Hartford Casualty Insurance Company's Motion to Intervene, # 4 Appearance of Counsel for Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parker, Paul) (Entered: 11/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 209 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Phillip A. Bock for presentment of motion to approve consent judgment, motion to certify class, motion for settlement,,,,,, 208 before Honorable Frederick J. Kapala on 11/30/2012 at 09:00 AM. (Bock, Phillip) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 208 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Americana Art China Co., Inc. to approve consent judgment (preliminary approval), MOTION by Plaintiff Americana Art China Co., Inc. to certify class (for settlement), MOTION by Plaintiff Americana Art China Co., Inc. for settlement (preliminary approval) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Signed settlement agreement with exhibits, # 2 Exhibit B - Second Expert of Robert Biggerstaff (without exhibit), # 3 Affidavit C - Affidavit of John Ferretti (without exhibits))(Bock, Phillip) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 207 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Phillip A. Bock for presentment of motion to withdraw, motion for relief, 206 before Honorable Frederick J. Kapala on 11/30/2012 at 09:00 AM. (Bock, Phillip) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 206 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Americana Art China Co., Inc. to withdraw notice of motion 149 , notice of motion 151 (Agreed Motion to Withdraw Motion for Approval of Settlement filed October 14, 2011) (Bock, Phillip) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 205 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Phillip A. Bock for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, motion to stay, motion for relief,,,,,,,,,,,, 204 before Honorable Frederick J. Kapala on 11/30/2012 at 09:00 AM. (Bock, Phillip) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 204 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Americana Art China Co., Inc., Intervenor Defendant Continental Casualty Company, Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Incintervention and lift stay (Joint Submission), MOTION by Plaintiff Americana Art China Co., Inc., Intervenor Defendant Continental Casualty Company, Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc to stay regarding memorandum in support of motion 188 , MOTION by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc for reconsideration regarding order on motion to intervene, terminate motions, set/clear flags,,, 186 187 , memorandum in opposition to motion 191 (Bock, Phillip) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 203 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE by Americana Art China Co., Inc. filing attached Affidavit of John Ferretti with exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of John Ferretti dated 10/23/12 with exhibits)(Bock, Phillip) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 202 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE by Americana Art China Co., Inc. filing attached Second Expert Report of Robert Biggerstaff (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Second Expert Report of Robert Biggerstaff)(Bock, Phillip) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 201 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc by Allison Renee Grow (Grow, Allison) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 200 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7764535. (Williams, John) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 199 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None
STATUS Report by Americana Art China Co., Inc. (Oppenheim, David) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 198 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Frederick J. Kapala: Plaintiff Americana Art China Co., Inc.'s motion for joinder 192 is granted, and the motion for reconsideration is under advisement. However, plaintiff has failed to provide the court with a written status report by 11/1/2012, as previously ordered, and the court's review of the docket sheet in the declaratory judgment action, Case No. 1:11-cv-01172-GMS-SRF in the District of Delaware, reveals that the parties may have reached a settlement in this matter. Before the court proceeds any further, the parties are directed to file a status report as to any potential settlement on or before 11/15/2012.Docketing mailed notice (pg, ) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 197 Filed: 7/28/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Intervenor Defendant Continental Casualty Company to other 196 Plaintiff's Supplemental Authority (Carroll, Christopher) (Entered: 07/28/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 196 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
Notice of Supplemental Persuasive Authority in Support of the Pending Motion to Reconsider by Americana Art China Co., Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - King Memorandum & Opinion)(Oppenheim, David) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 195 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None
REPLY by Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc to memorandum in opposition to motion 191 Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging, Inc.'s Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Reconsideration of Order of April 30, 2012 (Schiltz, Eugene) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 194 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Intervenor Defendant Continental Casualty Company to motion for joinder 192 (Carroll, Christopher) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 193 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None
Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging, Inc.'s Notice of Correction to the Court by Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Schiltz, Eugene) (Entered: 06/28/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 192 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Americana Art China Co., Inc. for joinder in Foxfire's Motion to Reconsider (Oppenheim, David) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 191 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Continental Casualty Company in Opposition to motion for reconsideration, motion for relief,, 187 (Simpson, Heather) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 190 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Frederick J. Kapala: Defendant's motion for reconsideration 187 is taken under advisement. Any interested party to file a response by 6/15/2012. Defendant's reply, if any, to be filed by 6/29/2012. Presentment of the motion, currently scheduled for 5/18/2012, is canceled.Docketing mailed notice (pg, ) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 189 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Eugene J. Schiltz for presentment of motion for reconsideration, motion for relief,, 187 before Honorable Frederick J. Kapala on 5/18/2012 at 09:00 AM. (Schiltz, Eugene) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 188 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc in support of motion for reconsideration, motion for relief,, 187 (Schiltz, Eugene) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 187 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc for reconsideration regarding order on motion to intervene, terminate motions, set/clear flags,,, 186 (Schiltz, Eugene) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 186 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Frederick J. Kapala: Continental Casualty Company's motion to intervene and to stay 163 is granted. This case is stayed until the currently pending declaratory judgment actions regarding potential insurance coverage have all been resolved. Plaintiff is directed to provide a written status report on or before 11/1/2012 and, if necessary, every six monthsthereafter.Docketing mailed notice(pg, ) (pg, ). (Entered: 04/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 185 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 2-1-12 before the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney. Court Reporter Contact Information: mary_lindbloom@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/12/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/20/2012. (Lindbloom, Mary) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 184 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Frederick J. Kapala: Defendant's motion for a status conference 182 is denied. Continental Casualty Companys motion to intervene and to stay has been taken under advisement and will be ruled upon in due course. Because it appears that the magistrate judge will have to recuse himself if the court grants the motion to intervene, all proceedings on the proposed settlement, including the fairness hearing, are stayed pending this courts ruling. Motion to certify class 119 filed by the former plaintiff is denied as moot. This case is removed from this court's 3/16/2012 motioncall.Docketing mailed notice (pg, ) (Entered: 03/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 183 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Eugene J. Schiltz for presentment of motion for hearing 182 before Honorable Frederick J. Kapala on 3/16/2012 at 09:00 AM. (Schiltz, Eugene) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 182 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc for hearing Foxfire's Unopposed Motion for a Status Conference (Schiltz, Eugene) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 181 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Brian J. Wanca re Notice Requirement of the Class Action Fairness Act (Wanca, Brian) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 180 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: The Magistrate Judge is disqualified from ruling on Continental Casualty Company's motion to intervene and to stay 163 . The motion is referred to the District Court.[For further details see text below.]Notice mailed by Judicial Staff (pg, ) (Entered: 02/14/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 179 Filed: 2/8/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Intervenor Defendant Continental Casualty Company to order on motion for order, in court hearing, terminate hearings, set/reset hearings 178 regarding Potential Conflict (Simpson, Heather) (Entered: 02/08/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 178 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Fairness hearing held on 2/1/2012. Potential intervenor given to 2/8/12 to submit material regarding potential conflict. Fairness hearing set for 3/27/2012 at 01:30 PM. (glg, ) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 177 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
notice regarding 4 exclusion requests and 0 objections by Americana Art China Co., Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - copies of exclusion requests)(Bock, Phillip) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 176 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Ross Good Re: Mailing of Class Notice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Class Notice, # 2 Exhibit B - List of addresses)(Wanca, Brian) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 175 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM text entry,, 171 by Continental Casualty Company regarding Magistrate Jurisdiction (Simpson, Heather) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 174 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Intervenor Defendant Continental Casualty Company by Heather Elizabeth Simpson (Simpson, Heather) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 173 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Intervenor Defendant Continental Casualty Company by Christopher Robert Carroll (Carroll, Christopher) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 172 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Joint Memorandum in Support of Jurisdiction by the Magistrate Judge by Americana Art China Co., Inc., Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc (Oppenheim, David) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 171 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: On October 4, 2011, this case was transferred to the Magistrate Judge pursuant to the joint consent of the parties. The transfer occurred to allow the Magistrate Judge to conduct settlement proceedings pursuant to a proposed class settlement. The parties and the potential intervenor are given to 2/1/2012 to file any authority indicating whether the consent to proceeding before the Magistrate Judge remains valid in light of the potential intervenor's motion to intervene and to stay the settlement proceedings.Notice mailed by Judicial Staff (pg, ) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 170 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None
REPLY by Intervenor Defendant Continental Casualty Company to motion to intervene 163 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Trainor, David) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 169 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Americana Art China Co., Inc. by David Max Oppenheim (Oppenheim, David) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 168 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Americana Art China Co., Inc., Foxfire Printing and Packaging Incin Opposition to MOTION by Intervenor Defendant Continental Casualty Company to intervene 163 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Oppenheim, David) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 167 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Continental's Motion to intervene 163 is taken under advisement. Set deadlines as to motion to intervene 163 : Responses due by 1/6/2012 Replies due by 1/17/2012. If a party is not going to file a brief in response or reply, it is the obligation of that party, within the time frame established by this order, to so notify the court in writing. Mailed notice (glg, ) (Entered: 12/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 166 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Intervenor Defendant Continental Casualty Company by Katherine Streicher Arnold (Arnold, Katherine) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 165 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Continental Casualty Company in support of motion to intervene 163 (Trainor, David) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 164 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by David Eugene Trainor for presentment of motion to intervene 163 before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 12/23/2011 at 01:30 PM. (Trainor, David) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 163 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
MOTION by Intervenor Defendant Continental Casualty Company to intervene (Trainor, David) Modified on 12/15/2011 (jat, ). [and TO STAY] (Entered: 12/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 162 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Continental Casualty Company (Trainor, David) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 161 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Intervenor Defendant Continental Casualty Company by David Eugene Trainor (Trainor, David) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 160 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Intervenor Defendant Continental Casualty Company by Barrett Arnold Breitung (Breitung, Barrett) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 159 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
Notice of wish to be excluded from the class action by Gazebo Works Too, Inc. (jat, ) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 158 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
Opt Out Of Class Action Settlement by Leroy Allgyer (pg, ) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 156 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None
Notice of Correction by Americana Art China Co., Inc. (Oppenheim, David) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 155 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Andrew Barnett (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Class Notice Document)(Kelly, Ryan) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 154 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None
ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING THE CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND APPROVING TOE CLASS NOTICE Signed by the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 10/24/2011:(pg, ) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 153 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Enter order preliminarily approving the class action settlement and approving the class notice. Fairness hearing set for 2/1/2012 at 10:00 AM. Mailed notice (glg, ) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 152 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Plaintiff's motion to substitute Americana Art China Co., Inc., as a new class representative and for voluntary dismissal of Stonecrafters, Inc., as a party plaintiff 148 is granted. Preliminary Settlement hearing held. The court finds the settlement appears to be fair, just and reasonable. Class notice to be sent by October 27, 2011. Objections, motions and briefs in support to intervene and op out notices due December 14, 2011. Counsel to submit draft order for court's approval.Electronic notice (jat, ) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 151 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Brian J Wanca for presentment of motion for order 150 before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 10/19/2011 at 10:00 AM. (Wanca, Brian) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 150 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc for order Preliminarily Approving Class Action Settlement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement, # 2 Exhibit B - Ferretti Affidavit)(Wanca, Brian) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace
Need legal research help? Let us know!
PACER 149 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Brian J Wanca for presentment of motion to intervene 148 before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 10/19/2011 at 10:00 AM. (Wanca, Brian) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 148 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc to intervene / Substitute New Class Representative (Wanca, Brian) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 147 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before Honorable Frederick J. Kapala: Parties consent to exercise of jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge. This case is transferred to Magistrate P. Michael Mahoney.Notices mailed. (jat, ) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 146 Filed: 10/5/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Telephonic Discovery hearing held on 10/5/2011. Hearing on Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement set for 10/19/2011 at 10:00 AM. Telephoned notice (glg, ) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 145 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Wanca, Brian) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 144 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc by Jerry Scott Menge (Menge, Jerry) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 143 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc by Eugene J. Schiltz (Schiltz, Eugene) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 142 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Defendant's motion for leave to substitute counsel of record 140 is granted. E. Schiltz and J. Menge given leave to file their appearances and counsel from Litchfield Cavo given leave to withdraw.Electronic notice (jat, ) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 141 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Stephanie Wing Tipton for presentment of motion to substitute attorney 140 before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 9/23/2011 at 01:30 PM. (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 140 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc to substitute attorney (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 139 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Due to the court's schedule, Telephonic Discovery Hearing reset for 10/5/2011 at 09:45 AM. Mailed notice (glg, ) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 138 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None
REPLY by Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc to Response 137 In Support of 3d Motion for Class Certification (Lewis, Tod) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 137 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc to Plaintiff's THIRD MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A Thru D, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit E Thru I)(Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 136 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Telephonic Discovery hearing held on 6/30/2011. Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 10/3/2011 at 09:45 AM. Telephoned notice (glg, ) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 135 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Attorney Jonathan E. Irwin's Motion to Withdraw 129 , 133 is granted. Notice of Motion for presentment of motion to withdraw before Magistrate Judge Mahoney on 5/20/11 is stricken.Notices mailed by Judicial staff. (jat, ) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 134 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Earl Irwin for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 133 before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 5/20/2011 at 01:30 PM. (Irwin, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 133 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
MOTION by counsel for Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc to withdraw as attorney (Irwin, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 132 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before Honorable Frederick J. Kapala: Notices of motion [130 & 131] filed by Jonathan Irwin are stricken as his motion to withdraw should be presented to Magistrate Mahoney. Case removed from Judge Kapala's May 13, 2011 motion call. Attorney Irwin is directed to file an amended motion of motion setting his motion to withdraw 129 for presentment to Magistrate Mahoney instead.Telephonic notice (pg, ) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 131 Filed: 5/5/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Earl Irwin for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 129 before Honorable Frederick J. Kapala on 5/13/2011 at 09:00 AM. (Irwin, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/05/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 130 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Earl Irwin for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 129 before Honorable Frederick J. Kapala on 5/13/2011 at 09:00 AM. (Irwin, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 129 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
MOTION by counsel for Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc to withdraw as attorney (Irwin, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 128 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Plaintiff's Motion for leave to file brief in support of motion to certify class 123 is granted. Responses due by 6/30/2011 Replies due by 7/21/2011. Defendant's Motion to strike 125 is granted in part. Defendant may take 30 minute deposition of Biggersten by 5/31/11. Telephonic Discovery Hearing reset for 6/30/2011 at 09:45 AM. Mailed notice (glg, ) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 127 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc by Lauren Marie Penn (Penn, Lauren) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 126 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Stephanie Wing Tipton for presentment of motion to strike 125 before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 4/29/2011 at 01:30 PM. (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 125 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc to strike Plaintiff's Expert's Second Expert Report (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 124 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Tod Allen Lewis for presentment of motion for leave to file,,, 123 before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 4/29/2011 at 01:30 PM. (Lewis, Tod) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 123 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc for leave to file 3rd Class Cert Brief Instanter (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Exhibit Ferretti Depo, # 3 Exhibit Spencer Depo, # 4 Exhibit Light Depo, # 5 Exhibit McDaniel Depo, # 6 Exhibit Nooney Depo, # 7 Exhibit Stein Depo, # 8 Exhibit Clark depo, # 9 Exhibit Hammerl Depo, # 10 Exhibit Redacted Biggerstaff Report, # 11 Exhibit Interrogatory Responses, # 12 Exhibit Doc Responses, # 13 Exhibit RTA Answers, # 14 Exhibit GM v Finish, # 15 Exhibit Green v Servicemaster, # 16 Exhibit Sadowski v Med1, # 17 Exhibit Holtzman v Turza, # 18 Exhibit GM v Group C, # 19 Exhibit October 22 fax - Fox0377, # 20 Exhibit Fox0830-31, # 21 Exhibit Fox0852-53, # 22 Exhibit Second Biggerstaff Report)(Lewis, Tod) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 122 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Discovery hearing held on 4/8/2011. Plaintiff's Motion to certify class 119 is taken under advisement. Set deadlines as to motion to certify class 119 : Responses due by 4/29/2011 Replies due by 5/6/2011. If a party is not going to file a brief in response or reply, it is the obligation of that party, within the time frame established by this order, to so notify the court in writing. Parties to hold Rule 26 Meeting. Case management order due by 5/10/2011. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/11/2011 at 01:30 PM. Mailed notice (glg, ) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 121 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Settlement conference held on 4/5/2011. Plaintiff's Motion to certify class 119 is entered and continued to Discovery Hearing set for 4/8/2011 at 01:30 PM. (glg, ) (Entered: 04/05/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 120 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Tod Allen Lewis for presentment of motion to certify class 119 before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 4/15/2011 at 01:30 PM. (Lewis, Tod) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 119 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc to certify class -- Third Motion (Lewis, Tod) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 118 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Pursuant to request of counsel, Settlement Conference reset for 4/5/2011 at 01:30 PM. Mailed notice (glg, ) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 117 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Telephonic Discovery hearing held on 2/16/2011. Stipulation for extension of time continued to Settlement Conference set for 3/22/2011 at 01:30 PM. Real parties in interest to be present. Counsel to submit 5 page settlement document to chambers by 3/21/11. Telephoned notice (glg, ) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 116 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None
STIPULATION and Joint Motion For an Extension of Time to File an Amended Motion For Class Certification (Kelly, Ryan) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 115 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Telephonic Discovery hearing held on 1/6/2011. Class Motions due by 2/3/2011. Discovery Hearing set for 2/16/2011 at 01:30 PM. Telephoned notice (glg, ) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 114 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Frederick J. Kapala:Plaintiff's motion to certify class 105 is denied without prejudice. [For further details see order.] Electronic notice (jat, ) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 113 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Telephonic Discovery hearing held on 11/17/2010. Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 1/6/2011 at 09:30 AM. Telephoned notice (glg, ) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 112 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Telephonic Discovery hearing held on 10/4/2010. Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 11/17/2010 at 09:30 AM. Telephoned notice (glg, ) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 111 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc by Tod Allen Lewis (Lewis, Tod) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 110 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Telephonic Discovery hearing held on 8/3/2010. Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 10/4/2010 at 09:30 AM. Telephoned notice (glg, ) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 109 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None
REPLY by Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc to motion to certify class 105 (Smith, James) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 108 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc to MOTION by Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc to certify class 105 Plaintiff's Second Motion for Class Certification (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A through E to Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Second Motion For Class Certification)(Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 107 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Plaintiff's Motion for reconsideration 103 is denied. Plaintiff's counsel does not appear. (glg, ) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 106 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Stonecrafters Inc in support of motion to certify class 105 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V)(Smith, James) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 105 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc to certify class (Smith, James) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 104 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Ryan M. Kelly for presentment of motion for reconsideration, motion for relief, 103 before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 5/26/2010 at 01:30 PM. (Kelly, Ryan) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 103 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc for reconsideration regarding order on motion for reconsideration,, terminate motions, 101 (Kelly, Ryan) Modified on 5/14/2010 (jat, ). [attached document has incorrect case number] (Entered: 05/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 102 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Telephonic Discovery hearing held on 5/5/2010. Motion for class certification due 5/14/10. Set deadlines as to motion for class certification. Responses due by 6/11/2010 Replies due by 7/2/2010. If a party is not going to file a brief in response or reply, it is the obligation of that party, within the time frame established by this order, to so notify the court in writing. Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 8/3/2010 at 09:30 AM.Mailed notice (glg, ) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 101 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: The court grants Defendant's motion 83 to reconsider. Plaintiff's attorney must pay Defendant $3,434.89 within a reasonable period of time.[For further details see text below.]Notice mailed by Judicial Staff (pg, ) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 100 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc to supplement Its Motion To Reconsider Its Motion for Fees (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 99 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Defendant's Motion for leave to file supplement to motion to reconsider 95 is granted. (glg, ) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 98 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None
AMENDED NOTICE of Motion by Stephanie Wing Tipton for presentment of motion for leave to file 95 before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 4/21/2010 at 01:30 PM. (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 97 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Frederick J. Kapala:Plaintiff's motion to certify class 81 is denied without prejudice. [For further details see minute order.] Electronic notice (jat, ) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 96 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Stephanie Wing Tipton for presentment of motion for leave to file 95 before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 4/21/2010 at 01:30 PM. (Tipton, Stephanie)[refile with correct date.] Modified on 4/19/2010 (pg, ). (Entered: 04/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 95 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc for leave to file Out of Time (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Motion to Supplement Motion to Reconsider Defendant's Motion for Fees Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 30(g))(Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 94 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Defendant's motion 83 for fees does not include an itemized billing sheet. Instead, Defendant attached Attorney Potempa's affidavit. The affidavit is insufficient for the court to determine reasonable costs and fees incurred under Hensely v. Eckerhart, 461 U.S. 424 (1983). By April 7, 2010, Defendant is to supplement its motion with an itemized billing sheet breaking down the fees and costs incurred and is to indicate whether it has paid those fees. Defendant should also attach any appropriate receipts.Notice mailed by Judicial Staff (pg, ) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 93 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Telephonic Discovery hearing held on 3/17/2010. Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 5/5/2010 at 09:30 AM. Telephoned notice (glg, ) (Entered: 03/17/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 92 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None
REPLY by Stonecrafters Inc to response to motion 91 (Bock, Phillip) (Entered: 02/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 91 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc to MOTION by Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc to certify class 81 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through E to Foxfire's Response to Plaintiff's Motion For Class Certification)(Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 90 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc by Louis Carey Ludwig (Ludwig, Louis) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 89 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: None
REPLY by Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc to MOTION by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc for reconsideration of Its Motion for Fees Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 30(g)MOTION by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc for reconsideration of Its Motion for Fees Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 30(g) 83 , response to motion,, 88 In Support of Its Motion for Reconsideration (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 88 Filed: 1/6/2010, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Stonecrafters Inc to MOTION by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc for reconsideration of Its Motion for Fees Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 30(g)MOTION by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc for reconsideration of Its Motion for Fees Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 30(g) 83 Plaintiff's Response To Defendant's Motion To Reconsider (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Defendant's Motion To Reconsider (12/14/09), # 2 Exhibit B: Defendant's Motion For Fees Pursuant To F.R.C.P. 30(g) (09/29/09), # 3 Exhibit C: Memorandum Opinion and Order (11/23/09))(Ludwig, Louis) (Entered: 01/06/2010)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 87 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney:Minute entry # 86 is amended as follows: Response to motion to certify class 81 due by 1/29/2010.Mailed notice (glg, ) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 86 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Discovery hearing held on 12/16/2009. Plaintiff's Motion to certify class 81 is taken under advisement; Set deadlines as to motion to certify class. Responses due 1/19/10. Replies due 2/16/10. Defendant's Motion for reconsideration 83 is taken under advisement. ;Set deadlines as to motion for reconsideration, 83 : Responses due by 1/6/2010 Replies due by 1/13/2010. Magistrate Judge will rule on motion for reconsideration. If a party is not going to file a brief in response or reply, it is the obligation of that party, within the time frame established by this order, to so notify the court in writing. Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 3/17/2010 at 09:30 AM.Mailed notice (glg, ) (Entered: 12/16/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 85 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Stephanie Wing Tipton for presentment of motion for reconsideration, 83 before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 12/16/2009 at 01:30 PM. (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 84 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Stephanie Wing Tipton for presentment of motion for reconsideration, 83 before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 12/16/2009 at 01:30 PM. (Tipton, Stephanie)[Not a Notice see 85] Modified on 12/15/2009 (pg, ). (Entered: 12/14/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 83 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc for reconsideration of Its Motion for Fees Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 30(g) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Email from Ryan Kelly, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Affidavit of Erin Potempa)(Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 82 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Stonecrafters Inc in support of motion to certify class 81 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Ferretti depo with exhibits, # 2 Exhibit B - Spencer depo, # 3 Exhibit C - Light depo with exhibits, # 4 Exhibit D - McDaniel depo with exhibits, # 5 Exhibit E - Nooney depo with exhibits, # 6 Exhibit F - Stein depo, # 7 Exhibit G - Clark depo with exhibits, # 8 Exhibit H - Hammerl depo with exhibit, # 9 Exhibit I - Biggerstaff report and exhibits, # 10 Exhibit J - Defendant's answers to interrogatories, # 11 Exhibit K - Defendant's responses to document requests, # 12 Exhibit L - Defendant's answers to request for admissions, # 13 Exhibit M - CE v. Cy's Crabhouse opinion, # 14 Exhibit N - GM v. Finish Thompson opinion, # 15 Exhibit O - Green v Service Master opinion, # 16 Exhibit P - Sadowski Med1 opinion, # 17 Exhibit Q - GM Franklin Bank opinion, # 18 Exhibit R - Holtzman v Turza opinion, # 19 Exhibit S - ESI Ergonomic opinion, # 20 Exhibit T - American Home opinion, # 21 Exhibit U - Travel 100 Empire Cooler opinion, # 22 Exhibit V - Ellis v Mario opinion, # 23 Exhibit W - Bock firm resume, # 24 Exhibit X - Wanca firm resume)(Bock, Phillip) (Entered: 12/02/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 81 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc to certify class (Bock, Phillip) (Entered: 12/02/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 80 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 11/23/2009:(pg, ) (Entered: 11/24/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 79 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: The court denies Defendant's first motion 63 for costs and attorneys' fees. The court grants Defendant's second motion 68 for costs and fees as follows: $1200.42 for travel costs, $2584 for fees associated with travel time, and $152 for the time spent waiting at the place in which the second attempt was scheduled to occur. The court awards a grand total of $3936.42 to be paid within a reasonable time.[For further detail see separate order(s).]Notice mailed by Judicial Staff (pg, ) (Entered: 11/24/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 78 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Plaintiff's Motion for extension of time 74 is granted. Class Discovery ordered closed by 12/2/2009. Class Motions due by 12/2/2009. Discovery Hearing reset for 12/16/2009 at 01:30 PM. (glg, ) (Entered: 11/13/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 77 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc by James Michael Smith (Smith, James) (Entered: 11/12/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 76 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: None
REPLY by Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc to MOTION by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc for attorney fees Relating to Plaintiff's Failure to Attend the FAXTS Deposition 68 , response in opposition to motion 73 (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/10/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 75 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Ryan M. Kelly for presentment of extension of time 74 before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 11/13/2009 at 01:30 PM. (Kelly, Ryan) (Entered: 11/05/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 74 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc for extension of time to Take Deposition and File Brief (Kelly, Ryan) (Entered: 11/05/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 73 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Stonecrafters Incin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc for attorney fees Relating to Plaintiff's Failure to Attend the FAXTS Deposition 68 (Kelly, Ryan) (Entered: 11/05/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 72 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Defendant's Motion for attorney fees 68 is taken under advisement; Set deadlines as to motion for attorney fees, 68 : Responses due by 11/6/2009, Replies due by 11/13/2009. Magistrate Judge will rule. If a party is not going to file a brief in response or reply, it is the obligation of that party, within the time frame established by this order, to so notify the court in writing. Mailed notice (glg, ) (Entered: 10/23/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 71 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc by Jonathan Earl Irwin (Irwin, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/22/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 70 Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE of Service for serving the Re-Notice of Deposition of David Hammerl by Stephanie Wing Tipton on behalf of Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/21/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 69 Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Stephanie Wing Tipton for presentment of motion for attorney fees, 68 before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 10/23/2009 at 01:30 PM. (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/21/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 68 Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc for attorney fees Relating to Plaintiff's Failure to Attend the FAXTS Deposition (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Email to SWT from Ryan Kelly, # 2 Exhibit B Affidavit of Laura Milnichuk)(Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/21/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 67 Filed: 10/16/2009, Entered: None
REPLY by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc In Support of Its Motion For Fees Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 30(g) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B to Reply Brief In Support of Its Motion For Fees Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 30(g))(Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/16/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 66 Filed: 10/12/2009, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE of Service for serving Second Notice of Deposition for David Hammerl by Stephanie Wing Tipton on behalf of Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/12/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 65 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Defendant's Motion for attorney fees 63 is taken under advisement; Set deadlines as to motion for attorney fees 63 : Responses due by 10/9/2009, Replies due by 10/16/2009. If a party is not going to file a brief in response or reply, it is the obligation of that party, within the time frame established by this order, to so notify the court in writing. Fact Discovery as to class ordered closed by 11/16/2009. Class Motions due by 11/16/2009. Discovery Hearing reset for 11/20/2009 at 01:30 PM. Mailed notice (glg, ) (Entered: 10/02/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 64 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Stephanie Wing Tipton for presentment of motion for attorney fees 63 before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 10/2/2009 at 01:30 PM. (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/29/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 63 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc for attorney fees Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 30(g) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/29/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 62 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE of Service for Amended Notice of Deposition of David Hammerl by Stephanie Wing Tipton on behalf of Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/29/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 61 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc by Laura Milnichuk (Milnichuk, Laura) (Entered: 09/28/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 60 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE of Service for Serving Notice of Deposition for David Hammerl by Stephanie Wing Tipton on behalf of Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/24/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 59 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: None
PROTECTIVE Order (Agreed) signed by the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 9/23/2009 (jmm-r, ) (Entered: 09/23/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 58 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Defendant's Motion for protective order 53 is granted. Enter protective order. (glg, ) (Entered: 09/23/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 57 Filed: 9/17/2009, Entered: None
AMENDED NOTICE of Motion by Stephanie Wing Tipton for presentment of motion for protective order 53 before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 9/23/2009 at 01:30 PM. (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/17/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 56 Filed: 9/17/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Frederick J. Kapala: Case taken off this court's September 18, 2009 motion call. Defendant, Foxfire Printing & Packaging, to reset motion for protective order 53 before Magistrate Mahoney, to notify all parties that the case is not before Judge Kapala on September 18, 2009, and to provide Magistrate Mahoney with a paper courtesy copy of the motion for protective order and the amended notice within 24 hours.Electronic notice (pg, ) (Entered: 09/17/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 55 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Pursuant to request of counsel, Motion to compel 49 is withdrawn and the hearing date of 9/17/09 is stricken. Telephoned notice (glg, ) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 54 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: None
Agreed NOTICE of Motion by Stephanie Wing Tipton for presentment of motion for protective order 53 before Honorable Frederick J. Kapala on 9/18/2009 at 09:00 AM. (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/11/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 53 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc for protective order Agreed (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/11/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 52 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Plaintiff's Motion to compel 46 is moot. Plaintiff's Motion to compel 49 is taken under advisement; Set deadlines/hearing as to motion to compel 49 : Responses due by 9/16/2009, Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2009 at 10:00 AM. As stated in open court defendant to bring material to hearing. Mailed notice (glg, ) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 51 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: None
AMENDED NOTICE of Motion by Ryan M. Kelly for presentment of motion to compel 49 before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 9/4/2009 at 01:30 PM. (Kelly, Ryan) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 50 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Ryan M. Kelly for presentment of motion to compel 49 before Honorable Richard R. Mahoney on 9/4/2009 at 01:30 PM. (Kelly, Ryan) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
Request RequestSpace
Need legal research help? Let us know!
PACER 49 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc to compel [First Amended] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(Kelly, Ryan) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 48 Filed: 8/26/2009, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney:Discovery hearing held on 8/26/2009. Class Motion due by and Fact Discovery ordered closed by 10/7/2009. Parties to hold 37.2 conference by 9/9/09. Discovery Hearing set for 10/7/2009 at 01:30 PM. Motion hearing date of 9/2/09 stricken. (glg, ) (Entered: 08/26/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 47 Filed: 8/25/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Ryan M. Kelly for presentment of motion to compel 46 before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 9/2/2009 at 01:30 PM. (Kelly, Ryan) (Entered: 08/25/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 46 Filed: 8/25/2009, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc to compel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A, B, C)(Kelly, Ryan) (Entered: 08/25/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 45 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Frederick J. Kapala on 7/8/2009:(pg, ) (Entered: 07/09/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 44 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Frederick J. Kapala: Pursuant to the Memorandum Opinion and Order dated July 8, 2009, defendant's motion to dismiss 27 is granted. Counts II and III are dismissed.Docketing mailed notice (pg, ) (Entered: 07/09/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 43 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney:Discovery hearing held on 7/8/2009. Discovery Hearing set for 8/26/2009 at 01:30 PM. (glg, ) (Entered: 07/08/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 42 Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE of Service for serving Answers to Interrogatories and Documents Requests by Stephanie Wing Tipton on behalf of Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 05/05/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 41 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE of Service For Serving Request for Production and Interrogatories on Plaintiff by Stephanie Wing Tipton on behalf of Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/08/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 40 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney:Initial Pretrial conference held on 3/27/2009. Case management order approved as stated. Scheduling as to Rule 23 motions only. FRCP 26(a)(1) due 3/27/09. FRCP 26(a)(2) reserved. Depositions limited to 5 hours. Amended Pleadings due by 10/2/2009. Fact Discovery ordered closed by 10/2/2009. Class Motions due by 10/2/2009. Discovery Hearing set for 7/8/2009 at 01:30 PM. (glg, ) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 39 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc by Andrew T Smith (Smith, Andrew) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 38 Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE of Service for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Stephanie Wing Tipton on behalf of Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/25/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 37 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: None
Proposed Case Management Order by Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/24/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 36 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE by Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc for Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion To Dismiss Counts II and III of Plaintiff's Complaint (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/06/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 35 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: None
REPLY by Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc to MOTION by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc to dismiss Counts II and III of Plaintiff's Complaint 27 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/06/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 34 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: None
Exhibits to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Stonecrafters Inc (Wanca, Brian) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 33 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Stonecrafters Incin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc to dismiss Counts II and III of Plaintiff's Complaint 27 (Kelly, Ryan) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 32 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney: Defendant's Motion for leave to file out of time 23 is granted. Defendant's Motion to dismiss 27 is taken under advisement; Set deadlines as to motion to dismiss 27 : Responses due by 2/20/2009, Replies due by 3/6/2009. If a party is not going to file a brief in response or reply, it is that partys obligation, within the time frame established by this order, to so notify the court in writing. Parties to hold Rule 26 Meeting. Case management order due by 3/26/2009. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/27/2009 at 01:30 PM. Status hearing of 3/4/09 stricken. Mailed notice (glg, ) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 31 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None
Amended NOTICE of Motion by Stephanie Wing Tipton for presentment of motion to dismiss 27 before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 1/30/2009 at 01:30 PM. (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 30 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None
Amended NOTICE of Motion by Stephanie Wing Tipton for presentment of motion for leave to file 23 before Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 1/30/2009 at 01:30 PM. (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 29 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Stephanie Wing Tipton for presentment of motion to dismiss 27 before Honorable Frederick J. Kapala on 1/30/2009 at 09:00 AM. (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 28 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM In support of Motion to Dismiss Counts II and III of Plaintiff's Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Thru D, # 2 Exhibit E Thru G)(Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 27 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc to dismiss Counts II and III of Plaintiff's Complaint (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 26 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE by Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc and COS for Answer to Complaint (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 25 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None
ANSWER to Complaint by Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc(Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 24 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Stephanie Wing Tipton for presentment of motion for leave to file 23 before Honorable Frederick J. Kapala on 1/30/2009 at 09:00 AM. (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 23 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc for leave to file Out of Time (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 22 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney:Foxfire's motion for an extension of time to answer is granted. Response to complaint due by 1/9/2009. Status hearing set for 3/4/2009 at 01:30 PM.Mailed notice (glg, ) (Entered: 01/21/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 21 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
INTRA district transfer from the Eastern Division. Case assigned to Judge Frederick J. Kapala and referred to Magistrate P. Michael Mahoney for all further proceedings.[Western Division received transfer letter.] (pg, ) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 20 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable John W. Darrah: Defendant's motion to transfer case is granted 15 . The clerk is directed to transfer this case forthwith to the U.S.D.C. for the Northern District of Illinois, Western Division, forthwith. Status hearing set for 01/20/09 is vacated. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ar, ) (Entered: 01/15/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 19 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE by Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc of Filing and Certificate of Service for Defendant's Local Rule 3.2 Statement (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 18 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None
NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 17 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable John W. Darrah: Status hearing set for 1/20/09 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notices (gcy, ) (Entered: 12/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 16 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Stephanie Wing Tipton for presentment of motion to transfer case 15 before Honorable John W. Darrah on 1/20/2009 at 09:00 AM. (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/11/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 15 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc to transfer case (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/11/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 14 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Stonecrafters Inc (Wanca, Brian) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 13 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc by Phillip A. Bock (Bock, Phillip) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 12 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc by Ryan M. Kelly (Kelly, Ryan) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 11 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Stonecrafters Inc by Brian J Wanca (Wanca, Brian) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 10 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE by Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc for filing an Appearance for Alan Becker (Becker, Alan) (Entered: 12/09/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 9 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE by Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc for Filing an Appearance for Erin Potempa (Potempa, Erin) (Entered: 12/09/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 8 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc by Erin Anne Potempa (Potempa, Erin) (Entered: 12/09/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 7 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc by Alan I. Becker (Becker, Alan) (Entered: 12/09/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 6 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Stephanie Wing Tipton for presentment of extension of time 5 before Honorable John W. Darrah on 1/20/2009 at 09:00 AM. (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/09/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 5 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead (Tipton, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/09/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 3 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc by Stephanie Wing Tipton. (gcy, ) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 2 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
CIVIL Cover Sheet. (gcy, ) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
Request RequestSpace
PDF 1 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of the 22nd Judicial Circuit McHenry County, case number (08CH2018) filed by Foxfire Printing and Packaging Inc Filing fee $ 350. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(gcy, ) (Entered: 12/08/2008)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 262 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?