Bryan Walter Tutler
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 11-40466
District Judge Raymond B. Ray, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.flsb.11-40466 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
This docket can only tell you so much. Get the rest.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Bryan Walter Tutler, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Sean I. Koplow, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Sean I Koplow +1 561 255 1122 +1 561 965 4966 seankoplow@gmail.com
No Logo Deborah Tutler, Joint Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Sean I. Koplow, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Sean I Koplow +1 561 255 1122 +1 561 965 4966 seankoplow@gmail.com
  Entries (2) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PACER 25 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
Trustee's Request for Entry of Order Confirming Chapter 13 First Amended Plan After Confirmation Hearing [Confirmation Hearing Date: 1/19/2012] (^Weiner8, Robin) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
PACER 22 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: None
The information required by 11 U.S.C. Sec. 521(a)(1) as provided by the debtor(s) in this case is complete to the satisfaction of the trustee. No creditor or other party in interest has filed a request for an order of dismissal pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sec. 521(i)(2) and the trustee does not believe that this case is subject to automatic dismissal pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sec. 521(i). (^Weiner8, Robin) (Entered: 01/20/2012)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 47 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?