Fox v. Albertville Quality Foods Inc
Alabama Northern District Court, Case No. 4:11-cv-00203
District Judge Karon O. Bowdre, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.alnd.4-11-cv-00203 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Judges don't know as much about themselves as we do.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Brian Fox, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ARENDALL & ARNOLD

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David R Arendall +1 205 252 1550 +1 205 252 1556 dra@arendalllaw.com
Allen Durham Arnold +1 205 252 1550 +1 205 252 1556 ada@arendalllaw.com
No Logo Crystal Lugo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ARENDALL & ARNOLD

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David R Arendall +1 205 252 1550 +1 205 252 1556 dra@arendalllaw.com
Allen Durham Arnold +1 205 252 1550 +1 205 252 1556 ada@arendalllaw.com
No Logo Max Leigh Blair, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ARENDALL & ARNOLD

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David R Arendall +1 205 252 1550 +1 205 252 1556 dra@arendalllaw.com
Allen Durham Arnold +1 205 252 1550 +1 205 252 1556 ada@arendalllaw.com
No Logo Reba Aguado, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ARENDALL & ARNOLD

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David R Arendall +1 205 252 1550 +1 205 252 1556 dra@arendalllaw.com
Allen Durham Arnold +1 205 252 1550 +1 205 252 1556 ada@arendalllaw.com
No Logo Shawna Nelson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ARENDALL & ARNOLD

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David R Arendall +1 205 252 1550 +1 205 252 1556 dra@arendalllaw.com
Allen Durham Arnold +1 205 252 1550 +1 205 252 1556 ada@arendalllaw.com
No Logo Teresa R Smalley, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ARENDALL & ARNOLD

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David R Arendall +1 205 252 1550 +1 205 252 1556 dra@arendalllaw.com
Allen Durham Arnold +1 205 252 1550 +1 205 252 1556 ada@arendalllaw.com
v.
No Logo Albertville Quality Foods, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Maynard, Cooper & Gale, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Janell M Ahnert +1 205 254 1000 +1 205 254 1999 jahnert@maynardcooper.com
Jeffrey Allen Lee +1 205 254 1000 +1 205 254 1999 jlee@mcglaw.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 201
Nature of Suit 710 Labor: Fair Standards
  Entries (15) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PACER 16 Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT. The court ORDERS Settlement Agreements and Releases are hereby APPROVED; the Joint Motion for Approval of Settlement Agreement is GRANTED, including the monetary distribution to the Plaintiffs and the attorney's fees set forth in it. This action is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 05/26/2011. (FNC) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
PACER 15 Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER. For the purposes of enabling the court to review and approve the settlement agreements, the court will accept the opt-in attempts of Reba Aguado, Max Leigh Blair, Crystal Lugo, Shawna Nelson, and Teresa R. Smalley to participate in this FLSA suit. The court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to designate these individuals as "opt-in Plaintiffs" to this action. Reba Aguado, Crystal Lugo, Shawna Nelson, Teresa R Smalley and Max Leigh Blair added as opt-in plaintiffs; the court does not accept the "opt-in" attempts of Karena Swords and William Pointer, Jr. to join this FLSA suit based on the representations of counsel that these individuals never worked for the Defendant. Therefore, these persons are not considered opt-in Plaintiffs to this action, or to the proposed settlement. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 05/26/2011. (FNC) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
PACER 14 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Setting Status Conference for 5/25/2011 02:30 PM, fifth floor chambers, before Judge Karon O Bowdre. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 05/12/2011. (FNC) (Entered: 05/12/2011)
PACER 12 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Approval of Settlement and Exhibits Under Seal by Albertville Quality Foods Inc, Brian Fox. (Lee, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
PACER 11 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 2/23/2011. (KAM, ) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
PACER 10 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Albertville Quality Foods Inc. (Ahnert, Janell) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
PACER 9 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
ANSWER to Complaint by Albertville Quality Foods Inc.(Ahnert, Janell) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
PACER 8 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE by Brian Fox of Filing of Consent - Second (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Arendall, David) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
PACER 7 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE by Brian Fox of filing of Consents - FIRST (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Consents of opt-in plaintiffs)(Arendall, David) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
PACER 6 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed Albertville Quality Foods Inc served on 2/1/2011, answer due 2/22/2011. (FNC) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
PACER 5 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Summons Issued
Summons Issued as to Albertville Quality Foods Inc. Mailed cert mail, this date. (FNC) (Entered: 01/31/2011)
PACER 4 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
Corporate Disclosure Statement (CORRECTED) by Brian Fox. (Arendall, David) Modified on 1/21/2011 (FNC). (Entered: 01/21/2011)
PACER 3 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None
Request for service by certified mail filed by Brian Fox. (KAM, ) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
PACER 2 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Brian Fox (KAM, ) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
PACER 1 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against Albertville Quality Foods Inc, filed by Brian Fox.(KAM, ) (Entered: 01/20/2011)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 59 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?