Christopher Anderson Friis, IV
Louisiana Western Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 11-80941
District Judge Henley A. Hunter, presiding
docket://gov.uscourts.lawb.11-80941 (What is this?)

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
The right information can save you thousands of dollars.
Access comprehensive profiles on judges, firms, lawyers, and more with PlainSite Pro and Pro Se.
No Logo Christopher Anderson Friis, IV, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David J. Klann +1 337 239 6709 +1 337 238 2638 juryv@bellsouth.net
No Logo Kathleen Obrien Friis, Joint Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
David J. Klann +1 337 239 6709 +1 337 238 2638 juryv@bellsouth.net
  Entries (30) Calendar Events Related (0) Tools Right End
PACER 30 Filed: 11/6/2011, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s): 29 Order). Service Date 11/06/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/06/2011)
PACER 29 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
Order (Re: 28 Agreement Between Parties to Modify Amended Chapter 13 Plan). Filed on 11/4/2011 (shar) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
PACER 28 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None
Agreement Between Parties to Modify Amended Chapter 13 Plan Before Confirmation (Re: 19 Amended Chapter 13 Plan) Filed by David J. Klann and Jon C. Thornburg on behalf of Christopher Anderson Friis IV, Kathleen Obrien Friis. (mart) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
PACER 27 Filed: 10/30/2011, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s): 26 Order). Service Date 10/30/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/30/2011)
PACER 26 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
Order Conditionally Granting (Re: 19 Amended Chapter 13 Plan) Filed on 10/27/2011 (mart) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
PACER 25 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
Trustee's Recommendation (Re: 19 Amended Chapter 13 Plan) Filed by Jon C. Thornburg. (mart) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
PACER 24 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None
Objection to Confirmation of Plan (Re: 19 Amended Chapter 13 Plan) with Certificate of Service. Filed by Jon C. Thornburg (Ch13 Trustee Jon Thornburg - rd) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
PACER 23 Filed: 9/18/2011, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s): 22 Order). Service Date 09/18/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/18/2011)
PACER 22 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
Order Conditionally Granting (Re: 8 Chapter 13 Plan) Filed on 9/15/2011 (mart) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
PACER 21 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
Trustee's Recommendation (Re: 8 Chapter 13 Plan) Filed by Jon C. Thornburg. (mart) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
PACER 20 Filed: 9/10/2011, Entered: None
Notice of Hearing (Served) (Re: 19 Amended Chapter 13 Plan) , IF AND ONLY IF Objection, A Hearing Will Be Held, 10/27/2011, 9:30 a.m., at 2nd Floor Courtroom, Alexandria with Certificate of Service. Filed by David J. Klann on behalf of Christopher Anderson Friis IV, Kathleen Obrien Friis (Klann, David) (Entered: 09/10/2011)
PACER 19 Filed: 9/10/2011, Entered: None
First Amended Chapter 13 Plan Before Confirmation (Re: 8 Chapter 13 Plan) with Certificate of Service. Filed by David J. Klann on behalf of Christopher Anderson Friis IV, Kathleen Obrien Friis (Klann, David) (Entered: 09/10/2011)
PACER 18 Filed: 9/10/2011, Entered: None
Amended Schedules filed with Certificate of Service: Schedule B, Personal Property in the Amount of $12,585.50, Schedule C, Schedule J, the average expenses for the debtor(s) in the Amount of $1,511.80, Amended Schedules filed with Certificate of Service: Schedule D, Creditors Holding Secured Claims in the Amount of $17,632.00, Schedule E, Creditors Holding Unsecured Priority Claims in the Amount of $18,595.09, Schedule F, Creditors Holding Unsecured Nonpriority Claims in the Amount of $16,887.35, Fee Amount Due $26, Summary of Schedules. Current Monthly Income in the amount of $2084.80. Total Type of Liability in the amount of $15795.09 with Declaration of Schedules. Filed by David J. Klann on behalf of Christopher Anderson Friis IV, Kathleen Obrien Friis (Klann, David) (Entered: 09/10/2011)
PACER 17 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
Objection to Confirmation of Plan (Re: 8 Chapter 13 Plan) with Certificate of Service. Filed by Jon C. Thornburg (Ch13 Trustee Jon Thornburg - rd) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
PACER 16 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None
Assignment/Transfer of Claim Waived. Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 From Transferor: Sallie Mae ECFC (Claim No. 10) Transferred To LA Student Financial Assist. Commission. Filed by Sallie Mae, Inc. on 8/18/2011. (Musial, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
PACER 15 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None
Objection to Confirmation of Plan (Re: 8 Chapter 13 Plan) with exhibits with Certificate of Service. Filed by Kevin J. Payne on behalf of First Tower Loan, Inc., d/b/a Tower Loan of Alexandria (Payne, Kevin) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
PACER 14 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: None
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice . Filed by Patti H. Bass on behalf of HSBC Bank Nevada, N.A. (Bass, Patti) (Entered: 08/04/2011)
PACER 13 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s): 9 Chapter 13 Plan Summary Notice). Service Date 07/28/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/28/2011)
PACER 12 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. (related document(s): 11 Notice - 341 Meeting of Creditors/Confirmation Hearing Sent for BNC Noticing.). Service Date 07/28/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/28/2011)
PACER 11 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None
Notice - 341 Meeting of Creditors/Confirmation Hearing Sent for BNC Noticing. (mart) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
PACER 10 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None
Addendum to (Re: 8 Chapter 13 Plan ) Filed by David J. Klann on behalf of Christopher Anderson Friis IV, Kathleen Obrien Friis (Klann, David) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
PACER 9 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None
Notice of Chapter 13 Plan Summary (Re: 8 Chapter 13 Plan) Filed by David J. Klann on behalf of Christopher Anderson Friis IV, Kathleen Obrien Friis (Klann, David) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
PACER 8 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by David J. Klann on behalf of Christopher Anderson Friis IV, Kathleen Obrien Friis (Klann, David) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
PACER 7 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None
Certificate of Service of Tax Information to Trustee. Filed by David J. Klann on behalf of Christopher Anderson Friis IV, Kathleen Obrien Friis (Klann, David) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
PACER 6 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None
Employee Income Records of Joint-Debtor. Filed by David J. Klann on behalf of Christopher Anderson Friis IV, Kathleen Obrien Friis (Klann, David) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
PACER 5 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None
Employee Income Records of Debtor. Filed by David J. Klann on behalf of Christopher Anderson Friis IV, Kathleen Obrien Friis (Klann, David) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
PACER 4 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None
Social Security Card Copy, and Picture ID Copy, Declaration Re Electronic Filing and Statement of SSN Filed by David J. Klann on behalf of Christopher Anderson Friis IV, Kathleen Obrien Friis (Klann, David) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
PACER 3 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Joint Debtor Filed by David J. Klann on behalf of Christopher Anderson Friis IV, Kathleen Obrien Friis (Klann, David) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
PACER 2 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by David J. Klann on behalf of Christopher Anderson Friis IV, Kathleen Obrien Friis (Klann, David) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
PACER 1 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition, All Schedules, Statements and Disclosure of Compensation for Attorney. Fee Amount Due $274 Filed by David J. Klann on behalf of Christopher Anderson Friis IV, Kathleen Obrien Friis. Declaration of ECF Filing due by 07/21/2011. Social Security Card due by 07/21/2011. Picture Identification Card due by 07/21/2011. (Klann, David) CORRECTIVE ENTRY - MODIFIED TEXT TO INCLUDE SCHEDULES AND STATEMENTS. Modified on 7/20/2011 (king). (Entered: 07/19/2011)

Statistics

This case has been viewed 38 times.

No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Pro Se Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Need Password Help?