Geraldine Gray Kimbrough
Illinois Northern Bankruptcy Court - Chicago, Case No. 11-47214
District Judge Donald R. Cassling, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.ilnb.11-47214 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
The right information can save you thousands of dollars.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Geraldine Gray Kimbrough, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of David Freydin Ltd

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David Freydin +1 847 630 3122 +1 866 575 3765 david.freydin@freydinlaw.com
  Entries (14) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PACER 40 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
(E)Hearing Continued (RE: 38 Compensation WITH Notice of Motion). hearing scheduled for 04/27/2012 at 11:30 AM at 505 N County Farm Road, Room 4016, Wheaton, IL, 60187.. Signed on 04/13/2012. (McClendon, Annette) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
PACER 35 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
Receipt of Amended Schedules (Fee)(11-47214) [misc,amdschdf] ( 30.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 19776442. Fee Amount $ 30.00 (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
PACER 30 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
Draft Order (Related Doc#: 18 Relief Stay). due by 03/23/2012 (McClendon, Annette) (Entered: 03/11/2012)
PACER 29 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
(E)Hearing Continued (RE: 11 Compensation WITH Notice of Motion). hearing scheduled for 04/13/2012 at 11:30 AM at 505 N County Farm Road, Room 4016, Wheaton, IL, 60187.. Signed on 03/09/2012. (McClendon, Annette) (Entered: 03/11/2012)
PACER 28 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
(E)Confirmation Hearing Continued. Confirmation Hearing to be held on 04/13/2012 at 11:30 AM at 505 N County Farm Road, Room 4016, Wheaton, IL, 60187.. Signed on 03/09/2012. (McClendon, Annette) (Entered: 03/11/2012)
PACER 27 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None
Meeting of Creditors Held (AMD SOFA & SCH B) Debtor appeared. (Stearns, Glenn) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
PACER 25 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None
Hearing Continued (RE: 18 Relief Stay). hearing scheduled for 03/09/2012 at 11:30 AM at 505 N County Farm Road, Room 4016, Wheaton, IL, 60187.. Signed on 02/10/2012. (Askew, Althea) (Entered: 02/14/2012)
PACER 24 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None
Hearing Continued (RE: 11 Compensation WITH Notice of Motion). hearing scheduled for 03/09/2012 at 11:30 AM at 505 N County Farm Road, Room 4016, Wheaton, IL, 60187.. Signed on 02/10/2012. (Askew, Althea) (Entered: 02/14/2012)
PACER 23 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None
Confirmation Hearing Continued. Confirmation Hearing to be held on 03/09/2012 at 11:30 AM at 505 N County Farm Road, Room 4016, Wheaton, IL, 60187.. Signed on 02/10/2012. (Askew, Althea) (Entered: 02/14/2012)
PACER 20 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors. Section 341(a) Meeting Continued on 2/29/2012 at 11:30 AM at 801 Warrenville Road Ste 655, Lisle, IL 60532-3614. (Stearns, Glenn) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
PACER 19 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None
Receipt of Motion for Relief Stay(11-47214) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 176.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 19193116. Fee Amount $ 176.00 (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
PACER 17 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: None
Meeting of Creditors Not Held NEED 2010 TAXES Debtor absent. (Stearns, Glenn) (Entered: 01/18/2012)
PACER 8 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 01/18/2012 at 01:00 PM at 801 Warrenville Road Ste 655, Lisle, IL 60532-3614. Confirmation hearing to be held on 02/10/2012 at 10:45 AM at DuPage Courthouse, 505 N County Farm Road, Rm 4016, Wheaton, Illinois 60187. Proof of Claim due by 04/17/2012. Objection to Dischargeability due by 03/19/2012. (Freydin, David) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
PACER 7 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(11-47214) [misc,volp13a] ( 281.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 18618763. Fee Amount $ 281.00 (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 11/21/2011)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 40 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?