Floyd D Rose v. American Precision, et al
California Central District Court, Case No. 8:92-cv-00166
District Judge Gary L. Taylor, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.cacd.8-92-cv-00166 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
The right information can save you thousands of dollars.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Floyd D. Rose, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
John Robert Nelson +1 512 305 4868 +1 512 305 4800 jnelson@lockelord.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Allergan USA, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Douglas Stephen Ingram +1 714 246 4500

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Steven C McCracken +1 949 451 3800

Toggle Switch Represented by Lerner David Littenberg Krumholz & Mentilk, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
William L. Mentlik +1 908 654 5000 wmentlik@ldlkm.com
No Logo American Precision Metal Works, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Anthony A Ferrigno Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Anthony Albert Ferrigno +1 949 366 9700

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Joel R Wohlfiel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Joel R Wohlfiel
v.
No Logo American Precision Metal Works, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Anthony A Ferrigno Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Anthony Albert Ferrigno +1 949 366 9700

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Joel R Wohlfiel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Joel R Wohlfiel
No Logo Gary Kahler, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Anthony A Ferrigno Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Anthony Albert Ferrigno +1 949 366 9700

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Joel R Wohlfiel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Joel R Wohlfiel
No Logo Floyd nmi Rose, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
John Robert Nelson +1 512 305 4868 +1 512 305 4800 jnelson@lockelord.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Allergan USA, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Douglas Stephen Ingram +1 714 246 4500

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Steven C McCracken +1 949 451 3800

Toggle Switch Represented by Lerner David Littenberg Krumholz & Mentilk, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
William L. Mentlik +1 908 654 5000 wmentlik@ldlkm.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 145
Nature of Suit 830 Patent
  Entries (94) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PACER 239 Filed: 2/13/1997, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Floyd D Rose of acknowledgment of satisfaction of judgment on opposing cnsl by mail on 2/12/97 (th) (Entered: 02/19/1997)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 238 Filed: 2/11/1997, Entered: None
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT as to defendant Gary Kahler, defendant American Precision, counter-claimant American Precision (th) (Entered: 02/18/1997)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 237 Filed: 2/12/1997, Entered: None
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re [210-2] as to defendant American Precision, defendant Gary Kahler (vv) (Entered: 02/13/1997)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 236 Filed: 12/7/1995, Entered: None
CERTIFIED COPY of Appellate Court Order: dismissing the appeal [225-1], dismissing the appeal [221-1] (ENT 12/8/95) mld cpys (lisp) (Entered: 12/08/1995)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 235 Filed: 12/7/1995, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES: Crt ords that the mandate of the 9th cca dism appeal is fld & spread upon the min of this USDC by Judge Gary L. Taylor (ENT 12/8/95) mld cpys (lisp) (Entered: 12/08/1995)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 234 Filed: 10/10/1995, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES: ; judgment debtor exam of Gary Kahler held by Magistrate Judge Elgin C. Edwards CR: SA Tape Number 2013 (tt) (Entered: 10/24/1995)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 233 Filed: 9/21/1995, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Floyd D Rose of appl & order (lisp) (Entered: 09/28/1995)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 232 Filed: 9/8/1995, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elgin C. Edwards decl of Ellen Wolf is to be fld (tt) (Entered: 09/21/1995)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 231 Filed: 9/8/1995, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Ellen K. Wolf in sup by plaintiff Floyd D Rose of applic for appearance & exam of 3rd person, enfrocement of jgm (tt) (Entered: 09/21/1995)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 230 Filed: 9/8/1995, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elgin C. Edwards for Carol Ann Kahler to appear for jgm debtor exam on 10/10/95 at 10am (tt) (Entered: 09/21/1995)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 229 Filed: 9/5/1995, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elgin C. Edwards ; judgment exam set on 10:00 10/10/95 of Gary Kahler (tt) (Entered: 09/06/1995)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 228 Filed: 8/30/1995, Entered: None
REQUEST by plaintiff Floyd D Rose for taking hrg off cal & for resetting hrg on applic & ord for appearance4 & examination (tt) (Entered: 09/05/1995)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 227 Filed: 8/7/1995, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elgin C. Edwards ; judgment exam set on 10:00 9/5/95 (lisp) (Entered: 08/10/1995)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 226 Filed: 8/4/1995, Entered: None
NOTICE by plaintiff of assoc of cnsl (tt) (Entered: 08/08/1995)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 225 Filed: 1/17/1995, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEAL by plaintiff Federal Circuit from Dist. Court ord ent on 11/9/94. (cc: Edward L. Xanders; Bauman & Wohlfell; Lerner, David, Littenberg, Krumholz & Mentlik; Bathgate, Wegener, Dugan & Wolf, P.C.). Fee: Billed. (dmap) (Entered: 01/19/1995)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 224 Filed: 1/11/1995, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION and ordering form for dates: 05/10/93 re transcript [207-1] CR: Ron Worth. Date: 11/22/93. CR: Nancy Staack. (dmap) (Entered: 01/12/1995)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 223 Filed: 12/16/1994, Entered: None
STIPULATION: parties stip that costs in the amnt of $22,562.55 should be awarded to Floyd D. Rose & LDLK&M & agnst Gary Kahler & APM (cjv) (Entered: 01/12/1995)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 222 Filed: 12/30/1994, Entered: None
NOTICE of association of cnsl by defendant American Precision, counter-claimant American Precision (lisp) (Entered: 01/05/1995)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 221 Filed: 1/4/1995, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEAL by defendant to Federal Circuit from Dist. Court ord ent on 11/9/94. (cc: John Morris). Fee: Paid. (dmap) Modified on 01/19/1995 (Entered: 01/04/1995)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 220 Filed: 12/8/1994, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Gary L. Taylor denying motion to alter or amend judgment [213-1] (ENT 12/9/94) mld cpy (lisp) (Entered: 12/09/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 219 Filed: 12/5/1994, Entered: None
Opposition by defendant American Precision, defendant Gary Kahler to motion to tax (lisp) (Entered: 12/06/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 218 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Floyd D Rose, counter-defendant Lerner David Littenberg Krumholz & Mentlik of bill of costs; decl in spt; notc (cjv) (Entered: 11/30/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 217 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: None
DECLARATION of John R. Nelson by plaintiff Floyd D Rose, counter-defendant Lerner David Littenberg Krumholz & Mentlik in spt of bill of costs [216-1] (cjv) (Entered: 11/30/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 216 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: None
BILL OF COSTS RETURNABLE submitted by plaintiff Floyd D Rose, counter-defendant Lerner David Littenberg Krumholz & Mentlik re [210-2] ; bill of cost hearing set on 9:00 12/14/94 (FRWD TO MR. JANISCH IN LOS ANGELES FOR HRG) (cjv) (Entered: 11/30/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 215 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: None
NOTICE by plaintiff Floyd D Rose, counter-defendant Lerner David, Littenberg, Krumholz & Mentlik of appl to clerk to tax costs (cjv) (Entered: 11/30/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 214 Filed: 11/28/1994, Entered: None
Opposition by plaintiff Floyd D Rose, counter-defendant Lerner David to motion to alter or amend judgment [213-1] (lisp) (Entered: 11/29/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 213 Filed: 11/21/1994, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/8/1994
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by defendant American Precision, defendant Gary Kahler, counter-claimant American Precision to alter or amend judgment ; motion hearing set for 10:00 12/12/94 (lisp) (Entered: 11/22/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 212 Filed: 11/14/1994, Entered: None
OBJECTIONS to proposed final jgm lodged w/crt by defendant American Precision, defendant Gary Kahler (lisp) (Entered: 11/15/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 211 Filed: 11/9/1994, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Floyd D Rose, counter-defendant Lerner David of final judgment (lisp) (Entered: 11/10/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 210 Filed: 11/8/1994, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT AND ORDER: by Judge Gary L. Taylor against defendant American Precision, defendant Gary Kahler . terminating case jointly & severally In the amount of $ 101,501,121.00 plus post-jgm int, Jgm on APM's counterclaim is ent in favor of counter-dfts Floyd D. Rose & Lerner, David, Littenberg, Krumholz & Metnlik & agnst counter-clm American Precision Metal Works & all of APM's 1st, 2nd, 3rd, 4th, 5th, 6th, & 7th causes of actn are dism w/prej; dfts are permanently enjoined, Rose & LDLK&M are awarded costs. (ENT 11/9/94) MD JS 6 (cc: all counsel) (lisp) (Entered: 11/09/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 209 Filed: 11/1/1994, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES: 9th day court trial final arg hrd, crt finds in favor of pla on the cmp & awards damages in the amt of $1,501,121.00, crt finds in favor of counter-dfts on the cnt-clm by Judge Gary L. Taylor CR: Ron Worth/Sharon Seffons (lisp) (Entered: 11/03/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 208 Filed: 11/1/1994, Entered: None
LIST OF EXHIBITS & WITNESSES (lisp) (Entered: 11/03/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 207 Filed: 10/26/1994, Entered: None
RECEIPT OF DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following date(s): 7/1/92 (Re: Depo of Joseph S. Littenberg) Volume II. (lisp) (Entered: 11/03/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 206 Filed: 10/26/1994, Entered: None
RECEIPT OF DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following date(s): 6/30/92 (Re: Depo of Joseph S. Littenberg) Volume I. (lisp) (Entered: 11/03/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 205 Filed: 10/18/1994, Entered: None
EXHIBITS (lisp) (Entered: 11/03/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 204 Filed: 10/18/1994, Entered: None
EXHIBITS (lisp) (Entered: 11/03/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 203 Filed: 10/26/1994, Entered: None
RECEIPT OF DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following date(s): 7/2/94 (Re: Depo of John R. Nelson) Volume II (lisp) (Entered: 11/03/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 202 Filed: 10/26/1994, Entered: None
RECEIPT OF DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following date(s): 7/1/92 (Re: Depo of John R. Nelson) Volume I (lisp) Modified on 11/03/1994 (Entered: 11/03/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 201 Filed: 10/18/1994, Entered: None
RECEIPT OF DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following date(s): 2/22/93 (Re: Depo of Gary L. Kahler )Volume I. (lisp) (Entered: 11/03/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 200 Filed: 10/18/1994, Entered: None
RECEIPT OF DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following date(s): 2/23/93 (Re: Depo of Gary L. Kahler ) volume II (lisp) (Entered: 11/03/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 199 Filed: 10/18/1994, Entered: None
EXHIBITS (lisp) (Entered: 11/03/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 198 Filed: 10/18/1994, Entered: None
EXHIBITS (lisp) (Entered: 11/03/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 197 Filed: 10/18/1994, Entered: None
RECEIPT OF DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following date(s): 6/30/92 (Re: Depo of Floyd D. Rose) Volume II. (lisp) (Entered: 11/03/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 196 Filed: 10/18/1994, Entered: None
RECEIPT OF DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following date(s): 6/29/92 (Re: deposition of Floyd D. Rose ) volume I. (lisp) (Entered: 11/03/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 195 Filed: 10/28/1994, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES: 8th day C/T, case cont to 11/1/94 at 9:30 by Judge Gary L. Taylor CR: Ron Worth (lisp) (Entered: 11/02/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 194 Filed: 10/28/1994, Entered: None
BRIEF FILED re duty to disclose & use of drawings by plaintiff Floyd D Rose, counter-defendant Floyd nmi Rose (lisp) (Entered: 11/01/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 193 Filed: 10/27/1994, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES: 7th day C/T case cont to 10/28/94 at 9:00 by Judge Gary L. Taylor CR: Ron Worth/Sharon Seffons (lisp) (Entered: 11/01/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 192 Filed: 10/26/1994, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES: 6th day court trial, matter cont to 10/27/94 at 9:00 am by Judge Gary L. Taylor CR: Ron Worth/Sharon Seffons (lisp) (Entered: 10/31/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 191 Filed: 10/25/1994, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES: 5th day C/T case cont to 10/26/94 at 9:00 by Judge Gary L. Taylor CR: Sharon Seffons/Ron Worth (lisp) (Entered: 10/28/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 190 Filed: 10/21/1994, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES: 4th day C/T case cont to 10/25/94 at 9:00 by Judge Gary L. Taylor CR: Ron Worth/Sharon Seffons (lisp) (Entered: 10/27/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 189 Filed: 10/21/1994, Entered: None
OBJECTIONS to depo testimony to be offered by APM & Kahler in suppt of their case-in-chief by plaintiff Floyd D Rose (lisp) (Entered: 10/27/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 188 Filed: 10/20/1994, Entered: None
Counter-designations to designations of excerpts of Gary Kahler by defendants American Precision (lisp) (Entered: 10/26/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 187 Filed: 10/20/1994, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES: 3rd day C/T case cont to 10/21/94 at 9:00 by Judge Gary L. Taylor CR: Ron Worth/Sharon Seffons (lisp) (Entered: 10/26/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 186 Filed: 10/19/1994, Entered: None
BRIEF FILED amended designations of depo to be offered by plaintiff Floyd D Rose (lisp) (Entered: 10/26/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 185 Filed: 10/19/1994, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES: 2nd day C/T case cont to 10/20/94 at 9:00 by Judge Gary L. Taylor CR: Ron Worth/Sharon Seffons (lisp) (Entered: 10/26/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 184 Filed: 10/18/1994, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES: 1st day court trial matter is cont to 10/19/94 at 9:00 by Judge Gary L. Taylor CR: Sharon Seffons (lisp) (Entered: 10/25/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 183 Filed: 10/17/1994, Entered: None
Financial info pending phase 2 if any on punitive damages by dfts Apm Inc. & Kahler. UNDER SEAL (tt) (Entered: 10/20/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 182 Filed: 10/17/1994, Entered: None
WITNESS list submitted by defendant American Precision, defendant Gary Kahler (tt) (Entered: 10/20/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 181 Filed: 10/14/1994, Entered: None
Designation of depo test to be offered in his case-in-chief on Rose's clms agnst APM & Kahler. by plf & cntrdfts (tt) (Entered: 10/20/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 180 Filed: 10/13/1994, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Floyd D Rose, counter-defendant Lerner David of findgs of fact & concls of law (tt) (Entered: 10/17/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 179 Filed: 10/13/1994, Entered: None
FINDINGS of fact and conclusions of law by plf & cntr-dfts (tt) (Entered: 10/17/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 178 Filed: 10/12/1994, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER on Rose's & Lerner, David, Littenberg, Krumholz & Mentlik's mtn for S/J-DENIED by Judge Gary L. Taylor (krpa) (Entered: 10/13/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 177 Filed: 5/13/1994, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER the foregoing admission having been md by the ptys, & the ptys having specified the foregoing issd of fact & klaw remaining to be litigated, this ptc Ord shall supersede the pleadings & govern the course of the trial of this cause, unless modified to prevent manifest injustice. by Judge Gary L. Taylor (cc: all counsel) (ruiz) (Entered: 05/16/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 176 Filed: 5/13/1994, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES: ; pretrial conference held ; crt/trial set on 9:00 10/18/94. Crt denies bifurcation as requested in the ptc ord. The ptc od is signed & fi by Judge Gary L. Taylor CR: Ron Worth (cc: all counsel) (ruiz) (Entered: 05/16/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 175 Filed: 4/20/1994, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES: The crt, on its own mtn, hereby ORDS ; pretrial conference on 1:30 5/13/94 (No bad luck intended by the new calendaring of the pretrial). by Judge Gary L. Taylor CR: Ron Worth (cc: all counsel) (ruiz) (Entered: 04/26/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 174 Filed: 4/20/1994, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant American Precision, defendant Gary Kahler of mem of contentions of fact & law on 4/20/94. (ruiz) (Entered: 04/25/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 173 Filed: 4/20/1994, Entered: None
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL of Steven C. McCracken as cnsl of rec for by plaintiff Floyd D Rose (ruiz) (Entered: 04/25/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 172 Filed: 4/20/1994, Entered: None
OBJECTIONS to prop trial exh by plaintiff Floyd D Rose (ruiz) (Entered: 04/25/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 171 Filed: 4/20/1994, Entered: None
Mem of contentions of fact & law. Dfts (ruiz) (Entered: 04/20/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 170 Filed: 4/13/1994, Entered: None
OBJECTIONS to exhibits identified by pltf Floyd D. Rose & cnt-dfts Rose & Lerner, David, Littenberg, Krumholz & Mendtlik in joint trial exhibit list by defendant American Precision, defendant Gary Kahler (ruiz) (Entered: 04/14/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 169 Filed: 4/5/1994, Entered: None
Joint trial exhibit list pur to L.R. 9.4.4. pltf (ruiz) (Entered: 04/06/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 168 Filed: 3/30/1994, Entered: None
NOTICE by defendant American Precision, defendant Gary Kahler, counter-claimant American Precision of change of address for Atty Anthony A Ferrigno (cjv) (Entered: 04/01/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 167 Filed: 3/18/1994, Entered: None
Amd NOTICE of deposition testimony to be offered in PAM & Kahler's case-in chiefby defendant American Precision, defendant Gary Kahler (ruiz) (Entered: 03/21/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 166 Filed: 3/7/1994, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES: Hrg held re motns in limine from both parties. APM & Kahler's motns in limine: 1) to exclude bnkrptcy evid denied; to exclude fee agreement ldgd in bnkrptcy crt denied; to rule certain communications not confidential denied; to exclude wits granted, except crt will permit the pres of Mr Littenberg & Mr Nelson; to warn wits to ans dir denied; to use video depos-no ruling, except permit depos if they are prop prepared. Rose & Lerner & David Motns in Limine: re prior litigation & settlement - to exclude depo trnscrpts denied; to exclude issue of Rose patent invalidity or unenforcability granted; to exsclude prior patent suit as act in furtherance of a conspiracy granted; to exclude acts bef settlement submitted; to exclude evid contrary to s/j ruling granted; to exclude evid & argument not framed by pleadings granted, although allow issue, & reopen dscvry, re Rose patent appl as potential trade secret misappropriation. [150-1], [149-1], [148-1], [147-1] by Judge Gary L. Taylor CR: Ron Worth (cj) (Entered: 03/10/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 165 Filed: 2/28/1994, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by plaintiff Floyd D Rose, counter-defendant Lerner David in support of motion in limine to exclude introduction of evid contrary to Crt's ruling on Rose' & Lerner, David Littenbert Krumholz & Mentlik's motns for s/j [149-1] (ruiz) (Entered: 03/01/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 164 Filed: 2/28/1994, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by plaintiff Floyd D Rose, counter-defendant Lerner David in support of motion in limine re prior litigation & settlement & release in that litigation [147-1] (ruiz) (Entered: 03/01/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 163 Filed: 2/28/1994, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by plaintiff Floyd D Rose, counter-defendant Lerner David in support of motion in limine to bar evid of or ref to Kahler's bnkrptcy bef Amer Precision Metal Works Inc [150-1] (ruiz) (Entered: 03/01/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 162 Filed: 2/25/1994, Entered: None
REPLY to oppm in limine to bar evidence of or reference to American Precision Metal Works, Inc.'s proposed fee agreement lodged w/the Bankruptcy Crt. by defendant American Precision, defendant Gary Kahler, counter-claimant American Precision (ruiz) (Entered: 02/28/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 161 Filed: 2/22/1994, Entered: None
OPPOSITION by defendant American Precision, defendant Gary Kahler, counter-claimant American Precision motion in limine re prior litigation & settlement & release in that litigation [147-1] (seal) (Entered: 02/24/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 160 Filed: 2/22/1994, Entered: None
OPPOSITION by defendant American Precision, defendant Gary Kahler, counter-claimant American Precision motion in limine to exclude introduction of evid contrary to Crt's ruling on Rose' & Lerner, David Littenbert Krumholz & Mentlik's motns for s/j [149-1] (seal) (Entered: 02/24/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 158 Filed: 2/22/1994, Entered: None
Table of uthorities to opposition of dfts American OPrecision Metal Works, Inc,., & Gary Kahler & cntlm american Precison Metal Wroks Inc., to pltf & cnt-dfts Floyd D. Rose & Lerner, David, Littenber, Kroumholz & Mentlik's mtn in limine re prior litigtion & settlement & release in that litigation. dfts (ruiz) (Entered: 02/23/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 157 Filed: 2/18/1994, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by blank (space) Littenber, blank (space) Krumholz & Mentlik, plaintiff Floyd D Rose, counter-claimant American Precision in opposition to APM's Kahler's mtn in limine for ord that communications by & between Floyd D. Rose' Lerner, David, Littenber, Krumholz & Memtlike & Kramer Music Products, Inc about exh 1013 & The Kramer Licensing program are not confidenial [oppositon no. 3 of 6] (ruiz) (Entered: 02/22/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 156 Filed: 2/18/1994, Entered: None
OPPOSITION to APM's & Kahler's mt inlimine for crt to control exam of Joseph R. Nelson of by blank (space) Littenber, blank (space) Krumholz & Mentlik, plaintiff Floyd D Rose, counter-claimant American Precision (ruiz) (Entered: 02/22/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 155 Filed: 2/18/1994, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by blank (space) Littenberg, blank (space) Krumholz & Mentlik, plaintiff Floyd D Rose, counter-claimant American Precision, counter-defendant Lerner David in opposition to motion in limine to exclude evid & argument on issues not framed by the pleadings [148-1] (ruiz) (Entered: 02/22/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 154 Filed: 2/18/1994, Entered: None
DECLARATION of John R Nelson in of Rose's & Ldlk & M's opposition to APM's & Kahler's 4th mtn in limine. by blank (space) Littenber, blank (space) Krumholtz & Mentlik, plaintiff Floyd D Rose, counter-claimant American Precision (ruiz) (Entered: 02/22/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 153 Filed: 2/22/1994, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by blank (space) Littenber, blank (space) Krumholz & Mentlik, plaintiff Floyd D Rose, counter-claimant American Precision, counter-defendant Lerner David in opposition to motion in limine to bar evid of or ref to Kahler's bnkrptcy bef Amer Precision Metal Works Inc [150-1] (ruiz) (Entered: 02/22/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 152 Filed: 2/18/1994, Entered: None
OPPOSITION by blank (space) Littenger, blank (space) Krumholz & Mentlik, plaintiff Floyd D Rose, counter-claimant American Precision motion in limine to exclude evid & argument on issues not framed by the pleadings [148-1] (ruiz) (Entered: 02/22/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 151 Filed: 2/18/1994, Entered: None
RESPONSE by plaintiff Floyd D Rose, counter-defendant Lerner David to mtn in limie to present video taped deposition testimony @ trial [opposition No, 6 of 6] [148-1] (ruiz) (Entered: 02/22/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 150 Filed: 2/11/1994, Entered: None
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by defendants in limine to bar evid of or ref to Kahler's bnkrptcy bef Amer Precision Metal Works Inc ; motion hearing set for 3:00 3/7/94 (cj) (Entered: 02/15/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 149 Filed: 2/11/1994, Entered: None
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiff Floyd D Rose, counter-defendant Lerner David in limine to exclude introduction of evid contrary to Crt's ruling on Rose' & Lerner, David Littenbert Krumholz & Mentlik's motns for s/j ; motion hearing set for 3:00 3/7/94 (cj) (Entered: 02/15/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 148 Filed: 2/11/1994, Entered: None
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiff Floyd D Rose, counter-defendant Lerner David in limine to exclude evid & argument on issues not framed by the pleadings ; motion hearing set for 3:00 3/7/94 (cj) (Entered: 02/15/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 147 Filed: 2/11/1994, Entered: None
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiff & cntr-dft in limine re prior litigation & settlement & release in that litigation ; motion hearing set for 3:00 3/7/94 (cj) (Entered: 02/15/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 146 Filed: 2/11/1994, Entered: None
AMENDED WITNESS list submitted by defendants (cj) (Entered: 02/15/1994)
Request RequestSpace
PACER 144 Filed: 1/3/1994, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES: ; pretrial conference on 2:30 4/25/94 w/trial date to be set at PTC for a date in 6/94. by Judge Gary L. Taylor CR: Ron Worth (cj) (Entered: 02/15/1994)
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 219 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?