Minor et al v. FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:09-cv-01375
District Judge Thelton E. Henderson, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.cand.3-09-cv-01375 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Judges don't know as much about themselves as we do.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Banipal Shabaz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Eric Stephan Honig +1 310 314 2603 +1 310 314 2793

Toggle Switch Represented by Diversity Law Group APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Larry W Lee +1 213 488 6555 +1 213 488 6554 lwlee@diversitylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gould & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Aarin April Zeif +1 714 669 2850 +1 714 544 0800 Aarin@wageandhourlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kenneth H Yoon Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Kenneth H Yoon +1 213 612 0988 +1 213 947 1211 kyoon@yoon-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Konner Teitelbaum & Gallagher

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Michael A. Gould +1 212 697 8500 +1 212 697 4512 mgould@ktglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Peter M Hart Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Peter Mark Hart +1 310 478 5789 +1 509 561 6441 hartpeter@msn.com
Kimberly Anne Westmoreland +1 310 478 5789 +1 509 561 6441 kwestmoreland.loph@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Yarian & Patatanyan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Allen Patatanyan +1 818 543 7075 +1 818 543 3271
Levik Yarian +1 818 543 7075 +1 818 543 3271
No Logo Gary Minor, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Eric Stephan Honig +1 310 314 2603 +1 310 314 2793

Toggle Switch Represented by Diversity Law Group APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Larry W Lee +1 213 488 6555 +1 213 488 6554 lwlee@diversitylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gould & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Aarin April Zeif +1 714 669 2850 +1 714 544 0800 Aarin@wageandhourlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kenneth H Yoon Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Kenneth H Yoon +1 213 612 0988 +1 213 947 1211 kyoon@yoon-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Konner Teitelbaum & Gallagher

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Michael A. Gould +1 212 697 8500 +1 212 697 4512 mgould@ktglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Peter M Hart Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Peter Mark Hart +1 310 478 5789 +1 509 561 6441 hartpeter@msn.com
Kimberly Anne Westmoreland +1 310 478 5789 +1 509 561 6441 kwestmoreland.loph@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Yarian & Patatanyan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Allen Patatanyan +1 818 543 7075 +1 818 543 3271
Levik Yarian +1 818 543 7075 +1 818 543 3271
v.
FedEx Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Gregory Clement Cheng +1 415 442 4810 +1 213 442 4870 gregory.cheng@ogletreedeakins.com
No Logo FedEx Kinko's International, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Gregory Clement Cheng +1 415 442 4810 +1 213 442 4870 gregory.cheng@ogletreedeakins.com
No Logo FedEx Kinko's, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Gregory Clement Cheng +1 415 442 4810 +1 213 442 4870 gregory.cheng@ogletreedeakins.com
No Logo Fedex Office And Print Services, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Gregory Clement Cheng +1 415 442 4810 +1 213 442 4870 gregory.cheng@ogletreedeakins.com
Thomas Michael McInerney +1 415 442 4810 +1 213 442 4870 tmm@ogletreedeakins.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 442 Civil Rights: Jobs
  Entries (155) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PACER 143 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
CLERK'S NOTICE re 140 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Relate Cases. The Court has reviewed the motion and determined that C09-1375 TEH and C14-1117 LHK are not related and no reassignments shall occur. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2014) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
PACER 142 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc. of re 140 MOTION to Relate Cases, re 141 Declaration in Support, re 139 Notice of Appearance (Purcell, Brooke) (Filed on 3/19/2014) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
PACER 141 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
Declaration of Gregory C. Cheng in Support of re 140 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Relate Cases filed by FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit)(Related document(s) 140 ) (Purcell, Brooke) (Filed on 3/19/2014) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
PACER 140 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Relate Cases filed by FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order)(Purcell, Brooke) (Filed on 3/19/2014) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
PACER 139 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Brooke Sikora Purcell (Purcell, Brooke) (Filed on 3/19/2014) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
PACER 138 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Transcript of Proceedings held on 7-24-13, before Judge Judge Thelton E. Henderson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/4/2013. (Related documents(s) 137 ) (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
PACER 137 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT ORDER by FedEx Kinko's International, Inc., FedEx Kinko's, Inc., FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation for Court Reporter Katherine Wyatt. (Cheng, Gregory) (Filed on 7/30/2013) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
PDF 136 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part re 116 Motion for Attorneys' Fees; granting re 121 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2013)
PDF 136 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part re 116 Motion for Attorneys' Fees; granting re 121 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2013) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
PACER 135 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry: Fairness Hearing held on 7/24/2013 before Judge Thelton E. Henderson. (Court Reporter: Kathy Wyatt) (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/24/2013) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
PACER 134 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
Supplemental Brief in Response to the Court's July 26, 2013 Order to Provide Supplemental Declaration of Class Representatives and the Report of Class Counsels' Expert and Further Briefing on that Report filed by Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Peter M. Hart ISO Supplemental Brief Regarding Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, #(2) Declaration of Gary Minor ISO Mtn for Award of Class Representatives Enhancement Payments, #(3) Declaration of Banipal Shabaz ISO Mtn for Award of Class Representatives Enhancement Payments, #(4) Supplemental Declaration of Narek Eloyan in Support of Response to Order to Show Cause, #(5) Supplemental Declaration of Narek Eloyan in Support of Response to Order to Show Cause)(Hart, Peter) (Filed on 7/8/2013) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
PACER 133 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 129 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, DECLARATION OF PETER M. HART IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz. (Hart, Peter) (Filed on 7/8/2013) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
PACER 132 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
Supplemental Declaration of Michal Macias and Declaration of Michael Gould in Support of re 121 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement/Order to Show Cause filed by Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration) (Zeif, Aarin) (Filed on 7/8/2013) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
PACER 131 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Transcript of Proceedings held on 7/1/2013, before Judge Thelton E. Henderson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/1/2013. (Related documents(s) 130 ) (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 7/3/2013) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
PACER 130 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Hart, Peter) (Filed on 7/3/2013) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
PACER 129 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ENTRY AND ORDER Granting Oral Motion to File Under Seal. Order to Show Cause Hearing held on 7/1/2013 before Judge Thelton E. Henderson. Fairness Hearing set for 7/24/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter: Lydia Zinn)(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
PACER 128 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz . (Attachments: # 1 DECLARATION OF PETER M. HART IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, # 2 DECLARATION OF KENNETH H. YOON IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, # 3 DECLARATION OF ALLEN PATATANYAN IN SUPPORT OF CLASS COUNSELS RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND ORDER CONTINUING FINAL APPROVAL HEARING)(Hart, Peter) (Filed on 6/28/2013) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
PACER 127 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
Declaration of Michael A. Gould in RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz . (Zeif, Aarin) (Filed on 6/28/2013) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
PDF 126 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/1/2013 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 6/28/2013. Fairness Hearing set for 7/15/2013 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/26/2013. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013)
PDF 126 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/1/2013 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 6/28/2013. Fairness Hearing set for 7/15/2013 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/26/2013. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
PACER 125 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
[Proposed] Order and JUDGMENT GRANTING re 121 MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND MOTION FOR AWARD OF CLASS REPRESENTATIVES ENHANCEMENT PAYMENTS, ATTORNEYS FEES AND LITIGATION COSTS, AND SETTLEMENT ADMINISTRATION COSTS filed by Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz. (Hart, Peter) (Filed on 6/24/2013) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
PACER 124 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
Supplemental Brief Of Plaintiff RE: Radcliffe V. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. In Support Of re 121 Motion For Final Approval Of Class Action Settlement filed by Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Peter M. Hart, # 2 Supplemental Declaration of Michael Gould, # 3 Supplemental Declaration of Kenneth H. Yoon, # 4 Supplemental Declaration of Eric Honig, # 5 Supplemental Declaration of Abel E. Morales, # 6 Supplemental Declaration of Allen Patatanyan, # 7 Supplemental Declaration of Levik Yarian)(Hart, Peter) (Filed on 6/24/2013) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
PDF 123 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER re supplemental briefing. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/19/2013. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
PDF 123 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER re supplemental briefing. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/19/2013. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
PACER 122 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
Supplemental Brief of Plaintiff in Support of re 121 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz. (Attachments: #(1) SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ABEL E. MORALES WITH RESPECT TO NOTIFICATION AND CLAIMS PROCESSING)(Hart, Peter) (Filed on 6/14/2013) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
PACER 121 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz. Motion Hearing set for 7/1/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Responses due by 6/10/2013. Replies due by 6/17/2013. (Attachments: #(1) DECLARATION OF PETER M. HART IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, #(2) SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ABEL E. MORALES WITH RESPECT TO NOTIFICATION AND CLAIMS PROCESSING)(Hart, Peter) (Filed on 5/24/2013) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
PACER 120 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
Supplemental Declaration of Shahen Bederian in Support of re 114 Motion for Award of Class Representatives' Enhancement Payments, and Attorneys' Fees and Litigation Costs, and Class Administration Fees -CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 118 - filed by Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz. (Hart, Peter) (Filed on 5/23/2013) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
PACER 119 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None
Supplemental Declaration of Narek Eloyan in Support of re 114 MOTION for Award of Class Representatives' Enhancement Payments, and Settlement Administration Costs, re 116 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs, Class Representatives' Enhancement Payments, and Settlement Administration Costs, CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 114 filed by Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz. (Related document(s) 114 , 116 ) (Hart, Peter) (Filed on 5/22/2013) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
PACER 118 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None
[DOCKETED IN ERROR...PLS. REFER TO DOCKET NO. 120 ]...Supplemental Declaration of Shahen Bederian in Support of re 114 MOTION for Award of Class Representatives' Enhancement Payments, and Settlement Administration Costs, re 116 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs, Class Representatives' Enhancement Payments, and Settlement Administration Costs, CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 114 filed by Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz. (Related document(s) 114 , 116 ) (Hart, Peter) (Filed on 5/22/2013)...Modified on 5/23/2013 (tn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/22/2013)
PACER 117 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None
Declaration of Michael Macias in Support of re 114 MOTION for Award of Class Representatives' Enhancement Payments, and Settlement Administration Costs, re 116 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs, Class Representatives' Enhancement Payments, and Settlement Administration Costs, CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 114 filed byGary Minor, Banipal Shabaz. (Related document(s) 114 , 116 ) (Zeif, Aarin) (Filed on 5/21/2013) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
PACER 116 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 7/30/2013
NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION for Award of Class Representatives' Enhancement Payments, Attorneys' Fees and Litigation Costs, and Settlement Administration Costs, CORRECTION OF DOCKET re # 114 filed by Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz. Motion Hearing set for 7/1/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Responses due by 6/10/2013. Replies due by 6/17/2013. (Yasuda, Stephanie) (Filed on 5/17/2013) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
PACER 115 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None
Declaration of Abel E. Morales with Respect to Notification and Claims Processing re 114 MOTION for Award of Class Representatives' Enhancement Payments, Attorneys' Fees and Litigation Costs, and Settlement Administration Costs filed by Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz. (Related document(s) 114 ) (Yasuda, Stephanie) (Filed on 5/17/2013) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
PACER 114 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION for Award of Class Representatives' Enhancement Payments, Attorneys' Fees and Litigation Costs, and Settlement Administration Costs filed by Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz. Motion Hearing set for 7/1/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Responses due by 6/10/2013. Replies due by 6/17/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Peter M. Hart, # 2 Declaration of Kenneth H. Yoon, # 3 Declaration of Eric Honig, # 4 Declaration of Allen Patatanyan, # 5 Declaration of Michael A. Gould)(Yasuda, Stephanie) (Filed on 5/17/2013) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
PDF 113 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER to Modify Class Action Settlement Preliminary Approval Order. Fairness Hearing reset for 7/1/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Susan Illston for Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/25/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2013)
PDF 113 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER to Modify Class Action Settlement Preliminary Approval Order. Fairness Hearing reset for 7/1/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Susan Illston for Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/25/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2013) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
PACER 112 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None
AMENDED JOINT STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER to Modify Class Action Settlement Preliminary Approval Order, re 110 Order on Motion for Settlement, AMENDED Joint Stipulation to Modify Class Action Settlement Preliminary Approval filed by FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc., Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz. (McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 3/25/2013) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
PACER 111 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None
JOINT STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER to Modiy Class Action Settlement Preliminary Approval Order, re 110 Order on Motion for Settlement, to Modify filed by FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc., Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz. (McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 3/25/2013) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
PDF 110 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting re 93 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2013) (Entered: 02/08/2013)
PACER 109 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: None
Request for Judicial Notice in Support of re 93 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT RE LEGAL AUTHORITIES FOR APPROVAL FOR CLASS SETTLEMENTS filed by Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz. (Related document(s) 93 ) (Hart, Peter) (Filed on 12/13/2012) (Entered: 12/13/2012)
PACER 108 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None
Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/3/2012 before Thelton E. Henderson. Motion is taken under submission. (Court Reporter: Belle Ball) (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/3/2012) (Entered: 12/03/2012)
PACER 107 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc. (Cheng, Gregory) (Filed on 12/3/2012) (Entered: 12/03/2012)
PACER 106 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc. (Cheng, Gregory) (Filed on 11/21/2012) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
PACER 105 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER setting forth questions for preliminary approval hearing. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/20/2012. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2012) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
PACER 104 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENTAL Declaration of Peter M. Hart in Support of re 93 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT -SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF PETER M. HART IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT WITH FULLY EXECUTED JOINT STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT- filed by Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz. (Related document(s) 93 ) (Hart, Peter) (Filed on 11/7/2012) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
PACER 103 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE filed by Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz of Status Conference Held and Notice of Hearing on re 93 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT , -NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE HELD AND NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT (Hart, Peter) (Filed on 11/6/2012) (Entered: 11/06/2012)
PACER 102 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None
DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 100 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DECLARATION OF PETER M. HART IN SUPPORT OF JOINT SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT by Gary Minor. (Hart, Peter) (Filed on 11/5/2012) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
PACER 101 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None
Minute Entry: Status Conference. Motion Hearing set for 12/3/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. (Court Reporter: Joan Columbini) (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/5/2012) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
PACER 100 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None
ORDER Signed by The Honorable Thelton E. Henderson granting re 99 Administrative Motion to File Document Under Seal. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2012) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
PACER 99 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None
Joint Administrative Motion to File Memorandum of Understanding Under Seal filed by Gary Minor. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Peter M. Hart, #(2) [Proposed] Order, #(3) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hart, Peter) (Filed on 10/25/2012) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
PACER 99
PACER 98 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None
Joint Supplemental Brief in Support of re 93 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT -JOINT SUPPLMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT- filed by Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz. (Related document(s) 97 , 93 ) (Hart, Peter) (Filed on 10/24/2012) (Entered: 10/24/2012)
PACER 98
PACER 97 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting re 94 Defendants' motion for a status conference, vacating the preliminary approval hearing, and ordering that the parties file a joint supplemental brief on or before October 24, 2012. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2012) (Entered: 10/18/2012)
PACER 97
PACER 96 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE to (re 94 Ex-Parte Application For Status Conference) -PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION- filed by Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz. (Hart, Peter) (Filed on 10/16/2012) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
PACER 96
PACER 95 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Submission of the Signature Pages to Settlement Agreement filed by Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz re 93 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. (Hart, Peter) (Filed on 10/15/2012) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
PACER 95
PACER 94 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None
Ex-Parte Request for Status Conference re: Enforcement of Settlement Agreement and [Proposed] Order Setting Status Conference filed by FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc.. (McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 10/12/2012) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
PACER 94
PDF 93 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None, Terminated: 2/8/2013
MOTION for Settlement NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT filed by Gary Minor. Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Responses due by 10/12/2012. Replies due by 10/19/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF PETER M. HART, # 2 Declaration DECLARATION OF KENNETH H. YOON, # 3 Declaration DECLARATION OF MICHAEL A. GOULD, # 4 Declaration DECLARATION OF ALLEN PATATANYAN, # 5 Declaration DECLARATION OF LEVIK YARIAN, # 6 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER)(Hart, Peter) (Filed on 9/28/2012) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
PDF 92 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Deadline for Plaintiffs' to File Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. No Further Continuances shall be granted. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/22/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2012)
PDF 92 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Deadline for Plaintiffs' to File Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement re 91 . No Further Continuances shall be granted Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/22/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2012) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
PACER 91 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT filed by Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz, FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc.. (Healy, Amber) (Filed on 8/21/2012) (Entered: 08/21/2012)
PDF 90 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFFS' TO FILE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/02/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
PDF 90 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFFS' TO FILE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT re 89 . Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/02/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
PACER 89 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT filed by Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz, FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc.. (Healy, Amber) (Filed on 8/1/2012) (Entered: 08/01/2012)
PDF 88 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO VACATE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SET DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFFS FILING FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT; NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/16/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2012) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
PDF 87 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; JOINT STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER TO VACATE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SET DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFFS FILING FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT filed by Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz, FedEx Office & Print Services,Inc.. (Healy, Amber) (Filed on 4/12/2012) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
PACER 86 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: None
JOINT CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz, Narek Eloyan, Shehan Bederian, Michael Macias, FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc.. (Hart, Peter) (Filed on 4/9/2012) (Entered: 04/09/2012)
PACER 85 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Peter Mark Hart (Hart, Peter) (Filed on 2/13/2012) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
PDF 84 Filed: 1/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/16/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/24/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2012) (Entered: 01/25/2012)
PACER 83 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None
JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz, FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc.. (Hart, Peter) (Filed on 1/23/2012) (Entered: 01/23/2012)
PDF 82 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/30/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/13/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2011) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
PACER 81 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: None
Joint Stipulation And [Proposed] Order To Continue Case Management Conference by Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz, FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc.. (Hart, Peter) (Filed on 12/13/2011) (Entered: 12/13/2011)
PDF 80 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Further Case Management Conference to 12/19/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/08/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
PACER 79 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None
JOINT STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Continuing Status Conference filed by Gary Minor & Banipal Shabaz. (Healy, Amber) (Filed on 11/7/2011) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
PACER 78 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None
CLERK'S NOTICE Rescheduling Further Case Management Conference to 11/14/2011 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2011) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
PACER 77 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 7/18/2011 before Judge Thelton E. Henderson. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Not Reported) (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/18/2011) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
PACER 76 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Plaintiffs' Supplemental Updated Joint Case Management Statement filed by Gary Minor. (Hart, Peter) (Filed on 7/14/2011) (Entered: 07/14/2011)
PACER 75 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
Updated Joint Case Management Statement filed by Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz, FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc.. (Hart, Peter) (Filed on 7/11/2011) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
PACER 74 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change of Address by Peter Mark Hart (Hart, Peter) (Filed on 7/1/2011) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
PACER 73 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 4/18/2011 before Judge Thelton E. Henderson. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (not reported) (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/18/2011) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
PACER 72 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
Updated Joint Case Management Statement filed by Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz, FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc.. (Hart, Peter) (Filed on 4/11/2011) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
PACER 71 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 12/20/2010 before Judge Thelton E. Henderson (Date Filed: 12/20/2010). Further Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Not reported) (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/20/2010) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
PACER 70 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
Updated JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz, FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc.. (Hart, Peter) (Filed on 12/13/2010) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
PACER 69 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None
ANSWER to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint for Damages & Injunctive Relief filed by FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc.. (Cheng, Gregory) (Filed on 12/9/2010) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
PACER 68 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change of Address filed by Attorney Peter Mark Hart. (Hart, Peter) (Filed on 12/2/2010) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
PACER 67 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None
Second Amended Class Action Complaint For Damages And Injunctive Relief against FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc.. Filed by Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz. (Westmoreland, Kimberly) (Filed on 11/22/2010) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
PACER 66 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting re 64 Motion for leave to file second amended complaint. Plaintiffs shall file second amended complaint by 11/29/10. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2010) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
PACER 65 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None
DEFENDANT FEDEX OFFICE AND PRINT SERVICES, INC.S NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO re 64 PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (Cheng, Gregory) (Filed on 11/22/2010) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
PACER 64 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: None, Terminated: 11/22/2010
MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Gary Minor. Motion Hearing set for 12/13/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Peter M. Hart In Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion For Leave To File Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Notice Of Lodging Second Amended Complaint, # 3 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Hart, Peter) (Filed on 11/2/2010) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
PACER 63 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER naming the law offices of Peter M. Hart as lead counsel. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/13/10. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2010) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
PACER 62 Filed: 10/11/2010, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz of re 61 Stipulation To Appoint Peter M. Hart As Lead Counsel. (Westmoreland, Kimberly) (Filed on 10/11/2010) (Entered: 10/11/2010)
PACER 61 Filed: 10/11/2010, Entered: None
STIPULATION To Appoint Peter M. Hart As Lead Counsel filed by Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order [Proposed] Order On Stipulation Naming The Law Offices Of Peter M. Hart As Lead Counsel)(Westmoreland, Kimberly) (Filed on 10/11/2010) (Entered: 10/11/2010)
PACER 60 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
Notice of ASSOCIATION of Counsel filed by Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz. (Westmoreland, Kimberly) (Filed on 9/14/2010) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
PACER 59 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: None
ORDER by MDL Panel Deeming as MOOT the Motion to Transfer Action Under 28 USC Sec. 1407. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2010) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
PACER 58 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's ANSWER to Amended Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief byFedEx Kinko's International, Inc., FedEx Kinko's, Inc., FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation. (Cheng, Gregory) (Filed on 8/23/2010) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
PACER 57 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 8/16/2010 before Judge Thelton E. Henderson. Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (not reported) (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/16/2010) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
PACER 56 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER allowing defendant to appear by phone at the 08/16/10 case management conference. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/11/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2010) (Entered: 08/11/2010)
PACER 55 Filed: 8/10/2010, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
MOTION to Amend/Correct Transfer of Action to the Central District filed by FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/16/2010 09:00 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Schedule of Actions, # 2 Docket and Complaint, # 3 Proof of Service)(McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 8/10/2010) (Entered: 08/10/2010)
PACER 54 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc., Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz. (Yoon, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/9/2010) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
PACER 53 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None
FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT For Damages and Injunctive Relief against FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc.. Filed by Gary Minor. (Westmoreland, Kimberly) (Filed on 8/6/2010) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
PACER 52 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None
Defendant FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc.'s Request to Appear Telephonically for Case Management Conference (Cheng, Gregory) (Filed on 8/6/2010) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
PACER 51 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson Granting re 45 Motion for leave to file first amended complaint. Amended complaint to be filed on or before 08/13/10. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2010) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
PACER 50 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: None
Reply in Support of re 45 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz. (Yoon, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/3/2010) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
PACER 49 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None
MOTION for Transfer of Actions to the Central District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1407 for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings filed by FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Brief in Support of Motion, #(2) Declaration of Karen Berglas in Support of Motion, #(3) Schedule of Actions, #(4) Proof of Service)(McInerney, Thomas) (Filed on 7/26/2010) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
PACER 48 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Gregory C. Cheng in Support of re 47 Opposition to re 45 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc.. (Related document(s) 45 ) (Cheng, Gregory) (Filed on 7/26/2010) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
PACER 47 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None
Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Opposition to re 45 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc.. (Cheng, Gregory) (Filed on 7/26/2010) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
PACER 46 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE to a Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 07/02/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2010) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
PACER 45 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None, Terminated: 8/6/2010
NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION & MEMORANDUM of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Gary Minor. Motion Hearing set for 8/16/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Kenneth H. Yoon, #(2) Notice of Lodging, #(3) Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Westmoreland, Kimberly) (Filed on 7/2/2010) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
PACER 44 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 5/17/2010 before Judge Thelton E. Henderson. Case Management Conference set for 8/16/2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (not reported) (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/17/2010) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
PACER 43 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None
UPDATED JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Filed by Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz, FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc., FedEx Kinko's International, Inc., Federal Express Corporation & FedEx Kinko's. (Yoon, Kenneth) (Filed on 5/10/2010) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
PACER 42 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None
CLERKS NOTICE continuing the Case Management Conference to 5/17/2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2010) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
PACER 41 Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 1/11/2010 before Judge Thelton E. Henderson. Case Management Conference set for 5/10/2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (not reported) (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/11/2010) (Entered: 01/11/2010)
PACER 40 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz. (Yoon, Kenneth) (Filed on 1/8/2010) (Entered: 01/08/2010)
PACER 39 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing the Case Management Conference set to 1/11/2010 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/24/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2009) (Entered: 11/25/2009)
PACER 38 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Continue Status Conference by Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz. (Yoon, Kenneth) (Filed on 11/23/2009) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
PACER 37 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE by Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz of Association of Counsel (Yoon, Kenneth) (Filed on 11/13/2009) (Entered: 11/13/2009)
PACER 36 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing the Case Management Conference to 11/30/2009 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/21/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009) (Entered: 10/22/2009)
PACER 35 Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: None
STIPULATION to Continue Status Conference by Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order to Continue Status Conference)(Yoon, Kenneth) (Filed on 10/21/2009) (Entered: 10/21/2009)
PACER 34 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/20/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2009) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
PACER 33 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc. re 32 Stipulation (Cheng, Gregory) (Filed on 10/15/2009) (Entered: 10/15/2009)
PACER 32 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None
STIPULATION re PROTECTIVE ORDER; [PROPOSED] ORDER by FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc.. (Cheng, Gregory) (Filed on 10/15/2009) (Entered: 10/15/2009)
PDF 31 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 15 Motion to Stay. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2009) (Entered: 07/06/2009)
PACER 30 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/6/2009 before Judge Thelton E. Henderson. The Motion to Stay is taken under submission. Case Management Conference set for 11/2/2009 at 01:30 PM. (Court Reporter: Sahar McVickar) (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/6/2009) (Entered: 07/06/2009)
PACER 29 Filed: 7/4/2009, Entered: None
Certificate of Interested Entities by Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz (Yoon, Kenneth) (Filed on 7/4/2009) (Entered: 07/04/2009)
PACER 28 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz. (Yoon, Kenneth) (Filed on 6/25/2009) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
PACER 27 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER selecting ADR process. Case referred to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/24/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2009) (Entered: 06/24/2009)
PACER 26 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc. (Cheng, Gregory) (Filed on 6/22/2009) (Entered: 06/22/2009)
PACER 25 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: None
Defendant's Reply Brief in Support of re 15 Motion to Stay all Further Proceedings as to Plaintiffs' Second Claim for Violation of Labor Code Section 226.7 (Meal Periods); Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byFedEx Office & Print Services, Inc.. (Cheng, Gregory) (Filed on 6/22/2009) (Entered: 06/22/2009)
PACER 24 Filed: 6/20/2009, Entered: None
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Yoon, Kenneth) (Filed on 6/20/2009) (Entered: 06/20/2009)
PACER 23 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: None
Memorandum in Opposition to re 15 Defendants' Motion to Stay All Further Proceedings as to Plaintiffs' Second Claim for Violation of Labor Code Section 226.7 (Meal Periods) & DECLARATION of Kenneth H. Yoon in Support Thereof filed by Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz. (Yoon, Kenneth) (Filed on 6/15/2009) (Entered: 06/15/2009)
PACER 22 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
INITIAL DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 6/15/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2009) (Entered: 06/15/2009)
PACER 21 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE to a Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/09/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2009) (Entered: 06/09/2009)
PACER 20 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: None
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR Certification by Parties and Counsel (Cheng, Gregory) (Filed on 6/2/2009) (Entered: 06/02/2009)
PACER 19 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None
Proposed Order Granting re 15 Motion to Stay all Further Proceedings as to Plaintiffs' Second Claim for Violation of Labor Code Section 226.7 (Meal Periods) by FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc.. (Cheng, Gregory) (Filed on 6/1/2009) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
PACER 18 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc. re 15 MOTION to Stay Defendant Fedex Office and Print Services, Inc. (Cheng, Gregory) (Filed on 6/1/2009) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
PACER 17 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None
Declaration of Gregory C. Cheng in Support of re 15 Defendant Fedex Office and Print Services, Inc.'s Motion to Stay all Further Proceedings as to Plaintiffs' Second Claim for Violation of Labor Code Section 226.7 (Meal Periods) filed byFedEx Office & Print Services, Inc.. (Cheng, Gregory) (Filed on 6/1/2009) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
PACER 16 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None
Request for Judicial Notice re 15 MOTION to Stay Defendant Fedex Office and Print Services, Inc. Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant Fedex Office and Print Services, Inc.'s Motion to Stay all Further Proceedings as to Plaintiff's Second Claim for Violation of Laobr Code Section 226.7 (Meal Periods) filed byFedEx Office & Print Services, Inc.. (Related document(s) 15 ) (Cheng, Gregory) (Filed on 6/1/2009) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
PACER 15 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION to Stay All Further Proceedings as to Plaintiffs' Second Claim for Violation of Labor Code Section 226.7 (Meal Periods)& MEMORANDUM of Points & Authorities in Support Thereof filed by FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/6/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Cheng, Gregory) (Filed on 6/1/2009) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
PACER 14 Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE by Gary Minor, Banipal Shabaz of Withdrawal as Counsel of Record by Larry W. Lee, Daniel H. Chang, Craig S. Hubble and Diversity Law Group (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 5/5/2009) (Entered: 05/05/2009)
PACER 13 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: None
CLERKS NOTICE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/6/2009 at 01:30 PM. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2009) (Entered: 04/02/2009)
PDF 12 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER voluntarily dismissing certain defendants. Federal Express Corporation; FedEx Kinko's International, Inc. and FedEx Kinko's, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/02/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2009) (Entered: 04/02/2009)
PACER 11 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: None
STIPULATION Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendants FedEx Kinko's International, Inc., Federal Express Corporation and FedEx Kinko's by Gary Minor. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Dismissal Without Prejudice)(Yoon, Kenneth) (Filed on 4/1/2009) (Entered: 04/01/2009)
PACER 10 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Thelton E. Henderson for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/1/09. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2009) (Entered: 04/01/2009)
PACER 9 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2009) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/1/2009: # 1 pos) (sv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/01/2009)
PACER 8 Filed: 3/31/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FedEx Kinko's International, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, FedEx Kinko's, Inc., FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc. re 7 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, (Cheng, Gregory) (Filed on 3/31/2009) (Entered: 03/31/2009)
PACER 7 Filed: 3/31/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by FedEx Kinko's International, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, FedEx Kinko's, Inc., FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc. and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge. (Cheng, Gregory) (Filed on 3/31/2009) (Entered: 03/31/2009)
PACER 6 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE Filed by Defendant FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc. of re 3 declaration in Support, re 5 Disclosure of Statement, re 4 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons, re 1 Notice of Removal & Civil Cover Sheet. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2009) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
PACER 5 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None
DISCLOSURE of Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Filed by Defendant FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc. Identifying Corporate Parent FedEx Corporation for FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2009) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
PACER 4 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None
CERTIFICATION of Interested Entities or Persons Filed by Defendant FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2009) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
PACER 3 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Karen Berglas in Support of re 1 Notice of Removal of Civil Action Filed by Defendant FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc.. (Related document(s) 1 ). (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2009) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
PACER 2 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None
ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Case Management Statement due 6/29/2009 & InitialCase Management Conference set for 7/6/2009 at 4:00 PM.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2009) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
PACER 1 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE OF REMOVAL - [No Process] from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their Case Number is CGC-09-485432. [Filing Fee: $350.00 Receipt Number 34611030481] Filed by Defendant FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2009) (tn, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/30/2009: # 1 Notice of Removal) (tn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/30/2009)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 332 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?